Mitchell v. Hamlet et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-03443-TEH
District Judge Thelton E. Henderson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 11:14 AM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gregory Mitchell, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo A.O. Amaya, Defendant
No Logo A.P. Kane, Defendant
No Logo Antar Jannah, Defendant
No Logo B. Curry, Defendant
No Logo B. Hedrick, Defendant
No Logo Caravello, Defendant
No Logo E. J. Klein, Defendant
No Logo J. Brown, Defendant
No Logo J. Hodges, Defendant
No Logo J.L. Madison, Defendant
No Logo Jim Hamlet, Defendant
No Logo Lockwood, Defendant
No Logo Nan Grannis, Defendant
No Logo P. Manerville, Defendant
No Logo Pat Barker, Defendant
No Logo Sue Summersett, Defendant
No Logo V. Raso, Defendant
No Logo W. Cohen, Defendant
No Logo W. J. Hill, Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 7/17/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Monterey
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags E-Filing, ProSe
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Letter
LETTER from Plaintiff Gregory Mitchell, dated 7/29/2008 Regarding Informa Pauperis Trust Account Certification. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Clerk's Notice re: IFP
    CLERK'S NOTICE re Completion of In Forma Pauperis Affidavit or Payment of Filing Fee Due Within 30 Days. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Complaint
      COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act - [No Summons Issued] against W. J. Hill, Pat Barker, Antar Jannah, E. J. Klein, A.O. Amaya, J. Hodges, J.L. Madison, Caravello, V. Raso, Sue Summersett, Nan Grannis, Jim Hamlet, J. Brown, A.P. Kane, B. Curry, W. Cohen, Lockwood, B. Hedrick & P. Manerville, [Filing Fee:Ifpp Entered on 6/17/2008] Filed by Plaintiff Gregory Mitchell. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2008) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2008: # (1) Complaint - [Part 1]) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2008: # (2) Complaint - [Part 2]) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2008: # (3) Complaint - [Part 3]) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2008: # (4) Complaint - [Part 4]) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2008: # (5) Complaint - [Part 5]) (tn, COURT STAFF).
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Case Referred to ECF
        CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 69 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?