Crewe v. Rich Dad Education, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-08301-PAE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 6:14 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Crewe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Scott A. Bursor +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163 scott@bursor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Joseph I. Marchese +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163 jmarchese@bursor.com
No Logo Robert Maurice, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated. Joseph I. Marchese +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163 jmarchese@bursor.com
v.
No Logo Cashflow Technologies Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DANIEL J. LEFFELL +1 212 373 3218 dleffell@paulweiss.com
No Logo Christopher Briggs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an Individual
TERMINATED: 08/17/2012 Daniel Dov Edelman +1 212 223 4000 +1 212 895 4201 dedelman@crowell.com
No Logo Dies 1 through 50, Defendant
No Logo Marc Hrisko, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard Sokol +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 howard.sokol@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Joseph Sweeney +1 212 513 3547 +1 212 341 7122 patrick.sweeney@hklaw.com
No Logo Rich Dad Education, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2012 Daniel Dov Edelman +1 212 223 4000 +1 212 895 4201 dedelman@crowell.com
No Logo Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DANIEL J. LEFFELL +1 212 373 3218 dleffell@paulweiss.com
No Logo Rich Global, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DANIEL J. LEFFELL +1 212 373 3218 dleffell@paulweiss.com
No Logo Robert Kiyosaki, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual DANIEL J. LEFFELL +1 212 373 3218 dleffell@paulweiss.com
No Logo Scott, Stewart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an Individual
TERMINATED: 08/17/2012 Daniel Dov Edelman +1 212 223 4000 +1 212 895 4201 dedelman@crowell.com
No Logo Tigrent Brands Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2012 Daniel Dov Edelman +1 212 223 4000 +1 212 895 4201 dedelman@crowell.com
No Logo Tigrent Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2012 Daniel Dov Edelman +1 212 223 4000 +1 212 895 4201 dedelman@crowell.com
No Logo Tigrent Learning Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2012 Daniel Dov Edelman +1 212 223 4000 +1 212 895 4201 dedelman@crowell.com
No Logo Wayne Morgan, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 61 Memorandum & Opinion. (tro) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    JOINT STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED,AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for CREWE and counsel for the TlGRENT DEFENDANTS that all of CREWE's claims against the TIGRENT DEFENDANTS have been dismissed with prejudice and that CREWE voluntarily will not seek an appeal of these claims; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that CREWE and the TlGRENT DEFENDANTS will each be responsible for their own attorneys' fees and costs incurred in connection with the motion to dismiss CREWE's claims, which the Court granted on account of the binding and enforceable arbitration clause.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/17/2012) (ama) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
      CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated August 3, 2012, defendants motion to dismiss the claims brought by plaintiff Crewe is hereby granted with prejudice, in light of the binding arbitration clause in his agreement; and defendants motion to dismiss the claims brought by plaintiff Maurice is hereby granted, without prejudice to his right to refile in a venue consistent with the forum selection clauses in his agreements; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 8/3/12) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 61 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER # 102144: Defendants' motion to dismiss the claims brought by plaintiff Crewe is hereby GRANTED with prejudice, in light of the binding arbitration clause in his Agreement. Defendants' motion to dismiss the claims brought by plaintiff Maurice is hereby GRANTED,without prejudice to his right to refile in a venue consistent with the forum selection clauses in his agreements. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at docket items 29, 30, and 43, and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/3/2012) (js) Modified on 8/3/2012 (jar). Modified on 8/6/2012 (ft). (Entered: 08/03/2012)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: Oral Argument, In Response to the Court's Order Directing Further Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Cashflow Technologies, Inc., Robert Kiyosaki, Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC, Rich Global, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of of Partial Withdrawal of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim re: 31 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Cashflow Technologies, Inc., Robert Kiyosaki, Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC, Rich Global, LLC. (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
