Round Rock Research, LLC v. Oracle Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-00332
District Judge Ron Clark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 3:50 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Desmarais LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Bondor +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 6460 paul.bondor@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe Tidwell & McCoy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Claud Tidwell +1 903 868 1933 +1 903 892 2397 jct@wtmlaw.net
v.
Oracle Corporation Oracle Corporation, Defendant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clyde Moody Siebman +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 siebman@siebman.com
Dell, Inc. Dell, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Perot Systems Corp
Unknown Role, Quest Software, Inc.

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

No Logo Arnold White & Durkee, Technical Advisor
Officially listed as "Michael T McLemore"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Mclemore +1 210 598 8563
No Logo Micron Technology, Inc., Third Party Defendant
Officially listed as "Micron Techology Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charlene Marie Morrow +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 cmorrow@fenwick.com
No Logo Robert W Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (288) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 10/24/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER GRANTING 286 Motion to Withdraw 278 Sealed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/22/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
      Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Round Rock Research LLC and Dell Inc. (McDavit, Jonas) Modified on 10/22/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Withdraw 278 Sealed Document by Dell, Inc., Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER DENYING 280 Joint MOTION to Stay JOINT MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Jury Selection/Trial set for 9/23/2013 9:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/12/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING ON MOTION 280 Joint MOTION to Stay JOINT MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2012 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/10/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
              RESPONSE to 269 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                ***DISREGARD ENTRY - LINKED INCORRECTLY TO R & R - TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY*** RESPONSE to 263 Report and Recommendations, by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) Modified on 10/10/2012 (kls, ). (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE to Motion re 280 Joint MOTION to Stay JOINT MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION filed by Micron Techology Inc.. (Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION to Stay JOINT MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 277 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Objections to Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/5/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 278 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Sealed Document - Micron Technology, Inc.'s Objection to Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Micron's Objection to Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: GRANTING 271 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order filed by Dell, Inc. Discovery Deadline 12/13/2012. Designate Expert Witnesses for parties with burden of proof by 11/8/2012. Designate Expert Witnesses on issues for which the parties do not bear the burden of proof by 11/29/2012. Dispositive Motions and any other motions that may require a hearing due by 11/19/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/2/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE to 270 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lauren M. Nowierski, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 266 MOTION To Limit The Number of Asserted Claims filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING IN PART 272 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/21/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Expedite to Shorten Time Support of its Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (Dkt 271) by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Reese, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                        OBJECTION to 262 Report and Recommendations by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                          OBJECTION to 263 Report and Recommendations by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cathleen G. Garrigan, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART 267 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/20/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Expedite to Shorten Time in Support of ITs Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims [Dkt. 266] by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                MOTION To Limit The Number of Asserted Claims by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Kaliski, # 2 Declaration of E. Mar, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 154 Third Party SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS by Third-Party Defendant Micron Technology, Inc. filed by Micron Techology Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/17/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER DENYING 208 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/17/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28 and 30 of U.S. Patent No. 6,145,098 and Claims 40, 41 and 44 of U.S. Patent No. 6,170,067. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/6/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/6/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER - The Court ORDERS each side to pay $19,550.00 to Michael T. McLemore, Technical Advisor, within 30 days from the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 9/5/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 8/9/2012 before Judge Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: David Maxwell,Telephone number: 903/892-8634. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE to 258 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF TO DKT. 225, DEFENDANT DELL'S RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Dell, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 255 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 8/14/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 256 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    SEALED SUR-REPLY re 208 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File ROUND ROCK RESEARCHS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DELLS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND UNDER SEAL by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 252 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 8/13/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 253 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          SEALED SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 208 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16 filed by Micron Technology, Inc. (Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Micron Technology, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in opposition to Dell Inc.'s Motion to Amend by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant: Claim Construction Hearing held on 8/9/2012, Motion for Summary Judgment argument, Briefing due in one week, response due one week after that (Court Reporter Dave Maxwell.) (dm, ) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28 and 30 of U.S. Patent No. 6,145,098 and Claims 40, 41 and 44 of U.S. Patent No. 6,170,067 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28 and 30 of U.S. Patent No. 6,145,098 and Claims 40, 41 and 44 of U.S. Patent No. 6,170,067 filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 246 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 8/1/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 247 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 208 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16 filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 22)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Its Replies to Round Rock and Micron's Separate Oppositions as a Consolidated Reply Brief by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 243 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Amend Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/30/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 208 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16 filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 22)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/30/2012 (baf, ). (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Its Motion for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16 Under Seal by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY in support of 198 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit / Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Dell, Inc., Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28 and 30 of U.S. Patent No. 6,145,098 and Claims 40, 41 and 44 of U.S. Patent No. 6,170,067 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 199 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/24/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING 204 Sealed Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/24/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 199 MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Third-Party defendant Micron Technology, INC. filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 233 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/18/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 231 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/18/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 234 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 208 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16, 233 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Micron's Opposition to Dell Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Answer filed by Micron Technology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Micron's Opposition to Dell Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Answer by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 232 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 208 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Dell's Motion For Leave to Amend by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 228 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/17/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 229 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 204 SEALED MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rochelle L. Woods, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Third-Party Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Discovery by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lauren Michelle Nowierski for Round Rock Research, LLC. (pkb, ) (Main Document 227 replaced on 7/16/2012) (pkb, ). (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 225 Reply to Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14, # 5 Exhibit 15, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit 17, # 8 Exhibit 18, # 9 Exhibit 19, # 10 Exhibit 20, # 11 Exhibit 21, # 12 Exhibit 22, # 13 Exhibit 23, # 14 Exhibit 24)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REPLY to 198 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Declaration of Eugene Mar, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 28 and 30 of U.S. Patent No. 6,145,098 and Claims 40, 41 and 44 of U.S. Patent No. 6,170,067 by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cathleen G. Garrigan, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 199 MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Third-Party defendant Micron Technology, INC. -- Declaration of Bryan Kohm In Support of Third-Party Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.'s Opposition to Third-Party Plaintiff Dell Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 199 MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Third-Party defendant Micron Technology, INC. filed by Micron Techology Inc.. (Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 220 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/11/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Extend the Deadlines to Produce Source Code and Supplemental Infringement Contentions Subject to the Court's June 21 Scheduling Order (Dkt. 197) by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Defendant Dell Inc.'s Motion to Extend the Deadlines to Produce Source Code and Supplemental Infringement Contentions Subject to the Court's June 21 Scheduling Order (Dkt. 197) by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/10/2012 (baf, ). (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC Plaintiff Round Rock Research LLC's Notice of Compliance With Order Regarding Technology Tutorial (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 215 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/6/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 216 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 154 Third Party SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS by Third-Party Defendant Micron Technology, Inc. filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cathleen G. Garrigan, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Plaintiff Dell Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Opposition to Third-Party Defendant Micron's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 9(b), 12(b)(3), 12(b)(6), and 14(a)(1), and 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) Under Seal by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 214 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ADDENDUM TO STIUPLATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/3/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 210 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/3/20012. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 206 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order filed by Round Rock Research, LLC, Dell, Inc. Discovery Deadline 11/12/2012. Designate Expert Witnesses on Issues for which that party does not have the burden of proof, and provide their Expert Witness Reporot(s) by 11/1/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 7/2/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Entry of An Addendum to the Stipulated Protective Order re 163 Protective Order by Dell, Inc., Micron Techology Inc., Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16 Under Seal by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 209 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 208 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13, # 2 Exhibit 14, # 3 Exhibit 15, # 4 Exhibit 16, # 5 Exhibit 17, # 6 Exhibit 18, # 7 Exhibit 19, # 8 Exhibit 20, # 9 Exhibit 21, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 208 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16 by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Motion for Leave to Amend Answer Pursuant to Rule 16 by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/2/2012 (baf, ). (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order by Dell, Inc., Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 203 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/28/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 204 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION to Stay Discovery by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ilana Rubel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND ACCOMPANYING DECLARATION OF ILANA RUBEL by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 200 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/26/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 201 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 154 Third Party SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS by Third-Party Defendant Micron Technology, Inc., 200 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Micron's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint filed by Micron Techology Inc.. (Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Micron's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents From Third-Party defendant Micron Technology, INC. by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rochelle L. Woods, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:( Discovery due by 11/5/2012., Jury instructions due by 3/20/2013, Mediation Completion due by 11/27/2012., Motions due by 11/19/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/13/2013.), ( Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/9/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant., Jury Trial set for 4/8/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Judge Ron Clark.) Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 116 (Sherman)via video before Judge Ron Clark. Jury Selection set for 4/8/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Judge Ron Clark. Motions in limine due by 3/13/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/21/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 193 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Sur-Reply in Support of Its Opposition to Dell's Motion to Reconsider Judge Mazzant's May 7, 2012 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/21/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 192 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Support of Round Rock's Opposition to Dell's Motion to Reconsider Judge Mazzant's May 7, 2012 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/21/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 194 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED SUR-REPLY in Support of Response to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order Under Local Rule 72(B) and Rule 4(A) of the Local Rules, Appendix B SEALED MOTION to Reconsider the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order Under Local Rule 72(B) and Rule 4(A) of the Local Rules, Appendix B filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Sur-Reply in Support of Its Opposition to Dell's Motion to Reconsider Judge Mazzant's May 7, 2012 Order by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Support of Round Rock's Opposition to Dell's Motion to Reconsider Judge Mazzant's May 7, 2012 Order by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Appearances of Allyson M. Franco and Paul A. Alsdorf as Counsel by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Alex Reese for Dell, Inc. (pad, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rochelle Lee Woods for Dell, Inc. (pad, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cathleen G Garrigan for Dell, Inc. (pad, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***REPLACED WITH DOCUMENT #188*** APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cathleen G Garrigan for Dell, Inc. (pad, ) Modified on 6/12/2012 (pad, ). (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew A Hollander for Dell, Inc. (pad, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 185 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 154 Third Party SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS by Third-Party Defendant Micron Technology, Inc. filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Roderick M. Thompson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Third-Party Defendant Micron's Motion to Dismiss Under Seal by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Objections To and Motion for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order Under Local Rule 72(B) and Rule 4(A) of the Local Rules, Appendix B SEALED MOTION to Reconsider the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order Under Local Rule 72(B) and Rule 4(A) of the Local Rules, Appendix B filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rochelle L. Woods, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***INCORRECT EVENT USED. ATTORNEY MUST REFILE. SEE DOCUMENT #183*** Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Objections to and Motion for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 6/11/2012 (pad, ). Modified on 6/11/2012 (pad, ). (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Its Objections to and Motion for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 175 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 154 Third Party SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS by Third-Party Defendant Micron Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 6/11/2012. Replies due by 6/25/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/5/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING 144 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/5/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 177 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 142 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/5/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 134 MOTION to Compel Document Production and Non-Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 154 Third Party SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS by Third-Party Defendant Micron Technology, Inc. by Dell, Inc., Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR - The Court hereby appoints Michael T. McLemore to serve as the Technical Advisor for the Court in this case. Michael T McLemore added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/4/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 169 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/4/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 167 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/4/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 165 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/4/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 170 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 160 SEALED MOTION to Reconsider the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order Under Local Rule 72(B) and Rule 4(A) of the Local Rules, Appendix B SEALED MOTION to Reconsider the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order Under Local Rule 72(B) and Rule 4(A) of the Local Rules, Appendix B filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Round Rock Research's Opposition to Dell's Motion to Reconsider Judge Mazzant's May 7, 2012 Order by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 168 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 144 SEALED MOTION to Permit Dell to Have Limited Access to Documents Designated as "Outside Attorneys' Eyes Only" by Round Rock filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Round Rock Research's Opposition to Dell's Motion to Permit Dell to Have Limited Access to Documents Designated as "Outside Attorneys' Eyes Only" by Round Rock by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 166 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 142 SEALED MOTION to Stay Its Obligation to Produce Its Confidential Documents to Desmarais LLP Pending Final Adjudication of Dell's Objections to and Motion for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Dell's Motion to Stay Its Obligation to Produce Its Confidential Documents to Desmarais LLP Pending Final Adjudication of Dell's Objections to And Motion for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 134 MOTION to Compel Document Production and Non-Infringement Contentions filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rochelle L. Woods)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/22/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 159 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/22/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION to Reconsider the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order Under Local Rule 72(B) and Rule 4(A) of the Local Rules, Appendix B by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Objections Under F.R.C.P. 72(A) and Motion to Reconsider the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order Under Local Rule 72(B) and Rule 4(A) of the Local Rules, Appendix B by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a Joint Protective Order no later than 12:00 p.m. on 5/25/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/18/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 155 Response to Non-Motion, Sur-Reply to Round Rock's Reply by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 153 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/17/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 147 Response to Non-Motion Reply to Dell Inc.'s Response and Objection to Round Rock Research's Notice of Compliance by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/5/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Third Party SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS by Third-Party Defendant Micron Technology, Inc. by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Micron's Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ilana S Rubel on behalf of Micron Techology Inc. (Rubel, Ilana) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laurence F Pulgram on behalf of Micron Techology Inc. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charlene M Morrow on behalf of Micron Techology Inc. (Morrow, Charlene) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 143 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/15/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 141 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/15/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 140 Notice (Other) Response and Objection to Plaintiff Round Rock Research's Improper Notice of Compliance with the Court's April 11, 2012 Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 144 SEALED MOTION to Permit Dell to Have Limited Access to Documents Designated as "Outside Attorneys' Eyes Only" by Round Rock. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 145 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 144 SEALED MOTION to Permit Dell to Have Limited Access to Documents Designated as "Outside Attorneys' Eyes Only" by Round Rock. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit P, # 4 Exhibit Q, # 5 Exhibit R, # 6 Exhibit S, # 7 Exhibit T, # 8 Exhibit U, # 9 Exhibit V, # 10 Exhibit W, # 11 Exhibit X)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 144 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION to Permit Dell to Have Limited Access to Documents Designated as "Outside Attorneys' Eyes Only" by Round Rock by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal a Motion to Permit Dell to Have Limited Access to Documents Designated as "Outside Attorneys' Eyes Only" By Round Rock by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 142 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION to Stay Its Obligation to Produce Its Confidential Documents to Desmarais LLP Pending Final Adjudication of Dell's Objections to and Motion for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene Y Mar, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal a Motion to Stay Its Obligation to Produce Its Confidential Documents to Desmarais LLP Pending Final Adjudication of Dell's Objections to and Motion for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's May 7, 2012 Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS APRIL 11, 2012 ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McDavit, Jonas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2012: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING 110 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/11/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 126 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/8/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC Notice of Compliance With the Court's May 8, 2012 Order (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE Round Rock Research's AMENDED Response in Opposition to Motion re 110 SEALED MOTION for F.R.C.P. 26(b)(5)(B) Privilege Determination filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DISREGARD - ENTERED IN WRONG CASE*** ORDER that Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. #108) no later than 5:00 p.m. on May 10, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/8/12. (tls, ) Modified on 5/8/2012 (tls, ). (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Document Production and Non-Infringement Contentions by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 131 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 5/7/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 132 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 129 MOTION for Leave to File Round Rock's Response to Dell's Motion for F.R.C.P. 26(b)(5) Determination filed by Dell, Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal an Opposition to Round Rock Research's Opposed Motion for Leave to File Portions of its Opposition to Dell's Motion for a Rule 26(B)(5) Privilege Determination Ex Parte by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Dell, Inc., Round Rock Research, LLC JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Round Rock's Response to Dell's Motion for F.R.C.P. 26(b)(5) Determination by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 110 SEALED MOTION for F.R.C.P. 26(b)(5)(B) Privilege Determination filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Dell's Motion for F.R.C.P. 26(b)(5)(B) Determination by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 120 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/26/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Micron Techology Inc. re 118 MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DELL INC.S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AND 119 EX PARTE MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING AND HEARING ON ITS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DELL'S THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (NOTICE OF WITHDRAW OF MOTIONS) (Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Micron Techology Inc..( Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** MOTION to Withdraw 118 MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DELL INC.S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AND 119 EX PARTE MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING AND HEARING ON ITS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DELL'S THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Micron Techology Inc.. (Kohm, Bryan) Modified on 4/26/2012 (baf, ). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 107 SEALED MOTION To File Under Seal Its Motion For Reconsideration of Order Re Entry of Protective Order filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10 - part 1, # 12 Exhibit 10 - part 2, # 13 Exhibit 11)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion to File Under Seal A Reply in Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration of Order Re Entry of Protective Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite EX PARTE MOTION OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING AND HEARING ON ITS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DELLS THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan) Modified on 4/25/2012 (baf, ). (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DELL INC.S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Micron Techology Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Alexander Kohm on behalf of Micron Techology Inc. (Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Micron Techology Inc. on 4/11/2012, answer due: 5/2/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/23/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 112 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/23/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 107 SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Order Re Entry of Protective Order filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Response to Dell's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 11, 2012 Order Under Seal by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 109 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/18/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION for F.R.C.P. 26(b)(5)(B) Privilege Determination by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion for F.R.C.P. 26(b)(5)(B) Determination by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 106 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/16/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration of Order Re Entry of Protective Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion for Reconsideration of Order Re Entry of Protective Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 80 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/11/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 101 