Brown v. Clayton et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00714-JCH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 12:17 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GEORGE BROWN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Sally A. Roberts, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sally A. Roberts +1 860 384 6701 +1 860 920 5233 sallyroberts@SallyRobertsLegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Carl Bergquist, Defendant
No Logo Edward Rivera, Defendant
No Logo Gregory Iamartino, Defendant
No Logo Ivan J. Clayton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Bridgeport

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Betsy A. Ingraham +1 203 576 7647 +1 203 576 8252 betsy.ingraham@bridgeportct.gov
Space Richard G. Kascak, Jr. +1 203 452 9077 +1 203 452 9087 richard.kascak@bridgeportct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Bridgeport, Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur C. Laske, III +1 203 576 7647 +1 203 576 8252 acl@laskelaw.com
No Logo Jose Bahr, Defendant
No Logo Miguel Perez, Defendant
No Logo Ricardo Vargas, Defendant
No Logo Walberto Cotto, Jr., Defendant
No Logo William Simpson, Defendant
No Logo Sally A Roberts, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Geraghty & Bonnano, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dubois +1 860 447 8077 +1 860 447 9833 mdubois@geraghtybonnano.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (216) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
    Acknowledgment of Receipt re: 215 Letter Dated 7/30/2014 Re: plaintiff's exhibits returned Acknowledgment filed by George Brown. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Status Conference held on 5/21/2014. 15 minutes. FINDING as MOOT defendants' Motion for Hearing and Briefing Schedule Regarding Attorney Sanctions 205 based on the report that the parties' have resolved the issues. The resolution will be reflected in a future docket entry. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Dubois on behalf of Sally A Roberts (Dubois, Mark) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 4/21/14 Status Conference set for 5/21/2014 10:30 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Once the parties are on the line, please contact chambers at 203 579-5640. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 209 Attorney Sally Brown's MOTION to Continue telephone conference for 4/21/2014, to obtain representation in this case. The telephone conference is rescheduled to May 21, 2014 at 10:30AM. Once the parties are on the line, please contact chambers at 203 579-5640. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 4/17/14. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Continue telephone conference for for 4/21/2014 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Fitzsimmons by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 205 MOTION for Hearing and Briefing Schedule Regarding Attorney Sanctions Order to the extent that a telephone status conference will be held on April 21, 2014 at 1:00PM. Once the parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at 203 579-5640. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 4/14/14. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 4/21/2014 01:00 PM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. The Court will hear the parties on setting a briefing schedule for defendants' Motion for Sanctions. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for motion including 205 MOTION for Hearing and Briefing Schedule Regarding Attorney Sanctions Order SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/14/2014.Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Lewis, D) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Hearing and Briefing Schedule Regarding Attorney Sanctions Order by Ivan J. Clayton. (Laske, Arthur) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                              ORDER allowing 203 Bill of Costs filed by Ivan J. Clayton in the amount of $1,353.30. Signed by Clerk on 2/27/2014.(Thomas, D.) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                BILL OF COSTS by Ivan J. Clayton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                  JUDGMENT entered in favor of Ivan J. Clayton against George Brown and the case is closed.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 1/9/2014.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 201 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                    JURY VERDICT For Defendant Clayton Against Plaintiff Brown. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                      Marked Court Exhibit List.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                        Marked Exhibit and Witness List. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Jury Trial completed on 1/7/2014. Total Time: 3 hours and 23 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Jury Selection and Jury Trial held on 1/6/2014; Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2014, granting in part and denying in part as stated on the record 101 Motion in Limine; withdrawing as moot 192 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 193 Motion in Limine; Jury Trial Continued Until 1/7/2014. Total Time: 5 hours and 56 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                              REPLY to Response to 193 MOTION in Limine Moton in Limine re Demonstration Supplemental Reply filed by George Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, MIL re live demonstration, Methvin)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                REPLY to Response to 193 MOTION in Limine Moton in Limine re Demonstration filed by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE re 193 MOTION in Limine Moton in Limine re Demonstration filed by Ivan J. Clayton. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION in Limine Moton in Limine re Demonstration by George Brown.Responses due by 1/9/2014 (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct motion to amend exhibit list, brown by George Brown.Responses due by 1/9/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, use of force continuum)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        RULING with regard to the Issue of the scope of Plaintiff's Testimony re 137 Trial Memo filed by George Brown Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/11/2013.(Malone, P.) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: granting 84 Motion in Limine absent objection; granting 86 Motion in Limine without prejudice to reconsider after direct examination; granting 87 Motion in Limine; denying 88 Motion in Limine; denying 99 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion in Limine as stated on the record. Pretrial Conference held on 12/9/2013. Total Time: 1 hour and 14 minutes. (Court Reporter T. Fidanza.) (Johnson, T) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2013 has been changed to 11:30 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 187 MOTION to Continue Time of Pretrial Conference to 11:30 a.m. by George Brown. The settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Fitzsimmons, in a different civil case, has been moved to 2:00 pm. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2013. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Continue Time of Pretrial Conference to 11:30 a.m. by George Brown. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  RULING denying 164 Motion to Reverse the Order of Magistrate Judge and Motion to Extend Scheduling Order. AFFIRMING Magistrate Judge's 162 Ruling on Motion in Limine and Motion to Extend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/4/2013. (Malone, P.) Modified on 12/13/2013 (Lewis, D). (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 12/9/2013 at 11:00 a.m. Pretrial Conference has been changed to 12/9/2013 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2013 has been changed to 09:15 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall (Johnson, T) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Supplemental Memorandum in Support re 164 MOTION Reverse Order of Magistrate Judge re 162 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by George Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, Ds Obj trial memo in Smith v Bridgeport, # 2 Exhibit Ex B, Motion for Sanctions filed in Smith v Bridgeport, # 3 Exhibit Ex C, Oliphant MIL Preclude P from Claiming Damages, # 4 Exhibit Ex D, Treating physician as fact witness, Ochoa, # 5 Exhibit Ex E, Lamere v. N.Y. State Office for the Aging, 223 F.R.D. 85, 89, (N.D.N.Y 2004))(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 11/28/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 181 Motion to Continue. The Pretrial Conference has been rescheduled for 9:15am on 12/9/13. Counsel in Bryans v. Cossette will receive a new calendar rescheduling the settlement conference for noon. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/26/2013. (Johnson, T) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Continue rescheduled pretrial due to a conflict with Bryans v. Cossette, 3:11-cv-01263 (JCH) by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting in part 178 Motion to Continue. The pre-trial conference will be held on 12/9/2013 at 11:00 a.m.. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/26/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE re 178 MOTION to Continue pretrial until January 6th, immediately after jury selection filed by Ivan J. Clayton. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Continue pretrial until January 6th, immediately after jury selection by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 100 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony & Evidence Supplemental Response filed by George Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, Ruling on MSJ, Pommer v Vaughn)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPLY to Response to 100 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony & Evidence filed by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 99 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Ds Expert Martin filed by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 86 MOTION in Limine re Unrelated Acts filed by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 87 MOTION in Limine re Plaintiff's Arrest filed by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 101 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Convictions filed by George Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, Ruling on MIL re prior convictions, Rivard)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 88 MOTION in Limine Re Plaintiff's Expert Witness Richard Siena filed by George Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, Richard Siena CV 08.22.2013, # 2 Exhibit Ex B, Siena expert report)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  OBJECTION re 101 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Convictions filed by Ivan J. Clayton. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    OBJECTION re 100 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony & Evidence filed by Ivan J. Clayton. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      OBJECTION re 99 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Ds Expert Martin filed by Ivan J. Clayton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Expert Report of Thomas Martin)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 165 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, 164 MOTION Reverse Order of Magistrate Judge re 162 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Ivan J. Clayton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/14/2013. 15 minutes (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Supplemental Memorandum in Support re 164 MOTION Reverse Order of Magistrate Judge re 162 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by George Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit Ex A, Dr. Eric Katz Supp Report 7.21,2013, # 3 Exhibit Ex B, Williams v. Raimo, # 4 Exhibit Ex C, Vosburgh v. Bourassa, # 5 Exhibit Ex D, Valanzuolo v. New Haven, # 6 Exhibit Ex E, Eslin v Housing Authority, # 7 Exhibit Ex F, Barack et al v. American Honda Motor Co., # 8 Exhibit Ex G, Williams v. Regus Mgmt. Group, # 9 Exhibit Ex H, Franz v. New England Disposal Technologies)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 09/08/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MOTION Reverse Order of Magistrate Judge re 162 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Extension of Time by George Brown.Responses due by 9/21/2013 (Williams, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2013: # 1 REPLACEMENT OCR SEARCHABLE PDF) (Torrenti, R.). (Entered: 08/31/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 144 MOTION for Order by Ivan J. Clayton. Motion is granted to the extent that any Rule 11 or other sanctions motion, to the extent such motion is directed at conduct other than the signing of the Complaint, shall be filed after trial or other disposition on the merits. Defense counsel may move to file any such motion at an earlier time upon a showing of need or prejudice from the delay. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/21/2013. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 85 Motion in Limine; denying 132 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 8/20/13. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/16/2013. 15 minutes. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      RULING granting 158 Motion for Clarification. A telephone conference was held on 8/14/13. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 8/15/13. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Status Conference set for 8/14/2013 10:15 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons to address Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification and Motion for Scheduling Order. Once the parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at 203 579-5640. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Clarification 157 Order,, by George Brown. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/11/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER for Status Report re 132 plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time filed by George Brown. A telephone conference was held on July 18, 2013 regarding plaintiff's request to extend the scheduling order to disclose additional medical experts. During the conference call, plaintiff's counsel agreed to report back the following week. To date, no report has been filed. Accordingly, plaintiff will file a status report by the close of business 8/14/13. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 8/8/13.(Esposito, A.) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ExParte Document by George Brown Response to OSC. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER re Motions in Limine (Doc. Nos. 84 , 86 , 87 , 88 , 99 , 100 , and 101 ). The court modifies the Pretrial Order Addendum to require opposition to any Motion in Limine must be filed by 10/30/2013. Motion in Limine Nos. 84,86,87,88,99,100 & 101 are restored as pending to the docket and the Orders concerning these Motions are vacated. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/29/2013.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  proposed Exhibit List Dr. Katz Supplemental Report by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 101 Motion in Limine, upon review and absent objection. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/25/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 100 Motion in Limine upon review and absent objection the evidence and testimony which is the subject of this motion. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/25/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 99 Motion in Limine upon review and absent objection. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/25/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion in Limine. Granted in part upon review and absent objection. Plaintiff's expert's testimony is limited to opinions disclosed in his report. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/25/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for motion including 144 MOTION for Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/24/2013.Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/23/2013.(Lewis, D) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2013: # 1 Exhibit) (Lewis, D). Modified on 7/24/2013 (Lewis, D). (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/18/2013. 12 minutes (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 132 MOTION for Extension of Time Scheduling Order filed by George Brown. (Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 143 Reply to Response to 85 MOTION in Limine, filed by George Brown. (Williams, John) Modified on 7/18/2013 to add link to motion and edit text. (Torrenti, R.). (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order by Ivan J. Clayton. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 85 MOTION in Limine re Medical Testimony and Exhibits filed by Ivan J. Clayton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental OBJECTION re 132 MOTION for Extension of Time Sceduling Order, 137 Trial Memo filed by Ivan J. Clayton. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 7/18/2013 at 10:15 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons re: 85 MOTION in Limine re: Medical Testimony and Exhibits; 132 MOTION for Extension of Time Scheduling Order. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5640. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 85 MOTION in Limine re Medical Testimony and Exhibits filed by George Brown. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for motion including 85 MOTION in Limine re Medical Testimony and Exhibits SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/3/2013.Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for motion including 132 MOTION for Extension of Time Scheduling Order SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/3/2013.Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL MEMO by George Brown Estimated trial time 3-4 days. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dr Katz Report & CV, # 2 Exhibit Dr Gross Report & CV, # 3 Exhibit Siena Report & CV)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 06/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting absent objection 84 MOTION in Limine re Evidence About the Bridgeport Police Department by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. Motion is granted as to members of the Bridgeport Police Department other than defendant, Police Officer Clayton, or the date in question. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/28/2013. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting absent objection 86 Motion in Limine based on review of the pretrial memorandum that no such evidence described is being offered by plaintiff. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/27/13. (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting absent objection 87 Motion in Limine based on review of the pretrial memorandum that suggests plaintiff is not offering such evidence. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/27/13. (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION re 132 MOTION for Extension of Time Sceduling Order filed by Ivan J. Clayton. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time Sceduling Order by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Selection set for 1/6/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2013 04:00 PM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Selection set for 1/6/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Please read and comply with the attached notice. (Lewis, D) Modified on 6/13/2013 (Lewis, D). (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Calendar Call held on 6/7/2013, J/S set for 1/6/14, trial to be scheduled for late January, calendar will issue. ( Jury Selection set for 1/6/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall). 