Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Homeland Security
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-05526
District Judge Susan Illston, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 6:33 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Ann Lynch +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 jlynch@eff.org
Space David L. Sobel +2027 979 009 x104 +1 202 797 9066 sobel@eff.org

Toggle Switch Represented by U.C. Berkeley School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M. Schultz +1 415 436 9993 jschultz@law.berkeley.edu
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2011 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
    ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND DIRECTING COUNSEL TO SUBMIT NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
      ORDER allowing phone appearance (counsel shall provide the Court with the number to be conferenced) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
        STIPULATION To Permit Defense Counsel To Appear Telephonically At Hearing by Department of Homeland Security. (Cartier, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/19/2011) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER RELATING CASE to 09-5640 Signed by Judge Illston (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/14/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
            Reply to Opposition re 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jason Schultz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/14/2011) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
              Memorandum in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byDepartment of Homeland Security. (Cartier, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/7/2011) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE by Department of Homeland Security of Declination of Magistrate Judge (Cartier, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/6/2011) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to Complaint byDepartment of Homeland Security. (Cartier, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/6/2011) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Patrick Cartier (Cartier, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/6/2011) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Schultz Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Schultz Declaration)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/22/2010) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Frontier Foundation.. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2010) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          CLERKS NOTICE to Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 1/3/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 12/17/10,granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David L. Sobel. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Admission of Attorney David L. Sobel to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611054042) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re 3 Summons Issued, 4 ADR Scheduling Order, 2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 1 Complaint (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/7/2010) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                    Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Frontier Foundation (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                        COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Department of Homeland Security (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611053579.). Filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?