Pagan-Colon v. Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 11-1089

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 5:00 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106459559 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge. On September 4, 2012, we issued an opinion in this case affirming the district court's judgment in all respects, save its decision to reject plaintiff Ada I. Renta-Bonilla's Article 1802 claim. We certified questions to the Puerto Rico Supreme Court with respect to that claim, and we retained jurisdiction over the case pending the Puerto Rico Supreme Court's determination of the certified questions. On September 21, 2012, plaintiffs filed a motion asking us to sever plaintiff Juan C. Pagán-Colón's claims pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and enter judgment with respect to those claims while the Puerto Rico Supreme Court considers the certified questions related to Renta-Bonilla's claims. We deny the motion. The district court entered an amended judgment in favor of plaintiffs on December 7, 2010. That judgment still stands. Plaintiffs do not assert (and the record does not indicate) that defendant posted a supersedeas bond pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(d), which would have automatically stayed the execution of that judgment pending appeal. See Acevedo-García v. Vera-Monroig, 296 F.3d 13, 17 (1st Cir. 2002). Absent such a bond, the mere pendency of an appeal does not preclude a plaintiff from seeking execution of a judgment in district court. See id.; Correa v. Cruisers, a Div. of KCS Intern., Inc., 298 F.3d 13, 29 (1st Cir. 2002); Trustmark Ins. Co. v. Gallucci, 193 F.3d 559, 559 (1st Cir. 1999); see also 11 Charles Allen Wright, Arthur R. Miller & Mary Kay Kane, Federal Practice and Procedure § 2905 (2d ed. 1995) ("In the absence of a stay obtained in accordance with Rule 62(d), the pendency of an appeal does not prevent the judgment creditor from acting to enforce the judgment."). As the only remaining issue in the appeal is whether to increase the amount of the judgment, we are confident that the district judge will entertain a request for immediate enforcement of the judgment as it now stands, without prejudice to any possible increase in the amount of the judgment following a reply to the question certified. [11-1089, 11-1091] (GK)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106440640 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
    MOTION seeking a ruling on the Emergency Motion filed on Septemer 21, 2012 filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089. Certificate of service dated 10/05/2012. [11-1089, 11-1091]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text.[11-1089, 11-1091]--[Edited 10/05/2012 by CP] (JM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106434556 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
      EMERGENCY MOTION to Request the Entry of Judgment on Juan C. Pagan-Colon's Claims filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089. Certificate of service dated 09/21/2012. [11-1089, 11-1091] (JM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106426826 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER of Court and Certification of Questions to the Supreme Court of Puerto Rico entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106426820 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          OPINION issued by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge and Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge. Published. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106346902 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
            CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2012. [11-1089, 11-1091] (GTU)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106344990 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
              CITATION of supplemental authorities pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089. Certificate of service dated 03/08/2012. [11-1089, 11-1091] (JM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106329220 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Designation of Attorney Presenting Oral Argument filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 02/06/2012. [11-1089, 11-1091] (GTU)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106326414 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                  DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Jorge Martinez-Luciano for Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089. Certificate of service dated 01/31/2012. [11-1089, 11-1091] (JM)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106325760 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                    CASE calendared: Tuesday, 03/06/2012 San Juan, PR: Jose V. Toledo Courthouse, 300 Recinto Sur Street, San Juan, PR: Designation form due 02/13/2012. [11-1089, 11-1091] (LM)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106266836 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                      APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANTS' REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 09/27/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 10/05/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (BLC)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106266802 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                        ORDER granting motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix to the reply brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089 . [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106266565 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                          BRIEF TENDERED by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089 to appellant/petitioner brief [5579512-2]. Certificate of service dated 09/27/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091]--[Edited 09/28/2011 by CP]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. [11-1089, 11-1091]--[Edited 09/28/2011 by BLC]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. [11-1089, 11-1091] (JM)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106266561 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION for leave to file a Second Supplemental Appendix filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089. Certificate of service dated 09/27/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (JM)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 00106259530 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                              APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Number of copies: 9. Certificate of service dated 09/12/2011. Brief due 09/27/2011 for appellee Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla. [11-1089, 11-1091]--[Edited 09/23/2011 by DT]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (BLC)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106258732 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                BRIEF tendered by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 09/12/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (NNV)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106255353 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                  ORDER granting motion to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. Reply brief due 09/12/2011 for appellant Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106255285 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 09/02/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (NNV)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106255071 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                      ORDER granting motion for leave to file