Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC. v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-09146
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 1 World Trade Center LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo 3 World Trade Center LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo 7 World Trade Company, L.P., Counter-Claimant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Counter-Claimant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Consolidated Edison Company of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F. Rysavy +1 973 848 4053 +1 973 848 4001 charles.rysavy@klgates.com
No Logo HMH WTC, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Management Co. LLC., Counter-Claimant
No Logo The Port Authority Of New York And New Jersey, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth D. Jacob +1 212 753 5000 +1 202 753 5044 bjacob@schiffhardin.com
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Joseph Keane +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1065 tkeane@quirkbakalor.com
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Joseph Keane +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1065 tkeane@quirkbakalor.com
No Logo Westfield Corporation, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blair G. Connelly +1 212 906 1658 +1 212 751 4864 blair.connelly@lw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter K. Rosen +1 213 891 8778
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Lee Winik +1 202 637 2224 +1 202 637 2201 peter.winik@lw.com
No Logo Westfield WTC LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blair G. Connelly +1 212 906 1658 +1 212 751 4864 blair.connelly@lw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter K. Rosen +1 213 891 8778
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Lee Winik +1 202 637 2224 +1 202 637 2201 peter.winik@lw.com
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC., Counter-Defendant

Represented by 420 Lexington Ave.

Toggle Switch Represented by Tashjian, Simsarian & Wickstrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sari E. Kolatch +1 212 381 8792 +1 212 586 5095 skolatch@ctswlaw.com
No Logo WTC Retail LLC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter K. Rosen +1 213 891 8778
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Lee Winik +1 202 637 2224 +1 202 637 2201 peter.winik@lw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (130) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 138 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AND OPINION APPLYING CERCLA'S "ACT OF WAR" DEFENSE TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM: Whether CERCLA provides a cause of action for the clean-up costs of World Trade Center dust is, as the court of appeals characterizes, a "tho rny" issue. If that characterization is apt, the applicability of the act-of-war defense could be described as a thicket of thorns. My holding as to the act-of-war defense should be read narrowly, fitting the facts of this case only. It should n ot be a precedent for cognate laws of insurance, for terrorist acts forming the basis of claims for monetary damages, and other such claims, or even for claims by other 9111 plaintiffs that remain pending. I hold, for the reasons expressed in this de cision, that the act-of-war defense is another ground of dismissal for the owner and lessees of the World Trade Center, the Ground Defendants, and the Aviation Defendants. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(rdz)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Submission (Reply Memorandum of Law) in Response to this Court's May 25, 2012 Order re: (104 in 1:08-cv-09146-AKH, 104 in 1:08-cv-09146-AKH, 1628 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1628 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, (105 in 1:08-cv-09146-AKH) Scheduling Order,,. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein WTC Management Co. LLC., World Trade Center Properties LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
      SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under Rule 12(c). Document filed by HMH WTC, Inc., Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc.. (Walsh, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
        SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Westfield Corporation, Inc., Westfield WTC LLC. (Winik, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
          SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW of American Airlines, Inc. and United Air Lines, Inc. in Further Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(c) Because the September 11 Attacks Were Acts of War. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Sears, Leah) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of The Port Authority's Reply Submission Pursuant to the Mandate of The United States Court of Appeals for The Second Circuit. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Sears, Leah) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                DECLARATION of Sari E. Kolatch in Opposition re: (1653 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 122 in 1:08-cv-09146-AKH) Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(Kolatch, Sari) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition To Defendants Submissions On The Act of War Defense. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(Kolatch, Sari) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION of Sari E. Kolatch in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Judgment., 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c)., 67 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of The Port Authority's separate Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under rule 12(c).. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Kolatch, Sari) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 120 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Judgment., 67 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of The Port Authority's separate Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under rule 12(c)., 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c).. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Kolatch, Sari) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of American Airlines, Inc. and United Air Lines, Inc. in Further Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(c) Because The September 11 Attacks Were Acts of War. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of SUBMISSION OF CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC., ON THE APPLICABILITY OF THE ACT OF WAR DEFENSE UNDER THECOMPREHENSIVE ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSE, COMPENSATION, AND LIABILITY ACT, 42 U.S.C. § 9607(B)(2) re: 105 Scheduling Order,,. Document filed by Consolidated Edison Company of New York. (Rysavy, Charles) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of THE PORT AUTHORITYS SUBMISSION PURSUANT TO THE MANDATE OF THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Sears, Leah) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of CHRISTOPHER WALSH, ESQ. (corrected) in Support re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c).. Document filed by HMH WTC, Inc., Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc.. (Walsh, Christopher) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim of Defendants United Continental Holdings, Inc. (f/k/a UAL Corporation) and United Air Lines, Inc. on June 20, 2012. Service was made by Email. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Ellis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                    AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Ellis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 64 MOTION for Judgment. --Westfield Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Westfield Corporation, Inc., Westfield WTC LLC. (Winik, Peter) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of of Submision (Memorandum of Law) in Response to this Court's May 25, 2012 Order re: 104 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, 105 Scheduling Order,,. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein WTC Management Co. LLC., World Trade Center Properties LLC. (Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Declaration of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support of Supplemental Memorandum of Law of American Airlines, Inc. and United Airlines, Inc. in Further Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(c) Because the September 11 Attacks Were Acts of War. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION of CHRISTOPHER WALSH, ESQ. in Support re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c).. Document filed by HMH WTC, Inc., Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc.. (Walsh, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of of Supplemental Memorandum of Law of American Airlines, Inc. and United Airlines, Inc. in Further Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(c) Because the September 11 Attacks Were Acts of War. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                BRIEF re: 104 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under Rule 12(c). Document filed by HMH WTC, Inc., Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc..(Walsh, Christopher) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ARGUMENT: I will entertain the parties' submissions pursuant to the Court of Appeals' mandate according to the following schedule: 1. Defendants' submission, by June 20, 2012. 2. Plaintiffs submission, by July 6, 2012. 3. Defendants' reply, by July 13,2012. 4. Oral Argument set for 7/23/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(ft) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ARGUMENT: I wilL entertain the parties' submissions pursuant to the Court of Appeals' mandate according to the following schedule: Defendants' submission, by June 20, 2012. Plaintiffs submission, by July 6, 2012. Defendants' reply, by July 13,2012. Oral Argument set for 7/23/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/25/2012) (jar) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                        MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (1312 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 99 in 1:08-cv-09146-AKH) Notice of Appeal, filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC. USCA Case Number 10-4197-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is REMANDED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/23/2012. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(nd) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/1/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/1/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Douglas M. Pravda hereby withdraws as counsel of record for defendant The Boeing Company in the above-captioned actions. Robert A. Atkins and H. Christopher Boehning of the law firm Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Ganison LLP have entered notices of appearance in this matter and together with Perkins Coie LLP and Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP, will continue to represent The Boeing Company. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(djc) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL from (97 in 1:08-cv-09146-AKH, 1305 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Clerk's Judgment, (1296 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 96 in 1:08-cv-09146-AKH,)Summary order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 917334. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(nd) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on September 20, 2010 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (mro) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Summary Order dated September 21, 2010, defendants' motion to dismiss is granted; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/30/10) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      SUMMARY ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS terminating (1043) Motion for Judgment; terminating (1046) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (1047) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH; terminating (64) Motion for Judgment; terminating (67) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (68) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:08-cv-09146-AKH. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted. Accordingly the CERCLA claims are time-barred. Since Plaintiff's claims under CERCLA are denied, the claims for indemnification and contribution are denied as academic. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. Nos. 64, 67, 68) terminated and the case closed (08-9146). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(cd) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER, Oral argument on Defendants' motion to dismiss will be heard on September 20, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14D. ( Oral Argument set for 9/20/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.)(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 08/20/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(ad) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER, 1. The Amended Notice shall include the July 30 Order; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts by any of the signatories hereto, including by facsimile, each of which shall constitute a duplicate original, and as so executed shall constitute one agreement. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 08/20/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(ad) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER Oral Argument on Defendant's motion to dismiss will be heard on September 20, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14D. SO ORDERED. ( Oral Argument set for 9/20/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.), Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/20/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Motion for an Order Requiring WTCP to Post an Appeal Bond. Document filed by Industrial Risk Insurers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Clifford, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jay B. Spievack dated 8/10/10 re: We represent non-settling plaintiff Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC ("C&W") in the above-referenced action, and write in response to American Airlines, Inc. and AMR Corporation's (collectively, "American") August 9th letter sent on behalf of all of the CERCLA defendants, which responded to our August 5th letter. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the parties lack of consensus, a conference to discuss settlement negotiation would not be fruitful. I will revisit the issue after decision on the pending motions to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/13/10) (rjm) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jay B. Spievack dated 7/29/2010 RE: request that the Court modify its recent July 25, 2010 order to provide C&W and Cantor Fitzgerald with the same Rule 24 intervenor status as WTCP in the final order on the Joint Motion Approving the Settlement Agreement Among the Aviation Defendants and the Settling Plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/30/2010) (jar) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 67 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of The Port Authority's separate Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under rule 12(c). Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of The Port Authority's Separate Motion and in Further Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c). Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c).. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c). Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c). Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Christopher Walsh in Support re: 64 MOTION for Judgment.. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 64 MOTION for Judgment. Lessee Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion for Judgment of the Pleadings. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              EXHIBITS: attached to Declaration of Sari E. Kolatch. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC. ***Accepted for filing in hard copy by the Honorable Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/5/10 (Document #80)(mro) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Judgment., 67 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of The Port Authority's separate Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under rule 12(c)., 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c). Redline Filed Pursuant to Judge's Order Dated 4/13/2010. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Spievack, Jay) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Judgment., 67 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of The Port Authority's separate Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under rule 12(c)., 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c). Amended Pursuant to Judge's Order Dated 4/13/2010. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Spievack, Jay) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jay B. Spievack dated 4/12/10 re: We represent plaintiff Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC ("C&W") in the above-captioned action. We write to request permission to file a revised opposition brief to correct a typographical error in C&W's preliminary statement that, in effect, mistakenly changed an argument that C&W made in its opposition brief. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Highlight the corrections in a separate copy that is served and filed. Relates to 21mc101, 08-9146. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/13/10) (rjm) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Sari Kolatch dated 4/2/10 re: Request to file exhibits in hard copy format, with certain voluminous exhibits to also be provided on an accommpanying CD (in searchable format). ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/5/10) (cd) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Sari E. Kolatch in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Judgment., 67 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of The Port Authority's separate Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under rule 12(c)., 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c).. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Spievack, Jay) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 64 MOTION for Judgment., 67 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of The Port Authority's separate Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under rule 12(c)., 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c).. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Spievack, Jay) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jay B. Spievack dated 3/19/2010 re: We represent plaintiff Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC ("C&W"). We write to request a two-week extension of the time in which to file an objection to the Joint Motion to Approve the settlement of the subrogated insurers and certain of the uninsured loss plaintiffs ("Joint Motion to Approve") in 21-MC-101. The deadline for filing objections to the motion is today, March 19, 2010. We request permission to file any objection on behalf of C&W on or before April 2, 2010. C&W's request for this extension is not meant to in any way signal that it will ultimately object to the Joint Motion to Approve. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/19/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jay B. Spievack dated 3/15/2010 re: Requesting an extension of the briefing schedule such that Plaintiffs opposition to the Rule 12(c) motions would be submitted on April 2, 2010 and defendants reply would be submitted on May 14, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/17/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jay B. Speivack dated 2/2/2010 re: Requesting an extension of the briefing schedule such that Plaintiff's opposition would be submitted on March 22, 2010 and Defendants' reply would be due April 22, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/3/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Suma Sanakkayala in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c). (Exhibits attached and certain voluminous exhibits provided on an accompanying cd) Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. ***Document filed in hard copy as per document #73. (mro) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Beth D. Jacob dated 1/29/10 re: we request permission to file the exhibits in hard copy format, with certain voluminous exhibits to be provided on an accompanying CD. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Relates to 21mc101, 08-9146. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/1/10) (rjm) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c).. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 67 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of The Port Authority's separate Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under rule 12(c).. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Suma Sanakkayala in Support re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c).. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Suma Sanakkayala in Support re: 67 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of The Port Authority's separate Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under rule 12(c).. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Joint Defense Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under Rule 12(c). Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. Responses due by 3/1/2010(Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of The Port Authority's separate Motion to Dismiss the Complaint under rule 12(c). Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. Responses due by 3/1/2010(Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Suma Sanakkayala in Support re: 64 MOTION for Judgment.. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 64 MOTION for Judgment. Lessee Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.(Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jay B. Spievack dated 12/16/2009 re: Counsel writes pursuant to Rule 2 (e) of Your Honor's individual Judge's Rule, to request a damages process akin to the process in place for 21 MC 101. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will address the issues posed by this letter at the arguments of Def't's "12(c)" motion, or soon thereafter. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/22/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Beth D. Jacob dated 12/3/09 re: counsel for defendant The Port Authority of New York, and New Jersey writes on behalf of all defendants, jointly with plaintiffs counsel Jay B. Spievack, to inform the Court of the briefing schedule on which the parties have agreed for defense Rule 12(c) motions to dismiss the complaint. The schedule to which the parties have agreed is: Rule 12(c) motions addressed to the pleadings will be submitted by defendants on or before Friday, January 29, 2010. Plaintiffs' responses will be submitted on or before Monday, March 1, 2010. Defendants' reply papers will be submitted on or before Monday, March 15, 2010.. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/4/09) (pl) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Answer and Counterclaim of Defendants UAL Corporation and United Air Lines, Inc. on June 18, 2009. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Sexton, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Sexton, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER; that United may file and serve the attached Amended Answer and Counterclaim of Defendants UAL Corporation and United Air Lines, Inc., without motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/16/2009) (tve) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/20/09 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (ama) (Entered: 03/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/20/09 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (tro) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER: American may file and serve the attached Amended Answer and Counterclaims of Defendants AMR Corporation and American Airlines, Inc. without motion. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/23/09) (tro) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between undersigned counsel for Plaintiff Cedar & Washington Associates LLC and Defendants AMR Corporation and American Airlines, Inc. (collectively, "American") that American may file and serve the attached Amended Answer and Counterclaim of Defendants AMR Corporation and American Airlines, Inc. without motion. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/3/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: granting 52 Motion for Peter K. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/3/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: granting 51 Motion for Peter L. Winik to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/3/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Peter K. Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by WTC Retail LLC, Westfield WTC LLC.(dle) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Peter L. Winik to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by WTC Retail LLC, Westfield WTC LLC(dle) Modified on 2/26/2009 (dle). (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to., COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, 47 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Document filed by Westfield WTC LLC, Westfield Corporation, Inc..(Connelly, Blair) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Westfield WTC LLC, Westfield Corporation, Inc..(Connelly, Blair) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Blair G. Connelly on behalf of Westfield WTC LLC, Westfield Corporation, Inc. (Connelly, Blair) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.(Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Document filed by Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mctiernan, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Document filed by Consolidated Edison Company of New York.(Rysavy, Charles) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc..(Mctiernan, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles F. Rysavy on behalf of Consolidated Edison Company of New York (Rysavy, Charles) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Document filed by HMH WTC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mctiernan, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Host Hotels & Resorts L.P. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by HMH WTC, Inc..