Audible, Inc. IPO, et al v. Audible, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-05258
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Rando, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brodsky & Smith LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Evan Jason Smith +1 610 667 6200 +1 610 667 9029 esmith@brodsky-smith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley, Geller, Bowman & Coates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven E Cauley +1 501 312 8500 + 501 312 8505

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian M. Felgoise

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Brian M Felgoise +1 215 886 1900 felgoiselaw@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 pmclean@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Peyman Abdollahzadeh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
v.
No Logo Andrew J. Huffman, Defendant
No Logo Andrew P. Kaplan, Defendant
No Logo Audible, Inc., Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Donald R. Katz, Defendant
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Unknown Role, Peloton Resources Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
No Logo Prudential Securities Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah S. Gold +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sgold@proskauer.com
No Logo R. Bradford Burnham, Defendant
No Logo Richard Brass, Defendant
No Logo Soundview Technology Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michele Athena Coffey +1 212 309 6000 mcoffey@morganlewis.com
No Logo Thomas P. Hirschfeld, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Mott, Defendant
No Logo Volpe Brown Whelan & Company Llc, Defendant
No Logo W. Bingham Gordon, Defendant
No Logo Winthrop Knowlton, Defendant
No Logo Wit Capital Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Abraham Garfinkel, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Anthony Illes, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo George Masidze, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Gregory M. DiMicelli, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo John Rick Heidel, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Mark Katz, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Oren Giskan, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Sam Regam, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo William Chue, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Cibc World Markets, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 scott.musoff@skadden.com
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Moses Silverman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Moses Silverman +1 212 315 3082

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Emanuel Tauber +1 202 263 3324 +1 202 263 5324 ATauber@mayerbrownrowe.com
No Logo Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Company, Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven G. Bradbury +1 202 879 5000
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS POSTED TO SATISFY RULE 7 BOND TO SETTLING OBJECTIONS granting (6302) Motion for Release of Funds in case 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within ten (10) calendar days of this order the clerk shall release to Jeffrey Weinstein, on behalf of the Movants, the $25,000 deposited with the cashier's office under Objectors Receipt Number 909152. The clerk's check for $25,000 should be made payable to "Jeffrey Weinstein" and mailed to Jeffrey Weinstein, 518 East Tyler Street, Athens, Texas, 75751. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Movants are hereby relieved of their joint and several obligation to post a bond. Movants are to pay their own fees and costs in the action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion [Docket No. 6302]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) Modified on 4/13/2012 (mro). (Entered: 04/12/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER AUTHORIZING CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR TO PROCESS CLAIMS SUBMITTED PRIOR TO ENTRY OF THIS ORDER AND TO STOP PROCESSING ANY NEW PROOFS OF CLAIM: The Claims Administrator is authorized to process all Proofs of Claim it received on or before entry of this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that any Proofs of Claim received by the Claims Administrator after entry of this Order shall not be processed, may not be accepted and shall be returned by the Claims Administrator to the sender together with a notice stating that "The Court has entered an Order providing that no Proof of Claim submitted after the date of entry of this Order may be accepted for any reason whatsoever" and it is further ORDERED, that the Claims Administrator is directed to include a notice on the www.iposecuritieslitigationsettlement.com website stating that no Proof of Claim submitted after the date ofentry of this Order may be accepted for any reason whatsoever; and it is further ORDERED, that the Claims Administrator is directed to promptly conclude the processing of all Proofs of Claim received on or before entry of this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that, upon the Claims Administrator's conclusion of the processing of the Proofs of Claim submitted or before entry of this Order, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee shall move for the Class Distribution Order contemplated in paragraph 14 of the Stipulation; and it is further ORDERED, that this Court retain jurisdiction over any further application or matter which may arise in connection with the administration an Settlement of this litigation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/9/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(ft) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
      PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO PRO SE OBJECTOR JAMES J. HAYES'S AUGUST 8, 2011 SUBMISSION. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/16/11 at 11:18 pm) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of Christian Siebott in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to this Court's July 20, 2011 Order addressing whether Pro Se objector James J. Hayes is a class member. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/5/11 at 11:13pm) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
          PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S JULY 20, 2011 ORDER ADDRESSING WHETHER PRO SE OBJECTOR JAMES J. HAYES IS A CLASS MEMBER. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/5/11 at 11:13pm)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: If Hayes is directed to submit any further support he wishes to be considered on the question of whether he is a class member, i.e., a "person...[who] purchased or otherwise acquired the securities of [Specific Issuer] during the Class Period and [was] damaged thereby," by the close of business on July 29, 2011. If Hayes makes any further submissions he shall simultaneously serve Plaintiffs' Executive Committee by email or by overnight express mail. Any party who wises to respond to Hayes's submissions to date or in response to this Order shall do so by the close of business on August 5, 2011. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(tro) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              OPINION AND ORDER #100514. For the foregoing reasons, total fees shall be allocated according to the methodology described herein and in the amounts included in the attached Spreadsheet. Expenses and interest shall be allocated according to Exhibit A of the Proposal. The Objectors are directed to file their Objections and any responses thereto. The Clerk of the Court is then directed to close these motions. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/8/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(djc) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Plaintiffs' Executive Committee ("EC") is hereby ordered to prepare a spreadsheet showing the allocation of total fees of $170,084,950.00 based on the "revised adjusted lodestars" of both the EC and non-EC law firms. This spreadsheet must be submitted to the Court by close of business Monday, June 20, 2011. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/15/11); Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(djc) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/10 re: We respectfully request a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPO Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm of Brower Piven, P.C. is directly seeking attorney's fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such claim will be heard by Judge Scheindlin. But any disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Haldenstein arising out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/2010 re: Requesting a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPO Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm of Brower Piven P.C. is directly seeking attorneys fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such claims will be heard by Judge Scheindlin. But any disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Haldenstein arriving out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(jpo) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/10 re: Request for a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPQ Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm Brower Piven PC is directly seeking attorneys' fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such caim will be heard by Judge Sheindlin. But only disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Halderstein arising out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(db) Modified on 1/13/2011 (db). (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Baum.Document filed by Lester Baum.Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(Greene, Leland) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leland L. Greene on behalf of Lester Baum Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(Greene, Leland) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER settling action as to 01 Civ. 5258. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              STIPULATION AND ORDER; on 5/13/08, the court issued and filed an Opinion and order granting in part and denying in part the motion of the underwriters to strike class allegations from the complaints in twenty-six non-focus cases pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(d)(1)(D). The court directed that withing 21 days of the Opinion and Order, "plaintiffs shall notify defendants and the Court of the identity of the putative class representatives for each proposed class in each of the 18 cases and the basis for each putative representative's claim, and shall indicate whether these putative representatives are members of the proposed classes." Plaintiffs' time to disclose the required information is extended through and including 3/6/09. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/11/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(sac) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                STIPULATION AND ORDER; on 5/13/08, the court issued and filed an Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part the motion of the underwriters to strike class allegations from the complaints in twenty-six non-focus cases. The court directed that within twenty-one days of the Opinion and Order, "plaintiffs shall notify defendants and the Court of the identity of the putative class representatives for each proposed class in each of the eighteen cases and the basis for each putative representative's claim, and shall indicate whether these putative representatives are members of the proposed classes." Plaintiffs' time to disclose the required information is extended through and including 1/30/09. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/28/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(sac) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER; on 5/13/08, the Court issued and filed an Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part the motion of the underwriters to strike class allegations from the complaints in 26 non-focus cases. The Court directed that within 21 days of the Opinion and Order, "plaintiffs shall notify defendants and the Court of the identity of the putative class representatives for each proposed class in each of the 18 cases and the basis for each putative representative's claim, and shall indicate whether putative representatives are members of the proposed classes." Plaintiffs' time to disclose the required information is extended through and including 10/30/08. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/25/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(sac) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER; on 5/13/08, the Court issued and filed an Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part the motion of the underwriters to strike class allegations from the complaints in 26 non-focus cases. The Court directed that within 21 days of the Opinion and Order, "plaintiffs shall notify defendants and the Court of the identity of the putative class representatives for each proposed class in each of the 18 cases and the basis for each putative representative's claim, and shall indicate whether putative representatives are members of the proposed classes." The Plaintiffs' time to disclose the required information is extended through and including 8/22/08. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/16/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(sac) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER; on 5/13/08, the Court issued and filed an Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part the motion of the underwriters to strike class allegations from the complaints in twenty-six non-focus cases. Plaintiffs' time to disclose the required information is extended through and including 7/15/08. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/4/08) This Document Relates to: 01cv3020; 01cv5258; 01cv6277; 01cv6820; 01cv6873; 01cv9411; 01cv9504; 01cv9741; 01cv9748; 01cv9619; 01cv9883; 01cv10053; 01cv10105; 01cv10108; 01cv10576; 01cv10683; 01cv10753; 01cv10799; 01cv10838; 01cv10839; 01cv10901; 01cv10942; 01cv10988; 01cv11219; 01cv11220; 01cv11249. (sac) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice... without costs as to defendant Andrew J. Huffman because he is deceased.. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/1/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-05258-SAS,1:01-cv-05334-SAS,1:01-cv-05585-SAS,1:01-cv-05665-SAS,1:01-cv-05998-SAS, 1:01-cv-06033-SAS,1:01-cv-07427-SAS(jsa, ) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 19 Amended Complaint filed by John Rando.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
