USA v. Muntean
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:08-cr-00444-SBA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Newman +1 415 436 6805 +1 415 436 6748 thomas.newman2@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Mark A. Muntean, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by youngquistlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Marvin Youngquist +1 415 986 4100 +1 415 615 0847 john@youngquistlaw.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Oakland
Filed 7/8/2008
County Alameda
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-2
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(2) False tax return
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil: Initial Appearance as to Mark A. Muntean held on 9/2/2008. Arraignment as to Mark A. Muntean (1) on Counts 1-2 held on 9/2/2008. NOT GUILTY plea entered. I.D. of Counsel Hearing as to Mark A. Muntean held on 9/2/2008. Added attorney John Marvin Youngquist for Mark A. Muntean. Defendant Mark A. Muntean released on his own recognizance. GRANTING government's motion to unseal indictment. Indictment ordered UNSEALED. Status or Trial Setting Hearing set for 9/23/2008 at 09:00 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (Tape #FTR 9/2/08 10:29:58.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Mark A. Muntean continuing Initial Appearance to 9/2/2008 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 8/8/08. (kcS, ) (Filed on 8/8/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      Motion by Government and ORDER to Seal Indictment and Arrest Warrant as to Mark A. Muntean. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/8/08. (kcS, ) (Filed on 7/8/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Indictment
        INDICTMENT as to Mark A. Muntean (1) count(s) 1-2. (kcS, ) (Filed on 7/8/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 88 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?