District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  1. Case No. 10-15616
    Filed 12/29/2011
  2. Case No. 15-16133
    Filed 6/4/2015
United States Supreme Court

Jewel et al v. National Security Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:08-cv-04373-JSW
District Judge Jeffrey S. White, presiding

Tags
NSA
Last Updated January 27, 2021 at 5:40 PM ST (3.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carolyn Jewel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy Ann Cohn +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 cindy@eff.org
Space Andrew Gellis Crocker +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 andrew@eff.org
Space Kurt Bradford Opsahl +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 kurt@eff.org
Space Mark Thomas Rumold +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 mark@eff.org
Space Lee Tien +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 tien@eff.org

Toggle Switch Represented by James S Tyre Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Samuel Tyre +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 jstyre@jstyre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin William Berkowitz +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 bberkowitz@keker.com
Space Paula Lenore Blizzard +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 plb@kvn.com
Space Michael S Kwun +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 mkwun@keker.com
Space Rachael Elizabeth Meny +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 rem@kvn.com
Space Justina Kahn Sessions +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jsessions@keker.com
Space Audrey Helena Walton-Hadlock +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 awh@kvn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard R. Wiebe +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 rwiebe@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Royse Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Edward Moore, III +1 650 813 9700 +1 650 813 9777 tmoore@rroyselaw.com
No Logo Erik Knutzen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy Ann Cohn +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 cindy@eff.org
Space Andrew Gellis Crocker +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 andrew@eff.org
Space Kurt Bradford Opsahl +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 kurt@eff.org
Space Mark Thomas Rumold +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 mark@eff.org
Space Lee Tien +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 tien@eff.org

Toggle Switch Represented by James S Tyre Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Samuel Tyre +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 jstyre@jstyre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin William Berkowitz +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 bberkowitz@keker.com
Space Paula Lenore Blizzard +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 plb@kvn.com
Space Michael S Kwun +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 mkwun@keker.com
Space Rachael Elizabeth Meny +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 rem@kvn.com
Space Justina Kahn Sessions +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jsessions@keker.com
Space Audrey Helena Walton-Hadlock +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 awh@kvn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard R. Wiebe +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 rwiebe@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Royse Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Edward Moore, III +1 650 813 9700 +1 650 813 9777 tmoore@rroyselaw.com
No Logo Joice Walton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy Ann Cohn +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 cindy@eff.org
Space Andrew Gellis Crocker +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 andrew@eff.org
Space Kurt Bradford Opsahl +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 kurt@eff.org
Space Mark Thomas Rumold +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 mark@eff.org
Space Lee Tien +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 tien@eff.org

Toggle Switch Represented by James S Tyre Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Samuel Tyre +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 jstyre@jstyre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin William Berkowitz +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 bberkowitz@keker.com
Space Paula Lenore Blizzard +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 plb@kvn.com
Space Michael S Kwun +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 mkwun@keker.com
Space Rachael Elizabeth Meny +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 rem@kvn.com
Space Justina Kahn Sessions +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jsessions@keker.com
Space Audrey Helena Walton-Hadlock +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 awh@kvn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard R. Wiebe +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 rwiebe@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Royse Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Edward Moore, III +1 650 813 9700 +1 650 813 9777 tmoore@rroyselaw.com
No Logo Tash Hepting, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy Ann Cohn +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 cindy@eff.org
Space Andrew Gellis Crocker +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 andrew@eff.org
Space Kurt Bradford Opsahl +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 kurt@eff.org
Space Mark Thomas Rumold +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 mark@eff.org
Space Lee Tien +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 tien@eff.org

Toggle Switch Represented by James S Tyre Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Samuel Tyre +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 jstyre@jstyre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin William Berkowitz +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 bberkowitz@keker.com
Space Paula Lenore Blizzard +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 plb@kvn.com
Space Michael S Kwun +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 mkwun@keker.com
Space Rachael Elizabeth Meny +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 rem@kvn.com
Space Justina Kahn Sessions +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jsessions@keker.com
Space Audrey Helena Walton-Hadlock +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 awh@kvn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard R. Wiebe +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 rwiebe@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Royse Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Edward Moore, III +1 650 813 9700 +1 650 813 9777 tmoore@rroyselaw.com
No Logo Young Boon Hicks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy Ann Cohn +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 cindy@eff.org
Space Andrew Gellis Crocker +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 andrew@eff.org
Space Kurt Bradford Opsahl +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 kurt@eff.org
Space Mark Thomas Rumold +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 mark@eff.org
Space Lee Tien +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 tien@eff.org

Toggle Switch Represented by James S Tyre Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Samuel Tyre +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 jstyre@jstyre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin William Berkowitz +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 bberkowitz@keker.com
Space Paula Lenore Blizzard +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 plb@kvn.com
Space Michael S Kwun +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 mkwun@keker.com
Space Rachael Elizabeth Meny +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 rem@kvn.com
Space Justina Kahn Sessions +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jsessions@keker.com
Space Audrey Helena Walton-Hadlock +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 awh@kvn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard R. Wiebe +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 rwiebe@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Royse Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Edward Moore, III +1 650 813 9700 +1 650 813 9777 tmoore@rroyselaw.com
v.
