USA v. Liew et al
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cr-00573
District Judge Jeffrey S. White, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 3:31 PM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Walter Liew, Defendant

Represented by Creech Liebow & Kraus

Represented by Law Offices of James S. Thomson

Represented by Manchester, Williams & Seibert

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (954) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeffrey S. White: Sentencing held on 9/29/2015 for Christina Liew (2) as to Count 13ss of the second superseding indictment, three (3) years probation; $100 special assessment; $25,000 fine; $6,029,391 restitution. Count(s) 2, 3, 4 of the indictment, 1s, 2s, 3s, 5s, 6s, 9s, 12s, 13s, 14s of the superseding indictment, and 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, 5ss, 6ss, 9ss, 12ss, 14ss of the second superseding indictment dismissed. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
    SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Christina Liew (Hemann, John) (Filed on 9/25/2015) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Christina Liew (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 9/21/2015) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER as to Tze Chao GRANTING IN PART 959 JOINT MOTION TO VACATE STATUS CONFERENCE DATE. Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2016. Status Conference set for 1/12/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 9/1/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
          JOINT STATUS REPORT AND JOINT MOTION TO VACATE STATUS CONFERENCE DATE OF JUNE 9, 2015 AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by USA as to Tze Chao. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 9/1/2015) Modified on 9/2/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/01/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER as to Christina Liew GRANTING 957 STIPULATION Continuing the Date for Sentencing. Sentencing set for 9/29/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 8/26/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Christina Liew Continuing the Date for Sentencing. (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 8/25/2015) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Christina Liew to Continue Date for Sentencing. (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 8/24/2015) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                  STATUS STATEMENT REGARDING PENDING CRIMINAL CHARGES AGAINST THE CAPTIONED PANGANG GROUP ENTITIES by USA as to Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 7/1/2015) Modified on 7/2/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER GRANTING IN PART JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATED REQUEST TO VACATE STATUS CONFERENCE DATE OF JUNE 9, 2015; AND FURTHER ORDER TO COUNSEL as to Tze Chao. Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2015. Status Conference set for 9/8/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 6/3/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATED REQUEST TO VACATE STATUS CONFERENCE DATE OF JUNE 9, 2015 by USA as to Tze Chao (Hemann, John) (Filed on 6/2/2015) Modified on 6/3/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 951 Stipulation Modifying Conditions of Release as to Christina Liew (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/18/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Christina Liew Modifying Conditions of Release. (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 5/15/2015) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 950 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeffrey S. White: Change of Plea Hearing as to Christina Liew held on 5/5/2015. Plea entered by Christina Liew (2) Guilty as to Count 13ss of the second superseding indictment. Sentencing set for 9/15/2015 at 01:00 PM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                              PLEA AGREEMENT as to Christina Liew (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Status Conference as to Christina Liew held on 4/7/2015. Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/5/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Selection set for 6/17/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  AMENDED ORDER as to Christina Liew (Correcting date of hearing): Status Conference set for 4/7/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 3/30/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER as to Christina Liew : Status Conference set for 4/6/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 2/27/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                      Joint Status Statement by USA as to Christina Liew. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 3/27/2015) Modified on 3/30/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 943 Stipulation as to Christina Liew (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/24/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release. (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 3/23/2015) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT as to Christina Liew. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 3/19/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE as to Tze Chao. Joint Status Report due by 6/2/2015. Status Conference set for 6/9/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/30/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                STATUS REPORT AND RESPONSE TO OSC by USA as to Tze Chao (Hemann, John) (Filed on 1/29/2015) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                  ORDER of USCA sua sponte consolidating appeal nos. 14-10367 and 14-10384. Unopposed motion for second extension of time in which to file opening brief is granted as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 902 Notice of Appeal, 899 Notice of Appeal. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                    STATUS REPORT by Tze Chao (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mailing)(Lyons, Edmund) (Filed on 1/27/2015) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER RE STATUS REPORT as to Tze Chao. Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2015. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/13/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE: Granting 935 Stipulation as to Christina Liew (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/3/2014. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release. (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 12/2/2014) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 933 Stipulation as to Christina Liew (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/25/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release. (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 11/24/2014) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Pretrial Services Form 8 by Victoria Gibson as to Christina Liew for Judicial Review.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/21/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/7/14, Jury Voir Dire, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Cler'ks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 9/25/2014) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/6/14, Jury Voir Dire, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2014. (Related documents(s) 911 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 9/25/2014) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 929 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew held on July 10, 2014, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2014. (Related documents(s) 912 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/24/2014) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 928 Filed: 9/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Transcript of the Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew held on September 20, 2011, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Transcriber Carrie McKee-Parks, Telephone number 510-637-9897; mckee-parks65@att.net. FTR 9:56-10:02. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2014. (cmp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2014) Modified on 9/22/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/21/2014)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          PAYMENT RECORD CARD: payment of special assessment in the amount of $400 paid on 8/26/14 on behalf of Robert J. Maegerle. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Status Conference as to Christina Liew held on 9/2/2014 Jury Selection set for 5/6/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 925 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              AMENDED JUDGMENT as to USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 9/2/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 924 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                FOURTH AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Walter Liew (To Correct Court Location Number). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 9/2/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Sealing Order - General Order 54 as to Robert J. Maegerle.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 8/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 922 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    THIRD AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Walter Liew. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 8/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case as to Robert J. Maegerle. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 8/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE to 919 Order Requiring Filings Regarding Forfeiture in Advance of any Future Sentencings by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company. (Countryman, David) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER REQUIRING FILINGS REGARDING FORFEITURE IN ADVANCE OF ANY FUTURE SENTENCINGS. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 8/27/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            POST-CONVICTION AGREEMENT as to Robert J. Maegerle (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeffrey S. White: Sentencing held on 8/26/2014 for Robert J. Maegerle (3) as to Count(s) 2s, 5s, 8s, and 10s of the second superseding indictment, committed to custody of BOP for a term of 30 months of each count to run concurrent; 3 years supervised release on each count to run concurrent; $400 special assessment; $367,679 restitution joint and several. Count(s) 2, 5, 8, and 10 dismissed, second superseding indictment filed. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Transcript Designation Form by USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 8/26/2014) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM Regarding Forfeiture by USA as to Robert J. Maegerle. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) Modified on 8/26/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ** Correction: This is a request for a transcript of the hearing before Judge Corley held on 9/20/11 (not 9/20/14 as the linked form indicates). **TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 8/20/2014) Modified on 8/21/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER Requiring Statement re Forfeiture. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on August 20, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Diane Skillman (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 8/20/2014) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 8/20/2014) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Transcript Designation Form by Walter Liew re 899 Notice of Appeal. (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 8/20/2014) Modified on 8/21/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 909 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Robert J. Maegerle (Hemann, John) (Filed on 8/19/2014) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Exhibits 31 to 74, Letters from Bob Maegerle's Friends and Neighbors to His Sentencing Memorandum by Robert J. Maegerle re 905 Sentencing Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit, # 43 Exhibit, # 44 Exhibit)(Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 8/18/2014) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Exhibits 16 to 30, Letters from Bob Maegerle's Family to His Sentencing Memorandum by Robert J. Maegerle re 905 Sentencing Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit)(Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 8/18/2014) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Exhibits 1 to 15, Employment Exhibits to His Sentencing Memorandum by Robert J. Maegerle re 905 Sentencing Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 8/18/2014) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Robert J. Maegerle (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 8/18/2014) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Corrections to the Final Presentence Report by Robert J. Maegerle. (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 8/14/2014) Modified on 8/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          USCA Case Number as to USA Performance Technology, Inc. 14-10384 for 902 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by USA Performance Technology, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 895 Judgment in a Criminal Case. Filing fee $505. Appeal Record due by 9/4/2014. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number as to Walter Liew 14-10367 for 899 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Walter Liew. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL by Walter Liew re 893 Judgment in a Criminal Case. Filing fee $505, receipt number 44611011731. Appeal Record due by 8/27/2014. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  2ND AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Walter Liew (To Correct Court Location Code). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 7/23/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Walter Liew. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 7/22/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Sealing Order - General Order 54 as to USA Performance Technology, Inc... Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case as to USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Sealing Order - General Order 54 as to Walter Liew. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case as to Walter Liew. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeffrey S. White: Sentencing held on 7/10/2014 for USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4) as to Counts 1s-3s, 5s-10s, five (5) years probation; $3,600 special assessment; $18,900,000 fine. Count(s) 1-3, 5-10 of the superseding indictment, dismissed, second superseding indictment filed. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeffrey S. White: Sentencing held on 7/10/2014 for Walter Liew (1) as to Count(s) 1ss-3ss, 5ss-9ss, committed to custody of BOP for a term of 120 months on each count to run concurrent; 3 years supervised release on each count to run concurrent; $800 special assessment; Count(s) 10ss, 11ss, 13ss, 14ss, 20ss-22ss, committed to custody of BOP for a term of 60 months on each count to run concurrent and to run consecutive to term imposed in Counts 1ss-3ss, 5ss-9ss; 3 years supervised release on each count to run concurrent and to run concurrent to term imposed in Counts 1ss-3ss, 5ss-9ss; $700 special assessment; Count(s) 15ss-19ss, committed to custody of BOP for a term of 36 months on each count to run concurrent and to run concurrent to term imposed in Counts 1ss-3ss, 5ss-11ss, 13ss, 14ss, 20ss-22ss; 1 year supervised release on each count to run concurrent and to run concurrent to term imposed in Counts 1ss-3ss, 5ss-11ss, 13ss, 14ss, 20ss-22ss; $500 special assessment; $511,667.82 restitution. Count(s) 1, 3, 4 of the indictment dismissed, superseding indictment filed. Count(s) 1s-3s, 5s-9s, 10s, 11s, 13s, 14s of the superseding indictment dismissed, second superseding indictment filed. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Status Conference as to Christina Liew held on 7/8/2014 Change of Plea Hearing set for 9/2/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 888 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ADVISING PARTIES THAT THE COURT WILL NOT HOLD AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING AT SENTENCING as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Exhibits L-EE in Support of the Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett In Support Of Defendants Sentencing Memorandum And Request For Evidentiary Hearing And Other Relief. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 886 by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 885 Notice (Other),, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit P, # 6 Exhibit Q, # 7 Exhibit R, # 8 Exhibit S, # 9 Exhibit T, # 10 Exhibit U, # 11 Exhibit V, # 12 Exhibit W, # 13 Exhibit X, # 14 Exhibit Y, # 15 Exhibit Z, # 16 Exhibit AA, # 17 Exhibit BB, # 18 Exhibit CC, # 19 Exhibit DD, # 20 Exhibit EE)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 7/3/2014) Modified on 7/7/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          DISREGARD, NOT FILED IN ACCORDANCE WITH LR 3-4(a)(1), SEE DOCKET 887 FOR CORRECTED ENTRYExhibits L-EE to Decl. of Katherine M. Lovett (re Notice Of Electronic Filing Of Public Copy Of Declaration Of Katherine M. Lovett In Support Of Defendants Sentencing Memorandum And Request For Evidentiary Hearing And Other Relief) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 885 Notice (Other),, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, # 2 Exhibit N, # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit P, # 5 Exhibit Q, # 6 Exhibit R, # 7 Exhibit S, # 8 Exhibit T, # 9 Exhibit U, # 10 Exhibit V, # 11 Exhibit W, # 12 Exhibit X, # 13 Exhibit Y, # 14 Exhibit Z, # 15 Exhibit AA, # 16 Exhibit BB, # 17 Exhibit CC, # 18 Exhibit DD, # 19 Exhibit EE)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 7/3/2014) Modified on 7/7/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Electronic Filing Of Public Copy Of Declaration Of Katherine M. Lovett In Support Of Defendants Sentencing Memorandum And Request For Evidentiary Hearing And Other Relief by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 875 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathererine M. Lovett, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 7/3/2014) Modified on 7/7/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. 876 Notice of Filing of Letter Received by the U.S. Attorneys Office filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Simona Agnolucci, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 7/2/2014) Modified on 7/3/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TERMINATING MOTIONS as to Robert J. Maegerle. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 7/2/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Status Conference as to Robert J. Maegerle held on 7/1/2014 Sentencing set for 8/26/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING 880 Stipulated Request to Continue, and CONVERTING Change of Plea to Status. Status Conference set for 7/8/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on July 1, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing to July 29, 2014, And to Exclude Time. (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 2 to 871 Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner in Support of 870 Response - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 878 by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 6/30/2014) Modified on 7/1/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          DISREGARD, NOT FILED IN COMPLIANCE WITH LR 3-4(a)(1). DOCUMENT TO BE RESUBMITTEDExhibits Exhibit 2 to 871 Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner in Support of 870 Response - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [871-2] by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 871 Declaration in Support, (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED REPLY by USA as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 853 Sentencing Memorandum. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF LETTER RECEIVED BY THE U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE RELEVANT TO SENTENCING by USA as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. DENYING REMAINDER OF 850 MOTION FOR ORDER TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DECLARATION OF KATHERINE M. LOVETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SENTENCING MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 6/27/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Brian McLaughlin by USA as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. In Support of 872 Response to Defendants' Sentencing Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Peter B. Axelrod by USA as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. In Support of 872 Response to Defendants' Sentencing Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to 853 Sentencing Memorandum by USA as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner in Support of 870 Response to Motion by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 856 Sentencing Memorandum and Request for Evidentiary Hearing by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 6/26/2014) Modified on 6/27/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Brief on Sealing of Letters of Support by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 865 Order on Motion to Seal. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 6/26/2014) Modified on 6/27/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dennis Patrick Riordan appearing for Walter Liew (Riordan, Dennis) (Filed on 6/25/2014) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION OF THE UNITED STATES FOR AN ORDER OF FORFEITURE by USA as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER OF FORFEITURE)(Countryman, David) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 6/24/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Statement Regarding Forfeiture by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 6/24/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part 850 Administrative Motion to Seal Exhibits to Lovett Declaration in Support of Sentencing Memorandum as to Walter Liew (1), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 6/19/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE, CONTINUANCE OF SENTENCING DATE, OR TO QUASH SUBPOENA as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 6/19/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER CONTINUING AND SPECIALLY SETTING SENTENCING HEARING as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Sentencing set for 7/10/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 6/19/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 860 MOTION for Telephonic Appearance, MOTION to Continue Sentencing, or MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Timothy Spitler as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of David Houston in Support of 860 MOTION for Telephonic Appearance, MOTION to Continue Sentencing, or MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Timothy Spitler as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Telephonic Appearance, MOTION to Continue Sentencing, or MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Timothy Spitler as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett in Support of 858 Administrative Motion for Expedited Consideration by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 6/18/2014) Modified on 6/19/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion for Expedited Consideration of 860 MOTION for Telephonic Appearance, MOTION to Continued Sentencing, or MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Administrative Motion for Expedited Consideration)(Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 6/18/2014) Modified on 6/19/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Walter Liew. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 6/18/2014) Modified on 6/19/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Walter Liew (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett in Support of 853 Sentencing Memorandum by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-U (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit V, # 3 Exhibit W, # 4 Exhibit X, # 5 Exhibit Y, # 6 Exhibit Z, # 7 Exhibit AA, # 8 Exhibit BB (REDACTED), # 9 Exhibit CC-EE (REDACTED))(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 6/17/2014) Modified on 6/18/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND OTHER RELIEF. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner, # 2 Declaration of Sara Rief, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Sara Rief)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 6/17/2014) Modified on 6/18/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pretrial Services Form 8 by Victoria Gibson as to Christina Liew for Judicial Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/17/2104. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re DECLARATION OF KATHERINE M. LOVETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SENTENCING MEMORANDUM AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND OTHER RELIEF (UNDER SEAL VERSION). (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 6/17/2014) Modified on 6/18/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DECLARATION OF KATHERINE M. LOVETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SENTENCING MEMORANDUM AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND OTHER RELIEF by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Simona Agnolucci, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Agnolucci, # 3 Proposed Order)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 6/17/2014) Modified on 6/18/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING 743 Motion for Judgments of Acquittal and DENYING 823 Renewed Motion for Judgments of Acquittal and for New Trials. