Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-02997-JSW
District Judge Jeffrey S. White, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 5:58 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Plaintiff

Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Kirschner +1 202 249 0920 adam.kirschner@usdoj.gov
Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Kirschner +1 202 249 0920 adam.kirschner@usdoj.gov
Office San Francisco
Filed 6/17/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing, RELATE
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING (121 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) AND (102 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/29/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 9/29/2010) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER GRANTING 100 Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/3/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
        STIPULATION re 99 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER GRANTING (98 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) Stipulation TO CONTINUE CMC (117 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Stipulation TO CONTINUE CMC. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/15/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
            STIPULATION (Second) to Continue Case Management Conference by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 7/14/2010) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER GRANTING (96 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/23/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/23/2010) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                  CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2010) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                    MANDATE of USCA as to (81 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 99 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                      CLERKS NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                        USCA ORDER AMENDING and AMENDED OPINION as to-AFFIRMED in part, REVERSED in part, and REMANDED in part (81 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 99 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                          OPINION of USCA as to (81 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 99 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010) Modified on 2/19/2010 (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                            ORDER of USCA as to (81 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 99 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                              ORDER of USCA as to (81 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 99 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER re Notice (83 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) and Notice (101 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) DENYING Emergency Motion for Temporary Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 13, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                  ORDER of USCA as to 81 Notice of Appeal, filed by Department of Justice (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence Reply in Support of Emergency Filing for Stay Pending Appeal Determination (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/13/2009) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                      Memorandum in Opposition to Emergency Filing for Temporary Stay Pending Decision by Solicitor General Regarding Appeal and Immediate Administrative Stay filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                        Minute Entry: Telephone Conference (Date Filed: 10/9/2009). (Court Reporter Christine Triska.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence Emergency Filing for Stay, Per Direction of Ninth Circuit (Attachments: # 1 Ninth Circuit Stay Order, # 2 Emergency Stay Motion filed in Ninth Cir., # 3 Stay Reply filed in Ninth Cir., # 4 EFF Opposition to Stay Mtn filed in Ninth Cir., # 5 Notice of Appeal)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                            Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence re 81 Notice of Appeal, (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (79 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 79 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 79 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 79 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW, 97 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW, 97 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW, 97 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW, 97 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Leave to File by Department of Justice. Filing fee waived. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence Notice of Appeal (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/8/2009) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING (91) Motion to Stay; DENYING (93) Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:08-cv-01023-JSW; DENYING (73) Motion to Stay; and DENYING (75) Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:08-cv-02997-JSW. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Reply Memorandum re 73 MOTION to Stay re 72 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment for 60 days pending appeal determination by Solicitor General MOTION to Stay re 72 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment for 60 days pending appeal determination by Solicitor General filed byDepartment of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/7/2009) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for a 60 Day Stay Pending Appeal Determination by Solicitor General filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/6/2009) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Declaration of Susan L. Kim in Support of 75 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and Request that Reconsideration be Granted Without Further Briefing filed byDepartment of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 NSD Second Revised Vaughn Index)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/6/2009) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and Request that Reconsideration be Granted Without Further Briefing filed by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 10/6/2009) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER GRANTING Modified Stipulation re (91 in 3:08-cv-01023-JSW) MOTION to Stay re (90) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment for 60 Days Pending Appeal Determination by Solicitor General; MOTION to Stay re (90) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, (73 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) MOTION to Stay re (72) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment for 60 days pending appeal determination by Solicitor General MOTION to Stay re (72) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 2, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Stay re 72 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment for 60 days pending appeal determination by Solicitor General filed by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Stipulation to Expedite Motion for 60-Day Stay Pending Appeal Determination)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/30/2009) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White in case 3:08-cv-01023-JSW; DENYING (29) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:08-cv-02997-JSW and GRANTING Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER WTIHDRAWING (70 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation and SUGGESTION for Consent. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 17, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER REFERRING Consolidated Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/10/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE Setting Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment on 8/14/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2009) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of 67 Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D part 1, # 5 Exhibit D part 2, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 67 ) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 6/2/2009) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 6/2/2009) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Declaration of Susan Kim in Support of 62 Notice (Other) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 revised Vaughn index)(Related document(s) 62 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Declaration of Melanie Ann Pustay in Support of 62 Notice (Other) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 62 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                Declaration of Paul P. Colborn in Support of 62 Notice (Other) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 revsied Vaughn index)(Related document(s) 62 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  Declaration of John F. Hackett in Support of 62 Notice (Other) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 62 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice Notice of Filing (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 5/12/2009) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 4/24/2009) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White dated March 23, 2009 GRANTING (70) Motion to Stay in case 3:08-cv-01023-JSW and GRANTING (53) Motion to Stay in case 3:08-cv-02997-JSW. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of 58 Response in Support of Motion for a Stay of Proceedings filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Related document(s) 58 ) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/3/2009) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support 53 of Motion for a Stay of Proceedings filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/3/2009) Modified on 3/4/2009 (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 53 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 2/24/2009) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER RE MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Proposed Order by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/10/2009) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Declaration of Marcia Hofmann 53 >in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/10/2009) Modified on 2/11/2009 (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/10/2009) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Proposed Order Granting Motion for Stay of Proceedings by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/9/2009) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of 50 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 50 ) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/9/2009) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/9/2009) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Reply Memorandum re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) Defs' Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Mtn for SJ and Reply in Support of Defs' Consol. Mtn for SJ filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Declaration of John F. Hackett in Support of 46 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Cross Mtn for SJ and Reply in Support of Defs' Consol. Mtn for SJ filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Declaration of Paul P. Colborn in Support of 46 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Cross Mtn for SJ and Reply in Support of Defs' Consol. Mtn for SJ filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) Defs' Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for SJ and Reply in Support of Defs' Consol. Mtn for SJ filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 43 Memorandum in Opposition, by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 1/13/2009) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of 43 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and In Support of Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Exhibit 6-10, # 3 Exhibit 11-15, # 4 Exhibit 16-18, # 5 Exhibit 19-22)(Related document(s) 43 ) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 1/13/2009) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment and Notice of Cross Motion and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 1/13/2009) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Declaration of J. Michael McConnell in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Declaration of David M. Hardy in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Declaration of Carl J. Nichols in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Daniel Meyer in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Joseph J. Brand in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Declaration of James M. Kovakas in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Matthew G. Olsen in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Charles M. Steele in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Kenneth L. Wainstein in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Melanie Ann Pustay in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part I, # 2 Exhibit Part II)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Paul P. Colborn in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of John F. Hackett in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) with Vaughn index attached filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Kathleen Turner in Support of 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment (consolidated) filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/10/2008) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING (27) Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment (Administrative Motion) filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Declaration)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/8/2008) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING IN PART Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 5, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation for Motions for Summary Judgment by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 12/4/2008) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING (23 in 3:08-cv-02997-JSW) Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 11/19/2008) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Berman (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 11/13/2008) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR COURT ORDER PRODUCTION SCHEDULE AND TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re 19 Order by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Kirschner, Adam) (Filed on 10/7/2008) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation to Court Ordered Production Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/24/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Court Ordered Production Schedule by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 9/24/2008) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Hon. Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/17/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re 7 Initial Scheduling Scheduling Order to Vacate Case Management Conference by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Kirschner, Adam) (Filed on 9/16/2008) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kirschner, Adam) (Filed on 9/16/2008) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kirschner, Adam) (Filed on 9/16/2008) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 9/11/2008) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Kirschner, Adam) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Clerk's Notice Re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ls7, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re [9] Amended Complaint to Extend Time to Respond by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. (Kirschner, Adam) (Filed on 7/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice. Filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re [7] Initial Scheduling Scheduling Order (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Initial Scheduling Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2008 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2008.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [4] Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008, Terminated: 7/7/2008 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION of David L. Sobel for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020631) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2008. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2008 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # (1) EMC Standing Order, # (2) Case Management Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT; summons issued against Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611020333). Filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2008) (slh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?