In re: Polyurethane Foam Antitrust Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:10-md-02196-JZ
District Judge Jack Zouhary, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2019 at 2:18 PM EDT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Direct Action Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Liston, III +1 601 981 1636 +1 601 982 0371 wlist3@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa B. Willett +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 mwillett@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chahira Solh +1 949 263 8400 +1 949 263 8414 csolh@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewsnup King & Olsen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Henri Patton +1 305 373 1000 +1 305 372 1861 dhp@kennynachwalter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartzog Conger Cason & Neville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt Maguire Rupert +1 405 235 7000 +1 405 996 3403 krupert@hartzoglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vanessa Roberts Avery +1 860 275 6700 +1 860 560 5956 vavery@mccarter.com
Space Eric Watt Wiechmann +1 860 275 6731 +1 860 724 3397 ewiechmann@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Bryan Wolfson +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 adamwolfson@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan LLP-Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MEEGAN F. HOLLYWOOD +1 212 980 7400 +1 212 980 7499 mhollywood@robinskaplan.com
Space Hollis L. Salzman +1 212 980 7400 +1 212 980 7499 hsalzman@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Wicklund +1 419 321 1213 +1 419 241 6894 dwicklund@slk-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by STEPHEN A. BRANDON, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen A. Brandon +1 601 714 2771 +1 601 982 0371 steve@stevebrandonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams, Montgomery & John, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Lynch +1 312 443 3200 +1 312 630 8508 jpl@willmont.com
No Logo Direct Purchaser Class, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Liston, III +1 601 981 1636 +1 601 982 0371 wlist3@aol.com

Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sathya S. Gosselin +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 sgosselin@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Earthlink, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian R. Strange +1 310 207 5055 +1 310 826 3210 lacounsel@earthlink.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lee Albert +1 212 682 5340 +1 212 884 0988 lalbert@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert G. Eisler +1 302 622 7000 +1 302 622 7100 reisler@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartzog Conger Cason & Neville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt Maguire Rupert +1 405 235 7000 +1 405 996 3403 krupert@hartzoglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth Rich Gassman +1 202 540 7226 +1 202 540 7201 sgassman@hausfeld.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenny Nachwalter Seymour Arnold Critchlow and Spector

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jay Blechman +1 305 373 1000 +1 305 372 1861 wblechman@kennynachwalter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kerger & Kerger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly A. Conklin +1 419 255 5990 +1 419 255 5997 kconklin@kergerkerger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lite DePalma Greenberg & Rivas, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mindee Jill Reuben +1 267 314 7980 +1 973 623 0858 mreuben@litedepalma.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Watt Wiechmann +1 860 275 6731 +1 860 724 3397 ewiechmann@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pearson Simon Soter Warshaw & Penny LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Michael Sheanin +1 415 433 9000 +1 415 433 9008 asheanin@pswlaw.com

Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmen A. Medici - NOT SWORN +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 cmedici@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan LLP-Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MEEGAN F. HOLLYWOOD +1 212 980 7400 +1 212 980 7499 mhollywood@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hollis L. Salzman +1 212 980 7400 +1 212 980 7499 hsalzman@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Wicklund +1 419 321 1213 +1 419 241 6894 dwicklund@slk-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strange & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Russell Strange +1 310 207 5055 +1 310 826 3210 jhood@strangeandcarpenter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams, Montgomery & John, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Lynch +1 312 443 3200 +1 312 630 8508 jpl@willmont.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wood & Lamping

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Price +1 513 852 6003 +1 513 852 6087 wcprice@woodlamping.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Woolmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald J. Aranoff +1 212 382 3300 +1 212 382 0050 raranoff@wmd-law.com
No Logo Indirect Purchaser Class, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Liston, III +1 601 981 1636 +1 601 982 0371 wlist3@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marvin Allen Miller +1 312 782 4880 +1 312 782 4485 mmlaw4you@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Brian Shapiro +1 305 789 3229 +1 305 789 3395 jshapiro@swmwas.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartzog Conger Cason & Neville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt Maguire Rupert +1 405 235 7000 +1 405 996 3403 krupert@hartzoglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenny Nachwalter, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jay Blechman +1 305 373 1000 +1 305 372 1861 wblechman@kennynachwalter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kerger & Kerger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly A. Conklin +1 419 255 5990 +1 419 255 5997 kconklin@kergerkerger.com

Represented by Kerger and Associates

Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Watt Wiechmann +1 860 275 6731 +1 860 724 3397 ewiechmann@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin Alan Miller +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 mmiller@millerlawllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Bryan Wolfson +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 adamwolfson@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan LLP-Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MEEGAN F. HOLLYWOOD +1 212 980 7400 +1 212 980 7499 mhollywood@robinskaplan.com
Space Hollis L. Salzman +1 212 980 7400 +1 212 980 7499 hsalzman@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C. Schubert +1 415 788 4220 + 415 788 0161 rschubert@schubert-reed.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Wicklund +1 419 321 1213 +1 419 241 6894 dwicklund@slk-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strange & Butler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian R. Strange +1 310 207 5055 +1 310 826 3210 lacounsel@earthlink.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strange & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Russell Strange +1 310 207 5055 +1 310 826 3210 jhood@strangeandcarpenter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams, Montgomery & John, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Lynch +1 312 443 3200 +1 312 630 8508 jpl@willmont.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAMSON PETTY LC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori Ann Fanning +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 lfanning@millerlawllc.com
No Logo Indirect Purchasers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartzog Conger Cason & Neville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt Maguire Rupert +1 405 235 7000 +1 405 996 3403 krupert@hartzoglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenny Nachwalter, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jay Blechman +1 305 373 1000 +1 305 372 1861 wblechman@kennynachwalter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kerger and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly A. Conklin +1 419 255 5990 +1 419 255 5997 kconklin@kergerkerger.com
Space Richard M. Kerger +1 419 255 5990 +1 419 255 5997 rkerger@kergerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Watt Wiechmann +1 860 275 6731 +1 860 724 3397 ewiechmann@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori Ann Fanning +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 lfanning@millerlawllc.com
Space Marvin Alan Miller +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 mmiller@millerlawllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Bryan Wolfson +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 adamwolfson@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan LLP-Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MEEGAN F. HOLLYWOOD +1 212 980 7400 +1 212 980 7499 mhollywood@robinskaplan.com
Space Hollis L. Salzman +1 212 980 7400 +1 212 980 7499 hsalzman@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Wicklund +1 419 321 1213 +1 419 241 6894 dwicklund@slk-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams, Montgomery & John, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Lynch +1 312 443 3200 +1 312 630 8508 jpl@willmont.com
v.
No Logo Carpenter Canada Co., Defendant

Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

No Logo Carpenter Company, Defendant

Represented by Cooper & Walinski

Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas G. Hooper +1 704 417 3000 +1 704 377 4814 tom.hooper@nelsonmullins.com
No Logo Carpenter Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

No Logo Crest Foam Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard B. Iwrey +1 313 465 7000
No Logo David Carson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carson, David

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Carson +1 419 825 5080
No Logo Defendants' Liaison Counsel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael R. Hoernlein +1 704 444 1000 +1 704 444 1111 michael.hoernlein@alston.com

Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

No Logo Domfoam International Inc., Defendant

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

No Logo E.R. Carpenter, L.P., Defendant

Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

No Logo Flexible Foam Products Inc., Defendant

Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Cogburn & Brazil, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max O. Cogburn, Jr. +1 828 255 5400 +1 828 258 8972 mcogburn@cobralawfirm.com
No Logo Foamex Innovations, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter M. Ryan +1 215 994 2449 +1 215 655 2449 peter.ryan@dechert.com
No Logo Future Foam, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN P. PASSARELLI +1 402 341 3070 +1 402 341 0216

Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

No Logo FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter M. Ryan +1 215 994 2449 +1 215 655 2449 peter.ryan@dechert.com
No Logo Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company, Defendant

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

No Logo Inoac Usa, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard B. Iwrey +1 313 465 7000
No Logo Leggett & Platt, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Louis Carson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carson, Louis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis Carson +1 419 346 3533
No Logo Mohawk Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall L. Allen +1 404 881 7000 +8817 881 881 7777

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

No Logo Ohio Decorative Products, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

No Logo Otto Bock Polyurethane Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bunda, Stutz & DeWitt - Perrysburg

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

No Logo Plastomer Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Plastomer Corp."

Represented by Butzel Long, PC

No Logo Scottdel, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Friends of Peter Lawson Jones

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry J. Geha, III +1 419 242 7985 +1 419 242 0316 hgeha@ralaw.com
No Logo Valle Foam Industries, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

No Logo Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cosgrave Vergeer Kester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Coleman +1 503 323 9000 +1 503 323 9019 tcoleman@cvk-law.com

Represented by Eastman & Smith

Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Everett J. Bowman +1 704 377 8329 +1 704 373 3929 ebowman@rbh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence C. Moore, III +1 704 377 8303 +1 704 373 3903 lmoore@rbh.com
No Logo Vitafoam Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cosgrave Vergeer Kester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Coleman +1 503 323 9000 +1 503 323 9019 tcoleman@cvk-law.com

Represented by Eastman & Smith

Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Everett J. Bowman +1 704 377 8329 +1 704 373 3929 ebowman@rbh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence C. Moore, III +1 704 377 8303 +1 704 373 3903 lmoore@rbh.com
No Logo Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

No Logo Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

No Logo Woodbridge Group, Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Keith Hutto +1 803 255 9575 +1 803 255 9109 keith.hutto@nelsonmullins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. Latham +1 803 255 9533 +1 803 255 9075 bill.latham@nelsonmullins.com

Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

No Logo Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

No Logo Arsenal Capital Partners, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Patrick McGuire +1 919 862 2279 +1 919 862 2579 matt.mcguire@alston.com
Space THOMAS G. WALKER +1 919 862 2212 +1 919 862 2260 thomas.walker@alston.com
The Dow Chemical Company The Dow Chemical Company, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Bernick +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 david.bernick@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by James N. Esterkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Neal Rains +1 216 515 1645 +1 216 515 1650 nrains@frantzward.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
Office Cleveland
Filed 12/2/2010
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Cuyahoga
Terminated 11/2/2016
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 11-4118[6th Circuit], 15-1497[Federal Circuit], 15-3481[6th Circuit], 15-3680[6th Circuit], 16-3168[6th Circuit], 16-3179[6th Circuit], 16-3181[6th Circuit], 16-3189[6th Circuit], 16-3241[6th Circuit], 17-3361[6th Circuit], 17-3548[6th Circuit]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags Appeal,Cat02,Complex,Knepp,Lead,MDL2196,Protect,Termed
  Entries (2240) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 2172 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Motion for disbursement/distribution
Motion for disbursement/distribution CORRECTED - Motion for an Order Approving Claims, Authorizing Distribution of Net Settlement Funds, Initial Payment of Claims Administration Fees and Expenses, and for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred After January 27, 2016 filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[2020]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Eric J. Miller, # (2) Exhibit B - Declaration of Marvin A. Miller, # (3) Exhibit C - Supplemental Declaration of Richard M. Kerger, # (4) Exhibit D - Declaration of Jay B. Shapiro, # (5) Exhibit E - Declaration of Martin D. Holmes)(Miller, Marvin)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2170 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Notice
Class Submission of Escrow Agent Quaterly Invoices filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Court Order Doc #1925, # (2) Exhibit B - Invoices - Escrow Agent)(Miller, Marvin)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Acknowledgment from the USCA
    Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of [2167] Notice of Appeal (USCA# 17-3548). Date filed in USCA 5/24/17. (H,SP)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2169 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Order on Motion to appeal in forma pauperisCourt Filing
      Marginal Entry Order granting [2168] Motion to appeal in forma pauperis. Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/19/2017.(D,L)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2168 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017, Terminated: 5/19/2017 Motion to appeal in forma pauperis
        Motion to appeal in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Andrews. (M,L) Modified text on 5/19/2017 (M,L).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2167 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the [2166] Order on Motion for leave (to file Motion to stay sanctions judgment) [2165] filed by Christopher Andrews. Filing fee not paid (M,L). Modified text on 5/22/2017 (H,SP).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
            Copy of [2169] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 5/19/2017. (D,L)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2166 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
              Order granting [2165] Andrews' Request for Leave to File Motion to Stay Sanctions Judgment pending appeal and denying [2165]-1 Motion to Stay. See Order for details. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 5/4/2017.(D,L)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2165 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017, Terminated: 5/4/2017 Motion for leave
                Motion for leave to file motion filed by Christopher Andrews. Related document(s)[2113], [2150]. (Attachments: # (1) Motion to stay sanctions judgment)(R,Ke)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                  Copy of [2166] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 5/4/2017. (D,L)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2164 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: 4/18/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                    Order. Objector pro se Christopher Andrews requests leave to file a Motion to Vacate Sanctions, attached as Exhibit A. Andrews' argument is frivolous, and therefore his request for leave to file the Motion is denied. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 4/18/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(D,L)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                      Copy of [2164] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 4/18/2017. (D,L)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Acknowledgment from the USCA
                        Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of [2161] Notice of Appeal (USCA# 17-3361). Date filed in USCA 4/11/17. (H,SP)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2163 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to AppealCourt Filing
                          Order granting [2156] Objector Andrews' Motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis [2156]. Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/11/2017.(D,L)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                            Copy of [2163] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 4/11/2017. (D,L)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2161 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Notice of Appeal
                              NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the [2144] Order of 1/19/17, [2150] Order and [2151] Judgment Entry of 2/28/17, [2113] Order of 10/24/16, filed by Christopher Andrews. Filing fee not paid. (R,Ke) Modified text on 4/7/2017 (H,SP).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2160 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                Order. Objector Andrews' Request for Leave to File Appeal and Motion to File and Proceed In Forma Pauperis [2156] remains pending. In response to that Request, this Court ordered Objector Andrews to submit under seal copiesof his account statements from Citizens Bank, plus any other bank account he held, for the period October 2016 to March 2017 [2159]. To date this Court has not received a response from Andrews. Andrews' response is due by Friday, April 14, 2017. If this Court does not receive a response by that date, Andrews' Request [2156] will be denied. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 4/4/2017. (D,L)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                  Copy of [2160] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 4/4/2017. (D,L)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2159 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                    Order. In response to this Court's prior Order [2157], class counsel filed under seal a copy of the documents produced by Objector Christopher Andrews [2158] during the limited financial discovery in this matter. Those documents include account statements from Citizens Bank for December 2014 to July 2015 [2158], but no more recent bank records. Andrews shall submit under seal copies of his account statements from Citizens Bank, plus any other bank account he held, for the period October 2016 to March 2017. Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/28/2017. (D,L)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                      Copy of [2159] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on on 3/28/2017. (D,L)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2158 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Sealed Document
                                        SEALED Document:Notice of Filing filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[2157]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Deposition Transcript, # (2) Exhibit Bank Statements, # (3) Exhibit Email with attachments, # (4) Exhibit IRS Form, # (5) Exhibit Receipts, # (6) Exhibit Vehicle Registration)(Kerger, Richard)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2157 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                          Order re Objector Christopher Andrews' Motion for Permission to Appeal in forma pauperis [2156]. This Court requires additional documentation of Andrews' financial status to effectively evaluate his Motion. Class counsel shall promptly file under seal the documents referenced in the January 9 and January 13 Orders (Docs. [2133], [2141]), which were produced by Andrews during the limited discovery related to the October 24 Order (Doc. [2113]). Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/22/2017. (D,L)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                            Copy of [2157] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 2/28/201 on 3/22/2017. (D,L)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2156 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 4/11/2017 Motion for Leave to Appeal
                                              Motion for leave to appeal, Motion to appeal in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Andrews. Related document(s)[2144], [2151], [2113], [2150]. (R,Ke)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2155 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                Order Approving Distribution and granting [2152] Motion For Order to Approve Distribution of Settlement Funds to Class Members and Payment of Administrative Fees and Expenses for the Direct Purchaser Settlement Classes. See Order for details. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 3/14/2017.(D,L)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2154 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  Marginal Entry Order approving [2149] Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class' Submission of Escrow Agent Invoices for Payment. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 3/14/2017. (D,L)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2153 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Sealed Document
                                                    SEALED Document:Exhibit B of Brasefield Declaration filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[42], [2152]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B - Distribution Chart)(Felder, Melissa)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2200 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2152 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017, Terminated: 3/14/2017 Motion for order
                                                        Motion For Order to Approve Distribution of Settlement Funds to Class Members and Payment of Administrative Fees and Expenses for the Direct Purchaser Settlement Classes filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Brasefield Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit A - Invoices, # (3) Exhibit B - Distribution Chart, # (4) Proposed Order)(Felder, Melissa)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2199 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Leave
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2151 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                            Judgment Entry re: Sanctions. This Court confirms the previously imposed sanction award of $15,303 [2113], with the addition of interest for the months of November 2016, December 2016, and January 2017 in the amount of $6,579 [2042]-5, for a total penalty of $21,882. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/28/2017. (D,L)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2150 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              Order re: Sanctions. See Order for details. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/28/2017. (D,L)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2197 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Disbursement/Distribution
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                  Copy of [2150] and [2151] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 2/28/2017. (D,L)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2196 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2149 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: 2/16/2017 Notice
                                                                      Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class' Submission of Escrow Agent Invoices for Payment filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[1925].(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2195 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2148 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                          Marginal Entry Order. Request for Leave to File Response [2147] is granted. Relief requested in Response to Order Dkt. 2144 [2147-1] is denied. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/14/2017.(D,L)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2194 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2147 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017, Terminated: 2/14/2017 Motion for order
                                                                              Request for Leave to File Response to [2144] Order filed by Christopher Andrews. Related document(s)[2144]. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Response)(M,L)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2193 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                  Copy of [2148] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 2/14/2017. (D,L)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2192 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2146 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Reply
                                                                                      Reply in support of [2107] Motion for sanctions Indirect Purchaser Class' Motion for Sanctions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2145 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Appeal Remark
                                                                                        Appeal Order from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied re [2131] (No. 16-7328) (H,SP)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                          Copy of [2143] and [2144] HAND DELIVERED to Christopher Andrews at the U.S. District Court (while here for his deposition) 1/20/2017. (D,L)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2189 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2144 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              Order. Previous Orders (Docs. [2113], [2123], [2124], [2127], & [2133]) filed by this Court were designated in the caption as related to "All Direct Purchaser Class Actions." Those Orders are corrected by interlineation to reflect that they are related to "All Indirect Purchaser Class Actions." Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/19/2017. (D,L)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2143 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Letter
                                                                                                Letter to Christopher Andrews from the Clerk's Office. (Attachments: # (1) Sixth Circuit Docs)(D,L)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2142 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Marginal Entry Order granting [2139] Request for leave to file Response to docket [2138]. See Doc. [2139]. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 1/13/2017.(D,L)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2186 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2141 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Order on Motion to extend deadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Marginal Entry Order granting [2140] Motion for extension of time to produce documents. Deadline for production is now January 18, 2017. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/13/2017.(D,L) Modified text on 1/17/2017 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2140 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for extension of time (other)
                                                                                                        Motion for extension of time to produce documents until January 18, 2017 filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[2139]. (Kerger, Richard) Modified text on 1/17/2017 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2184 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for disbursement/distribution
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2139 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for leave
                                                                                                            Request for leave to file Response to docket [2138] filed by Christopher Andrews. (H,JD)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                              Copy of [2141] and [2142] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 1/13/2017. (D,L)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2138 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Notice
                                                                                                                Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Conduct of Christopher Andrews and Suggestions for Additional Sanctions filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - January 6, 2017 Email, # (2) Exhibit B - January 8, 2017 Email)Related document(s)[2127].(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2137 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal Service upon Christopher Andrews on 1/6/2017. (M,L)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2136 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017, Terminated: 1/10/2017 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR, document returned per Order [2123]. Request for leave to file proof of $6.2 attorney fee fraud on Court filed by Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(H,JD) Modified on 1/10/2017 (H,JD).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2135 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court ReporterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Transcript of Hearing held on January 6, 2017 before Judge Jack Zouhary. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Angela Nixon at (419) 260-5259. [28 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 1/17/2017. Redaction Request due 1/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2017. (N,A)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2134 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 01/06/2017 before Judge Zouhary, Court Reporter: Angela Nixon. Requested completion date: 01/13/2017 filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2133 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Minute Order _ Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Order. This Court held a Record Hearing on 1/6/2017 regarding its earlier Show Cause Order [2127]. After this Court asked a few preliminary questions, IPC counsel deposed Andrews. Counsel and Andrews agreed that Andrews will produce certain documents by Friday, January 13, 2017. The deposition is held open and will resume -- if necessary, upon review of the documents -- on Friday, January 20, 2017 at 10:00 AM at the United States Courthouse, 1716 Spielbusch Avenue, Toledo, Ohio. Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/9/2017. (Court Reporter: Angela Nixon) (1 hr)(D,L) Modified on 1/19/2017 -- See Doc. [2144] for corrected caption information. (D,L).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                                            Copy of [2133] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 1/9/2017. (D,L)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2131 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Appeal Remark
                                                                                                                              Appeal Remark from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 12/22/16 and placed on the docket 12/28/16 as No. 16-7328 (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2130 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Response
                                                                                                                                Response to [2125] Motion for contempt filed by Christopher Andrews per [2129] Order. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Email communications, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Miller Law letter, # (3) Exhibit 2A - Order granting sanctions, # (4) Exhibit 3 - Notice of deposition is invalid, request the hearing be cancelled, # (5) Exhibit 3A - Response to docket 2122, # (6) Exhibit 4 - Order denying motion for reconsideration and Response to Orders 2123 and 2124, # (7) Exhibit 5 - Order denying motion for consideration)(H,JD)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2173 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2129 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Marginal Entry Order granting [2128] Request for leave to respond to [2125] contempt motion. Request for Leave to File a Response is granted. Clerk's office is instructed to file the Response and all Exhibits as a separate document. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/30/2016.(D,L)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                                                      Copy of [2129] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 12/30/2016. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2171 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Disbursement/Distribution
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2128 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016, Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                                          Request for leave to respond to [2125] contempt motion filed by Christopher Andrews. Related document(s)[2123], [2124], [2122], [2125]. (Attachments: # (1) Response to Contempt Motion, # (2) Exhibit 1 - Email communications, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Miller Law letter, # (4) Exhibit 2A - Order granting sanctions, # (5) Exhibit 3 - Notice of deposition is invalid, request the hearing be cancelled, # (6) Exhibit 3A - Response to docket 2122, # (7) Exhibit 4 - Order denying motion for reconsideration and Response to Orders 2123 and 2124, # (8) Exhibit 5 - Order denying motion for consideration)(H,JD)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2127 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016 Order on Motion for contemptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Order of Civil Contempt granting [2125] Motion for contempt. The United States Marshals are directed to bring Andrews before this Court as soon as practicable for him to answer why he should not be required to pay an additional monetary sanction in light of his continued contumacious conduct, and his undisguised failure to follow this Court's December Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/29/2016. See Order for details. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(D,L) Modified on 1/19/2017 -- See Doc. [2144] for corrected caption information. (D,L).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2126 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Brief
                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Civil Contempt filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[2125]. (Attachments: # (1) Statement for the Record) (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2125 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016, Terminated: 12/29/2016 Motion for contempt
                                                                                                                                                Motion for contempt and Brief in Support filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Order, # (2) Exhibit Notice, # (3) Exhibit Letter, # (4) Exhibit Order, # (5) Exhibit Letter, # (6) Exhibit Copy of Case)(Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2124 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Order granting in part Objector Christopher Andrews' Motion to cancel or postpone his deposition (Related Doc # [2119]). This Court will grant a one-day extension for his deposition which will now be held on Wednesday, December 21, 2016 at 1:30 PM at the Toledo Courthouse. This Court will be available to hear objections to the document request, but only after Andrews and counsel have conferred. The request to cancel the deposition or postpone the deposition until January is denied. Failure to appear as noticed, and as ordered by this Court, on Wednesday, December 21 (absent a modification agreed to by all parties) may result in additional sanctions against Andrews. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/12/2016.(R,Sh) Modified on 1/19/2017 -- See Doc. [2144] for corrected caption information. (D,L).
