Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Banc of America Securities LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-06690
District Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 11:13 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark B. Holton +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 4035 mholton@gibsondunn.com

Represented by Grais & Ellsworth LLP

Represented by Morris Law Group PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni A Jamison +1 702 474 9400 jaj@morrislawgroup.com

Represented by Morris Peterson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R. McCoy +1 702 474 9400 +1 702 474 9422 rrm@morrislawgroup.com
v.
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Joan Cox +1 213 683 9575 +1 213 683 5175

Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Christopher Jorgensen , +1 702 474 2642 +1 702 216 6178 cjorgensen@lrlaw.com

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua J. Fritsch

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Represented by Unknown Entity AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver J Pancheri +1 702 791 0308 +1 702 791 1912 OPancheri@nevadafirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas J Santoro +1 702 791 0308 +1 702 791 1912 nsantoro@nevadafirm.com
Morgan Stanley & Company Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley & Company LLC"
Director, Toy Biz, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pagemart Wireless, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vital Images, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xcyte Therapies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Websense, Inc.
Officer/Director, Silgan Holdings Inc.
Officer/Director, Msci Inc.
Officer/Director, Allegiance Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Wci Communities, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gramercy Capital Corp.
Officer/Director, Discover Financial Services
Officer/Director, Cadiz Land Co Inc
Officer/Director, Ivf America Inc /de
Officer/Director, Jefferson Smurfit Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Imre Corp
Officer/Director, Uniholding Corp
Officer/Director, Cardiac Pathways Corp
Officer/Director, Impsat Corp
Officer/Director, Allscripts Inc /il
Officer/Director, Allscripts Holding Inc
Officer/Director, Psf Group Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, Acquicor Technology Inc
Officer/Director, Constant Contact, Inc.
Officer/Director, Big Entertainment, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Digitalglobe, Inc.
Officer/Director, Remec, Inc.
Officer/Director, Golden Tan, Inc
Officer/Director, Ms Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, NB Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Lazarus Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Texas Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Innocoll Holdings plc
Officer/Director, Visions In Glass Inc
Officer/Director, Bloom Energy Corp
Officer/Director, Leisure Acquisition Corp.
Officer/Director, Rps Realty Trust
Officer/Director, Symix Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cfw Communications Co
Officer/Director, Saratogo Holdings I Inc
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc

Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Norman George +1 212 450 4103 +1 212 701 5103 nicholas.george@davispolk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com