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/10/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Micron Techology Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 101 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File ROUND ROCK RESEARCHS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DELLS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER SEAL filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File ROUND ROCK RESEARCHS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DELLS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER UNDER SEAL by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 97 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/9/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 99 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document.Third Party Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Round Rock Research, LLC Re: Initial Disclosures (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint Under Seal by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Add Two Potential Indemnitors as Parties by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC ROUND ROCKS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS MARCH 26, 2012 ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF ASSERTED CLAIMS (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 90 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/30/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 91 Motion Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/30/12. (snh, ) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 92 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 80 SEALED MOTION for Entry of a Protective Order to Preclude John DesMarais and other Members and Employees of DesMarais LLP from Accessing Dell's Confidential and High Confidential Information filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar, # 2 Exhibit X, # 3 Exhibit Y, # 4 Exhibit Z)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Entry of a Protective Order Under Seal by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 71 Motion to Limit Number of Asserted Claims ; GRANTING 76 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/26/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 76 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL NON-INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS FROM DELL, INC. filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 86 Motion to Seal Document 85 Sealed Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 3/20/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document 85 Sealed Response to Motion,, Round Rock's Opposition to Dell's Motion for Entry of a Protective Order by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 85 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 80 SEALED MOTION for Entry of a Protective Order to Preclude John DesMarais and other Members and Employees of DesMarais LLP from Accessing Dell's Confidential and High Confidential Information 84 MOTION to Seal Document Round Rock's Opposition to Dell's Motion for Entry of a Protective Order, filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gerard A. deBlasi, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTOREY MUST REFILE*** MOTION to Seal Document Round Rock's Opposition to Dell's Motion for Entry of a Protective Order by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas) Modified on 3/20/2012 (baf, ). (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/14/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL NON-INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS FROM DELL, INC. filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 79 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 2/29/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION for Entry of a Protective Order to Preclude John DesMarais and other Members and Employees of DesMarais LLP from Accessing Dell's Confidential and High Confidential Information by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene Y. Mar, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion for Protective Order by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit J. McDavit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10, # 6 Exhibit 11, # 7 Exhibit 12)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Oracle Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL NON-INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS FROM DELL, INC. by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 McDavit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(McDavit, Jonas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2012: # 11 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Dell, Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Deron R Dacus (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - GRANTING 59 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/25/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of E. Mar, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on 1/5/2012 before Judge Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: David Maxwell,Telephone number: 903/892-8634. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2012. (pad, ) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING/DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Setting set for 3/4/2013 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2012. Discovery Deadline 11/5/2012. Expert Witnesses and Reports on Issues for which the party bears the burden of proof due by 9/19/2012. Expert Witnesses and Reports on Issues for which the party does not bear the burden of proof due by 10/19/2012. Witness List due by 2/1/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 4/6/2012. Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Form due by 2/1/2013. Mediation Completion due by 11/27/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2012. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/1/2013. Motions in Limine due 2/1/2013. Claim Construction Prehearing Conference (if necessary) 5/11/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Sherman, Texas. Claim Constuction Hearing (i.e. Markman Hearing) 8/9/2012 at 9:00 a.m. at the US Courthouse Annex Sherman, Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 1/6/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION - The Court hereby ORDERS that this case be submitted to mediation in accordance with this Court's Mediation Plan. The mediator assigned is Robert W Faulkner. The mediation conference shall be conducted by the following date: 11/27/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 1/5/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 1/6/2012. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant: Scheduling Conference held on 1/5/2012. (Court Reporter D. Maxwell.) (dm, ) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 12/27/2011. (pad, ) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Round Rock Research, LLC (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC Notice of Compliance with Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED UNDER THE WRONT EVENT. ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Round Rock Research, LLC. (McDavit, Jonas) Modified on 12/27/2011 (pad, ). (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition to Round Rock Research's Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. #59) filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of E. Mar, # 2 Exhibit A - Dell Acquires KACE Press Release, # 3 Exhibit B - Dell Acquires EqualLogic Press Release, # 4 Exhibit C - KACE-Systems-Management-Appliance, # 5 Exhibit D - SAN HQ Tech Report, # 6 Exhibit E - IPMI Adopter's List, # 7 Exhibit F - IPMI Table of Contents, # 8 Exhibit G - Working with BMC, # 9 Exhibit H - CMC Overview, # 10 Exhibit I - DRAC 5 Overview, # 11 Exhibit J - OpenManage ITA, # 12 Exhibit K - DMC User Guide, # 13 Exhibit L - OpenManage Server Admin, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 51 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, ROUND ROCK RESEARCHS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS NOVEMBER 21, 2011 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DKT. # 51.) by Round Rock Research, LLC. (McDavit, Jonas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimball R Anderson on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Anderson, Kimball) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 48 Amended Complaint, by Dell, Inc..