Paramount Pictures Corporation et al v. International Media Films Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-09112

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 15, 2019 at 4:31 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Melange Pictures LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Paramount Pictures Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sally Wu +1 310 788 4400 +1 310 788 4471 sallywu42@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca Faye Ganz +1 310 788 4400 +1 310 788 4471 rebecca.ganz@kattenlaw.com
Space David Halberstadter +1 310 788 4400 +1 310 788 4471 david.halberstadter@kattenlaw.com
v.
No Logo International Media Films Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Manning Chodos +1 310 203 3888 davidchodos@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Isaacman Kaufman & Painter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack G Cairl +1 310 881 6800 +1 310 881 6801 cairl@ikplaw.com
  Entries (132) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Default by Judge
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Default Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
        SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Melange Pictures LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, re APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant International Media Films, Inc. Memorandum of Points and Authorities 123 , Notice of Lodging, 125 , Declaration, 124 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), 126 served on January 22, 2015. (Halberstadter, David) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: 1/27/2015 Text Only Scheduling Notice
          NOTICE OF ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION:The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant International Media Films, Inc. 123 , set for hearing on February 9, 2015. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/27/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Melange Pictures LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation, re APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant International Media Films, Inc. Memorandum of Points and Authorities 123 , Notice of Lodging, 125 , Declaration, 124 served on 1/22/15. (Halberstadter, David) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Notice of Lodging
              NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant International Media Films, Inc. Memorandum of Points and Authorities 123 , Declaration, 124 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Default Judgment by Court)(Halberstadter, David) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Declaration
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Default Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT International Media Films Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement proof of service of delivery of civil minutes)(Chodos, David) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Order on Motion in Limine to ExcludeCourt Filing
                              MINUTES OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE and MOTION of David M. Chodos; Jack Cairl to Withdraw as Attorney of record for Defendant International Media Films, Inc. and for Continuance of Trial to Permit IMF to Retain Substitute Counsel 113 held before Judge S. James Otero:The Court grants the Motion of David M. Chodos and Jack Cairl to Withdraw as Attorney of record for Defendant International Media Films, Inc 113 . The Court vacates the hearings on the pretrial conference, all pending motions in limine and the trial. All said matters are taken off the Courts calendar. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause hearing re striking the answer if defendant fails to appear with counsel on Monday, December 15, 2014 8:30 a.m. If counsel fails to appear, then Plaintiff can request that the Court strike the answer and pursue entry of default then default judgment. Defendants counsel shall serve notice of this minute order and file a proof of service, forthwith.Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (lc) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First MOTION of David M. Chodos; Jack Cairl to Withdraw as Attorney of record for Defendant International Media Films, Inc. and for Continuance of Trial to Permit IMF to Retain Substitute Counselo 113 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information on the pdf document is missing (blank). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Order on Ex Parte Application for Trial Date
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Stipulation re: Exhibits Pretrial Trial
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Notice of Lodging
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Ex Parte Application to Set Trial
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Notice of Lodging
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Ex Parte Application to Reset
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Status Report
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: 6/4/2014 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Order on Ex Parte Application to Continue
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Notice of Lodging
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Ex Parte Application to Continue
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Ex Parte Application to Hold Case in Abeyance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Ex Parte Application to Continue
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Order on Ex Parte Application to Reschedule
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Notice of Lodging
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Witness List
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013 Ex Parte Application to Reset
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. The parties are directed to appear for a settlement conference on July 11, 2013, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom "69O", Roybal Federal Building, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, California. Each party shall deliver a confidential settlement conference statement to the chambers of the Magistrate Judge on or before July 8, 2013. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mz) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 54 . (lc) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: 5/21/2013 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: 4/8/2013 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: 4/4/2013 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Stipulation for Order
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/21/2013 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Stipulation for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Stipulation re: Exhibits Pretrial Trial
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: 1/14/2013 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: 1/14/2013 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: 1/14/2013 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: 11/6/2012 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich re Stipulation for Protective Order 41 . See document for details. (yb)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Stipulation for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: 10/29/2012 Stipulation for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Stipulation for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: 4/2/2012 Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: 4/2/2012 Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012 Stipulation for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/28/2012 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: 2/2/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: 12/30/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: 12/30/2011 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: 12/29/2011 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: 12/29/2011 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: 12/28/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Stipulation to Set Aside Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Request for Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/4/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Complaint - (Discovery)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?