Gavin v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Hampshire District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00159-LM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 6:42 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Linda Gavin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyons Law Offices PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E. Lyons, Jr. +1 603 431 5144 jmathieu@lyonslaw.net
v.
No Logo LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Trischa Snyder Chapman +1 614 462 2663 +1 614 462 2616 tchapman@bakerlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph E. Ezzie +1 614 228 1541 +1 614 462 2616 jezzie@bakerlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , William Kevin Kane +1 312 416 6211 +1 312 832 4444 wkane@bakerlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Edward Mumford +1 216 861 7578 +1 216 696 0740 mmumford@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Drew Eckl & Farnham, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Michael Bagley +1 404 885 6415 mbagley@deflaw.com
Space Joseph Benson Ward +1 404 885 6141 bward@deflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Frost Brown Todd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, William M. Harter +1 614 559 7226 +1 614 464 1737 wharter@fbtlaw.com
Space Lynda Motes Hill +1 615 251 5589 +1 615 251 5551 lhill@fbtlaw.com
, Katherine Marie Klingelhafer kklingelhafer@fbtlaw.com
, , Laura Leister +1 614 559 7220 +1 614 464 1737 lleister@fbtlaw.com
, Mekesha Houchins Montgomery +1 513 651 6800 mmontgomery@fbtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Charles Mehigan +1 202 372 9097 +1 202 800 2999 jmehigan@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/15/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William W O'Connor +1 918 594 0400 +1 918 594 0505 boconnor@hallestill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Holly L. Cini +1 860 522 0404 +1 860 247 1330 cinih@jacksonlewis.com
Space Debra Weiss Ford +1 603 559 2727 +1 603 559 2701 debra.ford@jacksonlewis.com
, Douglas J. Hoffman +1 617 367 0025 +1 617 367 2155 hoffmand@jacksonlewis.com
Space Nancy Ellen Oliver +1 603 559 2700 +1 603 294 4126 olivern@jacksonlewis.com
Space Daniel P. Schwarz +1 603 559 2730 daniel.schwarz@jacksonlewis.com
Space K. Joshua Scott +1 603 559 2700 kjoshua.scott@jacksonlewis.com
, Margaret J. Strange +1 860 522 0404 +1 860 247 1330 strangem@jacksonlewis.com
, Alison Jacobs Wice +1 203 961 0404 +1 203 324 4704 wicea@jacksonlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ROBERT F SPRINGFIELD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Neal +1 615 724 3246 +1 615 724 3346 bneal@burr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher B. Kaczmarek +1 617 378 6000 +1 617 507 8046 ckaczmarek@littler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McAfee & Taft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/15/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Harrison Mitchell Kosmider +1 918 574 3038 +1 918 574 3194 Harrison.kosmider@mcafeetaft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , James M. Barrett +1 503 552 2140 +1 503 224 4518 jim.barrett@odnss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ray, McChristian & Jeans, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon A. Parden +1 505 855 6000 +1 505 212 0140 sparden@rmjfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Matthew D. Jacobson +1 202 414 9292 +1 202 414 9299 mjacobson@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyferth Blumenthal & Harris LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Bruce A. Moothart +1 816 756 0700 +1 816 756 3700 bruce@sbhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stites & Harbison, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Wingo +1 615 782 2263 +1 615 742 4106 john.wingo@stites.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tom Petrus & Miller LLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David R. Harada-Stone +1 808 792 5854 +1 808 792 5809 dharada-stone@tpm-hawaii.com
, Richard B. Miller +7925 792 792 5809 rmiller@tpm-hawaii.com
, Patricia K. Wall kwall@tpm-hawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by trust-tree.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder kevin@trust-tree.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Eric D. DeNure +1 605 336 2565 +1 605 336 2604 edenure@mayjohnson.com
, Richard L. Travis +3362 336 336 2604 dtravis@mayjohnson.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER re 45 Bill of Costs: Defendant is awarded costs for clerk fees in the amount of $365.00 and deposition costs in the amount of $1,228.70, for a total award of $1,593.70. Signed by Clerk James R. Starr.(ko) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Objection to 45 Bill of Costs,, filed by Linda Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      REPLACED SEE DOCUMENT #47. BILL OF COSTS by Linda Gavin( Follow up on Bill of Costs on 1/3/2013.), Objection to Bill of Costs by Linda Gavin (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Lyons, John) Modified on 12/18/2012 to add: REPLACED SEE DOCUMENT #47. (ko). (Entered: 12/17/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        BILL OF COSTS by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. Follow up on Bill of Costs on 12/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in support of Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit A-Court Fees, # 3 Exhibit B-Invoice of Gavin Deposition, # 4 Exhibit C-Invoices-Caldwell, Trefethen, Lozier Depositions, # 5 Exhibit D-Invoice of Newick and Avery-Leaf Depositions, # 6 Exhibit E-Check copies NHDES and medical providers, # 7 Exhibit F-Invoice for Economist Catherine Newick's file)(Ford, Debra) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          OBJECTION to 43 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Hoffman, Douglas) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Linda Gavin. Follow up on Objection on 10/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with 41 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Clerk James R. Starr. (Case Closed) (ko) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ///ORDER granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 33 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 36 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 40 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Clerk of court shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of 33 Motion to Compel Production of Certain Documents filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 9/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Linda Gavin)(Ford, Debra) Modified on 8/21/2012 to link to motion (ko). (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    OBJECTION to 36 MOTION to Strike 28 Objection to Motion, (Plaintiff's Affidavit, Issues of Material Fact and Disputes of Material Fact) filed by Linda Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER denying 18 Motion to Compel. Denied, except to the extent that Liberty Mutual is ordered to produce to Gavin copies of annotated documents within ten days. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to 33 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents . Follow up on Reply on 8/20/2012.(Ford, Debra) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Strike 28 Objection to Motion, (Plaintiff's Affidavit, Issues of Material Fact and Disputes of Material Fact) filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 8/20/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Memo Support Motion to Strike)(Ford, Debra) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            REPLY to Objection to Motion re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A - Undisputed Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit Exh B - Gavin Exit Interview, # 3 Exhibit Exh C - Augusta Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit Exh D - Mullane Deposition Excerpts)(Ford, Debra) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              OBJECTION to 33 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Linda Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 8/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A-Lyons Correspondence, # 3 Exhibit B-06/29/12 Email from Plaintiff's counsel, # 4 Exhibit C-07/13/12 Email from Plaintiff's counsel, # 5 Exhibit D-07/16/12 Email from Plaintiff's counsel, # 6 Exhibit E-Excerpt from Linda Gavin Deposition Transcript)(Ford, Debra) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Follow up on Reply on 8/6/2012.(Ford, Debra) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Addendum/ to 28 Objection to Motion, by Linda Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DEF001283)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Addendum/ to 28 Objection to Motion, by Linda Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Depo of Salmon, # 2 Exhibit Mullane 25, # 3 Exhibit DEF001483, # 4 Exhibit Mullane 26, # 5 Exhibit Depo of Augusta, # 6 Exhibit DEF000082)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Addendum/ to 28 Objection to Motion, by Linda Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Mullane 13, # 2 Exhibit Depo of Mullane, # 3 Exhibit LM Ans. to Int. 5, # 4 Exhibit Depo of Gavin, # 5 Exhibit Depo of Arnost, # 6 Exhibit Depo of Powell, # 7 Exhibit Mullane 16)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          OBJECTION to 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Linda Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law, # 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Linda Gavin, # 3 Exhibit DEF001277, # 4 Exhibit DEF001346, # 5 Exhibit Depo of Lahey, # 6 Exhibit Mullane 13)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            REPLY to Objection to Motion re 18 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS REVIEWED BY JANNA PASQUINI MULLANE IN PREPARATION FOR DEPOSITION, TO PRODUCE A PRIVILEGE LOG AND TO COMPEL THE TESTIMONY OF JANNA PASQUINI MULLANE AND INTEGRATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SAME filed by Linda Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Mullane Deposition Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit Mullane Fee Agreement)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 7/19/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Memo Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Ex.A Gavin Transcript, # 3 Exhibit Ex.B 12/7/07 Email from Salmon, # 4 Exhibit Ex.C 2/1/08 Ltr Salmon to Gavin, # 5 Exhibit Ex.D Gavin Resignation Letter)(Ford, Debra) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's May 1, 2012 Motion to Compel (Doc. 18) filed by Linda Gavin. Follow up on Objection on 6/15/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Reply to Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's May 1, 2012 Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from Mullane Deposition, # 3 Exhibit Mullane Fee Agreement)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  FILED IN ERROR SEE DOCUMENT 25 . REPLY to Objection to Motion re 18 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS REVIEWED BY JANNA PASQUINI MULLANE IN PREPARATION FOR DEPOSITION, TO PRODUCE A PRIVILEGE LOG AND TO COMPEL THE TESTIMONY OF JANNA PASQUINI MULLANE AND INTEGRATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SAME filed by Linda Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Mullane Deposition Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit Mullane Fee Agreement)(Lyons, John) Modified on 5/29/2012 to add: FILED IN ERROR SEE DOCUMENT 25 .(ko). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to May 1, 2012 Motion to Compel. Follow up on Reply on 6/11/2012.(Lyons, John) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS REVIEWED BY JANNA PASQUINI MULLANE IN PREPARATION FOR DEPOSITION, TO PRODUCE A PRIVILEGE LOG AND TO COMPEL THE TESTIMONY OF JANNA PASQUINI MULLANE AND INTEGRATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SAME filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoffman, Douglas) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        OBJECTION to 18 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS REVIEWED BY JANNA PASQUINI MULLANE IN PREPARATION FOR DEPOSITION, TO PRODUCE A PRIVILEGE LOG AND TO COMPEL THE TESTIMONY OF JANNA PASQUINI MULLANE AND INTEGRATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SAME filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Hoffman, Douglas) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Motion: 16 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Integrated Memorandum of Law.(Lyons, John) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Disclose Experts filed by Linda Gavin.(Lyons, John) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS REVIEWED BY JANNA PASQUINI MULLANE IN PREPARATION FOR DEPOSITION, TO PRODUCE A PRIVILEGE LOG AND TO COMPEL THE TESTIMONY OF JANNA PASQUINI MULLANE AND INTEGRATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SAME filed by Linda Gavin. Follow up on Objection on 5/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Mullane Deposition Excerpts)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Plaintiff's Notice as to Suitability for Mediation by Linda Gavin(Lyons, John) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  WITHDRAWN SEE #20. MOTION to Compel Discovery and Integrated Memorandum of Law filed by Linda Gavin. Follow up on Objection on 5/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Def's answers to Ints and RFP, # 2 Exhibit Letter, # 3 Exhibit Letter, # 4 Exhibit Letter)(Lyons, John) Modified on 7/25/2012 to add: WITHDRAWN SEE #20 (ko). (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel P. Schwarz on behalf of Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Schwarz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Douglas J. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-867731.) filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Hoffman Pro Hac Vice)(Scott, K.) