Vazquez v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-06277-LBS-FM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 2:16 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jessenia Vazquez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan S. Abady +1 212 763 5000 +1 212 763 5001 jabady@ecbalaw.com
Space Eisha Jain +1 212 763 5000 +1 212 763 5001 ejain@ecbalaw.com
Space David A Lebowitz +1 212 763 5000 +1 212 763 5001 dlebowitz@ecbalaw.com
Space Julia Wei Mun Fong Sheketoff +1 212 763 5000 +1 212 763 5001 jsheketoff@ecbalaw.com
Space Elizabeth S Saylor +1 212 763 5065 +1 212 763 5001 esaylor@ecbalaw.com
Space Earl S Ward +1 212 763 5070 +1 212 763 5001 eward@ecbalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Romano & Kuan, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia P. Kuan +1 212 274 0777 +1 212 274 9790 julia.kuan@romanoandkuan.com
v.
No Logo Annabella Nieves, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caroline Ling-Yu Chen +1 212 788 2000 +1 212 788 0367 caroline.chen@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall M. Elfenbein +1 212 788 1650 +1 212 788 9776 relfenbe@law.nyc.gov
Space Elan David Parra +1 212 442 8600 +1 212 788 9776 eparra@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Michael Donnelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shlomit Aroubas +1 212 442 2715 +1 212 788 9776 saroubas@law.nyc.gov
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
Space Stephanie Marie Breslow +1 212 788 1575 +1 212 788 9776 sbreslow@law.nyc.gov
Space Elan David Parra +1 212 442 8600 +1 212 788 9776 eparra@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon Clare Elwell +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 788 9776 selwell@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Thomas Aiello, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (224) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF COMPROMISE granting 217 Motion to Approve: The Stipulation of Settlement and the Four Million Nine Hundred Thousand ($4,900,000) Dollars to resolve this action are approved and deemed adequate and reasonable, and Plaintiff Jessenia Vazquez, as Administrator of the Estate of Israel Vasquez, Deceased, is authorized to settle and discontinue the claims and causes of action of the Estate against the defendants. The City of New York shall deliver to plaintiff's counsel a check made payable to "Romano & Kuan, PLLC, as attorney for Jessenia Vazquez, as Administrator of the Estate of Israel Vasquez" in the amount of Four Million Nine Hundred Thousand ($4,900,000) Dollars (the "Settlement Amount"). Of the Settlement Amount, one-third, which is equivalent to $1,633,333.33 is approved as the attorneys' fees of plaintiff's counsel, Romano & Kuan, PLLC and Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP, for services for the plaintiff herein. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 217. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/25/2014) (tn) Modified on 11/26/2014 (tn). (Entered: 11/25/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/13/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/13/2014 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2015.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of Jessenia Vazquez in Support re: 217 CONSENT MOTION to Approve Compromise .. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D - Text of Proposed Order)(Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
          DECLARATION of Elizabeth S. Saylor in Support re: 217 CONSENT MOTION to Approve Compromise .. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
            CONSENT MOTION to Approve Compromise . Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The action is hereby dismissed with prejudice; and Notwithstanding the dismissal of this action in accordance with this agreement, the District Court shall continue to maintain jurisdiction over this action for the propose of enforcing the terms of the settlement agreement reached between the parties and set forth in the Stipulation of Settlement executed by the parties in this matter. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/24/2014) (ab) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 213 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order at the November 13, 2014 Discovery Conference. . Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (DePaul, Philip) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of Philip R. DePaul in Support re: 213 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order at the November 13, 2014 Discovery Conference.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(DePaul, Philip) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order at the November 13, 2014 Discovery Conference. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually).(DePaul, Philip) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      SEALING ORDER: Accordingly, the Court will file the documents at issue (PRIV18-PRIV25, PRIV116, PRIV138, PRV145, PRIV163, and PRIV165) under seal so that they are part of the record. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/19/2014) (tn) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: In a joint letter dated November 10, 2014, the parties joined issue over Plaintiffs demand for thirteen documents created in connection with witness interviews that the Bronx District Attorney's Office conducted during the 2012-2013 reinvestigation of the murders at issue in this civil rights case. (Docket No. 208). Defendants maintain that the documents constitute protected attorney work product. (Id.). Upon due consideration of the parties' joint letter, counsels' arguments at the conference held yesterday, Plaintiff's supplemental letter filed after the conference yesterday (Docket No. 210), and the documents at issue themselves (which the Court reviewed in camera), Plaintiffs request is granted in part and denied in part. (SEE ORDER.) Defendants shall make the productions required by this Memorandum Opinion and Order to Plaintiff no later than November 17, 2014, at noon. If Plaintiff has any objections to any redactions, she shall advise the Court no later than November 18, 2014, at noon but not before conferring with defense counsel in good faith in an effort to resolve the dispute. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/14/2014) (ab) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David A. Lebowitz dated November 13, 2014 re: Application of People v. Rosario to Documents Under In Camera Review. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall appear for a conference with the Court on November 13, 2014, at 10 a.m., to discuss the issues raise in their joint letter dated November 10, 2014 (but filed on November 11, 2014). (Docket No. 208). Defendants shall bring to the conference the witness interview materials in dispute. Further, the parties should each be prepared to identify two or three of the documents at issue for in camera review in case the Court adopts Plaintiff's proposed approach to resolving the dispute. Status Conference set for 11/13/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/12/2014) (tn) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David A. Lebowitz dated 11/10/2014 re: Discovery Disputes. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Markup of Defendants' Privilege Log, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures)(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER denying 206 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference without prejudice to renewal after the parties have met and conferred in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices. To that end, no later than November 6, 2014, counsel shall meet and confer IN PERSON for no fewer than two hours to go over Plaintiff's objections in detail. If any items on the privilege log remain in dispute after that meeting, the parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court on November 7, 2014, proposing an expedited process to resolve the dispute(s). Defendants are warned that failure to provide the requisite amount of information as to any documents on the log may result in waiver of any otherwise applicable privilege, and that frivolous invocation of privilege may result in sanctions. The Court is rapidly losing patience with counsel; the parties should be focused on preparation of the joint pretrial order and preparation for trial, not bickering over discovery-related issues. Any failure to confer in good faith and any dilatory conduct will therefore result in sanctions. Furthermore, all dates and deadlines - including the deadline for submission of the joint pretrial order - remain in effect and will not be extended absent extraordinary circumstances. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David A. Lebowitz dated 11/4/2014. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a motion proceeding held on 10/24/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: motion held on 10/24/2014 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/1/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David A. Lebowitz dated October 23, 2014 re: Defendants' Letter Response of October 23, 2014. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Philip R. DePaul dated October 23, 2014 re: 200 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Elizabeth S. Saylor dated October 22, 2014. . Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (DePaul, Philip) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 200 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The parties shall appear for a conference on October 24, 2014, at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Defense counsel should be prepared to address, among other things, what quantity of the newly disclosed documents are relevant to the Vazquez matter and/or responsive to Plaintiff's discovery requests and approximately how long they have known about those documents. Defendants may file a letter in response to Plaintiff's letter tomorrow if they want. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Elizabeth S. Saylor dated October 22, 2014. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 198 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to file joint pretrial order and related filings. The deadline is extended to November 25, 2014. Given the age and history of the case, the parties should not anticipate any further adjournments of that deadline. The Court is not in a position to set a firm trial date given the priority of felony criminal trials, but the parties should be prepared to go to trial on January 5, 2015. The Court will confirm the trial date, and set a date for the final pretrial conference, after the parties file the joint pretrial order. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial Order and for a Date Certain for Trial addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David A. Lebowitz dated September 17, 2014. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER: Pursuant to the telephone conference held today, it is hereby ORDERED that: A settlement conference shall be held on October 23, 2014, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 20A. A representative of the Office of the New York City Comptroller with settlement authority is directed to appear. Counsel should submit any application regarding pretrial submissions directly to Judge Furman. (Settlement Conference set for 10/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/15/2014) (ja) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 9/15/2014 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Counsel for the Plaintiffs should initiate that conference by calling Chambers at (212) 805-6727. Requests for adjournment must be made to the Court, in writing, at least 48 hours prior to the conference. (tn) Modified on 9/10/2014 (tn). (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan S. Abady on behalf of Jessenia Vazquez. (Abady, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 194 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          OPINION AND ORDER re: 125 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert filed by Thomas Aiello, Michael Donnelly; 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Aiello, Michael Donnelly; 163 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by Jessenia Vazquez: For the reasons set forth within, all three pending motions are DENIED. The parties shall immediately contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Maas (to whom the case was previously referred for settlement purposes (Docket No. 188)) in the event that they are interested in having another settlement conference (either jointly with the related cases cited above or individually). Regardless, within thirty days of this Opinion and Order, the parties shall submit to the Court for its approval a Joint Pretrial Order prepared in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3) and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices. The parties should follow Paragraph 5 of the Courts Individual Rules and Practices, which identifies submissions that must be made at or before the time of the Joint Pretrial Order, including any motions in limine. At or before the same date, the parties shall also file joint requests to charge, joint proposed verdict forms, and joint proposed voir dire questions in accordance with the Courts Individual Rules and Practices. Jury instructions may not be submitted after the Joint Pretrial Order due date, unless they meet the standard of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 51(a)(2)(A). The parties shall be ready for trial approximately two weeks after the Joint Pretrial Order is filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket Numbers 125, 145, and 163. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/5/2014) (ab) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 191 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 191. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/29/2014) (mro) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Shlomit Aroubas in Support re: 191 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually).(Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Shlomit Aroubas dated 5/23/2014 re: Defendants write to appraise the Court of their position relating to the settlement of the above actions. ENDORSEMENT: Whether settlement discussions might be useful is something for Judge Furman and me -- not the City -- to determine. Nonetheless, I recognize that the City cannot secure any authority without an initial demand. Plaintiffs' counsel are therefore directed to confer with their clients and convey such a demand, in writing, by June 2, 2014. Thereafter, unless I am persuaded otherwise, the settlement conference will proceed as previously scheduled. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 5/27/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Earl S. Ward, Elizabeth Saylor and David Lebowitz dated 5/23/2014 re: Plaintiffs' counsel have reviewed Your Honor's settlement procedures and are ready and available to engage in meaningful settlement discussions in accordance with them. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a settlement conference on June 20, 2014, at 10 am. in Courtroom 20A., ( Settlement Conference set for 6/20/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 5/27/2014) (lmb) Modified on 5/27/2014 (lmb). (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. In light of the referral to Magistrate Judge Maas for settlement purposes of the related cases, Watkins v. City of New York, 14 Civ. 887 (JMF) et al., the parties in this case are likewise directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Maas no later than May 23, 2014, to discuss settlement. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/12/2014) (mro) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: By letter dated April 24, 2014, Defendants have moved for a modification of the protective order designating all video recordings, including but not limited to all videotaped depositions, and other items "confidential." (Docket No. 185). Upon due consideration of the parties' letters (Docket Nos. 185-86), and the cases cited therein, Defendants' motion is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/2/2014) (mro) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David A. Lebowitz dated 4/25/2014 re: Response to Defendants' Letter 185 Request for Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Shannon C. Elwell dated April 24, 2014 re: Modification of Existing Stipulation and Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually).(Elwell, Shannon) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 183 Letter addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David A. Lebowitz dated April 9, 2014 re: Defendants' Letter Application of April 9, 2014: Defendants request for a protective order is DENIED, substantially for the reasons set forth in this letter (especially in light of the fact that Defendants made the relevant deposition transcript part of the public record already), but without prejudice to reapplication - after conferring with Plaintiff's counsel - should the circumstances warrant it. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/9/2014) (ab) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David A. Lebowitz dated April 9, 2014 re: Defendants' Letter Application of April 9, 2014. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Shannon C. Elwell dated April 9, 2014 re: Modification of the Existing Stipulation and Protective Order. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually).(Elwell, Shannon) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Earl S. Ward, Julia P. Kuan, Elizabeth S. Saylor and David A. Lebowitz dated 4/8/2014 re: Bermudez v. City of New York. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Shannon C. Elwell dated April 7, 2014 re: Decision in Bermudez v. City of New York, et al., 11 Civ. 750 (LAP). Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually).(Elwell, Shannon) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Earl S Ward on behalf of Jessenia Vazquez. New Address: Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP, 75 Rockefeller Plaza, 20th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10019, 212-763-5000. (Ward, Earl) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 163 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION of David Lebowitz in Support re: 163 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 163 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Curt P. Beck in Opposition re: 163 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Addendum to Defendants' 56.1 Statement)(Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - AFFIRMATION of Shlomit Aroubas in Support re: 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Aroubas, Shlomit) Modified on 12/11/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Shlomit Aroubas in Support re: 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit MM, # 2 Exhibit NN, # 3 Exhibit OO, # 4 Exhibit PP)(Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Aroubas, Shlomit) Modified on 12/11/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 169 as modified Defendants' Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 163 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11. Defendants shall file their opposition no later than 12/17/2013. Any reply is due by 12/24/2013. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Shlomit Aroubas dated November 22, 2013. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 166 Letter filed by Jessenia Vazquez. ENDORSEMENT: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, the default briefing schedule and page lengths under the Court's Local Rules shall apply. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/22/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Elizabeth Saylor dated November 21, 2013 re: Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 163 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Elizabeth Saylor in Support re: 163 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 160 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 12/9/2013. No further extensions will be granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of David A. Lebowitz in Opposition re: 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18-V, # 2 Exhibit 28-V, # 3 Exhibit 34-V, # 4 Exhibit 37)(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Shlomit Aroubas dated November 20, 2013. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually).(Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 158 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File transcripts. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Transcripts per Court memorandum endorsement dated November 5, 2013 addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David Lebowitz dated 11/15/2013. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of David A. Lebowitz in Opposition re: 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25-1, # 26 Exhibit 25-2, # 27 Exhibit 26-1, # 28 Exhibit 26-2, # 29 Exhibit 26-3, # 30 Exhibit 26-4, # 31 Exhibit 26-5, # 32 Exhibit 26-6, # 33 Exhibit 26-7, # 34 Exhibit 27, # 35 Exhibit 28, # 36 Exhibit 29, # 37 Exhibit 30, # 38 Exhibit 31, # 39 Exhibit 32, # 40 Exhibit 33, # 41 Exhibit 34, # 42 Exhibit 35, # 43 Exhibit 36)(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        COUNTER STATEMENT TO 146 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David Lebowitz dated November 8, 2013 re: Video Exhibits. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 152 Letter, filed by Jessenia Vazquez. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is granted leave to file the video and audio files at issue. At the time her papers are filed, Plaintiff shall provide two sets of the files in digital format on CD-ROMs - one to be docketed by the Court and one to be maintained in Chambers. The video of Ms. Gomez's testimony shall be on its own CD-ROM, which will be placed under seal pending further order of the Court. Plaintiff, however, must also submit transcripts of any and all files with an audio component. Plaintiff is granted until November 15, 2013, to file the transcripts; all other papers remain due on November 8, 2013. The Court will address any objections to the admissibility of the files in connection with its decision on the motion. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/5/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David Lebowitz dated 11/1/13 re: Use of Audio/Video Exhibits in Opposition to Summary Judgment. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 E-mail from Shlomit Aroubas, Assistant Corporation Counsel, Re: Audio/Video Exhibits)(Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Leave to File Audio/Video Exhibits in Opposition to Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from David Lebowitz dated 11/1/13. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 E-mail from Shlomit Aroubas regarding audio/video exhibits)(Lebowitz, David) Modified on 11/4/2013 (db). (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A Lebowitz on behalf of Jessenia Vazquez. (Lebowitz, David) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to ECF Quality Assurance from Shlomit Aroubas dated 10/25/2013 re: Please note that, as per instructions from the ECF help desk, Defendants also re-filed the entirety of our timely October 7, 2013 motion for summary judgment, but nothing else was corrected or changed. Defendants have apprised plaintiff of the corrections and supplied plaintiff with the corrected 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Facts in accordance with Judge Furman's individual rules. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 136 as moot., Motions terminated: 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Thomas Aiello, Michael Donnelly. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/31/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Shlomit Aroubas in Support re: 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit G_II, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Exhibit CC, # 31 Exhibit DD, # 32 Exhibit EE, # 33 Exhibit FF, # 34 Exhibit GG, # 35 Exhibit HH, # 36 Exhibit II, # 37 Exhibit JJ, # 38 Exhibit KK, # 39 Exhibit LL)(Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually).(Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Elizabeth Saylor dated 10/16/13 re: Response to Daubert Motion. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit June 27, 2013 Letter Producing NYPD Manual)(Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 125 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit June 27, 2013 Letter Producing NYPD Manual)(Saylor, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/17/2013 (db). (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re: 125 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert. Declaration of Curt Beck. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 125 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of SHLOMIT AROUBAS in Support re: 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit G_II, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Exhibit CC, # 31 Exhibit DD, # 32 Exhibit EE, # 33 Exhibit FF, # 34 Exhibit GG, # 35 Exhibit HH, # 36 Exhibit II, # 37 Exhibit JJ, # 38 Exhibit KK, # 39 Exhibit LL)(Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 140 DECLARATION) - DECLARATION of SHLOMIT AROUBAS in Support re: 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Aroubas, Shlomit) Modified on 10/8/2013 (db). (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - (SEE ENTRY# 146)RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Aroubas, Shlomit) Modified on 10/28/2013 (kj). (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually).(Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 133 Letter Motion for Extension of Time and Excess Pages. The application for an extension is granted. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due by 10/7/2013. Any opposition is due by 11/8/2013. Any reply is due by 11/25/2013. The application for excess pages is granted in part and denied in part. The parties' principal memoranda may be up to 40 pages long -- that is, 15 pages above the normal limit. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 09/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 132 Letter Motion for Conference re: 125 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert. The Court will advise the parties in the event it elects to hold oral argument. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 09/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve and File Defendants Motion for Summary Judgement and Extension of the Page Limit addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Shlomit Aroubas dated September 26, 2013. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually).(Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 125 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert. addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Elizabeth Saylor dated 9/25/2013. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 125 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Elizabeth Saylor in Opposition re: 125 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 128 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Elizabeth S. Saylor dated 9/23/2013. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 125 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Breslow, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Curt P. Beck in Support re: 125 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Breslow, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Witness Pursuant to Daubert. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually).(Breslow, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Proposed Expert Pursuant to Daubert. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Breslow, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Curt Beck dated 9/3/2013 re: In anticipation of serving their Daubert motion tomorrow, September 4, 2013, defendants respectfully request that Your Honor grant defendants a two page extension for their motion. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Counsel are reminded that, per the ECF Rule change effective today, letters going forward should be filed on ECF, not submitted by email. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/3/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Marie Breslow on behalf of Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually). (Breslow, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, as follows: 1. All claims in the above referenced action against NYPD Detective Annabella Nieves are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, and without costs, expenses or attorneys' fees as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/23/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Curt P. Beck and Elizabeth Saylor dated 8/16/2013 re: Counsel for defendant and plaintiff jointly and respectfully request that Your Honor So Order the proposed briefing schedule for both motions set forth below. Plaintiff's motion due on September 25, 2013 and defendants' reply, if any, will be due on October 9, 2013. With respect to the summary judgment motion, which was also scheduled to be due on September 4, 2013, the parties respectfully propose that; defendants' summary judgment motion be served by September 30, 2013; plaintiff's opposition be served by October 30, 2013; and defendants' reply be served by November 15, 2013. Defendant will file and serve Daubert Motion on 9/14/13, plaintiff's opposition, if any due on 9/25/13. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. No further extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. The parties shall promptly submit a stipulation with respect to the dismissal of claims against Nieves. (Motions due by 9/4/2013., Responses due by 9/25/2013, Replies due by 10/9/2013.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/16/2013) (rsh) Modified on 8/21/2013 (rsh). (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Elizabeth S. Saylor dated 7/25/2013 re: We write to request that defendants produce training materials that their police practices expert NYPD Inspector Joseph M. Herbert utilized while serving as an NYPD instructor in how to conduct homicide investigations. ENDORSEMENT: Upon due consideration of this letter and defendants' response dated today, plaintiff's application is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/26/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Shannon Elwell dated 7/26/2013 re: Defendants write to reply to Plaintiff's letter, dated July 25, 2013, requesting that we produce training materials that defendants' rebuttal expert witness, NYPD Inspector Joseph Herbert, used serving as an instructor on how to conduct homicide investigations. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually).(lmb) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 115 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Julia Wei Mun Fong Sheketoff terminated (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIRMATION of Julia Fong Sheketoff in Support re: 115 MOTION for Julia Fong Sheketoff to Withdraw as Attorney for the Plaintiff.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Sheketoff, Julia) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Julia Fong Sheketoff to Withdraw as Attorney for the Plaintiff. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Sheketoff, Julia) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Julia Fong Sheketoff to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 JS Affirmation i/s/o Motion to Withdraw)(Sheketoff, Julia) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 113 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 98 MOTION to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes filed by Jessenia Vazquez. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiff's request to unseal the grand jury minutes of Gomez, Tavares, and Watkins is GRANTED. Defendants and/or the Bronx County District Attorney's Office are ordered to disclose a copy of these minutes within fourteen days of this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close Docket Number 98. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/6/2013) (lmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 98 MOTION to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes filed by Jessenia Vazquez. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiff's request to unseal the grand jury minutes of Gomez, Tavares, and Watkins is GRANTED. Defendants and/or the Bronx County District Attorney's Office are ordered to disclose a copy of these minutes within fourteen days of this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close Docket Number 98. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/6/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Curt Beck dated 5/30/2013 re: As counsel for the Defendants in the above referenced case, we write to reply to plaintiff's response dated May 24, 2013, regarding the "approximately 306 pages" of "materials" which Defendants recently learned plaintiff had improperly withheld in violation of the Local Civil and Federal Rules based solely on unspecified claims of attorney-client privilege, work-product protection or the common interest rule. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually).(lmb) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Earl S. Ward dated 5/24/2013 re: This firm, along with Romano and Kuan, represents plaintiff in the above-captioned matter. We write in response to defendants' letter, dated May 21, 2013 requesting that plaintiff turn over documents withheld on the basis of the attorney-client privilege (including the common interest privilege) and work product privilege. Defendants' untimely request should be denied. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(lmb) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Curt Beck dated 5/21/2013 re: Defendants respectfully request that Your Honor order plaintiff to produce the documents that they belatedly disclosed they withheld in violation of the Rules. ENDORSEMENT: Per the Case Management Plan and Revised Scheduling Order entered on April 12, 2013, and the Court's endorsement dated May 2, 2013, fact discovery in this case ended on April 30, 2013, except for the limited purpose set forth in the endorsement of May 2nd. Defendants have not shown good cause for their failure to raise these issues before April 30, 2013. Accordingly, the application is DENIED. Both counsel are reminded that, under the Court's rules and the Case Management Plan, letters to the Court regarding discovery disputes may not exceed three pages. Going forward, the Court will strike any letter that fails to comply with that limitation. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/30/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 98 MOTION to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Ward, Earl) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Earl S. Ward dated 5/22/2013 re: We write in brief response to the opposition letters submitted by the Bronx District Attorney's Office and Defendants dated May 15, 2013 in response to Plaintiff's motion dated April 30, 2013 to unseal the grand jury testimony of three witnesses that are already part of the discovery in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: Parties may not file memoranda of law in letter form. Plaintiff is granted leave to file until Tuesday, May 28, 2013, to file a memoranda of law in further support of her motion. This letter will not be considered by the Court. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/24/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - RESPONSE in Support re: 98 MOTION to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Jain, Eisha) Modified on 5/23/2013 (db). (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Mary Jo L. Blanchard dated 5/15/2013 re: I am an Assistant District Attorney in the Office of the District Attorney, Bronx County, and I am writing this letter in response to Plaintiff's motion, dated April 30, 2013 (received by this Office on May 2, 2013), seeking a federal order unsealing state Grand Jury minutes from an on-going state prosecution and investigation into the deaths of Denise Raymond and Bathe Diop under Bronx County Indictment Number 1086/95. (lmb) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Shlomit Aroubas dated 5/15/2013 re: For the reasons set forth above, defendants respectfully request that Your Honor defer to the judgment of the Bronx County District Attorney's Office, as well as to the decision of Judge Boyle of Bronx County Supreme Court, and deny plaintiff's request to unseal any grand jury minutes in Indictment 1086/1995 until such time as the ongoing criminal re-investigation is concluded. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually).(lmb) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Plaintiff filed a motion to unseal grand jury minutes on May 1, 2013. (See Mot., May 1, 2013, ECF No. 98). Any opposition shall be filed within two weeks of that date. Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed one week after the opposition is filed. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/2/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Curt P. Beck dated 4/30/2013 re: The Police Defendants are now reluctantly forced to bring this matter to Your Honor's attention in order: (i) to preserve the Police Defendants' rights, should that be necessary, given today's discovery close, and (ii) to respectfully request that Your Honor either order plaintiff's counsel to comply with both the Federal Rules and their own promises to bring Ms. Vasquez back for the 1 hour and 15 minutes of deposition to which the Police Defendants are entitled under the Federal Rules and plaintiff's representations, or in the alternative, preclude plaintiff from using any of the belatedly produced documents or the information contained therein in any way in this litigation. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall appear for another deposition, not to exceed one hour and fifteen minutes and limited to the documents produced on April 24, 2013, and anything reasonably related to those documents. Such deposition shall take place no later than May 17, 2013. Fact discovery is otherwise closed in this case., ( Deposition due by 5/17/2013.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/2/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Eisha Jain dated 5/2/2013 re: This firm, along with Romano and Kuan, represents Plaintiff in the above-captioned matter. We write in response to Defendants' letter dated April 30, 2013 requesting to depose Plaintiff on a second day, after the close of discovery. Defendants' request should be denied. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(lmb) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes and supporting Memorandum of Law and Declaration of Eisha Jain served on Mary Jo Blanchard, Bronx DA's office on 4/30/13. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 98 MOTION to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Eisha Jain in Support re: 98 MOTION to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 95 MOTION to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Jain, Eisha) Modified on 5/1/2013 (db). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Eisha Jain in Support re: 95 MOTION to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jain, Eisha) Modified on 5/1/2013 (db). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez.(Jain, Eisha) Modified on 5/1/2013 (db). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Shannon Clare Elwell on behalf of Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually). New Address: New York City Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel, 100 Church Street, New York, NY, United States 10007, 212-356-2658. (Elwell, Shannon) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 92 MOTION to Unseal Document.. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Jain, Eisha) Modified on 5/1/2013 (db). (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Unseal Document. Document filed by Jessenia Vazquez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eisha Jain in Support of Motion to Unseal Grand Jury Minutes)(Jain, Eisha) Modified on 5/1/2013 (db). (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Clare Elwell on behalf of Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually) (Elwell, Shannon) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: The conference scheduled for May 2, 2013 is cancelled. Deposition due by 8/5/2013. Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2013. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/12/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Eisha Jain dated 4/4/2013 re: Counsel requests that the Court allow five months for expert discovery, as further set forth in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall appear for a conference with the court on 4/11/2013, at 3 p.m., in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007. (Status Conference set for 4/11/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/5/2013) (tro) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia P. Kuan on behalf of Jessenia Vazquez (Kuan, Julia) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth S. Saylor on behalf of Jessenia Vazquez (Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eisha Jain on behalf of Jessenia Vazquez (Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Earl S Ward on behalf of Jessenia Vazquez (Ward, Earl) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Wei Mun Fong Sheketoff on behalf of Jessenia Vazquez (Sheketoff, Julia) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Curt Peter Beck on behalf of Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually) (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Eisha Jain dated 3/29/2013 re: We write to seek clarification regarding this Court's ruling yesterday relating to the grand jury minutes. Specifically, we seek clarification regarding whether Defendants may prevent Plaintiff from using the grand jury minutes that are already part of the discovery in this matter (and have been for over a year) in upcoming depositions. ENDORSEMENT: The Court cannot give Plaintiff an advisory opinion on whether her use of the grand jury minutes would or would not be in compliance with New York law, but notes that Plaintiff proceeds at some peril. See, e.g., Turturro v. City of New York, 925 N.Y.S.2d 808, 810 (Sup. Ct. 2011). Per the Court's Order of March 28, 2013, any application to unseal grand jury minutes, whether in Plaintiff's possession or otherwise, should be made to the state court in the first instance. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/31/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Plaintiff's application is DENIED without prejudice to renewing it after seeking appropriate relief in state court. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/28/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: In advance of the pretrial conference scheduled for Thursday, May 2, 2013, at 3:00 PM,the parties are hereby ORDERED to submit via e-mail(Furman_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, by Thursday of the week prior to the pretrial conference. The letter should include the following information in separate paragraphs: as set forth in this order (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/6/2013) (js) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia Wei Mun Fong Sheketoff on behalf of Israel Vasquez (Sheketoff, Julia) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shlomit Aroubas on behalf of Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually) (Aroubas, Shlomit) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 37 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually).(Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Elizabeth S. Saylor dated 2/7/2013 re: We write to respectfully request that the Court (1) substitute Ms. Vasquez as party plaintiff in this action; and (2) extend discovery until June 28, 2013. We also write to confirm that the telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Maas on February 13, 2013 is cancelled because Your Honor withdrew the referral to Judge Maas. Dkts. # 67, 69. ENDORSEMENT: Ms. Vasquez appears to be a "proper party" within the meaning of Rule 25. See, e.g., Shapiro v. United States, No. 07 Civ. 161 (PKL), 2008 WL 4302614, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 17, 2008) (citations omitted). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that "Jessenia Vazquez, as Administrator of the Estate of Israel Vasquez" be substituted for "Israel Vasquez" as Plaintiff in this action and that the Clerk of the Court amend the caption of this case to reflect this substitution. In light of the age of this case and the length of discovery to date, the parties' request for an extension of discovery is granted, but ONLY to APRIL 30, 2013. In addition, the case management conference scheduled for February 27, 2013, is hereby rescheduled for May 2, 2013, at 3:00pm in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007., Jessenia Vazquez added. Israel Vasquez terminated., ( Discovery due by 4/30/2013.), ( Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/11/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Caroline L. Chen dated 12/21/2012 re: Pursuant to Your Honor's instructions during the conference that took place on December 11, 2012, I write to respectfully inform the Court of the status regarding the production of the Bronx District Attorney's (DA) prosecution records that underlie this action, including whether the production of the prosecution records underlying this matter is complete, any reasons if not so, and whether a privilege log has been provided for documents that are being withheld. Document filed by Defendants.