Ruttkamp v. Delosreyes et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00392-SRU

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 12:02 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Shlomit Ruttkamp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph M. Merly +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jmerly@johnrwilliams.com
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Karen M. Gabianelli, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence Merrill, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howd & Ludorf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Gerarde +1 860 249 1361 +1 860 249 7665 tgerarde@hl-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murtha Cullina LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa A Federico +1 860 240 6042 +1 860 240 5863 mfederico@murthalaw.com
No Logo Richard Mulhall, Defendant
No Logo Rupert Delosreyes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W. Caley +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 james.caley@ct.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff And Defendants [JOINT STIPULATION] by Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Lawrence Merrill, Jr, Richard Mulhall, Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Caley, James) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
    MANDATE of USCA dated 12/28/2012 Stipulation WITHDRAWING 62 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, filed by Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
      Index to Record on Appeal by Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall re 62 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,,. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Caley, James) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re 61 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment by Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0205-2632168. (Caley, James) Modified on 10/1/2012 TO LINK TO DOC #61 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 09/19/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 61 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/20/2012. (Carter, J.) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER approving 59 Stipulation filed by Shlomit Ruttkamp, Lawrence Merrill, Jr.. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/12/12. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
              STIPULATION by Shlomit Ruttkamp, Lawrence Merrill, Jr. . (Longo-McLean, Rose) Modified on 7/11/2012 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension until 30 Days After Ruling On Motion For Reconsideration And Second MSJ To File Pre-Trial Memorandum And Appear At Pre-Trial Calendar Call. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/7/2012. (Carter, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 Days After Ruling On Motion For Reconsideration And Second MSJ To File Pre-Trial Memorandum And Appear At Pre-Trial Calendar Call 54 Pretrial Order by Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall. (Caley, James) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                    Memorandum in Opposition re 51 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts)(Longo-McLean, Rose) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER re Calendar Call set for 6/5/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Trial Brief due by 5/25/2012. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/12/12. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/12/12. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                          Memorandum in Opposition re 49 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,Joint MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,, 50 MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing,,,,,, filed by Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Longo-McLean, Rose) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                            Supplemental Memorandum in Support re 51 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment Re: Favorable Termination filed by Lawrence Merrill, Jr. (Federico, Melissa) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                              Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall.Responses due by 3/16/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts)(Caley, James) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing,,,,,, by Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall.Responses due by 3/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Caley, James) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing,,,,,, by Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Lawrence Merrill, Jr, Richard Mulhall.Responses due by 3/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Federico, Melissa) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Motion Hearing. Held on 1/24/12 before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. Court Reporter: Susan E. Catucci. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2012. (Catucci, S.) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to 2/21/12 to file Motion for Reconsideration re 45 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/7/12. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until February 21, 2012 to file Motion For Reconsideration 45 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Motion Hearing,,, by Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Lawrence Merrill, Jr, Richard Mulhall. (Federico, Melissa) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/7/2012 Court Filing
                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 1/24/2012 re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Oral ruling issued by Judge Underhill granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Summary Judgment as stated on the record in open court. Total Time: 1 hour(Court Reporter Susan Catucci.) (Sbalbi, B.) Modified on 2/8/2012 to correct date of hearing. (Sbalbi, B.). (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Longo-McLean on behalf of Shlomit Ruttkamp (Longo-McLean, Rose) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION., Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 12/21/11. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY to Response to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lawrence Merrill, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gerarde, Thomas) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER Granting 39 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/15/2011 To File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 11/1/11. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/15/2011 To File Reply Brief 38 Memorandum in Opposition to 31 Motion for Summary Judgment by Lawrence Merrill, Jr. (Federico, Melissa) Modified on 11/2/2011 - event correct event type (Gothers, M.). Modified on 11/2/2011 - linked to dkt #31 . (Gothers, M.). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Williams, John) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to Response to 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Sur-Reply filed by Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY to Response to 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall. (Caley, James) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER Granting 33 MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/30/2011 To File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 9/6/2011. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER Granting 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment until October 19, 2011. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 9/6/2011. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/30/2011 To File Reply Brief by Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall. (Caley, James) Modified on 9/2/2011 to change event (Grady, B.). Modified on 9/29/2011 to add to underlying motion (Grady, B.). (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment until October 19, 2011 by Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lawrence Merrill, Jr.Responses due by 9/19/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Memorandum in Support, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R)(Gerarde, Thomas) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Williams, John) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall.Responses due by 8/24/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Statement of Material Facts)(Caley, James) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 7/27/11. (Droney, Christopher) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31, 2011 for filing of Dispositive Motions by Lawrence Merrill, Jr. (Federico, Melissa) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 12/30/10. (Droney, Christopher) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2011 to respond to interrogatories. by Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Williams, John) (Main Document 25 replaced on 12/29/2010) (Grady, B.). (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR...Second MOTION for Extension of Time until January 28, 2011 To respond to defendants interrogatories. by Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Williams, John) Modified on 12/30/2010 (Gothers, M.). The pdf is blank. See dkt. #25. (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Granting 22 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 29, 2011 To Respond TO Defendant, Lawrence Merrill, Jr.'s First Set Of Interrogatories And Requests For Production. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 12/7/10. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until January 29, 2011 To Respond TO Defendant, Lawrence Merrill, Jr.'s First Set Of Interrogatories And Requests For Production by Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall.(Caley, James) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Merly on behalf of Shlomit Ruttkamp (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher F. Droney: Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2010 re 7 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Karen M. Gabianelli, Rupert Delosreyes, Richard Mulhall. 15 minutes(Court Reporter Marshall.) (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 11/9/10. (Droney, Christopher) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Federico, Melissa) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Lawrence Merrill, Jr.(Gothers, M.) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR... RESPONSE Answer Affirmative Defenses filed by Lawrence Merrill, Jr. (Federico, Melissa) Modified on 8/9/2010 - Clerk to re docket using correct event type.(Gothers, M.). (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF E-FILE CALENDAR: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: MOTION TO DISMISS [Dkt. #7] is set for 11/9/2010 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Christopher F. Droney. Each side will have 20 minutes for argument. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 8, 2010 to plead. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 7/12/10. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until August 8,2010 to plead by Lawrence Merrill, Jr. (Federico, Melissa) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A Federico on behalf of Lawrence Merrill, Jr (Federico, Melissa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Gerarde on behalf of Lawrence Merrill, Jr (Gerarde, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 7 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shlomit Ruttkamp. (Williams, John) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Caley on behalf of Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall in their individual capacities (Caley, James) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Dismiss by Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Richard Mulhall.Responses due by 7/7/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of the State Trooper Defendants' Motion To Dismiss)(Caley, James) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Caley on behalf of Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Lawrence Merrill, Jr, Richard Mulhall (Caley, James) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shlomit Ruttkamp. Rupert Delosreyes served on 3/21/2010, answer due 4/11/2010; Karen M. Gabianelli served on 3/21/2010, answer due 4/11/2010; Lawrence Merrill, Jr served on 3/21/2010, answer due 4/11/2010; Richard Mulhall served on 3/26/2010, answer due 4/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Summons-Delosreyes, # 2 Marshal's Return-Delosreyes, # 3 Summons-Gabianelli, # 4 Marshal's Return-Gabianelli, # 5 Summons-Merrill, # 6 Marshal's Return-Merrill, # 7 Summons-Mulhall, # 8 Marshal's Return-Mulhall)(Williams, John) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 6/16/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2010 Discovery due by 9/15/2010 Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2010. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2010. (Garguilo, B) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 3/16/2010. (Garguilo, B) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Shlomit Ruttkamp (Garguilo, B) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/20/2012. (Carter, J.)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Rupert Delosreyes, Karen M. Gabianelli, Lawrence Merrill, Jr, Richard Mulhall ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number N029899), filed by Shlomit Ruttkamp.(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 251 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?