Archer Daniels Midland Company et al v. Paillardon
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-02227
District Judge Michael P. McCuskey, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 9:02 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ADM Latin America Inc, Plaintiff
Archer Daniels Midland Archer Daniels Midland, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Archer Daniels Midland Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon R. Fetterolf +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 jfetterolf@wc.com
Space Ryan P. McCarthy , +1 202 434 5157 rmccarthy@wc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WINTERS FEATHERSTUN GAUMER KENNEY POSTLEWAIT STOCKS & FLYNN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerrold H Stocks +1 217 429 4453 +1 217 425 8892 jstocks@family-net.net
v.
No Logo Regis Paillardon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BECKETT & WEBBER PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew W B Bequette +1 217 328 0263 +1 217 328 0290 andrew@beckettwebber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony B Ullman +1 212 632 8342 anthony.ullman@dentons.com
Citation Section 09 U.S.C. § 0010
Nature of Suit 896 - Other Statutes: Arbitration
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
Appeal Record Returned: CD containing pleadings returned to the District Court Clerk. CD destroyed by clerk. (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
    LREF
    Blank 41 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
    MANDATE of USCA as to 26 Notice of Appeal, filed by Archer Daniels Midland Company and ADM Latin America Inc. Case is DISMISSED pursuant to Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Appeal filed by counsel for the parties. See written Mandate/Order. (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
      LREF
      Blank 40 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER entered by Judge Michael P. McCuskey on 1/21/2014. Pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this court has decided, in its discretion, to defer consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Judgment 33 , and the motions related to it. Plaintiffs' Motions 33 , 34 , 35 , 36 and 37 are dismissed with leave to refile when the case is no longer on appeal. Because of this ruling, Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motions 39 is MOOT. See written order. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
        LREF
        Blank 39 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory , 33 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment Rule 60 (b)(2), (b)(3), 34 MOTION for Hearing re 33 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment Rule 60 (b)(2), (b)(3) , 35 MOTION to Amend/Correct Original Petition to Vacate by Defendant Regis Paillardon. Responses due by 2/3/2014 (Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
          LREF
          Blank 38 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony B Ullman (Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
            LREF
            Blank 37 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION to Amend/Correct 33 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment Rule 60 (b)(2), (b)(3) to subtitute Ex 1 to Fetterolf Declaration by Plaintiffs ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Responses due by 1/27/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Substitute Ex 1 to Fetterolf Declaration)(Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
              MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Plaintiffs ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Responses due by 1/27/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 35 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                MOTION to Amend/Correct Original Petition to Vacate by Plaintiffs ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Responses due by 1/27/2014 (Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                  LREF
                  Blank 34 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Hearing re 33 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment Rule 60 (b)(2), (b)(3) by Plaintiffs ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Responses due by 1/27/2014 (Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Set Aside Judgment Rule 60 (b)(2), (b)(3) by Plaintiffs ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Responses due by 1/27/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 Fetterolf Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 Fetterolf Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 Fetterolf Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 Fetterolf Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 Fetterolf Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 Fetterolf Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 Fetterolf Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 Fetterolf Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 Fetterolf Declaration)(Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 32 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                      Letter of Transmittal to USCA re 26 Notice of Appeal consisting of 94 volumes of pleadings. Sent to USCA by UPS. (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                        Request from USCA for Long Record re 26 Notice of Appeal. (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                          LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Archer Daniels Midland Company. No transcipts are requested. (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                            LREF