(ama) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/11/2012 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Earl Ward dated 12/27/2012 re: Request to extend discovery until 2/27/2013. ENDORSEMENT: Discovery was indeed extended to February 27, 2013. Plaintiff's counsel shall move promptly to substitute a new plaintiff. ( Discovery due by 2/27/2013.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/2/2013) (cd) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Israel Vasquez on December 22, 2012. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD))(Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record yesterday, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Specifically, Plaintiffs Monell claim is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint to address the deficiencies in that claim, no later than January 10, 2013; no further opportunities to amend for those reasons will be granted. In addition, Plaintiffs claims against the New York City Police Department and his claims against the individual defendants in their official capacities are dismissed. Defendants' motion to dismiss is otherwise denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendants' motion (Docket No. 43). As discussed at the pretrial conference yesterday, it is FURTHER ORDERED that: The deadline for discovery is extended to February 27, 2013; Defendants are ORDERED to turn over the entire prosecution file AND to turn over a privilege log by December 21,2012. B y that same date, Defendants shall write a letter to the Court confirming that the entire prosecution file has been turned over and a privilege log has been turned over or explaining why they have not done so; The parties are ORDERED to submit a joint letter to the Court by December 27,2012, with respect to whether the United States Attorney's Office has disclosed the relevant documents in its possession and, if not, what the status of the process is; The parties are granted until January 18, 2013, to supplement their initial disclosures with any witnesses that they may want to call at trial; The parties shall appear for a pretrial conference on February 27, 2013, at 3:45 p.m., in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. In the case of discovery disputes, parties should follow Local Civil Rule 37.2 with the following modifications. Any party wishing to raise a discovery dispute with the Court must first confer in good faith with the opposing party, in person or by telephone, in an effort to resolve the dispute. If this meet-and-confer process does not resolve the dispute,the party may submit a letter to the Court, no longer than three pages, explaining the nature of the dispute and requesting an informal conference. Such a letter must include a representation that the meet-and-confer process occurred and was unsuccessful. If the opposing party wishes to respond to the letter, it must submit a responsive letter, not to exceed three pages, within three business days. Counsel should be prepared to discuss with the Court the matters raised by such letters, as the Court will seek to resolve discovery disputes quickly, by order, by conference, or by telephone. Discovery disputes will not be a justification for extending the discovery deadline and as further set forth herein.( Discovery due by 2/27/2013.), ( Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2013 at 03:45 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/12/2012) (ago) Modified on 12/14/2012 (ago). Modified on 12/28/2012 (ago). (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: On July 11, 2012 this case was referred to Magistrate Judge Maas for limited purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that the July 11, 2012 is withdrawn. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/12/2012) (ago) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The parties have brought to the attention of the Court conflicting endorsements regarding scheduling. (Compare Docket No. 66, with Docket No. 67). The latter endorsement is hereby vacated. Per the Court's November 16, 2012 endorsement, discovery is extended only until December 11, 2012, and the parties are ordered to appear for a conference on that date, when the scheduling of plaintiffs deposition and an extension of the discovery deadline will be discussed. (Discovery due by 12/11/2012.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/7/2012) (ab) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Caroline L. Chen dated 11/15/2012 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court grant the parties until February 27;2013, to complete discovery in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: The time to complete all discovery is extended to 2/27/13. I decline to get involved in the scheduling of plaintiff's deposition, which is something I expect counsel to work out. Additionally, the Court will hold a telephone conference on 2/13/2013 at 10 am. Mr Ward or Ms. Saylor should initiate the call. ( Discovery due by 2/27/2013. Telephone Conference set for 2/13/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 11/20/2012) (cd) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Caroline L. Chen dated 11/15/2012 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court grant the parties until February 27, 2013, to complete discovery in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall appear for a conference with the Court on December 11, 2012, at 4 pm, in Courtroom 6A of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Discovery is extended through the date of the conference, when the Court will address the timing of plaintiff's deposition and a deadline for the closure of discovery. (Discovery due by 12/11/2012. Conference set for 12/11/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 6A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/16/2012) (rjm) Modified on 12/5/2012 (ab). (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Elizabeth S. Saylor dated 11/7/2012 re: Counsel for Plaintiff submits this letter regarding the status of the case. Document filed by Israel Vasquez.(ae) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Caroline L. Chen dated 11/7/2012 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court grant them until the current close of discovery, November 27, 2012, to apprise the Court as to the progress of the production of the entire prosecution file and anticipated date for the end of a stay. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's application for a stay of discovery is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/9/2012) (ae) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Caroline L. Chen dated 11/5/2012 re: Counsel requests an extension of time until 11/7/2012, to submit their stats letter to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/5/2012) (tro) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Elizabeth S. Saylor dated 11/1/2012 re: Plaintiff's counsel writes to request an extension of time form November 5, 2012 to November 7, 2012 to update the Court on the status of the above referenced matter. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/5/2012) (ago) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that unless notified otherwise by the Court, any Scheduling Order or Case Management Plan remains in effect notwithstanding the case's transfer, except that any currently scheduled conference or oral argument with the Court is adjourned until further notification. Each party must submit a letter to the Court, not to exceed five pages, updating the Court on the status of the case no later then 11/5/2012. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/22/2012) (tro) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a telephone conference proceeding held on 9/13/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: telephone conference held on 9/13/2012 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2013.(tro) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Leonard B. Sand is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)). (Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Caroline L. Chen dated 10/03/2012 re: Your Honor instructed that defendants provide certain supplemental discovery disclosures to Plaintiff. By October 4, 2012, defendant will have complied with all but one of the issues, which is for the individual defendants to verify interrogatory responses. Defendants respectfully request that the Court allow them an additional four business days, from October 4, 2012, to October 11, 2012, to comply with this issue; because despite the undersigned's best efforts, the additional time is necessary for the three individual defendants, who each have particular scheduling constraints, to peruse the vast productions in this matter in an effort to comply with the Court's instructions. ENDORSEMENT: Extension from 10/04/12 to 10/11/12 Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/08/2012) (ama) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendants have sent us letters regarding discovery and bifurcation of the trial. Yet again, Defendants request a stay of discovery and Plaintiff complains of discovery delays. On July 10, we referred discovery disputes to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. If parties are not fulfilling their discovery obligations, that should be brought to Magistrate Judge Maas's attention. At this stage of the proceeding, we will not consider Defendants' requests to stay discovery or to bifurcate the trial. Defendants may request a stay of discovery or a bifurcation after we rule on their motion to dismiss. In the meantime, we expect all parties to work diligently to complete discovery.