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2123 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Order on Motion for reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Order denying Objector Christopher Andrews' Motion for Reconsideration (Related Doc # [2117]). In light of the streaming filings by Andrews, the Clerks Office is directed not to accept any further motions by Andrews, who must first request leave before a filing is accepted. Andrews knows that he may appeal this Courts previous orders, and that is proper recourse. Andrews has exhausted his remedies with this Court, and in the process has exhausted this Court. The Motion for Reconsideration is, emphatically, denied. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 12/12/2016.(R,Sh) Modified on 1/19/2017 -- See Doc. [2144] for corrected caption information. (D,L).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                                                                      Copy of [2124] Order on Motion for order,, [2123] Order on Motion for relief, mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 12/12/2016. Related document(s)[2124], [2123]. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2122 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Response
                                                                                                                                                        Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Andrews' Second Motion to Cancel his Deposition (Doc. 2121) filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[2121]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Andrews Deposition Notice, # (2) Exhibit B - Andrews Dec. 2 Email, # (3) Exhibit C - Response to Andrews Dec. 2 Email) (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2121 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Notice
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of deposition is invalid, request the hearing be cancelled filed by Christopher Andrews. (H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2120 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: 12/8/2016 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                            Opposition to [2119] Motion (request) to cancel/move Creditor's hearing filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin) Modified text on 12/19/2016 (B,R).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2119 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016, Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                              Motion (request) to cancel/move creditor's hearing filed by Christopher Andrews. (H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2118 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                Opposition to [2117] Motion for relief Indirect Purchaser Class' Opposition to Andrews' Latest Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 2117) filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2117 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016, Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion for relief
                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Reversal of the Court's [2020] Order of Approval, [2068], [2104] Orders on Bond and [2113] Order on Sanctions pursuant to Rule 60(b) filed by MDL Notice Only Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: # (1) U.S. Court of Appeals Opinion, # (2) Pending Bond Decision and Appeal Brief)(L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2116 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Marginal Entry Order denying [2115] Motion for Reversal of Sanctions regarding the Court's [2113] Order. This Court treats Objector Andrews' latest filing as a Motion under Federal Civil Rule 60(b) for a reversal of earlier Orders on bond (Docs. [2068], [2104]) and sanctions (Doc. [2113]). That Motion (Doc. [2115]) -- more a threat against this Court, rather than a new argument or discussion identifying an obvious error -- is denied. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/15/2016.(D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2115 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016, Terminated: 11/15/2016 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Reversal of Sanctions regarding the Court's [2113] Order filed by MDL Notice Only Christopher Andrews. Related document(s)[2113]. (L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of [2116] mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 11/15/2016. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2114 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Order recommending the termination of multidistrict litigation known as "In Re: Polyurethane Foam Antitrust Litigation." This Court recommends the JPML terminate this multidistrict litigation proceeding and the Clerk of Court close this matter, subject to this Court's continuing jurisdiction to enforce its Orders, handle any matters related to the final distributions of the class action settlements, or address any other miscellaneous issues necessary to complete the administration of these cases. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 11/2/2016. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                                                                                            Copy of [2113] Order on Motion for sanctions, mailed to Christopher Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153-0394 on 10/25/2016. Related document(s)[2113]. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2113 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Order on Motion for sanctionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Order granting Motion for sanctions. That amount, from April 2016 through October 2016, totals $15,303, with interest continuing to run until payment is made in full. (Related Doc # [2107]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 10/24/2016. (Attachments: # (1) U.S. Court of Appeals letter dated 10/13/16)(B,R) Modified on 1/19/2017 -- See Doc. [2144] for corrected caption information. (D,L).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2112 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Order denying Motion for Reimbursement of Inadvertently-Omitted Expenses (Related Doc # [2106]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 10/24/2016.(B,R)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2111 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplement to Objector's [2108] Response to Indirect Purchaser Class' [2107] Motion for Sanctions filed by Christopher Andrews. Related document(s)[2108]. (L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2110 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply in support of [2107] Motion for sanctions Indirect Purchaser Class' Motion for Sanctions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Order Denying Rehearing En Banc, # (2) Exhibit B - 6-20-2016 Order Dismissing Appeal, # (3) Exhibit C - Andrews' Motion to Stay Mandate, # (4) Exhibit D - 6-20-2016 Ltr from 6th Cir, # (5) Exhibit E - Natl Law Journal article)(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2109 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals Filing - Request to Stay Mandate filed by Christopher Andrews. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2108 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to [2107] Indirect Purchaser Class' Motion for Sanctions filed by Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: # (1) Documents in support)(H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2107 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016, Terminated: 10/24/2016 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for sanctions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Email from C. Andrews to M. Miller dated September 15, 2016)(Miller, Marvin) Modified text on 9/28/2016 (B,R).
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2106 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016, Terminated: 10/24/2016 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion Reimbursement of Inadvertently-Omitted Expenses filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Adam B. Wolfson)(Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2105 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/13/2016 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing to Bring Record Current and Complete filed by Objector Christopher Andrews. (L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2104 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order that this court lacks jurisdiction to decide Objector Christpher Andrews' Motion for reconsideration, re [2102], for the reasons stated herein and therefore, the Motion for reconsideration is dismissed. Related Doc # [2102]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/12/2016.(R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Copy of [2104] Order on Motion for reconsideration, mailed to Christopher Andrews on 7/12/2016. Related document(s)[2104]. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2103 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing to Bring Record Current and Complete filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Christopher Andrews e-mail)(Miller, Marvin) Modified text on 7/6/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2102 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: 6/23/2016, Terminated: 7/12/2016 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion (second) for reconsideration/stay on bond order under Rule 59(e) based on new case law under Shane v Blue Cross 15-1544 filed by Christopher Andrews. (H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2101 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 USCA MandateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Granting the motion to dismiss Hinojosa's appeal as late re [2048]. The motion to dismiss for failure to post the appeal bond is denied as moot (USCA# 16-3241). Circuit Judges: Guy and McKeague, District Judge: Bertelsman. Date issued by USCA 6/20/16 (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2100 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: 6/21/2016 USCA MandateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Denying the motion to reverse or stay the appeal bond. Granting the motion to dismiss the appeal [2035]. Andrews may move to reinstate his appeal only if he posts the full amount of the appeal bond ($145,463) no later than fourteen (14) days after this order is entered on the docket (USCA# 16-3168). Circuit Judges: Guy and McKeague, District Judge: Bertelsman. Date issued by USCA 6/20/16 (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2099 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                            True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Granting the appellant Patrick S. Sweeney's motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal re [2039] (USCA# 16-3189). Date issued by USCA 5/18/16 (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2098 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                              True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Granting the appellant Jill K. Cannata's motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal re [2038] (USCA# 16-3181). Date issued by USCA 5/18/16 (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2097 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Granting the appellant Sean Cochran's motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal re [2037] (USCA# 16-3179). Date issued by USCA 5/18/16 (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2096 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: 5/16/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to Indirect Purchaser Class's [2090] Response to Objector's Motions to Reconsider and or Stay Appeal Bond filed by Christopher Andrews. Related documents [2074], [2075], [2082], [2083]. (L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2095 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: 5/16/2016 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order approving Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Approve Distribution of Settlement Funds to Class Members and Payments of Notice Fees for the Direct Purchaser Settlement Classes (Related Doc # [2086]) as stated herein. Approved by Judge Jack Zouhary on 5/16/2016.(R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2094 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: 5/16/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order approving disbursement re [2093] Proposed Billing Statement (April 1, 2016 - May 13, 2016). Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 5/16/2016. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2093 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Summary Billing Statement for April 1, 2016 to May 13, 2016 relating to docket #2092 filed on May 13, 2016 filed by David Rosenblum Cohen. (Cohen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2091 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply to [2084] Response to [2082] Motion (supplemental) to reconsider order, [2083] Motion for reconsideration/stay on bond filed by Christopher Andrews. (H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2090 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to Objector Christopher Andrews' Response to Motions Doc. 2084 to Reconsider and or Stay Appeal Bond filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration) (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2089 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order denying Motions for Reconsideration and Motion To Stay. Related Documents [2074], [2075], [2076], [2082] and [2083]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 5/12/2016.(B,R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2088 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED Document:Corrected Exhibit J filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[42], [2087]. (Felder, Melissa) Modified text on 5/10/2016. No cover page with case caption or attorney signature block. (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2087 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Document:Notice of Sealed Filing filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[42], [2086]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit C, # (2) Exhibit D, # (3) Exhibit H, # (4) Exhibit J, # (5) Exhibit N, # (6) Exhibit R)(Felder, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2086 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016, Terminated: 5/16/2016 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion Order to Approve Distribution of Settlement Funds to Class Members and Payment of Notice Fees for the Direct Purchaser Settlement Classes filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Wolfson Declaration, # (2) Affidavit Castaneda Declaration, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit I, # (9) Exhibit K, # (10) Exhibit L, # (11) Exhibit M, # (12) Exhibit O, # (13) Exhibit P, # (14) Exhibit Q, # (15) Proposed Order)(Felder, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2085 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: 5/5/2016, Terminated: 5/6/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR. Refiled in individual action 1:15-pf-10000. SEALED Motion For Protective Order [42] filed by MDL Notice Only Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.. Related document(s)[42]. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of Patrick J. Ahern in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order, # (3) Exhibit Group Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit Declaration of Todd Wanek, # (5) Exhibit Declaration of Brent Koslo)(Ahern, Patrick) Modified text on 5/6/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2084 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: 5/5/2016 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Christopher Andrews' Motion for reconsideration and/or Stay Appeal Bond [2082], [2083] filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs'. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2083 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016, Terminated: 5/12/2016 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for reconsideration/stay on bond under Rule 59(e) filed by Christopher Andrews. Related document(s)[2069], [2068]. (H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2082 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016, Terminated: 5/12/2016 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion (supplemental) to reconsider order - appeal bond filed by Christopher Andrews. Related document(s)[2069], [2068]. (H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2081 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016, Terminated: 5/4/2016 Motion to compel discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR. Filed in incorrect action. Filer notified. Motion to compel discovery filed by MDL Notice Only Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit)(Ahern, Patrick) Modified text, terminated motion and regenerated NEF on 5/4/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2080 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply to Opposition to [2074] Motion for reconsideration of Bond Order filed by Sean Cochran. Related document [2077]. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2079 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Submission to Bring the Record to Date filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Email)(Kerger, Richard) Modified text on 5/3/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2078 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition to [2075] Motion for stay on Bond Order filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2077 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 4/29/2016 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition to [2074] and [2076] Motions for reconsideration of Bond Order, filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2076 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016, Terminated: 5/12/2016 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for reconsideration of Bond Order filed by MDL Notice Only Jill K Cannata. (Cannata, Sam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2075 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016, Terminated: 5/12/2016 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for stay on Bond Order filed by MDL Notice Only Christopher Andrews. (M,L) Modified text on 4/28/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2074 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016, Terminated: 5/12/2016 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for reconsideration of Bond Order filed by MDL Notice Only Sean Cochran. Related document(s)[2068]. (Cochran, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2073 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: 4/21/2016 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Attorney Appearance by Thomas G. Walker filed by on behalf of Arsenal Capital Partners, Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2072 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: 4/19/2016 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR. Refiled in member case 1:15pf10000. Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Against Woodbridge Defendants filed by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Ahern, Patrick) Modified text on 4/21/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2071 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016, Terminated: 4/21/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR. Document pertains only to member case 1:15pf10000. Refiled in that action and terminated pending motion on master docket. SEALED Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Movant Arsenal Capital Partners. Related document(s)[42]. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit A - Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit B - Subpoena)(McGuire, Matthew) Modified text on 4/21/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2070 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney Appearance by Matthew P. McGuire filed by on behalf of Arsenal Capital Partners. (McGuire, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2069 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 Order on Motion to clarifyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Marginal Entry Order granting [2067] Motion to clarify. Bond shall be posted by May 13, 2016. Bond amount corrected in Clarified Memorandum Opinion and Order at Doc. [2068]. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 4/14/2016.(D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2068 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016 Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clarified Memorandum Opinion and Order re [2065] requiring Objectors to post an appeal bond of $145,463. Moreover, to ensure this case concludes appropriately, the parties are required to seek approval from this Court if an Objector agrees to dismiss his or her appeal in exchange for payment (or anything else of value) from any source. Clarification on page 16: "Accordingly, the appeal bond of $145,463 shall be joint and several." Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/13/2016. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2067 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: 4/14/2016, Terminated: 4/14/2016 Motion to clarify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to clarify filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[2065]. (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2066 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: 4/13/2016 Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Opinion and Order designating Family House Toledo as the receipent of any cy pres distribution. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/13/2016. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2065 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: 4/13/2016 Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Opinion and Order requiring Objectors to post an appeal bond of $145,463. Moreover, to ensure this case concludes appropriately, the parties are required to seek approval from this Court if an Objector agrees to dismiss his or her appeal in exchange for payment (or anything else of value) from any source. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/13/2016. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2064 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Document Subpoena filed by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit- Arsenal Capital Partners III, LP Subpoena, # (2) Exhibit- Attachment A to Subpoena)(Ahern, Patrick) Modified text for exhibit descriptions on 4/13/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2063 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Service of Supplement the Record filed by Indirect Purchasers. Related document(s)[2062].(Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2062 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplement filed by Indirect Purchasers. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Email)(Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2061 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order approving disbursement re: [2060] Proposed Billing Statement (February 1, 2016 - March 31, 2016). Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 4/6/2016. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2060 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Summary Billing Statement for February 1 to March 31, 2016 relating to docket #2059 filed on April 5, 2016 filed by David Rosenblum Cohen. (Cohen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA Appeal Fees of $505 received, receipt number 14660085135 re [2037] Notice of Appeal (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2058 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Order on Motion to exceed page limitationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Marginal Entry Order granting [2056] Motion for leave to exceed page limitations. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 3/24/2016.(D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2057 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply in support of [2042] Motion for Order Requiring Posting of Appeal Bond and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O)(Shapiro, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2056 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016, Terminated: 3/24/2016 Motion to exceed page limitations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Shapiro, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2055 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Order on Motion to supplementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Marginal Entry Order granting [2053] Motion for leave to supplement response to bond motion. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 3/22/2016.(D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2054 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition to Plaintiff's [2042] Motion for Order Requiring Posting of Appeal Bond and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed byChristopher Andrews. (L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Acknowledgment from the USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of [2048] Notice of Appeal (USCA #16-3241). Date filed in USCA 3/16/16. (C,KA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2053 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016, Terminated: 3/22/2016 Motion to supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for leave to supplement response to bond motion filed by Christopher Andrews. Related document(s)[2042]. (L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2052 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum Opinion and Order denying the Center for Class Action Fairness' (CCAF) Motion for attorney fees (Related Doc # [2028]) for the reasons herein stated. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/14/2016.