No Logo Alberto R. Gonzales, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Berman +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.berman@usdoj.gov
Space Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
No Logo David S. Addington, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Dennis C Blair, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Berman +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.berman@usdoj.gov
Space Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Berman +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.berman@usdoj.gov
Space Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Eric Holder, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Berman +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.berman@usdoj.gov
Space Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
No Logo John D. Ashcroft, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
No Logo John D. Negroponte, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
No Logo John M. McConnell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Keith B. Alexander, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Berman +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.berman@usdoj.gov
Space Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
Space James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Security Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Berman +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.berman@usdoj.gov
Space Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard B. Cheney"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James R. Whitman +1 202 616 4169 +1 202 416 4314 james.whitman@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Edward Ahern +1 202 305 0633 +1 202 616 8470 Paul.Ahern@usdoj.gov
Space Marcia Berman +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.berman@usdoj.gov
Space Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
No Logo People for the American Way Foundation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by UC Berkeley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Marie Urban +1 510 642 7338 jurban@law.berkeley.edu
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Office San Francisco
Filed 9/18/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Sonoma
Terminated
Origin 4
Reopened 2/23/2012
Lead Case
306-cv-00672-VRW
Related Case
313-cv-03287-JSW
Other Court Case 10-15616[9th Circuit]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,E-Filing,REOPEN
  Entries (484) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Terminate Civil Case
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Statement of Recent Decision
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 447 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 9/8/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 352 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING [334] Motion for Discovery and to Lift Stay. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA: Issued pursuant to FRAP Rule 41(a), as to [329] Notice of Appeal, USCA No. 15-16133. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re [334] MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Lift Stay ) filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen. (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: 1/22/2016 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re [334] MOTION to Dissolve Discovery Stay) filed byKeith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 1/22/2016) Modified on 1/25/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 2/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: 1/14/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED [335] STIPULATION to Modify Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Plaintiffs Motion To Dissolve Discovery Stay Re: Counts 9, 12, & 15. Responses due by 1/22/2016. Replies due by 1/29/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/14/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016, Terminated: 1/14/2016 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Plaintiffs Motion To Dissolve Discovery Stay Re: Counts 9, 12, & 15 re [334] Motion for Discovery, Motion to Lift Stay, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America, Carolyn Jewel. (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 1/13/2016) Modified on 1/14/2016 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/1/2016, Entered: 1/1/2016, Terminated: 2/19/2016 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Discovery , MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 1/15/2016. Replies due by 1/22/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Tyre, James) (Filed on 1/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015, Terminated: 2/10/2016 USCA Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      USCA Memorandum: That Certification is Reversed; Appeal is Dismissed; Case Remanded. Each party shall bear its own costs on appeal, as to [329] Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 15-16133. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance of Jamie L. Williams as Counsel, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton (Williams, Jamie) (Filed on 7/21/2015) Modified on 7/22/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MANDATE of USCA: Issued pursuant to FRAP Rule 41(a), as to 329 Notice of Appeal, USCA No. 15-16133. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015, Terminated: 2/10/2016 Transcript Designation FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 12/19/14, 9/27/13, 12/14/12 before Judge Jeffrey S. White, re [329] Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 8/3/2015. (Crocker, Andrew) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number 15-16133 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for [329] Notice of Appeal, filed by Erik Knutzen, Carolyn Jewel, Joice Walton. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015, Terminated: 2/10/2016 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. Appeal of Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, [321], Judgment [328] (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9575031 paid.) (Crocker, Andrew) (Filed on 6/4/2015) Modified on 6/5/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT ON FOURTH AMENDMENT CLAIM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [323] Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015, Terminated: 5/20/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Cancel the Scheduled Hearing on May 22, 2015 and Decide Plaintiffs' Rule 54(b) Motion on the Papers, filed by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America, Carolyn Jewel. (Patton, Rodney) (Filed on 5/18/2015) Modified on 5/19/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re [323] MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) ) filed byCarolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Crocker, Andrew) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re [323] Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), filed by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney) (Filed on 5/1/2015) Modified on 5/1/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015, Terminated: 5/20/2015 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 5/8/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Crocker, Andrew) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number 15-16133 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 329 Notice of Appeal, filed by Erik Knutzen, Carolyn Jewel, Joice Walton. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance of David A Greene as Counsel, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton (Greene, David) (Filed on 2/13/2015) Modified on 2/17/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: 1/28/2015, Terminated: 2/10/2015 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike [319] Revised Proposed Order, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. Responses due by 2/11/2015. Replies due by 2/18/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 1/28/2015) Modified on 1/29/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Revised Proposed Order re [286] Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [261] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 1/23/2015) Modified on 1/26/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/5/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on December 19, 2014, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [316] Transcript Order, [315] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2015. (Related documents(s) [316], [315]) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Lodging of Classified Declaration for Ex Parte, In Camera Review, filed by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America (Patton, Rodney) (Filed on 12/23/2014) Modified on 12/24/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Hearing on Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment Held on 12/19/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White, filed by United States of America for Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 12/22/2014) Modified on 12/23/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, before Judge Jeffrey S. White by Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 12/19/2014) Modified on 12/22/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [309] Order Plaintiffs' Citations to the Record in Response to Question No. 1 by Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeffrey S. White: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2014. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Additional Authorities for Dec. 19, 2014 Hearing, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A 50 USC 3605, # (2) Ex. B NSA Minimization Procedures, # (3) Ex. C U.S. v. Heckenkamp, # (4) Ex. D Amer. Fed. State Cty. Muni. Empl. v. Scott, # (5) Ex. E Ollier v. Sweetwater Union H.S. Dist., # (6) Ex. F U.S. v. Bonds, # (7) Ex. G U.S. v. Bridgeforth, # (8) Ex. H In re Nat'l Sec. Agency Tel. Recs. Lit.)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/17/2014) Modified on 12/18/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of Appearance of Rodney Patton, filed by Keith B. Alexander, George W. Bush, Department of Justice, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America (Patton, Rodney) (Filed on 12/17/2014) Modified on 12/18/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Additional Authorities, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 12/17/2014) Modified on 12/18/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Questions for Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2014. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Order on Motion to File Amicus Curiae BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [271] Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [274] Motion for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [294] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Combined Reply ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [302] Motion for Extension of Time to File (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [302] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Declaration of James R. Clapper, Director of National Intelligence, in Support of Gov't Defs.' Reply Brief by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [299] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and for Enlargement of Page Limitation (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014, Terminated: 11/14/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Declaration of James R. Clapper, Director of National Intelligence, in Support of Gov't Defs.' Reply Brief, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of James R. Clapper, Director of National Intelligence)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 11/12/2014) Modified on 11/13/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Lodging of [300] Classified Declaration of Miriam P., NSA in Support of the Government Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 11/7/2014) Modified on 11/10/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Miriam P. in Support of [299] Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 11/7/2014) Modified on 11/10/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014, Terminated: 11/13/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and for Enlargement of Page Limitation filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Redacted Reply in Support of Government Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # (3) Sealed Reply in Support of Government Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re [297] Motion to Strike, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 10/28/2014) Modified on 10/29/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014, Terminated: 12/19/2014 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike [287] Notice of Lodging of the Classified Declaration of Miriam P. of the National Security Agency and a Classified Supplement to the Government Defendants Opposition and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for In Camera, Ex Parte Review, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. Responses due by 11/7/2014. Replies due by 11/14/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 10/24/2014) Modified on 10/27/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re [286] Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Denying Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration in Support of [261] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCarolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[261]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014, Terminated: 12/10/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Combined Reply ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Redacted MPSJ Opp/Reply, # (3) Sealed MPSJ Opp/Reply)(Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED [291] PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY ON MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO CROSS MOTION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/7/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re [291] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [286] Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byKeith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014, Terminated: 10/8/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [286] Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/3/2014) Modified on 10/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 297 Motion to Strike, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 10/28/2014) Modified on 10/29/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING [284] MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages; DENYING Request to Strike Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/30/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re [284] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [REDACTED] Declaration of Miriam P. in Support of [286] Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[286], [285]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Lodging of the Classified Declaration of Miriam P. of the National Security Agency and a Classified Supplement to the Government Defendants Opposition and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for In Camera, Ex Parte Review, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014, Terminated: 2/10/2015 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 10/14/2014. Replies due by 10/21/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit (Government Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment And Cross-Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On Plaintiffs Fourth Amendment Claim), # (7) Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re [261] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014, Terminated: 9/30/2014 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [282] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response until 11 a.m. on Monday, September 29, Responses due by 11:00 a.m. 9/29/2014. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014, Terminated: 9/24/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [261] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment until 11 a.m. on Monday, September 29, to Allow for Religious Observance filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting in part [279] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re [279] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/18/2014) Modified on 9/19/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014, Terminated: 9/19/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [261] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/16/2014) Modified on 9/17/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [279] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [261] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/22/2014. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [277] Corrected Order Granting [275] Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Unseal. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/11/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re [275] Order [Proposed] Corrected Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Unseal by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-6-14, before Judge Jeffrey White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [247] Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2014. (Related documents(s) [247]) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO UNSEAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/5/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014, Terminated: 12/10/2014 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File CORRECTED Amici Curiae Brief filed by American Society of News Editors, Courthouse News Service, First Amendment Coalition, First Look Media, Inc., Gannett Co., Investigative Reporters & Editors (IRE), Media News Group, National Press Photographers Association, National Public Radio, Inc., Online News Association, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, The Committee to Protect Journalists, The Investigative Reporting Workshop, The McClatchy Company, The Media Consortium, The National Press Club, The Seattle Times Company, The Tully Center for Free Speech, WP Company LLC dba The Washington Post. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit CORRECTED Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING [266] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Court's Order of July 11, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING [267] Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule on [261] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Opposition due by 9/19/2014. Reply due by 10/17/2014. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 4, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014, Terminated: 12/10/2014 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers. Responses due by 8/15/2014. Replies due by 8/22/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael H. Page, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael H. Page, # (3) Amicus Curiae Brief, # (4) Proposed Order)(Gellis, Catherine) (Filed on 8/1/2014) Modified on 8/4/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Michael Henry Page as Counsel, filed by National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers (Page, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2014) Modified on 8/4/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance of Catherine Rachel Gellis as Counsel, filed by National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers (Gellis, Catherine) (Filed on 8/1/2014) Modified on 8/4/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014, Terminated: 12/10/2014 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, American Society of News Editors, The Committee to Protect Journalists, Courthouse News Service, First Amendment Coalition, First Look Media, Inc., Gannett Co., Investigative Reporters & Editors (IRE), The Investigative Reporting Workshop, The McClatchy Company, The Media Consortium, Media News Group, The National Press Club, National Public Radio, Inc., National Press Photographers Association, Online News Association, The Seattle Times Company, The Tully Center for Free Speech, WP Company LLC dba The Washington Post. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Amici Brief, # (2) Proposed Order)(Koltun, Joshua) (Filed on 7/31/2014) Modified on 8/1/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014, Terminated: 8/4/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule re [261] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by David S. Addington, Keith B. Alexander, John D. Ashcroft, Dennis C Blair, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Department of Justice, Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael V. Hayden, Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Eric Holder, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, National Security Agency, John D. Negroponte, Barack Obama, United States of America, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/29/2014) Modified on 7/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014, Terminated: 8/4/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Response to the Court's Order of July 11, 2014, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Response to Court Order)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 7/28/2014) Modified on 7/29/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Joice Walton in Support of [261] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCarolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[261]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Erik Knutzen in Support of [261] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCarolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[261]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Carolyn Jewel in Support of [261] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCarolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[261]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Richard R. Wiebe in Support of [261] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byCarolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[261]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014, Terminated: 2/10/2015 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/8/2014. Replies due by 8/15/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Final Brief Re Enforcement of Evidence Preservation Orders (Pursuant to the Court's June 6, 2014 Order) filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/18/2014) Modified on 7/21/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance of Philip James Tassin as Counsel, filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton (Tassin, Philip) (Filed on 7/16/2014) Modified on 7/17/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 258 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014, Terminated: 7/16/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Paula L. Blizzard as Counsel for Plaintiffs, filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Blizzard, Paula) (Filed on 7/16/2014) Modified on 7/17/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Court StaffCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White, signed on 07/11/14. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2014: # (2) Main Document) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2014: # (4) Main Document) (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). ***DOCUMENT UNSEALED BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. [275]***
