United Western Bancorp, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Colorado Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 12-13815
District Judge A. Bruce Campbell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 11, 2020 at 8:51 PM ST (5.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eco Express LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Nicholas H. Ores

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas H. Ores +1 970 461 0754
No Logo Matrix Bancorp Trading, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by 1660 Lincoln St.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Regina Ries +1 303 571 0077 +1 303 571 4227 GRies@sendwass.com
Space Harvey Sender +1 303 296 1999 +1 303 296 7600 Sendertrustee@sendwass.com
Space David Warner +1 303 296 1999 +1 303 296 7600 david.warner@sendwass.com
No Logo Matrix Funding Corp., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by 1660 Lincoln St.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Regina Ries +1 303 571 0077 +1 303 571 4227 GRies@sendwass.com
Space Harvey Sender +1 303 296 1999 +1 303 296 7600 Sendertrustee@sendwass.com
Space David Warner +1 303 296 1999 +1 303 296 7600 david.warner@sendwass.com
No Logo United Western Bancorp, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by 1660 Lincoln St.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Regina Ries +1 303 571 0077 +1 303 571 4227 GRies@sendwass.com
Space Harvey Sender +1 303 296 1999 +1 303 296 7600 Sendertrustee@sendwass.com
Space David Warner +1 303 296 1999 +1 303 296 7600 david.warner@sendwass.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "US Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan K. Motes +1 303 299 7327 +1 303 382 4627 motesa@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jarrod Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jarrod Martin +1 303 312 7236 +1 303 312 7259
  Entries (351) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 698 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None ?
    LREF
    Blank 690 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None ?
      LREF
      Blank 679 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None ?
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
        9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Mark E. Haynes on behalf of David Dennis (related document(s):651 Application for Compensation).. 9013 Objections due by 1/7/2019 for 651,. (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None
          Interim Application for Compensation for David Dennis, Accountant, Period: 11/4/2017 to 11/28/2018, Fees Requested: $7,256.00, Expenses Requested: $64.00. Filed by David Dennis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Fifth Interim Application for Compensation of Dennis & Company, PC # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Fifth Interim Application for Compensation of Dennis & Company, PC # 3 Proposed/Unsigned Order Proposed Order re Fifth Interim Application for Compensation # 4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service re Fifth Interim Application for Compensation) (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
            9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Mark E. Haynes on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):648 Application for Compensation).. 9013 Objections due by 1/3/2019 for 648,. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Certificate of Service re Notice of Fifth Interim Application for Compensation of Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe, PC as Counsel for the Chapter 7 Trustee) (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Mark Haynes is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 648: 9013 Notice is incorrectly bundled with the Motion; please file Notice separate from the Motion. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) (related document(s)648 Application for Compensation). (vo) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None
                Interim Application for Compensation for Mark E. Haynes, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 11/1/2017 to 10/31/2018, Fees Requested: $99,578.00, Expenses Requested: $0.00. Filed by Mark E. Haynes. (Attachments: # 1 Other Notice of Fifth Interim Application for Compensation of Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe, PC as Counsel for the Chapter 7 Trustee # 2 Exhibit A to Fifth Interim Application for Compensation # 3 Exhibit B-1 to Fifth Interim Application for Compensation # 4 Exhibit B-2 to Fifth Interim Application for Compensation # 5 Exhibit B-3 to Fifth Interim Application for Compensation # 6 Exhibit B-4 to Fifth Interim Application for Compensation # 7 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order Granting Fifth Interim Application for Compensation of Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe, PC as Counsel for the Chapter 7 Trustee # 8 Certificate of Service re Notice of Fifth Interim Application for Compensation of Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe, PC as Counsel for the Chapter 7 Trustee) (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice of Change of Address For Joel Laufer Filed by Joel Laufer on behalf of Joel Laufer P.C.. (Laufer, Joel) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 12/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)643 Generic Order). No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/30/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/30/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)642 Order on Application for Compensation). No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 12/29/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)641 Order on Application for Compensation). No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 12/29/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Corrected* Order Granting Fourth Interim Application For Compensation Of Dennis & Company, PC As Accountant For The Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s)642 Order on Application for Compensation). (vo) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Order Granting Application For Compensation for David Dennis, Fees awarded: $16163.00, Expenses awarded: $96.00 (related document(s)633 Application for Compensation). (jtm) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Order Granting Application For Compensation for Mark E. Haynes, Fees awarded: $74225.00, Expenses awarded: $574.16 (related document(s)634 Application for Compensation). (jtm) Modified on 12/27/2017 (jtm). Modified docket text per pdf. (Entered: 12/27/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Mark E. Haynes on behalf of David Dennis (related document(s):633 Application for Compensation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Mark E. Haynes on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):634 Application for Compensation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Mark E. Haynes on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):633 Application for Compensation).. 