Rapha Products Group, LLC v. Skullcandy, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-03388

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 1:04 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rapha Products Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill Kertscher & Pixley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha Logan Decker +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 mh@hkw-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven G. Hill +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 sgh@hkw-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter F. Schoenthaler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/12/2011 Peter F Schoenthaler +1 404 592 5397 +Pleas eus eavalid pfs@pfslawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Horstemeyer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/12/2011 Eric Gregory Maurer +1 770 933 9500 +1 770 951 0933 eric.maurer@thomashorstemeyer.com
No Logo Skullcandy, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by 999 Peachtree Street, NE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ann Grunewald Fort +1 404 853 8493 +1 404 853 8806 ann.fort@sutherland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/23/2011 Jonathan K. Waldrop jwaldrop@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Workman Nydegger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew A Barlow +1 801 533 9800 mbarlow@wnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent P. Lorimer +1 801 533 9800 +1 801 328 1707 blorimer@wnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles L. Roberts +1 801 292 5300 croberts@wasatch-ip.com
v.
No Logo Skullcandy, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 999 Peachtree Street, NE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ann Grunewald Fort +1 404 853 8493 +1 404 853 8806 ann.fort@sutherland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/23/2011 Jonathan K. Waldrop jwaldrop@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Workman Nydegger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew A Barlow +1 801 533 9800 mbarlow@wnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent P. Lorimer +1 801 533 9800 +1 801 328 1707 blorimer@wnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles L. Roberts +1 801 292 5300 croberts@wasatch-ip.com
No Logo Rapha Products Group, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill Kertscher & Pixley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha Logan Decker +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 mh@hkw-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven G. Hill +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 sgh@hkw-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter F. Schoenthaler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/12/2011 Peter F Schoenthaler +1 404 592 5397 +Pleas eus eavalid pfs@pfslawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Horstemeyer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/12/2011 Eric Gregory Maurer +1 770 933 9500 +1 770 951 0933 eric.maurer@thomashorstemeyer.com
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ekb) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Rapha Products Group, LLC, Skullcandy, Inc.. (Fort, Ann) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012 Initial Disclosures
      Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Rapha Products Group, LLC.(Hill, Steven) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 63 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Scheduled Mediation. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 10/2/12. (ddm) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: 9/26/2012 Motion to Stay
          Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Scheduled Mediation by Skullcandy, Inc., Skullcandy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Scheduled Mediation)(Fort, Ann) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
            ORDER denying defendant's [39] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot defendant's [55] Motion to Strike; and granting plaintiff's [56] Motion for Leave to File Revised Declaration. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 8/13/12. (ekb)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
              ORDER granting [60] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery period shall be extended until 90 days after the Court issues its ruling on defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [39], with the disclosure of Rule 26 expert reports following the timeline set forth in LPR 7.1. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 8/11/11. (ddm)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: 8/9/2011, Terminated: 8/11/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Skullcandy, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Barlow, Matthew)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Response in Support of Motion
                  RESPONSE in Support re [55] MOTION to Strike [47] Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Skullcandy, Inc., Skullcandy, Inc.. (Barlow, Matthew)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Response to Motion
                    RESPONSE re [56] MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Tommy Disco in Support of Rapha's Response in Opposition to Skullcandy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Skullcandy, Inc., Skullcandy, Inc.. (Barlow, Matthew)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Response to Motion
                      RESPONSE re [55] MOTION to Strike [47] Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Rapha Products Group, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hill, Steven)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                        MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Tommy Disco in Support of Rapha's Response in Opposition to Skullcandy's Motion for Summary Judgment by Rapha Products Group, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Hill, Steven)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Motion to Strike
                          MOTION to Strike [47] Response in Opposition to Motion, with Brief In Support by Skullcandy, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike the Declaration of Tommy Disco)(Barlow, Matthew)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment Responding to Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Material Facts filed by Skullcandy, Inc.. (Barlow, Matthew)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Response to Statement of Material Facts
