Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc. et al v. Asami et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-03694-DMR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 6:15 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Plaintiff
No Logo Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Andrew Weill, Defendant
No Logo Curry Villeneuve, Defendant
No Logo Gina Moreland, Defendant
No Logo Jane Breyer, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Defendant
No Logo Joann Asami, Defendant
No Logo Joanne Rubio, Defendant
No Logo Lynn De Jonghe, Defendant
No Logo Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Defendant
No Logo Natasha Beery, Defendant
No Logo Oren Cheyette, Defendant
No Logo Orpheus Crutchfield, Defendant
No Logo R. Thomas Beach, Defendant
No Logo Roz Hamar, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Clugg, Defendant
No Logo Tim Moppin, Defendant
No Logo Valerie McCann Woodson, Defendant
No Logo Stone & Youngberg LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bernard Reynold Suter +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 ben.suter@kyl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Randall Jaskowiak +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 nathan.jaskowiak@kyl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Young +1 562 436 2000 +1 562 436 7416 steve.young@kyl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarinci Hollenbeck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry V. Osborne, II +1 732 780 5590 +1 732 462 0385 hosborne@scarincihollenbeck.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (328) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 317 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA as to (294 in 4:12-cv-03694-DMR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund. Plaintiffs-Appellants petition for panel rehearing is DENIED. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
    BILL OF COSTS by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Objections due by 7/27/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak ISO Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K to the Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/13/2016) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Costs Taxed
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Objection
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 8/16/2014, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                                    Errata to 300 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Administrative Motion to file documents under seal, # 2 Declaration of Catalona in support, # 3 Exhibit Slip Sheet, # 4 Exhibit to Declaration of Catalona, # 5 Proposed Order)(Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 8/15/2014) Modified on 8/18/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                          USCA Case Number 14-16532 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for (294 in 4:12-cv-03694-DMR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None USCA Appeal Fees
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                              ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET ENTRY 297*** Notice of Appeal FEE PAID (Filing fee $505.00, Receipt No. 44611011767). (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014) Modified on 8/8/2014 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Statement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 8/2/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE: Notice is hereby given that the Settlement Conference is vacated and removed from Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte's July 25, 2014 calendar. Therefore, no appearances are required. The parties must update the Chief Magistrate Judge regarding the status of their settlement no later than July 23, 2014. This is a text only entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER re Pretrial Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/21/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Stone & Youngberg LLC for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The parties are hereby excused from complying with the provision of the Courts Notice and Settlement Conference Order 245 that requires the parties lodge settlement conference documents by July 18, 2014. However, the parties shall update Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding the status of their settlement conference discussions no later than July 21, 2014. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Joann Asami for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Cillo, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2014) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                OBJECTIONS to re 277 Defendants' Designated Deposition Testimony by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/15/2014) Modified on 7/16/2014 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Objections to Defendants' Joint Exhibit List by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Objections and Counter-Designations to 210 , 211 Defendants' Designated Deposition Testimony by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Objections to 214 Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 190 MOTION in Limine to Determine the Applicable Law to Plaintiff's Negligent Misrepresentation Claim ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Expert Qualifications and Experience by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' Expert Qualifications and Experience, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 191 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Wells Fargo's Use of the Debt Service Reserve Fund was Proper ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Wells Fargo's Use of the Debt Service Reserve Fund Was Proper, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit 1 (Part 3), # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to Lord Abbett's Discovery Designations by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to 233 Proposed Form of Verdict, 228 Proposed Voir Dire, 235 Proposed Jury Instructions, by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 197 MOTION in Limine to Limit Testimony of Lord Abbett's Witness Patrick Donovan ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Limit the Testimony of Lord abbett's Witness Patrick Donovan, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 215 MOTION in Limine to Exclude from Evidence Deposition Exhibit 302) by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Deposition Exhibit 302, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaratin of Jennifer A. Tiedeken)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to Lord Abbett's Exhibits by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS to Lord Abbett's Witness List by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Objections to Stone & Youngberg's Designated Witnesses by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 226 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Paul Maco ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 195 