Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. ViewSonic Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00521
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 5:05 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
v.
No Logo Viewsonic Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Forrest Utley +1 214 978 3036 +1 214 978 3099 jay.utley@bakermckenzie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Vincent Wells +1 214 978 3006 +1 214 978 3099 richard.wells@bakermckenzie.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
      Norman IP Holdings LLC's ANSWER to 5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of ViewSonic Corporation by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
        ANSWER to 2 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by ViewSonic Corporation.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ViewSonic Corporation (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
            MOTION TO DISMISS for Improper Joinder by ViewSonic Corporation (See docket entry #132 in Lead Case 6:11cv495) (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against ViewSonic Corporation, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant ViewSonic Corporation from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Space Space

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 115 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?