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 256 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [255] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014, Terminated: 7/2/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to June 23, 2014 Order filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Marcia Berman, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Document sought to be filed under seal)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA to [253] Reply Memorandum, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit (Corrected Government Defendants' Reply Brief Regarding Compliance With Preservation Orders))(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 6/30/2014) Modified on 7/1/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 253 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memornadum re Compliance With Preservation Orders, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of James J. Gilligan, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F)(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Court Staff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [131] Order, filed by Virginia Shubert (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2014: # (1) Main Document) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2014: # (2) Main Document II) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2014: # (4) Main Document) (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). ***DOCUMENT UNSEALED BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. [275]***
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Court StaffCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White, signed on 06/23/14. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2014: # (2) Main Document II) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2014: # (3) Main Document) (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). ***DOCUMENT UNSEALED BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. [275]***
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [122] Order, filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/20/2014) Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Court StaffCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE REQUEST by Judge Jeffrey S. White, signed on 06/13/14. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Court StaffCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Judge Jeffrey S. White re Telephonic Hearing Held on 06/06/14, from Marica Berman, dated 06/12/14. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Motion Hearing Held on 06/06/2014, filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton for Court Reporter: Katherine Wyatt. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/9/2014) Modified on 6/10/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 246 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Temporary Restraining Order Hearing - Non-evidentiaryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing - Non-evidentiary held on 6/6/2014 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 6/6/2014). (Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/11/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 245 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of James Gilligan in Support of [243] Memorandum in Opposition filed by United States of America. (Related document(s)[243]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 244 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Richard H. Ledgett, Jr. in Support re [243] Memorandum in Opposition filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. B, # (2) Ex. C, # (3) Ex. D, # (4) Ex. E)(Related document(s)[243]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 243 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re [235] Emergency Ex Parte Motion to Enforce the Court's Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 242 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part [241] Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White, on 06/06/2014 (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 241 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014, Terminated: 6/6/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Enforce Court's Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 240 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Phone Number for Government Counsel for Emergency Hearing, filed by Department of Justice re [239] Order, filed by Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 239 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER SETTING HEARING. APPLICATION TO ENFORCE Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 6/6/2014 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/6/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 238 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re [237] Emergency Motion to Stay Order filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/5/2014) Modified on 6/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 237 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014, Terminated: 6/9/2014 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Emergency MOTION to Stay re [236] Order Emergency Motion to Stay the Court's June 5, 2014 Order filed by Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. Responses due by 6/6/2014. Replies due by 6/13/2014. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 236 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re [235] Emergency Ex Parte Application to Enforce the Court's Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/5/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 235 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014, Terminated: 6/9/2014 Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Emergency Ex Parte MOTION to Enforce the Court's Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Cindy Cohn)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 6/5/2014) Modified on 6/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONCERNING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/3/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: 5/30/2014 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief re: the Government's Non-Compliance with the Court's Evidence Preservation Orders filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Anthony J. Coppolino filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Lodging of Classified NSA Declaration, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [REDACTED] Classified Declaration of Miriam P., National Security Agency Ex Parte, In Camera Submission, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 229 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief re Compliance with Preservation Orders, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 228 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Classified Declaration of Teresa H. Shea in Support of [209] Notice of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review/Declassified 2014, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[209]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 227 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Classified Declaration of Frances Fleisch in Support of [209] Notice of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review/Declassified 2013, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[209]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Classified Declaration of William B. Black, Acting Director, NSI in Support of [209] Notice of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review/Declassified 2006, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[209]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Classified Declaration of Lieutenant General Keith B. Alexander in Support of [209] Notice of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review/Declassified 2007, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[209]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Classified Declaration of Lt. General Keith B. Alexander in Support of [209] Notice of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review/Declassified 2006, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[209]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Declaration of John D. Negroponte in Support of [209] Notice of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review/Declassified 2006 Supplemental Declaration of DNI Negroponte, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[209]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Classified Declaration of John D. Negroponte, DNI Negroponte in Support of [209] Notice of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review/Declassified 2006 filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[209]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Classified Declaration of J. Michael McConnell, DNI in Support of [209] Notice of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review/Declassified 2007, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[209]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 220 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Classified Declaration of James R. Clapper, DNI in Support of [209] Notice of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[209]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Classified Declaration of Michael B. Mukasey in Support of [209] Notice of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review/Declassified 2008 Certification of Attorney General Mukasey, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[209]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/6/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING (107 in 4:13-cv-03287-JSW) and (207 in 4:08-cv-4373-JSW) STIPULATION for an Extension of Time To Process for Public Filing Certain Classified Declarations and for an Extension of Time To File a Rule 11 Certification Regarding Preservation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 21, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Identification of Classified Declarations Filed on the Public Record in Redacted Form and Those Undergoing Classification Review, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified on 4/22/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel filed by Aram Vazken Antaramian, filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton (Antaramian, Aram) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified on 4/22/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014, Terminated: 4/22/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for an Extension of Time to Process for Public Filing Certain Classified Declarations and for an Extension of Time To File a Rule 11 Certification Regarding Preservation in First Unitarian, filed by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified on 4/22/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/1/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to the Court's Question About Rule 11 Certifications by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Brief re [167] Supplemental Brief, [190] Errata, [177] Supplemental Brief, PLAINTIFFS REPLY Re QUESTION THREE (Clapper) OF THE COURTS FOUR QUESTIONS filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[167], [190], [177]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton Notice of Opinion and Order by Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Transcript of Proceedings (amended both to reflect a correction of the hearing date on the cover page, and a correction as to the contact information for the National Security Agency) held on 03/19/2014, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2014. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS: 115-120 re 116 Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s) 116 ) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 9/18/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2015: # 1 Exhibit 116; Part 1 of 4, # 2 Exhibit 116; Part 2 of 4, # 3 Exhibit 116; Part 3 of 4, # 4 Exhibit; Part 4 of 4, # 6 Exhibit 117, # 7 Exhibit 118, # 8 Exhibit 119, # 9 Exhibit 120) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2015: # 10 Exhibit 115) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/19/2014 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 3/20/2014) re (186 in 3:08-cv-04373-JSW) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and (86 in 3:13-cv-03287-JSW) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS: 109-114 re 116 Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s) 116 ) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 9/17/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2015: # 1 Exhibit 109; Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit 109; Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 110, # 4 Exhibit 111, # 5 Exhibit 112; Part 1 of 3, # 6 Exhibit 112; Part 2 of 3, # 7 Exhibit 112; Part 3 of 3, # 8 Exhibit 113, # 9 Exhibit 114) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/18/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Clerk's NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/19/2014 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 3/19/2014) re (186 in 3:08-cv-04373-JSW) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and (86 in 3:13-cv-03287-JSW) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2014) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014) Modified on 4/18/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *** SEE CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT AT [201]. *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/19/2014, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2014. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/19/2014) Modified on 3/20/2014 (fff, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 198 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 18, 2014. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief re [191] Brief Plaintiffs' Reply Brief Re Evidence Preservation filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[191]) (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Notice Regarding Proposed Video Recording (zml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, George W. Bush, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America (Government Defendants' Notice of Filing of Ex Parte, In Camera Declaration of Teresa H. Shea, Director of the Signals Intelligence Directorate, NSA) (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 193 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to re [191] Brief (Government Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Opening Brief re Preservation) by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerks Notification of Request for Video Recording (Attachments: # (1) Party Response to Request for Video Recording) (zml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief Plaintiffs' Opening Brief Re Evidence Preservation filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA re [185] Response ( Non Motion ), Gvt. Defs.' Reply on Threshold Legal Issues as Ordered by the Court at the Sept. 27, 2013 Status Conference by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Gvt. Defs.' Reply on Threshold Legal Issues Ordered by the Court)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 189 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING (86 in 3:13-cv-03287-JSW) Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, (186 in 3:08-cv-04373-JSW) Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Motions due by 3/13/2014 at 2:00 p.m. Responses due by 3/17/2014 at 11:00 a.m. Replies due by 3/18/2014 at 2:00 p.m. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 10, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Court's Order re: Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Gilligan, James) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 187 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/10/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014, Terminated: 3/10/2014 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Cindy Cohn, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Proposed Order)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to (186 in 3:08-cv-04373-JSW) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , (86 in 3:13-cv-03287-JSW) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Responses due by 3/10/2014 by 2:00 p.m. P.S.T. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Court's Threshold Issues (Government Defendants' Reply on Threshold Legal Issues as Ordered by the Court at the September 27, 2013, Status Conference) by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [183] Second Stipulation and Proposed Order To Extend the Briefing Schedule on the Court's Four Questions (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014, Terminated: 3/3/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Second Stipulation and Proposed Order To Extend the Briefing Schedule on the Court's Four Questions) filed by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [179] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Bruce D. Brown (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [180] Stipulation to Extend the Briefing Schedule on the Court's Four Questions and to Vacate the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014, Terminated: 2/11/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Briefing Schedule on the Court's Four Questions and to Vacate the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014, Terminated: 2/11/2014 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice in Jewel et al. v. NSA et al. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8362288.) filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Brown, Bruce) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of [177] Supplemental Brief, DECLARATION OF RICHARD R. WIEBE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO THE COURTS FOUR QUESTIONS filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[177]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 177 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Brief re [167] Supplemental Brief, PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO THE COURTS FOUR QUESTIONS filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[167]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 176 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [175] Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Partial Summary Judgment Motion (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014, Terminated: 1/29/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule for Partial Summary Judgment Motion filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 174 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Mark Rumold in Support of [173] Response ( Non Motion ) filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10)(Related document(s)[173]) (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 173 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to re [172] Notice (Other),,,, by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 172 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America of Filing Declassified Declarations (Attachments: # (1) 2007 Declaration of J. Michael McConnell, Director of National Intelligence, filed in Jewel v. NSA and Shubert v. Obama, # (2) 2007 Declaration of Lt. Gen. Keith B. Alexander, Director, National Security Agency, filed in Jewel v. NSA and Shubert v. Obama, # (3) 2009 Declaration of Dennis C. Blair, Director of National Intelligence, filed in Jewel v. NSA, # (4) 2009 Declaration of Dennis C. Blair, Director of National Intelligence, filed in Shubert v. Obama, # (5) 2009 Declaration of Deborah A. Bonanni, National Security Agency, filed in Jewel v. NSA, # (6) 2009 Declaration of Lt. Gen. Keith B. Alexander, Direcotr, National Security Agency, filed in Shubert v. Obama, # (7) 2012 Declaration of James R. Clapper, Director of National Intelligence, filed in Jewel v. NSA and Shubert v. Obama, # (8) 2012 Declaration of Frances J. Fleisch, National Security Agency, filed in Jewel v. NSA and Shubert v. Obama)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Frances J. Fleisch, Acting Deputy Director of the National Security Agency (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of James R. Clapper, Director of National Intelligence (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Frances J. Fleisch , National Security Agency (Public Declaration) filed byKeith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of James Clapper , Director of National Intelligence (Public Declaration) filed byKeith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 167 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Brief of Govt. Defs. on Threshold Legal Issues as Ordered by the Court at the Sept. 27, 2013 Case Management Conference filed byKeith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Gellis Crocker (Crocker, Andrew) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Edward Moore, III (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-27-2013, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2014. (Related documents(s) [162]) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gilligan, James) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED Minute Entry: (Correction re: Briefing Schedule) Status Conference held (Date Filed: 9/30/2013). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Status Conference held (Date Filed: 9/30/2013). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2013) Modified on 9/30/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Justina Kahn Sessions (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Berkowitz (Berkowitz, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: 8/5/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING [155] Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 5, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013, Terminated: 8/5/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [152] Motion to Relate Case (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 23, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013, Terminated: 7/24/2013 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Relate Case filed by Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Corrected [Proposed] Order Clarifying July 8, 2013 Order (ECF No. 148) by Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013, Terminated: 7/23/2013 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [148] Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Thomas Rumold (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 148 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING [83] Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART and DEFERRING RULING IN PART on [102] Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to: [148] Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Richard R. Wiebe in Opposition to [142] Notice (Other),, filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1 of 5, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 2 of 5, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 3 of 5, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 4 of 5, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 5 of 5)(Related document(s)[142]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response re [143] Response ( Non Motion ), Government Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' June 7, 2013 Notice byKeith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by People For the American Way Foundation Of Withdrawal Of Certain Counsel For Amicus Curiae (Siavoshy, Babak) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: 6/13/2013 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Thomas E. Moore III in Opposition to [142] Notice (Other),, filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[142]) (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: 6/13/2013 Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re [142] Notice (Other),, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Government Defendants' Request to Stay Litigation by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 142 