Harry v. HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:12-cv-00990-SRN-JJK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 2:35 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Philip M. Harry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J Fuller +1 612 226 7462 richardjfuller@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowder Teske, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H Crowder +1 612 746 1558 +1 651 846 5339 crowder@crowderteske.com
Space Colleen M Daly +1 612 746 1558 +1 651 846 5339 daly@crowderteske.com
Space Douglas L Micko +1 612 746 1558 +1 651 846 5339 micko@crowderteske.com
Space Vildan A Teske +1 612 746 1558 +1 651 846 5339 teske@crowderteske.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowder, Teske, Katz & Micko PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marisa C Katz +1 612 746 1558 +1 651 846 5339 katz@crowderteske.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schaefer Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bert Black +1 612 294 2600 bblack@schaeferlaw.com
v.
No Logo HSBC Mortgage Services Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Frontino +1 310 556 5800 +1 310 556 5959 bfrontino@stroock.com
Space Julia Beatrice Strickland +1 310 556 5806 +1 310 556 5959 jstrickland@stroock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence T Hofmann +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 lhofmann@zelle.com
Space Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com
Citation Section 50 U.S.C. § 0501
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/20/13. (LPH) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Philip M. Harry. (Katz, Marisa) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Settlement Conference held on 1/17/2013. Confidential Settlement reached. Terms stated on the record. Any transcript of the terms of settlement is Confidential and shall be SEALED, with access being allowed only to the parties and their counsel. (Tape #1-17-13 12:21-12:31) (jam) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Resetting of Settlement Conference: 30 29 Settlement Conference set for 12/14/2012 reset for 1/17/2013 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Confidential settlement letters due in chambers 1/14/2013.(JEP) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Resetting of Settlement Conference: 29 Settlement Conference set for 12/7/2012 reset for 12/14/2012 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Confidential settlement letters due in chambers 12/11/2012.(JEP) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 12/7/2012 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/07/2012. (MMP) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 16 Motion to Compel and to Stay Action. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 09/07/12. (kll) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Phyllis Johnston in SUPPORT OF 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Action filed by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 9/7/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                  Notice of No Reply to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Action filed by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 9/7/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM by Philip M. Harry re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Action in Response filed by Philip M. Harry. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Katz, Marisa) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER DISAPPROVING 22 Stipulation filed by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Philip M. Harry. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 8/27/12. (ds) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 22 Stipulation re Emailing Proposed Order by Vildan A Teske on behalf of Philip M. Harry. (Teske, Vildan) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Action Stipulation to Suspend Motions and Vacate Hearing by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Philip M. Harry. (Teske, Vildan) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Action : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle.(ds) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Action. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 6/21/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT of Phyllis Johnston in SUPPORT OF 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Action filed by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-3)(Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 6/21/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Action filed by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 6/21/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Action : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Zamansky, Rory) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Action by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 6/21/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Julia B. Strickland re 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Julia B. Strickland by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 6/7/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Julia B. Strickland by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 6/7/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT of Brian C. Frontino re 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brian C. Frontino by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 6/7/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brian C. Frontino by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 6/7/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER GRANTING SECOND JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Based on the parties' Second Joint Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF Docket No. 9 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. shall have an additional fourteen days in which to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, to and including June 20, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 06/05/2012. (MMP) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Philip M. Harry re 9 Stipulation (Second)(Joint) Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 6/5/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION (Second) (Joint) Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Philip M. Harry. (Zamansky, Rory) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence T Hofmann on behalf of HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Hofmann, Lawrence) Modified on 5/29/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Having reviewed the parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. No. 5), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., shall have an additional twenty-one (21) days in which to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint, through and including June 6, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 05/25/2012. (MMP) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. re 5 Stipulation [Joint] Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 5/25/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Philip M. Harry. (Zamansky, Rory) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Rory D Zamansky on behalf of HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (Zamansky, Rory) Modified on 5/25/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip M. Harry. HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. served on 4/25/2012, answer due 5/16/2012. (Katz, Marisa) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, Exhibit A by Philip M. Harry. (Katz, Marisa) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 9/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 16 Motion to Compel and to Stay Action. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 09/07/12. (kll)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      COMPLAINT against HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 64307.) assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Master list referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Filed by Philip M. Harry. (Attachments: # 1 Verification of Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMP) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 210 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?