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on June 9, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: 6/4/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING, AS MODIFIED, 844 Stipulation to Continue and to Exclude Time. Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/8/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on June 4, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: 6/4/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 842 Stipulation to Convert Sentencing to Status and VACATING Briefing Schedule on Post-Trial Motions. Status Conference set for 7/1/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on June 4, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING TO JULY 8, 2014 AND EXCLUDE TIME filed by USA. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Robert J. Maegerle in Support of Motion to Continue Sentencing. (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 6/3/2014) Modified on 6/4/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING SENTENCING AS TO ROBERT MAEGERLE filed by USA. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DISCHARGING 839 Order to Show Cause and Resetting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on June 2, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by USA as to Robert J. Maegerle (Hemann, John) (Filed on 6/2/2014) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: 5/28/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER VACATING HEARING ON POST-TRIAL MOTIONS, DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT EXHIBITS, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, AND ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 10:00 a.m. 6/2/2014.Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 5/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Christina Liew GRANTING 837 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING TO JUNE 10, 2014 AND EXCLUDE TIME. Change of Plea Hearing set for 6/10/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 5/23/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING TO JUNE 10, 2014 AND EXCLUDE TIME filed by USA. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 5/22/2014) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: 5/21/2014 Motion for Waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Waiver of Defendant Robert J Maegerle's Presence at Motions Hearing Scheduled for June 3, 2014 by Robert J. Maegerle. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 5/21/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. in Support of 823 Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29 and For a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 33. (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 5/16/2014) Modified on 5/19/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 834 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: 5/7/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF SUGGESTION REGARDING TERMINATING ORDER by USA as to Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company (Hemann, John) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: 5/6/2014 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 829 Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Walter Liew (1), Robert Maegerle (3) and USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 5/6/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition, with Table of Contents and Table of Authorities, by USA as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 823 MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29 and for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 33. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 823 MOTION for Judgment of Acquittal or New Trial. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner in Support of 829 MOTION to Continue Sentencing and Request for Evidentiary Hearing on Guideline Issues by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue Sentencing and Request for Evidentiary Hearing on Guideline Issues by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Pretrial Services form 8Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pretrial Services Form 8 by Timothy Elder as to Christina Liew for Judicial Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/25/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: 4/16/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 825 STIPULATION to Alter Briefing Schedule re Post Trial Motions. Oppositions due by 4/30/2014. Replies due by 5/16/2014. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on April 16, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: 4/15/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Status Conference as to Christina Liew held on 4/15/2014 Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/27/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: 4/15/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Alter Briefing Schedule re Post Trial Motions filed by USA. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 4/15/2014) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney Jerome J Froelich Jr by Robert J. Maegerle (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 3/31/2014) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29 and for a New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 33 by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 3/19/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Robert J. Maegerle re 821 MOTION for New Trial (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Motion for New Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for New Trial by Robert J. Maegerle. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Robert J. Maegerle re 819 MOTION for Acquittal on Counts Two, Five, Eight and Ten (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Acquittal on Counts Two, Five, Eight and Ten by Robert J. Maegerle. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE STATUS REPORT as to Tze Chao. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 3/14/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA as to Tze Chao (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 3/11/2014) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Order of ExonerationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER EXONERATING BOND as to Walter Liew re 814 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 3/11/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 813 Stipulation TO EXCLUDE TIME FROM MARCH 6, 2014 TO APRIL 15, 2014 as to Christina Liew (2). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 3/11/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order by Walter Liew Exonerating Bond (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXCLUDE TIME FROM MARCH 6, 2014 TO APRIL 15, 2014 filed by USA. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. GRANTING AS MODIFIED 811 STIPULATION Regarding Post-Trial Submissions. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 3/10/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Post-Trial Submissions) filed by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 3/7/2014) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 810 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 809 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT LIST (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Status Conference as to Christina Liew held on 3/7/2014 Status Conference set for 4/15/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE EXHIBITS REFERENCED IN DOCKET NO. 777 - STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE TRIAL EXHIBITS as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 3/6/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 3/5/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Jury Verdict as to Walter Liew (1) Guilty on Count 1ss,2ss,3ss,5ss,6ss-7ss,8ss,9ss,10ss,11ss,13ss,14ss,15ss-19ss,20ss-21ss,22ss and Robert J. Maegerle (3) Guilty on Count 2s,5s,8s,10s and USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4) Guilty on Count 1s,2s,3s,5s,6s-7s,8s,9s,10s (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 31 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 3/5/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 3/4/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 801 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/27/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 30 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 3/4/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White: Jury Trial - Day 29 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 3/3/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014) Modified on 3/3/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 797 Stipulation RE: ADMITTED EVIDENCE as to Walter Liew (1), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 3/3/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: ADMITTED EVIDENCE filed by USA. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 2/27/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 796 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 28 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/27/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 27 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/26/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 794 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 2/25/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2014. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 2/24/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2014. (Related documents(s) 645 , 651 , 651 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Final Jury Instructions as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2014: # 1 Table of Contents) (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 26 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/25/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sulliavan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 790 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 762 Motion to Seal Document as to Walter Liew (1), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 2;/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial- Day 25 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/24/2014 (Court Reporter JjoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting as modified 777 Stipulation RE: TRIAL EXHIBITS as to Walter Liew (1), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 2/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 2/23/2014, Entered: 2/23/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURT'S Revised Intended Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on February 23, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2014) (Entered: 02/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 2/22/2014, Entered: 2/22/2014 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. United States' Response to Defendant Maegerle's Objection to the Trade Secret jury Instructions (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 2/22/2014) (Entered: 02/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM re Jury Instruction for Count 14 by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. 776 Order (Parties' Joint Response to Court's Order re Verdict Form) (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Re Defendant Maegerle's Objection to Jury Instructions to Trade Secrets as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen for Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/21/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition by Robert J. Maegerle of the Court's Jury Instruction Concerning Trade Secrets (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/14/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/13/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/12/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: TRIAL EXHBITS filed by USA. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 18, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: 2/17/2014 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE POSTPONING JURY TRIAL: as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Jury Trial set for 2/24/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 2/26/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2014) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Notice Regarding Defense Theory of the Case Jury Instruction) (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Robert J. Maegerle Jury Instructions Memorandum (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. 