9 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Richard G. Kascak, Jr on behalf of Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas (Kascak, Richard) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting absent objection 115 MOTION to Withdraw Docket Nos. 110, 109, 80, 75, 71-1, 39, 36, and 34.. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/5/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 113 Motion to Amend/Correct. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/30/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Calendar Call set for 6/7/2013 12:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Please read and comply with the attached notice. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of George Brown (Williams, John) (Entered: 05/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 120 Motion to Continue; granting 122 Motion to Continue. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/21/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental MOTION to Continue Calendar Call by George Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, Docket Sheet, Bonelo 5.20.2013)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION re 120 MOTION to Continue Calendar Call filed by Ivan J. Clayton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue Calendar Call by George Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, Docket Sheet, Bonelo 5.17.2013)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 5/3/2013. Calendar Call has been changed to 5/23/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT from Defendant by Ivan J. Clayton. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 4/29/2013. Calendar Call has been changed to 5/3/2013 12:30 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 114 Motion to Continue. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/24/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw Docket Nos. 110, 109, 80, 75, 71-1, 39, 36, and 34. by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue the Calendar Call scheduled for April 29, 2013 by Ivan J. Clayton. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket No. 108.00, Motion for Order, by Ivan J. Clayton.Responses due by 5/14/2013 (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED RULING 108 Granting defendants' Motion for Order; 109 denying plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. See Ruling attached. The Clerk of the Court will place the following documents under seal: 34, 71, 75, 80; 108 attachment 1; 109 Memorandum in Support with exhibits, 110. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 4/22/13.(Esposito, A.) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 108 defendants' Motion for Order; denying 109 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. See the ruling attached. The Clerk of the Court will place document nos. 34, 71, 75 and 80 under seal. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 4/22/13. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re 103 Order by George Brown.Responses due by 5/13/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Blough, B.) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order re Docket 103.00 by Ivan J. Clayton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULING granting 74 Motion to Quash Subpoena Dues Tecum to Markle Investigations; and granting 74 Motion for Protective Order Re: Deposition Notice. The Court has reviewed in camera the investigation file of Markle Investigative Services. The file contains no signed sworn statements from eye witnesses and there are no photographs. The file contains the investigators interview notes in both typed and handwritten form. There is no indication that the witnesses either reviewed or adopted the investigators description of what they said to him. Here, Attorney Riccio avers that he retained Markle Investigative Services to conduct private investigative services relating to plaintiff George Brown and he is asserting attorney work product privilege. Defendants cite no authority exempting an investigators notes from the attorney work product privilege and have not made a strong showing of necessity and unavailability. See Upjohn Co. v. U.S., 449 U.S. 383, 402 (1981) (work product based on oral statements requires a far stronger showing of necessity and unavailability... to compel disclosure.). Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 4/17/13. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Calendar Call set for 4/29/2013 12:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Please read and comply with the attached notice. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: Counsel and Pro Se Litigants are reminded that Joint Status Reports are due every 90 days unless a Motion for Summary Judgment has been filed or the case is set for trial. A Joint Status Report was last filed in this case on 7/12/2012. Counsel must file a Joint Status Report within 14 days of this Notice. (Status Report due 4/26/2013) Failure to file by this deadline may result in sanctions against counsel for failure to comply with the courts Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/12/2013.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER taking under advisement 74 Motion to Quash until after an in camera review of the documents responsive to the Markle Investigations Inc. subpoena dated January 24, 2013. The documents will be submitted to the Court within seven days; taking under advisement 74 Motion for Protective Order; denying 75 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 4/8/13. (Esposito, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER taking under advisement 74 Motion to Quash until after an in camera review of the documents responsive to the Markle Investigations Inc. subpoena dated January 24, 2013. The documents will be submitted to the Court within seven days; taking under advisement 74 Motion for Protective Order; denying 75 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 4/8/13. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER regarding attorney conduct. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 4/9/13.