Terilogy Co Ltd v. Glimmerglass Networks Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-03364-EMC
District Judge Edward M. Chen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Terilogy Co Ltd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sebastian Andres Jerez +1 415 954 4478 sjerez@fbm.com
Space Mark Dean Petersen +1 415 954 4406 +1 415 954 4480 mpetersen@fbm.com
v.
No Logo Glimmerglass Networks, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rodger R. Cole +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 rcole@fenwick.com
Space Mary Elizabeth Milionis +1 415 875 2313 +1 415 281 1350 MMilionis@Fenwick.com
Space Rachael Gayza Samberg +1 415 875 2330 +1 415 281 1350 rsamberg@fenwick.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 7/11/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Outside US
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Declaration in Support
Declaration of Mary E. Milionis in Support of [17] MOTION to Seal Exhibit Submitted for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byGlimmerglass Networks Inc. (Related document(s)[17]) (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Certificate Of Service.
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glimmerglass Networks Inc re [13] Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendant Glimmerglass Networks, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Unredacted) (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Proposed Order
      Proposed Order re [17] MOTION to Seal Exhibit Submitted for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Glimmerglass Networks Inc. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Motion to Seal
        MOTION to Seal Exhibit Submitted for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Glimmerglass Networks Inc. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Declaration in Support
          Declaration of Robert A. Lundy in Support of [12] MOTION to Dismiss filed byGlimmerglass Networks Inc. (Related document(s)[12]) (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE by Glimmerglass Networks Inc re [13] Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendant Glimmerglass Networks, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Exhibit A Manual Filing Notice) (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Proposed Order
              Proposed Order re [12] MOTION to Dismiss by Glimmerglass Networks Inc. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
                LREF
                Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Request For Judicial Notice
                Request for Judicial Notice re [12] MOTION to Dismiss filed byGlimmerglass Networks Inc. (Related document(s)[12]) (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss filed by Glimmerglass Networks Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                    CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Glimmerglass Networks Inc.. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Exhibits
                      EXHIBITS A-E re [1] Complaint (filed UNDER SEAL) filed by Terilogy Co Ltd. (Related document(s)[1]) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [3] Motion to Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Terilogy Co Ltd (Petersen, Mark) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Rodger R. Cole on behalf of Defendant Glimmerglass Networks, Inc. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Gayza Samberg on behalf of Defendant Glimmerglass Networks, Inc. (Samberg, Rachael) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Proposed Order
                                Proposed Order re [3] MOTION to Seal Complaint Exhibits by Glimmerglass Networks Inc. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Declaration in Support
                                  Declaration of Mary E. Milionis in Support of [3] MOTION to Seal Complaint Exhibits filed byGlimmerglass Networks Inc. (Related document(s)[3]) (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Motion to Seal
                                    MOTION to Seal Complaint Exhibits filed by Glimmerglass Networks Inc. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 ADR Scheduling Order
                                      ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2008. Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2008 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT; summons issued against Glimmerglass Networks Inc (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611021212). Filed by Terilogy Co Ltd. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2008: # (1) Exh A-C, # (2) Exh D-E) (slh, COURT STAFF).
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                          CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?