United States of America v. City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02067
District Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 27, 2021 at 5:22 PM DT (1.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Eskew +1 718 254 6194 +1 718 254 7489 david.eskew@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Goldberger +1 718 254 6052 +1 718 254 6083 Michael.Goldberger@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elliot M. Schachner +1 718 254 6053 +1 718 254 6081 Elliot.Schachner@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/12/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/26/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RAHEEMAH F. ABDULALEEM +1 202 307 2034 +1 202 514 1005 raheemah.abdulaleem@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 03/21/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Bachman +1 202 305 7883 +1 202 514 1005 eric.bachman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meredith Lynn Burrell +1 202 514 8746 +1 202 514 0280 meredith.burrell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hilary J Funk +1 202 353 8054 +1 202 514 0655 hilary.funk@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 04/14/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clare F. Geller +1 202 353 1817 clare.geller@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/06/2012 Varda Hussain +1 202 305 4267 +1 202 514 1005 varda.hussain@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/02/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Ladewski +1 202 353 1099 +1 202 514 1005 kathryn.ladewski@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 04/13/2010 David Reese +1 202 514 3851 david.reese@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/26/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Patricia Ruckert +1 202 616 9138 karen.ruckert@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/26/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara A. Schwabauer +1 202 305 3034 +1 202 353 8961 barbara.schwabauer@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/26/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Seeley +1 202 514 4761 +1 202 514 1005 sharon.seeley@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
TERMINATED: 05/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Anne Speck +1 202 307 0369 +1 202 307 0972 elizabeth.speck@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Swedish +1 202 305 4069 +1 202 353 8961 jennifer.swedish@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALLAN K. TOWNSEND +1 202 305 3302 +1 202 514 1005 allan.townsend@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 04/13/2010 Carolyn P. Weiss +1 202 514 6269 +1 202 514 1005 carolyn.weiss@usdoj.gov
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel of the City of NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William S.J. Fraenkel +1 212 788 1247 +1 212 788 8877 wfraenke@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward Lee Sample , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/08/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Lee Sample, II +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by N.Y.C. Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia B. Miller +1 212 788 0876 +1 212 788 0367 pmiller@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vivien V. Ranada +1 212 788 0922 +1 212 788 0940 vranada@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Christopher Sullivan +1 212 788 0800 +1 212 788 8877 dsulliva@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keri Reid McNally +1 212 788 0922 +1 212 788 8877 kmcnally@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yuval Rubinstein +1 212 788 8682 +1 212 341 3934 yrubinst@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kami Zumbach Barker +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 8876 kbarker@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Jay Eichenholtz +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 0940 eeichenh@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J. Traverse +1 212 356 4079 +1 212 788 0940 btravers@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Comfrey +1 212 848 4178 +1 646 848 4178 kcomfrey@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Georgia Pestana +1 212 788 1202 gpestana@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Fire Department of the City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel of the City of NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William S.J. Fraenkel +1 212 788 1247 +1 212 788 8877 wfraenke@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward Lee Sample , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/08/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Lee Sample, II +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by N.Y.C. Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia B. Miller +1 212 788 0876 +1 212 788 0367 pmiller@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keri Reid McNally +1 212 788 0922 +1 212 788 8877 kmcnally@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yuval Rubinstein +1 212 788 8682 +1 212 341 3934 yrubinst@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kami Zumbach Barker +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 8876 kbarker@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Jay Eichenholtz +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 0940 eeichenh@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J. Traverse +1 212 356 4079 +1 212 788 0940 btravers@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Comfrey +1 212 848 4178 +1 646 848 4178 kcomfrey@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Georgia Pestana +1 212 788 1202 gpestana@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel of the City of NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William S.J. Fraenkel +1 212 788 1247 +1 212 788 8877 wfraenke@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward Lee Sample , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/08/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Lee Sample, II +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by N.Y.C. Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia B. Miller +1 212 788 0876 +1 212 788 0367 pmiller@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keri Reid McNally +1 212 788 0922 +1 212 788 8877 kmcnally@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yuval Rubinstein +1 212 788 8682 +1 212 341 3934 yrubinst@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kami Zumbach Barker +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 8876 kbarker@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Jay Eichenholtz +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 0940 eeichenh@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J. Traverse +1 212 356 4079 +1 212 788 0940 btravers@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Comfrey +1 212 848 4178 +1 646 848 4178 kcomfrey@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Georgia Pestana +1 212 788 1202 gpestana@law.nyc.gov
New York City Department Of Citywide Administrative Services New York City Department Of Citywide Administrative Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel of the City of NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William S.J. Fraenkel +1 212 788 1247 +1 212 788 8877 wfraenke@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward Lee Sample , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/08/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Lee Sample, II +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by N.Y.C. Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia B. Miller +1 212 788 0876 +1 212 788 0367 pmiller@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keri Reid McNally +1 212 788 0922 +1 212 788 8877 kmcnally@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yuval Rubinstein +1 212 788 8682 +1 212 341 3934 yrubinst@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kami Zumbach Barker +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 8876 kbarker@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Jay Eichenholtz +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 0940 eeichenh@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J. Traverse +1 212 356 4079 +1 212 788 0940 btravers@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Comfrey +1 212 848 4178 +1 646 848 4178 kcomfrey@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Georgia Pestana +1 212 788 1202 gpestana@law.nyc.gov
No Logo NYC Fire Comm. Nicholas Scoppetta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel of the City of NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William S.J. Fraenkel +1 212 788 1247 +1 212 788 8877 wfraenke@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward Lee Sample , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/08/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Lee Sample, II +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by N.Y.C. Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia B. Miller +1 212 788 0876 +1 212 788 0367 pmiller@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keri Reid McNally +1 212 788 0922 +1 212 788 8877 kmcnally@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yuval Rubinstein +1 212 788 8682 +1 212 341 3934 yrubinst@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leah Sharon Schmelzer +1 212 788 0903 +1 212 788 0940 lschmelz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kami Zumbach Barker +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 8876 kbarker@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Jay Eichenholtz +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 788 0940 eeichenh@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J. Traverse +1 212 356 4079 +1 212 788 0940 btravers@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Comfrey +1 212 848 4178 +1 646 848 4178 kcomfrey@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Georgia Pestana +1 212 788 1202 gpestana@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Barbara S. Jones, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
No Logo Breon S. Peace, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Breon Peace +1 212 225 2059 +1 212 225 3999 bpeace@cgsh.com
No Logo Hector Gonzalez, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hector Gonzalez +1 212 698 6321 +1 212 698 3599 hector.gonzalez@dechert.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Sarah Kahan +1 212 698 3861 +1 212 698 3599 rebecca.kahan@dechert.com
No Logo MARK S COHEN, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Gresser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Abernethy +1 212 707 1322 +1 212 957 4514 jabernethy@cohengresser.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S. Cohen +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 mcohen@cohengresser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Thomas Gresser +1 212 957 7602 +1 212 957 4514 ltgresser@cohengresser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Vincent Povolny +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 mpovolny@cohengresser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra Sarah Wald +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 awald@cohengresser.com
No Logo United States Attorney, S.D.N.Y., Special Master
Officially listed as "Mary Jo White"