              DECLARATION of Daniel D. Edelman, Esq. in Support re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Christopher Briggs, Rich Dad Education, LLC, Scott Stewart, Tigrent Brands Inc., Tigrent Inc., Tigrent Learning Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Edelman Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Edelman Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Edelman Declaration)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 57 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Christopher Briggs, Rich Dad Education, LLC, Scott Stewart, Tigrent Brands Inc., Tigrent Inc., Tigrent Learning Inc.. (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of Marc Hrisko in Support re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State A Claim.. Document filed by Marc Hrisko. (Sokol, Howard) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 55 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State A Claim.. Document filed by Marc Hrisko. (Sokol, Howard) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION of Joseph I. Marchese in Opposition re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint., 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bursor, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 53 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint., 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Bursor, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 5/24/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 5/24/2012 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tara Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER: Oral argument in this case was held on Thursday, May 24, 2012, at 10:45 a.m. The Court issues this order to clarify and revise its order from the bench today with respect to the content and timing of the supplemental briefing it seeks. Specifically, the Court asks the parties to address the following issues, with plaintiffs' submission being due Friday, June 1,2012, and defendants' submission being due Wednesday, June 6, 2012. Each party is authorized to submit a brief of up to 15 pages: (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/24/2012) (djc) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Marchese, Joseph in Opposition re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State A Claim.. Document filed by Robert Crewe, Robert Maurice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State A Claim.. Document filed by Robert Crewe, Robert Maurice. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER: Oral argument in this case is scheduled for Thursday, May 24, 2012, at 10:45 a.m. The Court asks that counsel come to argument prepared to address the following: 1. As to plaintiff Crewe: a) Assuming that the arbitration clause is found enforceable, the question arises under the agreement as to the forum in which binding arbitration will be held. The agreement states: "We will agree on another binding arbitration forum if NAF ceases operations." The Court directs counsel to meet and confer on this issue before Thursday, and to attempt to agree on an alternative forum to NAF. In the event the parties cannot agree on such a forum, the Court(i) directs counsel to be prepared to set out, at argument, the procedure by which an alternative binding arbitration forum is to be chosen in the absence of agreement, with reference to on-point case law; and (ii) directs each party to be prepared to identify at argument two distinct binding arbitral fora that would be acceptable to it. b) Assuming that the arbitration clause is found enforceable, and assuming that putative lead plaintiff Maurice's lawsuit is transferred to federal court in Florida, the Court would like counsel's views as to the circumstances under which plaintiff Crewe would be eligible to obtain relief as a class member in the litigation led by lead plaintiff Maurice. 2. As to plaintiff Maurice: a) Is there any reason why the Court should not transfer this case to federal district court in Florida in light of the forum-selection clause in plaintiff Maurice's agreement? In the event of such a transfer, should the transfer be to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida or the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida? (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/22/2012) (js) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Christopher Briggs, Rich Dad Education, LLC, Scott Stewart, Tigrent Brands Inc., Tigrent Inc., Tigrent Learning Inc.. (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Cashflow Technologies, Inc., Robert Kiyosaki, Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC, Rich Global, LLC. (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State A Claim.. Document filed by Marc Hrisko. (Sokol, Howard) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State A Claim. Document filed by Marc Hrisko.(Sokol, Howard) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                              DECLARATION of Marchese, Joseph in Opposition re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint., 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Robert Crewe, Robert Maurice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION of Crewe, Robert in Opposition re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint., 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint., 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Robert Crewe, Robert Maurice. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Joseph Sweeney on behalf of Marc Hrisko (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Sokol on behalf of Marc Hrisko (Sokol, Howard) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Joseph I. Marchese dated 5/4/2012 re: I write to request the Court's permission to submit a single memorandum of law in opposition to both pending motions to dismiss not to exceed 50 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request to file a single responsive brief of up to 50 pages is hereby granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/8/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. ( Responses due by 5/9/2012, Replies due by 5/21/2012. Motion Hearing/oral argument set for 5/24/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/16/2012) (cd) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: On April 2, 2012, the RD defendants and the Tigrent defendants each submitted a motion to dismiss the complaint in this case. The Court has received letters from both the RD defendants and the Tigrent defendants requesting oral argument on the motions (attached). Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss is due April 23, 2012. Defendants' reply is due April 30, 2012. Oral argument on the motion is scheduled for May 11, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 9A at the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint:( Responses due by 4/23/2012, Replies due by 4/30/2012.), ( Oral Argument set for 5/11/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/9/2012) (mro) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Rich Dad Operating Company, LLC for Rich Global, LLC; Corporate Parent Pele Kala Corporation for Cashflow Technologies, Inc.. Document filed by Cashflow Technologies, Inc., Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC, Rich Global, LLC.(Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of James E. May in Support re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Christopher Briggs, Rich Dad Education, LLC, Scott Stewart, Tigrent Brands Inc., Tigrent Inc., Tigrent Learning Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 to May Declaration, # 2 Ex. 2 to May Declaration, # 3 Ex. 3 to May Declaration, # 4 Ex. 4 to May Declaration, # 5 Ex. 5 to May Declaration)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Christopher Briggs, Rich Dad Education, LLC, Scott Stewart, Tigrent Brands Inc., Tigrent Inc., Tigrent Learning Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum to Memorandum of Law)(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Cashflow Technologies, Inc., Robert Kiyosaki, Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC, Rich Global, LLC. (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Briggs, Rich Dad Education, LLC, Scott Stewart, Tigrent Brands Inc., Tigrent Inc., Tigrent Learning Inc..(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration and to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Cashflow Technologies, Inc., Robert Kiyosaki, Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC, Rich Global, LLC.(Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tigrent Inc., for Rich Dad Education, LLC, Tigrent Brands Inc., Tigrent Learning Inc.. Document filed by Christopher Briggs, Rich Dad Education, LLC, Scott Stewart, Tigrent Brands Inc., Tigrent Inc., Tigrent Learning Inc..(Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR MARC HRISKO TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed, by and between the undersigned counsel for plaintiffs and defendants, that the time for Hrisko to answer, move or otherwise appear and respond with respect to the First Amended Complaint in the above-captioned action is extended through and including May 9, 2012. Marc Hrisko answer due 5/9/2012. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/29/2012) (mro) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Daniel J. Leffell dated 3/27/12 re: Counsel for the RD defendants requests the Court's permission to submit a memorandum of law not exceeding 30 pages in support of their motion to dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: The RD Defendants' request to file a 30-page memorandum of law in support of their motion to dismiss is hereby granted. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/29/2012) (mro) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Scott Stewart served on 3/14/2012, answer due 4/4/2012. Service was accepted by Madison Gale, Daughter. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Robert Crewe; Robert Maurice. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Christopher Briggs served on 3/10/2012, answer due 4/2/2012. Service was accepted by Cecilia Briggs, Spouse. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Robert Crewe; Robert Maurice. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Marc Hrisko served on 3/9/2012, answer due 3/30/2012. Service was accepted by Mary Christian, UPS Store Clerk. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Robert Crewe; Robert Maurice. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Daniel D. Edelman dated 3/20/2012 re: We request permission to submit one brief of 35 pages on behalf of all of the defendants we will represent on the motion. ENDORSEMENT: The Tigrent Defendants may submit a memorandum of law in support of their motion to dismiss totaling no more than 35 pages. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/22/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for plaintiffs and counsel for the above-listed defendants that the above-listed defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint in the above-captioned action is extended through and including April 2, 2012; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this Stipulation is without prejudice to, or waiver of, any available defense, including without limitation any defenses based on lack of jurisdiction. There will be no further extensions of this deadline., Cashflow Technologies, Inc. answer due 4/2/2012; Robert Kiyosaki answer due 4/2/2012; Rich Dad Education, LLC answer due 4/2/2012; Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC answer due 4/2/2012; Rich Global, LLC answer due 4/2/2012; Tigrent Brands Inc. answer due 4/2/2012; Tigrent Inc. answer due 4/2/2012; Tigrent Learning Inc. answer due 4/2/2012. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/8/2012) (lmb) Modified on 3/8/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against All Defendants.Document filed by Robert Crewe, Marc Hrisko, Wayne Morgan, Christopher Briggs, Scott Stewart, Robert Maurice. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Robert Crewe. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Part 2, # 2 Supplement Part 3)(pl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2012: # 3 Ex A, # 4 Ex. B Part 1, # 5 Ex. B Part 2, # 6 Ex. C, # 7 Ex. D, # 8 Ex. E) (ama). (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATION: The undersigned counsel for CREWE and counsel for DEFENDANTS' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action is extended through and including March 5, 2012. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this Stipulation is without prejudice to, or waiver of, any available defense, including without limitation any defenses based on lack of jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/15/2012) (rdz) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including February 27, 2012. Cashflow Technologies, Inc. answer due 2/17/2012; Robert Kiyosaki answer due 2/17/2012; Rich Dad Education, LLC answer due 2/17/2012; Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC answer due 2/17/2012; Rich Global, LLC answer due 2/17/2012; Tigrent Brands Inc. answer due 2/17/2012; Tigrent Inc. answer due 2/17/2012; Tigrent Learning Inc. answer due 2/17/2012. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/3/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL: granting 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. The Court appoints Mr. Scott A. Bursor of Bursor & Fisher, P.A. as Interim Class Counsel pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3). (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/12/2011) (pl) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  STIPULATION: that TIGRENT's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint herein is extended through and including February 15, 2012; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED that TIGRENT does not contest CREWE's motion to serve as interim class counsel pursuant to Rule 23(8) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. In doing so, TIGRENT does not waive any claims in or defenses to this action nor does TIGRENT waive any objections or challenges as to class allegations that have been asserted or will be asserted by the plaintiff. Rich Dad Education, LLC answer due 2/12/2012; Tigrent Brands Inc. answer due 2/12/2012; Tigrent Inc. answer due 2/12/2012; Tigrent Learning Inc. answer due 2/12/2012. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/12/2011) (pl) Modified on 12/12/2011 (pl). (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cashflow Technologies, Inc. served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. Service was accepted by Cathy Grady, Director. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC served on 11/30/2011, answer due 12/21/2011. Service was accepted by Donna Madieros, Secretary. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tigrent Inc. served on 11/21/2011, answer due 12/12/2011. Service was accepted by James E. May, Chief Administrative Office and General Counsel. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tigrent Learning Inc. served on 11/21/2011, answer due 12/12/2011. Service was accepted by James E. May, Chief Administrative Office and General Counsel. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tigrent Brands Inc. served on 11/21/2011, answer due 12/12/2011. Service was accepted by James E. May, Chief Administrative Office and General Counsel. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Rich Dad Education, LLC served on 11/21/2011, answer due 12/12/2011. Service was accepted by James E. May, Chief Administrative Office and General Counsel. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Rich Global, LLC served on 11/21/2011, answer due 12/12/2011. Service was accepted by Linda Denis, Legal Assistant. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert Kiyosaki served on 11/30/2011, answer due 12/28/2011. Service was accepted by Donna Madieros, Secretary. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert Kiyosaki served on 12/7/2011, answer due 12/28/2011. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Interim Counsel. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Scott A. Bursor in Support re: 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit B)(Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Robert Crewe.(Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel). Document filed by Robert Crewe. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Scott A. Bursor, # 3 Exhibit Exh. A to Decl. of Scott A. Bursor, # 4 Exhibit Exh. B to Decl. of Scott A. Bursor)(Marchese, Joseph) Modified on 12/6/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Robert Crewe.(ama) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 8/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' motion to dismiss the claims brought by plaintiff Crewe is hereby GRANTED with prejudice, in light of the binding arbitration clause in his Agreement. Defendants' motion to dismiss the claims brought by plaint iff Maurice is hereby GRANTED,without prejudice to his right to refile in a venue consistent with the forum selection clauses in his agreements. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at docket items 29, 30, and 43, and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/3/2012) (js) Modified on 8/3/2012 (jar).
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Cashflow Technologies, Inc., Dies 1 through 50, Robert Kiyosaki, Rich Dad Education, LLC, Rich Dad Operating Co., LLC, Rich Global, LLC, Tigrent Brands Inc., Tigrent Inc., Tigrent Learning Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 22102)Document filed by Robert Crewe.(ama) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 387 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?