Melendres, et al. v. Arpaio, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-02513-GMS
District Judge G Murray Snow, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 20, 2021 at 4:21 PM DT (2.7 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Joseph Pochoda +1 602 532 0486 danpoc@cox.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Young, Stanley +1 415 326 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Cincotta , +1 415 343 0781 +1 415 395 0950 ccincotta@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Lisa Goldfaden +1 415 343 0776 +1 415 395 0950 rgoldfaden@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Lai +1 602 650 1854 +1 602 650 1376 alai@acluaz.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica Marie Ramirez +1 415 343 0778 +1 415 395 0950 mramirez@aclu.org

Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by MALDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Michelle Campbell +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 kcampbell@maldef.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Maricopa County Attorneys Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/31/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen J Hartman-Tellez +1 602 506 8541 hartmank@mcao.maricopa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Jeremy Bodney +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 dbodney@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 09/17/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Isaac Pasaret Hernandez +1 602 257 5206 +1 602 257 5299
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Shawn Kozinets +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 pkozinets@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron James Lockwood +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 alockwood@steptoe.com
No Logo Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Joseph Pochoda +1 602 532 0486 danpoc@cox.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Young, Stanley +1 415 326 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Cincotta , +1 415 343 0781 +1 415 395 0950 ccincotta@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Lisa Goldfaden +1 415 343 0776 +1 415 395 0950 rgoldfaden@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Lai +1 602 650 1854 +1 602 650 1376 alai@acluaz.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica Marie Ramirez +1 415 343 0778 +1 415 395 0950 mramirez@aclu.org

Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by MALDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Michelle Campbell +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 kcampbell@maldef.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Maricopa County Attorneys Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/31/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen J Hartman-Tellez +1 602 506 8541 hartmank@mcao.maricopa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Jeremy Bodney +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 dbodney@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 09/17/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Isaac Pasaret Hernandez +1 602 257 5206 +1 602 257 5299
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Shawn Kozinets +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 pkozinets@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron James Lockwood +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 alockwood@steptoe.com
No Logo Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Joseph Pochoda +1 602 532 0486 danpoc@cox.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Young, Stanley +1 415 326 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Lai +1 602 650 1854 +1 602 650 1376 alai@acluaz.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Cincotta , +1 415 343 0781 +1 415 395 0950 ccincotta@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Lisa Goldfaden +1 415 343 0776 +1 415 395 0950 rgoldfaden@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/02/2008 Louis R Moffa, Jr. +1 856 761 3493 +1 856 761 1020 moffal@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica Marie Ramirez +1 415 343 0778 +1 415 395 0950 mramirez@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen C Chien , +1 415 591 7077 +1 415 955 6577 schien@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Joseph Hickey , +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 591 6091 khickey@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew James Steilen , +1 415 591 7012 +1 415 955 6512 msteilen@cov.com

Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by MALDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Michelle Campbell +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 kcampbell@maldef.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Maricopa County Attorneys Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/31/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen J Hartman-Tellez +1 602 506 8541 hartmank@mcao.maricopa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/02/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie A Pace +1 602 778 3700 +1 602 778 3750 julie.pace@ogletreedeakins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Jeremy Bodney +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 dbodney@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 09/17/2009 Isaac Pasaret Hernandez +1 602 257 5206 +1 602 257 5299
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Shawn Kozinets +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 pkozinets@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron James Lockwood +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 alockwood@steptoe.com
No Logo Manuel Nieto, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Joseph Pochoda +1 602 532 0486 danpoc@cox.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Young, Stanley +1 415 326 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Cincotta , +1 415 343 0781 +1 415 395 0950 ccincotta@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Lisa Goldfaden +1 415 343 0776 +1 415 395 0950 rgoldfaden@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Lai +1 602 650 1854 +1 602 650 1376 alai@acluaz.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica Marie Ramirez +1 415 343 0778 +1 415 395 0950 mramirez@aclu.org

Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by MALDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Michelle Campbell +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 kcampbell@maldef.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Maricopa County Attorneys Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/31/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen J Hartman-Tellez +1 602 506 8541 hartmank@mcao.maricopa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Jeremy Bodney +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 dbodney@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 09/17/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Isaac Pasaret Hernandez +1 602 257 5206 +1 602 257 5299
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Shawn Kozinets +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 pkozinets@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron James Lockwood +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 alockwood@steptoe.com
No Logo Somos America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Joseph Pochoda +1 602 532 0486 danpoc@cox.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Young, Stanley +1 415 326 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Cincotta , +1 415 343 0781 +1 415 395 0950 ccincotta@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Lisa Goldfaden +1 415 343 0776 +1 415 395 0950 rgoldfaden@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Lai +1 602 650 1854 +1 602 650 1376 alai@acluaz.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica Marie Ramirez +1 415 343 0778 +1 415 395 0950 mramirez@aclu.org

Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by MALDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Michelle Campbell +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 kcampbell@maldef.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Maricopa County Attorneys Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/31/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen J Hartman-Tellez +1 602 506 8541 hartmank@mcao.maricopa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Jeremy Bodney +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 dbodney@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 09/17/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Isaac Pasaret Hernandez +1 602 257 5206 +1 602 257 5299
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Shawn Kozinets +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 pkozinets@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron James Lockwood +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 alockwood@steptoe.com
No Logo Velia Meraz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Joseph Pochoda +1 602 532 0486 danpoc@cox.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Young, Stanley +1 415 326 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Cincotta , +1 415 343 0781 +1 415 395 0950 ccincotta@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Lisa Goldfaden +1 415 343 0776 +1 415 395 0950 rgoldfaden@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Lai +1 602 650 1854 +1 602 650 1376 alai@acluaz.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica Marie Ramirez +1 415 343 0778 +1 415 395 0950 mramirez@aclu.org

Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by MALDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina Michelle Campbell +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 kcampbell@maldef.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Maricopa County Attorneys Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/31/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen J Hartman-Tellez +1 602 506 8541 hartmank@mcao.maricopa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Jeremy Bodney +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 dbodney@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 09/17/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Isaac Pasaret Hernandez +1 602 257 5206 +1 602 257 5299
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Shawn Kozinets +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 pkozinets@steptoe.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron James Lockwood +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 alockwood@steptoe.com
v.
