COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. v. TOBITS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-00045
District Judge C. DARNELL JONES, II, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 7:42 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID M. FARLEY, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boyle, Neblett & Wenger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RANDALL LUKE WENGER +1 717 737 2430 +1 717 737 2452 rlwenger@dennisboylelaw.com
No Logo JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Counter-Claimant
No Logo JOAN F. FARLEY, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boyle, Neblett & Wenger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RANDALL LUKE WENGER +1 717 737 2430 +1 717 737 2452 rlwenger@dennisboylelaw.com
No Logo Cozen O'Connor, PC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. Robert Fiebach +1 215 665 4166 +1 215 665 2013 grizzo@cozen.com
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jean Lin +1 202 514 3716 +1 202 616 8470 jean.lin@usdoj.gov
Space Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
No Logo BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bancroft PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2013 H Christopher Bartolomucci +1 202 234 0090 +1 202 234 2806 cbartolomucci@bancroftpllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2013 Kerry William Kircher +1 202 225 9700 +1 202 226 1360 kerry.kircher@mail.house.gov
No Logo Concerned Women For America, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clymer & Musser

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EMILY M. BELL +1 717 299 7101 emily.bell@cmbclaw.com
No Logo EQUALITY FORUM, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY CATHERINE ROPER +1 609 716 6500 marycatherine.roper@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SUSAN KATZ HOFFMAN +1 267 402 3015 +1 267 402 3131 shoffman@littler.com
No Logo FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alliance Defense Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dale Schowengerdt +1 480 444 0020 dale@telladf.org

Represented by LAW OFFICES OF PROCTOR LINDSAY & DIXON, LLC

No Logo GAGE RALEY, Movant

Represented by BEGLEY, CARLIN & MANDIO, LLP

No Logo PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF EX-GAYS & GAYS (PFOX), Movant

Represented by Law Offices of William Adair Bonner

Toggle Switch Represented by Litman Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. BONNER +1 610 566 2703 bonneresq@verizon.net
No Logo PROFESSOR ROBERT P. GEORGE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boyle, Neblett & Wenger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua M Autry +1 717 299 7101 +1 717 299 5115 josh.autry@clymerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Princeton University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT P. GEORGE +1 609 258 3270
No Logo RYAN T. ANDERSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boyle, Neblett & Wenger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua M Autry +1 717 299 7101 +1 717 299 5115 josh.autry@clymerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Princeton University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT P. GEORGE +1 609 258 3270
No Logo SHERIF GIRGIS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boyle, Neblett & Wenger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua M Autry +1 717 299 7101 +1 717 299 5115 josh.autry@clymerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Princeton University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT P. GEORGE +1 609 258 3270
No Logo THE HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARY CATHERINE ROPER +1 609 716 6500 marycatherine.roper@dbr.com
No Logo DAVID M. FARLEY, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boyle, Neblett & Wenger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RANDALL LUKE WENGER +1 717 737 2430 +1 717 737 2452 rlwenger@dennisboylelaw.com
No Logo JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Cross-Claimant
No Logo JOAN F. FARLEY, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boyle, Neblett & Wenger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RANDALL LUKE WENGER +1 717 737 2430 +1 717 737 2452 rlwenger@dennisboylelaw.com
No Logo DAVID M. FARLEY, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boyle, Neblett & Wenger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RANDALL LUKE WENGER +1 717 737 2430 +1 717 737 2452 rlwenger@dennisboylelaw.com
No Logo JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Cross-Defendant
No Logo JOAN F. FARLEY, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boyle, Neblett & Wenger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RANDALL LUKE WENGER +1 717 737 2430 +1 717 737 2452 rlwenger@dennisboylelaw.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (149) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 149 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
ORDER THAT MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL TO F.R.A.P. 42 FILED BY DEFTS DAVID AND JOAN FARLEY IS GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/23/13.9/24/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
    LREF
    Blank 148 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to Fed R App P 42 filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Certificate of Service.(BREEN, PETER) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
      LREF
      Blank 147 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
      Clerk's Notice to USCA, re 146 Notice of Appeal. (kw, ) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
        LREF
        Blank 146 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 144 Memorandum and/or Opinion, 145 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion),,, by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and Certificate of Service. (BREEN, PETER) Modified on 8/29/2013 (nd, ). (Entered: 08/28/2013)
          LREF
          Blank 145 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
          ORDER THAT COZEN O'CONNOR'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT COZEN SHALL PAY INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT ALL AMOUNTS DUE UNDER THE PLAN. AS SARAH ELLYN FARLEY'S SURVIVING SPOUSE, DEFENDANT JENNIFER TOBITS IS ENTITLED TO AN AWARD OF ALL MONIES PAID IN THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT AFTER THE DEPOSIT IS COMPLETED. PLAINTIFF COZEN O'CONNOR IS ENTITLED TO DISCHARGE OF FUTURE LIABILITY TO DEFENDANTS JENNIFER TOBITS AND THE FARLEYS CONCERNING THE DISTRIBUTION OF THE PLAN'S DEATH BENEFITS. DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-CLAIMANTS FARLEYS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. ALL OTHER PENDING MOTIONS ARE DENIED AS MOOT, AND THE PARTIES SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/29/2013. 7/29/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
            LREF
            Legal Document 144 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/29/2013. 7/29/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
              LREF
              Blank 143 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
              ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REMOVED FROM SUSPENSE AND PLACED ON THE COURT'S ACTIVE DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/15/2013. 7/15/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(stwe, ) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                LREF
                Blank 142 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                ORDER THAT UNOPPOSED MOTION OF THE BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES TO WITHDRAW AS INTERVENOR-DEFT IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 7/11/13. 7/12/13 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by JEAN LIN on behalf of THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (LIN, JEAN) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                    Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Intervenor-Defendant filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KIRCHER, KERRY) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP of Recent Legal Developments (KIRCHER, KERRY) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                        Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition re: 91 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Strike Documents Referenced by BLAG and the Farleys filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BARTOLOMUCCI, HOWARD) Modified on 9/28/2012 (fh) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                          ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS PLACED ON THE SUSPENSE DOCKET OF THE COURT PENDING THE OUTCOME OF RELEVANT CASES & ADDITIONAL RESEARCH ON THE PENDING MOTIONS. THE CASE SHALL REMAIN IN SUSPENSE PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/25/12. 9/26/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                            JENNIFER J. TOBITS'S Response to DAVID AND JOAN FARLEY'S 134 Notice of Supplemental Authority, Certificate of Service. (STOLL, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 9/25/2012 (fh) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                              ORDER THAT MOTION OF INTERVENOR-DEFT BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT JENNIFER TOBITS' MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT INTERVENOR-DEFT THE BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES SHALL FILE ITS SUR-REPLY WITHIN TEN CALENDAR DAYS OF THE DATE THIS ORDER IS ENTERED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/18/12. 9/20/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 134 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY'S Notice of Supplemental Authority, Certificate of Service. (WENGER, RANDALL) Modified on 9/14/2012 (fh) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP.Memorandum & Certification of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(KIRCHER, KERRY) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                    CROSS-CLAIMANT JENNIFER TOBIT'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DOCUMENTS REFERENCED BY BLAG AND THE FARLEYS (amas) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                      ORDER THAT, TO ANY EXTENT IT IS NOT MOOT, THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCKETED AT NO. 100 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/6/2012.8/8/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 130 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY re 128 Notice (Other) Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority (WENGER, RANDALL) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 129 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                          Response re 128 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority by Jennifer Tobits' by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (BARTOLOMUCCI, HOWARD) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 128 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS "Notice of Supplemental Authority" (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                              Response re 125 Notice of Supplemental Authority by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY ). Certificate of Service.(WENGER, RANDALL) Modified on 6/14/2012 (ahf, ). (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 126 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                Response re 125 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP, Certificate of Service. (BARTOLOMUCCI, HOWARD) Modified on 6/12/2012 (nd, ). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS of Supplemental Authorities (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Response to Cozen & O'Connor Letter of March 21, 2012 by EQUALITY FORUM. (HOFFMAN, SUSAN) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. re 120 Statement Response to Human Rights Campaign and Equality Forum's Statement of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(CAUGHIE, JILL) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service, re: 121 Transcript - PDF. 3/20/12 Entered and Copies E-mailed and Mailed. (kw, ) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 3/12/12, before Judge C. Darnell Jones, II. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2012. (kw, ) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Statement Supplemental Information by EQUALITY FORUM. (HOFFMAN, SUSAN) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                              ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF DALE SCHOWENGERDT, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II 3/7/12. 3/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF ROBERT P. GEORGE, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II 3/7/12. 3/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  APPLICATION/PETITION for those attorneys seeking to practice in this court pursuant to local rule of civil procedure 83.5.2(b) by FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION. (PROCTOR, CHARLES) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by ROBERT P. GEORGE.Applicant's Statement, Sponsor's Statement, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service.(AUTRY, JOSHUA) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Response re 113 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP. (BARTOLOMUCCI, HOWARD) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON 3/12/2012 SHALL COMMENCE AT 1:00 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/1/12. 3/2/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS of Supplemental Authority (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF SHANNON PRICE MINTER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 2/7/12. 2/8/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF CHRISTOPHER F. STOLL, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 2/7/12. 2/8/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                APPLICATION for admission of CHRISTOPHER F. STOLL, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS.(filing fee paid on 2/6/12) (kw, ) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  APPLICATION for admission of SHANNON PRICE MINTER, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS.(filing fee paid on 2/6/12) (kw, ) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 103 Response to Brief and Statement, 104 Notice (Other), 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, 102 Memorandum Regarding Reply Brief (LITTLETON, JUDSON) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS of Supplemental Legal Authority (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by AMY WHELAN on behalf of JENNIFER J. TOBITS(WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of "Motion to Strike" filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KIRCHER, KERRY) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP re 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, 97 Memorandum of DOJ re: Constitutionality of DOMA Section 3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KIRCHER, KERRY) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Defendant's Response to Request for Review of Plaintiff re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss, 25 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Jennifer J. Tobits (The Farleys response to Brief of the United States) filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (WENGER, RANDALL) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                Memorandum in Support re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss (Ms. Tobits's Response to Brief of the United States) filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Jennifer Tobits's Motion to Strike Documents Referenced by BLAG and the Farleys by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DOCUMENTS REFERENCED BY BLAG AND THE FARLEYS filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Brief, Certicate of Service.(REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED)(WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 1/20/2012 (md). (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Strike Documents Referenced by BLAG and the Farleys filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (BREEN, PETER) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Strike Documents Referenced by BLAG and the Farleys filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B)(KIRCHER, KERRY) Modified on 1/5/2012 (lisad, ). (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Memorandum of Law re 64 MOTION to Intervene As of Right -- Brief of the United States Regarding the Constitutionality of Section 3 of DOMA filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (LITTLETON, JUDSON) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE by FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION Errata (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Brief)(PROCTOR, CHARLES) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Letter to Attorney William A. Bonner re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (pod, ) **(NOTICE SENT IN ERROR)** Modified on 12/23/2011 (lisad, ). (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Letter to Attorney Nathan Daniel Fox re: L.R. 83.5 and 83.5.2. (pod, ) **(NOTICE SENT IN ERROR)** Modified on 12/23/2011 (lisad, ). (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss, 25 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Jennifer J. Tobits, 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss Response Br. pursuant to 10/27/11 Order filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (WENGER, RANDALL) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss (Response to Cozen's, the Farleys' and BLAG's Briefs in Response to 10/27/11 Order) filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Strike Documents Referenced by BLAG and the Farleys 72 Memorandum, 71 Notice (Other) filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 12/22/2011 (nd). (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. re 88 Memorandum, 73 Memorandum, 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Cozen O'Connor's Response Brief in Opposition to Jennifer Tobits's Supplemental Brief Pursuant to the Court's October 27, 2011 Order and the Amici Curiae Brief of the Human Rights Campaign and the Equality Forum (CAUGHIE, JILL) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP re 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Response Memorandum of Intervenor the Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the U.S. House of Representatives Regarding the Constitutionality of DOMA Section 3 (KIRCHER, KERRY) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Amicus Curiae Brief of HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN AND EQUALITY FORUM. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief of amicus curiae, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, filed by PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF EX-GAYS & GAYS (PFOX). (kw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Amicus Curiae Brief, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, filed by FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Amicus curiae Brief, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, filed by CONCERNED WOMEN FOR AMERICA. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Amicus Brief of amicus curiae, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, filed by GAGE RALEY. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Brief of amici curiae, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, filed by RYAN T. ANDERSON, ROBERT P. GEORGE, SHERIF GIRGIS. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT MOTION TO INTERVENE (DOC. #58) IS GRANTED. MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF (DOC. NOS. 75, 76, 77, 78, 79 & 80) ARE GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL APPROPRIATELY DOCKET THE PROPOSED AMICUS BRIEFS. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED & THE MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED, ETC. ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTION TO INTERVENE SCHEDULED FOR 1/10/2012 IS CANCELED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/15/11.12/16/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          BRIEF in Opposition re 80 MOTION for Leave to File, 76 MOTION for Leave to File, 78 MOTION for Leave to File, 77 MOTION for Leave to File, 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear As Amici, 75 MOTION for Leave to File Cozen O'Connor's Omnibus Opposition to Motions for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief filed by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C., Certificate of service. (CAUGHIE, JILL) Modified on 12/16/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY ROBERT P. GEORGE, SHERIF GIRGIS, RYAN T. ANDERSON.(AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED)(kw, ) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear As Amici filed by EQUALITY FORUM, THE HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CV of Susan Katz Hoffman, # 2 Exhibit Proposed brief of amici, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(ROPER, MARY) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF EX-GAYS & GAYS (PFOX).(AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED)(kw, ) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION. (AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED)(kw, ) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY CONCERNED WOMEN OF AMERICA. (AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED)(kw, ) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF OF GAGE RALEY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY GAGE RALEY. (AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF ATTACHED)(kw, ) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP (KIRCHER, KERRY) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum In Support re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss (Jennifer Tobits's Supplemental Brief Pursuant to the Court's October 27, 2011 Order) filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum of Law in Support of Farleys' Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Tobits' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss, 25 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Jennifer J. Tobits Supplemental brief filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (WENGER, RANDALL) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP re 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Memorandum Regarding Constitutionality of DOMA Section 3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KIRCHER, KERRY) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. re 55 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Cozen O'Connor, P.C.'s Supplemental Brief pursuant to Court's October 27, 2011 Order (CAUGHIE, JILL) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP in Support of its 58 Motion to Intervene for a Limited Purpose, Certificate of Service. (md) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE UNCONTESTED MOTION OF PROPOSED INTERVENOR FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED; THE PROPOSED REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT C TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THIS DATE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/30/2011. 12/1/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(md) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT MOTION OF UNITED STATES TO INTERVENE AS OF RIGHT IS GRANTED. THE UNITED STATES MAY FILE A RESPONSE TO MOTION TO INTERVENE FILED BY THE BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES NO LATER THAN 12/23/2011. FOR PLANNING PURPOSES, ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE BLAG'S MOTION TO INTERVENE IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/10/2012 AT 3:30 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/28/11. 11/30/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP.Memorandum; Certificate of Counsel; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KIRCHER, KERRY) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Certificate of Service.(LITTLETON, JUDSON) Modified on 11/22/2011 (ahf, ). (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene As of Right filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LITTLETON, JUDSON) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Certificate of Service. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 11/21/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 11/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS Second Request for Judicial Notice, Certificate of Service. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 11/21/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 11/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY re 57 Notice (Other) in Opposition (BREEN, PETER) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT CROSS CLAIMANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS HEREBY GRANTED; CROSS CLAIMANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS HEREBY DENIED...ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/14/2011.11/14/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support re 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(KIRCHER, KERRY) Modified on 11/7/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene filed by BIPARTISAN LEGAL ADVISORY GROUP.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Answer to Cozen O'Connor's First Amended Complaint for Interpleader, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(KIRCHER, KERRY) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS "Request for Judicial Notice", Certificate of Service. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 10/31/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike 54 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS., Certificate of Service.(WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 10/31/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON SUBJECTS AS DESCRIBED HEREIN, ETC. THE UNITED STATES MAY MOVE TO INTERVENE BY 12/30/2011, ETC. ORAL ARGUMENT ON PENDING MOTIONS IS RESCHEDULED FOR 3/12/2012 AT 2:30 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/27/11. 10/28/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION for Leave to File filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, Certificate of service. (BREEN, PETER) Modified on 10/26/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 27 Notice (Other) Acknowledgement of Constitutional Challenge (LITTLETON, JUDSON) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF NINA WASOW, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 10/12/11. 10/13/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum / Motion for Permission to File Same filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 10/12/2011 (nd). (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF NINA WASOW ON BEHALF OF JENNIFER D. TOBITS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, SPONSORS STATEMENT, PROPOSED ORDER. (FILING FEE PAID, $40, 051045) (kp, ) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss, 33 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (BREEN, PETER) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE COURT'S ORDER DATED SEPTEMBER 13, 2011, IS AMENDED TO REFLECT THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE PENDING MOTIONS WILL BE HELD ON 12/12/2011 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES II, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/28/2011. 9/29/2011 ENTERED MAILED TO COUNSEL AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, ) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT DAVID & JOAN FARLEY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A BRIEF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO JENNIFER TOBITS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, ETC. IS GRANTED. THE FARLEYS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/3/2011 TO RESPOND TO JENNIFER TOBITS' "MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS REGARDING THE FARLEYS' CROSS-CLAIM AND COUNTERCLAIM FOR RELIEF AND HER OPPOSITION TO THE FARLEYS' MOTION TO DISMISS." SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/27/11. 9/28/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Certificate of Service.(BREEN, PETER) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, Certificate of Service. (BREEN, PETER) Modified on 9/26/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE F.R.C.P. 16 CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/4/2011 IS POSTPONED PENDING RESOLUTION OF OUTSTANDING MOTIONS. THE COURT WILL HOLD ORAL ARGUMENT ON PENDING MOTIONS ON 11/8/2011 AT 3:30 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF TERESA S. RENAKER, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JULIE H. WILENSKY, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF AARON H. STANTON, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JONATHAN W. MICHAEL, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF THOMAS BREJCHA, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF PETER C. BREEN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/13/11.9/14/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS.CORRECTED FILING. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel Regarding Service of Jennifer Tobits's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss by AMY WHELAN on behalf of JENNIFER J. TOBITS(WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Jennifer Tobits's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Denying the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss by JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Farleys' Motion to Dismiss filed by JENNIFER J. TOBITS.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 9/13/2011 (afm, ).(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, REFILING CORRECT DOCUMENT) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. re 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (CAUGHIE, JILL) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C..Memorandum, Certificate of Service..(CAUGHIE, JILL) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT A FED. R. CIV. P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 10/4/2011 AT 11:00 A.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(a) WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/23/11. 8/24/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS re 15 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim Pursuant to ERISA Section 502(h) (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS of State Constitutional Question (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by JENNIFER J. TOBITS of Federal Constitutional Question (WHELAN, AMY) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Law in Support re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Jennifer J. Tobits filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, Certificate of Service. (WENGER, RANDALL) Modified on 8/23/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Jennifer J. Tobits filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY., Certificate of Service. (WENGER, RANDALL) Modified on 8/23/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant Jennifer J. Tobits's ANSWER to 14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, "Answer to Cross-Claim by Defendants David M. Farley and Joan F. Farley" by JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Certificate of Service. (WHELAN, AMY) Modified on 8/23/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 15 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6 to Tobits' Counterclaim)(CAUGHIE, JILL) Modified on 8/23/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 14 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim,,, and Affirmative Defenses by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to Answer to Farleys' Counterclaim)(CAUGHIE, JILL) Modified on 8/23/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Aaron H. Stanton filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Application, Statement, Certificate of Service.(WENGER, RANDALL) (filing fee paid on 8/11/11) Modified on 8/11/2011 (kw, ). (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan W. Michael filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Application, Statement, Certificate of Service.(WENGER, RANDALL) (filing fee paid on 8/11/11) Modified on 8/11/2011 (kw, ). (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Thomas Brejcha filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Application, Statement, Certificate of Service.(WENGER, RANDALL) (filing fee paid on 8/11/11) Modified on 8/11/2011 (kw, ). (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Peter C. Breen filed by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY.Application, Statement, Certificate of Service.(WENGER, RANDALL) (filing fee paid on 8/11/11) Modified on 8/11/2011 (kw, ). (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for admission of TERESA S. RENAKER, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Servce, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (filing fee paid on 8/1/11) (kw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for admission of JULIE H. WILENSKY, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Servce, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (filing fee paid on 8/1/11) (kw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, COUNTERCLAIM against COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. by JENNIFER J. TOBITS.(ROWEN, MELANIE) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Farley's ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against JENNIFER J. TOBITS, COUNTERCLAIM against COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. by DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(WENGER, RANDALL) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF AMY WHELAN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/22/11. 6/23/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF MELANIE S. ROWEN, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/22/11. 6/23/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 8/1/11 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/16/11. 6/20/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for admission of AMY WHELAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Servce, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (filing fee paid on 6/17/11) (kw, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for admission of MELANIE S. ROWEN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Servce, filed by DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS. (filing fee paid on 6/17/11) (kw, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN L. JERNER, ESQ. on behalf of DEFT JENNIFER J. TOBITS, Certificate of Service. (kw, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C. re 6 Stipulation Certificate of Service (CAUGHIE, JILL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 6/20/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION (SECOND) TO EXTEND TIME by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C.. (CAUGHIE, JILL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 6/20/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Praecipe to Grant Joint Stipulation to Extend Time by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C.. (CAUGHIE, JILL) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING AS TO WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION BY 5/20/2011. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/10/2011. 5/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, JENNIFER J. TOBITS, filed by PLFF COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C.(kw, ) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C..(jwl, ) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against DAVID M. FARLEY, JOAN F. FARLEY, JENNIFER J. TOBITS ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 035355.), filed by COZEN O'CONNOR, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Management Track Form, # 3 Designation Form, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(jwl, ) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 288 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?