USA v. O'Hara et al

Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cr-00228
District Judge Laura Taylor Swain, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Laura Taylor Swain
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 5:14 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jerome O'Hara, Defendant

Represented by Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/19/2014 Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/19/2014 ERIC R. BRESLIN +1 973 424 2063 +1 973 424 2001 erbreslin@duanemorris.com

Represented by Law Offices of Gordon Mehler, P.L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Gordon Mehler +1 212 527 7503 +1 212 527 7504 gmehler@mehlerlaw.com

Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/19/2014 Sarah Lum +1 212 661 2414 +1 212 661 8761 sarahjlum@gmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (1407) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Page 1 Page 2 Page 3

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1412 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated August 3, 2015 re: Forfeiture Order as to Irwin Lipkin Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1411 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Irwin Lipkin. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Abramowicz, David) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1410 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1409 LETTER MOTION Extension of Time to submit Sentencing Memorandum as to Irwin Lipkin (11). ENDORSEMENT: The requested extension is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/29/2015) (ft) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1409 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA David M. Abramowicz dated July 29, 2015 re: Request that time for Government to file its sentencing submission be extended to no later than July 31, 2015 . Document filed by USA as to Irwin Lipkin. (Abramowicz, David) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1408 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER: as to (S10-10-Cr-228-03) Daniel Bonventre....[See this Stipulation and Order]... WHEREAS, the Defendant has represented that he is the equitable owner, although not the record owner, of a lot or parcel of land, together with its buildings, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments, and easements, located at 16 Edgewater Terrace, Mantoloking, New Jersey 08738, identified on the Municipal tax map of Brick Township, Ocean County, New Jersey as Block 42.02, Lot 16 (the "Subject Property");...[See this Stipulation and Order]...WHEREAS, the United States caused to be filed of record a certain Notice of Pendency of the within action against Defendant, dated March 29, 2010, recorded in the Ocean County Clerk's Office on March 31, 2010 in OR BK 14561, page 0198 & c., Instrument No. 2010027590 (the "Notice of Pendency") against the Subject Property; WHEREAS, the Subject Property is encumbered by a lien, in the form of a mortgage in favor of Hudson City Savings Bank, which mortgage was made and given by Daniel M. Bonventre, single, by Barbara Bonventre, his attorney-in-fact, and Barbara Bonventre, married, to Hudson City Savings Bank to secure the sum of one million, five hundred thousand ($1,500,000.00) dollars, plus interest, dated December 1, 2008, recorded in the Ocean County Clerk's Office on December 8, 2008, in OR BK 14167, page 0329 & c., Instrument No. 2008123601, as modified by that certain Mortgage Modification Agreement-ARM-INTEREST ONLY, dated December 29, 2010, in connection with Mortgage No. 4008122427 (collectively, the "Mortgage"); WHEREAS, on or about January 6, 2015, Hudson City Savings Bank filed a Verified Statement of Interest with the Court asserting an interest in the Subject Property; as of July 1, 2015, the outstanding balance owed Hudson City Savings Bank under the terms of the Mortgage was $1,509,003.05 (the "Mortgage Due")(See Footnote 1 on page 4 of this Order); WHEREAS, the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York and Hudson City Savings Bank, in order to avoid litigation, have determined to resolve Hudson City Savings Bank's claim in and to the Subject Property premised upon the Mortgage on the terms and conditions set forth below. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff, United States of America, by its counsel, Assistant United States Attorneys Jonathan Cohen and Niketh Velamoor; and Hudson City Savings Bank, by its counsel, Daniel A. Schnapp, Esquire and Oksana Wright, Esquire, of Fox Rothschild LLP, that: 1. The United States of America hereby recognizes the validity of the Mortgage on the Subject Property and further recognizes the Mortgage to be a first lien upon the Subject Property, valid and enforceable in accordance with its terms, prior and superior in all respects to the lien of the United States established by the recording of its Notice of Pendency, to any other lien filed or of record in favor of the United States, and to the interest of the United States established by the entry of any Final Order of Forfeiture. 2. Upon the sale of the Subject Property, pursuant to a final Order of Forfeiture forfeiting all right, title and interest in the Subject Property to the United States or pursuant to an interlocutory sale order, the United States of America will not contest, and agrees to, payment first to Hudson City Savings Bank, from the net proceeds of the sale of the Subject Property, of the outstanding Mortgage Due on the Subject Property as of the date of sale. The net proceeds shall include all amounts received from the sale of the Subject Property after payment of any outstanding taxes, any New Jersey realty transfer fee, any normal and customary closing adjustments, and any real estate broker's commissions directly attributable to the sale. There shall be no deduction for fees or expenses payable to the USMS (as hereinafter defined) in connection with the sale of the Subject Property before payment to Hudson City Savings Bank. Any surplus from the net proceeds remaining after payment in full of the Mortgage Due shall be forfeited to the United States of America as a substitute res, or a portion of the substitute res, for the Subject Property. The United States Marshals Service ("USMS") shall be authorized to deposit any such surplus in the Assets Forfeiture Fund....[See this Stipulation and Order]... 12. Except as otherwise provided in this Stipulation and Order, this Court will have exclusive jurisdiction over the interpretation and enforcement of this Stipulation and Order. So Ordered: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/24/2015)(bw) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1407 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1404 LETTER MOTION as to Irwin Lipkin (11) addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 22, 2015 re: Extension of Time to File Forfeiture Order. ENDORSEMENT: The extension is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/24/2015) (lnl) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1406 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Irwin Lipkin. (Attachments: # 1 Report of Dr. Bruce Charash, # 2 Report of Dr. Robert Goldstein, # 3 Irwin Lipkin Letter, # 4 Carole Lipkin Letter, # 5 Marc Lipkin Letter)(Galler, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1405 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 7/23/15 re: Ordering of Stipulation and Order . Document filed by USA as to Daniel Bonventre. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulaton and Order)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1404 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 22, 2015 re: Extension of Time to File Forfeiture Order . Document filed by USA as to Irwin Lipkin. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1403 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 7/17/2015 re: Adjournment of Appearance. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to September 24, 2015, at 4:30 pm. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/20/2015)(ft) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1402 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