No Logo Arpaio, Joseph M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Joseph M Arpaio"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy James Casey +6177272 200 ext2043 +1 617 727 5785 Timothy.Casey@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Fennemore Craig, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alec R Hillbo +1 602 916 5000 +1 602 916 5585 ahillbo@fclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maricopa County Attorneys Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria R Brandon +1 602 372 3852 +1 602 506 1416 brandonm@mail.maricopa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Purcell Liddy 1 +1 +1 +1 +1 602 506 8567 liddyt@mcao.maricopa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leigh Eric Dowell +1 602 778 3700 +1 602 778 3700 eric.dowell@ogletreedeakins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kerry Scott Martin +1 602 778 3715 +1 602 778 3750 kerry.martin@ogletreedeakins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schmitt Schneck Smyth & Herrod PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2010 Drew Metcalf +1 602 277 7000 +1 602 277 8663 drewmetcalf@azbarristers.com
No Logo Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy James Casey +6177272 200 ext2043 +1 617 727 5785 Timothy.Casey@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Fennemore Craig, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alec R Hillbo +1 602 916 5000 +1 602 916 5585 ahillbo@fclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leigh Eric Dowell +1 602 778 3700 +1 602 778 3700 eric.dowell@ogletreedeakins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kerry Scott Martin +1 602 778 3715 +1 602 778 3750 kerry.martin@ogletreedeakins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A Pace +1 602 778 3700 +1 602 778 3750 julie.pace@ogletreedeakins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schmitt Schneck Smyth & Herrod PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2010 Drew Metcalf +1 602 277 7000 +1 602 277 8663 drewmetcalf@azbarristers.com
No Logo Maricopa, County of, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/22/2009 Timothy James Casey +6177272 200 ext2043 +1 617 727 5785 Timothy.Casey@state.ma.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A Pace +1 602 778 3700 +1 602 778 3750 julie.pace@ogletreedeakins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Selden +1 602 778 3700 +1 602 778 3750 david.selden@ogletreedeakins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RYLEY CARLOCK & APPLEWHITE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Michael Fry +1 602 258 7701 +1 602 257 9582 jfry@rcalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charitie L Hartsig +1 602 440 4898 +1 602 257 6998 chartsig@rcalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Moberly +1 602 440 4821 +1 602 257 6921 mmoberly@rcalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas George Stack +1 602 440 4875 +1 602 257 6975 tstack@rcalaw.com
No Logo Aggrieved and Irreparably Injured Class of United States and Phoenix Citizens, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 2811

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aggrieved and Irreparably Injured Class of United States and Phoenix Citizens +1 602 472 9353
United States of America United States of America, Amicus Curiae

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States of America United States of America, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amin Aminfar +1 202 307 0652 amin.aminfar@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 12/12/2007
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Maricopa
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '08-17270'['Ninth Circuit'], 12-15098[Ninth Circuit]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLASSACT,PROTO,STD
  Entries (2147) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2629 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2628 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2627 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2626 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2625 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2624 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2623 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2622 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2621 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2620 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2619 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2618 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2617 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2616 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2615 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2614 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2613 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Withdrawal of Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2612 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2611 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2610 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Show Cause
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2609 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2608 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2607 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Lodged Proposed Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2606 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2605 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2604 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2603 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2602 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2601 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2600 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2599 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2598 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2597 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2596 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2595 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2594 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Report - Other
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2593 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2592 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2591 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2590 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2589 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2588 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2587 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2586 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2585 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2584 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2583 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2582 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2581 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2580 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2579 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2578 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2577 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2576 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2575 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2574 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2573 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2572 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2571 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2570 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2569 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Report - Other
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2568 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2567 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2566 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2565 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2564 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2563 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2562 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2561 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2560 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2559 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2558 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2557 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2556 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2555 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2554 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2553 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2552 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2551 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2550 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2549 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Report - Other
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2548 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2547 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2546 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2545 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2544 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2543 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2542 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2541 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2540 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2539 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2538 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2537 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2536 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2535 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2534 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Report - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2533 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2532 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2531 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2530 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2529 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2528 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2527 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2526 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2525 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2524 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2523 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2522 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2521 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2520 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2519 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Report - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2518 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2517 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2516 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2515 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2514 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2513 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2512 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2511 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2510 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2509 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2508 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2507 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2505 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2504 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2503 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2502 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2501 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2500 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2499 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2498 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2497 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2496 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2495 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2494 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2493 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2492 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2490 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2489 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2488 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2487 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2486 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2485 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2484 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2483 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Report - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2482 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2481 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2480 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2479 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2478 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2477 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2476 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2475 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2474 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2473 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2472 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2471 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2470 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2469 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2468 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2467 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2466 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2465 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2464 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2461 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2460 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2459 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2458 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Report - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1387 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1272 MOTION Recognition of its Rights as a Party Litigant filed by Maricopa, County of. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1386 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine re: Re: Testimony of Don Vogel and IA 542 and 543 by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Masterson, John) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1385 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine re: Re: Montgomery Investigation by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Masterson, John) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1384 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Reconsideration Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena by Timothy J Casey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Clark, Karen) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1383 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver of Gordon & Rees for Status Conference proceedings held on 09/14/2015 and 09/18/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1382 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1380 Defendants' request to extend time to file their responsive pleading to the United States' Complaint in Intervention (Doc. 1277 ) by 30 days, to October 21, 2015. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/22/2015.