Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated v. Bosley et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-02112-DGC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 12:42 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Walker & Peskind PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles W Jirauch +1 480 483 6336 +1 480 483 6337 cwj@azlawpartner.com
Space Richard K Walker +1 480 483 6336 +1 480 483 6337 rkw@azlawpartner.com
v.
No Logo Bashas', Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Bashas' Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Abraham +1 602 234 9917 +1 602 234 0341 aabraham@bcattorneys.com
Space Ralph D Harris +1 602 234 8758 +1 602 234 0341 rharris@bcattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mesch Clark & Rothschild PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael William McGrath +1 520 624 8886 +1 520 798 1037 mmcgrath@mcrazlaw.com
Space Cassandra Blythe Meynard +1 520 624 8886 +1 520 798 1037 cmeynard@mcrazlaw.com
Space Isaac Daniel Rothschild +1 520 624 8886 +1 520 798 1037 irothschild@mcrazlaw.com
No Logo Bosley Group Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Bruce C Bosley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Joanne M Bosley, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (203) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Errata re 187 Reply to Response to Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Defendants Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
    TEXT-ONLY ORDER the pending motions for extensions of time 182 188 189 are granted and the subject documents are deemed timely filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KMG) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 190 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Motion for Additional Time to File Its Reply Re: Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Bashas' Incorporated. Description of deficiency: Document entered in wrong case. Please see PDF for full details. (KMG) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
        REPLY to Response to Motion re 174 First MOTION for New Trial filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Jirauch, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
          REPLY to Response to Motion re 173 Second MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jirauch, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial - Day 6 Proceedings held on 4/23/2013, before Judge Frederic Block. Court Reporter Merilyn A. Sanchez. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2013. (VAR) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day Five Proceedings held on 4/22/2013, before Judge Frederic Block. Court Reporter Linda Schroeder. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2013. (VPB) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day Four Proceedings held on 4/19/2013, before Judge Frederic Block. Court Reporter Linda Schroeder. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2013. (VPB) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 3 Proceedings held on 4/18/2013, before Judge Frederic Block. Court Reporter Linda Schroeder. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2013. (VPB) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 2 Proceedings held on 4/17/2013, before Judge Frederic Block. Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2013. (VPB) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day One Proceedings held on 4/16/2013, before Judge Frederic Block. Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2013. (VPB) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                        *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Motion for Additional Time to File Its Reply Re: Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Bashas' Incorporated. (Harris, Ralph) *Document entered in wrong case; Attorney notified on 7/8/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                          *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 174 First MOTION for New Trial by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Jirauch, Charles) *Modified to remove document relationship on 6/28/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                            *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 173 Second MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Jirauch, Charles) *Modified to remove document relationship on 6/28/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 172 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                *REPLY to Response to Motion re 171 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Sanctions filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) *Duplicate entry as doc.#185, attorney notified on 6/18/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 171 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Sanctions filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 174 First MOTION for New Trial filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 173 Second MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                        *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses and Replies re 171 , 172 , 173 , 174 by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Onofry, Charles) *Modified to include document relationship on 6/7/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Errata Regarding Its Response to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Plaintiff Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Jirauch, Charles) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                            *RESPONSE to Motion re 172 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B & C)(Jirauch, Charles) *Modified to correct event on 6/3/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                              TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 178 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion is hereby GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall have to and including May 31, 2013, to file its Response to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 172 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Jirauch, Charles) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                  TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 175 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion is hereby GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall have to and including May 29, 2013, to file its Response to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 171 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Sanctions filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 172 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jirauch, Charles) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                        First MOTION for New Trial by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Second MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-12)(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees , MOTION for Sanctions by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Bruce C Bosley for proceedings held on 4/16/2013-4/23/2013 before Judge Frederic Block.. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  CLERK'S JUDGMENT- IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Jury's Verdict filed April 23, 2013, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing and this action is hereby terminated. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Minute Order: ORDERED that the exhibits marked and/or admitted in the above entitled case at the time of the Jury Trial are returned to respective counsel on April 23, 2013. Counsel are directed to retain custody of the exhibits until the case is completely terminated, including all appeals. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 167 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      JURY VERDICT. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Witness List by Bashas' Incorporated, Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated, Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Exhibit List by Bashas' Incorporated, Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Exhibit List by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated.(LFIG) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Jury Notes/Questions (public document). (LFIG) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Exhibit List for Jury Deliberations. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Jury Instructions. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Jury Trial completed on 4/23/2013. The Clerk's Office is directed to enter judgment accordingly. (Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez.) Hearing held 1:26 PM to 1:33 PM.(CLB) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Jury Trial (Day #5) held on 4/22/2013. IT IS ORDERED denying the 154 157 Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Jury trial to reconvene on April 23, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 10:06 AM to 4:19 PM.(CLB) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE re Service of Trial Subpoena by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          First MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated for proceedings held on 04/19/2013 before Judge Frederic Block.. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF No. 2 Re: (1) Architectual Works and (2) License Defense by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Jury Trial (Day Four) held on 04/19/13. Trial continues on 04/22/13 at 10:00 AM. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 10:01 a.m. to 4:54 p.m. (NKS) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Jury Trial (Day Three) held on 04/18/13. Trial continues on 04/19/13 at 10:00 AM. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 10:02 a.m. to 5:00 p.m. (NKS) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Jury Trial (Day Two) held on 04/17/13. Trial continues on 04/18/13 at 10:00 AM. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez.) Hearing held 10:02 a.m. to 4:43 p.m. (NKS) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Jury Trial (Day One) held on 04/16/13. Trial continues on 04/17/13 at 10:00 AM. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez.) Hearing held 10:02 a.m. to 5:03 p.m. (NKS) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena with corrected Exhibit A by Bashas' Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bashas' Amended Exhibit A)(Meynard, Cassandra) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            * MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Bashas' Motion 147 to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena by Bashas' Incorporated. (Meynard, Cassandra) *Modified to include document relationship on 4/16/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash subpoena by Bashas' Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Meynard, Cassandra) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated for proceedings held on 4/15/2013-4/24/2013 before Judge Block.. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Final Pretrial Conference held on 04/15/13. Jury Trial set to begin 04/16/13 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederic Block. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez.) Hearing held 11:42 a.m. to 11:51 a.m. (NKS) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 140 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Damage Claim filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Pretrial Conference Hearing Transcript Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B-Discovery Response, # 3 Exhibit C-Defendants' First Request for Production and Second Non-Uniform Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit D-Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' First Non-Uniform Interrogatories)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE re Service of Subpoena by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Exhibit List Ntc of Filing Trial by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Civil Trial Exhibit List)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Strike 139 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Precluding Evidence of Prior Federal and State Lawsuits by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Excerpt of Final Pretrial Conference Hearing Transcript)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Damage Claim by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Precluding Evidence of Prior Federal and State Lawsuits by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                First MOTION to Strike 133 Trial Brief PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE AND FOR SPOLIATION SANCTIONS, AND EXHIBIT E ATTACHED THERETO by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Its Supplemental Briefing In Support of Its Motion in Limine And For Sanctions Due to Defendants' Spoliation of Material Evidence by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Defendants Responses to Non-Uniform Interrogatories-Superior, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Defendants Response to Request for Production - Superior, # 3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Plaintiff's Non-Uniform Interrogories to Defendant - Federal, # 4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents - Federal, # 5 Exhibit E-Pasternack Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F - Excerpt of Pretrial Conference Transcript)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF Reply in Support of Trial Memorandum No. 1 Re: Invalidity of Plaintiff's Copyright Registrations by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 2/20/2013, before Judge David G. Campbell. Court Reporter Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2013. (VAR) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF In Response to Defendants Trial Memorandum No. 1 Re Validity of Plaintiff's Copyright Registrations by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Transcript Except, # 2 Exhibit B Plaintiff 4th Supplemental Disclosure Statement)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF Supplemental Briefing in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine and for Spoliation Sanctions by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST of Pretrial Conference by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated for proceedings held on 02/20/2013 before Judge Campbell.. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              *Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan: Settlement Conference held on 3/25/2013. APPEARANCES: Richard Walker for and with Plaintiffs Robert Kubicek and Harvey Unti; Charles Onofry and Luane Rosen for and with Defendants Bruce Bosley and Joanne Bosley. Settlement not reached. (Court Reporter - N/A). Hearing held 9:00 AM to 11:30 AM.(LFIG) *Modified to include court reporter information on 3/26/2013 (CMAL). (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT Plaintiff's Supplemental Briefing In Support Of Its Motion In Limine And For Sanctions Due To Defendants' Spoliation Of Material Evidence re 121 Order on Motion in Limine 104 Seventh MOTION in Limine re: for Sanctions due to Defendants' Spoliation of Material Evidence by Plaintiff Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-State Court Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2-Transcript Excerpt, # 3 Exhibit 3-Discovery Response, # 4 Exhibit 4-Declaration)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  *Additional Attachments to Main Document Exhibits re 128 Trial Brief, No. 1 Re: Invalidity of Plaintiff's Copyright Registrations by Defendants Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H)(Onofry, Charles) *Modified to reflect main PDF is duplicate of Doc. 128 on 3/21/2013 (LFIG). (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF No. 1 Re: Invalidity of Plaintiff's Copyright Registrations by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit A-4, # 5 Exhibit A-5, # 6 Exhibit A-6, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D-1, # 10 Exhibit D-2)(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - This case is being referred to United States District Court Judge Frederic Block for trial and pretrial rulings. The briefing schedule on the parties' dispute regarding the validity of various copyrights asserted by Plaintiff in this case is modified as follows: Defendants shall file a 10-page memorandum on this issue on or before March 20, 2013, Plaintiff shall file a 10-page response on or before March 27, 2013, and Defendants shall file a five-page reply on or before March 29, 2013. The briefing schedule on 104 Seventh MOTION in Limine re: for Sanctions due to Defendants' Spoliation of Material Evidence: Plaintiff shall file a memorandum in support of its request for sanctions on or before March 20, 2013. The memorandum shall be limited to 10 pages. Defendants shall file a 10-page response on or before March 27, 2013. Plaintiff shall file a five-page reply on or before March 29, 2013. Jury Trial set for 4/16/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Frederic Block. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Frederic Block or at such other time as Judge Block directs. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/13/13. (LAD) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 102 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/13/2013.(NVO) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Conference held on 3/13/2013. Defendants supplemental response (doc. 124 ) to plantiff motion in limine (doc. 102 ) discussed. Court will issue an order. Spoilation issued to be discussed after briefing on 4/17/13 at the final pretrial conference. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Richard Walker for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Charles Onofry and Luane Rosen for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 11:02 AM to 11:21 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 102 Sixth MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Defendants Offering Undisclosed Documents as Evidence Due to Failure to Make Disclosure and Respond to Discovery (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Second Proposed Jury Instructions by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER attaching Proposed Jury Instructions and Voir Dire re 121 Order on Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/25/2013. (NVO) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 93 Motion in Limine; granting 94 Motion in Limine; granting 101 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 102 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 104 Motion in Limine; granting 105 Motion in Limine. Trial set for 4/23/2013 at 9:00 a.m. (4/23-25, 4/30, 5/1-2). Final conference 4/17/13 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/22/2013. (NVO) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - This case has been referred to United States Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan for a Settlement Conference pursuant to Rule 16, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and 28 U.S.C. § 473(b)(5) as follows: Settlement Conference is set for 3/25/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 2/22/2013. (See PDF for full details.)(KMG) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/20/2013. Discussion held. Motions in limine discussed and ruled upon. Court will issue an order. APPEARANCES: Richard Walker and Charles Jirauch for Plaintiff. Charles Onofry and Luane Rosen for Defendants Jury Trial set for 7 days beginning on 4/23/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2013 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:32 PM to 5:35 PM.(TCA) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W Jirauch on behalf of Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Jirauch, Charles) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2013 at 4:30 PM is VACATED and RESET to 2/20/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/13/2013. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            *NOTICE of Errata re Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Offering Evidence Regarding Their Financial Information by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated re 114 Response to Motion. (Onofry, Charles) *Modified from Notice on 2/7/2013 (REW). (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re of Filing Signed Affidavit of Bruce C. Bosley (Replacement of Exhibit "C" to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine and for Sanctions Due to Spoliation of Evidence and Exhibit "A" to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Preclude Defendants' from Offering Evidence Regarding Their Financial Information by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated re 113 Response to Motion, 114 Response to Motion, . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 105 Eighth MOTION in Limine re: to Preclude Defendants From Offering Evidence Regarding Their Financial Information due to Defendants' Failure to Make Disclosure and to Respond to Discovery as Required by F.R.C.P. 26(a) and F.R.C.P. 26(e) and for Adve filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 104 Seventh MOTION in Limine re: for Sanctions due to Defendants' Spoliation of Material Evidence filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 94 Fourth MOTION in Limine re: Failure to Make Disclosure of Expert Testimony per FRCP 26(a)(2) filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      *RESPONSE to Motion re 101 Fifth MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Defendants from Offering Evidence Re Prior Litigation filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) *Modified to correct event on 2/4/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 93 First MOTION in Limine re: Failure to Plead Affirmative Defenses filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 102 Sixth MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Defendants Offering Undisclosed Documents as Evidence filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B)(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Errata re 97 Notice (Other) Notice of Lodging Corrected Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form 1 by Plaintiff Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              *Notice of Withdrawal re 88 Proposed Verdict Form by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) *Modified to correct event on 1/31/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Verdict Form (Revised) by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) Modified on 1/31/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  *Eighth MOTION in Limine re: to Preclude Defendants From Offering Evidence Regarding Their Financial Information due to Defendants' Failure to Make Disclosure and to Respond to Discovery as Required by F.R.C.P. 26(a) and F.R.C.P. 26(e) and for Adverse Inference Instructions by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) *Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - text searchability. Attorney notified on 1/31/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    *Seventh MOTION in Limine re: for Sanctions due to Defendants' Spoliation of Material Evidence by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) *Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - text searchability. Attorney notified on 1/31/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, Motions terminated: 92 First MOTION in Limine re: Sanctions, Abandonment, Equitable Estoppel filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated, 90 MOTION in Limine re: Spoliation of Material Evidence filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. The Court's Order setting the final pretrial conference 84 specifically states that motions in limine and responses to motions in limine shall not exceed three pages in length. Plaintiff shall, by 5:00 p.m. on 1/30/2013, refile motions in limine 90 and 92 to comply fully with the Court's order 84 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/2013. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sixth MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Defendants Offering Undisclosed Documents as Evidence by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Prop Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Fifth MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Defendants from Offering Evidence Re Prior Litigation by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            *AMENDED DOCUMENT re 99 CORRECTED JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. as to 84 Order. (Walker, Richard) *Modified to correct document relationship on 1/28/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                *Proposed Verdict Form for Statutory Damages by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated re 84 Order. (Walker, Richard) *Modified to correct event on 1/28/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *Proposed Verdict Form Stipulated Proposed Verdict Form 1 by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated re 84 Order. (Walker, Richard) *Modified to correct event on 1/28/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing - Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated Joint. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *Notice of Stipulated Description of the Case RE: 84 Order by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) *Modified to correct event on 1/28/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Fourth MOTION in Limine re: Failure to Make Disclosure of Expert Testimony per FRCP 26(a)(2) by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION in Limine re: Failure to Plead Affirmative Defenses by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Prop Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *First MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendants from Offering Evidence re Their Financial Information by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A, # 2 Exhibit Exh. B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) *Modified to correct title of Motion on 1/28/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine re: Spoliation of Material Evidence by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *Proposed Jury Instructions by Bruce C Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated, Joanne M Bosley. (Onofry, Charles) *Modified to include filers on 1/28/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITHDRAWN by doc.#107...*Proposed Verdict Form by Bruce C Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated, Joanne M Bosley. (Onofry, Charles) *Modified to include filers on 1/28/2013 (KMG). Modified on 1/31/2013 (KMG). (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. The parties may have until 1/14/2013 to meet, confer and mark exhibits for trial. The parties shall file their proposed pretrial order on or before 1/23/2013 in accordance with Doc. 84. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/2013. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE re Service of 5th Supp to Disclosure Stmt by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time Ext of Time to Exchange Final Pretrial Order by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. Motions in limine due by 1/23/2013; responses to motions in limine due 1/30/2013; no replies permitted. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/23/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/2012. (NVO) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 12/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 79 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/2012.(NVO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 79 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/2012.