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Prior Lawsuit Involving Expert Witness Paul Maco ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Stone & Youngberg's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument relating to Prior Lawsuit Involving Expert Witness Paul Maco, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 225 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Board Defendants' Reliance on Counsel Defense ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 207 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Mitigation of Damages is a Defense to the California and New Jersey Securities Acts, 202 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff has a Duty to Investigate Under the Securities Laws of California and New Jersey, 192 MOTION in Limine Regarding Reliance and Causation ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Objections to Defendants' Use of Discovery Responses re 208 , 213 by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESSPONSE (re 217 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements from Deposition Exhibits 67 and 280 by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak In Support Of Stone & Youngberg's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions In Limine and Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Video Exhibits ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 221 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Entry in Stone & Youngberg's Internal "SYFI" System Relating to September 12, 2008 Investor Call ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Related to Plaintiff's Other Lawsuits ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 222 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Newspaper Articles ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 198 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Windrush did not Default on the Bonds ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 230 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff's Damages Should be Offset by the Reserve Fund ) (In Opposition) filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Response to 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Lord Abbett's Expert Witness Cynthia King filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 250 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 199 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Lord Abbett's Expert Witness Cynthia King ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Response to 194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Alleged Concealment of Making Waves filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14, # 5 Exhibit 15, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit 17, # 8 Exhibit 18, # 9 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) 248 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Response to 194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Alleged Concealment of Making Waves filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 194 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 194 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Alleged Concealment of Making Waves ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to 218 Request for Judicial Notice, by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 115 Stone & Youngberg's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 124 Board Member Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Lord Abbett and Stone & Youngberg are referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for a mandatory settlement conference to take place on 7/25/2014 9:30 AM. Further information regarding the settlement conference will be provided by notice from Judge Laporte. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (ig, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of 225 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Board Defendants' Reliance on Counsel Defense, 201 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Video Exhibits, 224 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Joshua Winter, 207 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Mitigation of Damages is a Defense to the California and New Jersey Securities Acts, 202 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff has a Duty to Investigate Under the Securities Laws of California and New Jersey, 222 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Newspaper Articles, 226 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Paul Maco, 192 MOTION in Limine Regarding Reliance and Causation, 221 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Entry in Stone & Youngberg's Internal "SYFI" System Relating to September 12, 2008 Investor Call, 203 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Related to Plaintiff's Other Lawsuits, 230 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff's Damages Should be Offset by the Reserve Fund, 223 MOTION in Limine Regarding Stone & Youngberg's Reliance on Counsel Defense, 198 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Windrush did not Default on the Bonds filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Related document(s) 225 , 201 , 224 , 207 , 202 , 222 , 226 , 192 , 221 , 203 , 230 , 223 , 198 ) (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 196 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Stone & Youngberg's Routine Destruction of Documents ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Stone & Youngberg's Destruction of Documents Policy, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 219 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Witness Mark Loewenstein From Testifying At Trial ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francine T. Redford in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Expert Testimony of Mark Loewenstein, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Francine T. Radford)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Board Member Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Tom Puckett and Teresa Hempeck From Evidence (Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 193 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Interest on Plaintiff's Negligent Misrepresentation Claim Should Accrue From the Date of Purchase of the Bonds ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ERRATA re 230 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff's Damages Should be Offset by the Reserve Fund by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ERRATA re 217 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements from Deposition Exhibits 67 and 280: An email from Jennifer Campbell to Ilana Kaufman and Caroline Mccall Dated April 11, 2010; Request for Rule 403 Hearing by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund With Submitting Party and Sources. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund (Disputed) without Submitting Party and Authorities. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund Stipulated by the Parties. (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Form of Verdict by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund . (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Discovery DesignationsMunicipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Pretrial Conference Statement by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund Jointly Prepared. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff's Damages Should be Offset by the Reserve Fund filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund . (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Plaintiff's Exhibit Setting Forth Qualifications and Experience for Its Expert Witnesses by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Paul Maco filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine Regarding the Board Defendants' Reliance on Counsel Defense filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Joshua Winter filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Regarding Stone & Youngberg's Reliance on Counsel Defense filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Newspaper Articles filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Exclude Entry in Stone & Youngberg's Internal "SYFI" System Relating to September 12, 2008 Investor Call filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF OF BOARD MEMBER DEFENDANTS by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine To Preclude Witness Mark Loewenstein From Testifying At Trial filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice of Articles Regarding 2008 Global Recession and Financial Crisis; Declaration of Susan P. Beneville filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Hearsay Statements from Deposition Exhibits 67 and 280: An email from Jennifer Campbell to Ilana Kaufman and Caroline Mccall Dated April 11, 2010; Request for Rule 403 Hearing filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Susan P. Beneville)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List by Stone & Youngberg LLC . (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude from Evidence Deposition Exhibit 302: An Email from Bobbi Poulton to Christina Pernisie dated September 28, 2011 filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Susan P. Beneville)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions, Verdict Form and Voir Dire Questions by Stone & Youngberg LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Designation of Written Discovery Responses to be Used at Trial by Stone & Youngberg LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Tom Puckett and Teresa Hempeck from Evidence filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan P. Beneville, # 2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, # 3 Exhibit B to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, # 4 Exhibit C to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, # 5 Exhibit D to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, # 6 Exhibit E to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, # 7 Exhibit F to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, # 8 Exhibit G to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville, # 9 Exhibit H to Decl. of Susan P. Beneville)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of defendant Board Members Designation of the Deposition Testimony of Virginia Housum, Daniel Solender, Richard Beames and Joseph Gulli by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Designation of Deposition Testimony to be Used at Trial by Stone & Youngberg LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson . (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DESIGNATION OF DISCOVERY RESPONSES FOR USE AT TRIAL by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson . (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Mitigation of Damages is a Defense to the California and New Jersey Securities Acts filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson EXPERT WITNESS QUALIFICATIONS AND EXPERIENCE. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Form of Verdict by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson . (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Related to Plaintiff's Other Lawsuits filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Plaintiff has a Duty to Investigate Under the Securities Laws of California and New Jersey filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Video Exhibits filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Nathan Jaskowiak In Support of Motions in Limine and Motion to Exclude Expert Witness Testimony filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Lord Abbett's Expert Witness Cynthia King filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Windrush did not Default on the Bonds filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Limit Testimony of Lord Abbett's Witness Patrick Donovan filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Stone & Youngberg's Routine Destruction of Documents filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Prior Lawsuit Involving Expert Witness Paul Maco filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Relating to Alleged Concealment of Making Waves filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Interest on Plaintiff's Negligent Misrepresentation Claim Should Accrue From the Date of Purchase of the Bonds filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine Regarding Reliance and Causation filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Wells Fargo's Use of the Debt Service Reserve Fund was Proper filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Determine the Applicable Law to Plaintiff's Negligent Misrepresentation Claim filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS TO 188 TRIAL BRIEF by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2014 before Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 6/26/2014). (Recording #FTR: 11:03:44 - 12:03:48.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 181 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. 185. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/10/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. 186 *** ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 181 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (Filed on 6/11/2014) Modified on 6/12/2014 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. 185 .*** Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 181 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/11/2014 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment ) ; Evidentiary Objections filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Reply Declaration of Alex P. Catalona, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 48 to Reply Decl. of Alex P. Catalona, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 49 to Reply Decl. of Alex P. Catalona, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 50 to Reply Decl. of Alex P. Catalona)(Catalona, Alex) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Scott W. Wilkinson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8675790.) filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing for Scott Warren Wilkinson)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 6/6/2014) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu Denying 179 Stipulation for ENLARGEMENT OF PAGE LIMITATIONSFOR REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014) Modified on 6/6/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Enlargement of Page Limitations for Reply Briefs in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/4/2014) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 177 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gary Ceriani representing Plaintiff. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Gary J. Ceriani ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8663463.) filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 175 Stipulation to Substitute Document #120-37 with Exhibit A (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Substitute Document #120-37 with Exhibit A filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/28/2014) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 146, # 2 Exhibit 147, # 3 Exhibit 148, # 4 Exhibit 149, # 5 Exhibit 150, # 6 Exhibit 151, # 7 Exhibit 152, # 8 Exhibit 153, # 9 Exhibit 154, # 10 Exhibit 155)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 142, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 142, Part 3, # 3 Exhibit 142, Part 4, # 4 Exhibit 142, Part 5, # 5 Exhibit 142, Part 6, # 6 Exhibit 142, Part 7, # 7 Exhibit 142, Part 8, # 8 Exhibit 143, # 9 Exhibit 144, # 10 Exhibit 145)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 133, # 2 Exhibit 134, # 3 Exhibit 135, # 4 Exhibit 136, # 5 Exhibit 137, # 6 Exhibit 138, # 7 Exhibit 139, # 8 Exhibit 140, # 9 Exhibit 141, # 10 Exhibit 142, Part 1)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 123, # 2 Exhibit 124, # 3 Exhibit 125, # 4 Exhibit 126, # 5 Exhibit 127, # 6 Exhibit 128, # 7 Exhibit 129, # 8 Exhibit 130, # 9 Exhibit 131, # 10 Exhibit 132)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 113, # 2 Exhibit 114, # 3 Exhibit 115, # 4 Exhibit 116, # 5 Exhibit 117, # 6 Exhibit 118, # 7 Exhibit 119, # 8 Exhibit 120, # 9 Exhibit 121, # 10 Exhibit 122)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 103, # 2 Exhibit 104, # 3 Exhibit 105, # 4 Exhibit 106, # 5 Exhibit 107, # 6 Exhibit 108, # 7 Exhibit 109, # 8 Exhibit 110, # 9 Exhibit 111, # 10 Exhibit 112)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 93, # 2 Exhibit 94, # 3 Exhibit 95, # 4 Exhibit 96, # 5 Exhibit 97, # 6 Exhibit 98, # 7 Exhibit 99, # 8 Exhibit 100, # 9 Exhibit 101, # 10 Exhibit 102)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 85, # 2 Exhibit 86, # 3 Exhibit 87, # 4 Exhibit 88, # 5 Exhibit 89, # 6 Exhibit 90, # 7 Exhibit 91, Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 91, Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 91, Part 3, # 10 Exhibit 92)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 75, # 2 Exhibit 76, # 3 Exhibit 77, # 4 Exhibit 78, # 5 Exhibit 79, # 6 Exhibit 80, # 7 Exhibit 81, # 8 Exhibit 82, # 9 Exhibit 83, # 10 Exhibit 84)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 65, # 2 Exhibit 66, # 3 Exhibit 67, # 4 Exhibit 68, # 5 Exhibit 69, # 6 Exhibit 70, # 7 Exhibit 71, # 8 Exhibit 72, # 9 Exhibit 73, # 10 Exhibit 74)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 55, # 2 Exhibit 56, # 3 Exhibit 57, # 4 Exhibit 58, # 5 Exhibit 59, # 6 Exhibit 60, # 7 Exhibit 61, # 8 Exhibit 62, # 9 Exhibit 63, # 10 Exhibit 64)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 45, # 2 Exhibit 46, # 3 Exhibit 47, # 4 Exhibit 48, # 5 Exhibit 49, # 6 Exhibit 50, # 7 Exhibit 51, # 8 Exhibit 52, # 9 Exhibit 53, # 10 Exhibit 54)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35, # 2 Exhibit 36, # 3 Exhibit 37, # 4 Exhibit 38, # 5 Exhibit 39, # 6 Exhibit 40, # 7 Exhibit 41, # 8 Exhibit 42, # 9 Exhibit 43, # 10 Exhibit 44)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30, # 2 Exhibit 31, # 3 Exhibit 32, # 4 Exhibit 33, # 5 Exhibit 34, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 34, Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 34, Part 3, # 8 Exhibit 34, Part 4, # 9 Exhibit 34, Part 5, # 10 Exhibit 34, Part 6)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20, # 2 Exhibit 21, # 3 Exhibit 22, # 4 Exhibit 23, # 5 Exhibit 24, # 6 Exhibit 25, # 7 Exhibit 26, # 8 Exhibit 27, # 9 Exhibit 28, # 10 Exhibit 29)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 158 Declaration in Support,, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 13, # 5 Exhibit 14, # 6 Exhibit 15, # 7 Exhibit 16, # 8 Exhibit 17, # 9 Exhibit 18, # 10 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken in Support of 153 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 153 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Patrick Donovan in Support of 153 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 153 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Cynthia King in Support of 153 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1, Part 3)(Related document(s) 153 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Mark J. Loewenstein in Support of 153 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 153 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Joseph Gulli in Support of 153 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Related document(s) 153 ) (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting AS MODIFIED 151 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response and Replies to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/15/2014) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions and Amended Case Management and Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/12/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 146 MOTION to File an Omnibus Opposition to Defendants Stone & Youngberg LLC's and Board Member Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment ) filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Stone & Youngberg LLC, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2014) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Stone & Youngberg LLC of Supplemental Designation of Rule 26 Expert Witnesses (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2014) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 145 , 146 Parties' Submissions re Briefing for Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/09/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File an Omnibus Opposition to Defendants Stone & Youngberg LLC's and Board Member Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Responses due by 5/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Enlargement of Time for Response and Replies to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jennifer A. Tiedeken, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson Board Members' Amended Expert Designation (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/2/2014) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Stone & Youngberg LLC of Expert Witness Disclosures (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 5/2/2014) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson disclosure of expert witnesses (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/2/2014) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund of Expert Witness Disclosures (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/2/2014) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibits 33-37 and Exhibits 46-47 filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 33 (part 2 of 6), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 33 (part 3 of 6), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 33 (part 4 of 6), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 33 (part 5 of 6), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 33 (part 6 of 6), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 34, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 35, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 36, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 46, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 47)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Alex P. Catalona in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (part 1 of 2), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (part 2 of 2), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit 32)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Bonnie Whitler in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment By the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39, # 2 Exhibit 40, # 3 Exhibit 41, # 4 Exhibit 42, # 5 Exhibit 43, # 6 Exhibit 44, # 7 Exhibit 45)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of R. Thomas Beach in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 38)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement re 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Jennifer Curry Villeneuve in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Gina Moreland in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Tim Moppin in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Valerie McCann Woodson in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Rosalind Hamar in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Lynn DeJonghe in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Oren Cheyette in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jennifer Lowe Campbell in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Jane Breyer in Support of 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by the Board Members filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Joann Asami in support of the Board Members' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Curry Villeneuve, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 5/15/2014. Replies due by 5/22/2014. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Dismissal of Defendants Natasha Beery, Sarah Cluff, Orpheus Crutchfield, Natalie Lenz-Acuna and Andrew Weill Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Dirk ten Grotenhuis in Support of 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Lauren Post in Support of 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Related document(s) 115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Nathan R. Jaskowiak in Support of 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II - 1, # 36 Exhibit II - 2, # 37 Exhibit II - 3, # 38 Exhibit JJ, # 39 Exhibit KK, # 40 Exhibit LL, # 41 Exhibit MM, # 42 Exhibit NN, # 43 Exhibit OO, # 44 Exhibit PP, # 45 Exhibit QQ, # 46 Exhibit RR, # 47 Exhibit SS)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Kenneth Holman in Support of 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Richard Beames in Support of 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Marie Autphenne in Support of 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J - 1, # 11 Exhibit J - 2)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement re 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 5/12/2014. Replies due by 5/19/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Dismissal of Defendant Joanne Rubio filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 4/25/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: (See Order for all dates set by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/15/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amended Case Management and Pretrial Order for Jury Trial)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 4/11/2014) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Denying 110 Request to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/08/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Joint Letter from All Counsel Regarding Modification to the Case Management Order . (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/7/2014) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting AS MODIFIED 108 Stipulation re Deadlines. Last day for hearing dispositive motions is 6/5/14.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Expert Witness Deadlines and for Dispositive Motions Hearing Date filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amended Case Management and Pretrial Order for Jury Trial)(Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 106 Stipulation Re: Deposition of Cecil Bobey. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DEPOSITION OF CECIL BOBEY filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 104 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Plaintiff Lord Abbett and Defendant Stone & Youngberg, LLC Regarding Additional Deposition of a Representative of Stone & Youngberg, LLC. (Pappas, Valeri) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference HELD on 1/22/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (FTR Recording: 1:35-1:40) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 100 Stipulation to continue the Further Case Management Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Case Management Conference filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 92 Stipulation AS MODIFIED.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 91 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 91 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD on 11/21/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 91 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Joann Asami, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Tim Moppin, Andrew Weill, Orpheus Crutchfield, Valerie McCann Woodson, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Joanne Rubio, R. Thomas Beach, Sarah Clugg, Oren Cheyette, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Roz Hamar, Natasha Beery, Lynn De Jonghe, Jane Breyer, Curry Villeneuve, Gina Moreland - Motion DENIED. Court's written Order to follow. (FTR Recording: 11:26-11:54) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Further Case Management Conference previously set on 12/11/2013 01:30 PM has been rescheduled to 12/11/2013 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on 91 Joint Discovery Letter Brief: Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/30/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Stephanie L. Smith in support of Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Stephanie L. Smith, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Stephanie L. Smith, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Stephanie L. Smith, # 