LETTER by Eric S. Lipkin addressed to James K. Filan from James K. Filan dated 7/8/2015 re: Return of Funds. (ft) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1401 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 7/17/15 re: Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1400 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Paul J. Konigsberg (12), Count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 are dismissed on the motion of the US; Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1s, Count(s) 2s, Count(s) 3s, Imprisonment for a total term of Time Served as to Counts One (1), Two (2) and Three (3). No term of supervised release to follow. Special Assessment of $300 which is due immediately. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/15/2015)(jw) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1399 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Niketh Varadaraj Velamoor appearing for USA. (Velamoor, Niketh) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1398 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Annette Bongiorno. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the plaintiff, United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United StatesAttorney, Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, of counsel, and the Windsor Bay HOA, by its counsel, Keith F. Backer, Esq., that: 1. At such time as the Subject Property is sold pursuant either to a final order of forfeiture in this criminal matter forfeiting the Subject Property to the United States, or to an interlocutory sale order in this criminal matter, the United States agrees to satisfy the outstanding HOA Arrears owed by the Defendant, including all charges that have come duesubsequent to the entry of this Stipulation, on the Subject Property from the net proceeds of the sale of the Subject Property. 2. The net proceeds from the sale of the Subject Property will include all moneys realized from the sale of the Subject Property, except for the following: (See Order). 9. This Stipulation and Order may be executed in counterparts, each of which shall be deemed an original, and all of which, when taken together, shall be deemed the complete Stipulation. Signature pages may be by fax and such signaturesshall be deemed as valid originals. AGREED AND CONSENTED TO. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/14/15)(ajc) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1397 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Paul J. Konigsberg. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 7/9/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1396 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Paul J. Konigsberg re: Sentence held on 7/9/15 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1395 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 13, 2015 re: Forfeiture Stipulation as to Windsor Bay Homeowner's Association Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1394 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER EXONERATING BAIL: as to (S12-10-Cr-228-12) Paul J. Konigsberg. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, upon the application of counsel for Paul J. Konigsberg, Mr. Konigsberg's personal recognizance bond in this matter is hereby exonerated and released and all securities on Mr. Konigsberg's bond are also released and all liens on any property in connection with said bond are also released. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Pre-Trial Service Agency or any other entity that has custody of Mr. Konigsberg's passport return it to Mr. Konigsberg by no later than July 27, 2015, and that Mr. Konigsberg is permitted to apply for a renewal of his passport if it has expired. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/13/2015)(bw) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1393 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Reed Brodsky dated July 10, 2015 re: Request for exoneration of bail, reurn of passport, and permission to apply for a new passport . Document filed by Paul J. Konigsberg. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Exonerating Bail)(Harris, Darcy) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1392 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE/MONEY JUDGMENT as to Paul J. Konigsberg. ITIS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED, AND AGREED, by and between the United States of America, by and through its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, of counsel, and the defendant PAUL J. KONIGSBERG, and his attorney, Reed Brodsky, Esq., that As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One and Two of the Information, to which the defendant pled guilty, a money judgment in the amount of $4,400,000 in United States currency (the "Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant for which he shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against his co-defendants in this case, DANIEL BONVENTRE, ANNETTE BONGIORNO, JOANN CRUPIa/k/a "Jodi," JEROME O'HARA, GEORGE PEREZ, ERIC S. LIPKIN, DAVID L. KUGEL,CRAIG KUGEL, IRWIN LIPKIN, PETER MADOFF, and ENRICA COTELLESSA-PITZ, aswell as any forfeiture money judgment entered against BERNARD L. MADOFF in United States v. Madoff; 09 Cr. 213 (DC), DAVID G. FRIEHLING in United States v. Friehling, 09 Cr. 700 (LIS), and FRANK DIPASCALI in United States v. DiPascali, 09 Cr. 764 (LTS) (S.D.N.Y.). Any amount, up to $4,100,000, paid by the defendant to the SIPA Trustee shall be credited towards the Money JudgmentPursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure,upon entry of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment, this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment is final as to the defendant, PAUL J. KONIGSBERG, and shall be deemed part of the sentence of the defendant, and shall be included in the judgment of conviction therewith. Pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, upon entry of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment, the United StatesAttorney's Office is authorized to conduct any discovery needed to identify, locate or dispose of forfeitable property, including depositions, interrogatories, requests for production of documents and the issuance of subpoenas, pursuant to Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/9/15)(jw) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1391 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Irving H. Picard as to Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Irving H. Picard dated 7/8/2015 re: Sentencing of Mr. Paul Konigsberg on July 9, 2015. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (ft) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1390 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER EXONERATING BAIL: as to (10-Cr-228-07) David L. Kugel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that upon the application of counsel for David Kugel, that Mr. Kugel's personal recognizance bond in this matter is hereby exonerated and released and all securities on Mr. Kugel's bond are also released and all liens on any property in connection with said bond are also released. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Pre-Trial Service Agency or any other entity that has custody of Mr. Kugel's passport return it to the defendant, David Kugel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/7/2015)(bw) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1389 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Paul J. Konigsberg. (Abramowicz, David) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1388 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Paul J. Konigsberg. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix - Letters in Support, # 2 Appendix part 2 - Letters in Support, # 3 Appendix part 3 - Letters in Support, # 4 Appendix part 4 - Letters in Support, # 5 Appendix part 5 - Letters in Support, # 6 Appendix part 6 - Letters in Support, # 7 Appendix part 7 - Letters in Support, # 8 Appendix part 8 - Letters in Support, # 9 Appendix part 9 - Letters in Support, # 10 Appendix part 10 - Letters in Support, # 11 Appendix part 11 - Letters in Support, # 12 Appendix part 12 - Letters in Support, # 13 Appendix part 13 - Letters in Support, # 14 Appendix part 14 - Letters in Support, # 15 Appendix part 15 - Letters in Support, # 16 Appendix part 16 - Letters in Support, # 17 Appendix part 17 - Letters in Support, # 18 Appendix part 18 - Letters in Support, # 19 Appendix part 19 - Letters in Support, # 20 Appendix part 20 - Letters in Support, # 21 Appendix part 21 - Letters in Support, # 22 Appendix part 22 - Letters in Support, # 23 Appendix part 23 - Letters in Support, # 24 Appendix part 24 - Letters in Support, # 25 Appendix part 25 - Letters in Support, # 26 Appendix part 26 - Letters in Support, # 27 Appendix part 27 - Letters in Support, # 28 Appendix part 28 - Letters in Support, # 29 Appendix part 29 - Letters in Support, # 30 Appendix part 30 - Letters in Support, # 31 Appendix part 31 - Letters in Support, # 32 Appendix part 32 - Letters in Support, # 33 Appendix part 33 - Letters in Support, # 34 Appendix part 34 - Letters in Support, # 35 Appendix part 35 - Letters in Support, # 36 Appendix part 36 - Letters in Support, # 37 Appendix part 37 - Letters in Support, # 38 Appendix part 38 - Letters in Support)(Brodsky, Reed) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1387 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
