Lennon Image Technologies LLC v. Tissot USA Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00902
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 12:49 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Niknaz Bukovcan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Niknaz Bukovcan

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 984 6087 kdorsney@potteranderson.com
v.
No Logo Swatch Group (u.s.) Inc.,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
No Logo Tissot USA Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,624,843. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation)(fms) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR THE DEFENDANTS TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to OCTOBER 12, 2012 - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/17/2012 at 04:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/4/2012. (lih) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
          PROPOSED ORDER - Joint [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Skullcandy Inc., Mattel Inc., Forevermark US Inc., Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 5, 2012 - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR THE DEFENDANTS TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to SEPTEMBER 28, 2012 - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                PROPOSED ORDER - Joint [Proposed] Scheduling Order re (10 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR) Order Setting Scheduling Conference by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Skullcandy Inc., Mattel Inc., Forevermark US Inc., Boucheron Joaillerie USA Inc., Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR THE DEFENDANTS TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to September 13, 2012 - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/14/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00900-SLR et al.(nmfn) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                        Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding coordinated discovery and Markman proceedings - re (10 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR) Order, Set Deadlines,,. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER, Counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/29/2012.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/15/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00900-SLR et al.(nmfn) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                            Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to September 6, 2012 - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher M. Joe and Attorney Niky Bukovcan - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Tissot USA Inc. served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/7/2012. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Swatch Group (US) Inc. served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/7/2012. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,624,843;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-1106657.) - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?