USA v. Juneau
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-00481-PJH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Owen Peter Martikan +1 415 436 7241 +1 415 436 6748 CaseView.ECF@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Peter Raymond Juneau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald C. Tyler +1 415 436 7700 +1 415 436 7706 ronald_tyler@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Francisco
Filed 7/23/2008
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
308-mj-70181-MAG
Count 1-6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a) Bank Robbery
Def Custody Status
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None PRB12
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton:Change of Plea Hearing as to Peter Raymond Juneau held on 8/6/2008, Plea entered by Peter Raymond Juneau (1) Guilty Count 1-6. Sentencing set for 11/5/2008 01:30 PM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Plea Agreement
            PLEA AGREEMENT as to Peter Raymond Juneau (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton:Change of Plea as to Peter Raymond Juneau Not held on 7/30/2008. Change of Plea Hearing set for 8/6/2008 01:30 PM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
                LREF
                Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Waiver of Indictment
                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Peter Raymond Juneau (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James:Arraignment as to Peter Raymond Juneau (1) Count 1-6 held on 7/24/2008 ; not guilty plea entered. Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/30/2008 02:30 PM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Tape #10:02-10:05.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2008)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Information - Felony
                    INFORMATION as to Peter Raymond Juneau (1) count(s) 1-6. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2008)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                      CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing.
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Docket CallCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas:Preliminary Examination/arraignment as to Peter Raymond Juneau not held on 7/9/2008. Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination/arraignment set for 7/24/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (Tape #9:54-9:55.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER excluding time as to Peter Raymond Juneau re [26] Stipulation filed by USA. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/25/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Stipulation
                            STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCLUDING TIME FROM JUNE 24, 2008 THROUGH JULY 10, 2008 by USA as to Peter Raymond Juneau (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 6/25/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER - Stipulation and Order Excluding Time [23] as to Peter Raymond Juneau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Stipulation
                                STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCLUDING TIME FROM MAY 27, 2008 THROUGH JUNE 24, 2008 by USA as to Peter Raymond Juneau (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 6/20/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Docket CallCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen:Preliminary Examination/arraignment as to Peter Raymond Juneau not held on 5/27/2008. Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination/arraignment set for 6/24/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. (Tape #9:46-9:48a.m..) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER Excluding Time as to Peter Raymond Juneau. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/19/08. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Stipulation
                                      STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCLUDING TIME FROM MAY 13, 2008 THROUGH MAY 27, 2008 by USA as to Peter Raymond Juneau (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 5/16/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen:Arraignment as to Peter Raymond Juneau (2) Count Complaint held on 5/13/2008, Preliminary Examination as to Peter Raymond Juneau held on 5/13/2008. Arraignment set for 5/27/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Tape #9:32-9:35.) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER as to Peter Raymond Juneau re [11] Stipulation filed by USA. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson on 4/30/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Stipulation
                                            STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCLUDING TIME FROM APRIL 25, 2008 THROUGH MAY 13, 2008 by USA as to Peter Raymond Juneau (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 4/30/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Docket CallCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson:Preliminary Examination/arraignment as to Peter Raymond Juneau not held on 4/25/2008 ; defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination/arraignment set for 5/13/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Tape #9:54-9:56.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER EXCLUDING TIME as to Peter Raymond Juneau re [4] Stipulation filed by USA. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson on 4/16/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Stipulation
                                                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXCLUDING TIME UNDER 18 U.S.C.§ 3161 by USA as to Peter Raymond Juneau (Martikan, Owen) (Filed on 4/15/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Docket CallCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson:Preliminary Examination/arraignment as to Peter Raymond Juneau not held on 4/14/2008. Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination/arraignment set for 4/25/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James Larson. (Tape #9:37-9:39.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Docket CallCourt Filing
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson:Detention hearing as to Peter Raymond Juneau not held on 4/2/2008. Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination/arraignment set for 4/14/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James Larson. (Tape #9:47-9:49.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Initial Appearance as to Peter Raymond Juneau held on 3/28/2008, Added attorney Ronald C. Tyler for Peter Raymond Juneau. CJA23 Submitted as to Peter Raymond Juneau. Defendant remanded to custody. Detention Hearing and to set preliminary examination hearing set for 4/2/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James Larson. (Tape #FTR 10:15 to 10:18.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT as to James Michael Burge (1), Peter Raymond Juneau (2). (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2008)[3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                                            CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. [3:08-mj-70181-MAG]
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?