USA v. Jett et al
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:08-cr-00509-SBA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 25, 2021 at 12:41 PM DT (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garth Hire +1 510 637 3929 +1 510 637 3724 garth.hire@usdoj.gov
Space Christine Y. Wong +1 212 637 2460 +1 212 637 2527 USANYS.ECF@USDOJ.GOV
v.
No Logo Calvin Sloan, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Oakland
Filed 7/30/2008
County Alameda
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
18371 Conspiracy
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a),(d),(e), 182 Armed bank robbery, Aiding and abetting
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 924C.F
Offense Level 4
18924(c)(1)(A), 182 Using, carrying and brandishing firearm during crime of violence, Aiding and abetting
Def Custody Status
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Order on Probation 12B - Request to Modify Conditions or Term of Supervision with Consent of Person
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None PRB12
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None USCA Case Number
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                                  NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney as to Tellas Jett, Eugene Moses, Christopher Roberson, Calvin Sloan (Hire, Garth) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad proseCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [3] Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Calvin Sloan (4) before the Hon. Wayne D. Brazil, United States Magistrate Judge, at 10:00 a.m. on Monday, September 22, 2008, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California.. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/29/08. (fj, COURT STAFF)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008, Terminated: 8/29/2008 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
                                      MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Calvin Sloan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Wong, Christine) (Filed on 8/29/2008) Modified on 9/2/2008 (kc, COURT STAFF).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                        Initial Appearance set for 9/22/2008 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil as to Eugene Moses, Calvin Sloan, Christopher Roberson.
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Indictment
                                          INDICTMENT as to Tellas Jett (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Eugene Moses (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Christopher Roberson (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Calvin Sloan (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                            CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing.
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?