                              Response to Statement of Material Facts re [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Skullcandy, Inc.. (Barlow, Matthew)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Skullcandy, Inc.. (Barlow, Matthew)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                  Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Ann Grunewald Fort replacing attorney Jonathan Keith Waldrop. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fort, Ann)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: 5/19/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Proof of Service and Affidavit of Service of a Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action on Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., c/o CT Corporation System by Rapha Products Group, LLC.(Hill, Steven)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File its Reply Brief in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement re: [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Skullcandy, Inc., Skullcandy, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Barlow, Matthew)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/3/2011 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. See Order for Details. NOTE: NO PLEADINGS SHALL BE FILED UNDER SEAL BASED ON THIS ORDER. ALL PLEADINGS SHALL BE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 05/01/11. (fap)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rapha Products Group, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Material Facts Response, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E)(Hill, Steven)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011 Proposed Order
                                            PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed Stipulated Protective Order). (Hill, Steven)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: 4/19/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE by Rapha Products Group, LLC of Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Decker, Martha)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: [39] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Rapha Products Group, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Steven)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [41] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Accordingly, the Clerk shall terminate Peter F. Schoenthaler as counsel of record for Rapha Products Group, LLC and discontinue cm/ecf notices to Peter F. Schoenthaler for this civil action. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 04/12/11. (fap)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [40] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Accordingly, the Clerk shall terminate Eric G. Maurer as counsel of record for Rapha Products Group, LLC and discontinue cm/ecf notice to Eric G. Maurer for this civil action. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 10cv3388. (fap)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011, Terminated: 4/12/2011 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Peter F. Schoenthaler as Attorneyby Rapha Products Group, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Schoenthaler, Peter)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011, Terminated: 4/12/2011 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Eric Gregory Maurer as Attorneyby Rapha Products Group, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Maurer, Eric)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011, Terminated: 8/13/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                          Defendant and Counter-claimant MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Skullcandy, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support, # (2) Statement of Undisputed Facts, # (3) Declaration of Matthew A. Barlow, # (4) Exhibit A - Declaration, # (5) Exhibit B - Declaration, # (6) Exhibit C - Declaration, # (7) Exhibit D - Declaration, # (8) Exhibit E - Declaratioin, # (9) Exhibit F - Declaration, # (10) Exhibit G - Declaration, # (11) Exhibit H - Declaration, # (12) Exhibit I - Declaration, # (13) Exhibit J - Declaration, # (14) Exhibit K - Declaration, # (15) Exhibit L - Declaration, # (16) Exhibit M - Declaratioin, # (17) Exhibit N - Declaration, # (18) Exhibit O - Declaration, # (19) Exhibit P - Declaration, # (20) Exhibit Q - Declaration, # (21) Exhibit R - Declaration, # (22) Exhibit S - Declaration, # (23) Exhibit T - Declaration, # (24) Exhibit U - Declaration, # (25) Exhibit V - Declaration, # (26) Exhibit W - Declaration, # (27) Exhibit X - Declaration, # (28) Exhibit Y - Declaration, # (29) Exhibit Z - Declaration, # (30) Exhibit AA - Declaration, # (31) Exhibit BB - Declaration)(fap) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 notice of filing
                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Manual Filing of Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents filed on 3/23/11 by Skullcandy, Inc. (Waldrop, Jonathan)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                              NOTICE by Rapha Products Group, LLC of Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: # (1) Subpoena to Best Buy Co., Inc.)(Maurer, Eric)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Rapha Products Group, LLC's First Request for Interrogatories (Nos. 12-14 and 17-19) by Skullcandy, Inc..(Barlow, Matthew)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/3/2011 Initial Disclosures
                                                                  Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Rapha Products Group, LLC.(Decker, Martha)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Disclosure of Invalidity Contentions
                                                                    Disclosure of Invalidity Contentions filed by Skullcandy, Inc... (Barlow, Matthew)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Response to Infringement Contentions
                                                                      Response to [24] Infringement Contentions filed by Skullcandy, Inc... (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Skullcandy's Pipe Product, # (2) Exhibit B-Skullcandy's Super Pipe Product)(Barlow, Matthew)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Rapha Products Group, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Rapha Products Group, LLC's First Request for Production of Documents by Skullcandy, Inc..(Barlow, Matthew)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Rapha Products Group, LLC and Defendant's First Set of Requests for Productionof Documents and Things to Plaintiff Rapha Products Group,LLC by Skullcandy, Inc..(Barlow, Matthew)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Initial Disclosures