771 Order RESPONSE TO ORDER RE FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on February 14, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 24 (no jury present) as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/14/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014) Modified on 2/14/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM re Defense Theory of the Case Instruction by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Robert J. Maegerle (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Proposed Jury Instruction on Defense Theory of the Case) (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT LIST by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Second Amended Exhibit List) (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/11/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/10/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 23 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/13/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document (Administrative Motion to Seal Defendants Walter Liew and USAPTI's In Camera, Under Seal Submission) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christina M. Blais, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christina M. Blais - Redacted Submission, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. UNITED STATES OBJECTIONS TO THE COURTS PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Hemann, John) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Defendants Walter Liew and USA Performance Technology, Inc.s Objections to Courts Proposed Final Jury Instructions) (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Robert J. Maegerle Second Proposed Jury Instruction Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 22 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/12/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 757 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 756 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 21 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/11/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/7/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 20 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/10/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 2/8/2014, Entered: 2/8/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/6/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/8/2014) (Entered: 02/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 2/8/2014, Entered: 2/8/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/5/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/8/2014) (Entered: 02/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re Government Renewed Daubert Motions Regarding Klein. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on February 7, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUNDRECORDING as to Walter Liew held on 1/23/14, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tara Bauer, Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (853)453-7590, Email echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:12-2:54. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2014. (Related documents(s) 705 ) (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 19 (no jury present) as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/7/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 747 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 746 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. to Defendants' Rule 29 Motion (Hemann, John) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT'S PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on February 6, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Acquittal (Defendants Walter Liew and USAPTI's Motion for Judgment of Acquittal Pursuant to Fed R. Crim. P. 29) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL BOND SIGNATURE FORM as to Walter Liew (1). Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/6/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Further Bond Hearing as to Walter Liew held on 2/6/2014. Defendants conditions of release remain unchanged. Surety Ching Hu admonished by the Court, signs supplemental bond form and will post $80,000 as security for the bond by close of business 2/7/2014. (FTR: 2:15pm - 2:46pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 18 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/6/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/4/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 2/3/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 2/6/2014) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 17 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/5/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 727 Motion to Seal as to Walter Liew (1), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 2/5/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Trial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL MEMORANDUM by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Simona Agnolucci, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Trial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL MEMORANDUM by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 2/4/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 733 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to witness Jian Liu (rhwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 732 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document as to witness Jian Liu (rhwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 16 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/4/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal and Remove from the Public Docket Portions of Docket No. 712 by Jian Liu as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McNamara, Mary) (Filed on 2/4/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Expedited Motion to Compel Return of Attorney-Client Privileged Correspondence by Jian Liu as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McNamara, Mary) (Filed on 2/4/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Mary McNamara by Jian Liu as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company In Support of Reply on Expedited Motion to Compel Return of Attorney-Client Privileged Correspondence (McNamara, Mary) (Filed on 2/4/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Renewed Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Reply In Support of Expedited Motion to Compel Return of Attorney-Client Privileged Correspondence by Jian Liu as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McNamara, Mary) (Filed on 2/4/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 706 Declaration in Support, (Defendants Walter Liew and USAPTI's Opposition to Expedited Motion to Compel Return of Correspondence of Jian Liu (Public Version) (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 2/4/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/4/2014 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED Minute Entry (Amended to correct the spelling of the last name of the last witness of the day) for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 15 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/3/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014) Modified on 2/4/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/5/2014 (rhw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 15 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 2/3/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL FILED BY JIAN LIU RE PRIVILEGE ISSUE AND INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK RE DOCKET NO. 712 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 2/3/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ON 707 Motion to Return of Inadvertently Produced Attorney-Client Correspondence. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on January 31, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of manual filing of video of deposition of Thongchai Thongthawee by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (CD attached) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF VIDEO OF DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/29/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2014. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/28/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2014. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/27/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2014. (Related documents(s) 645 , 651 , 651 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 14 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/29/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE EXPEDITED MOTION TO COMPEL RETURN OF DOCUMENTS as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/29/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2014: # 1 Certificate of Service (via email)) (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Christina M. Blais in Support of 712 Memorandum in Opposition, by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci in Support of 712 Memorandum in Opposition, by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Document removed pursuant to order #723 (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2014: # 1 Supplement) (rhwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/4/2014 (rhwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 13 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/28/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Trial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL MEMORANDUM by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney M. McNamara for Witness Jian Liu by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company (McNamara, Mary) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 707 MOTION Return of Inadvertently Produced Attorney-Client Correspondence re 706 Declaration in Support, DECLARATION OF AUSA JOHN H. HEMANN REGARDING INADVERTENT PRODUCTION OF JIAN LIU EMAILS (Hemann, John) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Return of Inadvertently Produced Attorney-Client Correspondence re 706 Declaration in Support, by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company. (McNamara, Mary) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Marc N. Bernstein by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company in Support of Expedited Motion to Compel Return of Inadvertantly Produced Attorney-Client Correspondence (McNamara, Mary) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ** CORRECTION: This is for court reporter Jo Ann Bryce. **TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 12 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/27/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Walter Liew (1) $2 million unsecured. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/23/14. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/23/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2014. (Related documents(s) 645 , 651 , 651 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/22/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2014. (Related documents(s) 645 , 651 , 651 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Further Hearing re conditions of release held as to Walter Liew held on 1/23/2014. Bond issued. Further Bond Hearing set for 2/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (FTR: 2:12pm - 2:55pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 11 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/23/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 1/21/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce/Kelly L. Shainline, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/13/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Proposed Form of Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Form of Verdict by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Parties' Joint Proposed Verdict Form) (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 1/22/2014) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Bail Review Hearing as to Walter Liew held on 1/22/2014. Bond Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (FTR: 3:19pm - 3:57pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 693 Application for Immunity Order. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on January 22, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 10 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/22/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. and Application for Immunity Order (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Attachment)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/22/2014) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion by Robert J. Maegerle as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company re 691 Trial Brief (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit C)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial - Day 9 as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/21/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Kelly Shainline.