Colgan Air, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case New York Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 12-11344
District Judge Robert E. Gerber, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 17, 2016 at 1:00 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marshall Scott Huebner +1 212 450 4099 +1 212 450 3099 marshall.huebner@davispolk.com
Space Damian Schaible +1 212 450 4580 +1 212 450 3580 damian.schaible@dpw.com
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Withdrawal of Val Verde County Proof of Claim Nos. 530 and 1661 filed by David G. Aelvoet on behalf of Val Verde County. (Aelvoet, David) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice of Withdrawal of the City of Del Rio Proof of Claim No. 531 filed by David G. Aelvoet on behalf of City of Del Rio. (Aelvoet, David) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Withdrawal of Claim(s): No. 1653 filed by Diane W. Sanders on behalf of McLennan County. (Sanders, Diane) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Order signed on 5/28/2013 Granting Application for Final Decree Closing The Chapter 11 Cases of Colgan Air, Inc., Mesaba Aviation, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines, Inc. and Pinnacle East Coast Operations Inc. (Related Doc # 7 ). (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Application for Final Decree / Reorganized Debtors' Motion for Final Decree Closing the Chapter 11 Cases of Colgan Air, Inc., Mesaba Aviation, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines, Inc. and Pinnacle East Coast Operations Inc. This Administrative Entry was Entered to Reflect the Accurate Docket Event Code filed by Darren S. Klein on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc.. (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Appearance filed by Kay Diebel Brock on behalf of c/o Kay D. Brock Travis County. (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice of Appearance And Demand For Service of Papers filed by Margaret Taylor Finucane on behalf of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Taylor Finucane, Margaret) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Notice of Appearance filed by Diane W. Sanders on behalf of McLennan County. (Sanders, Diane) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration Directing the ProceduralConsolidation and Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of ColganAir, Inc.; Mesaba Aviation, Inc.; Pinnacle Airlines Corp.; PinnacleAirlines, Inc. and Pinnacle East Coast Operations Inc. The docket in CaseNo. 12-11343 (REG) Should be Consulted for All Matters Affecting thisCase.(Related Doc # 2) signed on 4/2/2012. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases filed by Damian Schaible on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc.. (Schaible, Damian) (Entered: 04/01/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Marshall Scott Huebner of Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc.. (Huebner, Marshall) (Entered: 04/01/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 196 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?