Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. TomTom, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00520
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 8:10 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
v.
No Logo Tomtom Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adrienne Gail Johnson +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 ajohnson@wileyrein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian H Pandya +1 202 719 7457 +1 202 719 7049 bpandya@wileyrein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Wallace, Jr. +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7207 jwallace@wileyrein.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice all claims of Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC against Defendant TomTom. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/11/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss TomTom by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrienne Gail Johnson on behalf of TomTom, Inc., (Johnson, Adrienne) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TomTom, Inc., (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
          ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to 2 Complaint by TomTom, Inc.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against TomTom, Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant TomTom, Inc from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 64 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?