Brown et al v. Herbert et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-00652-CW-BCW
District Judge Clark Waddoups, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 30, 2017 at 4:34 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christine Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Alba +1 801 792 8785 adam.alba@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The George Washington University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Turley +1 202 994 7001 +1 202 994 9811 jturley@law.gwu.edu
No Logo Janelle Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Alba +1 801 792 8785 adam.alba@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The George Washington University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Turley +1 202 994 7001 +1 202 994 9811 jturley@law.gwu.edu
No Logo Kody Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Alba +1 801 792 8785 adam.alba@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The George Washington University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Turley +1 202 994 7001 +1 202 994 9811 jturley@law.gwu.edu
No Logo Meri Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Alba +1 801 792 8785 adam.alba@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The George Washington University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Turley +1 202 994 7001 +1 202 994 9811 jturley@law.gwu.edu
No Logo Robyn Sullivan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Alba +1 801 792 8785 adam.alba@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The George Washington University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Turley +1 202 994 7001 +1 202 994 9811 jturley@law.gwu.edu
v.
No Logo Gary R. Herbert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Utah Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerrold S. Jensen +1 801 366 0350 jerroldjensen@utah.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thom D. Roberts +1 801 366 0353 +1 801 366 0352 thomroberts@utah.gov
No Logo Jeffrey R. Buhman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Utah Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerrold S. Jensen +1 801 366 0350 jerroldjensen@utah.gov
No Logo Mark Shurtleff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Utah Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerrold S. Jensen +1 801 366 0350 jerroldjensen@utah.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thom D. Roberts +1 801 366 0353 +1 801 366 0352 thomroberts@utah.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES-IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That judgment for attorney fees be entered in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendants in the amount of $242,550. Signed by Louise S. York. (jmr) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Please be advised the Record is complete for purposes of appeal for USCA case number 14-4117 re 95 Notice of Appeal,. (jmr) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on January 17, 2014 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura W. Robinson, RPR, FCRR, CSR, CP, Telephone number 801-328-4800. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2015. (jmr) Modified on 4/16/2015 by removing restricted text (las). (Entered: 01/16/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss for Mootness held on July 25, 2012 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura W. Robinson, RPR, FCRR, CSR, CP, Telephone number (801)328-4800. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2015. (jmr) Modified on 4/16/2015 by removing restricted text (las). (Entered: 01/16/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
              Please be advised the Record is complete for purposes of appeal for USCA case number 14-4117 re 95 Notice of Appeal,. (jmr) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                    USCA Case Number Case Appealed to Tenth Case Number 14-4117 for 95 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jeffrey R. Buhman. (jmr) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                      Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA re 95 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(jmr) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 78 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike, Memorandum Decision,,,, 90 Judgment, filed by Jeffrey R. Buhman. Appeals to the USCA for the 10th Circuit. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 1088-2130529. (Douglas, Parker) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Parker Douglas on behalf of Jeffrey R. Buhman (Douglas, Parker) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 89 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Response - not to Motion
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Response - not to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Status Conference
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Notice of Hearing.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Notice of Hearing.
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Order
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Modification of Docket
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Clerks Judgment
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 78 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                          MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part [49] Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying [55] Motion for Summary Judgment ; finding as moot [60] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 12/13/13. See order for details(rks)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: 3/26/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE of New Authority by Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions for Summary Judgment held on January 17, 2013 before Judge CLARK WADDOUPS. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen Murakami, Telephone number 801-328-4800. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2013. (asp) Modified by removing restricted text on 5/9/2013 (mlp).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Motion Hearing held on 1/17/2013 re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christine Brown, Meri Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Robyn Sullivan, [55] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey R. Buhman. The court hears argument and takes the matter under submission. Attorney for Plaintiff: Jonathan Turley, Adam Alba, Attorney for Defendant: Jerrod Jensen, Thomas Roberts. Court Reporter: Karen Murakami. (jwt)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [55] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jeffrey R. Buhman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit)(Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [55] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: 8/31/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: [55] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment : (Notice generated by jwt) Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2013 03:30 PM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (jwt)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-denying [46] Motion to Dismiss-For the reasons stated in the Order, the court hereby DENIES Defendant Buhmans motion to dismiss on the grounds of mootness. (Dkt. No. 46). On July 2, 2012, the court issued a stay on further proceedings on Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment and Defendants cross-motion for summary judgment. (Dkt. No. 64). The stay is now LIFTED. Plaintiffs may, in their discretion, file a reply memorandum to Defendants memorandum opposing Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment on or before August 31, 2012. Plaintiffs should also file a memorandum opposing Defendants cross-motion for summary judgment on or before September 14, 2012. Defendant may then, at his discretion, file a reply memorandum on or before September 28, 2012. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/17/12. (jmr)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: 7/25/2012 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2012 re [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by Jeffrey R. Buhman. The court hears argument and takes the matter under submission. Attorney for Plaintiff: Jonathan Turley, Adam Alba, Attorney for Defendant: Jerrold Jensen, Thomas Roberts. Court Reporter: Laura Robinson. (jwt)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Kody Brown in Opposition re [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by Defendant Jeffrey R. Buhman. (Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: 7/3/2012 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness : (Notice generated by jwt) Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2012 11:00 AM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (jwt)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christine Brown, Meri Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Robyn Sullivan, [55] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey R. Buhman. Further pleadings in response to, or opposition to these Motions will not be required pending this Courts determination of whether or not it has jurisdiction. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 7/2/12. (jmr)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [57] MOTION to Stay re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [50] Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Motions No Longer Referred
                                                                                        Motions No Longer Referred: [60] MOTION to Strike [55] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , [57] MOTION to Stay re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [50] Memorandum in Support of Motion , [56] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [58] Memorandum in Sup, [57] MOTION to Stay re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [50] Memorandum in Support of Motion (mjw)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [60] MOTION to Strike [55] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , [57] MOTION to Stay re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [50] Memorandum in Support of Motion , [56] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [58] Memorandum in Sup filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012, Terminated: 12/13/2013 Motion to Strike
                                                                                            MOTION to Strike [55] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , [57] MOTION to Stay re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [50] Memorandum in Support of Motion , [56] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [58] Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells.(Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [57] MOTION to Stay re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [50] Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Defendant Jeffrey R. Buhman. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012, Terminated: 8/17/2012 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [50] Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Defendant Jeffrey R. Buhman. Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells.(Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    Oral MEMORANDUM in Support re [55] Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jeffrey R. Buhman. (Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012, Terminated: 12/13/2013 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                      Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jeffrey R. Buhman. (Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss held on December 16, 2011 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen Murakami, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 801-328-4800. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2012. (jmr) Modified by removing restricted text on 9/6/2012 (mlp).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [48] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/31/12. (jmr)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Motions No Longer Referred
                                                                                                            Motions No Longer Referred: [48] MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (saw)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [49] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012, Terminated: 12/13/2013 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012, Terminated: 6/1/2012 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells.(Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by Defendant Jeffrey R. Buhman. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration)(Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012, Terminated: 8/17/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness filed by Defendant Jeffrey R. Buhman. (Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      DOCKET TEXT ORDER No attached document. Initial Pretrial Conference is VACATED. Motion deadline is 5/31/12, responsive memo due 6/29/12 and reply due 7/16/12. Counsel are to notify court after resolution of dispositive motions for scheduling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 05/10/12. (tab)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice Vacating Hearing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE VACATING Initial Pretrial Conference HEARING set for 05/16/12 before Judge Furse (Notice generated by Theresa Brown). Counsel are directed to notify the court when scheduling is required. (tab)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/4/2012. No document attached.(saw)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012, Terminated: 5/10/2012 Motion for Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012, Terminated: 5/10/2012 Motion for Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Notice Attorney Report ReminderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE REMINDER of Attorneys' Planning Meeting Report due five days from receipt of this notice. This is a reminder of the notice filed 03/14/16 [40] NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by Stephanie Schaerrer)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 30 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to ipt@utd.uscourts.gov30 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/ipt.html Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2012 11:30 AM in Room 477 before Magistrate Judge David Nuffer. (ss) (tab)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Notice of Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by Stephanie Schaerrer)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 30 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to ipt@utd.uscourts.gov30 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/ipt.html Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2012 11:30 AM in Room 477 before Magistrate Judge David Nuffer. (ss)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Constitutional Challenge to an Act of Congress by United States of America (Parker, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [36] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan B. Parker for United States of America. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov; granting [37] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan B. Parker for United States of America. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/8/12. (jmr)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012, Terminated: 3/8/2012 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Parker (no registration fee required) filed by Interested Party United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Application for Admission, # (2) Exhibit B - ECF Registration, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Swent, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: 3/6/2012, Terminated: 3/8/2012 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Parker (no registration fee required) filed by Interested Party United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Application for Admission, # (2) Exhibit B - ECF Registration, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Swent, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Notice From the Court re Initial Scheduling