                            Blank 29 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                            DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company re 26 Notice of Appeal, (Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                              LREF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 26 Notice of Appeal, filed by ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. USCA Case Number 13-2220 (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re 26 Notice of Appeal. (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order on Motion to Vacate,, 24 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion to Cite Authority,,, by ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0753-1600358. (Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                    JUDGMENT in favor of Regis Paillardon against ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. See written judgment. (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      OPINION entered by Judge Michael P. McCuskey on 5/3/2013. ADM's Motion to File Oversize Reply Brief 18 is GRANTED. ADM's Motion for Hearing 19 is DENIED. Paillardon's Motion to Cite Newly-Issued Authority 22 is GRANTED. ADM's Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award 1 is DENIED.This case is terminated. See written opinion. (JMW, ilcd) Modified on 5/3/2013 to show the document as an opinion. (JMW, ilcd)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name (Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Cite Authority (Newly-Issued) in Opposition to Petitioners' Petition to Vacate Arbitral Award by Defendant Regis Paillardon. Responses due by 4/4/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 19 MOTION for Hearing re 1 MOTION to Vacate filed by Defendant Regis Paillardon. (Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION for Leave to File Oversize Reply Brief filed by Defendant Regis Paillardon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Respondent's Proposed Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Respondent's Proposed Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law)(Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Hearing re 1 MOTION to Vacate by Plaintiffs ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Responses due by 11/13/2012 (Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Oversize Reply Brief by Plaintiffs ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Responses due by 11/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proposed Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits to Reply, # 3 Exhibit to Reply Brief)(Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Exhibit re 16 Memorandum by ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit)(Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM re 1 MOTION to Vacate by Archer Daniels Midland Company. (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Remark: Attached Rule 26.3 regarding discovery sent to the Plaintiff by way of e-filing project. (JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Vacate International Arbitration Award (CORRECTED AFFIDAVIT) filed by Defendant Regis Paillardon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Award ) - PART 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A (Award) - PART 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B (Cl. Opening Brief), # 4 Exhibit C (Acedo WS), # 5 Exhibit D (Fernandez WS), # 6 Exhibit E (Paillardon WS with relevant exs) - PART 1 of 2, # 7 Exhibit E (Paillardon WS with relevant exs) - PART 2 of 2, # 8 Exhibit F (Perez WS with relevant exs), # 9 Exhibit G (Ullman Dec. with relevant exs), # 10 Exhibit H (Resp. Br.), # 11 Exhibit I (Batchelder WS with relevant exs), # 12 Exhibit J (Bonnensen WS with relevant exs), # 13 Exhibit K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 1 of 8, # 14 Exhibit K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 2 of 8, # 15 Exhibit K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 3 of 8, # 16 Exhibit K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 4 of 8, # 17 Exhibit K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 5 of 8, # 18 Exhibit K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 6 of 8, # 19 Exhibit K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 7 of 8, # 20 Exhibit K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 8 of 8, # 21 Exhibit L (Funderburg WS with relevant exs), # 22 Exhibit M (Graves WS with relevant exs), # 23 Exhibit N (Hart WS with relevant exs), # 24 Exhibit O (Jansen WS with relevant exs), # 25 Exhibit P (Martinez WS with relevant exs), # 26 Exhibit Q (Montes WS with relevant exs), # 27 Exhibit R (Onks WS with relevant exs), # 28 Exhibit S (Planchart WS), # 29 Exhibit T (Rayhill WS with exs), # 30 Exhibit U (Schwalbe WS), # 31 Exhibit V (Cl. Reply Br.), # 32 Exhibit W (Acedo Reply WS), # 33 Exhibit X (Bardyn Reply WS with relevant exs), # 34 Exhibit Y (Paillardon Reply WS with relevant exs), # 35 Exhibit Z (Perez Reply WS), # 36 Exhibit AA (Relevant pages from the hearing transcript), # 37 Exhibit BB (Acedo Aff.), # 38 Exhibit CC (Planchart Aff.), # 39 Exhibit DD (Acedo Reply Aff.), # 40 Exhibit EE (Planchart Reply Aff.), # 41 Exhibit FF (Paillardon Post-HB), # 42 Exhibit GG (ADM Post-HB), # 43 Exhibit HH (Paillardon's Reply Post-HB), # 44 Exhibit II (ADM's Motion to Dismiss), # 45 Exhibit JJ (Stipulation), # 46 Exhibit KK (JVA), # 47 Exhibit LL (Commission Agreement), # 48 Exhibit MM (JE 046), # 49 Exhibit NN (Arbitrator's bio))(Ullman, Anthony) (Attachment 10 replaced on 10/15/2012 - Document was corrupt and could not be viewed. Mr. Ullman provided pdf of document) (MC, ilcd). ) (MC, ilcd). Modified on 10/15/2012 (Entered: 10/13/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                            STRICKEN- AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Vacate International Arbitration Award filed by Defendant Regis Paillardon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A (Award ) - PART 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A (Award) - PART 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. B (Cl. Opening Brief), # 4 Exhibit Ex. C (Acedo WS), # 5 Exhibit Ex. D (Fernandez WS), # 6 Exhibit Ex. E (Paillardon WS with relevant exs) - PART 1 of 2, # 7 Exhibit Ex. E (Paillardon WS with relevant exs) - PART 2 of 2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. F (Perez WS with relevant exs), # 9 Exhibit Ex. G (Ullman Dec. with relevant exs), # 10 Exhibit Ex. H (Resp. Br.), # 11 Exhibit Ex. I (Batchelder WS with relevant exs), # 12 Exhibit Ex. J (Bonnensen WS with relevant exs), # 13 Exhibit Ex. K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 1 of 8, # 14 Exhibit Ex. K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 2 of 8, # 15 Exhibit Ex. K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 3 of 8, # 16 Exhibit Ex. K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 4 of 8, # 17 Exhibit Ex. K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 5 of 8, # 18 Exhibit Ex. K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 6 of 8, # 19 Exhibit Ex. K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 7 of 8, # 20 Exhibit Ex. K (Cervantes WS with exs) - PART 8 of 8, # 21 Exhibit Ex. L (Funderburg WS with relevant exs), # 22 Exhibit Ex. M (Graves WS with relevant exs), # 23 Exhibit Ex. N (Hart WS with relevant exs), # 24 Exhibit Ex. O (Jansen WS with relevant exs), # 25 Exhibit Ex. P (Martinez WS with relevant exs)), # 26 Exhibit Ex. Q (Montes WS with relevant exs), # 27 Exhibit Ex. R (Onks WS with relevant exs), # 28 Exhibit Ex. S (Planchart WS), # 29 Exhibit Ex. T (Rayhill WS with exs), # 30 Exhibit Ex. U (Schwalbe WS), # 31 Exhibit Ex. V (Cl. Reply Br.), # 32 Exhibit Ex. W (Acedo Reply WS), # 33 Exhibit Ex. X (Bardyn Reply WS with relevant exs), # 34 Exhibit Ex. Y (Paillardon Reply WS with relevant exs), # 35 Exhibit Ex. Z (Perez Reply WS), # 36 Exhibit Ex. AA (Relevant pages from the hearing transcript), # 37 Exhibit Ex. BB (Acedo Aff.), # 38 Exhibit Ex. CC (Planchart Aff.), # 39 Exhibit Ex. DD (Acedo Reply Aff.), # 40 Exhibit Ex. EE (Planchart Reply Aff.), # 41 Exhibit Ex. FF (Paillardon Post-HB), # 42 Exhibit Ex. GG (ADM Post-HB), # 43 Exhibit Ex. HH (Paillardon Reply Post-HB), # 44 Exhibit Ex. II (ADM's Motion to Dismiss), # 45 Exhibit Ex. JJ (Stipulation), # 46 Exhibit Ex. KK (JVA), # 47 Exhibit Ex. LL (Commission Agreement), # 48 Exhibit JE 046, # 49 Exhibit Arbitrator's bio)(Ullman, Anthony) (Attachment 10 replaced on 10/15/2012 - Document was corrupt and could not be viewed. Mr. Ullman provided pdf of document) (MC, ilcd). Modified on 10/15/2012. Modified on 10/17/2012 to show the document as stricken pursuant to the text order entered on 10/17/2012.(JMW, ilcd). (Entered: 10/13/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Vacate International Arbitration Award filed by Defendant Regis Paillardon. (Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 1 MOTION to Vacate International Arbitration Award filed by Defendant Regis Paillardon. (Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File an Oversized Brief by Defendant Regis Paillardon. Responses due by 10/29/2012 (Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Defendant Regis Paillardon. (Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 MOTION to Vacate, 4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Regis Paillardon. Responses due by 9/24/2012 (Bequette, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Regis Paillardon. (Bequette, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrew W B Bequette on behalf of Regis Paillardon (Bequette, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Anthony B Ullman on behalf of Regis Paillardon (Ullman, Anthony) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Responses due by 9/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Petition, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Designation of Lead Counsel by Jerrold H Stocks on behalf of ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. (Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. (Stocks, Jerrold) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award by Plaintiffs ADM Latin America Inc, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Responses due by 9/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Filing fee $350 received)(Receipt 24626003573)(JMW, ilcd) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 599 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?