(Mctiernan, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Consolidated Edison, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Consolidated Edison Company of New York.(Rysavy, Charles) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. Document filed by 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., Silverstein Properties, Inc., World Trade Center Properties LLC, Silverstein WTC Management Co. LLC., 1 World Trade Center LLC.(Pallen, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., Silverstein Properties, Inc., World Trade Center Properties LLC, Silverstein WTC Management Co. LLC., 1 World Trade Center LLC.(Pallen, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Francis Mctiernan on behalf of HMH WTC, Inc., Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (Mctiernan, Edward) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Walsh on behalf of HMH WTC, Inc., Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc.. New Address: GIBBONS PC, One Gateway Center, Newark, New Jersey, USA 07102, 973 596 4500. (Walsh, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Walsh on behalf of HMH WTC, Inc., Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (Walsh, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Beth D. Jacob dated 12/16/2008 re: Counsel writes requesting that the conference scheduled for 1/16/2009 at 9:45 a.m. be rescheduled. ENDORSEMENT: Conf. is adjourned until 2/6/2009 @ 9:45 a.m. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/22/2008) (tve) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Westfield Corporation, Inc. served on 12/9/2008, answer due 1/8/2009. Service was accepted by New York Secretary of State, Agent for Service of process Pursuant to BCL 307. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Consolidated Edison Company of New York served on 11/20/2008, answer due 12/10/2008. Service was accepted by Donna Christie, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Silverstein Properties, Inc. served on 11/20/2008, answer due 12/10/2008. Service was accepted by Donna Christie, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. 2 World Trade Center LLC served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/15/2008. Service was accepted by Kathy Kreiger, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. 7 World Trade Company, L.P. served on 11/25/2008, answer due 12/15/2008. Service was accepted by Cliff Schwartz, Managing Agent. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC. served on 12/1/2008, answer due 12/22/2008. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by UAL Corporation; United Airlines, Inc.. (Keane, Timothy) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc..(Keane, Timothy) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying UAL Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc..(Keane, Timothy) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by AMR Corporation.(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc..(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Westfield WTC LLC served on 11/6/2008, answer due 11/26/2008. Service was accepted by Aixa Florez - Managing Agent. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Service was accepted by Tanya Brackson - Managing Agent. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. American Airlines, Inc. served on 11/6/2008, answer due 11/26/2008. Service was accepted by Aixa Florez - Managing Agent. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. HMH WTC, Inc. served on 11/7/2008, answer due 12/1/2008. Service was accepted by Kevin Van Houtka - Clerk. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. 1 World Trade Center LLC served on 11/7/2008, answer due 12/1/2008. Service was accepted by Kevin Van Houtka - Clerk. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. World Trade Center Properties LLC served on 11/7/2008, answer due 12/1/2008. Service was accepted by Kevin Van Houtka. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Silverstein WTC Management Co. LLC. served on 11/7/2008, answer due 12/1/2008. Service was accepted by Kevin Van Houtka. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. 3 World Trade Center LLC served on 11/7/2008, answer due 12/1/2008. Service was accepted by Kevin Van Houtka. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. 4 World Trade Center LLC served on 11/7/2008, answer due 12/1/2008. Service was accepted by Kevin Van Houtka. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. United Airlines, Inc. served on 11/7/2008, answer due 12/1/2008. Service was accepted by Kevin Van Houtka. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc. served on 11/7/2008, answer due 12/1/2008. Service was accepted by Donna Christie. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties in the above-captioned action that the time for defendant THE PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff CEDAR & WASHINGTON ASSOCIATES, LLC'S Complaint is hereby extended up to and including January 5, 2009. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/17/2008) (jfe) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey served on 11/6/2008, answer due 11/26/2008. Service was accepted by Tanya Brackson - Managing Agent. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (rdz) (rdz). (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sari E. Kolatch on behalf of Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. New Address: Cohen Tauber Spievack & Wagner P.C., 420 Lexington, Suite 2400, New York, New York, USA 10170, 212-586-5800. (Kolatch, Sari) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jay B. Spievack on behalf of Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. New Address: Cohen Tauber Spievack & Wagner P.C., 420 Lexington, Suite 2400, New York, New York, USA 10170, 212-586-5800. (Spievack, Jay) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ginnine Beth Fried on behalf of Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.. New Address: Cohen Tauber Spievack & Wagner P.C., 420 Lexington, Suite 2400, New York, New York, USA 10170, 212-586-5800. (Fried, Ginnine) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.(ama) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., HMH WTC, Inc., Host Hotels and Resorts, Inc., Westfield WTC LLC, Westfield Corporation, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc., The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Silverstein Properties, Inc., World Trade Center Properties LLC, Silverstein WTC Management Co. LLC., 1 World Trade Center LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 667153)Document filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC.(ama) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 299 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?