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Joint Mediation Statement: additional 30 days needed to determine if mediation is suitable (Scott, K.) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Nancy E. Oliver to Withdraw as Attorney Replaces Document No. 11 filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc..(Oliver, Nancy) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            REPLACED SEE 12 . NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Nancy Ellen Oliver on behalf of Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.(Oliver, Nancy) Modified on 3/1/2012 to add: (ko). (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Weiss Ford on behalf of Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Ford, Debra) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines Trial and Discovery Deadlines filed by Linda Gavin. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amended Discovery Plan)(Lyons, John) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Disclose Experts filed by Linda Gavin.(Lyons, John) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by K. Joshua Scott on behalf of Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Scott, K.) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Proposed Discovery Plan agreed to by the parties filed by Linda Gavin. (Lyons, John) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Oliver, Nancy) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2011-CV-00105, Strafford County Superior Court (Oliver, Nancy) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to all parties. (jeb) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. disclosing no parent companies, and no merger agreement (Oliver, Nancy) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER denying 18 Motion to Compel. Denied, except to the extent that Liberty Mutual is ordered to produce to Gavin copies of annotated documents within ten days. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Strafford County Superior Court, case number 219-2011-CV-00105. (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0102-729551.) filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 4/28/2011. State Court Record Follow Up 4/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, # 2 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff''s Counsel, # 3 Notice of Removal to State Court, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliver, Nancy) Modified on 4/4/2011 to delete "with jury demand": (jeb). (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: 46 Bill of Costs, Miscellaneous Filing filed by Linda Gavin. Filer used wrong event. Filer shall refile using the Objection not to motion event and enter in docket text: Replaces document no. 46. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1473. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 12/27/2012.(ko)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER denying 43 Motion for Reconsideration re: 41 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's May 1, 2012 Motion to Compel. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of ECF Filing Error ACTION REQUIRED re: 24 Reply to Objection to Motion, filed by Linda Gavin. The document fails to comply with: LR 7.1(e)(2) Nondispositive motion: reply memorandum is not permitted without prior leave of court. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1473. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 6/8/2012.(ko)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: 22 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1473.(ko)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Motion terminated: re 16 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Integrated Memorandum of Law filed by Linda Gavin. Withdrawn, see document 20. (ko)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Motion to Extend Time to Disclose Experts. Text of Order: Granted. The court notes that the parties did not seek any extension of the summary judgment deadline (June 15, 2012), which deadline remains in place. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Motion for Douglas J. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Douglas J. Hoffman complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. ECF Registration Deadline set for 4/19/2012.To access the online registration form, click HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click HERE.(gla)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER re 13 Mediation Statement: additional 30 days needed to determine if mediation is suitable. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      REVISED TRIAL NOTICE: (As to Final Pretrial Conference & deadlines only) Pretrial Statements due 9/11/2012. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 9/25/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2012 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Jury Trial set for two-week period beginning 10/16/2012 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 9/14/2012. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 9/28/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2012 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Jury Trial set for two-week period beginning 10/16/2012 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines. Text of Order: Granted. Trial is continued to the two-week trial period beginning October 16, 2012. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion to Extend Time to Disclose Experts. Text of Order: Granted. The court notes, however, that the summary judgment deadline is not extended and remains April 2, 2012. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 7/23/2012. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 8/6/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Jury Trial set for two-week period beginning 8/21/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER approving 6 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order with the following modifications: Motions to dismiss due on or before August 24, 2011; Trial: Two week period beginning August 21, 2012. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 4/2/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 8/24/2011. Mediation Follow Up on 3/1/2012. (ko)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2011 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Follow up on Discovery Plan 5/18/2011. (kad)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:11-cv-159-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (jeb)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click HERE. (jeb)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re 1 Notice of Removal filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. Jury demand was entered on the docket sheet for both the plaintiff and defendant when defendant filed case initiating document (Notice of Removal) but was not included in that initiating document in accordance with LR 38.1. The jury demand entered by the defendant has been removed. Jury demand has been entered on the docket for the plaintiff only. (jeb)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?