(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 55 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline is extended to 1/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 11/28/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Serve Infringement Contentions as to Oracle by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Dell, Inc. Dell's Disclosure Pursuant to the Court's November 7, 2011 Order to Meet, Report, and Appear at Scheduling Conference (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Oracle Corporation (Certificate of Interested Parties) (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC ROUND ROCK RESEARCHS DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO THE COURTS NOVEMBER 7, 2011 ORDER TO MEET, REPORT AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - It is ORDERED that defendant Dell, Inc.'s 22 Motion to Dismiss and defendant Oracle Corporation's 25 Motion to Dismiss are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/18/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 39 Report and Recommendations, 32 Motion to Change Venue,, filed by Dell, Inc., Oracle Corporation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/17/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 46 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 11/16/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dell, Inc., Oracle Corporation, filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE***AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dell, Inc., Oracle Corporation, filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(McDavit, Jonas) Modified on 11/14/2011 (baf, ). (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 44 Amended Complaint, by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B, Exhibit A to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit C, Exhibit B to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit D, Exhibit C to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit E, Exhibit D to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit F, Exhibit E to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit G, Exhibit F to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit H, Exhibit G to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit I, Exhibit H to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 11 Exhibit J, Exhibit I to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 12 Exhibit K, Exhibit J to Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 43 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Round Rock Research, LLC. (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dell, Inc., Oracle Corporation, filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION to 39 Report and Recommendations by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO MEET, REPORT AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Counsel and all unrepresented parties must comply with the following deadlines: Deadline to file Motions to Transfer 12/15/2011. Hold a meeting as required by FRCP 26(f) by 12/15/2011. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 12/22/2011. Deadline to serve Disclosures of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions pursuant to Patent rules 3-1 and 3-2. Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2012 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 11/7/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** MOTION for Reconsideration re 39 Report and Recommendations and Objection to by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 11/7/2011 (baf, ). (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement filed by Oracle Corporation, 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Dell, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/25/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 32 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas filed by Dell, Inc., Oracle Corporation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 10/21/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 McDavit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 29, # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibit 31)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas DEFENDANTS' REPLY ISO THEIR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by Dell, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tim Morris, # 2 Declaration of Tim Knight)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 McDavit Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28)(McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement filed by Oracle Corporation. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas by Dell, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Fountain Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Fountain Decl - Bloomberg Law article, # 3 Exhibit B to Fountain Decl - The AM Law Daily, # 4 Exhibit C to Fountain Decl - Verio web site pages, # 5 Exhibit D to Fountain Decl - Judicial Caseload Profile Report, # 6 Thompson Declaration, # 7 Hackett Declaration, # 8 Exhibit A to Hackett Decl - 11/23/10 corres, # 9 Exhibit B to Hackett Decl - 4/4/11 corres, # 10 Knight Declaration, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (McDavit, Jonas) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Carrie L Williamson for Oracle Corporation (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oracle Corporation (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC that Case is Ready for Scheduling Conference (Tidwell, James) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark D Fowler for Oracle Corporation (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alan A Limbach for Oracle Corporation (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Text of Proposed Order re More Definite Statement)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Oracle Corporation (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell, Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Allyson M Franco for Dell, Inc. (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eugene Y Mar for Dell, Inc. (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul A Alsdorf for Dell, Inc. (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Roderick M Thompson for Dell, Inc. (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Julie B Wahlstrand,Douglas R Young for Dell, Inc. (RECEIPT 6-4363- $200.00). (Attachments: # 1 PHV Young)(rml, ) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of Oracle Corporation (Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Oracle Corporation.( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dell, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Oracle Corporation.( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dell, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Dell, Inc. on 6/10/2011, answer due: 7/1/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Oracle Corporation on 6/10/2011, answer due: 7/1/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonas R McDavit for Round Rock Research, LLC (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul A Bondor for Round Rock Research, LLC (FEE PAID). (baf, ) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 6/10/2011. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Dell, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Oracle Corporation. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant pursuant to a Standing Order. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT sent to Round Rock Research, LLC (baf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Round Rock Research, LLC (Tidwell, James) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Dell, Inc., Oracle Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3070470.), filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark, # 3 Exhibit A - '816 Patent, # 4 Exhibit B - '098 Patent, # 5 Exhibit C - '067 Patent, # 6 Exhibit D - '173 Patent, # 7 Exhibit E - '838 Patent, # 8 Exhibit F - '721 Patent, # 9 Exhibit G - '006 Patent, # 10 Exhibit H - '416 Patent, # 11 Exhibit I - '342 Patent)(Tidwell, James) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 334 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?