FIRST MOTION for Bond Exonerate Bail. Document filed by David L. Kugel. (Joyce, Patrick) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1386 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated June 25, 2015 re: Proposed Forfeiture Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1385 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1378 LETTER MOTION requests that the deadline for filing his Sentencing Memorandum, currently set for June 25, 2015 under the Court's Sentencing Submission Procedures, be extended to July 1 2015...ENDORSEMENT...The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/24/15) (jw) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1384 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1382 LETTER MOTION Reschedule Sentencing as to Irwin Lipkin...ENDORSEMENT..The sentencing is adjourned to August 5, 2015, at 2:00pm. Docket #1382 resolved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/24/15) (jw) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1383 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Richard P. Galler dated June 23, 2015 re: Lipkin, Irwin (Galler, Richard) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1382 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated June 22, 2015 re: Adjournment of Irwin Lipkin Sentencing . Document filed by USA as to Irwin Lipkin. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1381 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg dated 12/18/2013 re: Federal Bureau of Investigation. (jw) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1380 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Postpone Sentencing. Document filed by USA as to Irwin Lipkin. (Monteleoni, Paul) Modified on 6/23/2015 (ka). (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1379 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from David M. Abramowicz dated 6/19/2015 re: Unsealing request. ENDORSEMENT: The unsealing request (DE # 1363) is granted. Motions terminated as to Daniel Bonventre: 1363 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated June 15, 2015 re: Request to Unseal FBI Interview Report filed by George Perez. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/22/2015)(ft) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1378 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Reed Brodsky dated June 22, 2015 re: Extension of Time to Submit Sentencing Memorandum . Document filed by Paul J. Konigsberg. (Harris, Darcy) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1377 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Andrea Michelle Griswold appearing for USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1376 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Craig Kugel. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 5/28/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1375 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Craig Kugel re: Sentence held on 5/28/2015 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1374 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David L. Kugel. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 5/27/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1373 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David L. Kugel re: Sentence held on 5/27/2015 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sabrina D'Emidio, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1372 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to George Perez addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA David M. Abramowicz dated June 19, 2015 re: 1363 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated June 15, 2015 re: Request to Unseal FBI Interview Report .. (Abramowicz, David) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1371 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1370 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1369 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Eric S. Lipkin. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 5/20/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1368 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Eric S. Lipkin re: Sentence held on 5/20/15 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1367 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 5/19/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1366 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz re: Sentence held on 5/19/15 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1365 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1363 LETTER MOTION unseal the FBI interview report as to George Perez (2). ENDORSEMENT: The government is directed to respond to this request by June 22, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/16/2015) (ft) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1364 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Eric S. Lipkin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, upon the application of counsel for the defendant, Eric S. Lipkin, that Mr. Lipkin's bond issued on June 6, 2011, as modified on June 17, 2013, is hereby exonerated and released, including all property posted as collateral to secure Mr. Lipkin's release. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court, or any other agency that is holding the $100,000 cash that was deposited with the Clerk of the Court by Philip and Sue Kienast to secure Mr. Lipkin's release, return those funds to Philip and Sue Kienast. It is further ORDERED that Pre-Trial Services, or any other agency that has custody of Mr. Lipkin's passport and the passports of his wife and children, return those passports to Mr. Lipkin's wife, Erika Lipkin. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/16/2015)(ft) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1363 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated June 15, 2015 re: Request to Unseal FBI Interview Report . Document filed by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1362 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER EXONERATING BAIL as to Craig Kugel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that upon the application of counsel for defendant Craig Kugel that Mr. Kugel's personal recognizance bond in this matter is hereby exonerated and released and all securities on Mr. Kugel's personal recognizance bond are also released from any liability in connection with said bond. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Pretrial Service Agency or any other entity that has custody of Mr. Kugel's passport return it to the defendant in this case. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/11/2015)(jw) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1361 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1360 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1359 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1358 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Craig Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Barry W. Agulnick dated 06/08/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Exonerating Bail)(Agulnick, Barry) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1357 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT In A Criminal Case (S4-10-Cr-228-07). Date of Imposition of Judgment: May 27, 2015. Defendant David L. Kugel (7) pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1-2, 3, 4, 5, and 6. Count(s) any pending are dismissed on the motion of the United States. Underlying Indictment(s) are dismissed on the motion of the United States. IMPRISONMENT: TIME SERVED as to each of Counts One (1), Two (2), Three (3), Four (4), Five (5) and Six (6). SUPERVISED RELEASE: 2 years as to each of Counts One (1), Two (2), Three (3), Four (4), Five (5) and Six (6), to run concurrently. - The above drug testing condition (see page 4 of Judgment) is suspended, based on the court's determination that the defendant poses a low risk of future substance abuse. -The defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. -The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. Special Conditions of Supervision (see page 5 of Judgment for complete details): Defendant must comply with the conditions of home detention for a period of 10 months. While on supervised release, defendant must perform 200 hours of Community Service, as directed by the Probation Officer. ASSESSMENT: $600.00, due immediately. Joint and Several: (see page 7 of Judgment). The defendant shall forfeit the defendant's interest in the following property to the United States: (see page 7 of Judgment). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/4/2015) (bw) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1356 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Craig Kugel (9), Pleaded guilty to count(s)1, 2, 3, 4, 5. The defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of: TIME SERVED as to each of Counts One (1), Two (2), Three (3), Four (4) and Five (5). ADDITIONAL COUNTS OF CONVICTION; 28 usc 7206(1) Subscribing to a false U.S. individual tax return. Three (3), 28 usc 7206(1) Subscribing to a false U.S. individual tax return. Four(4), 28 usc 7206(1) Subscribing to a false U.S. individual tax return. Five (5). Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of: 2 years as to each of Counts One (I) and Two (2), I year as to each of Counts Three (3), Four (4) and Five (5), all to run concurrently, for a total of 2 years. Count(s) 2, SPECIAL CONDITIONS OF SUPERVISION: Not withstanding the standard conditions, the defendant is permitted, upon advance notice to the Probation Department, to travel within the continental U.S. and to retain his passport. International travel requires advance approval ofthe Probation Department and the Court. Defendant must continue to cooperate in investigative and prosecutorial activities, as requested by the Government and the Trustee. Defendant must provide the probation officer with access to any requested financial information. Defendant must not incur new credit charges or open additional lines of credit without the approval of the Probation Officer unless the defendant is in compliance with the installment payment schedule.Defendant is to report to the nearest Probation Office within 72 hours.Defendant is to be supervised by the district of residence. The defendant must pay the total criminal monetary penalties, special assessment $500, in lump sum payment. The defendant shall forfeit the defendant's interest in the following property to the United States: Defendant is to forfeit to the United States $2,306,584.58 as specified in the Consent Order of Forfeiture, which represents the proceeds of the defendant's criminal activity. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/28/15)(ajc) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1355 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno on re: 1350 Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to July 23, 2015, at 4:45 PM. This resolves DE# 105 in 10 CV 4858, DE# 1350 in 10CR228 and DE #26 in 09cv9455. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/3/2015)(ft) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1354 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO RETURN PASSPORT as to (S5-10-Cr-228-08) Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz....ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ENRICA COTELLESSA-PITZ's United States passport, currently in the custody of Pretrial Services at 233 Broadway, New York, NY 10007, be returned to her immediately, and that ENRICA COTELLESSA-PITZ be permitted to personally pick up her passport at Pretrial Services. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/2/2015)(bw) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1353 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Craig Kugel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Agulnick, Barry) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1352 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED CONSENT PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY / MONEY JUDGMENT: as to (S10-10-Cr-228-02) George Perez....[See this Order]... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED, AND AGREED, by and between the United States of America, by and through its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, of counsel, and the defendant GEORGE PEREZ, Jeanette Perez, and their attorney, Larry Krantz, Esq., that: 1. This Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment replaces the Preliminary Order of Forfeiture. 2. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One, Two, Six, Seven, Nine, and Ten of the Indictment, of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of$19,707,987,337 in United States currency (the "Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant, for which he shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against his codefendants in this case, DANIEL BONVENTRE, ANNETTE BONGIORNO, JOANN CRUPI a/k/a "Jodi," JEROME O'HARA, ERIC S. LIPKIN, DAVID L. KUGEL, ENRICA COTELESSA-PITZ, CRAIG KUGEL, IRWIN LIPKIN, PETER MADOFF, and PAUL J. KONIGSBERG, as well as any forfeiture money judgment entered against BERNARD L. MADOFF in United States v. Madoff, 09 Cr. 213 (DC), DAVID G. FRIEHLING in United States v. Friehling, 09 Cr. 700 (AKH), and FRANK DIP A SCALI in United States v. DiPascali, 09 Cr. 764 (RJS) (S.D.N.Y.)....[See this Order]... 20. The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. 21. This Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Facsimile and electronic copies shall be treated as originals. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/28/2015) [*** NOTE: The Clerk of the Court has forwarded three certified copies of this Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to AUSA Paul M. Monteleoni, by inter-office mail on 5/29/2015. ***] (bw) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1351 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
Sentencing Letter by David L. Kugel addressed to Honorable Laura Taylor Swain from Patrick Joyce dated 5/19/2015 re: USA v David Kugel. (Joyce, Patrick) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1350 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 28, 2015 re: Adjournment of Forfeiture Conference Document filed by USA. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1349 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT In A Criminal Case (S3-10-Cr-228-06). Date of Imposition of Judgment: May 20, 2015. Defendant Eric S. Lipkin (6) pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, and 6. Underlying Indictment(s) are dismissed on the motion of the United States. IMPRISONMENT: TIME SERVED as to each of Counts One (1), Two (2), Three (3), Four (4), Five (5) and Six (6). SUPERVISED RELEASE: 2 years as to each of Counts One (1), Two (2), Three (3), Four (4), Five (5) and Six (6), to run concurrently. -The above drug testing condition (see page 4 of Judgment) is suspended, based on the court's determination that the defendant poses a low risk of future substance abuse. -The defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. -The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. Special Conditions of Supervision (see page 5 of Judgment for complete details): -Defendant must comply with the conditions of home detention for a period of 9 months. -While on supervised release, defendant must perform 200 hours of Community Service, as directed by the Probation Officer. ASSESSMENT: $600.00, due immediately. Joint and Several: (See page 7 of Judgment). The defendant shall forfeit the defendant's interest in the following property to the United States: (See page 7 of Judgment). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/25/2015)(bw) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1348 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT In A Criminal Case (S5-10-Cr-228-08). Date of Imposition of Judgment: May 19, 2015. Defendant Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz (8) pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1, 2, 3, and 4. Underlying Indictment(s) are dismissed on the motion of the United States. IMPRISONMENT: TIME SERVED as to each of Counts One (1), Two (2), Three (3) and Four (4). SUPERVISED RELEASE: 2 years as to each of Counts One (1), Two (2), Three (3) and Four (4), to run concurrently. -The above drug testing condition (see page 4 of Judgment) is suspended, based on the court's determination that the defendant poses a low risk of future substance abuse. -The defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. -The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. Special Conditions of Supervision (See page 5 of Judgment): Defendant must perform 250 hours of Community Service, as directed by the Probation Officer. ASSESSMENT: $400.00, due immediately. Joint and Several: (See page 7 of Judgment). The defendant shall forfeit the defendant's interest in the following property to the United States: (See page 7 of Judgment). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/25/2015)(bw) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1347 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to George Perez addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 26, 2015 re: Forfeiture Stipulation as to George Perez Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1346 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
Sentencing Letter by Craig Kugel addressed to Honorable Laura Taylor Swain from Barry W. Agulnick. (Agulnick, Barry) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1345 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY / MONEY JUDGMENT as to (S3-10-Cr-228-06) Eric S. Lipkin....[See this Order]... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED, AND AGREED, by and between the United States of America, by and through its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, of counsel, and the defendant ERIC S. LIPKIN, and his attorney, James Filan, Esq., Erika Lipkin, and her attorney, Tony Miodonka, Esq., that: 1. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One and Three of the Information, to which the defendant pled guilty, a money judgment in the amount of $30,626,602,311 in United States currency (the "First Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant, for which he shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against his codefendants in this case, DANIEL BONVENTRE, ANNEITE BONGIORNO, JOANN CRUPI a/kla "Jodi," JEROME O'HARA, GEORGE PEREZ, ERIC S. LIPKIN, DAVID L. KUGEL, ENRICA COTELLESSA-PITZ, CRAIG KUGEL, PETER MADOFF, and PAUL J. KONIGSBERG, as well as any forfeiture money judgment entered against BERNARD L. MADOFF in United States v. Madoff, 09 Cr. 213 (DC), DAVID G. FRIEHLING in United States v. Friehling, 09 Cr. 700 (AKH), and FRANK DIPASCALI in United States v. DiPascali, 09 Cr. 764 (LTS)(S.D.N.Y.). 2. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts Two and Six of the Information, to which the defendant pled guilty, a money judgment in the amount of $1,400,000 in United States currency (the "Second Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant. 3. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One, Two, Three, and Six of the Information, all of the defendant's right, title and interest in the Specific Property (as set forth on Schedule A) is hereby forfeited to the United States for disposition in accordance with the law, subject to the provisions of Title 21, United States Code, Section 853. The defendant and Erika Lipkin agree not to file any claim or petition for remission or mitigation in any proceeding involving the forfeiture of the Specific Property or to assist any other person in doing so. 4. The Government agrees not to seek the forfeiture of the Additional Property in connection with this case. 5. Upon entry of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment, the Government shall release its interest in the Steilen Avenue Property and consent to Erika Lipkin retaining full title to all of the equity in the Steilen Avenue Property, and to the transfer of title to Erika Lipkin. 6. The defendant and Erika Lipkin are hereby barred from asserting any claim against the United States of America, the Department of Justice, the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York, the Federal Bureau of Investigations, or the United States Marshals Service, or any agents or employees of the above (the "Released Parties"), in connection with the seizure, possession, or attempt to forfeit the Specific Property or the Additional Property in this case. 7. Erika Lipkin represents that she is the sole owner of any equity in the Additional Property, apart from any interest possessed by the defendant, and agrees to hold harmless the Released Parties from any and all third-party claims of ownership of the Additional Property. 8. Pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, upon entry of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment, this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment is final as to the defendant, ERIC S. LIPKIN, and shall be deemed part of the sentence of the defendant, and shall be included in the judgment of conviction therewith....[See this Order]... 16. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce this Order, and to amend it as necessary, pursuant to Rule 32.2(e) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. 17. Pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, upon entry of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment, the United States Attorney's Office is authorized to conduct any discovery needed to identify, locate or dispose of forfeitable property, including depositions, interrogatories, requests for production of documents and the issuance of subpoenas, pursuant to Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 18. The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. 19. This Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Facsimile and electronic copies shall be treated as originals. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/20/2015) [*** NOTE: The Clerk of the Court has forwarded three certified copies of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to AUSA Paul M. Monteleoni, by inter-office mail on 5/20/2015. ***] (bw) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1344 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER concerning defendant (10-Cr-228-06) Eric S. Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Irving H. Picard dated May 18, 2015 re: I am the court-appointed trustee for the liquidation of the business of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC ("BLMIS") under the Securities Investor Protection Act, 15 U.S.C. §§ 78aaa et seq. ("SIPA") and the substantively consolidated estate of Bernard L. Madoff ("Madoff"). I write to you in connection with this Court's scheduled sentencing of Mr. Eric Lipkin on May 20, 2015. (bw) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1343 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
Sentencing Letter by USA as to David L. Kugel addressed to The Honorable Laura Taylor Swain from the United States of America dated May 20, 2015 re: the sentencing of David Kugel and the Government's Expected Section 5K1.1 motion. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1342 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
Sentencing Letter by USA as to Craig Kugel addressed to the Honorable Laura Taylor Swain from the United States of America dated May 20, 2015 re: the sentencing of defendant Craig Kugel and the Government's expected Section 5K1.1 motion. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1341 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY / MONEY JUDGMENT as to (S5-10-Cr-228-08) Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz....[See this Order]... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED, AND AGREED, by and between the United States of America, by and through its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, of counsel, and the defendant ENRICA COTELLESSA-PITZ, Thomas Pitz, and their attorney, David M. Rody, Esq., that: 1. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One and Two of the Information, to which the defendant pled guilty, a money judgment in the amount of $97,300,000,000 in United States currency (the "Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant, for which she shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against her codefendants in this case, DANIEL BONVENTRE, ANNETTE BONGIORNO, JOANN CRUPI a/k/a "Jodi," JEROME O'HARA, GEORGE PEREZ, ERIC S. LIPKIN, DAVID L. KUGEL, CRAIG KUGEL, IRWIN LIPKIN, PETER MADOFF, and PAUL J. KONIGSBERG, as well as any forfeiture money judgment entered against BERNARD L. MADOFF in United States v. Madoff, 09 Cr. 213 (DC), DAVID G. FRIEHLING in United States v. Friehling, 09 Cr. 700 (AKH), and FRANK DIPASCALI in United States v. DiPascali, 09 Cr. 764 (LTS)(S.D.N.Y.). 2. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One and Two of the Information, all of the defendant's right, title and interest in the Specific Property (as set forth on Schedule A) is hereby forfeited to the United States for disposition in accordance with the law, subject to the provisions of Title 21, United States Code, Section 853. The defendant and Thomas Pitz agree not to file any claim or petition for remission or mitigation in any proceeding involving the forfeiture of the Specific Property or to assist any other person in doing so. 3. The Government agrees not to seek the forfeiture of the Additional Property, or of the contents of Chase Account No. 02919393815, held in the name of the defendant and Gregory Maccarone (the "3815 Account," together with the Additional Property the "Released Property") in connection with this case. 4. The defendant and Thomas Pitz are hereby barred from asserting any claim against the United States of America, the Department of Justice, the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York, the Federal Bureau of Investigations, or the United States Marshals Service, or any agents or employees of the above (the "Released Parties"), in connection with any seizure, possession, or attempt to forfeit the Specific Property or the Released Property (including without limitation any claim that they are entitled to attorney's fees), and agree to hold harmless the Released Parties from any and all third-party claims of ownership of the Released Property. 5. Pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, upon entry of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment, this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment is final as to the defendant, ENRICA COTELLESSA-PITZ, and shall be deemed part of the sentence of the defendant, and shall be included in the judgment of conviction therewith....[See this Order]... 13. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce this Order, and to amend it as necessary, pursuant to Rule 32.2(e) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. 14. Pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, upon entry of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment, the United States Attorney's Office is authorized to conduct any discovery needed to identify, locate or dispose of forfeitable property, including depositions, interrogatories, requests for production of documents and the issuance of subpoenas, pursuant to Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 15. The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. 16. This Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Facsimile and electronic copies shall be treated as originals. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/19/2015) [*** NOTE: The Clerk of the Court has forwarded three certified copies of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to AUSA Paul M. Monteleoni, by inter-office mail on 5/20/2015. ***] (bw) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1340 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Eric S. Lipkin. (Filan, James) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1339 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to David L. Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Patrick Joyce dated 5/13/15 re: Reschedule Sentencing....ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing is rescheduled to May 27, 2015 at 9:15am. The defense submission must be filed, and a courtesy copy submitted for Chambers by Tuesday, May 19, 2015( Sentencing set for 5/27/2015 at 09:15 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/14/15)(jw) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1338 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF INTERLOCUTORY SALE OF PROPERTY as to Peter Madoff. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT:1. The USMS is authorized to liquidate the Specific Property in acommercially feasible manner and may, in its sole discretion, reject any offer to purchase theSpecific Property where it determines that the offer is being made by, or on behalf of, a personinvolved in the criminal activity alleged as the basis for forfeiture;2. The net proceeds from the sale will be held by the USMS in its SeizedAsset Deposit Fund pending entry of a final order of forfeiture and will serve as a substitute resfor the Specific Property (the "Substitute Res") in the above-captioned case, with all claims anddefenses applicable to the Specific Property, including any other action that may be brought bythe United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York for forfeiture of the Specific Property or claims by third parties, to apply instead to the Substitute Res. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/14/15)(jw) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1337 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Eric S. Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 13, 2015 re: Proposed Forfeiture Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Forfeiture Order)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1336 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