(NVO) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 79 Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Joinder in Bashas' Response filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 79 Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases Bashas' Response to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Consolidate filed by Bashas' Incorporated. (Meynard, Cassandra) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Rosen, Luane) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/22/2012.(NVO) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              * MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Onofry, Charles) *Modified to include document relationship on 10/22/2012 (KMG). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *STATEMENT of Controverting Facts and Its Own Stmt of Facts In Support of Its Response 74 In Opposition to the Bosley Defendants Rule 56(c) Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Walker, Richard) *Modified to correct document relationship on 10/4/2012 (KMG). (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Opposition to the Bosley Defendants' Rule 56(c) Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/26/2012.(NVO) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by the Bosley Defendants by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Order: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. For patent or trademark cases, the following information is required: itemized list of each patent or trademark that is the subject of the litigation, date of each patent or trademark, and the holder of the patent or trademark. For copyright cases, the following information is required: the registration number for the copyright(s) that are the subject of the litigation, the Title of the Work(s) for that copyright(s), and the Author(s) for each copyright.Therefore, within five (5) days, you must provide the above information to the Clerk's Office by filing a Notice with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. If additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading, then defendant is also required to provide the above information within five (5) days of this minute order. (CLB) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 58 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying request for discovery relief. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/30/2012.(NVO) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephonic appearances: Richard Walker for plaintiff;Charles Onofry and Luane Rosen for Bosley defendants; Cassandra Meynard for Bashas Inc. defendant.Telephone Conference held on 8/28/2012.Plaintiff request the Court to reopen discovery for 90 days;grant leave to amend complaint;strike answer of defendants;postpone response to motion for summary judgment. Discussion held with Court.Discussion held on the pending motion to consolidate. ORDERED taking under advisement 58 Motion to Consolidate Cases; Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2012. Court will enter an order. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re of Withdrawal of Defendants' Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated re 60 Notice (Other) . (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 58 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Bashas' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate filed by Bashas' Incorporated. (Meynard, Cassandra) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. During today's telephone conference (which the Court will move to 4:30), the parties should be prepared to address the motion to consolidate recently filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8-28-12. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of Material Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-1, # 3 Exhibit F-2, # 4 Exhibit G)(Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Kelly, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. Telephone Discovery Conference set for 8/28/2012 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate a conference call to include counsel for Defendants and the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/24/2012. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re of Service of Discovery by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated . (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WITHDRAWN by doc.#67...NOTICE re of Service of Discovery by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated . (Onofry, Charles) Modified on 8/29/2012 (KMG). (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document re 58 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/1/2012.(NVO) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re Service of 2nd Amended Subpoena (AV Schwan) by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE re Service of Amended Subpoena (Walker, Bentley) by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re Service of Amended Subpoena to Testify and Produce by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated (A.V. Schwan). (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re Service of 4th Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re Service of Discovery Response by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re Service of Subpoena-Walker, Bentley & Company, Inc. by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re Service of Subpoena-Robert E. Porter Construction, Co., Inc. by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE re Service of Subpoena-A.V. Schwan and Associates, Inc. by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re Service of Subpoena - Arthur Porter Construction, Inc. by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE re Service of Discovery - Expert Written Report by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated re 23 Scheduling Order . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re of Service of Discovery by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re Service of 3rd Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Federal RICO Violations (Count IV), Arizona's Anti-Racketeering Violations (Count V), and Alter Ego (Count VI) filed by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Joint Report on Good Faith Settlement Discussions re 23 , 39 by Plaintiff Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re Service of Discovery by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated . (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 31 Motion to Amend/Correct. Defendants shall file their amended answer with the clerk of court on or before 4/30/2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/24/2012.(NVO) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER pursuant to 37 Stipulation: The parties shall have until 5/4/2012 to file and submit their joint report on settlement talks. The parties are advised that the Court will not grant further extensions in this matter. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/18/2012. (NVO) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Federal RICO Violations (Count IV), Arizona's Anti-Racketeering Violations (Count V), and Alter Ego (Count VI) filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A")(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re 23 Scheduling Order by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Prop] Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim for Federal RICO Violations (Count IV), Arizona's Anti-Racketeering Violations (Count V), and Alter Ego (Count VI) by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 34 Order on Stipulation. The deadline extended by 34 is the deadline for parties to submit their joint report on settlement talks. The deadline to complete the joint report on settlement talks is extended to 4/16/2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/2012. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER pursuant to 33 Stipulation: The date for good faith settlement talks is extended to 4/16/2012. All other deadlines in the Court's Case Management Order 23 remain in effect. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/2012. (NVO) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 23 Scheduling Order by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re Non-Opposition to Def Mtn to Amend Answer by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated re 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Rosen, Luane) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re Service of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re Service of Plaintiff's First Supplement to Initial Disclosure Stmt by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated . (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated . (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, that Bashas' Motion to Refer this Case to the Bankruptcy Court (Doc. 9 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED the Plaintiffs' Claim against Bashas' shall be severed in its entirety and the Plaintiff's Claim against Bashas' only is referred to the Bankruptcy Court. The Plaintiff's Claim against the remaining Defendants will remain in the U.S. District Court. FURTHER ORDERED that this Court will not rule upon Bashas' Motion to Dismiss. The Bankruptcy Court will now have exclusive jurisdiction to adjudicate Bashas' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/12/2012. (KMG) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *Additional Attachments to Main Document (Amended Proposed Order) re: 9 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Motion to Refer This Case to the Bankruptcy Court, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6). Filed by Bashas' Incorporated. (Rothschild, Isaac) *Modified to correct event type on 1/6/2012 (SAT). (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *Additional Attachments to Main Document - (Proposed Order) re: 9 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Motion to Refer This Case to the Bankruptcy Court, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6). Filed by Bashas' Incorporated. (Rothschild, Isaac) *Modified to correct event type on 1/6/2012 (SAT). (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/27/2012. Dispositive motions due by 8/24/2012.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/3/2012. (see order for details)(TCA) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Appearances: Richard Walker for plaintiff; Charles Onofry for defendants Bosley; Brian Murphy for defendant Bashas'Incorporated; Michael McGrath telephonic for defendant Bashas' Incorporated Scheduling Conference held on 12/30/2011. Deadlines discussed. Court will enter a scheduling order. Parties to file 502(d) stipulation. ORDERED granting 9 Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court. Parties to provide Court will a form of order for remand and severance of claims by next week. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Motion to Refer This Case to the Bankruptcy Court Bashas' Reply to Motion to Refer this Case to the Bankruptcy Court filed by Bashas' Incorporated. (Rothschild, Isaac) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) Bashas' Reply to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Bashas' Incorporated. (Rothschild, Isaac) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bashas' Incorporated. (Rothschild, Isaac) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Motion to Refer This Case to the Bankruptcy Court, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Walker, Richard) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 9 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Motion to Refer This Case to the Bankruptcy Court, 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/7/2011.(NVO) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/5/2011. (NVO) *Entry modified on 12/6/2011 to correct case management conference date. (KMG). NEF regenerated 12/7/2011 (JHER). (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Bashas' Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Bashas' Motion to Refer the Case to the Bankruptcy Court by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulated Motion)(Walker, Richard) *Document is not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 12/5/2011 (SAT). (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Separate ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated.(Onofry, Charles) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *MOTION to Dismiss Party Bashas' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Bashas' Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rothschild, Isaac) *Modified to correct motion type on 11/17/2011 (SAT). (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Motion to Refer This Case to the Bankruptcy Court by Bashas' Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rothschild, Isaac) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service, # 2 Affidavit of Service, # 3 Affidavit of Service)(Walker, Richard) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Order: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge David G. Campbell. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 11-2112-PHX-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Bashas' Incorporated, Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-5983692. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Mark E. Aspey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 11-02112-PHX-MEA. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated (submitted by Richard Walker). (REK) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Submitted by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated (submitted by Richard Walker). (REK) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/1/2012.(NVO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number PHX 0970-5983692, filed by Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated (submitted by Richard Walker). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?