(R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2051 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition to [2042] Motion for Order Requiring Posting of Appeal Bond and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jill K Cannata. (Cannata, Sam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2050 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: 3/10/2016 Order on Motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Marginal Entry Order granting Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' [2049] Motion for Extension of Time to File and to Consolidate Reply Briefing on Motion for Order Requiring Posting of Appeal Bond, re [2042]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 3/10/2016.(R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2049 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016, Terminated: 3/10/2016 Motion for extension of time (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for extension of time to reply to and to consolidate reply briefing on Motion for Order Requiring Posting of Appeal Bond. Filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[2042]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Shapiro, Jay) Modified text on 3/10/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2048 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016, Terminated: 6/21/2016 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the [2020] Memorandum Opinion and Order and [2021] Judgment Entry of 1/27/16, filed by Jennifer Hinojosa. (Filing fee of $505 paid, receipt number 0647-7518781). (Cafferty, Thomas) Modified text on 3/9/2016 (R,Sh). Modified text on 3/9/2016 (H,SP).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2047 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class Identification of Cy Pres Beneficiaries filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[2020]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Article, # (2) Exhibit Bio, # (3) Exhibit Article, # (4) Exhibit Article, # (5) Exhibit Declaration, # (6) Exhibit Declaration) (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2046 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition to [2042] Motion for Order Requiring Posting of Appeal Bond and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Sean Cochran. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Stay Order, # (2) Exhibit Stay Order)(Cochran, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Acknowledgment from the USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of [2039] Notice of Appeal (USCA# 16-3189). Date filed in USCA 3/2/16. (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2045 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition to IPPs' Proposed Cy Pres Beneficiaries filed by Melissa Holyoak, John Tabin. Related document(s)[2030]. (St. John, Anna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2044 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Service of Doc. # [2041] & [2042] filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Kerger, Richard) Modified text to create links on 3/3/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2043 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 Order on Motion to exceed page limitationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Marginal Entry Order granting [2041] Motion for leave to exceed page limitations. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 3/2/2016.(D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2042 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016, Terminated: 4/13/2016 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Order Requiring Posting of Appeal Bond and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Email, # (2) Exhibit Email, # (3) Exhibit Declaration, # (4) Exhibit Declaration, # (5) Exhibit Declaration)(Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2041 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016, Terminated: 3/2/2016 Motion to exceed page limitations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Acknowledgment from the USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of [2038] Notice of Appeal (USCA# 16-3181). Date filed in USCA 3/1/16. (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Acknowledgment from the USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of [2037] Notice of Appeal (USCA# 16-3179). Date filed in USCA 3/1/16. (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2040 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply in support of [2028] Motion for attorney fees by Anna W. St. John filed by Melissa Holyoak, John Tabin. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Theodore H. Frank)(St. John, Anna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2039 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016, Terminated: 5/19/2016 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the [2020] Memorandum Opinion and Order and [2021] Judgment Entry of 1/27/16, filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. (Filing fee of $505 paid, receipt # 34660009424) (L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2038 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016, Terminated: 5/19/2016 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the [2020] Memorandum Opinion and Order and [2021] Judgment Entry of 1/27/16, filed by Jill K Cannata. (Filing fee of $505 paid, receipt number 0647-7499220) (Cannata, Sam). Modified text on 2/26/2016 (H,SP).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2037 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016, Terminated: 5/19/2016 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the [2020] Memorandum Opinion and Order and [2021] Judgment Entry of 1/27/16, filed by Sean Cochran. Filing fee paid 3/31/16, receipt #14660085135 (Cochran, Edward). Modified text on 2/26/2016 (H,SP). Modified on 3/31/2016 for fee payment (H,SP).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Acknowledgment from the USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of [2035] Notice of Appeal (USCA# 16-3168). Date filed in USCA 2/25/16. (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2036 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Order and Notice of Party DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, with Prejudice, of Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc. and Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia's claims against Future Foam, Inc. Related document, [2033]. Approved by Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/24/2016. (R,Sh) Modified text for link on 2/24/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2035 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016, Terminated: 6/21/2016 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the [2020] Memorandum Opinion and Order and [2021] Judgment Entry of 01/27/2016, filed by Christopher Andrews. (Filing fee of $505 paid, receipt # 34660009420) (L,A). Modified text on 2/23/2016 (H,SP).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2034 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Order on Motion to exceed page limitationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Marginal Entry Order granting [2031] Motion for leave to exceed page limitations. Judge Jack Zouhary(MDL2106) on 2/22/2016.(D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2033 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Future Foam, Inc., Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2032 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition to [2028] Motion for attorney fees by Anna W. St. John filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Transcript - Final Approval Hearing, # (2) Exhibit Transcript - Fairness Hearing, # (3) Exhibit Objection, # (4) Exhibit Objection, # (5) Exhibit Objection)(Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2031 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016, Terminated: 2/22/2016 Motion to exceed page limitations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2030 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: 2/17/2016 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Identification of Cy Pres Beneficiaries filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit AAI Mission Statement)Related document(s)[2020].(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2029 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Order and Notice of Party DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulated Order of Dismissal, with prejudice, of Plaintiff Alfred T. Giuliano's, in his capacity as trustee, of claims against Defendant FXI Holding, Inc., (formerly known as Foamex Innovations, Inc.) only. Each side shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Court retains jurisdiction of this matter for purposes of enforcing the settlement between Plaintiffs and FXI. Related document [2027]. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/11/2016. (R,Sh) Modified text on 2/12/2016 (R,Sh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2028 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016, Terminated: 3/14/2016 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for attorney fees by Anna W. St. John filed by Melissa Holyoak, John Tabin. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support, # (2) Affidavit of Anna St. John)(St. John, Anna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2027 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Stipulation for Dismissal, With Prejudice, of Plaintiffs' Claims Against Defendant FXI Holdings, Inc. filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Wiechmann, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2026 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Change of Entity Name filed by FFP Holdings, LLC. (Love, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2025 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order of dismissal, with prejudice, of Direct Action Plaintiffs' claims against Future Foam, Inc. Related document [2019]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 2/1/2016. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2024 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order approving disbursement re: [2023] Proposed Billing Statement (December 1, 2015 - January 29, 2016. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 2/1/2016. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2023 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order Summary Billing Statement for December, 2015 and January, 2016 relating to docket #2022 filed on January 29, 2016 filed by David Rosenblum Cohen. (Cohen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2021 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judgment Entry as to Case Nos. 3:10-pf-10007 (Vicky's Furniture), 3:11-pf-10002 (Gomez), 3:11-pf-10003 (Hudson) and 3:11-pf-10010 (Beastrom). This Court having filed its Memorandum Opinion and Order, granting the Indirect Purchaser Class Motions for Final Approval (Docs. [1987] & [1988]), andno other claims remaining, this Court enters final judgment on the terms set forth in the Order of Final Approval. These cases are now closed. Related document [2020], Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/27/2016. (R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2020 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum Opinion and Order granting the Motions by the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class for Final Approval of the nine settlement agreements (Docs. [1987] & [1988]), and grants in part and denies in part the Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses, and an Incentive Award to the Class Representatives (Doc. [1908]). Final approval of the nine Settlement Agreements is granted pursuant to Federal Civil Rule 23(e). The Indirect Purchaser Settlement Classes meet the requirements of Rule 23 and are therefore certified for the purposes of these settlements. The persons and entities identified in Exhibit A are excluded from the Indirect Purchaser Settlement Classes and are not bound by this Order, and may not make any claim or receive any benefit from the relevant settlement, whether monetary or otherwise. As to the Released Parties, the Class Action and any and all currently pending indirect purchaser class action lawsuits directly related to the subject matter of this litigation are dismissed with prejudice and in their entirety, on the merits, and, except as provided for in the Settlement Agreements, without costs. The Releasing Parties are permanently enjoined and barred from instituting, commencing, or prosecuting any action or other proceeding asserting any Released Claims released in the nine Settlement Agreements against any of the Released Parties. This Order does not settle or compromise any other claims by Class Representatives or the Indirect Purchaser Settlement Classes against the Defendants or other persons or entities other than Released Parties, and all rights against any other Defendant or other person or entity are specifically reserved. Pursuant to Federal Civil Rule 54(b), this Court directs entry of final judgment of dismissal as to the Released Parties, as set forth in its separate orders entered following this Order. This Court retains exclusive jurisdiction over the Class Action and the Settlement Agreements, including the administration, interpretation, consummation, and enforcement of these Settlement agreements. The escrow accounts established by certain of the parties are approved as Qualified Settlement Funds pursuant to Internal Revenue Code Section 468B and related Treasury Regulations. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 1/27/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Entities Excluded from the Nine Settlements)(R,Sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2019 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Spring Air Plaintiffs' Claims against Future Foam filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Future Foam, Inc., Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order of Dismissal)(O'Neill, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2018 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court ReporterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Final Approval Hearing held on 12/15/15 before Judge Jack Zouhary. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Tracy McGurk at 419-213-5520. [88 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 1/26/2016. Redaction Request due 2/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2016. Related document(s)[2006], [2007]. (M,Tl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2017 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: 1/14/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order of Dismissal, with prejudice, of Jackson Furniture Plaintiffs' claims against Mohawk Industries, Inc. Related document [2016]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 1/14/2016. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2016 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Mohawk Industries, Inc. filed by Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc.. (Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2015 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: 12/30/2015 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order granting Motion Order to Approve Distribution (Related Doc # [2012]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/30/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2014 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: 12/30/2015 Order on Motion to compel discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Opinion and Order re: Objector Andrews. For the reasons stated in the Order, Objector Chris Andrews' Motion to compel discovery and Motion to disqualify attorney/law firm are denied. Related documents [1974], [1975]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/30/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Copy of [2014] Memorandum Opinion and Order mailed to Chris Andrews at P.O. Box 530394, Livonia, MI 48153 on 12/30/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2013 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: 12/29/2015 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objector's Response to Supplemental Declaration of Eric Miller filed by Christopher Andrews. Related document(s)[1998], [2010]. (M,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2012 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015, Terminated: 12/30/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion Order to Approve Distribution of Settlement Funds for Payment of Notice Fees for the Direct Purchaser Settlement Classes filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Adam Wolfson, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration of Adam Wolfson, # (3) Exhibit B to Declaration of Adam Wolfson)(Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2011 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order For the reasons stated in the Order, Motion for Reconsideration or to Alter or Amend the Final Judgment as to the Direct Purchaser Class (Doc. [1978]) is denied. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/21/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2010 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Class Submission of the Declaration of Eric J. Miller to Clarify and Provide Additional Information in Connection with Fairness Hearing to [1988] Motion Corrected Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreements with the Remaining Settling Defendants filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[1988]. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Eric Miller regarding the Distribution of Settlement Funds)(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2009 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order dismissing, without prejudice, Jackson Furniture Plaintiffs' claims against Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/17/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2008 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Florida Foam and Sales, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company, Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., L & J Products and Sales, Inc., NC Foam and Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2007 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 12/15/2015 before Judge Jack Zouhary, Court Reporter: Tracy Spore. Requested completion date: 1/15/2016 filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Passarelli, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2006 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 12/15/2015 before Judge Zouhary, Court Reporter: Tracy Sport. Requested completion date: 1/14/2016 filed by Leggett & Platt, Inc.. (Warncke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Jack Zouhary. Fairness Hearing held on 12/15/2015 re Indirect Purchaser Class Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, for Reimbursement of Expenses, and for an Incentive Award to the Indirect Purchaser Class Representatives [1908]. This Court heard argument from counsel and objectors. Motion taken under advisement. See transcript for details and hearing attendance. (Court Reporter: Tracy Spore.) Time: 2 hours.(D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2005 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for leave to file declarations (Related Doc # [1999]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/14/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2004 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Stipulation & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation & Order approving [2003] Joint Motion to stay as to Future Foam, Inc. In-person conference set for 12/14/2015 is vacated. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/14/2015. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2003 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: 12/11/2015, Terminated: 12/14/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Motion to stay as to Future Foam, Inc. filed by MDL Notice Only Future Foam, Inc.. Related document(s)[1966], [1981]. (Passarelli, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2002 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: 12/11/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Report filed by Future Foam, Inc.. Related document(s)[1981].(Passarelli, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2001 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: 12/11/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Report filed by Florida Foam and Sales, Inc., Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., L & J Products and Sales, Inc., NC Foam and Sales, Inc.. Related document(s)[1981].(Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2000 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: 12/11/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Marginal Entry Order granting Jackson Furniture Plaintiffs' Motion to stay action as to Mohawk Industries, Inc. (Related Doc # [1998]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/11/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1999 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015, Terminated: 12/14/2015 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for leave to file declarations of Theodore H. Frank and Melissa Holyoak filed by Melissa Holyoak, John Tabin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Proposed Order)(St. John, Anna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1998 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015, Terminated: 12/11/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Motion to stay action as to Mohawk Industries, Inc. filed by Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc.. (Dowell, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1997 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to Questions for Fairness Hearing filed by Indirect Purchasers. Related document [1908], [1973]. (Miller, Marvin) Modified text 12/11/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1996 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: 12/8/2015 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition to [1978] Motion for reconsideration filed by Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Jennifer M. Keough Regarding the FFP, FXI, Future Foam, Hickory Springs, Mohawk, and Woodbridge Settlements)(Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1995 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: 12/8/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order dismissing, with prejudice, Jackson Furniture Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc. Related document [1994]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/8/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1994 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: 12/8/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1993 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response to [1974] Motion to compel discovery Class Counsel's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Christopher Andrews' Motion to Compel Disclosure filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1992 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to [1975] Motion to disqualify attorney/law firm Class Counsel's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Christopher Andrews' Motion for Disqualification filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - A. Jewell Declaration, # (2) Exhibit B - Andrews Email 10-20 to 10-26-2015, # (3) Exhibit C - E. J. Miller Declaration, # (4) Exhibit D - M. Fehretdinov Declaration, # (5) Exhibit E - M. Holmes Declaration)(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1991 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response to Objections filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Astiani v. Kashi - Dkt. 242, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Eric. J. Miller, # (3) Exhibit 3 - In re Neurontin - Dkt. 114, # (4) Exhibit 4 - AT&T Mobility - Dkt. 196, # (5) Exhibit 5 Supp. Declaration of Marvin Miller, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Dennis E. Murray, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Careathers v. Red Bull - Dkt. 72, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Careathers v. Red Bull - Dkt. 55, # (9) Exhibit 9 - In re: Flonase - Dkt. 576, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Shpetim Ademi, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Eric D. Barton, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Martin D. Holmes, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Richard Kerger, # (14) Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Marvin A. Miller, # (15) Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Robert C. Schubert, # (16) Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Jay B. Shapiro, # (17) Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Avidan J. Stern, # (18) Exhibit 18 - In re Nutella - Dkt. 78, # (19) Exhibit 19 - In re Nutella - Dkt. 111, # (20) Exhibit 20 - In re Lehman Bros. - Dkt. 353, # (21) Exhibit 21 - In re Lehman Bros. - Dkt. 391-9, # (22) Exhibit 22 - In re Lehman Bros. - Dkt. 1388, # (23) Exhibit 23 - In re Lehman Bros. - Dkt. 1404, # (24) Exhibit 24 - Shane Grp. - Dkt. 159, # (25) Exhibit 25 - Shane Grp. - Dkt. 216, # (26) Exhibit 26 - Shane Grp. - Dkt. 169-15, # (27) Exhibit 27 - Shane Grp. - Dkt. 206-1, # (28) Exhibit 28 - Shane Grp. - Dkt. 28, # (29) Exhibit 29 - In re Lehman Bros. - Dkt. 387, # (30) Exhibit 30 - In re Nutella - Dkt. 89, # (31) Exhibit 31 - In re Tyco - Dkt. 1146-17, # (32) Exhibit 32 - In re Lehman Bros. - Dkt. 889-9, # (33) Exhibit 33 - Declaration of Anne Jewell, # (34) Exhibit 34 Emails from C. Andrews, # (35) Exhibit 35 - Shane Grp. - Dkt. 163, # (36) Exhibit 36 - In re Tyco - Dkt. 1108, # (37) Exhibit 37 - In re Tyson Foods - Dkt. 107, # (38) Exhibit 38 - Yarrington - Dkt. 71, # (39) Exhibit 39 - Union v. R.L. Polk Docket & Dismissal, # (40) Exhibit 40 - Koller v. Intl Rectifier Dkt. 304, # (41) Exhibit 41 - Berry v. LexisNexis - Dkt. 104-7, # (42) Exhibit 42 - Gemelas v. Dannon - Dkt. 