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: 1/20/2014 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM re White Cross-Examination Documents by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 1/20/2014) (Entered: 01/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/16/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2014. (Related documents(s) 645 , 651 , 651 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/17/2014) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/15/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2014. (Related documents(s) 645 , 651 , 651 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/17/2014) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/14/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2014. (Related documents(s) 645 , 651 , 651 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/16/2014) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/13/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2014. (Related documents(s) 645 , 651 , 651 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/16/2014) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial (Day 8) as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/16/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce/Katherine Sullivan.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/15/2014 (Day 7) (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce/Katherine Sullivan.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Stipulated Facts filed by USA. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/14/2014) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Order to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL to Seal Document (Docket No. 657) as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc... Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/14/14. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial (Day 6) as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/14/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sullivan.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/9/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2014. (Related documents(s) 645 , 651 , 651 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/13/2014) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial (Day 5) as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/13/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce/Katherine Sullivan.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle held on 1/8/14, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jo Ann Bryce and Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporters, Telephone number 510-910-5888. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2014. (Related documents(s) 645 , 651 , 651 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/10/2014) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial (Day 4) as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/9/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Jury Trial (Day 3) as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/8/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce / Katherine Sullivan.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Richard S. Scott by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. SECOND DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. SCOTT IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBITS A & C TO SCOTT DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES OFFER OF PROOF RE: ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/8/2014) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 652 Trial Memorandum DEFENDANTS WALTER LIEW AND USA PERFORMANCE TECHNOLOGYS RESPONSE TO UNITED STATES OFFER OF PROOF RE ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White: Voir Dire concluded on 1/7/2014 (Day 2) as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 1/7/2014 (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) Modified on 1/7/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      VOIR DIRE as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Trial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL MEMORANDUM by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. GRANTING 665 RE DEFENDANT WALTER LIEWS COMPUTER AND DOCUMENT ACCESS. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLEASE DISREGARD AND SEE DOC. 668 ORDER as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. GRANTING 665 RE DEFENDANT WALTER LIEWS COMPUTER AND DOCUMENT ACCESS. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) Modified on 1/7/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Proposed Form of Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Form of Verdict by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DEFENDANT WALTER LIEWS COMPUTER AND DOCUMENT ACCESS (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TEMPORARILY GRANTING 657 Motion to Seal Exhibits A and C to Scott Declaration. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on January 6, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Voir Dire BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Voir Dire begun on 1/6/2014 Jury Selection continued to 1/7/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibits J and K by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 652 Trial Memorandum, 653 Declaration in Support, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 661 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. First Amended Exhibit (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 660 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE MODIFICATION OF TO PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: 644 . Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/6/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 659 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company GRANTING 621 MOTION for Leave to File Response to the Government's Attestation Regarding Service of Summons on Pangang Group Defendants. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/6/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Proposed Procedure and Jury Instruction for Identifying Witnesses and Evidence Relating to Particular Defendants (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SEAL EXHIBITS A & C TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. SCOTT (doc. 653) IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES OFFER OF PROOF RE: ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard S. Scott, # 2 Proposed Order)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibits I Part 2 (English) by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 652 Trial Memorandum, 653 Declaration in Support, (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibits I Part 1 (Chinese) by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 652 Trial Memorandum, 653 Declaration in Support, (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibits A by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 652 Trial Memorandum, 653 Declaration in Support, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of RICHARD S. SCOTT in Support of 652 Trial Memorandum by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES OFFER OF PROOF RE: ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Trial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL MEMORANDUM by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Transcript Order - Daily Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE 649 STIPULATION RE SCHEDULE FOR OPENING STATEMENTS as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/3/14 (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: SCHEDULE FOR OPENING STATEMENTS filed by USA. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 647 Stipulation Use of Electronic Equipment at Trial as to Walter Liew (1), Robert J. Maegerle (3, and USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 1/3/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Use of Electronic Equipment at Trial. (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company held on 12-16-2013, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2014. (Related documents(s) 632 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Transcript Order - Daily Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 168 Order, (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Modification to Protective Order) filed by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE GOVERNMENT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND OBJECTIONS TO PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VOIR DIRE as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/31/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2013) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objections re Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Unired States' Objections to the Court's Intended Voir Dire (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 12/30/2013) Modified on 12/31/2013 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objections re Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. United States' Objections to the Court's Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 12/30/2013) Modified on 12/31/2013 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 637 MOTION for Ex Parte ApplicationUNITED STATES EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADJUSTMENT OF TRIAL SCHEDULE DUE TO ILLNESS OF PROSECUTOR (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of KLovett ISO Response)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO FURNISH DAILY REFRESHMENTS as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Peter B. Axelrod in Support of 637 MOTION for Ex Parte ApplicationUNITED STATES EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADJUSTMENT OF TRIAL SCHEDULE DUE TO ILLNESS OF PROSECUTOR by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Motion for Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Ex Parte ApplicationUNITED STATES EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADJUSTMENT OF TRIAL SCHEDULE DUE TO ILLNESS OF PROSECUTOR by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED] ORDER ON UNITED STATES EX PARTE MOTION FOR ADJUSTMENT OF TRIAL SCHEDULE DUE TO ILLNESS OF PROSECUTOR)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of His Objection to the Court's Preliminary Instruction that Jurors May Ask Questions by Robert J. Maegerle re 633 Objection (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Defendants Walter Liew and USA Performance Technology's Objections to Court's Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Defendants Walter Liew and USA Performance Technology's Objections to Court's Intended Voir Dire (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Robert J. Maegerle to the Preliminary Instruction Allowing the Jury to Ask Questions (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 632 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Debra Pas (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Pretrial Conference as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 12/17/2013 (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF WALTER A. CONNOR as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/17/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of Walter A. Connor in Support of DuPont's Compliance with Rule 17(c) Subpoena by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Walter A.Connor in Support of DuPont's Compliance with Rule 17(c) subpoena)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 12/13/2013) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 628 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 607 Motion to Seal Document as to Walter Liew (1), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 581 Motion to Seal Document as to Walter Liew (1), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 622 Stipulation to extend time for filing stipulations for trial as to Walter Liew (1), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COURT'S PROPOSED PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT'S INTENDED VOIR DIRE as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RESOLVING 482 484 480 488 AND 477 Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on December 9, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/9/2013 (jswlc3, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend time for filing stipulations for trial filed by USA. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 12/6/2013) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Response to the Government's Attestation Regarding Service of Summons on Pangang Group Defendants by Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Specially-Appearing Defendants' Proposed Response to Government's Attestation Re. Service of Summons)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 12/6/2013) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Robert J. Maegerle GRANTING 618 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO WAIVE PRESENCE. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. GRANTING 616 Motion for Rule 15 Deposition of Thongchai Thongthawee. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Waiver......