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Jo White +1 212 909 6260 +1 212 909 6836 mjwhite@debevoise.com
No Logo Mitra Hormozi, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shireen Anneke Barday +1 212 446 6418 +1 212 446 4900 shireen.barday@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitra Hormozi +1 212 897 3433
No Logo Dist Atty, NY County, Special Master
Officially listed as "Robert M. Morgenthau"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/01/2010 Robert M. Morgenthau +1 212 403 1000 +1 212 403 4785
No Logo Steven M Cohen, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Michael Cohen +1 212 704 9600 +1 212 704 4256 scohen@zuckerman.com
No Logo Candido Nunez, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccr-ny.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chauniqua Danielle Young +1 212 614 6483 cyoung@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Incredible Technologies

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ghita Schwarz +1 212 614 6445 +1 212 614 6422 gschwarz@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Ratner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana E Lossia +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 dlossia@levyratner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert H. Stroup +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 rstroup@levyratner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth Ann Kaswan +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 bkaswan@scott-scott.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judy Scolnick +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 jscolnick@scott-scott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 307

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Friedman +1 212 737 0400 +1 212 861 9015 flashlf@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tai, Shun-nan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2012 Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
No Logo Jamel Nicholson, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chauniqua Danielle Young +1 212 614 6483 cyoung@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Ratner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana E Lossia +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 dlossia@levyratner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert H. Stroup +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 rstroup@levyratner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth Ann Kaswan +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 bkaswan@scott-scott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 307

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Friedman +1 212 737 0400 +1 212 861 9015 flashlf@aol.com
No Logo Kevin Simpkins, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccr-ny.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chauniqua Danielle Young +1 212 614 6483 cyoung@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Ratner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana E Lossia +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 dlossia@levyratner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert H. Stroup +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 rstroup@levyratner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 307

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Friedman +1 212 737 0400 +1 212 861 9015 flashlf@aol.com
No Logo Kevin Walker, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Ratner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana E Lossia +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 dlossia@levyratner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert H. Stroup +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 rstroup@levyratner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 307

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Friedman +1 212 737 0400 +1 212 861 9015 flashlf@aol.com
No Logo Marcus Haywood, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccr-ny.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Incredible Technologies

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ghita Schwarz +1 212 614 6445 +1 212 614 6422 gschwarz@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Ratner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana E Lossia +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 dlossia@levyratner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert H. Stroup +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 rstroup@levyratner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth Ann Kaswan +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 bkaswan@scott-scott.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judy Scolnick +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 jscolnick@scott-scott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 307

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Friedman +1 212 737 0400 +1 212 861 9015 flashlf@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tai, Shun-nan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2012 Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
No Logo Roger Gregg, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccr-ny.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Incredible Technologies

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ghita Schwarz +1 212 614 6445 +1 212 614 6422 gschwarz@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Ratner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana E Lossia +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 dlossia@levyratner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert H. Stroup +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 rstroup@levyratner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth Ann Kaswan +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 bkaswan@scott-scott.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judy Scolnick +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 jscolnick@scott-scott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 307

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Friedman +1 212 737 0400 +1 212 861 9015 flashlf@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tai, Shun-nan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2012 Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
No Logo Rusebell Wilson, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chauniqua Danielle Young +1 212 614 6483 cyoung@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Ratner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana E Lossia +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 dlossia@levyratner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert H. Stroup +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 rstroup@levyratner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth Ann Kaswan +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 bkaswan@scott-scott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 307

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Friedman +1 212 737 0400 +1 212 861 9015 flashlf@aol.com
No Logo Vulcan Society, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccr-ny.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chauniqua Danielle Young +1 212 614 6483 cyoung@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Incredible Technologies

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ghita Schwarz +1 212 614 6445 +1 212 614 6422 gschwarz@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levy Ratner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana E Lossia +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 dlossia@levyratner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert H. Stroup +1 212 627 8100 +1 212 627 8182 rstroup@levyratner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth Ann Kaswan +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 bkaswan@scott-scott.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judy Scolnick +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 jscolnick@scott-scott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 307

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Friedman +1 212 737 0400 +1 212 861 9015 flashlf@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tai, Shun-nan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2012 Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
No Logo Keith M Sullivan, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Galleshaw +1 718 326 6200 +1 718 228 7010 jgalleshaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Michael N. Block, Esq., Interested Party
No Logo Norman Bennett, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodgdon, Dana