                                            ANSWER by Morgan Stanley to [19-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Steven G. Bradbury from the Firm: Kirkland & Ellis). (moc) (Entered: 11/22/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER by Prudential to [19-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Sarah S. Gold from the Firm: Proskauer Ross, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 10/09/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER by Soundview Technology to [19-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Michele A. Coffey from the Firm: Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER by CIBC World Markets to [19-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                    ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [19-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:30 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWER by Lehman Brothers, Inc to [19-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Moses Silverman from the Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by Lehman Brothers, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER, substituting Proskauer Rose LLP in place of Katten Muchin Zavis Rosenman as counsel for defts Prudential Securities Inc. & Volpe Brown. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 01/31/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Volpe Brown Whelan by Beth Remick, V.P., on 5/21/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Andrew P. Kaplan by Anthony Nash, co-worker, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Donald R. Katz by Anthony Nash, co-worker, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Audible, Inc. by Anthony Nash, managing agent, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Richard Brass by Anthony Nash, Co-Worker of the on 4/29/02. (gf) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Winthrop Knowlton by Anthony Nash, Co-Worker of the Defendant on 4/29/02. (gf) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by John Rando amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                          AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Wit Capital Corp. (ph) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/23/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/23/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/23/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by CIBC World Markets Corp. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/23/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the time for defts Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., and Volpe Brown Whelan & Co., LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 45 days after (i) the assingment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) Modified on 10/23/2001 (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Volpe Brown Whelan. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by the Plffs. on whose behalf Brodsky & Smith, LLC . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Lehman Brothers, Inc. (Recieved in the night deposit box 9/6/01 9:16 p.m.) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER, that all cases against Audible, Inc. in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-5258, 1:01-cv-5334, 1:01-cv-5585, 1:01-cv-5665, 1:01-cv-5998, 1:01-cv-6033, 1:01-cv-7427) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 5258. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to consolidate any future cases filed against Audible, Inc. subsequent to the date of this Order into lead case number 01 Civ. 5258. The Clerk of the Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 09/21/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Wit Capital Corp. . (bai) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by John Rando, William Chue, Anthony Illes, Gregory M. DiMicelli in support Re: [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05334, 1:01-cv-05585, 1:01-cv-05665, 1:01-cv-05998 and 1:01-cv06033, [5-2] motion to appoint John Rando, William Chue, Anthony Illes, Gregory M. DiMicelli as Lead Plaintiff, [5-3] motion to approve John Rando, William Chue, Anthony Illes and Gregory M. DiMicelli's selection of the law firms of Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP, Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway to serve as Lead Counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-13-01 at 9:57 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05258 Document Number 7. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05334; 1:01-cv-05585; 1:01-cv-05665; 1:01-cv-05998; 1:01-cv-06033] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by John Rando, William Chue, Anthony Illes, Gregory M. DiMicelli in support of [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05258, 1:01-cv-05334, 1:01-cv-05585, 1:01-cv-05665, 1:01-cv-05998 and 1:01-cv06033, [5-2] motion to appoint John Rando, William Chue, Anthony Illes, Gregory M. DiMicelli as Lead Plaintiff, [5-3] motion to approve John Rando, William Chue, Anthony Illes and Gregory M. DiMicelli's selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP, Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway to serve as Lead Counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-13-01 at 9:57 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05258 Document No. 6. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05334; 1:01-cv-05585; 1:01-cv-05665; 1:01-cv-05998; 1:01-cv-06033] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION by John Rando, William Chue, Anthony Illes, Gregory M. DiMicelli to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05258, 1:01-cv-05334, 1:01-cv-05585, 1:01-cv-05665, 1:01-cv-05998 and 1:01-cv06033 , and to appoint John Rando, William Chue, Anthony Illes, Gregory M. DiMicelli as Lead Plaintiff , and to approve John Rando, William Chue, Anthony Illes and Gregory M. DiMicelli's selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP, Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway to serve as Lead Counsel . No Return Date. Prposed Order attached. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-13-01 at 9:57 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05258 Document Number 5. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05334; 1:01-cv-05585; 1:01-cv-05665; 1:01-cv-05998; 1:01-cv-06033] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassinged to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 10/31/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Joseph H. Weiss, Tzivia Brody, Aaron Lee Brody, Jules Brody . (gmo) (Entered: 07/02/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Peyman Abdollahzadeh. (moc) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 408514. (moc) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?