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER by Robert J. Maegerle (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 12/6/2013) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White:Motion Hearing as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. held on 12/5/2013 re 593 MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE AND REQUESTING A HEARING ON DECEMBER 5, 2013 filed by USA (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re Thongchai Thongthawee Depostion (Hemann, John) (Filed on 12/5/2013) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 615 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attestation Regarding Service of Summons on Pangang Group Defendants by USA as to Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company re 467 Order on Motion for Leave to File, (Hemann, John) (Filed on 12/5/2013) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Direct Land Line by Robert J. Maegerle as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc., Tze Chao, Hou Shengdong, Pangang Group Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Steel Vanadium & Titanium Company, Ltd., Pangang Group Titanium Industry Company, Ltd., Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company re 611 Order on Motion for Waiver (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 12/5/2013) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Order on Motion for WaiverCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 610 Motion for Waiver. Counsel for Defendant is ORDERED to participate by phone. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on December 4, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Motion for Waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Waiver Defendant Robert Maegerle's Presence and His Counsel Jerome J Froelich Jr Presnce at the December 5, 2013 Motion Hearing by Robert J. Maegerle. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 607 MOTION to Seal Document ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SEAL EXHIBIT 4 TO HEMANN DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO UNITED STATES MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration in Support of 607 MOTION to Seal Document ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SEAL EXHIBIT 4 TO HEMANN DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO UNITED STATES MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SEAL EXHIBIT 4 TO HEMANN DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO UNITED STATES MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of John H. Hemann by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Hemann, John) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. UNITED STATES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE (Hemann, John) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Robert J. Maegerle (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner in Support of 602 Memorandum in Opposition, by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Declaration in Support of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to United States' Motion for Rule 15 Deposition of Thongchai Thongthawee) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 12/3/2013) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 592 Notice (Other) (Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to United States' Motion for Rule 15 Deposition of Thongchai Thongthawee) (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 12/3/2013) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 12/3/2013) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT LIST by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Joint Objections and Responses to Defendants' Exhibit List) (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 12/2/2013) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Peter B. Axelrod by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. SECOND DECLARATION OF PETER B. AXELROD IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBITS 1-9 TO AXELROD DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO ADMIT CO-CONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 12/2/2013) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT LIST by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Parties' Joint Exhibit List) (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 12/2/2013) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting as modified 593 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME REGARDING MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE as to Walter Liew (1), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of 592 Notice (Other) by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. OF CYNTHIA HO IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re 592 Notice (Other) by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. GRANTING UNITED STATES MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 593 MOTION SHORTEN TIME REGARDING MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE AND REQUESTING A HEARING ON DECEMBER 5, 2013 by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION SHORTEN TIME REGARDING MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE AND REQUESTING A HEARING ON DECEMBER 5, 2013 by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RULE 15 DEPOSITION OF THONGCHAI THONGTHAWEE by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER to Show Cause re Untimely Pretrial Filings. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on November 27, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SIXTH ORDER OF PRODUCTION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on November 26, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 11/26/2013) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 588 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/26/2013) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of 585 Trial Brief by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRIAL BRIEF by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE (Notice of Electronic Filing of Public Copy of Exhibits C, D, and E to Declaration of Christina M. Blais in support of Opposition to Governments Motion to Exclude Defendants Expert Witnesses Gerald Cox and Gordon Klein) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 517 Memorandum in Opposition,, 578 Order on Motion to Seal Document (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C to Decl. of Christina Blais, # 2 Exhibit D to Decl. of Christina Blais, # 3 Exhibit E to Decl. of Christina Blais)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 581 MOTION to Seal Document ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SEAL EXHIBITS 1-9 TO THE DECLARATION OF PETER B. AXELROD IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO ADMIT CO-CONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS, 582 Declaration in Support, by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Peter B. Axelrod by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBITS 1-9 TO AXELROD DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO ADMIT CO-CONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SEAL EXHIBITS 1-9 TO THE DECLARATION OF PETER B. AXELROD IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO ADMIT CO-CONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Peter B. Axelrod by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. IN SUPPORT OF UNITED STATES MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO ADMIT CO-CONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM Defendant Robert Maegerle's Jury Instruction Memorandum by Robert J. Maegerle (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING 511 Motion to Seal Exhibits C, D and E to Declaration of Christina Blais. Defendants to file Redacted Versions of Exhibits C, D and E. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on November 25, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART 507 Motion to Seal Exhibit A Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on November 25, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIFTH ORDER of Production and Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on November 25, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITNESS LIST by Robert J. Maegerle (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 11/23/2013, Entered: 11/23/2013 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM In Support of U.S. Disputed Jury Instructions and in Opposition to Defendants' Instructions by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/23/2013) (Entered: 11/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Joint Proposed Voir Dire Questions (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 566 First MOTION in Limine to Admit Co-Conspirator Statements (Defendants Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to United States Motion in Limine #1 to Admit Co Conspirator Statements) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christina Blais)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Joint Objections and Responses to U.S. Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Joint Proposed Jury Instructions (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Defendants Memorandum in Opposition to Governments Motion in Limine #3 to Exclude Nullification Argument and Evidence) (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 555 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS FROM ADMITTING SELF-SERVING HEARSAY (Defendants Memorandum in Opposition to United States Motion In Limine #2 to Preclude Defendants From Admitting Self-Serving Hearsay) (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM (Defendants Omnibus Memorandum in Support of Its Disputed Proposed Jury Instructions and in Opposition to the Governments Disputed Proposed Jury Instructions) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION in Limine to Admit Co-Conspirator Statements by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibits Attachment D - USA's Exhibit List by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 564 Pretrial Conference Statement, (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Pretrial Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. [PROPOSED] JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A - USA's Witness List, # 2 Attachment B - Walter Liew's Witness List, # 3 Attachment C - Robert Maegerle's Witness List)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. STATEMENT OF THE CASE (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. UNITED STATES OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AND TESTIMONY REGARDING UNCHARGED CONDUCT AND OTHER ACTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Trial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRIAL MEMORANDUM by Robert J. Maegerle (Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of