(KFZ) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1381 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference proceedings held on 09/18/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1380 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the United States' Complaint in Intervention by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ackerman, Justin) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1379 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 09/18/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1378 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Deposition of Stephen Fax, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1377 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Deposition of Suzanne Kimberly Seagraves-Young, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1376 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Deposition of Steve Bailey, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1375 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Deposition of Gerard Sheridan, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1374 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on September 18, 2015 Status Conference, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1373 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa County Attorney's Office, William Montgomery for proceedings held on 09-18-2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Hamilton, April) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1372 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - The Court has received and reviewed Maricopa County Attorney William Montgomery and Maricopa County Attorney's Office's (MCAO) Objection to Disclosure of MCAO00640 and MCAO00650. (Doc. 1367 .) The Court finds that the portions of MCAO00640 and MCAO00650 to which Mr. Montgomery and MCAO assert the work product doctrine applies are protected from disclosure and fall outside the subject-matter waiver found by the Court in its May 14, 2015 Order. Therefore, the Court sustains the objection. The discoverable portions of MCAO00640 and MCAO00650 have already been disclosed by Defendants. (See Doc. 1361 .) The Court has not received any objection to the disclosure of the documents Bates numbered MCAO00573-76 and MCAO00626-29. If they haven't done so already, Defendants shall disclose those documents immediately. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 9/21/2015. (KMG) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1371 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Deposition of Timothy J. Casey, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1370 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that the Monitor Team shall send to the Parties the tally of the 1500 identifications belonging to members of the Plaintiff Class. FURTHER ORDERED that a subject matter waiver exists regarding the approximately 1,459 identification documents (see attached Order for details). FURTHER ORDERED that a subject matter waiver exists regarding communications between MCSO employees and counsel at the January 2, 2014 meeting. FURTHER ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Boyle will attend the deposition of Tom Liddy on Monday, September 21, 2015. FURTHER ORDERED that the deposition of Tim Casey will continue on Tuesday, September 22, 2015. The Court will be available via telephone. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/18/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1369 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: In-Court Hearing held on 9/18/2015. The Court has reviewed the excerpts provided pursuant to the agreement of the parties. THE COURT FINDS that there is a subject matter privilege waiver with respect to the January 2, 2014 meeting. APPEARANCES: Cecillia Wang for Plaintiffs. John Masterson and Justin Ackerman for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker for Maricopa County. Paul Killebrew for United States Department of Justice. Karen Clark for Tim Casey. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 12:48 PM to 12:51 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1368 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 9/18/2015. The continued Evidentiary Hearing shall resume on 9/24/2015 at 9:00 a.m., before Judge G. Murray Snow, in Courtoom 602, Phoenix, AZ. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Andre Segura, Jorge Castillo, Michelle Morin (all telephonically), Stanley Young, Cecillia Wang, Daniel Pochoda and Anne Lai for Plaintiffs. A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. and Joseph Popolizio (both telephonically), Michele Iafrate, John Masterson and Justin Ackerman for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Charles Jirauch (telephonically) and Richard Walker for Maricopa County. Lee Stein (telephonically) for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan, who is also present. Gregory Como (telephonically) for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods (telephonically) for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa, who is also present. Mitesh Patel for Gary Birnbaum for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre. April Hamilton (telephonically) and Ernest Calderon for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. Cynthia Coe (telephonically) and Puneet Cheema for United States of America. Paul Killebrew for United States Department of Justice. Karen Clark for Tim Casey. Deputy Monitors John Girvin and Raul Martinez (both telephonically). (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 10:34 AM to 12:04 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) Modified on 9/18/2015 (KFZ). (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1367 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          * OBJECTION to Disclosure by Maricopa County Attorney's Office, William Montgomery re: 1357 Order. (Calderon, Ernest) * Modified to correct event on 9/18/2015 (LAD). (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1366 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference proceedings held on 09/14/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1365 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re: Authorities by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Morin, Michelle) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1364 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1319 MOTION to Compel Testimony Re: July 17, 2015 Meeting and MCSOs Nondisclosure of the 1500 IDs filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Anne Lai with Exhibits)(Lai, Anne) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1363 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Errata re: 1362 Notice (Other) (Defendant Arpaio's Notice of Errata Regarding Defendant Arpaio's Notice of Authorities) by Defendant Joseph M Arpaio.. (Masterson, John) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1362 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE re: Defendant Arpaio's Notice of Authorities by Joseph M Arpaio . (Masterson, John) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1361 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re: Documents Provided by Joseph M Arpaio re: 1357 Order . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1360 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE re: Authorities by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America . (Morin, Michelle) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1359 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Deposition of Rollie Seebert, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Segura, Andre) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1358 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re: 1319 MOTION to Compel Testimony Re: July 17, 2015 Meeting and MCSOs Nondisclosure of the 1500 IDs filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit Part 2 of 2)(Masterson, John) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1357 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER on September 15, 2015, District Judge G. Murray Snow referred to this Court an in camera review of certain documents to determine whether they are protected from disclosure by the attorney-client privilege and/or work-product doctrine. On the same day, counsel for Maricopa County Attorney William Montgomery and the Maricopa County Attorney's Office (MCAO) provided this Court with a privilege log and documents potentially responsive to a May 26, 2015 subpoena. Based on the above, the Court finds that the document Bates numbered MCAO00572 is protected from disclosure by the attorney-client privilege and work product doctrine, and falls outside the subject-matter waiver identified in the Court's May 14, 2015 Order at Doc. 1094. The Court finds that the documents Bates numbered MCAO00640, MCAO00650, MCAO00573-76, and MCAO00626-29 fall within the subject-matter waiver. However, if Mr. Montgomery/MCAO or Defendant Arpaio wishes to object to disclosure of these documents, they must do so no later than 5:00 P.M. on Friday, September 18, 2015. Finally, the Court finds that the remaining documents that appear on the privilege log and were provided to the Court, even if covered by the attorney-client privilege or work-product doctrine, fall within the subject matter waiver identified by the Court in Doc. 1094 . Therefore, Defendants must disclose these documents immediately. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 9/16/2015. (See Order for complete details.)(KMG) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1356 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Popolizio, Joseph) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1355 Filed: 9/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference proceedings held on 09/10/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1354 Filed: 9/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference proceedings held on 09/10/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1353 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference proceedings held on 09/04/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1352 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE re: Document Provided by Joseph M Arpaio re: 1349 Order . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1351 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re: Filing Annual Compliance Report by Joseph M Arpaio . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1350 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. Amendment to 1291 Notice of Deposition of Jonathan Knapp. (Albarran, Tammy) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1349 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER On September 14, 2015, District Judge G. Murray Snow referred to this Court an in camera review of certain emails to determine whether they are protected from disclosure by the attorney-client privilege and/or work-product doctrine. Accordingly, the Court concludes that the documents Bates numbered MELC1397334, MELC1397335, and MELC1397336 are protected from disclosure by the attorney-client privilege and the work-product doctrine, and those protections have not been waived. The document Bates numbered CaseySub000166 relates to compliance with the Court's Preliminary Injunction and, therefore, any attorney -client or work product protections as to that document have been waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 9/15/2015. (See Order for complete details.)(KMG) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1348 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on September 14, 2015 at 1:45 pm, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1347 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 09/10/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Killebrew, Paul) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1346 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/14/2015. APPEARANCES: Cecillia Wang and Michelle Morin for Plaintiffs. Michele Iafrate, Joseph Popolizio and A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker and Charles Jirauch for Maricopa County. A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. for Lee Stein and Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan. Terrence Woods for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. April Hamilton for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. David Ouimette for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre. Gregory Como for Brian Sands. Karen Clark for Tim Casey. Paul Killebrew for United States of America. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 1:52 PM to 2:09 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1345 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST and Realtime Request by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 9/22/2015 - 10/2/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1344 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re: 1272 MOTION Recognition of its Rights as a Party Litigant filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Albarran, Tammy) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1343 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED DOCUMENT by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. Amendment to 1268 Notice of Deposition of Timothy J. Casey. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1342 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re: of Service of Electronically Stored Information by Maricopa, County of . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1341 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on September 10, 2015 at 3:30 pm, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1340 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on September 10, 2015 at 9:00 am, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1339 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 09/10/15 AM and PM proceedings, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Kimmins, Lynnette) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1338 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE re: Documents Provided by Joseph M Arpaio re: 1326 Order . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1337 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 9/14/2015 at 1:45 PM before Judge G Murray Snow. Plaintiffs' counsel shall provide the call-in number via e-mail. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1336 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re: 1272 MOTION Recognition of its Rights as a Party Litigant filed by United States of America. (Coe, Cynthia) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1335 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibits to Motion to Seal re: 1334 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits 8-11 and 13-16 of Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1(B) Statement of Facts and Rule 56(D) Statement of Unavailable Facts in Opposition to Sands' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Albarran, Tammy) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1334 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits 8-11 and 13-16 of Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1(B) Statement of Facts and Rule 56(D) Statement of Unavailable Facts in Opposition to Sands' Motion for Summary Judgment by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albarran, Tammy) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1333 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 1332 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-16)(Albarran, Tammy) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1332 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re: 1214 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Albarran, Tammy) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1331 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re: Filing Fifth Quarterly Compliance Report by Joseph M Arpaio . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1330 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver of Gordon & Rees for proceedings held on 09/10/2015 (Volumes 1 and 2), Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1329 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Larry Klayman for Status Conference/In-Court Hearing proceedings held on 05/22/2015, 07/31/2015 (Volumes 1 & 2), and 08/07/2015 (Volumes 1 & 2), Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1328 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST all volumes by United States of America for proceedings held on 8/7/15; 8/11/15; 8/21/15; 8/28/15; 9/4/15, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Kimmins, Lynnette) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1327 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver of Gordon & Rees for Status Conference proceedings held on 09/04/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1326 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that counsel for Defendants shall produce all materials contained in the client file Timothy Casey provided to counsel, requested in Plaintiff's subpoena duces tecum to Mr. Casey, and consistent with the previous orders of this Court. FURTHER ORDERED that Richard Walker shall confer with all parties requesting the designated archived Maricopa County files to ascertain the most appropriate and workable production format that includes all relevant text, meta data, and attachments. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/10/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1325 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Telephone Conference held on 9/10/2015. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Stanley Young and Cecillia Wang for Plaintiffs. John Masterson (in person), Michele Iafrate and A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker and Charles Jirauch for Maricopa County. A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. for Lee Stein and Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan. Dane Dodd for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. April Hamilton for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. Cynthia Coe and Puneet Cheema for United States of America. Chief Robert Warshaw and Deputy Monitor John Girvin. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 3:35 PM to 3:53 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1324 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 9/10/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1323 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marni Shapiro of Davis Wright Tremaine LLP for Evidentiary Hearing (Day 3) proceedings held on 04/23/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1322 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephone Conference for 9/10/2015 at 3:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow. The parties may appear in person or appear telephonically by calling the number and participant code provided via e-mail. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 9/10/2015. The Court sets expedited briefing on 1319 Motion to Compel Testimony Re: July 17, 2015 Meeting and MCSOs Nondisclosure of the 1500 IDs. Response is due by 10:00 AM on 9/17/2015; Reply is due by 12:00 PM on 9/18/2015. APPEARANCES: Stanley Young, Andre Segura, and Jorge Castillo (all telephonically), Cecillia Wang and Michelle Morin for Plaintiffs. A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. (telephonically) and John Masterson for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker and Charles Jirauch (late) for Maricopa County. A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. (telephonically) for Lee Stein and Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan, who is also present. Dane Dodd for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa. Gary Birnbaum for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre. Ernest Calderon for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. Cynthia Coe and Puneet Cheema (both telephonically) for United States of America. Raphael Gomez (telephonically) for United States Department of Justice. Chief Robert Warshaw and Deputy Monitor John Girvin (both telephonically). (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 9:05 AM to 9:53 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1320 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marni Shapiro of Davis Wright Tremaine LLP for Status Conference proceedings held on 08/28/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Testimony Re: July 17, 2015 Meeting and MCSOs Nondisclosure of the 1500 IDs by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Anne Lai with Exhibits, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lai, Anne) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1318 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. Amendment to 1281 Notice of Deposition of Don Vogel. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1317 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED DOCUMENT by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. Amendment to 1290 Notice of Deposition of John ("Jack") MacIntyre. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1316 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 9/4/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1315 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 09/04/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1312 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that counsel for Defendants shall review the client file that Timothy Casey provided to the Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and produce the documents requested in Plaintiff's subpoena duces tecum to Mr. Casey. FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties comply with the procedure suggested by Mr. Gomez, counsel for the United States, for the examination of the fifty hard drives. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for responses to pending interrogatories and requests for admissions shall be September 15, 2015. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/8/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1311 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. Amendment to 1289 Notice of Deposition of Stephen Fax. (Morin, Michelle) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1310 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference proceedings held on 08/28/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1309 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 9/4/2015. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Cecillia Wang, Andre Segura, Michelle Morin and Jorge Castillo (all telephonically), Stanley Young and Anne Lai for Plaintiffs. A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. (telephonically), Michele Iafrate, John Masterson and Joseph Popolizio for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker and Charles Jirauch for Maricopa County. A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. (telephonically) for Lee Stein and Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan, who is also present. Gregory Como for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa. Gary Birnbaum and David Ouimette for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre. Ernest Calderon for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. Paul Killebrew, Cynthia Coe and Puneet Cheema (all telephonically) for United States of America. Raphael Gomez (telephonically) for United States Department of Justice. Karen Clark (telephonically) for Tim Casey. Chief Robert Warshaw and Deputy Monitors Raul Martinez and John Girvin (all telephonically). (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 9:06 AM to 10:36 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1308 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 07/31/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Killebrew, Paul) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1307 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST re: to be Excused from September 10, 2015 Status Conference by Defendant Joseph M Arpaio. (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1306 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re: Non-Party Timothy J. Casey's Notice of Position Re His Deposition by Timothy J Casey . (Clark, Karen) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1305 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Deposition of Christine Bailey Stutz, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1304 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Deposition of Thomas P. Liddy, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1303 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. Amendment to 1278 Notice of Deposition of David Tennyson. (Segura, Andre) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1302 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver for Status Conference proceedings held on 08/28/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1301 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 08/28/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Killebrew, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1300 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 08/21/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Killebrew, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1299 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cynthia Coe appearing for United States of America. . (Coe, Cynthia) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1298 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Deposition of Michael Zullo, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1297 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Deposition of Brian Mackiewicz, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1296 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Deposition of Brian Sands, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1295 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Deposition of Joseph Sousa, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1294 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Deposition of Mike Olson, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1293 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Deposition of Brett Palmer, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1292 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Deposition of Joseph M. Arpaio, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1291 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Deposition of Jonathan Knapp, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1290 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Deposition of John ("Jack") MacIntyre, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1289 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Deposition of Stephen Fax, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1288 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Deposition of Travis Anglin, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1287 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Deposition of Bill Knight, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1286 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 8/28/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1285 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on August 28, 2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1284 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Deposition of Edward Patrick Lopez, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1283 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Deposition of Steve Bailey, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1282 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver for Status Conference proceedings held on 08/21/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1281 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Deposition of Don Vogel, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1280 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by United States of America. (Killebrew, Paul) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1279 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Deposition of Suzanne Kimberly Seagraves-Young, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Segura, Andre) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1278 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Deposition of David Tennyson, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Segura, Andre) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1277 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caspar, Edward) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1276 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Segura, Andre) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1275 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference proceedings held on 08/21/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1274 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that the Court's Order dated July 31, 2015 1208 shall be amended as follows: On page 3 of the order, lines 3-5, the text of the fifth document production date duplicates verbatim the text of the fourth document production date. This text should be eliminated. FURTHER ORDERED that the Department of Justice file the complaint in intervention. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/28/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 8/28/2015. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Andre Segura, Tammy Albarran, Lauren Pedley and Michelle Morin (all telephonically), Cecillia Wang and Stanley Young for Plaintiffs. A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. (telephonically), Michele Iafrate, John Masterson and Joseph Popolizio and for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker and Charles Jirauch for Maricopa County. Lee Stein for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan, who is also present. Gregory Como for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa. Mitesh Patel for Gary Birnbaum for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre. Ernest Calderon for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. Paul Killebrew and Edward Caspar (both telephonically) for United States of America. Raphael Gomez (telephonically) for United States Department of Justice. Chief Robert Warshaw and Deputy Monitors Raul Martinez and John Girvin (all telephonically). (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 9:37 AM to 10:23 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1272 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Recognition of its Rights as a Party Litigant by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1271 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 1247 Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan's Motion to be Excused; and DENYING 1256 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose E-mails. Documents to be provided to all parties and non-parties named in the Order to Show Cause by August 28, 2015. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/26/2015.(KFZ) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1270 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER AMENDING SUPPLEMENTAL PERMANENT INJUNCTION/JUDGMENT ORDER (Doc. 606). See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/26/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1269 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Deposition of Gerard Sheridan, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1268 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Deposition of Timothy J. Casey, filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1267 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on August 21, 2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1266 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 1263 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and allowing Joshua Bendor to withdraw as counsel of record for the Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/24/2015.(KFZ) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1265 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 08/21/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1264 Filed: 8/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Puneet Cheema on behalf of United States of America. (Cheema, Puneet) (Entered: 08/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1263 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joshua Bendor by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bendor, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1262 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to the parties' 1250 Stipulation. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/21/2015. (LMR) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1261 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 8/21/2015. Separate order to issue. APPEARANCES: Andre Segura, Cecillia Wang, Joshua Bendor, Stanley Young, Michelle Morin (telephonically), Tammy Albarran (telephonically) and Lauren Pedley (telephonically) for Plaintiffs. Michele Iafrate, John Masterson, Joseph Popolizio and A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. (telephonically) for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker and Charles Jirauch for Maricopa County. Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan, who is also present. Gregory Como for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods (telephonically) for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa, who is also present. David Ouimette for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre. April Hamilton for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. Paul Killebrew and Puneet Cheema (both telephonically) for United States of America. Chief Robert Warshaw, Deputy Monitor John Girvin and Deputy Monitor Raul Martinez (all telephonically). (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 10:03 AM to 11:30 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1260 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED LODGED Proposed Motion to Appoint Counsel re: 1259 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Joseph Sousa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eisenberg, David) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1259 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *SEALED Motion to Seal Motion and Motion for the Appointment of Counsel filed by Joseph Sousa. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eisenberg, David) *Modified on 8/21/2015 to change from lodged to filed (MAP)*. (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1258 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re: Documents Provided re numbers 4 and 5 by Joseph M Arpaio re: 1208 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1257 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Amending Doc. 1207 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 7/31/2015. Order to follow. At 3:30 PM, the public was excused from the courtroom and the Court held sealed discussion with parties, counsel, specially appearing non-parties, and monitors. APPEARANCES: Andre Segura and Tammy Albarran (telephonically), Cecillia Wang, Stanley Young, Joshua Bendor, Danial Pochoda, and Lauren Pedley for Plaintiffs. Michele Iafrate, Melvin McDonald, Jr., and Joseph Popolizio for Defendants Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Charles Jirauch and Richard Walker for Maricopa County. Gregory Como for Brian Sands. Lee stein for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan, who is also present. Gary Birnbaum for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre, who is also present. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa, who is also present. Jake McLaughlin for for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. April Hamilton for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. Karen Clark for Timothy Casey. Deputy Monitors John Girvin and Raul Martinez (telephonically). (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 2:01 PM to 3:37 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) Reason for Amendment: to reflect sealed discussion held. (MMO) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1256 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose E-mails by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1255 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re: Documents provided re No. 8 by Joseph M Arpaio re: 1208 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1254 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST re: Defense Counsel Michele M. Iafrate to be Excused from August 21, 2015 Status Conference due to Trial by Defendant Joseph M Arpaio. (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1253 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed the Monitor's invoice dated August 3, 2015 for services rendered by the Monitor in July 2015. The Court finds the invoice and charges to be reasonable and directs Maricopa County to authorize payment of the Monitor's invoice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/20/2015. (LMR) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1252 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 1251 Transcript Request filed by Joseph M Arpaio. Description of deficiency: Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the General Orders, Local Rules, and CM/ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual of this Court, the following deficiency has been identified with the electronically filed document: 1) AO435 Transcript Order form, box #11 - No court proceedings were transcribed/recorded on 20April2015. ACTION REQUIRED BY THE REQUESTER: The deficiency must be corrected within one (1) business day of this notice. Please provide a valid date of proceeding for transcription. The requester must re-file the entire document, AO435 Transcript Order form, as a Transcript Request AMENDED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1251 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 04/20/15, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Popolizio, Joseph) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1250 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Entry of Protective Order by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Segura, Andre) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1249 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The seal is lifted on those portions of the Court's hearings in this matter on 7/31/2015 and 8/7/2015 that were held under seal. The parties and represented non-parties are authorized to work out the terms of an appropriate protective order to further implement the terms of this Order. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/18/2015. (LMR) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1248 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Case Number re: 1238 Notice of Appeal. Case number 15-16626, Ninth Circuit. (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit.) (KMG) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1247 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *MOTION to be Excused from Status Conferences and Contempt Hearings from October 11 - 23, 2015 by Interested Party Gerard Sheridan. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, Lee) *Modified to correct event on 8/17/2015 (KMG). (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1246 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/31/15 before Judge G. Murray Snow. Court Reporter: Gary Moll. Type of Hearing: Status Conference (Volume 2, Pages 71-81). (MAP) *Modified on 8/17/2015 to Unseal Pursuant to GMS Chambers (MAP)*. (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1245 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST AMENDED by Larry Klayman for Status Conference proceedings held on 08/11/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1244 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Larry Klayman for Status Conference proceedings held on 08/11/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1243 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jude Joffe-Block of KJZZ Public Radio for Sealed portion of Status Conference proceedings held on 07/31/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1242 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver for Status Conference proceedings held on 08/11/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1241 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Megan Cassidy with the Arizona Republic for proceedings held on 08/07/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1240 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul Killebrew appearing for United States of America. . (Killebrew, Paul) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1239 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that the United States' Motion to Intervene (Doc. 1177 ) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/13/2015.(KMG) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1238 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: 1167 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 1093 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge by Dennis L Montgomery. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number PHX161632. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Filing Fee)(KMG) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1237 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference proceedings held on 08/11/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1236 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver for Status Conference proceedings held on 07/31/2015 and 08/07/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1235 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on August 11, 2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1234 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Charitie L Hartsig, counsel for Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Fry, John) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1233 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 8/7/2015, 8/11/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1232 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/7/15 before Judge G. Murray Snow. Court Reporter: Gary Moll. Type of Hearing: In-Court Hearing (Volume 1, Pages 1-24). (MAP) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1231 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of In-Court Hearing (Volume 2, Pages 25-39) proceedings held on 08/07/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/31/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1230 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL AMENDED TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Volume 1, Pages 1-70 (Sealed Proceedings Omitted) proceedings held on 07/31/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). Added missing court reporter information on cover page. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1229 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *(AMENDED BY DOC. 1230 ) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Volume 1, Pages 1-70 (Sealed Proceedings Omitted) proceedings held on 07/31/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (RAP) *Modified on 8/11/2015 (RAP). (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1228 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 1227 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1227 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michelle L Morin on behalf of plaintiffs Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, and Somos America. (BAS) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1226 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 8/11/2015. APPEARANCES: Andre Segura and Michelle Morin (both telephonically), Cecillia Wang and Joshua Bendor for Plaintiffs. Michele Iafrate, John Masterson, Joseph Popolizio and A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker and Charles Jirauch for Maricopa County. Lee Stein for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan. Dane Dodd for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa, who is also present. Gary Birnbaum for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre, who is also present. Ernest Calderon for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. Edward Caspar and Paul Killebrew for United States of America. Deputy Monitor Raul Martinez (telephonically). (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 9:03 AM to 10:37 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1225 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re: Documents Provided Pursuant to Court Orders by Joseph M Arpaio re: 1208 Order, Set/Reset Hearings, 1192 Order . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1224 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 08/07/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Caspar, Edward) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1223 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: 1057 MOTION to Intervene filed by Dennis L Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 continued) (submitted by Larry Klayman)(KMG) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1222 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on August 7, 2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1221 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1177 MOTION to Intervene filed by United States of America. (Caspar, Edward) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1220 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: In-Court Hearing held on 8/7/2015. Initial portion of proceedings held under seal, with the parties and counsel. APPEARANCES: Cecillia Wang, Andre Segura, Lauren Pedley, Jorge Castillo and Michelle Morin (all telephonically), and Joshua Bendor for Plaintiffs. Michele Iafrate, John Masterson, Joseph Popolizio and Linda Tivorsak for A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker and Charles Jirauch for Maricopa County. Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan, who is also present. Gregory Como and John D. Wilenchik for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods (telephonically) for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa. Chief Robert Warshaw and Deputy Monitor Raul Martinez (both telephonically). Captain Steve Bailey, Maricopa County Sheriffs Office. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 1:02 PM to 1:40 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1219 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re: Materials Discussed in Sealed Portion of Hearing Provided to the Monitor by Joseph M Arpaio re: 1208 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1218 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re: 1177 MOTION to Intervene filed by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1217 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re: 1177 MOTION to Intervene (Defendant Arpaio's Response to United States' Motion to Intervene and Memorandum in Support) filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Masterson, John) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1216 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on this matter is set for tomorrow, August 7, 2015 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/6/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1215 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 1214 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Interested Party Brian Sands. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Exhibit 8-14, # 3 Exhibit 15-19, # 4 Exhibit 20-21)(Como, Gregory) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1214 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Brian Sands. (Como, Gregory) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1213 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver for Status Conference proceedings held on 07/31/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1212 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Unsealed portion by United States of America for proceedings held on Vol I - 07/31/15, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Kimmins, Lynnette) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1211 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 07/31/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1210 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST re: Brian Sands' Request to be Excused from Status Conferences by Interested Party Brian Sands. (Como, Gregory) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1209 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on July 31, 2015 Status Conference, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1208 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants are to turn over to the United States Marshal Service the items stated herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant shall provide the Monitor with the access and materials discussed in the sealed portion of the hearing pursuant to the previous orders of the Court relating to such matters. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall hold open the following dates for the resumption of the contempt hearing: September 22-25, September 29-October 2, October 8-9, 13-14, 27-30, November 2-6, 10, 12-13, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall provide to the Parties the documents provided for herein pursuant to the deadlines establised herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting weekly Status Conferences for the following dates and times: 8/11/2015 at 09:00 AM, 8/21/2015 at 10:00 AM, 8/28/2015 at 09:30 AM, 9/4/2015 at 09:00 AM, 9/10/2015 at 09:00 AM, and 9/18/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. (See Order for complete details.) Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/31/2015. (MMO) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 7/31/2015. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Andre Segura and Tammy Albarran (telephonically), Cecillia Wang, Stanley Young, Joshua Bendor, Danial Pochoda, and Lauren Pedley for Plaintiffs. Michele Iafrate, Melvin McDonald, Jr., and Joseph Popolizio for Defendants Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Charles Jirauch and Richard Walker for Maricopa County. Gregory Como for Brian Sands. Lee stein for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan, who is also present. Gary Birnbaum for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre, who is also present. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa, who is also present. Jake McLaughlin for for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. April Hamilton for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. Karen Clark for Timothy Casey. Deputy Monitors John Girvin and Raul Martinez (telephonically). (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 2:01 PM to 3:37 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1206 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *OBJECTION To Def. Arpaio's/MCSO Statement 1203 Re Proposed Deadline for Document Production by Interested Party Timothy J Casey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 8)(Clark, Karen) *Modified to include document linkage on 7/31/2015 (KMG). (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1205 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Proposed Revisions to the Supplemental Permanent Injunction/Judgment Order re: 1179 Order on Motion to Stay, Status Conference, Set/Reset Hearings, Common Prompts (Text Only) (Defendant Arpaio and Maricopa County's Proposed Revisions to the Supplemental Permanent Injunction/Judgment Order) by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Masterson, John) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1204 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re: 1179 Order on Motion to Stay, Status Conference, Set/Reset Hearings, Common Prompts (Text Only) Response to Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Joseph M Arpaio. (Masterson, John) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1203 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of Proposed Deadlines for Document Production by Defendants Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa, County of. (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1202 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry Klayman by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1201 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' Proposed Revisions to Supplemental Permanent Injunction/Judgment Order by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America re: 1179 Order on Motion to Stay, Status Conference, Set/Reset Hearings, Common Prompts (Text Only) . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Segura, Andre) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1200 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 07/24/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Kimmins, Lynnette) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1199 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re DR files DR 15-14899 and DR 15-011082: Defendants are hereby ordered to turn over each of these Departmental Reports and all items of evidence associated with those DR files to the custody of the United States Marshal. Representatives of the Marshal shall contact the MCSO to coordinate such transfer which shall be timely and efficiently accomplished by the MCSO. See Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/28/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1198 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry Klayman by Plaintiffs Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Young, Stanley) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1197 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver for In-Court Hearing proceedings held on 07/24/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1196 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 07/24/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1195 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to United States' Motion To Intervene re: 1177 MOTION to Intervene by Plaintiffs Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1194 Filed: 7/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of In-Court Hearing proceedings held on 07/24/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1193 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (3:00 PM In-Court Hearing) by Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 7/24/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Ackerman, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1192 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Defendants are hereby ordered to turn over all items of evidence associated with DR 14-007250. Defendants are further ordered to produce to the Marshals the 1,459 identifications that lack an associated DR number. See Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/24/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1191 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: In-Court Hearing held on 7/24/2015. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Andre Segura, Cecillia Wang and Stanley Young (all telephonically), Daniel Pochoda and Joshua Bendor and for Plaintiffs. A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. (telephonically), Michele Iafrate, John Masterson and Joseph Popolizio for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Charles Jirauch (telephonically) and Richard Walker for Maricopa County. Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan. Gregory Como (telephonically) for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods (telephonically) for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. April Hamilton for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. David Ouimette (telephonically) for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre. Karen Clark (telephonically) for Tim Casey. Chief Robert Warshaw, Deputy Monitors John Girvin and Raul Martinez, and monitor team. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 3:04 PM to 3:47 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1190 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting In-Court Hearing for 7/24/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/24/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1189 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 07/20/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Kimmins, Lynnette) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1188 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USCA Case Number re: 1173 Notice of Appeal. Case number 15-16440, Ninth Circuit. (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit.) (KMG) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1187 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed the Monitor's invoice dated July 2, 2015 for services rendered by the Monitor in June 2015. The Court finds the invoice and charges to be reasonable and directs Maricopa County to authorize payment of the Monitor's invoice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/22/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1186 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 07/20/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1185 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver for Status Conference proceedings held on 07/20/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1184 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE re: Trial Conflict by Brian Sands . (Como, Gregory) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1183 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 07/20/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1182 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 07/20/15, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Popolizio, Joseph) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1181 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on July 20, 2015 Status Conference, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1180 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Larry Klayman for Status Hearing proceedings held on 07/20/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1179 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 7/20/2015. IT IS ORDERED denying 1171 Motion to Stay. Status Conference set for 7/31/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. By July 29, 2015, Parties are ordered to file (1) suggested revisions to the Supplemental Permanent Injunction in light of the recent Mandate of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals (see Doc. 1163 ); (2) schedules for the completion of outstanding internal investigations, document production requests, and/or other discovery; and (3) responses to Larry Klayman's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. APPEARANCES: Andre Segura, Cecillia Wang and Jorge Castillo (all telephonically), Stanley Young, Daniel Pochoda and Joshua Bendor and for Plaintiffs. Michele Iafrate, John Masterson, Joseph Popolizio and A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio, who is also present, and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker and Charles Jirauch for Maricopa County. Lee Stein and Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan, who is also present. Gregory Como for Brian Sands, who is also present. Terrence Woods for Tom Liddy and Christine Stutz. April Hamilton for Maricopa County Attorney's Office and William Montgomery. David Ouimette for Deputy Chief John MacIntyre, who is also present. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa. Karen Clark for Tim Casey. Raphael Gomez for United States of America. Chief Robert Warshaw, Deputy Monitors John Girvin and Raul Martinez, and monitor team. Rosaleen O'Gara and Lynnette Kimmins also present telephonically. Larry Klayman for Dennis Montgomery. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 11:03 AM to 12:31 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1178 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Scott Huminski. Reason for return: Attempted - Not Known. Document number 1173 . (KGM) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1177 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Caspar, Edward) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1176 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1171 MOTION to Stay Reply in Support of Motion to Stay filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Popolizio, Joseph) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1175 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re: 1171 MOTION to Stay filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Bendor, Joshua) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1174 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA Appeal Fees received re: 1173 Notice of Appeal filed by Dennis L Montgomery. Filing Fee $ 505.00, receipt number PHX160708. (LSP) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1173 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: 1167 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 1164 Order on Motion for Recusal, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge, and 1093 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge by Dennis L Montgomery. Filing fee DUE. (LSP) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1172 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Errata re: 1171 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Joseph M Arpaio.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Popolizio, Joseph) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1171 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Regarding Motion to Stay)(Popolizio, Joseph) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1170 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOURTH QUARTERLY REPORT from Independent Monitor Robert Warshaw for the Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Comments, # 2 Defendant's Comments)(KFZ) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1169 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re: Monitor's Billing Procedures re: County's Status Report Re: Retention of Accountant for Bill Review (Doc. 1148 , Ex. 2) and the Wilson Status Report (Doc. 1157 ). (SJF) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1168 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 1146 Motion to Withdraw Deborah L. Garner as Counsel of Record for Defendants Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa CountySheriff's Office. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/10/15.(SJF) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1167 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 1112 Mr. Moseley's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/10/15.(SJF) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1166 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Cecillia Wang re: 1150 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiffs. (SJF) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1165 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 1152 Motion to Seal Document 1153 . FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to file the lodged document as a public record. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/10/15.(SJF) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1164 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that Sheriff Arpaio and Chief Deputy Sheridan's Motion for Recusal/Disqualification (Doc. 1117 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that any stay on pre-hearing discovery and/or the activities of the Monitor related to the resumption of the show-cause hearings is lifted. FURTHER ORDERED setting a status conference in these matters for Monday, 07/20/15, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003. All parties and specially appearing non-parties are required to attend. The parties shall be prepared to discuss: (1) Defendants' Motion relating to the definition of the Plaintiff Class (Doc. 1103 ); (2) Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Doc. 1085 ); (3) the status of MCSO's remaining internal investigations; (4) the Department of Justice's request to see the database of documents given by Montgomery to the MCSO, which he claims to have taken from the CIA; (5) the procedures pertaining to Maricopa County's independent review of the Monitor's billing; (6) whether Maricopa County is entitled to representation in this litigation separate from Sheriff Arpaio; and (7) the scheduling of the second phase of the civil contempt hearings. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge G. Murray Snow on 7/10/15. (NKS) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1163 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA, affirmed in part, vacated and remanded in part; each party shall bear its own costs on appeal, re: 13-16285 and 13-17238 587 , 616 , 677 Notices of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 Opinion, # 3 NDA) (copies sent by the Ninth Circuit)(REW) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1162 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re: of Appearance of Co-Counsel for Defendant Maricopa County, Arizona by Maricopa, County of . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1161 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT (Fourth) to Motion re: 1112 MOTION for Reconsideration re: 1093 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge by Intervenor Dennis L Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Continued)(KMG) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1160 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY/Supplement to Motion re: 1112 MOTION for Reconsideration re: 1093 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge filed by Dennis L Montgomery. (KMG) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1159 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Errata re: 1158 Reply to Response to Motion for Recusal or Disqualification on Judge Snow by Defendant Joseph M Arpaio.. (Masterson, John) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1158 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1117 MOTION for Recusal MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration Supplement)(Masterson, John) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1157 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT re Payment of Monitor's May 2015 Bill; Personnel to Perform In-Camera Review Procedure for June 2015 Bill; Lack of Contract Amendment between Monitor and Maricopa County by Maricopa County Administration. (Baker, Katherine) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1156 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of FOURTH QUARTERLY COMPLIANCE REPORT by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Iafrate, Michele) Modified on 6/16/2015 (KMG). (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1155 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER regarding Clarification dated June 1, 2015 Doc. 1141 . The Court has received and reviewed the Monitor's invoice dated June 2, 2015 for services rendered by the Monitor in May 2015. The Court finds the invoice and charges to be reasonable and directs Maricopa County to authorize payment of the Monitor's invoice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/15/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1154 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re: of Service by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America re: 1153 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document . (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1153 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *FILED at Doc. 1166 --SEALED LODGED Proposed Sealed Declaration of Cecillia Wang in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Recusal or Disqualification of the Court re: 1152 MOTION to Seal Document (Unopposed). Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Wang, Cecillia) Modified on 7/10/2015 (SJF). (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1152 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document (Unopposed) by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1151 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re: of Lodging Under Seal by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America . (Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1150 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re: 1117 MOTION for Recusal MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Wang, Cecillia) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1148 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re: Submission of Documents Previously Filed In Camera Under Seal by Maricopa County Administration . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(Baker, Katherine) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1147 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court directs that Ms. Wilson electronically file her May 7 objections and May 28 submission in accordance with the procedures utilized in the District of Arizona, so that all parties may have access thereto. If Ms. Wilson objects to the documents being filed publicly, she is directed to lodge the filings under seal along with any objections within five days. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/5/2015. (LMR) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1146 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Deborah L. Garner by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1145 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re: 1112 MOTION for Reconsideration re: 1093 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge Sheriff Joseph Arpaio and Chief Deputy Gerard Sheridan's Response to Putative Intervenor Dennis Montgomery's Supplement to Motion for Reconsideration filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (McDonald, Andrew) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1144 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver for Status Conference proceedings held on 06/29/2012, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1143 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John T Masterson on behalf of Joseph M Arpaio. (Masterson, John) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1142 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office for proceedings held on 06/29/2012, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1141 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLARIFICATION Re Documents 1117 and 1120 and VACATING Evidentiary Hearing of June 16-19; 23-26, 2015. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/1/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1140 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to 1112 MOTION for Reconsideration and OBJECTION to Procedure Set Forth by the Court's 1134 Amended Notice re Document Request by the US Department of Justice by Intervenor Dennis L Montgomery. (LAD) (6 pages) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1139 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re: Joint Briefing Schedule for Response and Reply regarding Defendants' Motion for Recusal by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office re: 1120 Order, Terminate Hearings . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1138 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION re: 1134 Notice (Other) to Procedure Set Forth by Court by Defendants Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1137 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re: Notice of Response to Order Dated May 22, 2015 by Tom Liddy . (Woods, Terrence) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1136 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re: Brian Sands' Response to Order Dated May 22, 2015 by Brian Sands re: 1120 Order, Terminate Hearings . (Como, Gregory) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1135 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE re: Response to Court Order by Joseph Sousa . (Eisenberg, David) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1134 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED NOTICE re: Document Request by the U.S. Department of Justice. Earlier this week, the Court-appointed Monitor received a request from the United States Department of Justice to copy the documents and hard drives containing materials that Dennis Montgomery delivered to the Maricopa County Sherriff's Office and that were allegedly harvested from the Central Intelligence Agency. The Department of Justice has requested to copy these hard drives on Tuesday, June 2, 2015 under the supervision of a court-appointed security officer. Should any Party wish to be heard regarding this request or procedure, it should immediately notify the Court with its comments or objections and the reasons therefore. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/29/2015 (KFZ) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1133 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *Amended by Doc. 1134 - NOTICE re: Document Request by the U.S. Department of Justice. Earlier this week, the Court-appointed Monitor received a request from the United States Department of Justice to copy the hard drives containing the documents that Dennis Montgomery delivered to the Maricopa County Sherriff's Office, and that were allegedly harvested from the Central Intelligence Agency. The Department of Justice has requested to copy these hard drives on Tuesday, June 2, 2015 under the supervision of a court-appointed security officer. Should any Party wish to be heard regarding this request or procedure, it should immediately notify the Court with its comments or objections and the reasons therefore. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/29/2015. (KFZ) Modified on 5/29/2015 (KFZ). (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1132 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 06/29/2012, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Ernest Calderon on behalf of William Montgomery, Maricopa County Attorney's Office. (Calderon, Ernest) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 05/22/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Candy L. Potter). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1129 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re: of its Position re Pending Motion for Recusal or Disqualification by Maricopa, County of . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 1127 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1127 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lauren E Pedley on behalf of plaintiffs Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, and Somos America. (BAS) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1126 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for Status Conference by United States of America for proceedings held on 05-22-2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Kimmins, Lynnette) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1125 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver for Status Conference proceedings held on 05/22/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez for proceedings held on 05/22/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1123 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office for proceedings held on 05/22/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1122 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on May 22, 2015 Status Conference, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence P Woods on behalf of Christine Stutz. (Woods, Terrence) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1120 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: In light of the Motion for Recusal or Motion to Disqualify 1117 filed this morning, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED vacating the Status Conferences set for May 29, June 5 and June 12, 2015. The Court shall issue no further orders until the Motion is fully briefed and/or a ruling has been issued. FURTHER ORDERED directing the parties to continue to hold the dates in June for the continued civil contempt hearings or for discovery, until further notice of the Court. FURTHER ORDERED directing the parties to inform the Court of their intention to file responses to the Motion on or before May 29, 2015 and submit a joint expedited schedule for responses and/or replies. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/22/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 5/22/2015. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Andre Segura, Stanley Young and Tammy Albarran (telephonically), Cecillia Wang and Daniel Pochoda for Plaintiffs. Michele Iafrate and A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker for Maricopa County. David Eisenberg (telephonically) for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa. Gary Birnbaum for Deputy Chief MacIntyre, who is also present. Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Sheridan, who is also present. M. Craig Murdy for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods for Thomas Liddy and Christine Stutz. Karen Clark for Timothy Casey. Deputy Monitors John Girvin and Raul Martinez (telephonically). (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) Hearing held 9:37 AM to 9:49 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Terrence Woods shall immediately file a Notice of Appearance on behalf of Christine Stutz. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1117 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Recusal , MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Joseph M Arpaio, Gerard Sheridan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Certificate of Good Faith, # 12 Certificate of Good Faith, # 13 Certificate of Good Faith)(McDonald, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re: of Filing Petition for Panel Rehearing and En Banc Determination Recently Filed in U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit by Maricopa, County of . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1115 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER For the reasons discussed (see Order for complete details,) the Court finds that Chief Deputy Sheridan's statements to the press waived the work-product protections as to the redacted portions of the November 6, 2013 letter that are specifically addressed in those statements. The waiver, however, does not extend to the other redacted portions of the letter that were not discussed by Chief Deputy Sheridan in the interview. A copy of the newly redacted November 6, 2013 letter is attached to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 5/21/2015. (KMG) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re: 1085 MOTION to Compel Production of Internal Affairs Reports filed by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1113 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re: 1092 Objection to the Purported "Expansion" of the Plaintiff Class by Plaintiffs Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Albarran, Tammy) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1112 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re: 1093 Order on Motion for Admittance Pro Hac Vice of Jonathon A. Moseley on behalf of Dennis L Montgomery. (33 pages) (KMG) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    IT IS ORDERED granting 1110 Mr. Eisenberg's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for the Status Conference on 5/22/15 at 9:30 a.m. Ordered by Judge G. Murray Snow. (GMS, ag) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by Joseph Sousa . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eisenberg, David) Modified on 5/20/2015 (KFZ). (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone by Joseph Sousa. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eisenberg, David) Modified on 5/20/2015 (KFZ). (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re: Lodging Under Seal Objection to Re-Evaluation of Disclosures Made on Behalf of Tim Casey by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office re: 1107 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1107 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED LODGED Proposed Objection to Re-Evaluation of Disclosures Made on Behalf of Tim Casey. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on May 14, 2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Caspar, Edward) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Case Number re: 1104 Notice of Appeal. Case number 15-15996, Ninth Circuit. (copies sent by the Ninth Circuit) (REW) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1104 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: 606 Permanent Injunction, Judgment, 579 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, 494 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Leave to File, 670 Permanent Injunction by Maricopa, County of. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-11686464. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1103 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *OBJECTION to and MOTION to Limit Expansion of, or Inclusion into, Plaintiff Class Designation of Persons Placed into, or Transported in, Vehicles as a Result of Sheriff's "Worksite Operations", and to Discovery Related Thereto by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Walker, Richard) *Modified ti include Motion on 5/18/2015 (KMG). (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1102 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jonathon Moseley for Status Conference proceedings held on 05/14/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jonathon Moseley for Status Conference proceedings held on 05/08/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: On May 14, 2015, District Judge G. Murray Snow referred to this Court an evaluation of whether the work-product immunity continues to apply to the redacted materials appended to Doc. 1053 , in light of statements made by Chief Deputy Sheridan to the press. (Doc. 1093 .) Pursuant to Judge Snow's Order, if the parties wish to submit briefing to Magistrate Judge Boyle on this issue, they must do so no later than Tuesday, May 19, 2015 at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 5/15/2015. (REK) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1099 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 05-14-2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Kimmins, Lynnette) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Adam Longo of KPHO-TV for Status Conference proceedings held on 05/14/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1097 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 05/14/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon Silver for Status Conference proceedings held on 05/14/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1095 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA (re 15-71433) - Petitioner has not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. Accordingly, the emergency petition is denied. No further filings will be entertained in this closed case. (LAD) (Distributed by the Ninth Circuit) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1094 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1045 Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/14/2015.(KFZ) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1093 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that this matter is referred back to Judge Boyle for re-evaluation on discovery matters; Jonathon A. Moseley's Application of Attorney for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice is denied; 1057 Motion to Intervene is stricken; 1067 Motion to Disqualify Judge is stricken. The Court orders that the parties proceed to effectively manage discovery. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/14/2015.(KFZ) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1092 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to the Court's Expansion of Plaintiff Class by Defendants Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1091 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Tom Liddy for proceedings held on 05-14-15, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Woods, Terrence) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 05/14/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1089 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office for proceedings held on 05/14/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow. Status Conference held on 5/14/2015. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Andre Segura and Tammy Albarran (telephonically), Cecillia Wang, Stanley Young, Daniel Pochoda and Joshua Bendor for Plaintiffs. Michele Iafrate and A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio, who is also present, and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker for Maricopa County. David Eisenberg for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa. Gary Birnbaum for Deputy Chief MacIntyre. Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Sheridan, who is also present. Gregory Como for Brian Sands. Karen Clark for Tim Casey. Chief Robert Warshaw, Deputy Monitors John Girvin, Sherry Kiyler, and Raul Martinez (telephonically). (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 9:34 AM to 10:59 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1087 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on May 14, 2015 Status Conference, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1086 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 05/08/2015, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Gary Moll). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2015. (RAP) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1085 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Production of Internal Affairs Reports by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Segura, Andre) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1084 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER Re Unsealing of Court's Order and Documents. See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 5/13/15. (cc: Cnsl for Plas, Dfts/Karen Clark/ Lee David Stein/ Gregory Stephen Como/ Melvin McDonald/ Gary Birnbaum/ David Eisenberg/ Robert Warshaw)(MAP) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Court's Inquiry Regarding Ethical Rule 3.3(a)(3) by Defendant Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cover, 1-2)(Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER That the Clerk shall unseal Doc. 1053 and the appended documents. The objections (Docs. 1072 , 1073 , and 1077 ) shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 5/13/15. (MAP) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1081 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum in Support of Motion re: 1057 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Dennis L Montgomery. (KMG) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1080 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Clarification of Motion for Admittance Pro Hac Vice of Jonathon A Moseley by Dennis L Montgomery. (KMG) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1079 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: A Status Conference is set for May 14, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are to be prepared to discuss various matters (see attached Order for details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/13/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1045 MOTION for Discovery of Attorney-Client and Work Production Information filed by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America. (Bendor, Joshua) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1077 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *SEALED Non-Party Casey's Objection To Magistrate Judge Boyle's Sealed Order Dated May 7, 2015 - Filed Under Seal filed by Timothy J Casey. (Clark, Karen) *Modified on 5/13/2015 to change from lodgedto filed pursuant to JZB Chambers (MAP)*. (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1076 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re: Supplement to Notice Regarding Completion of Internal Investigations by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office re: 1052 Notice (Other) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re: Lodging by Timothy J Casey . (Clark, Karen) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1074 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re: Lodging Under Seal Objection to Unsealing of Order and Documents by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office re: 1073 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1073 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *SEALED Amended Objection to Unsealing of Order and Document-Cover Sheet Added filed by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Iafrate, Michele) *Modified on 5/13/2015 to change from lodged to filed pursuant to JZB Chambers (MAP)*. (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *AMENDED at Doc. 1073 SEALED Objection to Unsealing of Order and Documents filed by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Iafrate, Michele) *Modified on 5/13/2015 (SCH). *Modified on 5/13/2015 to change from lodged to filed pursuant to JZB Chambers (MAP)*. (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Leon B. Silver for Status Conference proceedings held on 05/08/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1070 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re: Correspondence Sent to Central Intelligence Agency by Joseph M Arpaio . (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America for proceedings held on 05-08-2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Kimmins, Lynnette) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1068 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Fernanda Santos for The New York Times for entire transcript for Evidentiary Hearing proceedings held April 21-24, 2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1067 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *STRICKEN by Doc. 1093 -- MOTION to Disqualify Judge Under 28:144 by Intervenor Dennis L Montgomery. (submitted by Jonathon Moseley) (KMG) Modified on 5/14/2015 (KFZ). (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on May 8, 2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1065 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ORDER - Previously the parties agreed to a confidential procedure in which Sandi Wilson, Deputy County Manager for Maricopa County, and her attorney reviewed on a monthly and confidential basis the detailed billings of the monitor prior to authorizing payment. The details of that arrangement and the required confidentiality procedures were set forth in the Court's Order (Doc. 696 ). Recently, Maricopa County has separately re-entered this action to assert rights that it claims to be separate from the interests of Sheriff Arpaio and/or the MCSO. In light of that independent representation which may well encompass Ms. Wilson's interests, the Court is uncomfortable authorizing this continued review without reconsidering the matter with the parties. Therefore, pending reconsideration of this matter with all parties, the procedure set forth under the Order (Doc. 696 ) is at least temporarily suspended. Maricopa County is directed to authorize payment of the Monitor's April invoice. Ms. Wilson and her counsel remain under the confidentiality obligations set forth under the Order (Doc. 696 ) for those reviews that they have conducted to date. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/8/2015. (KMG) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1064 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Deputy County Attorneys Thomas Liddy, Ann Thompson Uglietta, and Douglas Schwab's Amended and Supplemental Application to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendants (Doc. 1028 ) is GRANTED. The Court will hold weekly status conferences according to the schedule set forth below, at which out-of-state counsel may appear telephonically: Thursday, May 14, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.; Friday, May 22, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.; Friday, May 29, 2015 at 10:00 a.m.; Friday, June 5, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.; Friday, June 12, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. The Parties shall hold the dates of June 2326, 2015 to follow the resumption of the show cause proceedings on June 16-19, 2015. The hearings will be continued as follows:Tuesday, June 23, 2015 at 1:30 p.m.; Wednesday, June 24, 2015 at 9:00 a.m.; Thursday, June 25, 2015 at 1:30 p.m.; Friday, June 26, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/8/2015. (See Order for complete details.)(KMG) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office for proceedings held on 5/8/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1062 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Additional Attachment to Order 1060 . (cc: Plaintiffs' Cnsl/Dfts' Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Manuel de Jesus Ortega Melendres, Velia Meraz, Manuel Nieto, Jr, David Rodriguez, Jessica Quitugua Rodriguez, Somos America for proceedings held on 5/8/2015, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Young, Stanley) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1060 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Re Application of Attorney for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice from Mr. Jonathon A. Moseley. ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to: Jonathon A. Moseley. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of the dditional Information by mail to all Plaintiffs' Counsel and Defense Counsel of record. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/8/15. (MAP) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 5/8/2015. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Cecillia Wang, Andre Segura and Hyun Byun (telephonically), Stanley Young, Daniel Pochoda and Josh Bendor for Plaintiffs. Michele Iafrate and A. Melvin McDonald, Jr. for Defendant Joseph M. Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Richard Walker for Maricopa County. David Eisenberg (telephonically) for Lieutenant Joseph Sousa. Gary Birnbaum for Deputy Chief MacIntyre. Barry Mitchell for Chief Deputy Sheridan, who is also present. Gregory Como for Brian Sands. Terrence Woods for Thomas Liddy, Ann Uglietta and Douglas Schwab. Karen Clark for Tim Casey. Chief Robert Warshaw, Deputy Monitors John Girvin and Raul Martinez, and Sandi Wilson also present. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) Hearing held 9:01 AM to 10:22 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1058 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *MEMORANDUM in Support of 1057 MOTION to Intervene and 1067 Motion to Disqualify Judge Snow by Intervenor Dennis L Montgomery. (submitted by Jonathon A Moseley) (KMG) *Modified to include document linkage on 5/8/2015 (KMG). (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1057 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *STRICKEN by Doc. 1093 -- MOTION to Intervene by Dennis L Montgomery. (submitted by Jonathon A Moseley) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(KMG) Modified on 5/14/2015 (KFZ). (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1056 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re: 1045 MOTION for Discovery of Attorney-Client and Work Production Information filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Iafrate, Michele) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence P Woods on behalf of Interested Parties Tom Liddy, Ann Uglietta and Douglas Schwab. (Woods, Terrence) *Modified to add filers on 5/8/2015 (KMG). (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1054 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION re: 1048 Order , and Motion for Rescission or Modification of, Order re Payment of Monitor Billings by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1053 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *ORDER Re Determination Whether Documents are Protected from Disclosure by the Attorney-Client Privilege and/or Work-Product Immunity. See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 5/7/15. (cc: AUSA/Dft's Cnsl/Karen Clark/ Lee David Stein/ Gregory Stephen Como/ Melvin McDonald/ Gary Birnbaum/ David Eisenberg/ Robert Warshaw)(MAP) *Modified on 5/13/2015 to Unseal Pursuant to Order 1082 (MAP)*. (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,509 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?