(Esposito, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION re 95 Trial Memo filed by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Preclude Convictions by George Brown.Responses due by 3/27/2013 (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony & Evidence by George Brown.Responses due by 3/27/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Preclude Ds Expert Martin by George Brown.Responses due by 3/27/2013 (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Verdict Form by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL MEMO Plaintiff's by George Brown Estimated trial time 2-3 days. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 over objection plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to comply with the Court's Pretrial Order. Plaintiff will file a Pretrial Memorandum by 3/7/13. Plaintiff's request for a thirty day extension is denied. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 2/21/13. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Discovery Conference held on 2/21/2013. Total Time: 2 hours and 5 minutes (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION re 71 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION re 75 MOTION to Compel discovery from Ivan Clayton filed by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur C. Laske, III on behalf of Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas (Laske, Arthur) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REMINDER: The deadline for submitting an agenda for the February 21, 2013 Discovery Conference is due by the close of business February 19, 2013. The agenda may be submitted by e-mail to: alyssa_esposito@ctd.uscourts.gov (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine Re Plaintiff's Expert Witness Richard Siena by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas.Responses due by 3/7/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine re Plaintiff's Arrest by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas.Responses due by 3/7/2013 (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine re Unrelated Acts by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas.Responses due by 3/7/2013 (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine re Medical Testimony and Exhibits by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas.Responses due by 3/7/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine re Evidence About the Bridgeport Police Department by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas.Responses due by 3/7/2013 (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRIAL MEMO by Defendants by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas Estimated trial time 3 days. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for motion including 80 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after ruling by Magistrate Fitzsimmons filing of JTM, SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/14/2013.Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Lewis, D) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION re 80 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after ruling by Magistrate Fitzsimmons filing of JTM filed by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 2/7/13 Hearing on Pending Discovery Issues set for 2/21/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. The parties will submit an agenda with supporting documents to Chambers by February 19, 2013. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Walberto Cotto, Jr. Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, Robert E. Simpson and Ricardo Vargas by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, George Brown, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER withdrawing 71 Motion to Quash; withdrawing 71 Motion for Protective Order; withdrawing 73 Motion to Quash; withdrawing 73 Motion for Protective Order. Motion to Quash/Protective Order 74 is the operative motion. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 2/5/13. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for Motions including 71 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order, 74 MOTION to Quash replacement memo pdf MOTION for Protective Order, 73 MOTION to Quash with replacement Riccio Affidavit MOTION for Protective Order, 75 MOTION to Compel discovery from Ivan Clayton. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/5/2013. Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel discovery from Ivan Clayton by George Brown.Responses due by 2/26/2013 (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Quash replacement memo pdf, MOTION for Protective Order by George Brown.Responses due by 2/25/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support replacement pdf)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash with replacement Riccio Affidavit, MOTION for Protective Order by George Brown.Responses due by 2/25/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support & Exhibits 1 - 6, # 2 Affidavit replacement pdf)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing on Pending Discovery motions set for 2/7/2013 04:30 PM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. The parties will provide an agenda for the conference on 2/6/13 and append any documents that will be referenced during oral argument. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for conference. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/2/2013. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. All parties are advised that 68 Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/4/2013 09:30 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall, has been CANCELED. A revised calendar entry will follow. (Mar, Stephen) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/4/2013 09:30 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. Counsel shall coordinate this conference call. Once all parties are on the line, please telephone chambers at (203) 773-2428. (Mar, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 66 Motion for Conference. A calendar entry will follow. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/27/2012. (Mar, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Discovery Conference by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: COUNSEL AND PRO SE LITIGANTS ARE HEREBY ADVISED THAT EFFECTIVE SEPTEMBER 19, 2012, ALL COURT PROCEEDINGS BEFORE JUDGE JANET C. HALL PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED IN BRIDGEPORT CONNECTICUT, WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 1, 141 CHURCH STREET, NEW HAVEN, CONNECTICUT. PARTIES REQUESTED TO PARTICIPATE IN TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES ON OR AFTER SEPTEMBER 19, 2012, SHOULD TELEPHONE CHAMBERS AT (203) 773-2427. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.. Signed by Clerk on 9/12/2012. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 62 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/20/2012. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Entry Correction re 62 Interim MOTION for Disbursement of Funds under LR 83 for pro bono counsel expenses. Replacement pdf was added because the original pdf (Certificate of Service) was unsigned. (Torrenti, R.) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Interim MOTION for Disbursement of Funds under LR 83 for pro bono counsel expenses by George Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Roberts, Sally) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2012: # 2 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Torrenti, R.). (Entered: 08/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/13/12. (Lienke, J) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/14/2012 Scheduling Order by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, George Brown, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 57 Motion for Extension of Time for failure to state good cause. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/9/2012. (Lienke, J) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER finding as moot 56 Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/9/2012. (Lienke, J) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/14/2012 expert deposition schedule 56 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/14/2012 Expert deposition schedule by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/14/2012 Expert deposition schedule by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULING on Pending Discovery Motions denying 34 Motion for Sanctions; denying 36 Motion for Sanctions; granting 48 Motion to Compel; denying 48 Motion to Preclude. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 7/31/12. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, George Brown, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for 48 MOTION to Compel Expert Disclosures. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/11/2012. Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Blough, B.) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          "ENTERED IN ERROR" ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for 48 Motion to Compel Expert Disclosures. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/10/2012. Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(Blough, B.) Modified on 7/10/2012 (Blough, B.). (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER finding as moot 35 Motion for Protective Order in light of the parties' representation that the motion is resolved and the deposition was held on June 6, 2012 without issue. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 7/5/12. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 48 MOTION to Compel Expert Disclosures filed by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER terminating as moot 45 Motion for Cost and Fees; granting in part 46 SEALED MOTION to Incur CJA Expenses by George Brown Request for Authorization of Litigation Expenses under LR 83.10(f). The court authorizes up to $3,500. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/11/2012. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Expert Disclosures by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas.Responses due by 6/27/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Motion Hearing held on 5/31/2012taking under advisement 34 Motion for Sanctions; taking under advisement 35 Motion for Protective Order; taking under advisement 36 Motion for Sanctions. 30 minutes(Court Reporter Torrenti.) (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION to Incur CJA Expenses by George Brown Request for Authorization of Litigation Expenses under LR 83.10(f). (Roberts, Sally) Modified on 5/30/2012 TO CORRECT MOTION RELIEF (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Cost and Fees re litigation costs under Local Rule 83.10(f) by George Brown.Responses due by 6/19/2012 (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REMINDER: This case is scheduled for a hearing on discovery motions on THURSDAY, May 31, 2012 at 10AM. The parties are directed to provide to the Court a letter, not to exceed 2 pages, double spaced, which identifies and describes the issues presented by this Motion, together with the relief sought, and the basis or rationale on which you seek this relief. The letter is due 3 days before the hearing. Counsel are encouraged to discuss the issues in advance in an effort to resolve the motions or to narrow the issues in dispute. Agreements will be heard first. Please report to the courtroom deputy prior to the opening of court to let her know which issues are still outstanding. There are 10 cases and 22 motions currently on the calendar. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 42 MOTION for Extension of Time of the Scheduling Order by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/21/2012. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time of the Scheduling Order by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing re: 34 MOTION for Sanctions, 35 MOTION for Protective Order and 36 MOTION for Sanctions set for 5/31/2012 at 10:00 AM Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED DISCOVERY HEARING INSTRUCTIONS. THERE ARE 7 CASES AND 16 MOTIONS CURRENTLY ON THE CALENDAR FOR 5/31/2012. COUNSEL ARE ENCOURAGED TO DISCUSS THE PENDING MATTERS IN AN ATTEMPT TO NARROW THE ISSUES IN DISPUTE. COUNSEL SHALL REPORT TO THE COURTROOM DEPUTY PRIOR TO THE OPENING OF COURT WHICH ISSUES ARE STILL OUTSTANDING. THE COURT WILL HEAR AGREEMENTS FIRST.(Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for Motion and Conference regarding discovery dispute including 35 MOTION for Protective Order re Ernest Brown's Deposition & Application of Attorney-Client Privilege and Work Product Privilege, 36 MOTION for Sanctions Exhibit A, Transcript of Ivan Clayton Deposition, 34 MOTION for Sanctions as to Attorney Betsy Edwards. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/9/2012. Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 37 Objection, re Motion for Sanctions filed by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. Attorney Sally Roberts is ordered to cease emailing documents to the court's law clerks. Any communications shall be in the form of a pleading, filed on the court's docket. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/9/2012. (Lienke, J) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION re 36 MOTION for Sanctions Exhibit A, Transcript of Ivan Clayton Deposition, 34 MOTION for Sanctions as to Attorney Betsy Edwards filed by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I)(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Sanctions Exhibit A, Transcript of Ivan Clayton Deposition by George Brown.Responses due by 5/29/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order re Ernest Brown's Deposition & Application of Attorney-Client Privilege and Work Product Privilege by George Brown.Responses due by 5/27/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 05/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by George Brown, Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas . (Roberts, Sally) Modified on 4/12/2012 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 31 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 20, 2011 Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure by George Brown. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/28/2012. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until May 20, 2011 Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 29 MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days Scheduling Order by George Brown. Motion is denied as it appears unnecessary. The deadline for discovery is currently 7/15/2012. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/26/2012. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days Scheduling Order by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot 25 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/24/2012. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION re 25 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to all Defendants filed by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson.(Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to all Defendants by George Brown. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 23 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 10, 2012 by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/23/2012. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until March 10, 2012 by Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas. (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER re: 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 7/15/2012 Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2012 Status Report due by 4/12/2012 Trial Brief due by 8/15/2012. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/12/2012. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/30/2011. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Sally A. Roberts on behalf of George Brown (Roberts, Sally) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Attorney Roberts is appointed pro bono counsel. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/29/2011. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Appointing Counsel: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.10, Attorney Sally A. Roberts is appointed as Pro Bono Counsel for plaintiff George Brown. Counsel is directed to contact plaintiff and file an appearance as soon as possible. A copy of this Order will be sent to plaintiff via United States Mail. Signed by Clerk on 12/29/11. (Earle, C.) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy Edwards on behalf of Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas (Edwards, Betsy) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 14 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 1/27/2012. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to Rule 41(b) FRCP. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/28/2011. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Ivan J. Clayton, Carl Bergquist, Edward Rivera, Ricardo Vargas, Walberto Cotto, Jr., Miguel Perez, Jose Bahr, Gregory Iamartino and William Simpson by George Brown. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel by George Brown. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Walberto Cotto, Jr waiver sent on 10/21/2011, answer due 12/20/2011; Carl Bergquist waiver sent on 10/21/2011, answer due 12/20/2011; Miguel Perez waiver sent on 10/21/2011, answer due 12/20/2011; Gregory Iamartino waiver sent on 10/21/2011, answer due 12/20/2011; Ivan J. Clayton waiver sent on 10/21/2011, answer due 12/20/2011; Jose Bahr waiver sent on 10/21/2011, answer due 12/20/2011; Edward Rivera waiver sent on 10/21/2011, answer due 12/20/2011; William Simpson waiver sent on 10/21/2011, answer due 12/20/2011; Ricardo Vargas waiver sent on 10/21/2011, answer due 12/20/2011 filed by George Brown (REPLACING DOC #11). (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of copies of Complaints, Notices and Waivers Executed upon Defendants; Acknowledgment filed by George Brown. (Brown, S.) Modified on 12/2/2011 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 9 MOTION for Extension of Time 60 Days in order for the defendants to be served by George Brown. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/22/2011. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time 60 Days in order for the defendants to be served. by George Brown. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RE-ISSUED USM 285 forms together with Summons/Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons OPTD, Standing Protective Order, Consent to Electronic Notice, Motion by Pro Se Litigant to participate in Electronic Filing and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, OPTD, Standing Protective Order, 1 Copy of the Complaint, Consent to Electronic Notice, Motion by Pro Se Litigant to participate in Electronic Filing and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 5/6/11. (Esposito, A.) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for Motion including 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/5/2011. Motions referred to Holly B. Fitzsimmons(DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/2/2011. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/2/2011. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2011. Discovery due by 11/1/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2011. Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2011. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Brown. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULING on Pending Discovery Motions denying 34 Motion for Sanctions; denying 36 Motion for Sanctions; granting 48 Motion to Compel; denying 48 Motion to Preclude. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 7/31/12. (Esposito, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Jose Bahr, Carl Bergquist, Ivan J. Clayton, Walberto Cotto, Jr, Gregory Iamartino, Miguel Perez, Edward Rivera, William Simpson, Ricardo Vargas, filed by George Brown.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?