9013 Objections due by 12/15/2017 for 633,. (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Mark E. Haynes on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):632 Application for Compensation).. 9013 Objections due by 12/15/2017 for 632,. (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 11/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)635 Notification Entry). No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/24/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/24/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Public Notice of Deficient Filing, Error or Defect and Application of L.B.R. 5005-4(l). The Electronic Filer of Document Number 633, 632 is hereby notified the errors noted below shall be corrected by the close of the third court day following transmittal of this Notice, failing which the electronic document will be deemed stricken and, absent order of the court, no further action will be taken on the document. Error to be corrected: 9013-1.1 Notices filed within the body of the Applications. E-Filer is to Re-file the 9013-1.1 Notices separate from the Applications. (related document(s)632 Application for Compensation, 633 Application for Compensation). (vo) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Corrected Application for Compensation for Mark E. Haynes, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 11/1/2016 to 10/31/2017, Fees Requested: $74,356.00, Expenses Requested: $574.16, for Simon E. Rodriguez, Trustee Chapter 7, Period: 11/1/2016 to 10/31/2017, Fees Requested: $74,356.00, Expenses Requested: $574.16. Filed by Mark E. Haynes. (Attachments: # 1 Other Fourth Interim Application for Compensation of Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe, PC as Counsel for Chapter 7 Trustee) (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Interim Application for Compensation for Mark E. Haynes, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 10/20/2016 to 11/3/2017, Fees Requested: $16,163.00, Expenses Requested: $96.00, for David Dennis, Accountant, Period: 10/20/2016 to 11/3/2017, Fees Requested: $16,163.00, Expenses Requested: $96.00. Filed by Mark E. Haynes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Other Notice of Fourth Interim Application for Compensation of Dennis & Company, PC as Accountant for Chapter 7 Trustee # 4 Proposed/Unsigned Order # 5 Certificate of Service) (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Interim Application for Compensation for Mark E. Haynes, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 11/1/2016 to 10/30/2017, Fees Requested: $74,356.00, Expenses Requested: $574.16, for Simon E. Rodriguez, Trustee Chapter 7, Period: 11/1/2016 to 10/30/2017, Fees Requested: $74,356.00, Expenses Requested: $574.16. Filed by Mark E. Haynes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B-1 # 3 Exhibit B-2 # 4 Exhibit B-3 # 5 Exhibit B-4 # 6 Exhibit B-5 # 7 Exhibit B-6 # 8 Other Notice of Fourth Interim Application for Compensation of Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe, PC as Counsel for Chapter 7 Trustee # 9 Proposed/Unsigned Order # 10 Certificate of Service) (Haynes, Mark) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Notice to Substitute Attorney. Mark E. Haynes Added to Case. Kimberley H. Tyson Terminated From Case. Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez... (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Document Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):589 Objection to Claim)... (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)628 Order on Application for Compensation). No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 01/25/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Order Granting BuckleySandler, LLP's First and Final Application For Compensation as Counsel for the Chapter 11 Debtor-in-Possession, Fees awarded: $100,000.00, Expenses awarded: $2,618.53 (related document(s)618 Application for Compensation). (pt) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 627 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Trustee's Report Dated January 18, 2017 Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Notice of Change of Address For Joel Laufer, Esq. Filed by Joel Laufer on behalf of Joel Laufer P.C., Stage Coach Investments, LLC. and Mr. R. James Nicholson (Laufer, Joel) Modified to add parties per PDF on 1/10/2017 (pt). (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Maria J. Flora on behalf of BuckleySandler, LLP (related document(s):618 Application for Compensation). (Flora, Maria) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 12/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)622 Order on Application for Compensation). No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/17/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 12/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)621 Order on Application for Compensation). No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/17/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Order Granting Third Interim Application For Compensation Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe, PC, as Counsel for the Chapter 7 Trustee; Fees awarded: $70424.75, Expenses awarded: $683.51 (related document(s)609 Application for Compensation). (pt) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Order Granting Third Interim Application For Compensation of Dennis & Company, PC, as Accountant for the Chapter 7 Trustee; Fees awarded: $14308.00, Expenses awarded: $78.00 (related document(s)607 Application for Compensation). (pt) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 615 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)614 Order on Objection to Claim). No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 11/23/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 613 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):591 Objection to Claim). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 612 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):608 9013-1.1 Notice, 610 9013-1.1 Notice). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 611 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Certificate of Service Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of David Dennis, Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):608 9013-1.1 Notice, 610 9013-1.1 Notice). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 610 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):609 Application for Compensation).. 9013 Objections due by 12/1/2016 for 609,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Third Application for Compensation for Kimberley Haines Tyson, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 12/1/2015 to 10/31/2016, Fees Requested: $70424.75, Expenses Requested: $683.51. Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B-1 # 3 Exhibit B-2 # 4 Exhibit B-3 # 5 Exhibit B-4 # 6 Exhibit B-5 # 7 Exhibit B-6 # 8 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of David Dennis (related document(s):607 Application for Compensation).. 9013 Objections due by 12/1/2016 for 607,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Application for Compensation for David Dennis, Accountant, Period: 11/21/2015 to 10/20/2016, Fees Requested: $14386.00, Expenses Requested: $78.00. Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal of Document Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):597 Objection to Claim)... (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Document Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):595 Objection to Claim)... (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Document Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):593 Objection to Claim)... (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 603 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Response Filed by Maria J. Flora on behalf of BuckleySandler, LLP (related document(s):589 Objection to Claim). (Flora, Maria) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order Granting Motion For Approval Of Stipulation For Settlement Of Controversy Between The Chapter 7 Trustee And Defendant Greenberg Traurig, LLP (related document(s):448 Motion to Approve). (pt) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Support Brief/Memorandum Filed by Mark A. Larson on behalf of Jeffrey A. Weinman (related document(s):461 Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order). (Larson, Mark) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Objection Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):451 Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice, 453 Objection, 461 Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 5/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)461 Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order). No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 05/10/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/10/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Minute Order RE: Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Jeffrey A. Weinman as Chapter 7 Trustee of UWT, Inc. and Objection thereto by Simon E. Rodriguez as Chapter 7 Trustee of United Western Bancorp, Inc. (related document(s)451 Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice, 453 Objection). (pt) Modified to correct date of filing to "5/7/2015" per pdf on 5/13/2015 (pt). (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)456 Other Order). No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 05/06/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)455 Order on Application for Compensation). No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 05/06/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              List of Witnesses and Exhibits Filed by Mark A. Larson on behalf of Jeffrey A. Weinman (related document(s):451 Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice). (Larson, Mark) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                List of Witnesses and Exhibits Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):451 Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion For Authority For Trustee To Pay Holdback To Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe, PC (related document(s):442 Other Motion). (pt) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Order Granting First Interim Application For Compensation Of Dennis & Company, PC Aas Accountant For The Chapter 7 Trustee; Fees awarded: $46276.00, Expenses awarded: $96.00 (related document(s)440 Application for Compensation). (pt) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):448 Motion to Approve). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Objection Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):451 Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice(12-13815-TBM) [motion,mfrstr] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21806456. Fee amount 176.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Motion for Relief from Stay On Fraudulent Transfered Claims and 4001-1.1 Notice Filed by Mark A. Larson on behalf of Jeffrey A. Weinman. Stay Hearing to be held on 5/7/2015 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom A. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Larson, Mark) Modified to correct typographical error "fradulant" to "fraudulent" per PDF on 5/8/2015 (pt). Modified on 5/8/2015 (pt). (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):449 9013-1.1 Notice). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):448 Motion to Approve).. 9013 Objections due by 4/27/2015 for 448,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Motion to Approve Stipulation between Trustee and Greenberg Traurig, LLP Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):442 Other Motion). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of David Dennis (related document(s):440 Application for Compensation). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Change of Address For the United States Trustee and Attorney for the United States Trustee Filed by Alan K. Motes on behalf of US Trustee 11. (Motes, Alan) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of David Dennis, Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):441 9013-1.1 Notice, 443 9013-1.1 Notice). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):442 Other Motion).. 