Lennon Image Technologies LLC v. Forevermark US Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00904
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 8:43 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 984 6087 kdorsney@potteranderson.com
No Logo Forevermark US Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo De Beers Diamond Jewellers US Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,624,843. (nmfn) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Rodger Dallery Smith, II (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
        PROPOSED ORDER /Agreed [ Proposed] Protective Order by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
          (DEFICIENCY ISSUED - RE-FILED AT D.I. 35) PROPOSED ORDER /Agreed [Proposed] Protective Order by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 3/21/2013 (fms). (Entered: 03/21/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF'S THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS (NO. 13) and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Buether - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Eric W. Buether)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to AKQA, Inc. by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF LENNON IMAGE TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO ALL DEFENDANTS; (2) PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF COMMON INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS (NOS. 11-12) and (3) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF'S DISCLOSURE OF ASSERTED CLAIMS AND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                      REPLY BRIEF re 24 Joint MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 Defendants' Reply Brief In Support Of Their Joint Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination Of U.S. Patent No. 6,624,843 filed by Forevermark US Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 24 Joint MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION re (24 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR, 24 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 36 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR) Joint MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 DECLARATION OF RANDY LIPSITZ, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Skullcandy Inc., Forevermark US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                            Joint OPENING BRIEF in Support re 24 Joint MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 filed by Forevermark US Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2013. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                              Joint MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,624,843 - filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Skullcandy Inc., Forevermark US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7.1.1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant Forevermark US, Inc.'s Responses to First Request for Production of Documents of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC; 2) Defendant Forevermark US, Inc.'s Answers to First Interrogatories of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC; and 3) Defendant Forevermark US, Inc.'s Paragraph 4 Core Technical Documents by Forevermark US Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Lennon Image Technologies LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Richard D. Kirk. Attorney Kenneth L. Dorsney terminated. (Kirk, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of : (1) Defendant's Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) Initial Disclosures; and (2) Defendant Forevermark US, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of Delaware's Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Forevermark US Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures; (ii) Plaintiff's Section 4(a) Disclosures; and (iii) Plaintiff's Section 3 Disclosures by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/17/2012 at 04:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/4/2012. (lih) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Forevermark (Nos. 1-10); and (2) Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production to Forevermark by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                            ANSWER to 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lennon Image Technologies LLC.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                              PROPOSED ORDER - Joint [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Skullcandy Inc., Mattel Inc., Forevermark US Inc., Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark C. Nelson and Andrea M. Kimball of SNR DENTON - filed by Forevermark US Inc.. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                  PROPOSED ORDER - Joint [Proposed] Scheduling Order re (10 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 11 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 12 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR) Order Setting Scheduling Conference by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc., Conde Nast Americas LC, Conde Nast Digital, Conde Nast Publications Inc., Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Skullcandy Inc., Mattel Inc., Forevermark US Inc., Boucheron Joaillerie USA Inc., Swatch Group (US) Inc., Tissot USA Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Lennon Image Technologies LLC by Forevermark US Inc..(Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of De Beers Diamond Jewellers US Inc. by De Beers Diamond Jewellers US Inc., Forevermark US Inc., Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/14/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00900-SLR et al.(nmfn) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Kenneth L. Dorsney regarding coordinated discovery and Markman proceedings - re (10 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00903-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00904-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00900-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 10 in 1:12-cv-00905-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 9 in 1:12-cv-00902-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR, 8 in 1:12-cv-00901-SLR) Order, Set Deadlines,,. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER, Counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/29/2012.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/15/2012. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00900-SLR et al.(nmfn) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to Complaint to September 6, 2012 - filed by De Beers Diamond Jewellers US Inc., Forevermark US Inc., Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher M. Joe and Attorney Niky Bukovcan - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. De Beers Diamond Jewellers US Inc. served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/7/2012. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. Forevermark US Inc. served on 7/17/2012, answer due 8/7/2012. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,624,843;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against De Beers Diamond Jewellers US Inc., Forevermark US Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-1106659.) - filed by Lennon Image Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?