USA v. Cheney
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-00441-MHP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 14, 2017 at 5:34 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derek R Owens +1 415 436 6488 Derek.Owens@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Arthur Eli Cheney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steve Gary Kalar +1 415 436 7711 +1 415 436 7706 Steven_Kalar@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Francisco
Filed 7/7/2008
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
307-mj-70734-MAG
Count 1-20
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a) Bank Robbery
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None PRB12
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER RE TRANSFER TO FDC DUBLIN as to Arthur Eli Cheney; Signed by Judge Hon. Marilyn H. Patel on 9/5/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Letter
      Letter from STEVEN G. KALAR, ASSISTANT FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Arthur Eli Cheney (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kalar, Steve) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Plea Agreement
        PLEA AGREEMENT as to Arthur Eli Cheney (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Application and Order Accepting PleaCourt Filing
          Application for Permission to Enter Plea of Guilty and ORDER Accepting PLEA as to Arthur Eli Cheney; Signed by Judge Hon. Marilyn H. Patel on 8/25/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Marilyn H. Patel:Change of Plea Hearing as to Arthur Eli Cheney held on 8/25/2008, Plea entered by Arthur Eli Cheney (1) Guilty Count 1-20. Sentencing set for 10/20/2008 09:00 AM before Hon. Marilyn H. Patel. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Terminate Deadlines and HearingsCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Marilyn H. Patel:Status Conference as to Arthur Eli Cheney held on 7/21/2008; Change of Plea Hearing set for 8/25/2008 10:00 AM before Hon. Marilyn H. Patel; Sentencing set for 10/20/2008 09:00 AM before Hon. Marilyn H. Patel. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2008) Modified on 7/24/2008 (rhw, COURT STAFF).
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Waiver of Indictment
                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Arthur Eli Cheney (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas:Arraignment as to Arthur Eli Cheney (1) Count 1-20 held on 7/9/2008 ; not guilty plea entered. Defendant remanded to custody. Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/21/2008 10:00 PM before Hon. Marilyn H. Patel. (Tape #10:08-10:12.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Information - Felony
                    INFORMATION as to Arthur Eli Cheney (1) count(s) 1-20. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                      CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing.
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Arthur Eli Cheney Arraignment set for 7/9/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/08. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Proposed Order
                          Proposed Order by Arthur Eli Cheney [PROPOSED] STIPULATED ORDER CONTINUING ARRAIGNMENT (Kalar, Steve) (Filed on 7/2/2008)[3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen:Status Conference as to Arthur Eli Cheney held on 5/22/2008 Status Conference set for 7/8/2008 09:30 AM. (Tape #9:41-9:43.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2008)[3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson:Status Conference as to Arthur Eli Cheney held on 4/24/2008 Status Conference set for 5/22/2008 09:30 AM. (Tape #9:46-9:48.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2008)[3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson:Status Conference as to Arthur Eli Cheney held on 4/1/2008 Status Conference set for 4/24/2008 09:30 AM. (Tape #9:45-9:49.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2008)[3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James:Detention Hearing as to Arthur Eli Cheney NOT held on 2/6/2008 Detention Hearing set for 4/1/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James Larson. Unsealing granted. Request that affidavit ONLY REMAIN SEALED.(Tape #9:50-9:52.) (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)[3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER as to Arthur Eli Cheney re eye exam. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/29/08. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008) (lsk, COURT STAFF).[3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James:Initial Appearance as to Arthur Eli Cheney held on 1/23/2008, Added attorney Steve Gary Kalar for Arthur Eli Cheney. Detention Hearing set for 2/6/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (Tape #9:45-9:50.) (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008) (lsk, COURT STAFF).[3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Receipt
                                        Receipt of Documents from Eastern District of California (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2007) (lsk, COURT STAFF).[3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Order to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                          Order to Seal Case as to Arthur Eli Cheney. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/11/07. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2007) (lsk, COURT STAFF).[3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT as to Arthur Eli Cheney (1). (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2007) (lsk, COURT STAFF).[3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 2/28/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                              CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. [3:07-mj-70734-MAG]
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?