and Testimony Regarding Uncharged Conduct and Other Acts by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of FBI SPECIAL AGENT CECILY ROMETO by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. IN SUPPORT OF GOVERNMENT'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DRAFTS OF LETTER TO PANGANG EXECUTIVES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Hemann, John) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Drafts of Letter to Pangang Executives by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. GOVERNMENTS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DRAFTS OF LETTER TO PANGANG EXECUTIVES (Hemann, John) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE NULLIFICATION ARGUMENT AND EVIDENCE by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS FROM ADMITTING SELF-SERVING HEARSAY by USA as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 554 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: 11/22/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine TO ADMIT CO-CONSPIRATOR STATEMENTS by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 11/19/2013) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 11/18/2013) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/14/2013) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 549 Stipulation re Jury Instructions and EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PRETRIAL FILINGS (EXCLUDING OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS) to November 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on November 14, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES FOR JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND MEMORANDA RE DISPUTED INSTRUCTIONS filed by USA. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/14/2013) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOURTH ORDER OF PRODUCTION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FIRST ORDER OF PRODUCTION as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/14/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: 11/13/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part 532 Motion to File More than Five Motions in Limine as to Walter Liew (1), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: 11/13/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 545 Stipulation Regarding Deadlines for Exhibit Lists as to Walter Liew (1), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Deadlines for Exhibit Lists) filed by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 11/12/2013) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Re Fed. Rule Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena filed by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 11/12/2013) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: 11/12/2013 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 487 Motion to Exclude as to Walter Liew (1), Christina Liew (2), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4) AND VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/12/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: 11/8/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      THIRD ORDER OF PRODUCTION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER RE FIRST ORDER OF PRODUCTION as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, RICHARD S. SCOTT, FOR THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 11/6/2013) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO GOVERNMENT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY MOTIONS TO SEAL SHOULD NOT BE DENIED as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 11/14/2013.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DISCHARGING ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/5/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting AS MODIFIED 537 Stipulation RE FED. RULE CRIM. P. 17(C) SUBPOENA as to Walter Liew (1), Christina Liew (2), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/5/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE FED. RULE CRIM. P. 17(C) SUBPOENA filed by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 11/4/2013) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE (Defendants Response to Courts October 22, 2013 Order to Show Cause Re Dupont Production) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 501 Order, (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 11/4/2013) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 532 MOTION Leave to File Ten Motions in Limine AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 11/4/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Witness Testimony of Donald J. Lewis (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 11/1/2013) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. 's Opposition to Motion to Exclude Experts Cox and Klein (Hemann, John) (Filed on 11/1/2013) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Leave to File Ten Motions in Limine (Defendants' Administrative Motion Re Motions in Limine) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci, # 2 Proposed Order)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 11/1/2013) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 514 Memorandum in Opposition (Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Dayton) (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 11/1/2013) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 515 Memorandum in Opposition, 513 Memorandum in Opposition (Defendants Joint Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Robert Gibney and James Feinerman) (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 11/1/2013) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Doron Weinberg to the Hon. Jeffrey S. White as to Christina Liew (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 11/1/2013) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Joinder by Christina Liew in Defendant Walter Liew's Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony and Oppositions to the Government's Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony by Christina Liew. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 11/1/2013) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting In Part 481 Motion to Seal Exhibit C to Declaration of Katharine Lovett in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Robert Gibney. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on October 29, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 526 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 525 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Pretrial Services form 8Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pretrial Services Form 8 by Timothy Elder as to Christina Liew for Judicial Review.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/28/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Electronic Filing of Public Copy of Exhibit C to Decl. of Stuart Gasner in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Dayton by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 480 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Dayton, 519 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C to Decl. of Stuart Gasner ISO Mtn. to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Dayton)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 10/28/2013) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. SECOND DECLARATION OF PETER B. AXELROD IN SUPPORT OF SEALING PORTIONS OF EXHIBIT C TO LOVETT DECLARATION RE: DEFENDANTS ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (DOCKET NO. 481) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/28/2013) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibits 1, 2 and 3 to Declaration of Peter B. Axelrod in Support of United States' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Dayton, James Feinerman and Robert Gibney (Docket No. 477, 480, 482) by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 516 Declaration in Opposition, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/28/2013) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 506 Stipulation Re Fed. Rule Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena as to Walter Liew (1), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/28/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. granting in part 479 Administrative Motion for an Order to Seal Exhibit C to Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Dayton. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/28/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 511 MOTION to Seal Document (Administrative Motion for an Order to Seal Exhibits C, D and E to Decl. of Christina M. Blais in Support of Opp. to Govt.'s Mtn. to Exclude Gerald Cox and Gordon Klein) (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 484 MOTION to Exclude UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESSES GERALD COX AND GORDON KLEIN (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner, # 2 Declaration of Christina M. Blais, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C (Filed Provisionally Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit D (Filed Provisionally Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit E (Filed Provisionally Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Peter B. Axelrod by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. In Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Testimony of Dayton, Feinerman, and Gibney (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. 's Motion to Exclude Testimony by James Feinerman (Hemann, John) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Dayton (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. 's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Robert Gibney (Hemann, John) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 488 MOTION to Exclude UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESS TESTIMONY OF DONALD J. LEWIS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document (Administrative Motion for an Order to Seal Exhibits C, D and E to Decl. of Christina M. Blais in Support of Opp. to Govt.'s Mtn. to Exclude Gerald Cox and Gordon Klein) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Peter B. Axelrod by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. In Response to Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal Exhibit C to Gasner Declaration (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 508 Memorandum in Opposition, Proof of Service of Exhibit A Filed Provisionally Under Seal (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 487 MOTION to Exclude UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESS TESTIMONY OF PAUL A. COOPER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner, # 2 Exhibit A (Filed Provisionally Under Seal))(Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Document (Administrative Motion for Order to Seal Exhibit A to Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner in Support of Opposition to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimny of Paul A. Cooper) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Fed. Rule Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena filed by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 Order on Motion for Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 504 Ex Parte Application Authorizing Disclosure of Grand Jury Transcripts. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on October 24, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Motion for Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Grand Jury Materials to Defendants; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Axelrod, # 2 Proposed Order Authorizing Disclosure of Grand Jury Materials to Defendants)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/23/2013) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY as to Christina Liew. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 479 Motion to Seal Document as to Walter Liew (1), Christina Liew (2), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND ORDER OF PRODUCTION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER RE FIRST ORDER OF PRODUCTION as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBIT C TO LOVETT DECLARATION AND VACATING HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO SEAL as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 496 Stipulation re Pretrial Submissions. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on October 21, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 491 Stipulation to Exclude Time. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on October 21, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 497 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 472 Motion to Sever Defendant Pursuant to Rule 14 Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure filed by Christina Liew. Status Conference set for 3/6/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on October 21, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Pretrial Submissions) filed by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/21/2013) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting as modified 489 Stipulation re: Fed. Rule Crim. P (17C) Subpoena as to Walter Liew (1), Christina Liew (2), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Peter B. Axelrod by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBIT C TO GASNER DECLARATION (DOCKET NO. 479) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBIT C TO GASNER DECLARATION (DOCKET NO. 479))(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/18/2013) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 492 Declaration in Support, by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER SEALING EXHIBIT C TO LOVETT DECLARATION RE: DEFENDANTS ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (DOCKET NO. 481) (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/18/2013) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. OF PETER B. AXELROD IN SUPPORT OF SEALING EXHIBIT C TO LOVETT DECLARATION RE: DEFENDANTS ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (DOCKET NO. 481) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER SEALING EXHIBIT C TO LOVETT DECLARATION RE: DEFENDANTS ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (DOCKET NO. 481))(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/18/2013) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue nad Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act filed by USA. (Hemann, John) (Filed on 10/18/2013) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement by USA as to Christina Liew UNITED STATES STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHRISTINA LIEWS MOTION TO SEVER (Hemann, John) (Filed on 10/18/2013) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and Proposed Order re Fed. Rule Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena) filed by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 10/16/2013) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Exclude UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESS TESTIMONY OF DONALD J. LEWIS by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter B. Axelrod, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Exclude UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESS TESTIMONY OF PAUL A. COOPER by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Peter B. Axelrod in Support of 484 MOTION to Exclude UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESSES GERALD COX AND GORDON KLEIN by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Special Agent Cynthia Ho in Support of 484 MOTION to Exclude UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESSES GERALD COX AND GORDON KLEIN by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Exclude UNITED STATES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESSES GERALD COX AND GORDON KLEIN by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 480 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Dayton, 482 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Robert Gibney (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Robert Gibney by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C (Submitted Provisionally Under Seal), # 5 Proposed Order)(Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document (Administrative Motion for an Order to Seal Exhibit C to the Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Robert Gibney) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Dayton by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C (Submitted Provisionally Under Seal), # 5 Proposed Order)(Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document (Administrative Motion for an Order to Seal Exhibit C to Declaration of Stuart L. Gasner in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Daniel Dayton) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine M. Lovett, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Simona A. Agnolucci in Support of 477 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of James V. Feinerman by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of James V. Feinerman by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 471 Motion To Set Brady/Giglio Disclosure Deadline as to Walter Liew (1), Christina Liew (2), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/11/2013 (lskS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA as to Tze Chao (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 10/10/2013) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. Adminstrative Motion to Set Brady/Giglio Disclosure Deadline (Hemann, John) (Filed on 10/10/2013) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support by Christina Liew re 472 MOTION to Sever Defendant Pursuant to Rule 14 Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure (Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Motion to Sever Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Sever Defendant Pursuant to Rule 14 Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure by Christina Liew. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Doron Weinberg, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Doron Weinberg, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Doron Weinberg, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Doron Weinberg, # 5 Declaration of Walter Liew in Support of Christina Liew's Motion for Severance)(Weinberg, Doron) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Set Brady/Giglio Disclosure Deadline (Administrative Motion) by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Simona Agnolucci, # 2 Exhibit A to Agnolucci Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Agnolucci Decl., # 4 Proposed Order)(Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 10/7/2013) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc.,GRANTING 469 STIPULATION RE FED. RULE CRIM. P. 17(C) SUBPOENA. Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/7/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE FED. RULE CRIM. P. 17(C) SUBPOENA filed by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc.. (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 10/4/2013) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING STIPULATED MODIFICATION NO. 2 TO PROTECTIVE ORDER 462 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 467 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 423 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF NEW SUMMONSES BASED ON A FINDING OF SUBSTANTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 4 WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANTS PANGANG GROUP COMPANY, LTD. AND PANGANG GROUP INTERNATIONAL ECONOMIC & TRADING COMPANY as to Pangang Group Company, Ltd. (7), Pangang Group International Economic & Trading Company (10). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 436 Joint Motion to Compel Amended Bill of Particulars as to Walter Liew (1), Christina Liew (2), Robert J. Maegerle (3), USA Performance Technology, Inc. (4). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Order on Motion for WaiverCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 463 Motion for Waiver of Counsel's presence at the October 3, 2013 hearing as to Robert J. Maegerle (3). Signed by Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White on 9/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Re Order to Show Cause by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. as to Walter Liew, Christina Liew, Robert J. Maegerle, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 453 Order to Show Cause, (Lovett, Katherine) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013 Motion for Waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Waiver of His Attorney's (Jerome J. Froelich Jr) Pesence at the October 3, 2013 Hearing by Robert J. Maegerle. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jerome J Froelich to Waive his Appearance at the October 3, 2013 Hearing, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting the Waiver of Jerome J Frolich's Presence at the October 3, 2013 Hearing)(Froelich, Jerome) (Filed on 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 432 Order, MODIFICATION NO. 2 TO PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by USA. (Axelrod, Peter) (Filed on 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Walter Liew, USA Performance Technology, Inc. re 449 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Rule 16(A)(1)(E)(II) Order filed by USA Performance Technology, Inc., Walter Liew (Gasner, Stuart) (Filed on 9/25/2013) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 2,306 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?