USA v. Malhotra
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:08-cr-00423-JF

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Frances Knight +1 408 535 5061 +1 408 535 5066 Susan.Knight@usdoj.gov
Space Mark Louis Krotoski +1 408 535 5061 +1 408 535 5066 Mark.Krotoski@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Atul Malhotra, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Vandevelde +1 213 271 2780 +1 213 622 2690

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Jose
Filed 6/27/2008
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1832.F
Offense Level 4
181832(a)(2) Theft of Trade Secrets
Def Custody Status
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Plea Agreement
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Atul Malhotra (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Waiver of Indictment
    WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Atul Malhotra (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Jeremy Fogel:Arraignment and disposition as to Atul Malhotra held on 7/11/2008. Defendant waives arraignment and indictment. Plea entered by Atul Malhotra (1) Guilty Count 1. Defendant remains out of custody on his own recognizance, under the conditions imposed by pretrial service. Sentencing set for 10/29/2008 11:00 AM before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Information - Felony
        FELONY INFORMATION as to Atul Malhotra (1) count(s) 1. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Case Referred to ECF
          CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing.
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 161 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?