60, # (43) Exhibit 43 - In re NFL Players Concussion Litig. - Dkt. 6213, # (44) Exhibit 44 - Meyenburg v. Exxon - Dkt. 29, # (45) Exhibit 45 - Sampang v. AT&T Mobility - Dkt. 499, # (46) Exhibit 46 - Sampang v. AT&T Mobility - Dkt. 531, # (47) Exhibit 47 - Poole v. Merrill Lynch - Dkt. 82, # (48) Exhibit 48 - In re HP Inkjet Printer Litig. - Dkt. 266, # (49) Exhibit 49 - In re Vytorin/Zetia Mktg. - Dkt. 203, # (50) Exhibit 50 - Marsikian v. Mercedes-Benz - Dkt. 102, # (51) Exhibit 51 - Hartless v. Clorox - Dkt. 102, # (52) Exhibit 52 - In re Lawnmower Engine - Dkt. 315, # (53) Exhibit 53 - In re Kentucky Grilled Chicken - Dkt. 105, # (54) Exhibit 54 - In re Kentucky Grilled Chicken - Dkt. 110, # (55) Exhibit 55 - Masters v. Lowes - Dkt. 68, # (56) Exhibit 56 - Embry v. ACER America - Dkt. 253, # (57) Exhibit 57 - Poole v. Merrill Lynch - Dkt. 119, # (58) Exhibit 58 - Sampang v. AT&T Mobility - Dkt. 630, # (59) Exhibit 59 - Masters v. Lowes - Dkt. 73, # (60) Exhibit 60 - Marsikian v. Mercedes-Benz - Dkt. 124, # (61) Exhibit 61 - In re HP Inkjet Printer Litig. - Dkt. 310, # (62) Exhibit 62 - In re Kentucky Grilled Chicken - Dkt. 108-13, # (63) Exhibit 63 - In re Vytorin/Zetia Mktg. - Dkt. 207, # (64) Exhibit 64 - In re Quantcast - Dkt. 78, # (65) Exhibit 65 - In re Complaints Against Cannata, # (66) Exhibit 66 - State Bar of Wisconsin, # (67) Exhibit 67 - Roberts v. Electrolux - Dkt. 193, # (68) Exhibit 68 - Fraley v. Facebook - Dkt. 359, # (69) Exhibit 69 - Fladell v. Wells Fargo - Dkt. 198, # (70) Exhibit 70 - Fladell v. Wells Fargo - Dkt. 329, # (71) Exhibit 71 - In re Mattel - Dkt. 352, # (72) Exhibit 72 - Holyoak Bio, # (73) Exhibit 73 - In re Capital One - Dkt. 459, # (74) Exhibit 74 - In re Target - Dkt. 513, # (75) Exhibit 75 - In re Southwest Airlines - Dkt. 105, # (76) Exhibit 76 - Lee v. Enter. - Dkt. 133, # (77) Exhibit 77 - Hays v. Walgreen - Dkt. 53, # (78) Exhibit 78 - In re Google - Dkt. 70, # (79) Exhibit 79 - @johntabin, TWITTER, # (80) Exhibit 80 - CEI Form 990, # (81) Exhibit 81 - CEI Pamphlet, # (82) Exhibit 82 - In re Transpacific - Dkt. 1033, # (83) Exhibit 83 - LinkedIn Holyoak Bio, # (84) Exhibit 84 - Declaration of Maria Fehretdinov, # (85) Exhibit 85 - Shane Grp. - Dkt. 223, # (86) Exhibit 86 - In re Lehman Bros. - Dkt. 8, # (87) Exhibit 87 - In Re: Potash - Dkt. 565, # (88) Exhibit 88 - In Re: Potash - Dkt. 592, # (89) Exhibit 89 Careathers v. Red Bull Dkt. 103, # (90) Exhibit Index) (Shapiro, Jay) Modified on 12/8/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1990 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Order on Motion to exceed page limitationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Marginal Entry Order reluctantly granting Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc # [1989]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/7/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1989 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015, Terminated: 12/7/2015 Motion to exceed page limitations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1988 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015, Terminated: 1/27/2016 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion (Corrected) for Final Approval of Settlement Agreements with the Remaining Settling Defendants filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreements with the Remaining Settling Defendants, # (2) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Eric J. Miller Regarding A) Mailing of the Notice and Proof of Claim and Release; B) Publication of Summary Notice; and C) Report on Requests for Exclusion Received to Date, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Declaration of Marvin A. Miller in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards to Indirect Purchaser Class Representatives)(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1987 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015, Terminated: 1/27/2016 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, for Reimbursement of Expenses, and for Incentive Awards to the Indirect Purchaser Class Representatives by Marvin A. Miller filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, for Reimbursement of Expenses, and for Incentive Awards to the Indirect Purchaser Class Representatives, # (2) Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Declaration of Marvin A. Miller in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards to Indirect Purchaser Class Representatives)(Miller, Marvin) Modified text 12/8/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1986 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015, Terminated: 12/7/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filing Error - See [1988]. Motion The Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreements with the Remaining Settling Defendants filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Agreements with the Remaining Settling Defendants, # (2) Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Declaration of Marvin A. Miller in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards to Indirect Purchaser Class Representatives)(Miller, Marvin) Modified text; motion termed 12/7/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1985 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: 12/4/2015 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Dismissing the appeals, upon the stipulation of the parties re [1620] and [1747] (USCA# 15-3481 & 3680). Date issued by USCA 12/4/15 (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1984 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order approving disbursement re: [1983] Proposed Billing Statement (August 1 - November 30, 2015). Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/3/2015. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1983 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order Summary Billing Statement for August 1 to November 30, 2015 relating to docket #1982 filed on December 3, 2015 filed by David Rosenblum Cohen. (Cohen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1981 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Pursuant to prior Order (Doc. [1966]), this Court will hold an in-person conference on Monday, December 14, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. By noon on Friday, December 11, 2015, counsel shall (1) provide a roll call via e-mail, listing both counsel and client representative who will attend the conference and (2) file a status report (three pages maximum) identifying remaining claims and proposing a further case schedule. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/2/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1980 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Objections by Michael Narkin (filed with permission by the Direct Purchaser Class) filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related documents [1473], [1965]. (Wolfson, Adam) Modified text 12/3/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1979 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order. The Direct Purchaser Class shall respond to Direct Action (non-Class) Plaintiff Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration/Motion to Alter or Amend the Final Judgment as to the Direct Purchaser Class (Doc. [1978]) no later than Tuesday, December 8, 2015. No more than five pages. No reply or hearing unless requested by this Court. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/2/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1978 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015, Terminated: 12/21/2015 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for reconsideration of the [1971] Court's Order filed by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. Related document [1971]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Ahern, Patrick) Modified on 12/1/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1977 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Marginal Entry Order granting [1976] Motion for Extension of time until December 7, 2015 to file response/reply to [1974] Motion to compel discovery and [1975] Motion to disqualify attorney/law firm. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 12/1/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1976 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015, Terminated: 12/1/2015 Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for extension of time until December 7, 2015 to file response/reply to [1974] Motion to compel discovery, [1975] Motion to disqualify attorney/law firm filed by Indirect Purchaser Class, Indirect Purchasers. Related document(s)[1974], [1975]. (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1975 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 Motion to disqualify attorney/law firm
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to disqualify attorney/law firm filed by Christopher Andrews, pro se. (H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1974 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 Motion to compel discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion and proposed order to compel disclosure filed by Christopher Andrews, pro se. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1973 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Questions For Fairness Hearing. To aid this Court in its review of Class Counsel's [1908] Motion for attorney fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards to Indirect Purchaser Class Representatives, Class Counsel should respond to the following questions before the December 15, 2015 fairness hearing. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/23/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1972 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judgment Entry This Court having filed its Memorandum Opinion and Order (Doc. [1971]), granting the Direct Purchaser Class Motion for Final Approval (Doc. [1828]), and no other Direct Purchaser Class claims remaining, this Court enters final judgment on the terms set forth in the Order of Final Approval. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/20/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1971 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015 Order on Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Opinion and Order For the reasons stated in the Order, this Court grants the Direct Purchaser Class Motion for Final Approval (Doc. [1828]), denies Direct Action Plaintiff Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Certified Class (Doc. [1884]), and grants in part and denies in part Class Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, for Reimbursement of Expenses, and for an Incentive Award to the Direct Purchaser Class Representatives (Doc. [1830]). For the reasons discussed in this Court's companion Order sanctioning Narkin, filed with this Opinion,this Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1970 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015 Order on Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Opinion and Order Imposing Sanctions. For the reasons stated in the Order, this Court grants the Direct Purchaser Class's Motion for Sanctions (Doc. [1743]), and denies as frivolous Narkin's Cross-Motion for Sanctions (Doc. [1800]). Narkin shall pay Direct Purchasers Ten Thousand Dollars ($10,000) as sanctions for his Rule 11 violations. This Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of [1971] Memorandum Opinion and Order and [1534] Memorandum Opinion and Order mailed to Michael Nark at 85391 Chezem Road, Eugene, OR 97405 on 11/19/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Copy of [1970] Memorandum Opinion and Order Imposing Sanctions mailed to Michael Nark at 85391 Chezem Road, Eugene, OR 97405 on 11/19/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1969 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Michael H. Steinberg Regarding Defendant FXI's Compliance with 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1968 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Proposed Settlement and [1908] Motion for attorney fees filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. (M,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1967 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to the Proposed Settlement and [1908] Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Jennifer Hinojosa. (L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1966 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order This Court will hold an in-person conference on Monday, December 14, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 16B of the Carl B. Stokes U.S. Courthouse, 801 West Superior Avenue, Cleveland, Ohio. Counsel and client representative attendance required, unless prior to the hearing counsel obtain Court approval for the client representative to attend by phone. By noon on Friday, December 11, 2015, counsel shall provide a roll call for the conference via e-mail. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/13/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1965 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to the Proposed Class Action Settlements and [1908] (Motion) Request for Attorney's Fees filed by Michael Narkin. (L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1964 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to Class Action Settlement and Request for Attorney Fees and Notice of Intent to Appear filed by Sean Cochran. Related document [1908]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Receipt) (Cochran, Edward) Modified on 11/13/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1963 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Allison S. Thompson Regarding Defendant Mohawk Industries, Inc.'s Compliance with 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1962 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Attorney Appearance by Jonathan E. Fortman filed on behalf of Objector Kelly Marie Spann. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1961 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Intent to Appear filed by Melissa Holyoak, John Tabin. Related document(s)[1960].(St. John, Anna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1960 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to [1908] Motion for attorney fees Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards to Indirect Purchaser Class Representatives by Marvin A. Miller filed by Melissa Holyoak, John Tabin. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Anna St. John, # (2) Affidavit of Melissa Holyoak, # (3) Affidavit of John Tabin)(St. John, Anna) Modified text 11/12/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1959 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Attorney Appearance by Anna W. St. John filed by on behalf of John Tabin. (St. John, Anna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1958 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff Park Place Corporation's claims against FXI Holdings, Inc. Related document [1953]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/12/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1957 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order dismissing, with prejudice, American Bedding Company Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant FXI Holdings, Inc. Related document [1952]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/12/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1956 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order dismissing, with prejudice, Direct Action Plaintiffs' claims against FXI Holdings, Inc. Related document [1949]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/12/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1955 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Marginal Order dismissing, without prejudice, Plaintiff Park Place Corporation's claims against Defendants Valle Foam Industries, Inc. and Domfoam International, Inc. Related document [1944]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/12/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1954 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Marginal Order dismissing, without prejudice, American Bedding Company Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Valle Foam Industries, Inc. and Domfoam International, Inc. Related document [1942]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/12/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1953 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Park Place Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Lynch, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1952 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by American Bedding Company Inc, Diamond Mattress Company, Rest Master Bedding Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Lynch, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1951 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Attorney Appearance by Sam P. Cannata filed by on behalf of Jill K Cannata. (Cannata, Sam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1950 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection (Letter) to Settlement filed by Jill K Cannata. (Cannata, Sam) Modified text 11/10/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1949 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1948 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney Appearance by Anna St. John filed on behalf of Melissa Holyoak. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1947 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Report filed by Future Foam, Inc.. Related document(s)[1927].(Passarelli, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1946 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Report filed by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Ahern, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1945 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Report filed by American Bedding Company Inc, Diamond Mattress Company, Park Place Corporation, Rest Master Bedding Company. Related document(s)[1927].(Lynch, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1944 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Valle Foam Industries, Inc. and Domfoam International, Inc. filed by Park Place Corporation. (Lynch, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1943 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Report filed by FFP Holdings, LLC. Related document(s)[1927].(Love, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1942 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Valle Foam Industries, Inc. and Domfoam International, Inc. filed by American Bedding Company Inc, Diamond Mattress Company, Rest Master Bedding Company. (Lynch, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1941 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order of Dismissal, with prejudice, of Direct Action Plaintiff Park Place Corporation's claims against Future Foam, Inc. Related document [1937]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/9/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1940 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Report filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1939 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order of Dismissal, with prejudice, as to Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc. and Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia's claims against Leggett & Platt, Incorporated. Related document [1935]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/9/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1938 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order of Dismissal, with prejudice, of American Bedding Company Direct Action Plaintiffs' claims against Future Foam, Inc. Related document [1931]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/9/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1937 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Park Place Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Lynch, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1936 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Stipulation of Dismissal and Proposed Order (Dkt. No. 1933) as an Incorrect Document Filed in Error (To be Replaced by Corrected Filing) filed by Park Place Corporation. Related document(s)[1933].(Lynch, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1935 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Inc.. (Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1934 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Report filed by Florida Foam and Sales, Inc., Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., L & J Products and Sales, Inc., NC Foam and Sales, Inc.. Related document(s)[1927].(Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1933 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filing Error - see [1937]. Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Park Place Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Lynch, Dennis) Modified text 11/9/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1932 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Report filed by General Motors LLC. (Solh, Chahira)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1931 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by American Bedding Company Inc, Diamond Mattress Company, Rest Master Bedding Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Lynch, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1930 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Report filed by Alaco, Inc., Belden Foam & Fiber, Inc., Comfort Mattress Co., Inc., Corinthian, Inc., Corsicana Beddings, Inc., Foamcraft, Inc., Golden Chair, Inc., H.M. Richards, Inc., Henson Sleep Relief, Inc., Life Style Furniture Company, Inc., Mount Vernon Foam Sales, Inc., Professional Foam Fabricators, Inc., Somnus Mattress Corporation, The Bedding Group, Inc., Tupelo Foam Sales, Inc., Ultra Comfort Foam Company, Inc. (Mississippi Direct Action Plaintiffs) . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit MS DAP Remaining Claims)(Liston, William) Modified text 11/6/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order (non-document) Phone Status reset Wednesday, November 11, 2015 at 3:30 PM. Please note change in time only. Related document [1927]. Entered on behalf of Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/6/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1927 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order confirming a Phone Status for next Wednesday, November 11, 2015 at 2:00 p.m.(EST) to discuss next steps in the remaining cases. Please refer to the attached Order for call in information. Direct Action (non-Class) Plaintiffs with remaining claims should file a status update (two page maximum) by 5:00 p.m. (EST) on Monday, November 9, 2015. The status update should identify (1) remaining claims and (2) any request for further case dates or other action from this Court. Each Defendant with remaining claims asserted against it may also file a status update with requests. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 11/5/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1929 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Declaration of Class Membership, attempted HIPPA (sic) breach and tortuous interference in business relationship filed by Chris Andrews. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits in Support of Declaration)(H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1928 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplement to [1920] Notice of Objection, Fee and Expense filed by Chris Andrews. Related document(s)[1908], [1920]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits to Supplement)(H,JD) Modified text 11/6/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1926 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court ReporterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Fairness Hearing held on October 9, 2015 before Judge Jack Zouhary. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Angela Nixon at (419) 260-5259. [58 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 11/11/2015. Redaction Request due 11/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2016. (N,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1925 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order granting Indirect Purchasers' Motion to Approve Payment of Escrow Agent Fees (Related Doc # [1923]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 10/23/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1924 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of payments received from Vitafoam Settlement filed by Direct Purchaser Class. (Felder, Melissa) Modified text 10/21/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1923 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015, Terminated: 10/23/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Approve Payment of Escrow Agent Fees filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Invoices for escrow services)(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1922 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order dismissing, with prejudice, Spring Air Plaintiffs' claims against FFP Holdings, LLC. Related document [1921]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 10/15/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1921 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Spring Air Plaintiffs' Claims Against FFP Holdings, LLC filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., FFP Holdings, LLC, Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1920 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Objection to Proposed Class Action Settlement and Notice of Appearance filed by Chris Andrews. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1A to 1C - Proof of purchase)(H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1919 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Service of Direct Purchaser Class Counsels Reply to Objectors Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs (Dkt. 1913) filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[1913].(Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1918 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Exclusions from FFP, FXI, Future Foam, Hickory Springs, Mohawk, and Woodbridge Settlements filed by Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-List of New Exclusions From Settlements, # (2) Exhibit B-List of Re-Submitted Exclusions From Settlements)(Felder, Melissa) Modified text 10/14/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1917 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Adam B. Wolfson in Further Response to the Court's Questions for Fairness Hearing filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[1909], [1910].(Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1916 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 10/09/2015 before Judge Jack Zouhary, Court Reporter: Angela Nixon. Requested completion date: 10/27/2015 filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Jack Zouhary. Fairness Hearing held on 10/9/2015 re Direct Purchaser Class's Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants FFP Holdings, LLC, Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing Co., Mohawk Industries, Inc., Woodbridge Foam Corp., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc., and Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc. [1828] and Class Counsel's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, for Reimbursement of Expenses, and for an Incentive Award to the Direct Purchaser Class Representatives [1830]. This Court heard argument from counsel and testimony from Brian Fitzpatrick. Motions taken under advisement. This Court granted Class Counsel's Motion for Leave to File Declaration of Brian Fitzpatrick in Reply to Questions for Fairness Hearing [1911]. See transcript for details and hearing attendance. (Court Reporter: Angela Nixon.) Time: 1 hour, 45 minutes. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1915 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: 10/12/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on October 9, 2015 before Judge Jack Zouhary, Court Reporter: Angela Nixon. Requested completion date: October 27, 2015 filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Passarelli, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1914 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: 10/12/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 10/9/2015 before Judge Zouhary, Court Reporter: Angela Nixon. Requested completion date: 11/11/2015 filed by Leggett & Platt, Inc.. (Warncke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1913 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply in support of [1830] Motion for attorney fees The Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, for Reimbursement of Expenses, and for an Incentive Award to the Direct Purchaser Class Representatives (i.e., Reply to Narkin "Objection") filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related document [1912]. (Wolfson, Adam) Modified text 10/13/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1912 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition to [1830] Motion for attorney fees The Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, for Reimbursement of Expenses, and for an Incentive Award to the Direct Purchaser Class Representatives filed by Michael Narkin, pro se. (M,L) Modified text 10/9/2015 (K,K). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2015: # (1) Envelope) (D,L).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1911 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015, Terminated: 10/13/2015 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for leave to File Declaration of Brian T. Fitzpatrick filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[1910]. (Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1910 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Responses to Questions for Fairness Hearing filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related document [1909]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Response to Question 1), # (2) Exhibit B (Response to Question 5), # (3) Exhibit C (Declaration of Brian T. Fitzpatrick))(Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1909 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        QUESTIONS FOR FAIRNESS HEARING set for 10/9/15 at 10:00 AM. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/1/15. (S,Na)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1908 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015, Terminated: 1/27/2016 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for attorney fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards to Indirect Purchaser Class Representatives by Marvin A. Miller filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Marvin A. Miller in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards to Indirect Purchaser Class Representatives, # (2) Exhibit A - Declaration of Marvin A. Miller in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives, # (3) Exhibit B - Declaration of Richard M. Kerger in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives, # (4) Exhibit C - Declaration of Jay Shapiro in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives, # (5) Exhibit D - Declaration of Eric Barton in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives, # (6) Exhibit E - Declaration of Dustin Schubert in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives, # (7) Exhibit F - Declaration of Martin Holmes in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives, # (8) Exhibit G - Declaration of Attorney Susan Bernstein in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives, # (9) Exhibit H - Declaration of Shpetim Ademi in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives, # (10) Exhibit I - Declaration of David Schiller in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives, # (11) Exhibit J - Declaration of Avidan Stern in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives, # (12) Exhibit K - Aggregate Loadstar Through September 30, 2015, # (13) Exhibit L - Accounting for Litigation Fund)(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1907 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Marginal Order granting [1906] Motion to withdraw as attorney; attorney Jamie E. France removed from case. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 9/17/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1906 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015, Terminated: 9/17/2015 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion by Jamie E. France to withdraw as attorney for Woodbridge Defendants filed by Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.. (France, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1905 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court ReporterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Phone Conference held on September 9, 2015 before Judge Jack Zouhary. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Angela Nixon at (419) 260-5259. [29 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 9/23/2015. Redaction Request due 10/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2015. (N,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1904 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order dismissing, with prejudice, Sealy Plaintiffs' claims against Leggett & Platt. Related document [1761]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 9/14/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1903 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply in support of [1884] Motion To Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Certified Class filed by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Ahern, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1902 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on Sept. 9, 2015 before Judge Jack Zouhary, Court Reporter: Angela Nixon. Requested completion date: Sept. 18, 2015 filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Passarelli, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1901 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Document:The Direct Purchaser Class's Opposition to Plaintiff Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.'s [1884] Motion to Withdraw Request for Exclusion From the Direct Purchaser Class (Unredacted) filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[42], [1900]. (Wolfson, Adam) Modified text 9/11/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1900 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition to [1884] Motion To Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Certified Class (Redacted) filed by Direct Purchaser Class. (Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1899 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on September 9, 2015 before Judge Jack Zouhary, Court Reporter: Angela Nixon. Requested completion date: September 15, 2015 filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Steinberg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1898 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Minute Order _ Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order. This Court held a record Phone Status on September 9, 2015 to discuss next steps in this litigation. (Court Reporter: Angela Nixon). See transcript for details. This Court grants William Blechman's Motion to Withdraw as Liaison Counsel for Direct Action (non-Class) Plaintiffs (Doc. [1888]). This Court also grants, without objection, Kendall Millard's oral motion to withdraw as Defendant co-Liaison Counsel -- along with James Walsh,counsel for the Carpenter Defendants who have settled claims against them. This Court will hold a further Phone Status on Wednesday, November 11, 2015 at 2:00 PM (EST). At that Phone Status, this Court will discuss with remaining parties: FXI's request to revive or revise its previously filed Daubert motion (see Doc. [1696]) targeting Ashenfelter's models; andDaubert motions targeting Ashenfelter's models from any other Defendant. Without objection from any party, and pursuant to Federal Civil Rule 41(a)(2), this Court dismisses, without prejudice and without costs, all pending claims in these consolidated proceedings against Defendants David Carson, Louis Carson, and Scottdel, Inc. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 9/10/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1897 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Report filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1896 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Report filed by Florida Foam and Sales, Inc., Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., L & J Products and Sales, Inc., NC Foam and Sales, Inc.. Related document(s)[1879].(Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1895 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Report of Sealy Plaintiffs filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Blechman, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1894 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Report filed by Ford Motor Company. (Holt, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1893 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Report Status Update Submitted Pursuant To The Court's August 26, 2015 Order Scheduling Phone Status filed by American Bedding Company Inc, Diamond Mattress Company, Park Place Corporation, Rest Master Bedding Company. Related document(s)[1879].(Eddy, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1892 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Report filed by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Ahern, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1891 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Report filed by Alaco, Inc., Belden Foam & Fiber, Inc., Comfort Mattress Co., Inc., Corinthian, Inc., Corsicana Beddings, Inc., Foamco Sales, Inc., Foamcraft, Inc., Golden Chair, Inc., H.M. Richards, Inc., Henson Sleep Relief, Inc., Houston Foam Fabricators, Inc., Mount Vernon Foam Sales, Inc., Professional Foam Fabricators, Inc., Somnus Mattress Corporation, The Bedding Group, Inc., Tupelo Foam Sales, Inc., Ultra Comfort Foam Company, Inc., Winco Bedding USA, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A" - MS DAP Remaining Claims)(Deas, W.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1890 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Report Status Update Submitted Pursuant to the Court's August 26, 2015 Order Scheduling Phone Status filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1889 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Report - Status Update Submitted Pursuant To The Courts August 26, 2015 Order Scheduling Phone Status filed by General Motors LLC. Related document(s)[1879].(Solh, Chahira)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1888 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015, Terminated: 9/10/2015 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion by William J. Blechman to withdraw as attorney as Liaison Counsel for Dairect Action Plaintiffs filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. Related document(s)[192]. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Blechman, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1887 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., and Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., L&J Products and Sales, Inc., Florida Foam and Sales, Inc. and NC Foam and Sales, Inc. claims against the Woodbridge Group Defendants. (Related document [1883]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/28/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1886 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiffs Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., and Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., L&J Products and Sales, Inc., Florida Foam and Sales, Inc. and NC Foam and Sales, Inc. claims against Flexible Foam Products, Inc. (Related document [1882]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/28/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1885 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order dismissing, without prejudice, the Sealy Plaintiffs' claims against Future Foam, Inc. (Related document [1878]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/28/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1884 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015, Terminated: 11/19/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion To Withdraw Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Certified Class filed by MDL Notice Only Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Proposed Order)(Ahern, Patrick) Modified: motion termed; notice regenerated 8/28/2015 (K,K). Modified on 9/29/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1883 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Florida Foam and Sales, Inc., Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., L & J Products and Sales, Inc., NC Foam and Sales, Inc., Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Group, Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1882 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by FFP Holdings, LLC, Florida Foam and Sales, Inc., Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., L & J Products and Sales, Inc., NC Foam and Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1881 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filing Error - Refiled on member case 3:12-pf-10001. Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Florida Foam and Sales, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company, L & J Products and Sales, Inc., NC Foam and Sales, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Revera, Gregory) Modified text 8/28/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1880 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Kendall Millard in Support of Compliance with 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1879 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Scheduling Phone Status. This Court will hold a Phone Status on Wednesday, September 9, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. (EDT) to discuss next steps in the remaining cases. Direct Action (non-Class) Plaintiffs with remaining claims should file a status update by 3:00 p.m. (EDT) on Tuesday, September 8, 2015. By 5:00 p.m. (EDT) on Tuesday, September 8, 2015, liaison counsel for the Direct Action (non-Class) Plaintiffs and Defendants shall provide this Court a roll call and call-information for the call via e-mail (zouhary_chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/26/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1878 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Stipulation Dismissing Claims against Future Foam Without Prejudice filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Randall, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1877 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: 8/24/2015 Order and Notice of Party DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Dismissing without Prejudice Indirect Purchaser Class Claims Against Defendants Louis and David Carson [1876]. Judge Jack Zouhary(MDL2196) on 8/24/2015. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1876 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015, Terminated: 8/24/2015 Motion to dismiss party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion to dismiss party Louis Carson and David Carson filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1875 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Wesley M. Mullen regarding Vitafoam's Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715 in Connection with the Proposed Settlement Between Vitafoam and the IPP Class filed by Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, Vitafoam, Inc. Related document(s)[1859], [1861], [1751]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter dated 7/31/2015)(Coleman, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1874 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order denying motions made moot by settlements. Related documents [1670], [1681], [1687], [1691], [1693], [1696]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/12/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1873 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order dismissing, with prejudice, Sealy Plaintiffs' claims against FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc. Related document [1856]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/11/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1872 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order granting Motion to Approve Distribution of Settlement Funds for Payment of Notice Fees for the Direct Purchaser Settlement Classes (Related Doc # [1868]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/7/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1871 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order approving disbursement re: [1863] Proposed Billing Statement (July 1 - July 31, 2015). Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/7/2015. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1870 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order of dismissal, without prejudice, of Sealy Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. Related document [1869]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/7/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1869 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal, Without Prejudice, of Sealy Plaintiffs' Claims Against Hickory Springs filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Blechman, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1868 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015, Terminated: 8/7/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion and Memorandum in Support for Order to Approve Distribution of Settlement Funds for Payment of Notice Fees for the Direct Purchaser Settlement Classes filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-Wolfson Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Felder, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1867 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order of dismissal, with prejudice, of Direct Action Plaintiffs' claims against Leggett & Platt, Incorporated. Related document [1866]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/4/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1866 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of Spring Air Plaintiffs' Claims Against Leggett & Platt filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1865 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Marginal Entry Order granting Motion to stay Spring Air Plaintiffs' case against Defendant Foamex Innovations, Inc. (Related Doc # [1864]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 8/4/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1864 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015, Terminated: 8/4/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Motion to stay as to Defendant Foamex Innovations, Inc. filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Foam Ex Innovations, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (O'Neill, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1863 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Summary Billing Statement for July, 2015 relating to docket #[1862] filed on July 31, 2015 filed by David Rosenblum Cohen. (Cohen, David) Modified text 8/3/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1861 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order The Motions of the Indirect Purchaser Class for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with certain Defendants (Docs. [1751], [1854]) are granted, as amended by recent submissions. (Related documents [1859], [1860].) Fairness Hearing set for 12/15/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 204 of the Ashleys' Courthouse1716 Spielbusch Avenue, Toledo, Ohio, 43606. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/31/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1860 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015, Terminated: 7/30/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Submission of Amendments to Settlement Agreements Pending Preliminary Approval filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[1751]. (Miller, Marvin) Modified text; motion termed 7/30/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1859 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015, Terminated: 7/29/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submission of Amendments to Settlement Agreements Pending Preliminary Approval filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[1751]. (Miller, Marvin) Modified text/motion termed 7/31/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1858 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order. For the reasons stated in the Order, FXI's Motion for Summary Judgment, limited to the scope-of-damages (Docs. [1670] & [1696]), is granted. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/28/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1857 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice to take Deposition of Edward Bates on July 30, 2015 filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1856 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal, with Prejudice, of Sealy Plaintiffs' Claims Against FXI filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Randall, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1855 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice to take Deposition of Ian Dew on July 31, 2015 filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1854 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreements with FFP Holdings LLC, FXI Holdings, Inc., and Future Foam, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1853 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice to take Deposition of Eric Spitzer on July 29, 2015 filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1852 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Denying Motions Made Moot By Settlements. This Court denies as moot, in light of settlements in the Indirect Purchaser Class cases, certain dispositive motions (Docs. [1689], [1690], [1695], & [1698]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/27/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1851 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order staying IPP case as to FXI Holdings, Inc. Related document [1850]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/24/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1850 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015, Terminated: 7/24/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Motion to stay Case Against FXI Holdings, Inc. (formerly known as Foamex Innovations Inc.) filed by MDL Notice Only Foam Ex Innovations, Inc., Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1849 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Denying Motions Made Moot By Settlements. This Court denies as moot, in light of settlements in the Sealy Plaintiffs cases, certain dispositive motions (Docs. [1671], [1673], [1675], [1676]). This Court also denies the Spring Air Plaintiffs' and Defendant FFP Holdings, LLC's cross-motions to strike expert reports (Docs. [1734] & [1746]) in light of the settlement between those parties. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/24/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1848 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order staying IPP case as to Future Foam. Related document [1846]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/24/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1847 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Document:FXI's Reply in Support of Its Evidentiary Objection to Hearsay Evidence filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1838]. (Paris, Adam) Modified to add link 7/27/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1846 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015, Terminated: 7/24/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Motion to stay Case Against Future Foam, Inc. filed by MDL Notice Only Future Foam, Inc., Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1845 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Witness List filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (O'Neill, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1844 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Errata Related to the Memorandum of Law in Support of the Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, for Reimbursement of Expenses, and for an Incentive Award to the Direct Purchaser Class Representatives filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[1830].(Felder, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1843 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response (Objector's Reply) to [1800] Motion for sanctions, [1743] Motion for sanctions The Direct Purchaser Class' Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11 filed by Michael Narkin, pro se. (H,JD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1842 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order For the reasons stated in Plaintiffs' Opposition (Doc. [1827]),the Defendants' Motion to Stay is denied (Doc. [1817]). Weighing the lengthy history of this case, prior appeals, and the unlikelihood that a decision in Tyson Foods will impact this case and the recent work of preparing this case for trial, Defendants have failed to justify a stay. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/21/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1841 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order The Vitafoam Defendants' Motion to Decertify Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to the Vitafoam Defendants (Doc. [1688]) is denied as moot in light of the parties' settlement. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/21/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1840 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum Opinion and Order. For the reasons stated in the Order, Defendants' Motions to Decertify the Indirect Purchaser Class are denied. Related documents [1692], [1694]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/21/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1839 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order dismissing. without prejudice, Sealy Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc., Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., and Woodbridge Foam Corporation. Related document [1837]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/21/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1838 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Document:The "Spring Air Plaintiffs'" Opposition to FXI's Evidentiary Objection to Hearsay Evidence Submitted in the Sealy Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response In Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1760]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Case citations)(Wiechmann, Eric) Modified on 7/21/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1837 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Stipulation Dismissing Claims against Woodbridge Defendants Without Prejudice filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Randall, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1836 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice to take Deposition of Gregory D. Ethridge on July 23, 2015, at 12:00 p.m. EST filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (O'Neill, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1835 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order staying Indirect Purchaser Class case as to FFP Holdings, LLC (Related Doc # [1826]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/20/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1834 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Document:FXI's Notice of Filing of Corrected Trial Exhibit List for the Spring Air Trial filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - FXI's Exhibit List)(Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1833 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Document:FXI's Notice of Filing of Corrected Trial Exhibit List for the Indirect Purchaser Class Action Trial filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - FXI's Exhibit List)(Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1832 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Spring Air Plaintiffs General Objections to FXI's Initial Deposition Designations filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (O'Neill, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1831 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Michael H. Steinberg Regarding FXI's Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1715 filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A CAFA Notice Letter, # (2) Exhibit B CAFA Service List)(Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1830 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015, Terminated: 11/19/2015 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for attorney fees The Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, for Reimbursement of Expenses, and for an Incentive Award to the Direct Purchaser Class Representatives by Melissa Felder filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support)(Felder, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1829 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Document:Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of Stephen R. Neuwirth and William A. Isaacson filed by Direct Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[42], [1828]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-A Lodestar-Monthly by Attorney, # (2) Exhibit 1-B Lodestar-Monthly by Law Firm, # (3) Exhibit 1-C Lodestar-Monthly and by Attorney and Category, # (4) Exhibit 1-D Lodestar-Cumulative by Category, # (5) Exhibit 1-E Lodestar - Cumulative by Attorney and Category, # (6) Exhibit 2-A Summary of Expenses, # (7) Exhibit 2-B Expenses Per Firm, # (8) Exhibit 2-C Total Payments from Common Fund, # (9) Exhibit 2-D Outstanding Invoices, # (10) Exhibit 2-E Contributions to Common Fund)(Felder, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1828 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015, Terminated: 11/19/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants FFP Holdings, LLC, Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc., Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company, Mohawk Industries, Inc., Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc., and Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of the Direct Purchaser Class' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements, # (2) Exhibit A-Declaration of Lael Dowd, # (3) Exhibit B-Declaration of Stephen R. Neuwirth and William A. Isaacson, # (4) Proposed Order for Final Approval, # (5) Proposed Order of Judgments Dismissing Defendants)(Felder, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1827 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition to [1817] Motion to stay Indirect Purchaser Class Cases Pending Supreme Court Resolution of Tyson Foods, Inc. v. Bouaphakeo filed by Indirect Purchasers. (Kerger, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1826 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015, Terminated: 7/20/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Motion to stay Case Against FFP Holdings LLC filed by MDL Notice Only FFP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1825 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Minute Order _ Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Order of Telephone Conference held on 7/15/2015. Trial in this matter will now begin on Tuesday, September 1, 2015 in the Carl B. StokesFederal Courthouse in Cleveland, Ohio. By Tuesday, July 21, 2015, the Spring Air Plaintiffs shall file an amended trial witness list, reflecting all trial witnesses identified as of July 15, 2015. Further record phone conference scheduled for Wednesday, July 22, 2015 at 11:30 AM (EDT). Counsel shall use the district court conference line. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/17/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1824 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Excluding Greenhalgh and Silbert Testimony. The Spring Air and Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude the Limited Supplemental Expert Report of Peter R. Greenhalgh (Docs. [1683] and [1686]) aregranted. The Sealy Plaintiffs' Motion (Doc. [1669]) is denied as moot in light of the parties' settlement. This Court likewise grants the Indirect Purchasers Class' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Earl J. Silbert (Doc. [1686]) for the reasons previously stated as grounds for excluding Silbert's testimony in the Direct Purchaser Class case. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/16/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1823 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Matthew P. McGuire filed by Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Letter to Federal and State Officials and Service List))(McGuire, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1822 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Marginal Entry Order granting Motion to stay action as to Defendant Future Foam, Inc. (Related Doc # [1821]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/14/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1821 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015, Terminated: 7/14/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Motion to stay as to Defendant Future Foam, Inc. filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Future Foam, Inc., Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (O'Neill, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1820 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Bethany G. Lukitsch Regarding Carpenter Co.'s Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1715 filed by Carpenter Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Carpenter CAFA Service Letter), # (2) Exhibit B (Carpenter CAFA Service List))(Lukitsch, Bethany)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1819 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply in support Motion for Sanctions and, Opposition to [1800] Motion for sanctions, [1743] Motion for sanctions The Direct Purchaser Class' Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11 filed by Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Wolfson Declaration)(Felder, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1818 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of FXI and Future Foam's General Objections to the Spring Air Plaintiffs' Initial Deposition Designations filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1817 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015, Terminated: 7/21/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to stay Indirect Purchaser Class Cases Pending Supreme Court Resolution of Tyson Foods, Inc. v. Bouaphakeo filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc.. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1816 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED Document:Defendants' Reply in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss Certain Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Claims for Lack of Standing and Motions to Decertify the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc. Related document [1698], [42]. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael H. Steinberg, # (2) Exhibit A (Johs Dep. Tr.), # (3) Exhibit B (Parker Dep. Tr.), # (4) Exhibit C (Driftwood Dep. Tr.), # (5) Exhibit D (Beastrom Dep. Tr.), # (6) Exhibit E (Brown Dep. Tr.), # (7) Exhibit F (Gomez Dep. Tr.), # (8) Exhibit G (Lord Dep. Tr.), # (9) Exhibit H (Lord Dep. Ex.), # (10) Exhibit I (Johs Dep. Ex.), # (11) Exhibit J (Gomez Dep. Ex.), # (12) Exhibit K (Gomez Dep. Ex.), # (13) Exhibit L (Brown Dep. Ex.), # (14) Exhibit M (Beastrom Dep. Ex.), # (15) Exhibit N (Beastrom Dep. Ex.), # (16) Exhibit O (Petition for Writ of Cert.), # (17) Exhibit P (Bemco Dep. Tr.))(Paris, Adam) Modified to add link 7/13/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1815 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of John P. Passarelli filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter to Federal and State Officials)(Passarelli, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1814 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Dhananjay S. Manthripragada filed by Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Letter to Federal and State Officials and Service List))(France, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1813 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order dismissing, with prejudice, Direct Action Plaintiffs' claims against Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company. Related document [1812]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/9/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1812 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice against Hickory Springs Manufacturing Co. filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company, Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Anthony) Modified to remove duplicate text 7/9/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1811 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order extending deadlines related to deposition designations. Related document [1809]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/9/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1810 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on July 2, 2015 before Judge Judge Jack Zouhary, Court Reporter: George Staiduhar. Requested completion date: July 15, 2015 filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Regan, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1809 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Proposed Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadlines Related to Deposition Designations filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Steinberg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1808 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court ReporterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of telephone conference held on July 2nd, 2015, before Judge Jack Zouhary. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter George J. Staiduhar at (216) 357-7128. [28 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 7/15/2015. Redaction Request due 7/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2015. Related document(s)[1803]. (S,G)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1807 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Order on Motion to appeal in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order denying Motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis (Related Doc # [1775]). This Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Remark re Pro Se Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Copy of [1807] Order mailed to Mr. Michael Narkin at 85391 Chezem Road, Eugene, OR 97405 on 7/8/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1806 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Jeanne M. Janchar in Support of Compliance with 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1805 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order staying Sealy Plaintiffs' action and all deadlines as to Defendant Future Foam, Inc. Related document [1804]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/7/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1804 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Stipulation to Stay Action as to Future Foam filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Randall, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1803 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on July 2, 2015 before Judge Zouhary, Court Reporter: George Staiduhar. Requested completion date: July 8, 2015 filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. (Steinberg, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1802 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation for Mindee J. Reuben filed by Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Reuben, Mindee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1801 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Marginal Entry Order granting Sealy Plaintiffs' Motion to stay action as to Foamex Innovations, Inc. (Related Doc # [1798]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/7/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1800 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to have Class Counsel Sanctioned and Objector's Response to Direct Purchaser Class' [1743] Motion for Sanctions filed by Michael Narkin. (L,A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1799 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Minute Order _ Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order re: July 2 Phone Call. This Court held a record phone conference on 7/2/2015 to discuss the Indirect Purchaser Class's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements [1751]. See transcript for details (Court Reporter: George Staiduhar). Final Approval Hearing set for 12/7/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 209 before Judge Jack Zouhary. Indirect Purchaser Class shall respond to any objections to the settlements by 12/2/2015. By 7/13/2015, counsel shall meet and confer and jointly propose remaining dates for settlement milestones as discussed during the call. Also by 7/13/2015 the parties will supplement the Motion for Preliminary Approval with any modifications to the notices, claim form, or plan of allocation. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/6/2015. (1 hr, 30 mins) (Attachments: # (1) Legal Notice)(D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1798 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015, Terminated: 7/7/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to stay Action as to Defendant Foamex Innovations, Inc. filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Blechman, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1797 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order approving disbursement re: [1786] Proposed Billing Statement (June 1-June 30, 2015). Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/6/2015. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1796 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on July 2, 2015 before Judge Zouhary, Court Reporter: George Staiduhar. Requested completion date: July 20, 2015 filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Passarelli, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1795 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Non-Appeal Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 7/2/2015 before Judge Zouhary, Court Reporter: Staiduhar. Requested completion date: 8/5/2015 filed by Leggett & Platt, Inc.. (Warncke, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1794 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Document:FXI's Notice of Filing of Its Exhibit List for the Sealy/Spring Air Trial filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - FXI's Exhibit List)(Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1793 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED Document:FXI's Notice of Filing of Its Exhibit List for the Indirect Purchaser Class Action Trial filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - FXI's Exhibit List)(Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1792 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Document:FXI's Trial Witness List for the Sealy/Spring Air Trial filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42]. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1791 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Document:FXI's Trial Witness List for the Indirect Purchaser Class Action Trial filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42]. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1790 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List for Sealy/Spring Air Trial filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Sealy/Spring Air Exhibit List)(Fox, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1789 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List for Sealy/Spring Air Trial filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Fox, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1788 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List for IPP Trial filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Fox, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1787 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List for IPP Trial filed by Future Foam, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Trial Exhibit List)(Fox, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1786 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order Summary Billing Statement for June, 2015 relating to docket #1785 filed by David Rosenblum Cohen. (Cohen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1784 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order of dismissal, with prejudice, of the Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., and L&J Products and Sales Inc. Plaintiff's claims against the Vitafoam Defendants. Related document [1783]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 7/1/2015. (K,K) Modified to add link 7/8/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1783 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Florida Foam and Sales, Inc., Jackson Furniture Company of Virginia, Jackson Furniture Industries, Inc., L & J Products and Sales, Inc., NC Foam and Sales, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Limited, Vitafoam, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Revera, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1782 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Document:Reply in Support of FXI's Motion for Summary Judgment and FXI's and Future Foam's Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Orley Ashenfelter filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1691], [1696]. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1781 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply in support of [1695] SEALED Motion to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Russell L. Lamb [42] filed by FFP Holdings, LLC, FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit D - Excerpts of Dr. Lamb's Deposition Testimony, # (2) Exhibit E - Ordover Figures 1 & 3)(Raines, Alicia) Modified to remove duplicate text 6/30/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1780 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply in support of [1686] Motion Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Earl J. Silbert and to Exclude the Limited Supplemental Expert Report of Peter R. Greenhalgh and Any Testimony Regarding its Subject Matter filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1779 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Document:Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs filed by FFP Holdings, LLC, FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc., Future Foam, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1698]. (Blinn, Meghan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1778 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Document:Future Foam's Reply Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment Motion as to the Spring Air Plaintiffs filed by Future Foam, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1691]. (Blinn, Meghan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1777 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Document:Memorandum in Support of Evidentiary Objection to Hearsay Evidence Submitted in the Sealy Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42]. (Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1776 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Marginal Entry Order granting [1760] SEALED Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Evidentiary Objections to Hearsay Evidence Included in the Sealy Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions. The Sealy Plaintiffs shall oppose the evidentiary objections by 7/8/2015. No more than 15 pages. No reply. Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/29/2015.(D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1775 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015, Terminated: 7/8/2015 Motion to appeal in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to appeal in forma pauperis filed by Michael Narkin. Related document(s)[1747]. (M,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1774 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Document: Sur-reply in Opposition to Future Foam's Reply filed by Sealy Plaintiffs'. Related document(s)[42], [1671]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Email re: Foamex Letter)(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1773 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Marginal Entry Order granting Spring Air Plaintiffs' Motion to stay action as to FFP Holdings, LLC (Related Doc # [1765]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/29/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1772 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Marginal Entry Order granting Sealy Plaintiffs' Motion to stay action as to FFP Holdings, LLC (Related Doc # [1764]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/29/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1771 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Marginal Entry Order granting [1763] Sealed Motion for leave to file sur-reply. Sealy Plaintiffs are to file the sur-reply forthwith. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/29/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1770 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A -- IPP Trial Exhibit List)(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Pleasant Mattress Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc., Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Exhibit List)(Almon, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Pleasant Mattress Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc., Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Almon, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Refiled on member case 3:10-pf-10019. Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Eric Hodge. (Terrell, Reginald) Modified text 7/1/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1765 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015, Terminated: 6/29/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Motion to stay Action as to FFP Holdings LLC filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., FFP Holdings, LLC, Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1764 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015, Terminated: 6/29/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to stay Action as to FFP Holdings LLC filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Blechman, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1763 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015, Terminated: 6/29/2015 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION:Sealy Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File One Page Sur-reply filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1756]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Sur-reply)(Blechman, William) Modified to SEALED MOTION; notice regenerated 6/29/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1762 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015, Terminated: 12/4/2015 Acknowledgment from the USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of [1747] Notice of Appeal (USCA# 15-3680). Date filed in USCA 6/24/15. (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal, With Prejudice, of Sealy Plaintiffs' Claims Against Leggett & Platt filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Blechman, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1760 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015, Terminated: 6/29/2015 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Evidentiary Objections to Hearsay Evidence Included in the Sealy Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions [42] filed by MDL Notice Only FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (FXI's Memorandum in Support of Evidentiary Objection to Hearsay Evidence Submitted in the Sealy Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions))(Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1759 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Document:Reply in Support of FXI's Motion for Summary Judgment and FXI's and Future Foam's Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Keith Leffler as to FXI and Future Foam filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1673], [1672], [1670]. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Sealed Appendix Exhibits, # (2) Declaration of Michael H. Steinberg with Sealed Appendix Exhibits, # (3) Sealed Appendix Exhibits 1-21, # (4) Sealed Appendix Exhibits 22-38, # (5) Sealed Appendix Exhibits 39-46)(Paris, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Document:Reply Brief in Support of Future Foam's Summary Judgment Motion as to the Sealy Plaintiffs filed by Future Foam, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1673]. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Evidence, # (2) Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from Deposition of Michael Faus, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from Deposition of Jan Denenberg)(Blinn, Meghan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Document:Reply in Support of Its Partial Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion filed by FFP Holdings, LLC. Related document(s)[42], [1675]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Summary Charts of FFP's Gross Margins)(Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1756 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Document:Reply in Support of Summary Judgment that the Sealy Plaintiffs Lack Standing to Pursue an Antitrust Claim filed by FFP Holdings, LLC, Future Foam, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1671]. (Pollack-Milgate, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply in support of [1669] SEALED Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Mr. Greenhalgh filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Blechman, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Document:Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Decertify filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[42], [1692], [1694]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Lamb Class Cert Dec, # (2) Exhibit B - Nolan Pillow Receipt and Packaging, # (3) Exhibit C - Serta 30(b)(6) Dep, # (4) Exhibit D - Sealy 30(b)(6) Dep, # (5) Exhibit E - Parker 30(b)(6) Dep, # (6) Exhibit F - Driftwood 30(b)(6) Dep, # (7) Exhibit G - FXI Disclosures)(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1753 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response to [1698] Joint SEALED Motion to Dismiss Certain IPP Claims for Lack of Standing and for Summary Judgment [42] filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1752 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015, Terminated: 6/22/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Law in Support of [1751] Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Carpenter Co., Hickory Springs Manufacturing Co., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Mohawk, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Ltd., and Vitafoam, Inc., Woodbridge Foam Corp., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc., and Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[1751]. (Miller, Marvin) Modified text on 6/22/2015 (B,R).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1751 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015, Terminated: 7/31/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Carpenter Co., Hickory Springs Manufacturing Co., Leggett & Platt, Inc., Mohawk, Inc., Vitafoam Products Canada Ltd., Vitafoam Inc., Woodbridge Foam Corp., Woodbridge Sales & Engineering, Inc., and Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Marvin A. Miller, # (2) Exhibit B - Carpenter Settlement Agreement, # (3) Exhibit C - Hickory Springs Settlement Agreement, # (4) Exhibit D - Leggett & Platt Settlement Agreement, # (5) Exhibit E - Mohawk Settlement Agreement, # (6) Exhibit F - Vitafoam Settlement Agreement, # (7) Exhibit G - Woodbridge Settlement Agreement, # (8) Exhibit H - Short-Form Notice for Publication, # (9) Exhibit I - Long-Form Notice for Website and Mailing, # (10) Exhibit J - Plan of Allocation, # (11) Exhibit K - Claim Form, # (12) Exhibit L - Affidavit of Anya Verkhovskaya)(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1750 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice to take Deposition of Howard Marvel on June 26, 2015 filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Randall, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition to [1746] (Cross-Motion) Motion to strike FFP's Rebuttal Expert Report and Daubert Motion :Spring Air Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant FFP's Cross-Motion to Strike Rebuttal Report [1746] filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Tompkins, Charles) Modified text on 6/19/2015 (H,JD).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1748 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Document:The "Spring Air Plaintiffs'" corrected Omnibus Memorandum in Opposition to various Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgement and to exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Orley Ashenfelter filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1689], [1691], [1739], [1697], [1696]. (Wiechmann, Eric) Modified to remove caps 6/19/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015, Terminated: 12/4/2015 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals the Court's 5/19/15 [1701] Order filed by Michael Narkin. Fee not paid. (L,A) Modified text 6/19/2015 (C,KA).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1746 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition to [1734] Motion to strike FFP's Rebuttal Expert Report and Daubert Motion and Cross-Motion to Strike Spring Air's Rebuttal Expert Report and Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion filed by FFP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - 6-1-15 Love email and attachments)(Love, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1745 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Marginal Order staying action as to Woodbridge Defendants. Related document [1744]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/17/2015. (K,K) Modified to add document link 6/17/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Proposed Stipulation Regarding Staying the Action as to Woodbridge Defendants filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc., Woodbridge Foam Corporation, Woodbridge Foam Fabricating, Inc., Woodbridge Group. (O'Neill, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1743 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015, Terminated: 11/19/2015 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for sanctions The Direct Purchaser Class' Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11 filed by Plaintiff Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support, # (2) Exhibit A-Narkin Objection, # (3) Exhibit B-Ghirardelli Objection, # (4) Exhibit C-Aguiar Objection, # (5) Exhibit D-Bezdek Objection, # (6) Exhibit E-Larsen Objection, # (7) Exhibit F-Fitflop Objection, # (8) Exhibit G-Letter to Narkin, # (9) Exhibit H-Chart of Narkin Objections, # (10) Exhibit I-Narkin bankruptcy schedules)(Felder, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1742 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order staying IPP case as to Vitafoam Defendants. Related document [1737]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1741 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Marginal Order staying action as to Mohawk Industries, Inc. Related document [1731]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/16/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1740 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Document:IPP Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[42], [1689], [1698], [1692], [1690]. (Attachments: # (1) Index Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - April 12, 2006 Email attaching Mohawk Price Increase Letter, # (3) Exhibit B - May 9, 2006 Renfro Email to Carpenter attaching Flexible Foam Increase Letter, # (4) Exhibit C - May 9, 2008 Facsimile Transmission of Carpenter Increase Letter, # (5) Exhibit D - Declaration of John Howard, # (6) Exhibit E - Declaration of Tammy Jacovides, # (7) Exhibit F - October 6, 2005 Donato/Farah Email, # (8) Exhibit G - Handwritten Notes Re Price-fixing situation, # (9) Exhibit H - February 26, 2005 Emai, # (10) Exhibit I - October 9, 2002 Future Foam Email, # (11) Exhibit J - Declaration of Tony Vellecoccia, # (12) Exhibit K - Vitafoams Responses to IPPs Amended Requests for Admission, # (13) Exhibit L - Woodbridge Plea Agreement, # (14) Exhibit M - Compressors Antitrust Litig. 3rd Consolidated Am. Complaint, # (15) Exhibit N - Deposition of Kathleen Nolan and Proof of Purchase, # (16) Exhibit O - Deposition of The Parker Company, # (17) Exhibit P - Deposition of Driftwood Hospitality Management, # (18) Exhibit Q - June 3, 2003 Email, # (19) Exhibit R - Moeller Deposition Transcript, # (20) Exhibit S - Price Increase Correspondence Involving FFP From 2001, # (21) Exhibit T - Excerpt From Trial Reply Declaration of Dr. Russell Lamb, # (22) Exhibit U - Lamb Deposition Transcript (07/14/14))(Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1739 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Document:The "Spring Air Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum in Opposition to Various Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Orley Ashenfelter filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.Related document(s)[42], [1689], [1691], [1697], [1696]. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A - Deposition Excerpts, # (2) Appendix B - Addendum of Orly Ashenfelter June 15, 2015, # (3) Affidavit of Charles E. Tompkins, # (4) Exhibit 1 - Ashenfelter Rebuttal Report, # (5) Exhibit 2 - Ashenfelter Deposition Excerpts, # (6) Exhibit 3 - Dkt. No. 1648-3 Ashenfelter Rebuttal Errata, # (7) Exhibit 4 - Greenhalgh Deposition Excerpts, # (8) Exhibit 5 - Orly Ashenfelter Curriculum Vitae, # (9) Exhibit 6 - Greenhalgh Resume, # (10) Exhibit 7 - Joseph P. Kalt Expert Report, # (11) Exhibit 8 - Janusz Ordover Expert Report, # (12) Exhibit 9 - Orly Ashenfelter Expert Report, # (13) Exhibit 10 - Peter Greenhalgh Expert Report, # (14) Exhibit 11 - Howard Marvel Expert Report, # (15) Exhibit 12 - Howard Marvel Deposition Excerpts, # (16) Exhibit 13 - Joseph Kalt Expert Report, # (17) Exhibit 14 - Peter Greenhalgh Deposition Excerpts, # (18) Exhibit 15 - Thomas Koltun Deposition Excerpts, # (19) Exhibit 16 - Ex. 41 - Freeman Deposition)(Tompkins, Charles) Modified to remove caps 6/16/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1738 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Document:IPP Memo in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Russell Lamb filed by Indirect Purchaser Class. Related document(s)[42], [1692], [1695], [1690]. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - Lamb Trial Report, # (3) Exhibit B - Lamb Trial Reply Report, # (4) Exhibit C - Lamb Deposition, # (5) Exhibit D - Ordover Deposition, # (6) Exhibit E - Pauley Deposition v. 1, # (7) Exhibit F - Pauley Deposition v. 2, # (8) Exhibit G - Ordover Declaration, # (9) Exhibit H - Sharkey Deposition, # (10) Exhibit I - Jernigan Deposition, # (11) Exhibit J - Lockhart & Jackson Deposition, # (12) Exhibit K - Sealy 10-K 2004, # (13) Exhibit L - Sealy 10-K 2006, # (14) Exhibit M - Sealy 10-K 2008, # (15) Exhibit N - Sealy 10-K 2010, # (16) Exhibit O - Serta article, # (17) Exhibit P - Ex P - Bedding Majors article, # (18) Exhibit Q - La-Z-Boy 10-K 2005, # (19) Exhibit R - La-Z-Boy 10-K 2007, # (20) Exhibit S - La-Z-Boy 10-K 2008, # (21) Exhibit T - Tempur-Pedic 10-K, # (22) Exhibit U - Select Comfort 10-K 2005, # (23) Exhibit V - Select Comfort 10-K 2006, # (24) Exhibit W - Denenberg Deposition, # (25) Exhibit X - Wahrmund Deposition, # (26) Exhibit Y - Minning Deposition, # (27) Exhibit Z - SRTFMED00154621, # (28) Exhibit AA - SRTFMED 00176657, # (29) Exhibit BB - FBNFM00007783, # (30) Exhibit CC - FX00211233, # (31) Exhibit DD - Palmer Ex. 11, # (32) Exhibit EE - Mohawk Retailer Survey, # (33) Exhibit FF - Furniture Today article, # (34) Exhibit GG - SRTFMED00155070, # (35) Exhibit HH - Class Cert Hrg Transcript, # (36) Exhibit II - Kalt Deposition)(Miller, Marvin) Modified to remove duplicate text 6/16/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1737 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015, Terminated: 6/16/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Motion to stay Case Against Defendants Vitafoam Products Canada Limited and Vitafoam, Inc. (Collectively, "Vitafoam Defendants") filed by Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1736 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Firm Name Change filed by Cambridge of California, Inc.. (Strange, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1735 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Matthew P. McGuire Regarding Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company's Compliance with 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1734 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015, Terminated: 7/24/2015 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to strike FFP's Rebuttal Expert Report and Daubert Motion filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. Related document(s)[1675]. (Wiechmann, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1733 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Kendall Millard in Support of Compliance with 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1732 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Dhananjay S. Manthripragada Regarding Woodbridge Defendants' Compliance with 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1731 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Proposed Stipulation Regarding Staying Action as to Mohawk Industries, Inc. filed by Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., E&E Bedding Company, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Alfred T. Giuliano, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Medi-Pedic Bedding Co., Inc., Mohawk Industries, Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Sleep Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc.. (Dowell, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1730 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Affidavit/Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Allison S. Thompson Regarding Mohawk Industries, Inc.'s Compliance with 28 U.S.C.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1729 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order approving disbursement re: [1712] Proposed Billing Statement (March 14-May 29, 2015). Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/11/2015. (D,L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1728 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order staying IPP case as to Hickory Springs. Related document [1727]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/11/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1727 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015, Terminated: 6/11/2015 Motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Motion to stay Case Against Defendant Hickory Spring Manufacturing Company filed by MDL Notice Only Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company, Plaintiff Indirect Purchaser Class. (Miller, Marvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1726 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Order on Motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order. For the reasons stated in the Order, the Court denies Plaintiffs' [1723] Motion for a 15 minute extension, but grants a 20 minute extension, thereby allowing their brief, filed 18 minutes late, to be deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/10/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1725 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney Appearance by Brittany A. Killian.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1724 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015, Terminated: 6/10/2015 Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealy Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response in Opposition to Defendants' Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc. Related documents [1670], 1671], [1675], [1673]. (Attachments: # (1) Pleading Randall Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Declaration Exhibits 1-10, # (3) Exhibit Declaration Exhibits 11-15, # (4) Exhibit Declaration Exhibits 16-20, # (5) Exhibit Declaration Exhibits 21-30, # (6) Exhibit Declaration Exhibits 31-60, # (7) Exhibit Declaration Exhibits 61-70, # (8) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 71 - Part 1, # (9) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 71 - Part 2, # (10) Exhibit Declaration Exhibits 72-80, # (11) Exhibit Declaration Exhibits 81-92)(Randall, Samuel) Modified to term motion, add links 6/10/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1723 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015, Terminated: 6/10/2015 Motion for extension of time (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for extension of time until June 10, 2015 at 12:15 am to File Brief filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Randall, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1722 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Document:FXI's Opposition to Sealy, Spring Aiar and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude Report and Testimony of Mr. Greenhalgh filed by FXI-Foamex Innovations, Inc.. Related document(s)[42], [1669], [1683], [1686]. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Adam S. Paris, # (2) Exhibit A - 02.11.15 Greenhalgh report, # (3) Exhibit B - 02.11.15 email, # (4) Exhibit C - 02.12.15 email)(Paris, Adam) Modified text 6/10/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1721 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Appeal Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              True Copy of mandate from US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit: Transferring the Notice of Appeal to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals re [1620] (USCA# 15-1497). Date issued by USCA 6/8/15 (H,SP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1720 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Attorney Appearance by James P. Fieweger, Paul J. Ripp filed by on behalf of Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Spring Air International LLC, Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1719 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filing Error (refiled on member case 3:13-pf-10012) - Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Holt, Benjamin) Modified text; notice regenerated 6/8/2015 (K,K). Modified on 11/10/2015 (K,K).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1718 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order denying leave to file Amended Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions. Related document [1713]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/5/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1717 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order granting Sealy and Spring Air Plaintiffs' unopposed Motions for the Court to Adopt Previous Daubert Rulings (Docs. [1674], [1682]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 6/5/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1716 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Attorney Appearance by Eric R. Lifvendahl, Anthony J. O'Neill filed by on behalf of Advanced Sleep Concepts, Albany Foam & Supply, Inc., Bemco Sleep Products, Inc., Fraenkel Company, Grand Rapids Bedding Co., Illinois Sleep Products, Jeffco Fibres, Inc., Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc., Pleasant Mattress Company, Simple Designs Manufacturing, Inc., Spring Air LLC, Spring Air Mattress Corp., Spring Air Ohio LLC, Tualatin Sleep Products, Inc., White Cross Sleep Products, Inc. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1715 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply in support of [1713] SEALED Motion by Defendant FFP Holdings LLC for Leave to File Amended Memorandum and Exhibits in Support of Its Partial Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion [42], [1710], [1675] filed by FFP Holdings, LLC. (Love, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1714 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to [1713] SEALED Motion by Defendant FFP Holdings LLC for Leave to File Amended Memorandum and Exhibits in Support of Its Partial Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion [42], [1710], [1675] filed by La-Z-Boy Incorporated, National Bedding Company, Sealy Corporation, Select Comfort Corporation, Simmons Bedding Company, Tempur-Pedic International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Highlighted FFP Original Memorandum)(Blechman, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1713 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015, Terminated: 6/5/2015 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Motion by Defendant FFP Holdings LLC for Leave to File Amended Memorandum and Exhibits in Support of Its Partial Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion [42], [1710], [1675] filed by MDL Notice Only FFP Holdings, LLC. Related document(s)[42], [1710], [1675]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - FFP's Amended Memorandum and Exhibits in Support of Its Daubert and Partial Summary Judgment Motion, # (2) Exhibit B - Redline Comparison)(Love, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1712 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Summary Billing Statement for March 14-May29, 2015 relating to docket #1711 filed by David Rosenblum Cohen. (Cohen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1710 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order imposing sanctions for late-disclosed expert report and granting in part and denying in part [1680] Sealy's Motion to Strike Rebuttal Export Report and Daubert Motion. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 5/26/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1709 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: 5/22/2015 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Marginal Entry Order granting Motion to stay case against Carpenter Co. (Related Doc # [1706]). Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 5/22/2015.(K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1708 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: 5/22/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order staying action as to Woodbridge Defendants. Related document [1705]. Signed by Judge Jack Zouhary (MDL2196) on 5/22/2015. (K,K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 2,801 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?