supplemental appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106253796 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for leave to file supplemental appendix filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 08/31/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (NNV)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106250710 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                          ORDER granting motion to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. Reply brief due 09/06/2011 for appellant Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106250647 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 08/24/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (NNV)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106235739 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                              ORDER granting motion to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. Reply brief due 08/29/2011 for appellant Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106235607 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 07/21/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (NNV)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106230368 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATE of service for pleading tendered [5562904-2] filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (JM)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106225549 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                    ORDER granting motion for leave to file supplemental appendix filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership Pagan/Renta, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089. Supplemental appendix due 07/07/201. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106225418 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                      APPELLEES/CROSS-APPELLANTS' PRINCIPAL BRIEF filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 06/24/2011. Reply brief due 07/28/2011 for appellant Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/05/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (BLC)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106224694 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                        BRIEF tendered by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089. Certificate of service dated 06/24/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (JM)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106224688 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for leave to file supplemental appendix filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089. Certificate of service dated 06/24/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (JM)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106224364 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla. Brief due 06/24/2011 for appellee Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106223841 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089. Certificate of service dated 06/22/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (JM)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106211397 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla. Brief due 06/22/2011 for appellee Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106211016 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 05/20/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (JM)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106198453 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 04/19/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (BLC)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106198412 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 04/19/2011. Brief due 05/23/2011 for appellee Conjugal Partnership, Juan C. Pagan-Colon and Ada I. Renta-Bonilla. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 04/26/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (BLC)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 00106198322 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        BRIEF tendered by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 04/19/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (NNV)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106197072 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          ORDER granting motion for leave to file oversized addendum filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. [11-1089] (CP)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106196900 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for leave to file oversized Addendum filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091. Certificate of service dated 04/15/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (NNV)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106195621 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              ORDER directing Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. in 11-1089, 11-1091 to file a conforming brief. Brief due 04/27/2011. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106195068 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                BRIEF tendered by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 04/11/2011. [11-1089]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by BLC] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required.[11-1089, 11-1091] (NNV)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106176728 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  CROSS-APPEAL briefing schdule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Brief due 04/11/2011 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. Appendix due 04/11/2011 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106176185 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    ORDER directing the parties to proceed under F.R.A.P 28.1. [11-1089, 11-1091] (CP)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106174907 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: 10/25/2010, Closing Arguments:Plaintiff and Defendant; 10/18/2010, Testimony All Witnesses; 10/19/2010, Testimony All Witnesses; 10/20/2010, Testimony All Witnesses; 10/21/2010, Testimony All Witnesses; 10/22/2010, Testimony All Witnesses; 10/20/2010, Rule 50 Arguments; 10/25/2010, Rule 50 Arguments. Transcript(s) due 04/25/2011 from Court Reporter Vicki L Eastvold [11-1089] (CP)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106174139 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. filed by Attorney Gregory T. Usera. Certificate of service dated 02/22/2011. [11-1089] (GTU)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106173584 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 02/22/2011. [11-1089] (NNV)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106173575 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/22/2011. [11-1089] (NNV)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106173571 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc. filed by Attorney Nilda N. Villavicencio Camacho. Certificate of service dated 02/22/2011. [11-1089] (NNV)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106173472 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Conjugal Partnership and Juan C. Pagan-Colon filed by Attorney Alfredo Acevedo-Cruz. Certificate of service dated 02/21/2011. [11-1089] (AA)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106169228 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #193) filed by Appellant Walgreens of San Patricio, Inc.. Docketing Statement due 02/23/2011. Transcript Report/Order form due 02/23/2011. Appearance form due 02/23/2011. [11-1089] (CP)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 193 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?