Salz v. Casey's Marketing Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-03055
District Judge Donald E. O'Brien, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 8:34 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Stepheni Salz, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D Sherinian +1 515 224 2079 +1 515 224 2321 sherinianlaw@msn.com

Represented by Sherinian & Hasso Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Hasso +1 515 224 2079 +2242 224 224 2321 mhasso@sherinianlaw.com
v.
No Logo Casey's Marketing Company, Defendant

Represented by AHLERS & COONEY PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan John Overberg +1 515 246 0329 +2432 243 243 2149 noverberg@ahlerslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda G Wachuta +1 515 246 0322 +1 515 243 2149 awachuta@ahlerslaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Casey's Marketing Company, Stepheni Salz (Hasso, Melissa) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 28 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 21 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 28 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 3/17/2014 09:00 AM in SC 3rd Fl Ct before Senior Judge Donald E O'Brien. Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2014 08:30 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Donald E O'Brien. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2014 03:00 PM in SC 1st Fl Ct before Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2014. Pretrial Status Conference set for 3/14/2014 03:30 PM in SC 3rd Fl Ct before Senior Judge Donald E O'Brien. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/21/12. (djs) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures ddl 09/03/12 but not filed with the court: Add Parties ddl 10/24/2012: Amended Pleadings ddl 10/24/2012: Plaintiff's Expert Witness ddl 11/26/2012: Defendant's Expert Witness ddl 01/24/2013: Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts ddl 02/25/2013: Discovery ddl 05/10/2013: Motions ddl 06/07/2013: Trial Ready ddl 11/04/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 08/21/12. (kfs) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
        Defendant's ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by Casey's Marketing Company. (Overberg, Nathan) Modified text on 8/17/2012 (pac). (Entered: 08/16/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER pursuant to 15 memorandum opinion and order filed 7/19/2012, Scheduling Report due by 8/20/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard T Strand on 7/20/2012. (des) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION ORDER: Granting in Part and Denying in Part 6 and 11 Motion to Dismiss: See text of Order for further information. Signed by Senior Judge Donald E O'Brien on 07/19/12. (kfs) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Donald E O'Brien: Motion Hearing held on 02/01/2012 RE: 11 Motion to Dismiss: Ruling withheld: Order to follow (Court Reporter: Carolyn Plueger) (kfs) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions: Motion to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 6 and 11 ) Telephonic motion hearing set for 2/1/2012 at 2:00 PM before Senior Judge Donald E. O'Brien. The Court will initiate the telephone call to each party utilizing the numbers provided. Signed by Senior Judge Donald E. O'Brien on 01/11/2012. (Gollhofer, Jami) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                  RESISTANCE to Motion to Dismiss Count I of the Amended Complaint and Request for Oral Argument filed by Stepheni Salz. (Sherinian, Mark) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                    *Oral Argument Requested* - MOTION to Dismiss Count I of Amended Petition by Defendant Casey's Marketing Company. Responses due by 12/22/2011. (Overberg, Nathan) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/5/2011 to correct typo in caption) (src) Modified text on 12/6/2011 (pac). (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                      REPLY BRIEF to 6 Motion to Dismiss Count 1 filed by Casey's Marketing Company. (Overberg, Nathan) Modified text on 12/1/2011 (pac). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                        RESISTANCE to Motion to Dismiss filed by Stepheni Salz. (Attachments: # 1 Brief) (Sherinian, Mark) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                          AMENDED Complaint and Jury Demand against Casey's General Stores, Inc, filed by Stepheni Salz. (Sherinian, Mark) Modified text on 11/22/2011 (pac). (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                            PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Casey's General Stores, Inc (Wachuta, Amanda) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                              *Oral Argument Requested* - MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of Petition by Defendant Casey's General Stores, Inc Responses due by 11/21/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support) (Overberg, Nathan) Modified text on 11/4/2011 (pac). (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                DOCKET Annotation re 2 Notice of Removal: Complaint Filing Fee of $350.00 receipt #0862-1297107 by Amanda G Wachuta captured by pay.gov on 10/28/11 at 16:29:42. Pay.gov also captured Complaint Filing Fee of $350.00 receipt #0862-1297128 by Amanda G Wachuta on 10/28/11 at 16:35:20. Therefore, receipt #0862-1297128 for $350.00 Complaint Filing Fee is refunded to Counsel pursuant to written request dated 10/31/11 received by the finance dept 10/31/11 and Clerk's Approval on 10/31/11. (Attachments: # 1 Atty Correspondence) (ksy) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                  DOCKET Annotation re 2 Notice of Removal: Parties, please find attached the case packet used in removal cases. (pac) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                    STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Stepheni Salz. (pac) Modified text on 11/1/2011 (pac). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Hancock County, case number LACV019028. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0862-1297128), filed by Casey's General Stores, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 2/8/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Local Rule 81 List on Removal) (Wachuta, Amanda) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of New Removal Case Filing by Casey's General Stores, Inc. (skm) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 303 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?