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (jmr)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Notice of ADR
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan, Defendant Jeffrey R. Buhman. (jmr)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by Jeffrey R. Buhman.(Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012 Notice of Transmittal
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that Notice of Claim sent. (jmr)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-granting in part and denying in part [7] Motion to Dismiss. Defendants motion as to Defendants Gary R. Herbert, in his official capacity as Governor of Utah, and Mark Shurtleff, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Utah, is GRANTED. These Defendants are dismissed. Defendants motion with regard to Jeffrey R. Buhman, in his official capacity as County Attorney for Utah County, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/3/12. (jmr)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/11/2012 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan (Attachments: # (1) Supplement) (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Amanda Jex in Support re [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit H)(Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Supplemental Material by Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan re [12] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2) (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                                                                        Please disregard See [28]-NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2) (Turley, Jonathan) Modified on 12/19/2011-Per call from counsel's office re-filed as 28. (jmr).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2011 re [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Jeffrey R. Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Gary R. Herbert. The court hears argument and takes the matter under submission. Attorney for Plaintiff: Jonathan Turley, Adam Alba, Attorney for Defendant: Jerrold Jensen, Thomas Roberts, Amanda Jex. Court Reporter: Karen Murakami. (jwt)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: 12/13/2011 Response - not to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Order Docket #20 filed by Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit David Tenzer Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Michael Maguire Declaration)(Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: 12/13/2011 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA to [23] Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan . (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: 12/9/2011 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff. (Roberts, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing : (Notice generated by jwt) Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 08:30 AM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Note change in time, date remains the same. (jwt)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET TEXT ORDER re [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Jeffrey R. Buhman, Mark Shurtleff, Gary R. Herbert. Upon review of the memoranda submitted in support and in opposition to the Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of standing, the court observes that all parties have relied upon facts to support their arguments for which they have not yet offered supporting evidence. If the parties intend to rely upon disputed facts to support their motion, both sides should be prepared to present evidence to support such facts at the hearing set for December 16, 2011. In particular, Plaintiffs should be prepared to substantiate their standing through evidence of the Defendants' investigations and other allegedly injurious actions. The Defendants should be prepared to offer rebuttal evidence and any additional evidence that would defeat the Plaintiffs' claim of standing. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/1/11. (No attached document) (jwt)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Defendants Jeffrey R. Buhman, Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff. (Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing : (Notice generated by jwt) Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Note change in time, date remains the same. (jwt)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re [16] Notice of Hearing on Motion. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/28/11. (jmr)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing : (Notice generated by jwt) Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 03:30 PM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (jwt)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Janelle Brown in Opposition re [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Meri Brown in Opposition re [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Kody Brown in Opposition re [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: 9/29/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas D. Roberts on behalf of Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff (Roberts, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME-granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [9] First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, [8] Memorandum in Support of Motion,First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, [8] Memorandum in Support of Motion. Responses due by 10/17/2011. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/26/11. (jmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: 9/22/2011, Terminated: 9/27/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, [8] Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [7] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Defendants Jeffrey R. Buhman, Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey R. Buhman, Utah County Attorney, # (2) Affidavit Declaration of Mark L. Shurtleff Utah Attorney General)(Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011, Terminated: 2/3/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Defendants Jeffrey R. Buhman, Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff. (Jensen, Jerrold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Christine Brown, Robyn Sullivan, Janelle Brown as to Mark Shurtleff served on 7/18/2011, answer due 8/8/2011. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                  **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Christine Brown, Robyn Sullivan, Janelle Brown as to Gary R. Herbert served on 7/18/2011, answer due 8/8/2011. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                    **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Christine Brown, Robyn Sullivan, Janelle Brown as to Jeffrey R. Buhman served on 7/15/2011, answer due 8/5/2011. (Turley, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [2] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Turley for Christine Brown,Jonathan Turley for Janelle Brown,Jonathan Turley for Kody Brown,Jonathan Turley for Meri Brown,Jonathan Turley for Robyn Sullivan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 07/21/2011. (asp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011, Terminated: 7/22/2011 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Turley, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 4681045690, Fee Status: Paid. filed by Plaintiffs Christine Brown, Janelle Brown, Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Robyn Sullivan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Application, # (2) Exhibit B - Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit C - CM/ECF Registration)(rks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Jeffrey R. Buhman, Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4681045689) (Electronic document provided on disc. Original file stamped and signed document permanently retained), filed by Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Christine Brown, Robyn Sullivan, Janelle Brown. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (rks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 253 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?