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America re [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense, [102] Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment Notice and Request that the Court Hold the Pending Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment in Abeyance (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 141 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Cindy Ann Cohn (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Brief re [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense, [138] Order, [102] Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment ; Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief re: Clapper v. Amnesty International filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[83], [138], [102]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to: [148] Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/6/2013 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Brief by Govt. Defs. Addressing Clapper v. Amnesty Int'l filed byKeith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 27, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Statement of Recent Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byKeith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Clapper v. Amnesty International)(Related document(s)[83], [102]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Statement of Recent Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d (Pollack v. Hogan) filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[83], [102]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: 1/16/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [134] Stipulation: The deadline for filing a motion or stipulation for substitution regarding Mr. Hicks claims against the individual capacity defendants is extended until sixty days after the issuance of an order by this Court deciding the cross-motions filed by the plaintiffs and the government defendants sued in their official capacity. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013, Terminated: 1/16/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding substitution of party filed by David S. Addington, Keith B. Alexander, John D. Ashcroft, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael V. Hayden, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, John D. Negroponte. (Whitman, James) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on December 14, 2012, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/11/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2013. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2012 before Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 12/14/2012). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Received Document (EXHIBIT) 1 re [132] Motion Hearing. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton Notice of Additional Authorities Pursuant To The Court's December 12, 2012 Order (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 12, 2012. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton Notice of Amended Ninth Circuit Decision in Al-Haramain v. Obama (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING - All Parties Have Consented to the Video Recording of the December 14, 2012 Motion Hearing as part of the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTIFICATION OF REQUEST TO VIDEO RECORD DECEMBER 14, 2012 MOTION HEARING Pursuant to General Order 65 and the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. NO LATER THAN 5:00 p.m. PST on December 11, 2012, all parties shall complete the attached Party Response Form and email it to cameras@cand.uscourts.gov. (Attachments: # (1) Party Response Form) (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING [124] STIPULATION Substituting Party. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Incorrect Document Attached - Please disregard and see Doc. No. 126 ORDER GRANTING [124] STIPULATION Substituting Party. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012) Modified on 12/4/2012 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012, Terminated: 12/4/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Substituting Party filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Received Document (EXHIBIT) 1 re [132] Motion Hearing. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of Fact of Death of Gergory Hicks by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [84] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [118] Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to re [115] Request for Judicial Notice, [116] Declaration in Support, [113] Appendix, Government Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Filings by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re [102] Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment ) Government Defendants' Reply in Support of Second Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byKeith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit to Government Defendants' Reply)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012, Terminated: 10/30/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae People For the American Way Foundation In Support of Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment, MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by People For the American Way Foundation. Responses due by 10/19/2012. Replies due by 10/26/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Amicus Brief)(Siavoshy, Babak) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Babak Siavoshy and Jennifer Urban as Counsel on Behalf of Amicus Curiae People For the American Way Foundation (Siavoshy, Babak) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 5/1/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY; DUPLICATE OF PREVIOUSLY FILED EXHIBITS. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NOS. [211]-[217]*** EXHIBITS (CD - Copies of Exhibits 1-120) re [116] Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[116]) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/4/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/4/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 5/1/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS: 115-120 re [116] Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[116]) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 9/18/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2015: # (1) Exhibit 116; Part 1 of 4, # (2) Exhibit 116; Part 2 of 4, # (3) Exhibit 116; Part 3 of 4, # (4) Exhibit; Part 4 of 4, # (6) Exhibit 117, # (7) Exhibit 118, # (8) Exhibit 119, # (9) Exhibit 120) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2015: # (10) Exhibit 115) (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 5/1/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS: 109-114 re [116] Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[116]) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 9/17/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2015: # (1) Exhibit 109; Part 1 of 2, # (2) Exhibit 109; Part 2 of 2, # (3) Exhibit 110, # (4) Exhibit 111, # (5) Exhibit 112; Part 1 of 3, # (6) Exhibit 112; Part 2 of 3, # (7) Exhibit 112; Part 3 of 3, # (8) Exhibit 113, # (9) Exhibit 114) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/18/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 5/1/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS: 102-108 re [116] Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion, filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[116]) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2015: # (1) Exhibit 102, # (2) Exhibit 103, # (3) Exhibit 104; Part 1 of 2, # (4) Exhibit 104; Part 2 of 2, # (5) Exhibit 105, # (6) Exhibit 106, # (7) Exhibit 107, # (8) Exhibit 108) (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 5/1/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS: 65-101 re [116] Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion, filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[116]) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2015: # (1) Exhibit 65, # (2) Exhibit 66, # (3) Exhibit 67, # (4) Exhibit 68, # (5) Exhibit 69, # (6) Exhibit 70, # (7) Exhibit 71, # (8) Exhibit 72, # (9) Exhibit 73, # (10) Exhibit 74, # (11) Exhibit 75, # (12) Exhibit 76, # (13) Exhibit 77, # (14) Exhibit 78, # (15) Exhibit 79, # (16) Exhibit 80, # (17) Exhibit 81, # (18) Exhibit 82, # (19) Exhibit 83, # (20) Exhibit 84, # (21) Exhibit 85, # (22) Exhibit 86, # (23) Exhibit 87, # (24) Exhibit 88, # (25) Exhibit 89, # (26) Exhibit 90, # (27) Exhibit 91, # (28) Exhibit 92, # (29) Exhibit 93, # (30) Exhibit 94, # (31) Exhibit 95, # (32) Exhibit 96, # (33) Exhibit 97, # (34) Exhibit 98, # (35) Exhibit 99, # (36) Exhibit 100, # (37) Exhibit 101) (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 5/1/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS: 30-64 re [116] Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion, filed by Tash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[116]) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2015: # (1) Exhibit 31, # (2) Exhibit 32, # (3) Exhibit 33, # (4) Exhibit 34, # (5) Exhibit 35, # (6) Exhibit 36, # (7) Exhibit 37, # (8) Exhibit 38, # (9) Exhibit 39, # (10) Exhibit 40, # (11) Exhibit 41, # (12) Exhibit 42, # (13) Exhibit 43, # (14) Exhibit 44, # (15) Exhibit 45, # (16) Exhibit 46, # (17) Exhibit 47, # (18) Exhibit 48, # (19) Exhibit 49, # (20) Exhibit 50, # (21) Exhibit 51, # (22) Exhibit 52, # (23) Exhibit 53, # (24) Exhibit 54, # (25) Exhibit 55, # (26) Exhibit 56, # (27) Exhibit 57, # (28) Exhibit 58, # (29) Exhibit 59, # (30) Exhibit 60, # (31) Exhibit 61, # (32) Exhibit 62, # (33) Exhibit 63, # (34) Exhibit 64) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2015: # (1) Main Document) (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/9/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 5/1/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS: 12-29 re [116] Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion, filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[116]) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2015: # (1) Exhibit 12, # (2) Exhibit 13, # (3) Exhibit 14, # (4) Exhibit 15, # (5) Exhibit 16, # (6) Exhibit 17, # (7) Exhibit 18, # (8) Exhibit 19, # (9) Exhibit 20, # (10) Exhibit 21, # (11) Exhibit 22, # (12) Exhibit 23, # (13) Exhibit 24, # (14) Exhibit 25, # (15) Exhibit 26, # (16) Exhibit 27, # (17) Exhibit 28, # (18) Exhibit 29) (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 5/1/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS: 1-11 re [116] Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion, filed byTash Hepting, Young Boon Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[116]) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2015: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, Part 1 of 3, # (12) Exhibit 11, Part 2 of 3, # (13) Exhibit 11, Part 3 of 3) (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support of [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross Motion filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Manual Filing Notification, # (2) Certificate/Proof of Service of Manual Filing)(Related document(s)[83]) (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Government Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Cindy Cohn in Opposition to [102] Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[102]) (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix FRE 1006 Summary of Voluminous Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross-Motion filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense ) and Opposition to the Government Defendants' Cross-Motion filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO RESET BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012, Terminated: 10/3/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER and Request to Set Briefing Schedule filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED [108] STIPULATION to Reset Hearing Date; Set Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012, Terminated: 9/25/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Request to Reset Hearing Date; Set Briefing Schedule filed by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America re [102] Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified Declaration of Frances Fleisch National Security Agency (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America re [102] Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified Declaration of James R. Clapper Director of National Intelligence (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of [102] Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment Public Declaration of Frances Fleisch National Security Agency filed byKeith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[102]) (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration in Support of [102] Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment Public Declaration of James R. Clapper Director of National Intelligence filed byKeith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[102]) (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [102] Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment Exhibits 1 to 5 filed byKeith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[102]) (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 102 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012, Terminated: 7/8/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 10/9/2012. Replies due by 10/19/2012. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING [100] STIPULATION Re Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule.Hearing on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment set for 11/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/20/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/10/2012, Terminated: 8/21/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton re [98] Order, Terminate Motions, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Notice of Ninth Circuit Decision in Al -Haramain v. Obama (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: 7/26/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING: [94] Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 26, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re [94] MOTION to Stay Proceedings, Notice of Motion, and Defs.' Case Management Statement ) filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [95] STIPULATION to Expedite Motion to Stay Proceedings. Responses due by 7/23/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012, Terminated: 7/11/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [94] MOTION to Stay Proceedings, Notice of Motion, and Defs.' Case Management Statement Stipulation to Expedite Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012, Terminated: 7/26/2012 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Proceedings, Notice of Motion, and Defs.' Case Management Statement filed by Keith B. Alexander, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. Responses due by 7/25/2012. Replies due by 8/1/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: 7/3/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [91] STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton re [84] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012, Terminated: 7/3/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Cindy Cohn in Support of [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[83]) (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of J. Scott Marcus in Support of [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-D, # (2) Exhibit E, # (3) Exhibit F, # (4) Exhibit G, # (5) Exhibit H-K, # (6) Exhibit L-N, # (7) Exhibit O-Q, # (8) Exhibit R, # (9) Exhibit S, # (10) Exhibit T-V, # (11) Exhibit W-Y)(Related document(s)[83]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of William E. Binney in Support of [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[83]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Thomas A. Drake in Support of [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[83]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of J. Kirk Wiebe in Support of [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[83]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Mark Klein in Support of [83] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[83]) (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012, Terminated: 11/13/2012 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit A to Klein Decl, # (4) Exhibit B Klein Decl, # (5) Exhibit C Part 1 Klein Decl, # (6) Exhibit C Part 2 Klein Decl, # (7) Proposed Order)(Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012, Terminated: 7/8/2013 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rejecting the Government Defendants' State Secret Defense filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/16/2012. Replies due by 7/23/2012. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Thelton E. Henderson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/18/12. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: 5/17/2012 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/17/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: 5/15/2012 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/15/12. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Plaintiffs requesting assignment to a District Court judge. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012, Terminated: 2/10/2016 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012, Terminated: 2/10/2016 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Cindy Ann Cohn Withdrawal of Kevin Bankston (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012, Terminated: 2/23/2012 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA OPINION. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011, Terminated: 2/23/2012 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011, Terminated: 2/23/2012 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011, Terminated: 2/23/2012 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA as to [61] Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Erik Knutzen, Carolyn Jewel, Joice Walton (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011, Terminated: 2/23/2012 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA as to [61] Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Erik Knutzen, Carolyn Jewel, Joice Walton (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011, Terminated: 2/23/2012 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010, Terminated: 2/23/2012 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA as to [61] Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Erik Knutzen, Carolyn Jewel, Joice Walton (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010, Terminated: 2/23/2012 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number 10-15616 9th Circuit for [61] Notice of Appeal, filed by Gregory Hicks, Tash Hepting, Erik Knutzen, Carolyn Jewel, Joice Walton. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/12/09, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010, Terminated: 2/23/2012 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [61] Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # (1) docket sheet, # (2) cover letter, # (3) USCA appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010, Terminated: 2/23/2012 Notice of Appeal Notification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # (1) docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [58] Judgment, [57] Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 34611043712.(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re [57] 1/21/2010 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 2/4/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard R. Wiebe (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/25/2010 Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's January 21, 2010 Order, judgment is hereby entered in this case in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting [18] Motion to Dismiss; granting motion to dismiss in MDL Docket No. 3:06-cv-1791 VRW (member case no. 3:07-cv-0693 VRW) (Attachments: # (1) Appendix) (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED DOCUMENT by Carolyn Jewel. Amendment to Substitute Yoo & Goldsmith for Does 1 & 2. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton re [18] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment , Plaintiffs' Local Rule 7-13 Notice That Government Defendants' Motion Has Been Under Submission More Than 120 Days (Wiebe, Richard) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by David S. Addington, Keith B. Alexander, John D. Ashcroft, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael V. Hayden, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, John D. Negroponte re [51] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Notice of Manual Filing (Whitman, James) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 7/21/2010 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Kevin S. Bankston in compliance with preservation order filed byPlaintiffs. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009) (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 7/21/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILED UNDER SEAL Response of the individual capacity defendants to the court's order of 11/13/09 regarding preservation of evidence by. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009) (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 7/21/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response to the Court's Order of 11/13/09 regarding preservation of evidence byNational Security Agency. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009) (hdjS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/8/2014 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by United States of America re [51] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Notice of Manual Filing (Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton of Manual Filing (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker GRANTING doc [#50] JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE. Counsel representing each party shall, not later than 12/15/2009, submit to the Court under seal and pursuant to FRCP 11, a statement that the directive in paragraph D, has been carried out. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009, Terminated: 11/16/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding Preservation of Evidence filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, Dkt. 393 in 06-cv-1791-VRW, # (2) Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by United States of America Withdrawal of Appearance (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by United States of America of Order by Court of Appeals Granting Rehearing En Banc (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Ahern, Paul) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re doc #s 32 and 33 held on 9/17/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker, the court submitted the matter. (Date Filed: 9/17/2009). (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum Government Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief (Dkt. 38-1) filed byDennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of Non-Opposition re [32] MOTION Individual capacity defendants' motion for relief from the Court's Orders of April 27, 2009, and May 8, 2009 Statement in Support of Individual Capacity Defs.' Motion for Relief from Court Orders filed byKeith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Related document(s)[32]) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply in support re [32] MOTION Individual capacity defendants' motion for relief from the Court's Orders of April 27, 2009, and May 8, 2009 filed byDavid S. Addington, Keith B. Alexander, John D. Ashcroft, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael V. Hayden, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, John D. Negroponte. (Whitman, James) (Filed on 9/3/2009) Modified on 9/4/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Supplemental Brief (Dkt. 38-1) and Proposed Order by Keith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition to Individual Capacity Defendants' Motion for Relief filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Set Briefing Schedule by David S. Addington, Keith B. Alexander, John D. Ashcroft, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael V. Hayden, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, John D. Negroponte. (Whitman, James) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: 8/4/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting [38] motion for leave to file post-hearing brief. Defendants may file a brief on the same subject and of no greater length on or before 9/3/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of [38] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief on the Scope of FISA Act Preemption filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[38]) (Blizzard, Paula) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009, Terminated: 8/4/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief on the Scope of FISA Act Preemption filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Supplemental Memorandum on the Scope of FISA Act Preemption, # (2) Affidavit Wiebe Declaration ISO Supplemental Memorandum, # (3) Exhibit A to Wiebe Decl., # (4) Exhibit B to Wiebe Decl., # (5) Exhibit C to Wiebe Decl., # (6) Exhibit D to Wiebe Decl., # (7) Exhibit E to Wiebe Decl., # (8) Proposed Order Allowing Supplemental Memorandum)(Blizzard, Paula) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/15/2009, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Radovich Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. 1. Def's Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (Doc 18). 2. Motion for Relief filed by Individual Capacity Defendants (Doc 32)-not argued. 3. Plas' Motion for Administrative Relief (Doc 33). The Court heard argument from counsel. The Court submitted the matter. The court to issue written ruling. Hearing on Government Individual Capacity Defendants motion for relief (doc 32) set for 9/17/2009 at 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Tash Hepting, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO GOVERNMENT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Blizzard, Paula) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of [33] MOTION Administrative Relief from Improper Motion for Reconsideration by Individual Capacity Defendants filed byTash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. (Related document(s)[33]) (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009, Terminated: 1/21/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Administrative Relief from Improper Motion for Reconsideration by Individual Capacity Defendants filed by Tash Hepting, Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009, Terminated: 1/21/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Individual capacity defendants' motion for relief from the Court's Orders of April 27, 2009, and May 8, 2009 filed by David S. Addington, Keith B. Alexander, John D. Ashcroft, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael V. Hayden, John M. McConnell, Michael B. Mukasey, John D. Negroponte. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Whitman, James) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply to Opposition re [18] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Government Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byKeith B. Alexander, Dennis C Blair, Department of Justice, Eric Holder, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits to Government Defendants' Reply)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Cindy Cohn in Opposition to [29] Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Cindy Cohn Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) in Opposition to Government Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and For Summary Judgment filed byGregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[29]) (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re [18] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Opposition to Government Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byGregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Elizabeth Meny Paula A. Blizzard, Michael S. Kwun, and Audrey Walton-Hadlock (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving [26] Stipulation, filed by United States of America, at al. In addition, date established by [25] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by which individual government defendants shall answer or otherwise respond is also hereby extended to July 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/8/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Opposition due: 6/3/2009. Govt's Reply due: 6/26/2009. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Opposition due: 6/3/2009. Govt's Reply due: 6/26/2009. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Revise Hearing Date and to Set Briefing Schedule by Barack Obama, Eric Holder, Dennis C Blair, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Department of Justice. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: 4/27/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker denying without prejudice [22] motion to enlarge time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Individual defendants shall have until June 25, 2009 within which to answer or otherwise respond. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re [23] Memorandum in Opposition, to Individual Capacity Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief to Enlarge the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition to Individual Capacity Defendants' [22] Motion for Administrative relief to Enlarge the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 4/8/2009) Modified on 4/9/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009, Terminated: 4/27/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Individual capacity defendants' motion for administrative relief to enlarge the time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint filed by Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, David S. Addington, Alberto R. Gonzales, John D. Ashcroft, John M. McConnell, John D. Negroponte, Michael B. Mukasey. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of James R. Whitman, # (2) Proposed Order)(Whitman, James) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Barack Obama, Eric Holder, Dennis C Blair, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Department of Justice re [18] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified In Camera Ex Parte Supplemental Memorandum of Government Defendants in Support of Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Barack Obama, Eric Holder, Dennis C Blair, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Department of Justice re [18] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified In Camera Ex Parte Declaration of Deborah A. Bonanni, National Security Agency (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Barack Obama, Eric Holder, Dennis C Blair, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Department of Justice re [18] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Lodging of Classified In Camera Ex Parte Declaration of Dennis C. Blair, Director of National Intelligence (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009, Terminated: 1/21/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Barack Obama, Eric Holder, Dennis C Blair, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix of Exhibits, # (2) Affidavit Public Declaration of DNI Dennis C. Blair, # (3) Affidavit Declaration of Deborah A. Bonanni, National Security Agency)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker GRANTING Docs #15, 16, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 4/3/2009. The 3/26/2009 hearing is vacated. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009, Terminated: 1/30/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, (CORRECTED VERSION) filed by National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, United States of America, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, David S. Addington, Department of Justice, Alberto R. Gonzales, John D. Ashcroft, John M. McConnell, John D. Negroponte, Michael B. Mukasey. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009, Terminated: 1/30/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, United States of America, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, David S. Addington, Department of Justice, Alberto R. Gonzales, John D. Ashcroft, John M. McConnell, John D. Negroponte, Michael B. Mukasey. (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Gerald Freeborne on behalf of federal defendants sued in their official capacity and the other agency defendants (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Whitman on behalf of the individual capacity defendants (Whitman, James) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting of Summons and Complaint (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION by National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, United States of America, George W. Bush, Department of Justice, John M. McConnell. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Kenneth Haas (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker. Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker. Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting [7] Motion to Relate Case. C06-0672 and C08-4373 are related. LR3-12. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Create Case Association
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cases associated: Create association to 3:06-cv-00672-VRW. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Create Case Association
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Cases associated: Create association to 3:06-cv-00672-VRW. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re [7] MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion by Plaintiffs to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; Declaration of Kevin S. Bankston; Proof of Service ; Deeming Cases Related and Assigning Jewel to MDL Docket No. 06-1791 VRW, In Re National Security Agency Telecommunications Records Litigation by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008, Terminated: 10/28/2008 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion by Plaintiffs to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related; Declaration of Kevin S. Bankston; Proof of Service filed by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (Bankston, Kevin) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated 9/21/08 from James Alfred Miller, Jr. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 Clerk's Notice re: Failure to E-File and Register
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Michael V. Hayden, United States of America, George W. Bush, Richard B. Cheney, David S. Addington, Department of Justice, Alberto R. Gonzales, John D. Ashcroft, John M. McConnell, John D. Negroponte, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2009. Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2009 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # (1) Order setting CMC, # (2) Standing Order, # (3) CM Standing Order for All Judges)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Gregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611023512.) SUMMONS ISSUED. Filed byGregory Hicks, Carolyn Jewel, Erik Knutzen, Joice Walton, Tash Hepting. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008) (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2015: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet) (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 403 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?