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 6 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # 8 Redacted Version of Exhibit O, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit O, # 10 Redacted Version of Exhibit T, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit T, # 12 Redacted Version of Exhibit U, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit U)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit B to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit C to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit D to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit E to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit F to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit G to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit H to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit I to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit J to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit K to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit L to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit M to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit N to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit P to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit R to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit S to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit T to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit V to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit W to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit X to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit Y to Stip. and (Proposed) Order, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit Z to Stip. and (Proposed) Order)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 87 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 10/24/2013) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER to Submit Joint Letter re Parties' Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/24/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER to Submit Joint Letter re Parties' Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/24/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Administrative Relief: Expansion of Page Limitation for Joint Discovery Letter; [Proposed] Order filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 10/24/2013) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint byStone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 10/16/2013) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Amend Answer filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 10/16/2013) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 10/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 79 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 79 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Vacating 10/10/13 Hearing re 79 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/07/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Vacating 10/10/13 Hearing re 79 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/07/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibits to 79 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit A to discovery letter brief, # 2 Exhibit Amended Exhibit B to discovery letter brief)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 10/7/2013) Modified on 10/8/2013 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Hearing re 79 Discovery Letter Brief set for 10/10/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/26/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Hearing re 79 Discovery Letter Brief set for 10/10/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/26/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 79 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Stone & Youngberg LLC, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Errata Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit D Part One, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit D Part Two)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2013) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Stone & Youngberg LLC, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2013) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 77 Stipulation Extending Deadling for Private Mediation and Setting Further Case Management Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 76 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Case Management Conference - Further,, EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PRIVATE MEDIATION AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Cover letter for stipulation and proposed order re ADR deadline/CMC)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 8/9/2013) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference HELD on 7/31/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Parties shall promptly submit a Stipulation and Order to the Court to extend the deadline for completion of private mediation. Stipulation shall include proposed date for further case management conference. See minutes for more particulars. (FTR Recording 1:34-2:18) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/31/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Stone & Youngberg LLC. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/24/2013) Modified on 7/25/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 72 Stipulation (Protective Order).(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 71 Stipulation.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 7/11/2013) Modified on 7/12/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Information Produced Information Produced by Non-Party Windrush School Pursuant to Subpoena filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Cover letter for stipulated protective order for Windrush production)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 7/10/2013) Modified on 7/11/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Stone & Youngberg LLC for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/27/2013) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 70 FOR CORRECT ATTACHMENT.TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Stone & Youngberg LLC for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Jaskowiak, Nathan) (Filed on 6/27/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on May 30, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, rayneeh@hotmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Tape Number: FTR Recording 11:46-12:31. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Related documents(s) 63 , 64 ) (rhm) (Filed on 6/25/2013) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 66 Stipulation to continue Further Case Management Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 50 Case Management Conference filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 6/24/2013) Modified on 6/25/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 50 Case Management Conference filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 6/24/2013) Modified on 6/25/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Stone & Youngberg LLC, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 5/31/2013) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 5/31/2013) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 56 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 56 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD on 5/30/2013 before Donna M. Ryu re 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund. Court's written Order to follow. (FTR Recording 11:46-12:31) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2013) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER: Deadline for completing mediation shall be extended to 8/30/2013 re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Deadline to Complete ADR filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/24/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief; Extension of Deadline to Complete ADR Pursuant to Stipulation filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation and Order)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief : Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/1/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY NO. 57 AND GO TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. 58 INSTEAD DUE TO A TYPO. ERROR AS TO YEAR OF THE HEARING DATE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief : Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/1/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013) Modified on 5/1/2013 (ig, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Becherer signature page, # 4 Cillo signature page, # 5 Cordova signature page, # 6 Suter signature page)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 4/19/2013) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 53 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, 52 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC, Joann Asami, Tim Moppin, Andrew Weill, Orpheus Crutchfield, Valerie McCann Woodson, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Joanne Rubio, R. Thomas Beach, Sarah Clugg, Oren Cheyette, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Roz Hamar, Natasha Beery, Lynn De Jonghe, Jane Breyer, Curry Villeneuve, Gina Moreland. Joint Letter due 4/19/13.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/17/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 53 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, 52 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Stone & Youngberg LLC, Joann Asami, Tim Moppin, Andrew Weill, Orpheus Crutchfield, Valerie McCann Woodson, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Joanne Rubio, R. Thomas Beach, Sarah Clugg, Oren Cheyette, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Roz Hamar, Natasha Beery, Lynn De Jonghe, Jane Breyer, Curry Villeneuve, Gina Moreland. Joint Letter due 4/19/13.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/17/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 53 Discovery Letter Brief Exhibit A filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Related document(s) 53 ) (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 4/17/2013) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 4/17/2013) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Discovery Letter Brief filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Stone & Youngberg LLC, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 4/17/2013) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/21/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference HELD on 2/20/2013 before Donna M. Ryu, Case referred to Private Mediation, which shall be completed within 120 days from the date of this Order. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to consolidate cases C-12-3694-DMR and C-12-6185-DMR for all purposes including discovery and trial GRANTED. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2013 01:30 PM. Non-expert Discovery and Expert Disclosure due by 3/25/2014. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 4/8/2014. Expert Discovery to be completed by: 4/22/2014. Last day to hear dispositive motions on 5/22/2014 11:00 AM. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement/Trial Briefs due by 7/7/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2014 03:00 PM and Jury Trial (estimated for 2 weeks) set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (FTR Recording: 1:32-1:44) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2013) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Natasha Berry, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 2/12/2013) Modified on 2/13/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Merit Corrected of Gordon Yale by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/4/2013) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Merit in Compliance with N.J.S.A. Section 2A:53A-27 by Gordon Yale by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Tiedeken, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/1/2013) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion (44 in 4:12-cv-03694-DMR) MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery and Trial (Unopposed), (36 in 4:12-cv-06185-DMR) MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery and Trial (Unopposed) : Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/21/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support of 44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery and Trial (Unopposed) filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Related document(s) 44 ) (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/26/2012 (kcS, ). (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery and Trial (Unopposed) filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 1/4/2013. Replies due by 1/11/2013. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/21/2012) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 12/19/2012) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Amendment of Answer of Windrush Trustees filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 12/19/2012) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RELATING CASE to C-12-6185-JSC Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, et al v. Stone & Youngberg, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/19/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Reassignment and Consolidation filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund, Natasha Berry, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Judge Ryu re Stipulation and Proposed Order re Consolidation)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 12/17/2012) Modified on 12/18/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/18/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on October 25, 2012, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2013. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 11/20/2012) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Schweitzer, Lori) (Filed on 11/14/2012) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 11 Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 11 Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/25/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD. on 10/25/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in alternative, for Summary Judgment - DENIED. Written Order to follow. Initial Case Management Conference HELD on 10/25/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. No new parties or new claims may be added. Further ADR phone conference to take place as scheduled on 12/3/2012. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2013 01:30 PM. Non-expert Discovery and Expert Disclosure due by 9/17/2013. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 10/1/2013. Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/15/2013. Last Day to hear dispositive motions on 11/14/2013 11:00 AM. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement/Trial Briefs due by 1/3/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2014 03:00 PM and Jury Trial (estimated for 2 Weeks) set for 2/3/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/25/2012). (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Clerk Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 10/23/12 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schweitzer, Lori) (Filed on 10/18/2012) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 10/17/2012) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson, Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/18/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Franklin, Joshua) (Filed on 10/5/2012) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 10/2/2012) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Extending Time to Serve Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26 filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 10/1/2012) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment ) filed byJoann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants Objection to Plaintiff's Evidence)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2012) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Bryant Ahn in Support of 23 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss, Or, Alternatively, For Summary Judgment filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 9/19/2012) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Virginia Anne Housum in Support of 23 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss, Or Alternatively, For Summary Judgment filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Related document(s) 23 ) (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 9/19/2012) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Francine T. Radford in Support of 23 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss, Or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 9/19/2012) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment ) filed byLord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 9/19/2012) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 16 Valeri S. Pappas' Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice by Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 15 Jennifer A. Tiedeken's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 14 Michael P. Cillo's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Sarah Clugg, Roz Hamar (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2012) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sarah Clugg, Roz Hamar.. (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2012) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended NOTICE of Hearing on 11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Sarah Clugg, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Roz Hamar, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/19/2012. Replies due by 9/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Lori Schweitzer in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment)(Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 9/5/2012) Modified on 9/7/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Valeri S. Pappas ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611009356.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/5/2012 filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Jennifer A. Tiedeken ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611009352.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/4/2012 filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/5/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Michael P. Cillo ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611009352.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/4/2012 filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/5/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 12 Stipulation re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, For Summary Judgment.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 12 Stipulation re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, For Summary Judgment.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Hon. Donna M. Ryu)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 8/31/2012) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/10/2012. Replies due by 9/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, # 3 Declaration Declaration of James Ough in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, # 4 Declaration of Lori A. Schweitzer in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment (Pt. 1 of 3), # 5 Declaration of Lori A. Schweitzer in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment (Pt. 2 of 3), # 6 Declaration of Lori A. Schweitzer in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment (Pt. 3 of 3))(Schweitzer, Lori) (Filed on 8/27/2012) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson.. (Schweitzer, Lori) (Filed on 8/23/2012) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Stipulation for Plaintiff to Issue a Third-Party Subpoena.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson (Beneville, Susan) (Filed on 8/15/2012) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Plaintiff to Issue a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to FRCP 26(f) Conference filed by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 3 Cover letter to Honorable Donna M. Ryu)(Radford, Francine) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 8/13/2012) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Extending Time for Responsive Pleading filed by Joann Asami, R. Thomas Beach, Natasha Beery, Jane Breyer, Jennifer Lowe Campbell, Oren Cheyette, Orpheus Crutchfield, Lynn De Jonghe, Natalie Lenz-Acuna, Tim Moppin, Gina Moreland, Joanne Rubio, Curry Villeneuve, Andrew Weill, Valerie McCann Woodson. (Becherer, Patrick) (Filed on 8/10/2012) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund.. (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 8/6/2012) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2012 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Stipulation for Plaintiff to Issue a Third-Party Subpoena.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611009106.). Filed byLord Abbett Municipal Income Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett California Tax-Free Income Fund, Lord Abbett National Tax-Free Income Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?