9013 Objections due by 3/20/2015 for 442,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Motion For Authority for Trustee to Pay Holdback to Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe, PC Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley). Related document(s) 422 Application for Compensation, 435 Order on Application for Compensation. Modified to create linkage to Docket #422 and Docket #435 per attorney request on 2/24/2015 (pt). (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of David Dennis (related document(s):440 Application for Compensation).. 9013 Objections due by 3/20/2015 for 440,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  First Application for Compensation for David Dennis, Accountant, Period: 9/1/2013 to 12/31/2014, Fees Requested: $46276.00, Expenses Requested: $96.00. Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley) Additional attachment(s) CORRECTED Proposed Order added on 2/24/2015 (pt). Modified to add CORRECTED Proposed Order per attorney request on 2/24/2015 (pt). (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 2/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)438 Order on Motion to Approve Stipulation). No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 02/07/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion For Approval of Stipulation for Settlement of Controversy Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and Defendant William D. Snider (related document(s):426 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Stipulation). (pt) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):426 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Stipulation). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)435 Order on Application for Compensation). No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 01/29/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting First Interim Application for Compensation of Ireland Stapleton Pryor & Pascoe, PC, as Counsel for the Chapter 7 Trustee; Fees awarded: $146,686.25, Expenses awarded: $1174.60 (related document(s)422 Application for Compensation). (pt) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):422 Application for Compensation). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)431 Order on Motion to Strike). No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 01/15/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)430 Informational Notice). No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/14/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Order Denying, as Moot, Motion to Strike Letter Filed January 5, 2015 (Docket No. 425) (related document(s):429 Motion to Strike). (pt) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Deficient filing (related document(s)425 Document). (pt) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Strike Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s)425 Document). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):427 9013-1.1 Notice). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):426 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Stipulation).. 9013 Objections due by 2/2/2015 for 426,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Approve Stipulation Between Simon E. Rodriguez and William D. Snider and Stipulation Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Honorable A. Bruce Campbell from "substantial group of United Western Bancorp Shareholders" (related document(s):422 Application for Compensation). (re) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):423 9013-1.1 Notice). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):422 Application for Compensation).. 9013 Objections due by 1/16/2015 for 422,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Compensation for Kimberley Haines Tyson, Trustee's Attorney, Period: 4/16/2013 to 10/31/2014, Fees Requested: $146686.25, Expenses Requested: $1174.60. Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B-1 # 3 Exhibit B-2 # 4 Exhibit B-3 # 5 Exhibit B-4 # 6 Exhibit B-5 # 7 Exhibit B-6 # 8 Exhibit B-7 # 9 Exhibit B-8 # 10 Exhibit B-9 # 11 Exhibit B-10 # 12 Exhibit B-11 # 13 Exhibit B-12 # 14 Exhibit B-13 # 15 Exhibit B-14 # 16 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerk's Notice of Fees Due. Amount Due: $1465.00. (saj) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 8/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)419 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/30/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Request For Relief Set Forth In Agreed Motion By The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation As Receiver And The Chapter 7 Trustee For An Order Requiring Tax Refunds To Be Deposited With This Court (related document(s):404 Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry). (vo) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 8/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)416 Order on Motion to Approve Stipulation). No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 08/23/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 8/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)415 Order on Motion to Approve Stipulation). No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/23/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion For Approval Of Stipulation For Settlement Of Controversy Between The Chapter 7 Trustee And Defendant Latham & Watkins, LLP(related document(s):409 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Stipulation). (pt) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Motion For Approval Of Stipulation For Settlement Of Controversy Between The Chapter 7 Trustee And Defendant American Express (related document(s):407 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Stipulation). (pt) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by John F. Young on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurace Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank (related document(s):404 Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry). (Young, John) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):409 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Stipulation). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):407 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Stipulation). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):408 9013-1.1 Notice, 410 9013-1.1 Notice). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):409 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Stipulation).. 9013 Objections due by 8/11/2014 for 409,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Approve Stipulation Between Simon E. Rodriguez and Latham & Watkins, LLP and Stipulation Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):407 Motion to Approve Stipulation and Stipulation).. 