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/05/2012) (ama) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Caroline I. Chen dated 10/3/2012 re: Counsel for defendant writes at a telephone conference before Your Honor on September 13, 2012, Your Honor instructed that defendants provide certain supplemental discovery disclosures to Plaintiff. By October 4, 2012, defendants will have complied with all but one of the issues, which is for the individual defendants to verify interrogatory responses. Defendants respectfully request that the Court allow them an additional four business days, from October 4, 2012, to October 11, 2012, to comply with this issue, because, despite the undersigned's best efforts, the additional time is necessary for the three individual defendants, who have particular scheduling constraints, to peruse the vast productions in this matter in an effort to comply with the Court's instructions. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 10/3/2012) (js) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Eisha Jain in Opposition re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Israel Vasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A to Eisha Jain's Declaration in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Israel Vasquez. (Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). ADDENDUM TO DEFENDANTS' SEPT. 17 FILING. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)). (Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Caroline L. Chen in Support re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). ADDENDUM WITH DETAILED REFERENCES TO CASTILLO HEARING (PREVIOUSLY SOUGHT TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL). Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)). (Chen, Caroline) Modified on 9/28/2012 (ldi). (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM & ORDER: For the reasons that are set forth in this Order, Defendants request to file these papers under seal is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/24/2012) (pl) Modified on 9/26/2012 (pl). (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By September 27, 2012, Defendants shall provide to Plaintiff their supplemental Rule 26 disclosures. 2. By October 4, 2012, Defendants shall produce: (a) complete, signed responses to Plaintiffs' interrogatories; (b) for "Attorneys' Eyes Only" unredacted copies of the DD5 reports discussed during the telephone conference; and (c) for "Attorneys' Eyes Only" unredacted versions of the detectives' notebooks discussed during the telephone conference (to the extent unredacted versions exist). 3. In the event that unredacted versions of the detectives' notebooks do not exist, Defendants shall make the original redacted versions of the notebooks available for Plaintiff's review. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/17/2012) Copies Sent By Chambers. (rjm) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Caroline L. Chen dated 9/12/2012 re: I write to respectfully request that the Court grant defendants permission to exceed the twenty-five page limit set forth in Your Honor's individual rules, by fifteen pages. Defendants respectfully request a one-week extension of time, from September 14, 2012, to September 21, 2012, to file motion to dismiss complaint. ENDORSEMENT: This application should be made to Judge Sand as the referral to me concerned only discovery disputes. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/17/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)). (Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Caroline L. Chen in Support re: 43 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D _ pending applic to file under seal, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I_1, # 10 Exhibit I_2)(Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)). Responses due by 9/28/2012 Return Date set for 10/10/2012 at 11:59 PM.(Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - FIRST MOTION for Protective Order To File Under Seal, with the Clerk's Office, (1) Castillo Hearing transcript, (2) 2.5 pages of detailed and clear references to the Hearing transcript's contents. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)).(Chen, Caroline) Modified on 9/17/2012 (db). (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: We GRANT Defendants' request to exceed our twenty-five page limit. They may submit a forty-page brief. We also partially grant Defendants' request for an extension of time. Defendants now may submit their brief by Monday, September 17, 2012. By Plaintiffs consent, no other deadline changes. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/14/2012) (ama) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Caroline L. Chen dated 9/10/2012 re: I write to respectfully request that the telephone conference presently scheduled to take place before Your Honor on September 11, 2012, at 4:00 p,m., be adjourned to a later date as the undersigned has a scheduling conflict. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to 9/13/2012 at 2:15 p.m., ( Telephone Conference set for 9/13/2012 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/10/2012) (ama) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. We GRANT defendants' request for an extension of time until September 14, 2012, to respond to the amended complaint. Accordingly, we adopt defendants' proposed briefing schedule. Plaintiff will file his response by September 28, 2012, and defendants will reply by October 10, 2012. We reserve judgment on the remainder of defendants' requests. All Defendants answer due 9/14/2012. (Responses due by 9/28/2012. Replies due by 10/10/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/4/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Caroline L. Chen dated 8/15/12 re: Counsel for the defendants requests an extension of time to complete discovery, from 8/27/12 to 11/27/12. ENDORSEMENT: Completion of discovery extended from Aug. 27, 2012 to Nov. 27, 2012. So ordered. ( Discovery due by 11/27/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/20/2012) (mro) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint,, against Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Israel Vasquez. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by Israel Vasquez.(tro) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Document. For the reasons provided in the foregoing opinion, Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff has thirty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint with the Court. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/14/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Court conference proceeding held on 7/12/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(laq) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Court conference held on 7/12/2012 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2012.(laq) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Eisha Jain in Support re: 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Israel Vasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Israel Vasquez. (Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Caroline L. Chen in Opposition re: 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Court Docket, # 2 Exhibit Original Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Crim Ct Decision and Order, # 4 Exhibit Ltr from Ptf Counsel July 11 2012, # 5 Exhibit McKinnon Relevant Trial Transcript)(Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)). (Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand, from Caroline L. Chen, dated 7/25/2012, re: request that the Court grant defendants a brief extension of time, from July 26, to July 31, 2012, to file their opposition to plaintiff's motion. ENDORSEMENT: Extension GRANTED. ( Responses due by 7/31/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/26/2012) (ja) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that:1.By July 26, 2012, Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs motion to amend the complaint. 2. By August 8, 2012, Plaintiff may file its reply. 3. The return date shall be August 9, 2012. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 7/13/2012) (js) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randall Marc Elfenbein on behalf of Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)) (Elfenbein, Randall) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Caroline L. Chen dated 7/12/2012 re: For the above reasons, defendants respectfully request that the Court: (1) in accordance with Local Rule 6.1, the Court grant defendants until July 19, 2012, to serve defendants' opposition to plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint; and (2) grant a brief stay of all discovery in this matter, until after July 26, 2012, pending the resolution of plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Request #1 is granted; request #2 is denied. As to Donnelly and Aiello, I have already ruled. Plaintiff's counsel should not assume, however, that there will be any opportunity for 2 bites at the apple. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 7/12/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Eisha Jain dated 7/11/2012 re: Defendant's baseless request to bar Plaintiff from conducting any discovery until 7/26/2012. ENDORSEMENT: Judge Sand has directed that the witness appear by 7/20. Despite plaintiff's motion to amend, I see no reason to depart from that ruling. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 7/12/2012) (cd) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Motions referred to Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/10/2012) (djc) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Eisha Jain in Support re: 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Israel Vasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Israel Vasquez. (Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Document filed by Israel Vasquez.(Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Eisha Jain dated 6/15/2012 re: This firm, along with Romano & Kuan PLLC, represents Plaintiff in the above-captioned matter. We write to request a 45 day extension of discovery, until Monday August 27, due to the unavailability of two key Defendants for depositions. Defendants consent to the extension request. In addition, Plaintiff requests that Defendants be produced for depositions byno later than July 20, to avoid any additional delays in discovery. ENDORSEMENT: Discovery extended for 45 days as requested. Defendants to appear for depositions no later than July 20, 2012 unless the Court orders otherwise. ( Deposition due by 7/20/2012, Discovery due by 8/27/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/20/2012) (djc) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Eisha Jain dated 4/06/2012 re: We respectfully request that the Court order Ms. Chen to promptly produce the the address information so we may serve her clients, if she maintains her refusal to accept service. ENDORSEMENT: Ms. Chen shall promptly produce her clients address information. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 4/09/2012) (ama) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew G. Celli on behalf of Israel Vasquez (Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the unsealing Order filed June 28, 2011, which unsealed the record of the criminal court proceedings against Charles McKinnon in the action of People of the State of New York v. Charles McKinnon (Bronx County Supreme Court Indictment #1086-95), be hereby incorporated by reference and amended to include all documents and/or references to the above-described investigations and/or prosecution Charles McKinnon within the New York City Police Department file(s) regarding the murders of Denise Raymond and Baithe Diop, and the District Attorney's file in connection with Indictment #1086-95. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/5/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 2/27/2012) (cd) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Caroline L. Chen dated 2/17/2012 re: Counsel for the defendants request that the Court grant defendants until 3/2/2012 to produce responses to plaintiff's discovery demands. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 2/21/2012) (ft) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the unsealing Order filed June 28, 2011, which unsealed the record of the criminal court proceedings against Charles McKinnon in the action of People of the State of New York v. Charles McKinnon (Bronx County Supreme Court Indictment #1086-95), be hereby incorporated by reference and amended to include all documents and/or references to the above-described prosecution of Charles McKinnon within the Bronx District Attorney's file for the prosecution of plaintiff Israel Vasquez. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 2/21/2012) (mro) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Ling-Yu Chen on behalf of Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)) (Chen, Caroline) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Earl S Ward on behalf of Israel Vasquez (Ward, Earl) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eisha Jain on behalf of Israel Vasquez (Jain, Eisha) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth S. Saylor on behalf of Israel Vasquez (Saylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Julia P. Kuan and Elan Parra dated 10/7/2011 re: Parties request that fact discovery be extended six months until April 12,2012, to retrieve and exchange outstanding documents and complete depositions. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So ordered. (Discovery due by 4/12/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/11/2011) (ft) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNSEALING ORDER: It is hereby Ordered, by the Honorable Leonard B. Sand, U.S. District Court Judge for the Southern District of New York, that the record of the criminal court proceedings in the action entitled People of the State of New York v. Charles McKinnon (Bronx County Supreme Court Indictment# 1086-95) be unsealed and made available to all parties in the above litigation, with copies provided to ROMANO & KUAN, PLLC, 100 Lafayette Street~ Suite 401, New York, New York, 10013, (212) 274-0777, and Elan Parra, Esq. of the New York City Law Department, 100 Church Street, New York, New York, 10007, attorneys for all parties. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/27/2011) (mbe) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), after holding an initial pretrial conference, it is hereby ordered that: The last date for joining additional parties or amending the pleadings shall be 4/12/2011. The last date for filing and hearing of motions shall be 11/12/2011. All discovery shall be completed by 10/12/2011. Joint status letter by 5/16/11. If the action is for personal injuries, plaintiff is directed to make a monetary settlement demand and defendant is directed to respond to such demand prior to the pretrial conference. ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2011., Discovery due by 10/12/2011., Motions due by 11/12/2011.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/25/11) (mro) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Elan Parra dated 12/30/10 re: Defendants request a brief adjournment of the initial conference currently scheduled for January 4, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. until a date mentioned above or another time more convenient for the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Adjournment granted to 1/12/11 at 12 p.m. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 1/12/2011 at 12:00 p.m. before Judge Leonard B. Sand.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/3/11); (djc) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD)).(Parra, Elan) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Elan David Parra on behalf of City of New York. New Address: New York City Law Department, 100 Church Street, New York, New York, 10007, (212)442-8600. (Parra, Elan) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Elan Parra dated 10/1/10 re: Request that defendant City's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint be extended sixty days until December 7, 2010. No previous request for an extension has been made in this case. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. So Ordered. City of New York answer due 12/7/2010. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/1/10) (db) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elan David Parra on behalf of City of New York (Parra, Elan) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Document. For the reasons provided in the foregoing opinion, Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff has thirty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint with the Court. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/14/2012) (lmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD), Thomas Aiello(Tax ID# 868427, Individually), City of New York, Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801, Individually), Michael Donnelly(Tax ID# 883801 as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, Individually), Annabella Nieves(Tax ID# 876782, as Member of the New York City Police Department (NYPD). (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 912809)Document filed by Israel Vasquez.(ama) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 334 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?