Lightspeed Media Corporation v. Shashek

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Southern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00860
District Judge William D. Stiehl, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge William D. Stiehl
Last Updated November 10, 2016 at 2:07 AM EST (8.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Lightspeed Media Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Prenda Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Duffy +1 312 952 6136 pduffy@duffygroup.com
v.
No Logo Lucas Shashek, Defendant

Represented by Dana McKitrick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Gerdes Long +1 314 726 1000 +1 314 725 6592 llong@dmfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. McKitrick +1 314 889 7122 +1 314 725 6592 mmckitrick@dmfirm.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Clerks JudgmentCourt Filing
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge William D. Stiehl on 2/20/13. (car) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 Order Dismissing Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Motion for Leave to File
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Notice of Scheduling and Discovery Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Notice of Scheduling and Discovery Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 CJRA Track
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Notice of Deficiencies
NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re 11 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Lucas Shashek. See attached document for specifics (myz ) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: 9/20/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss (Reply Brief in Further Support) filed by Lucas Shashek. (Long, Laura) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Bohm on behalf of Lucas Shashek (Bohm, David) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/10/2012 Response to Motion
RESPONSE to Motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lightspeed Media Corporation. (Duffy, Paul) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Duffy on behalf of Lightspeed Media Corporation (Duffy, Paul) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lucas Shashek. (Long, Laura) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Lucas Shashek. Responses due by 9/10/2012 (Long, Laura) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012 Notice of Deficiencies
NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re 2 Notice of Removal filed by Lucas Shashek. Case number not listed on document. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 12-860-WDS/DGW. No further action required.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Gerdes Long on behalf of Lucas Shashek (Long, Laura) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Notice of Removal
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lucas Shashek ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0754-1746954) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKitrick, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Case OpenedCourt Filing
Case Opened. Filing Fee Due. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 12-860-WDS-DGW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge)(cekf) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 168 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?