9013 Objections due by 8/11/2014 for 407,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Approve Stipulation Between Simon E. Rodriguez and American Express and Stipulation Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service Filed by John F. Young on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurace Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank (related document(s):404 Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry, 405 9013-1.1 Notice). (Attachments: # 1 Other Mailing Matrix dated 07-16-14) (Young, John) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        9013-1.1 Notice Filed by John F. Young on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurace Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank (related document(s):404 Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry).. 9013 Objections due by 8/6/2014 for 404,. (Young, John) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry In The Amount Of $ 4,401,794 ("Tax Refund") Filed by John F. Young on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurace Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4) (Young, John) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 7/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)402 Other Order). No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 07/04/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 402 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Denying FDIC's Motion To Deposit Funds In Court Registry (related document(s):394 Other Motion). (pt) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Change of Address For David E. Dennis, accountant, filed by David Dennis . (pt) Modified on 6/20/2014; updated accountant's address per PDF. (pt). (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 400 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by John F. Young on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurace Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank (related document(s):394 Other Motion). (Young, John) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Document Filed by Caroline C. Fuller on behalf of Fairfield and Woods, P.C. (related document(s):397 Application for Compensation)... (Fuller, Caroline) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Caroline C. Fuller on behalf of Fairfield and Woods, P.C. (related document(s):397 Application for Compensation).. 9013 Objections due by 6/20/2014 for 397,. (Fuller, Caroline) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation for Fairfield and Woods, P.C., Special Counsel, Period: 9/4/2013 to 5/23/2014, Fees Requested: $4,187.50, Expenses Requested: $116.40. Filed by Fairfield and Woods, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Fuller, Caroline) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service Filed by John F. Young on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurace Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank (related document(s):394 Other Motion, 395 9013-1.1 Notice). (Attachments: # 1 Other Mailing Matrix dated 05-20-14) (Young, John) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            9013-1.1 Notice Filed by John F. Young on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurace Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank (related document(s):394 Other Motion).. 9013 Objections due by 6/10/2014 for 394,. (Young, John) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulated Motion For an Order Requiring Tax Refund Monies to be Deposited with this Court Filed by John F. Young on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurace Corporation, as Receiver for United Western Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4) (Young, John) Modified to correct typographical error on 5/21/2014 (pt). (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third Status Report Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)391 Order on Motion to Compromise Controversy). No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/24/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Motion For Approval Of Stipulation For Settlement Of Controversy Between Plaintiff United Western Bancorp, Inc. Trustee And Defendants M. Stephen Peters, Chapter 7 Trustee of the DeCola Bankruptcy Estate, Nicholson Enterprises, Inc., R. James Nicholson, and Stage Coach Investments, LLC (related document(s):379 Motion to Compromise Controversy). (pt) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Notice.. (Beckett Lee, *) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary case 14-01191. Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, in its capacity as Receiver for United Western Bank. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 08/14/2014 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):379 Motion to Compromise Controversy). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary case 14-01189. Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against William D. Snider. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 08/12/2014 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary case 14-01188. Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against Latham & Watkins LLP. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 08/12/2014 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary case 14-01187. Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against Greenberg Traurig, LLP. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 08/12/2014 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary case 14-01186. Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against American Express. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 08/12/2014 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Change of Address For Simon E. Rodriguez Filed by Caroline C. Fuller on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Fuller, Caroline) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):381 9013-1.1 Notice). (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended 9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):379 Motion to Compromise Controversy).. 9013 Objections due by 4/14/2014 for 379,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez (related document(s):379 Motion to Compromise Controversy).. 9013 Objections due by 4/7/2014 for 379,. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion To Compromise Controversy With M. Stephen Peters, Chapter 7 Trustee of the DeCola bankruptcy estate, Nicholson Enterprises, Inc., R. James Nicholson, and Stage Coach Investments, LLC In Adversary 13-01649 ABC; 13-01650 ABC; 13-01652 ABC Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order) (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)374 Informational Notice). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/16/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second Status Report Filed by Kimberley Haines Tyson on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Tyson, Kimberley) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Court Certificate of Mailing. Number of notices mailed: 1; Date Mailed 1/14/2014 (related document(s)374 Informational Notice). (pt) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Motion to Extend Time (Bankruptcy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Monthly Report of Operations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Other Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None Order on motion to extend time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Other Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Chapter 11 Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/20/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Monthly Report of Operations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing 9013-1.1 Notice Re: Dismiss/Convert 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Motion to Extend Time (Bankruptcy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Monthly Report of Operations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Monthly Report of Operations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Order on Motion for Relief from Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Monthly Report of Operations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/22/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Order on motion to extend time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Order on Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Order on Motion To Set Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Motion to Set Bar Date For Filing Proofs of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Motion to Extend Time (Bankruptcy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Order to Vacate Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None ~Generic~ Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Report of Sale
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Order on Motion for Relief from Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Monthly Report of Operations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Order on Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Notice Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/2/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None 1009-1.1 Notice of Amendment to Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None 1009-1.1 Notice of Amendment to Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Amended Schedules D, E or F and Amended Creditor Matrix-Fee Required
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Amended Schedules D, E or F and Amended Creditor Matrix-Fee Required
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Amended Schedules-No Fee Required
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None List of Equity Security Holders
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/26/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Other Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Order to Vacate Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/19/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Monthly Report of Operations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Order on Motion for Relief from Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Motion to Reject
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Motion to Reject
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Order on Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None Monthly Report of Operations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Trustee's Statement Re: Creditor's Committee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Other Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Order on Application to Employ and Approve Retainer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Order on Chapter 11 Initial Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Order for Joint Administration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None 9013-1.1 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Application to Employ and Approve Retainer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Motion for Joint Administration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Chapter 11 Initial Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice(12-13815-ABC) [motion,mfrstr] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16390810. Fee amount 176.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt of Amended Schedules D, E or F and Amended Creditor Matrix-Fee Required(12-13815-ABC) [misc,amdschfe] ( 30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16166513. Fee amount 30.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of Amended Schedules D, E or F and Amended Creditor Matrix-Fee Required(12-13815-ABC) [misc,amdschfe] ( 30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16166513. Fee amount 30.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Corporate Resolution
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice(12-13815-ABC) [motion,mfrstr] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16088280. Fee amount 176.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice(12-13815-ABC) [motion,mfrstr] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16073870. Fee amount 176.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None List of Equity Security Holders
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay and 4001-1.1 Notice(12-13815-ABC) [motion,mfrstr] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15965215. Fee amount 176.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Automatic Docket of Credit Card
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Receipt of Voluntary Petition- Chapter 11(12-23129) [misc,volp11a] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16302708. Fee amount 1046.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of Voluntary Petition- Chapter 11(12-23129) [misc,volp11a] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16302708. Fee amount 1046.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Voluntary Petition-Chapter 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 4,277 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?