                                                                            Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Rapha Products Group, LLC.(Decker, Martha)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: 2/17/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                              NOTICE by Rapha Products Group, LLC of Issuance of Subpoena (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Subpoena to Target Corporation)(Maurer, Eric)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: 2/17/2011 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [27] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Charles L. Roberts. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 02/16/11. (fap)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011, Terminated: 2/16/2011 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                  APPLICATION for Admission of Charles L. Roberts Pro Hac Viceby Skullcandy, Inc.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #GAN32352. (fap)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                    ANSWER to [6] Counterclaim by Rapha Products Group, LLC.(Maurer, Eric) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [23] Motion to Strike [11] Answer to Counterclaim. Plaintiff is directed to re-file the correct document (Plaintiff's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendant's Counterclaims), which document shall be deemed timely filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(a)(1)(B). Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 01/27/11. (fap)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Disclosure of Infringement Contentions
                                                                                        Disclosure of Infringement Contentions filed by Rapha Products Group, LLC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Infringement by "Pipe" Models, # (2) Exhibit B - Infringement by "Super Pipe" Model)(Maurer, Eric)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011, Terminated: 1/28/2011 Motion to Strike
                                                                                          Consent MOTION to Strike [11] Answer to Counterclaim and for Leave to Replace With and Deem Timely Filed "Plaintiff's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendant's Counterclaim" by Rapha Products Group, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiff's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendant's Counterclaim, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Maurer, Eric)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [13] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Anthon Barlow. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 01/04/10. (fap)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [12] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brent Parl Lorimer. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 01/04/10. (fap)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents by Rapha Products Group, LLC.(Maurer, Eric)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant by Rapha Products Group, LLC.(Maurer, Eric)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
                                                                                                    Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Rapha Products Group, LLC, Skullcandy, Inc.. (Maurer, Eric)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [16] Joint Motion for Extension of Time, through and including December 22, 2010, in which to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Schedule. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 12/20/10. (ddm)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010, Terminated: 12/20/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan by Rapha Products Group, LLC, Skullcandy, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Maurer, Eric)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                          Initial Disclosures by Rapha Products Group, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment A, # (2) Exhibit Attachment B, # (3) Exhibit Attachment C)(Maurer, Eric)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                            Initial Disclosures by Skullcandy, Inc..(Waldrop, Jonathan)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010, Terminated: 1/4/2011 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Barlow Pro Hac Vice by Skullcandy, Inc.. (Waldrop, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010, Terminated: 1/4/2011 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Brent Lorimer Pro Hac Vice by Skullcandy, Inc.. (Waldrop, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: 12/7/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                  (STRICKEN PER [25] ORDER) ANSWER to [6] Counterclaim of Skullcandy, Inc. by Rapha Products Group, LLC.(Maurer, Eric) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/31/2011 (fap).
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interested Persons by Rapha Products Group, LLC. (Maurer, Eric)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Anthon Barlow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3025565)by Skullcandy, Inc., Skullcandy, Inc.. (Waldrop, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Admission of Brent Parl Lorimer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-3025321)by Skullcandy, Inc., Skullcandy, Inc.. (Waldrop, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Persons by Skullcandy, Inc.. (Waldrop, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to [1] COMPLAINT with COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement against Rapha Products Group, LLC by Skullcandy, Inc.(Waldrop, Jonathan) ( Discovery ends on 8/15/2011.)Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 11/22/2010 to correct capitilization on docket (fap).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Keith Waldrop on behalf of Skullcandy, Inc. (Waldrop, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed by Rapha Products Group, LLC. Skullcandy, Inc. served on 10/21/2010, answer due 11/12/2010. (Hill, Steven)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 AO Form 120
                                                                                                                                  AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office. (adg)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                    Electronic Summons Issued as to Skullcandy, Inc.. (adg)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rapha Products Group, LLC. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 113E-2952248.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?