Raymond J Fuentes
Bankruptcy Case California Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-12624
District Judge Margaret M. Mann, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cecilia Fuentes, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew E Faler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Faler +1 714 465 4433 +1 714 965 7823 faler.matthew@gmail.com
No Logo David L. Skelton, Trustee
No Logo Raymond J Fuentes, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew E Faler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Faler +1 714 465 4433 +1 714 965 7823 faler.matthew@gmail.com
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
Virtual Entry. Termination of Hearing DATE: 06/26/2012, MATTER: MOTION TO DISMISS CASE FILED BY TRUSTEE (fr. 5/15/12). Tentative Ruling as issued is the order of the court. Appearances waived. (vCal Hearing ID (242454)). HEARING Scheduled for 07/24/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse . (related documents 66 Motion to Dismiss Bankruptcy Case; w/Right to request hearing) (Robinson, G.) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
    Request and Notice of Hearing regarding Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case; HEARING Scheduled for 5/15/2012 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse . .. (related documents 69 Opposition) (Duran, K.) Modified on 3/13/2012 (Robinson, G.). (Entered: 03/12/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
      Court Notice Served On: 02/09/2012. Unless an Order Shortening Time has been entered, Request for Hearing and Opposition due by: 03/08/2012. If you were served electronically or by mail, you have three additional days to take actions as calculated by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9006(f). Opposition due by: 03/12/2012. (related document 67 Motion to Dismiss Case, Notice of Motion With Right to Request Hearing.) (Admin) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
        Amended Virtual Entry. Termination of Hearing DATE: 04/06/2011, MATTER: MOTION TO VALUE COLLATERAL AND AVOID SECOND TRUST DEED LIEN HELD BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA. Amended Tentative Ruling as issued is the Order of the Court. Appearances waived. (vCal Hearing ID (186296)). (related documents 24 Motion to Avoid Lien) (McGrew, J.). (*COURT NOTE: Amended to reflect amended tentative ruling is order of the court). Modified on 4/25/2011 (McGrew, J.). (Entered: 04/25/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
          Virtual Entry. Termination of Hearing DATE: 04/06/2011, MATTER: MOTION TO VALUE COLLATERAL AND AVOID SECOND TRUST DEED LIEN HELD BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA. Tentative Ruling as issued is the Order of the Court. Appearances waived. (vCal Hearing ID (178114)). (related documents 24 Motion to Avoid Lien) (McGrew, J.) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
            Request for Special Notice HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., 3936 E. Fort Lowell Road, Suite #200, Tucson, AZ 85712 filed by HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. (Bass, Patti) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
              Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at 525 B Street, street level mutipurpose room, San Diego, CA 92101-4432 . (Skelton 5, David) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/1/2010 at 04:00 PM at Suite 1360 (B), Hearing Room B, Emerald Plaza Building (Ch13) . (Skelton 5, David) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                  Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings. U.S. Party/Index Findings: CAS 10-11375-MM13 Filed 06/29/10, Dismissed 07/14/10, (Clark, S.) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                    Receipt of Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition(10-12624-13) [misc,1305u] ( 274.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 274.00 Receipt number 5349793. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Space Space

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 167 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?