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
No Logo Levy Ratner, PC, Claimant
No Logo Uniformed Fire Officers Association Local 854, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Betheil +1 212 326 0154 +1 212 798 6348 rbetheil@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Uniformed Firefighters Association, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Hamm Milby & Ridings

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Kenneth Sergent +1 606 864 4126 +1 606 878 8144 bsergent@hmrkylaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (1746) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2023 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2014 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1970 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Release of Funds
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1968 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Release of Funds
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1940 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1884 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1875 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1850 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1839 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1837 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1792 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1791 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1790 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1789 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1788 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1787 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1786 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1785 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1784 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1783 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1782 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1781 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1780 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1779 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1778 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1777 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1776 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1775 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1774 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1773 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1772 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1771 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1770 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1765 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1764 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1763 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1762 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1760 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1759 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1756 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1753 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1752 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1751 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1750 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1748 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1746 Filed: 2/12/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1745 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1743 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1742 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1741 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1740 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1739 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1738 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1737 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1736 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1735 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1734 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1733 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1732 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1731 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1730 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1729 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1728 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1727 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1726 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1725 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1724 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1722 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1721 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1720 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1719 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1718 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1717 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1714 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1713 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1712 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1711 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1710 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1709 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1708 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1707 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1706 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1705 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1704 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1703 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1672 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1671 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1670 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1669 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1668 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1667 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1666 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1665 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1664 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1663 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1662 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1661 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1660 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1659 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1658 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1657 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1656 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1655 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1654 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1653 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1652 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1651 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1650 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1649 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1648 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1647 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1646 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1644 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1643 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1642 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1641 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1640 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1639 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1638 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1637 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1636 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1635 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1634 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 1628 Motion for Release of Funds/Fourth Statement of Consultant's Fees and Expenses by Mark S. Cohen. Payment approved. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/1/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1633 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1632 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1631 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1631 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 8/20/2015 to Judge Garaufis from Thomas Dermody, Lt. FDNY 18th Battallion on behalf of candidate Richard A. DeClara. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1630 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1630 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, granting 1629 Special Masters' Nineteenth Statement of Fees & Expenses: Payment approved. SO ORDERED by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, on 8/18/2015. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1629 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1628 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1627 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1627 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Judge Garaufis from Richard DeClara requesting help re: lost claim form. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1626 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1625 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1624 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1623 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None 1 - Report and Recommendations - Special Master