Represented by Kummer Kaempger Bonner Renshaw & Ferrario

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E Ferrario +1 702 792 7000
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
              Letter to Counsel issued on case number 2:12-cv-6690 MRP (MANx). (esa) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                LETTER Requesting Transfer of MDL case to this District sent to Nevada re transfer of their case number 2:12-CV-532 for consolidation with 11-2265. (esa) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 8/3/12 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:12-532 from Nevada. Case assigned to Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 11-2265. (esa) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                    ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Nevada (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                      CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by MDL Panel on 8/3/12. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                        MINUTE ORDER regarding MDL Transfer. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 8/3/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                          CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER re MDL 2265. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, these actions are transferred to the Central District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Mariana R. Pfaelzer for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chairman John G. Heyburn II, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 8/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER Denying 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 7/12/2012. Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Company's motion for hearing 68 re its motion to remand to state court 42 is DENIED. The court's order on the motion to remand is complete and will issue forthwith.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Hearing re 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 7/11/2012. (MAJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of JPML Hearing Session and Request for Hearing by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation re 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                    STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 64 Motion to Remove Attorney Leanne M. Wilson from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to remove attorney(s) Leanne M. Wilson from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 6/14/2012. (McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                          (1st Notice) NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Jeffrey T. Scott, Joshua J. Fritsch and Leanne M. Wilson are in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select CM/ECF Info, to register the Attorney(s).(no image attached) (RFJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                            (1st Notice) NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Daniel J. Schwartz, James P. Rouhandeh and Nicholas N. George are in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select CM/ECF Info, to register the Attorney(s). (no image attached) (RFJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER Granting 60 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Court will therefore accept plaintiff's reply brief 59 filed in support of the motion to remand. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to Exceed Limitation on Length for Reply in Support of Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 6/8/2012. (McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY to Response to 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court ; filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE to 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. Replies due by 6/11/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit)(Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER Granting 52 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas N. George for Morgan Stanley & Company LLC and approving Attorney Mark E. Ferrario as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER Granting 54 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. Rouhandeh for Morgan Stanley & Company LLC and approving Attorney Mark E. Ferrario as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER Granting 53 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel J. Schwartz for Morgan Stanley & Company LLC and approving Attorney Mark E. Ferrario as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                            VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James P. Rouhandeh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark E. Ferrario (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2380447) filed by Defendant Morgan Stanley & Company LLC. Motion ripe 5/23/2012. (Ferrario, Mark) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                              VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J. Schwartz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark E. Ferrario (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2380439) filed by Defendant Morgan Stanley & Company LLC. Motion ripe 5/23/2012. (Ferrario, Mark) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas N. George and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark E. Ferrario (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2380429) filed by Defendant Morgan Stanley & Company LLC. Motion ripe 5/23/2012. (Ferrario, Mark) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER Granting 47 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey T. Scott for Barclays Capital Inc. and approving Attorney Nicholas Santoro as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER instructing parties that 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation will be adjudicated. Defendants shall file opposition within 14 days of this order. Any replies shall be filed within 7 days of the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER Granting 48 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua J. Fritsch and approving Attorney Nicholas J. Santoro as Designation of Local Counsel for Barclays Capital, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joshua J. Fritsch and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2369580) filed by Defendant Barclays Capital Inc.. Motion ripe 5/14/2012. (Pancheri, Oliver) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey T. Scott and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2369571) filed by Defendant Barclays Capital Inc.. Motion ripe 5/14/2012. (Pancheri, Oliver) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER Granting 12 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Transfer Decision by Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation. Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 5/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY to Response to 12 MOTION to Stay ; filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE to 12 MOTION to Stay, filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Replies due by 5/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 5/13/2012. (McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Granting 21 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Erin Cox and approving Attorney J.C. Jorgensen as Designation of Local Counsel for Banc of America Securities LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER Granting 22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James C. Rutten and approving Attorney J.C. Jorgensen as Designation of Local Counsel for Banc of America Securities LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER Granting 23 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc T.G. Dworsky and approving Attorney JC Jorgensen as Designation of Local Counsel for Banc of America Securities, LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER Granting 18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mary G. Menge for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation and approving Morris Law Group as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER Granting 19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David J. Grais and approving Morris Law Group as Designation of Local Counsel for FDIC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Granting 20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark B. Holton and approving Morris Law Group as Designation of Local Counsel as to FDIC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 20 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Holton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344465) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Holton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344465) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached). (McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 19 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Grais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344448) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Grais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344448) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached). (McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 18 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary G. Menge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344424) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary G. Menge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344424) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached). (McCoy, Robert) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 21 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Cox and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345174) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Cox and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345174) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC (no image attached)IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Erin Cox defendant's counsel is directed to correct questions, 5,6,7 and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#21) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Cox's Verified Petition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 23 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc T.G. Dworsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345218) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc T.G. Dworsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345218) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 22 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James C. Rutten and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345210) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James C. Rutten and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345210) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 21 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Cox and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345174) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Cox and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345174) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 20 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Holton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344465) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Holton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344465) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (no image attached)IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Mark Holton plaintiff's counsel is directed to correct questions 5,6 and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#20) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Holton's Verified Petition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 23 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc T.G. Dworsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345218) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc T.G. Dworsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345218) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Marc Dworsky defendant's counsel is directed to correct questions 5,6,7, and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#23) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Dworsky's Verified Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 22 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James C. Rutten and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345210) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James C. Rutten and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345210) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that James Rutten defendant's counsel is directed to correct questions 5,6,7 and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#22) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Rutten's Verified Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 19 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Grais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344448) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Grais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344448) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURTthat David J. Grais plaintiff's counsel is directed to correct questions 5,6, and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#19) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Grais's Verified Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 18 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary G. Menge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344424) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary G. Menge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344424) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Mary G. Menge plaintiff's counsel is directed to correct questions 5,6 and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#18) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Ms. Menge's Verified Petition.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc T.G. Dworsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345218) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. Motion ripe 4/23/2012. (Jorgensen, J.) Corrected image 31 added on 4/23/2012 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James C. Rutten and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345210) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. Motion ripe 4/23/2012. (Jorgensen, J.) Corrected image 30 added on 4/23/2012 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Cox and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345174) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. Motion ripe 4/23/2012. (Jorgensen, J.) Corrected image 29 added on 4/23/2012 (RFJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Holton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344465) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 4/20/2012. (McCoy, Robert) Corrected image 35 filed on 4/24/2012 (SRK). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Grais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344448) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 4/20/2012. (McCoy, Robert) Corrected image 34 filed on 4/24/2012 (SRK). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary G. Menge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344424) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 4/20/2012. (McCoy, Robert) Corrected image 33 filed on 4/24/2012 (SRK). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT to 12 MOTION to Stay ; by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Minutes of the Court by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC re 3 Minute Order re Removal,. (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of 11 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Mark Ferrario advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations which have a direct, pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached)(ASB) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. Motion ripe 4/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Morgan Stanley & Company LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Ferrario, Mark) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC Notice of Filing a Notice of Removal to U.S. District Court (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC of Filing in the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation of Defendants' Notice of Related Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 4/2/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Erin Smith. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:12-cv-0532-JCM-RJJ. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Banc of America Securities LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Other Affiliate Aegis Mortgage Corporation, Other Affiliate First Magnus Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Fieldstone Mortgage Company, Other Affiliate Alliance Bancorp, Other Affiliate Home Savings Mortgage, Other Affiliate American Home Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CWALT, Inc., Other Affiliate Alliance Bancorp Inc., Other Affiliate American Home Mortgage Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Cal Coast Mortgage Corporation, Other Affiliate ComUnity Lending, Inc., Other Affiliate First NLC Financial Services LLC, Other Affiliate New Century TRS Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Oak Street Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate Prime Mortgage Financial, Inc. for Banc of America Securities LLC added.. (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Barclays Capital Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Barclays plc, Other Affiliate Barclays Bank PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays Group US Inc for Barclays Capital Inc. added.. (Pancheri, Oliver) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Marc T.G. Dworsky, James C. Rutten, Erin J. Cox, David J. Grais, Mark B. Holton, and Leanne M. Wilson to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 5/14/2012.(no image attached) (EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 3/30/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Erin Smith. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/17/2012. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-12-657025-B, (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2322116), filed by Banc of America Securities LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jorgensen, J.) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2012.] (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 386 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?