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1622 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1621 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1620 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1619 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1618 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1617 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1616 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1616 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 1612 Motion for Release of Funds. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/22/2015. (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1615 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1614 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1613 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1612 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1611 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1610 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1609 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1608 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1607 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1606 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 1604 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Motion for Order Regarding Retroactive Pension Benefits Submitted by City of New York filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Swedish, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1605 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1604 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1603 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1602 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1599 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1598 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1597 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1596 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1595 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1594 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1593 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1592 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1591 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1590 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1589 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1588 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1587 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1586 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1585 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1584 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1583 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1582 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1580 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1579 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1578 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1577 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1576 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1575 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1574 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1573 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1572 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1571 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1570 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1569 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1567 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1566 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1565 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1564 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1563 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1562 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1561 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1560 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1559 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1558 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1557 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1556 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1555 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1554 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1553 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 1551 Second MOTION for Settlement for Final Entry of Proposed Stipulation and Order Resolving Intentional Discrimination Claims filed by Roger Gregg, Marcus Haywood, Jamel Nicholson, Candido Nunez, Kevin Simpkins, Vulcan Society, Kevin Walker, Rusebell Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Levy, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1552 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1551 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1550 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1549 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1548 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Appendix B to Dkt. No. 1469 (Exhibits 1-50), # 2 Appendix B to Dkt. No. 1469 (Exhibits 51-101)) (Funk, Hilary) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1547 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 1543 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by Levy Ratner, P.C. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that payment to each compensatory damages claimant that has accepted defendants' Rule 68 offer is approved, in accordance with the terms of the offer that has been previously posted to the docket sheet on behalf of each such claimant, and shall be paid in full satisfaction of all claims by those claimants concerning compensatory damages, except as to attorneys' fees, where applicable, which shall be resolved separately. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/30/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1546 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1545 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1544 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1543 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1542 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1541 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1540 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1539 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1538 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1537 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1536 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1535 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1535 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 12/15/2014 to Judge Garaufis from Devin Darby in regard to the status of the proposed settlement offer. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1534 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1533 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1532 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1531 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1530 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1529 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1528 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1527 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1526 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1525 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1523 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1522 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1521 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1520 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1519 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1518 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1517 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Although the Intent Stipulation involves injunctive relief, and therefore its final approval and entry would bind Injunctive Relief Subclass members, it appears to the court that not all members of that subclass have received notice thereof and an opportunity to object thereto. Accordingly, the court hereby DIRECTS Plaintiff-Intervenors and the City to submit proposals for appropriate next steps by December 1, 2014. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 11/13/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1516 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1515 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1514 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1513 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1512 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1511 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1510 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1509 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1508 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1507 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1506 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1505 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1504 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1503 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1502 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1501 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1500 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1499 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1498 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1497 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1496 Filed: 11/9/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1495 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1494 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1493 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1492 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1491 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1491 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 10/15/2014 to Judge Garaufis from Anthony Hermo re: contesting FDNY exam. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1490 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1490 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs-Intervenors' Response to the City's and Court Monitor's EEO Reports by Vulcan Society (Schwarz, Ghita) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1489 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1488 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1486 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1485 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1484 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1483 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1482 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1481 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1480 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1479 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1478 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1477 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION to Withdraw 1208 Notice of MOTION for Reconsideration re 1194 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, by Roger Gregg, Marcus Haywood, Jamel Nicholson, Candido Nunez, Kevin Simpkins, Vulcan Society, Kevin Walker, Rusebell Wilson. (Levy, Richard) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1475 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1474 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1473 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1472 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 1470 MOTION for Settlement for Final Entry of Proposed Stipulation & Order Resolving Intentional Discrimination Claims filed by Roger Gregg, Marcus Haywood, Jamel Nicholson, Candido Nunez, Kevin Simpkins, Vulcan Society, Kevin Walker, Rusebell Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21) (Levy, Richard) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1471 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1470 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1469 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1468 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1467 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1466 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1465 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1465 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Court Clerk from Royce Corley, Pro Se requesting paper work to join class action. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1464 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1464 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT (Monitor's Recruitment Report to the Court) by Mark S. Cohen (Cohen, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1463 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1463 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Monitor's EEO Report to the Court) by Mark S. Cohen (Cohen, Mark) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1462 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1461 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1460 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 1456 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Motion For Order Requiring City To Pay Interest Due On Claimants' Minimum Employee Pension Contributions Submitted By City of New York filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Abdulaleem, Raheemah) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1459 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 1456 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Motion For Order Requiring City To Pay Interest Due On Claimants' Minimum Employee Pension Contributions filed by Roger Gregg, Marcus Haywood, Jamel Nicholson, Candido Nunez, Kevin Simpkins, Vulcan Society, Kevin Walker, Rusebell Wilson. (Levy, Richard) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1458 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1457 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1456 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1455 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1454 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1453 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1452 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1451 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1450 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1449 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1448 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1447 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Notice(Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1446 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1445 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1444 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1443 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1442 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1441 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Release of Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1440 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1439 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Levy Ratner, P.C. on behalf of 30 individual eligible black non-hire compensatory damages claimants (Attachments: # 1 Offers of Judgment) (Lossia, Dana) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1438 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1436 Motion to Vacate Requirement that the City's Corporation Counsel personally sign all submissions. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/30/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1437 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1433 Motion for Hearing: The parties' Joint Motion for Provisional Entry of the Monetary Relief Consent Decree is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that a Fairness Hearing will be held on October 1, 2014, at 10:00 am in courtroom 4D. The hearing will continue on October 2, 2014, if necessary. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/30/2014. (King, Alyssa) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1436 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION to Vacate requirement that the Corporation Counsel personally sign all of the defendants' written submissions to the Court by City of New York. (Eichenholtz, Eric) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1435 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by United States of America Monetary Relief Consent Decree (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A: Proposed Relief Awards List, # 2 Attachment B: Declaration of Ed Barrero, # 3 Attachment C: Notice Documents, # 4 Attachment D: Cover Letter for Notice Documents, # 5 Attachment E: Notice of Individual Monetary Relief Award, # 6 Attachment F: Acceptance of Individual Monetary Relief Award and Release of Claims) (Swedish, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1434 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 1433 Joint MOTION for Hearing Regarding Monetary Relief Consent Decree filed by United States of America. (Swedish, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1433 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Hearing Regarding Monetary Relief Consent Decree by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Joint Motion for Provisional Entry of Monetary Relief Consent Decree and Scheduling of Fairness Hearing) (Swedish, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1432 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Biesheen Sinclair (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1431 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Lashawn Favors (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1430 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Jomo Thomas (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1429 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Andy Rondon (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1428 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Jeremy Niland (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1427 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Carlos Munroe (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1426 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York Derek Isaac (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1425 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Aswad Hutchins (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1424 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Wayne Hepburn (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1423 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Kievon Harper (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1422 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Paul Dobson (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1421 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Jovis Depognon (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1420 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Darrell Couch (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1419 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Vincent Atkinson (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1418 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Matthew Alexander (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1417 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Richard Antoine (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1416 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 1410 Motion for Release of Funds/Monitor's Thirteenth Statement of Fees & Expenses. Payment approved. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/18/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1415 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and proposed supplemental protective order concerning the confidentiality of certain documents submitted to be "so ordered" by the Court by City of New York (Eichenholtz, Eric) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1414 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter on behalf of all parties providing update regarding Railroad Retirement Board authorizations by United States of America (Swedish, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1413 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 1409 Motion for Release of Funds/Special Masters Twelfth Statement of Fees and Expenses. Payment approved. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/10/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1412 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT (Monitor's Eighth Periodic Report To The Court) by Mark S. Cohen (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A) (Cohen, Mark) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1411 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 1286 Motion for Release of Funds/Special Masters Eleventh Statement of Fees and Expenses. Payment approved. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/3/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1410 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Release of Funds (Monitor's Thirteenth Statement of Fees & Expenses) by Mark S. Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Cohen, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1409 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Release of Funds / Special Masters Twelfth Statement of Fees and Expenses by Hector Gonzalez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Gonzalez, Hector) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1408 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Damion Waite (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1407 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Josh Williams (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1406 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Leanardo Williams (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1405 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Hasaan Watler (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1404 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Keith Walters (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1403 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Lonell Tuddles (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1402 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Varian Townsend (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1401 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Ronald Thomas (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1400 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Renee Smalls (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1399 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Michael Rosendary (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1398 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Jamel Nicholson (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1397 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Anthony Myers (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1396 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for William Miner (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1395 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Robert Miller (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1394 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Ralph Miller (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1393 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Abraham Miller (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1392 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Craig McKissick (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1391 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Louis Kimbrough (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1390 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Anthony Johnson (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1389 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Victor Johnson (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1388 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Kareena James (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1387 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Sean Hunter (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1386 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Philip Hudson (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1385 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Lynell Horry (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1384 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Marcus Haywood (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1383 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Paul Gibbs (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1382 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Benjamin Fields (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1381 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Jean Ductan (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1380 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Jude Diallo (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1379 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Staveus Daley (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1378 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Wayne Cunningham (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1377 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Vaughn Crewe (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1376 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Darius Collins (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1375 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for William Colclaugh (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1374 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Kalena Clark (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1373 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Wilfrid Cedie (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1372 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Vivian Carrington (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1371 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Gavin Billey (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1370 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Derrick Bell (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1369 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter response to DE #1323 from United States of America, Railroad Retirement Board dated 5/16/2014. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1368 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Malik Crawford (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1367 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Sean Foster (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1366 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Caleb Dauphin (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1365 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Brian Wilcox (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1364 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Santwan Washington (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1363 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Grant Valentine (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1362 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Jean Tanis (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1361 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Joseph Singleton (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1360 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Janise Sheriff (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1359 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Jason Shallow (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1358 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for John Sampson (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1357 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Kevon Safe (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1356 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Chaka Rogers (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1355 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Moses Robeson (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1354 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Ferry Robergeau (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1353 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Aisha Ricks (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1352 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Mark Reese (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1351 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Harvey Rabel (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1350 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Coreena Popowitch (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1349 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Brent Perkins (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1348 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Christopher Payne (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1347 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Demetrius Padmore (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1346 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Baron Owens (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1345 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Matthew Montgomery (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1344 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Fredrick Miller (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1343 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Ernest McCoy (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1342 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Devida Lipscombe (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1341 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Walter Lewis (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1340 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Cindy Lawrence (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1339 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Youry Larosiliere (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1338 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Christopher Lambright (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1337 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Reginald Kimbrough (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1336 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Dawar Kermee (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1335 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Edouard Jerome (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1334 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Harry Jean-Baptiste (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1333 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Renald Jean (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1332 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York Daren Hutchinson (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1331 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Stephen Holliday (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1330 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Christopher Hicks (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1329 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Michael Herring (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1328 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Natalie Henderson (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1327 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York for Ian Hemmands (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1326 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 1313 Letter filed by Mark S. Cohen. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/2/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1325 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann:Telephone Conference held on 5/12/2014. Plaintiff requests that, in light of the Railroad Retirement Board's continued objections, the Court vacate or stay Judge Garaufis' order of May 9, 2014. This Court agrees that, if the Railroad Retirement Board files a timely objection to the May 9th order, this Court will stay the compliance deadline. The parties will file a report, by June 17, 2014, on their efforts to obtain the information sought through authorizations. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1324 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION to Consolidate Cases For Purposes of Discovery in Action Nos. 14-cv-1445/14-cv-1090/14-cv-1091 by Michael N. Block, Esq.. (Block, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1323 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The United States Railroad Retirement Board shall produce to counsel for the United States, within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, the following information pertaining to each individual listed in Attachment 1 hereto: (1) Whether the individual worked for a railroad employer that paid into the railroad retirement program; and (2) If so, the amount of that individual's creditable compensation from the railroad employer on an annual basis for the years 2001 through 2011. Any objections to this Order shall be raised before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann no later than seven (7) days following entry of this Order. It is further ORDERED that counsel for the United States may share the information provided by the Railroad Retirement Board with counsel for the other parties in this case and The Garden City Group, the court-appointed claims administrator, but that such information shall be treated as confidential and subject to the Protective Orders previously entered by the court. (See Dkt. Nos. 36, 199, 859.) Finally, the United States is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order and Attachment 1 on the Railroad Retirement Board forthwith. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/9/2014. (As per Chambers - Attachment 1 has not been placed on the docket at the parties' request.) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1322 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1320 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1318 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1317 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1316 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter with Overview of Disparate Treatment Settlement Process by Roger Gregg, Marcus Haywood, Jamel Nicholson, Candido Nunez, Kevin Simpkins, Vulcan Society, Kevin Walker, Rusebell Wilson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Lossia, Dana) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1315 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter on behalf of all parties transmitting overview of Monetary Relief Consent Decree by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Overview of Monetary Relief Consent Decree to be proposed by all parties) (Swedish, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1314 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America. (Ladewski, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1313 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter (Letter Regarding Schedule) by Mark S. Cohen (Cohen, Mark) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1312 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1311 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1310 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1309 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1308 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1307 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1306 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1305 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1304 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1303 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1302 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1301 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1300 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1299 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1298 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1297 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1296 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1295 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1294 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by City of New York (Rubinstein, Yuval) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1293 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 1291 Motion for Settlement/Preliminary Approval. For the reasons set forth below, the court GRANTS preliminary approval of the settlement. In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e) and Section 703(n) of Title VII, the court will conduct a Fairness Hearing regarding the terms of the Plaintiffs-Intervenors' and Defendants' proposed Stipulation and Order settling the intentional discrimination claims. The Fairness Hearing shall be held at a date to be determined in a future order of the court in consultation with the parties. That order will also include a detailed notice plan. (See document for complete detail.) So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/23/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1292 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 1288 Motion for Release of Funds - Monitor's Twelfth Statement of Fees and Expenses. Payment approved. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1291 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval by Roger Gregg, Marcus Haywood, Jamel Nicholson, Candido Nunez, Kevin Simpkins, Vulcan Society, Kevin Walker, Rusebell Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order as to Notice of Settlement, Objection Form and Fairness Hearing) (Lossia, Dana) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1288 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Release of Funds (Monitor's Twelfth Statement of Fees and Expenses) by Mark S. Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Cohen, Mark) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1287 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter concerning timeline for compensatory damages claims by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Fire Department of the City of New York, New York City Department of Citywide Administrative Services, Nicholas Scoppetta (Pestana, Georgia) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1286 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Release of Funds / Special Masters Eleventh Statement of Fees and Expenses by Hector Gonzalez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Gonzalez, Hector) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1285 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 1284 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric Bachman terminated. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/20/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1284 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Eric Bachman) by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bachman, Eric) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1283 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Jay Eichenholtz on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Eichenholtz, Eric) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1282 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The court has received Judge Dearie's Order referring supervision of the settlement of Plaintiffs' disparate treatment claim to Judge Garaufis. (Mar. 18,2014, Order, No. 13-CV-3123 (Dkt. 21).) The court accepts Judge Dearie's referral and thanks the Judge for his efforts in the case. Any filings related to the disparate treatment case shall be filed on both dockets. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/18/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1281 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter regarding settlement of disparate treatment claim by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Fire Department of the City of New York, New York City Department of Citywide Administrative Services, Nicholas Scoppetta (Pestana, Georgia) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1280 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT (Monitor's Seventh Periodic Report to the Court) by Mark S. Cohen (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A) (Cohen, Mark) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1279 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1277 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 1275 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Court Monitor Cohen's Report and Recommendation, Docket Entry 1274. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/24/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1276 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 1270 Motion for Release of Funds/Special Master's Tenth Statement of Fees and Expenses. Payment approved. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/19/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1275 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to R & R (Dkt 1274) by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Fire Department of the City of New York, New York City Department of Citywide Administrative Services, Nicholas Scoppetta. (Pestana, Georgia) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1274 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter (Monitor's Recommendation Concerning Requests for Consultants' Documents) by Mark S. Cohen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (Cohen, Mark) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 1267 Letter Requesting Modification of Schedule for Upcoming Reports filed by Mark S. Cohen. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/28/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1270 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Tenth MOTION for Release of Funds Special Master's Tenth Statement of Fees and Expenses by Hector Gonzalez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Gonzalez, Hector) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1269 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The court GRANTS IN PART Plaintiff-Intervenors' Application for Expert Fees and Costs. Scott+ Scott is awarded a total of $198,715.11; Levy Ratner is awarded a total of$5,856.00, and CCR is awarded a total of $33,642.00. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/24/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1268 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Opposition to Defendants' Objections to the Court Monitor's Recommendations Regarding Discovery filed by Roger Gregg, Marcus Haywood, Jamel Nicholson, Candido Nunez, Kevin Simpkins, Vulcan Society, Kevin Walker, Rusebell Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Young, Chauniqua) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1267 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter (Letter Requesting Modification of Schedule for Upcoming Reports) by Mark S. Cohen (Cohen, Mark) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 381 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?