Sentencing Letter by USA as to Eric S. Lipkin addressed to The Honorable Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 5/13/2015 re: Sentencing and Expected 5k1.1 motion for Eric Lipkin. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1335 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by David L. Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Patrick Joyce dated 5/13/15 re: Sentencing (Joyce, Patrick) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1334 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letters in Support Volume I., # 2 Exhibit A - Letters in Support Volume II)(Morrissey, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1333 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Peter Madoff addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 12, 2015 re: Forfeiture Orders Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Cotellessa-Pitz Forfeiture Order, # 2 Interlocutory Sale Order)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1332 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
Sentencing Letter by USA as to Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz addressed to The Honorable Laura Taylor Swain from the United States of America dated May 12, 2015 re: the Sentencing of Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz and the Government's expected 5K1.1 motion. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1331 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1327 LETTER MOTION Extension of Forfeiture Order as to Eric S. Lipkin (6). ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. DE# 1327 resolved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/7/2015) (ft) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1330 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Richard P. Galler dated 5/5/2015 re: Reschedule Sentencing....ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing is adjourned to July 7, 2015 at 4:30pm. The Court wishes Mr. Lipkin a full recovery ( Sentencing set for 7/7/2015 at 04:30 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/6/15)(jw) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1329 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1325 LETTER MOTION to respectfully request that the time to submit a proposed forfeiture order as to the defendant be extended by one week, to May 12, 2015 (the same date that the defendant's sentencing submission is due, ECF No. 1324)...ENDORSEMENT...The extension request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/6/15) (jw) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1328 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Eric S. Lipkin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sentencing Letters in Support)(Filan, James) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1327 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 6, 2015 re: Extension of Time to Submit Forfeiture Order . Document filed by USA as to Eric S. Lipkin. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1326 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from RICHARD P. GALLER dated May 5, 2015 re: Req. to a 45 day Adjournment of Sentencing (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Dr. DeNeve 5/5/2015 Letter)(Galler, Richard) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1325 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 5, 2015 re: Extension of Time to Submit Forfeiture Order . Document filed by USA as to Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1324 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S5-10-Cr-228-08) Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney David M. Rody dated April 29, 2015 re: We represent defendant Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz in the above-referenced matter, and respectfully submit this letter to request an extension of time to file our sentencing submission on her behalf. Moreover, I am requesting an extension until May 12, 2015, out of an abundance of caution, but will certainly file Ms. Cotellessa-Pitz's sentencing submission earlier if possible. ENDORSEMENT: The requested extension is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/29/2015)(bw) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1323 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Darcy Caitlyn Harris appearing for Paul J. Konigsberg. Appearance Type: Retained. (Harris, Darcy) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1322 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Craig Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Barry W. Agulnick dated 4/21/2015 re: To travel to Las Vegas on business from May 17 to May 20, 2015...ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/22/15)(jw) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1320 LETTER MOTION Adjournment of Conference as to Daniel Bonventre (3). ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. The conference is adjourned to June 5, 2015, at 4:45 pm. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/17/2015) (ft) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1320 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated April 20, 2015 re: Adjourn Conference . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER EXONERATING BAIL as to (10-Cr-228-04) Annette Bongiorno. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, upon the application of counsel for defendant Annette Bongiorno, that Mrs. Bongiorno's personal recognizance bond in this matter is hereby exonerated and released, and all suretors on Mrs. Bongiorno's personal recognizance bond and all property posted as security for Mrs. Bongiorno's personal recognizance bond are also released from any liability in connection with said bond. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Pre-Trial Services Agency or any other agency that has custody of Mrs. Bongiorno's passport return it to Mrs. Bongiorno's counsel in this matter, Roland Riopelle. IT IS SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/2/2015)(bw) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1318 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED CONSENT PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY/MONEY JUDGMENT: as to (S10-10-CR-228-05) Joann Crupi....[See this Order]... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One, Two, Six, Seven, Nine, and Ten of the Indictment, of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of $33,947,549,355 in United States currency (the "First Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant, for which she shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against her codefendants in this case, DANIEL BONVENTRE, ANNETTE BONGIORNO, JEROME O'HARA, GEORGE PEREZ, ERIC S. LIPKIN, DAVID L. KUGEL, ENRICA COTELESSA-PITZ, CRAIG KUGEL, IRWIN LIPKIN, PETER MADOFF, and PAUL J. KONIGSBERG, as well as any forfeiture money judgment entered against BERNARD L. MADOFF in United States v. Madoff, 09 Cr. 213 (DC), DAVID G. FRIEHLING in United States v. Friehling, 09 Cr. 700 (AKH), and FRANK DIPASCALI in United States v. DiPascali, 09 Cr. 764 (RJS) (S.D.N.Y.). 2. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts Sixteen and Seventeen of the Indictment, of which the defendant was found guilty following jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of $3,417,804.26 in United States currency (the "Second Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant. 3. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One, Two, Six, Seven, Nine, Ten, Sixteen, and Seventeen of the Indictment, all of the defendant's right, title and interest in the Mantoloking Funds is hereby forfeited to the United States for disposition in accordance with the law, subject to the provisions of Title 21, United States Code, Section 853. 4. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One, Two, Six, Seven, Nine, Ten, Sixteen, and Seventeen of the Indictment, all of the defendant's right, title and interest in the 0624 Substitute Asset, the 1268 Substitute Asset, the 2792 Substitute Asset, the 5391 Substitute Asset, the Duane Morris Substitute Asset, and the Westfield Trustee Encumbrance (collectively the "Substitute Assets") is hereby forfeited to the United States as substitute assets for disposition in accordance with the law, subject to the provisions of Title 21, United States Code, Section 853....[See this Order]... 22. The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. 23. This Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Facsimile and electronic copies shall be treated as originals. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/8/2015); The Clerk of the Court has forwarded three certified copies of this Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to AUSA Paul M. Monteleoni, by inter-office mail on 4/8/2015. [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Case 10-CV-4857(LTS), Doc.#44. ***] (bw) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1317 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated April 7, 2015 re: Stipulation as to Forfeiture Matters Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1316 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated April 2, 2015 re: Exonerating bail . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1315 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Daniel Bonventre. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/4/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1314 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, upon application of counsel for defendant Jerome O'Hara, that Mr. O'Hara's bond issued November 13, 2009, is hereby exonerated and released, including the obligors on the personal recognizance bond ("PRB") as well as the property posted as security, which conditions were imposed to secure Mr. O'Hara's pretrial release. It is further ordered that Pretrial Services or any other agency that has custody of Mr. O'Hara's passport return it to Mr. O'Hara's wife, Bernadette O'Hara, or to his counsel. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/1/2015)(jw) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1313 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Daniel Bonventre re: Conference held on 3/4/2015 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1312 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Irwin Lipkin on re: 1311 Letter filed by Irwin Lipkin. ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing is adjourned to May 13, 2015, at 3:00 PM. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/31/2015)(ft) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1311 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from RICHARD P. GALLER, ESQ. dated March 27, 2015 re: AMENDED REQUEST FOR 30 DAY ADJOURNMENT OF SENTENCING (Galler, Richard) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1310 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Richard P. Galler dated March 27, 2015 re: Request for 30 day Adjournment of Sentencing 4/10/15 (Galler, Richard) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1309 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Joann Crupi. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, upon the application of counsel for defendant JoAnn Crupi, that Ms. Crupi's bond issued on November 19, 2010, as modified on December 2, 2010, is hereby exonerated and released, including property posted as collateral to secure Ms. Crupi's pretrial release. It is further ordered that Pretrial Services or any other agency that has custody of Ms. Crupi's passport return it Ms. Crupi's wife, Judith Bowen, or to her counsel, Eric R. Breslin of Duane Morris, LLP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Pretrial Services or any other agency that has custody of the passports belonging to Judith Bowen and the two Bowen Crupi children, return the passports to Ms. Bowen, or to her counsel, Eric R. Breslin of Duane Morris, LLP. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/20/15)(jw) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1308 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to George Perez. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, upon application of counsel for defendant George Perez, that Mr. Perez's bond issued November 13, 2009, is hereby exonerated and released, including the obligors on the personal recognizance bond ("PRB") as well as the property posted as security, which conditions were imposed to secure Mr. Perez's pre-trial release. It is further ordered that Pre-Trial Services or any other agency that has custody of Mr. Perez's passport return it to Mr. Perez's wife, Jeanette Perez, or to his counsel. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/17/2015)(ft) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1307 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Paul J. Konigsberg ( Sentencing set for 7/9/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) The sentencing scheduled for March 20, 2015, is hereby rescheduled to July 9, 2015 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 12D. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/13/15)(jw) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1306 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Daniel Bonventre. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, upon the application of counsel for defendant Daniel Bonventre, that Mr. Bonventre's bond issued on February 25, 2010, as modified on March 2, 2010, and July 20, 2012, is hereby exonerated and released, including property posted as collateral to secure Mr. Bonventre's pretrial release. It is further ordered that Pretrial Services or any other agency that has custody of Mr. Bonventre's passport return it to Mr. Bonventre's wife, Barbara Bonventre, or to his counsel. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/11/2015)(jw) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1305 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated March 4, 2015 re: Forfeiture Conference as to Bonventre Document filed by USA. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1304 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated 3/3/15 re: Responding to the Court's order of earlier today, we have reconsidered and do believe it would be fruitful to appear tomorrow at the originally scheduled conference...ENDORSEMENT: The conference will go forward as to Mr. Bonventre at 3:00pm on March 4, 2015 (Status Conference set for 3/4/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/4/15)(jw) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1303 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 3, 2015 re: Supplemental Letter as to Tomorrow's Conference (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1302 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 3, 2015 re: Tomorrow's Scheduled Conference (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1301 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (10-Cr-228-05) Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Eric R. Breslin dated March 2, 2015 re: We write on the issue of the removal of Ms. Crupi's ankle bracelet. Ms. Crupi's surrender date is scheduled for March 9th and in order to reach Alderson in time and in good order, she will need to have the bracelet removed on March 8th. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/2/2015)(bw) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1300 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10 10 Cr. 228-) Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSAs Paul M. Monteleoni, Jonathan Cohen dated March 2, 2015 re: United States v. Daniel Bon ventre, et al. No. S10 10 Cr. 228 (LTS); United States v. All Right, Title & Interest in the Real Property and Appurtenances Located at 167 Legion Place, et al. No. 09 Civ. 9455(LTS)(GWG); United States v. Joann Crupi, et al. No. 10 Civ. 4857(LTS)(GWG); United States v. All Funds on Deposit in Account Nos. 94660869, 9948199297, 8007487, 9115606297, 9116151903 and 9931127481 in the Names of Annette Bongiorno and/or Rudy Bongiorno, et al. No. 10 Civ. 4858(LTS)(JCF). We write to respectfully request that the March 4, 2015 conference scheduled in the criminal case and the above-referenced civil forfeiture actions be adjourned for 45 days to allow the parties to attempt to consensually resolve or narrow the procedural and substantive issues involved in these cases. Counsel for all of the defendants and claimants except for Daniel Bonventre consent to this request. ENDORSEMENT: The general conference is adjourned to April 23, 2015, at 2:00 pm. A joint status report must be filed by April 20, 2015. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/3/2015) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Cases 09CV9455, doc.#23; 10CV4857, doc.#42; 10CV4858, doc.#101. ***] (bw) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1299 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (10-Cr-228-03) Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Andrew J. Frisch dated March 3, 2015 re: On behalf of Daniel Bonventre, I write in opposition to the government's application that the conference currently scheduled for March 4, 2015, to address open criminal and civil forfeiture issues be adjourned for 45 days. I oppose the application for the following reasons. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a conference tomorrow concerning a methodology for resolving Mr. Bonventre's forfeiture issues if the parties believe that would be useful. Messrs Frisch and Jackson are requested to consult with each other and inform Chambers by 3:00 p.m. today (March 3, 2015) if there is a request that the conference go forward tomorrow, or a joint request for a one-week adjournment. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/3/2015) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Cases 09CV9455, doc.#22; 10CV4857, doc.#41; 10CV4858, doc.#100. ***] (bw) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1298 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 3, 2015 re: Opposition to Government's Request for Adjournment of Conference (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1297 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Daniel Bonventre. On January 5, 2015, this Court entered an order requiring the parties to file a joint letter outlining all unresolved forfeiture issues, as well as a proposed schedule for any further proceedings that may be required, in advance of the conference then scheduled for January 26, 2015. The conference was subsequently adjourned to March 4, 2015, at 3:00 p.m. The Court has not yet received a submission from the parties, however, and therefore directs them to file a joint letter (with a courtesy copy to chambers) by noon on March 3, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/2/2015)(ft) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1296 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated March 2, 2015 re: Removal of electronic bracelet to allow for travel to Alderson for JoAnn Crupi. Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1295 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated March 2, 2015 re: 1282 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, re: Adjournment of Forfeiture Conference . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1294 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Craig Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Barry W. Agulnick dated 2/24/15 re: To request that the Court modify my client's bail conditions to permit him to travel to Austin and Dallas, Texas from March 10 - March 11, 2015 and Los Angeles, California from April 6 - April 15, 2015 both for business.ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/25/15)(jw) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1293 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1290 LETTER MOTION to make an application on defendant Annette Bongiorno for permission to turn in her ankle bracelet on February 27, so that, on February 28, she can begin her travel to Coleman, Florida, where she will be surrendering to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons on or before March 5 as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5)...ENDORSEMENT...IT IS ORDERED that the defendant Annette Bongiorno return her ankle bracelet to the Pretrial Services Agency on February 27, 2015, and begin her travel to Coleman, Florida on February 28, 2015. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/19/15) (jw) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1292 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1289 LETTER MOTION Requesting for a delay in Ms. Crupi's surrender date to March 16, 2015 as to Joann Crupi...ENDORSEMENT..Ms. Crupi's surrender date is extended to March 9, 2015. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/19/15) (jw) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1291 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Peter Madoff. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT: All right, title and interest in the Specific Property is hereby forfeited and vested in the United States of America for disposition according to law. Pursuant to Title 21 U.S.C. § 853(n)(7) the United States of America shall, and is hereby deemed to, have clear title to the Specific Property. The United States Marshals Service shall take possession of the Specific Property and dispose of the same according to law, in accordance with Title 21, United States Code, Section 853(h). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/18/15)(jw) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1290 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/19/2015 re: Permission to turn in ankle bracelet on February 27 . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1289 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 19, 2015 re: Application for short extension of deadline to surrender to continue negotiations on forfeiture . Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1288 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1283 LETTER MOTION I respect the government's interest in Mr. Bonventre's surrender, but I believe that a two-week extension serves everyone's interests and can only help facilitate resolution of this last piece of the case. as to Daniel Bonventre...ENDORSEMENT...Mr. Bonventre's surrender date is extended to March 5, 2015. He must surrender at the facility by 2:00pm. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/18/15) (jw) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1287 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated February 18, 2015 re 1283 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated February 17, 2015 re: Application for Short Extension of Deadline for Surrender Date .. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1286 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2-18-2015 re: Response to the Defendant's Request for a Stay of His Surrender Date Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1285 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Peter Madoff addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated February 18, 2015 re: Corrected Proposed Final Order of Forfeiture Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Final Order of Forfeiture)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1284 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Peter Madoff addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni dated February 17, 2015 re: Proposed Final Order of Forfeiture Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1283 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated February 17, 2015 re: Application for Short Extension of Deadline for Surrender Date . Document filed by Daniel Bonventre. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1282 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to George Perez on re: 1280 Letter, filed by George Perez. ENDORSEMENT: The adjournment is granted. (Status Conference set for 3/4/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/13/2015)(ft) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1281 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
SERVICE BY PUBLICATION as to Peter Madoff. A Notice of Criminal Forfeiture was published in the www.forfeiture.gov on May 18, 2013 through June 16, 2013. Document filed by USA as to Peter Madoff. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1280 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated February 13, 2015 re: Scheduling of Forfeiture Conference Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1279 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Annette Bongiorno on re: 1278 Letter - Sentencing, filed by Annette Bongiorno. I write to make an application on the defendant's behalf for a two week adjournment of her surrender date. I have discussed this application with AUSA Randall Jackson, and he has no objection to it, The reasons for the application are as follows. For all the foregoing reasons, I respectfully request that the Court extend the time for Mrs. Bongiorno to surrender to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons until March 5, 2015. As noted above, the US Attorney's Office has no objection to this request...It is ORDERED that the date by which the defendant Annette Bongiorno must surrender to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons is hereby extended to March 5, 2015. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/11/15)(jw) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1278 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
Sentencing Letter by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/2015 re: Adjournment of Surrender Date. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1277 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-01) Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Gordon Mehler dated February 2, 2015 re: I write to request permission for Mr. O'Hara and his family to travel to Lake Harmony, PA for a trip with 20 other families from February 15 until February 19. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/2/2015)(bw) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1276 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S5-10-Cr-228-08) Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Michael P. Morrissey dated February 2, 2015 re: We write to request that the Court modify Ms. Cotellessa-Pitz's conditions of release to allow her to travel to Boston, Massachusetts, from February 11, 2015, through February 13, 2015, so that Ms. Cotellessa-Pitz can accompany her daughter to an interview for a graduate school program. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/3/2015)(bw) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1275 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Michael P. Morrissey dated 02/02/2015 re: modify Ms. Cotellessa-Pitz's conditions of release to travel to Boston (Morrissey, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1274 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Annette Bongiorno. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the plaintiff, United States of America, by its attorriey Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, of counsel, and the Stone Hill HOA, by its counsel, Caryn L. Meyer, Esq., that Stone Hill HOA agrees to stay the Foreclosure Action against the Subject Property pending the resolution of the Defendant's criminal forfeiture matter. At such time as an amended preliminary order of forfeiture is entered by the Court in which the Government seeks the forfeiture of all right, title and interest of the defendant in the Subject Property, Stone Hill HOA agrees to not contest or file any claims of interest in the ancillary proceeding in this criminal action or the Civil Forfeiture Action contesting the forfeiture of the Subject Property to the Government. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/30/15)(jw) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1272 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 1/28/2015 re: Striking document #1270. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/29/2015)(ft) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1271 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated January 28, 2015 re: Stipulation Regarding Real Property Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulation)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1269 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 1/23/2015 re: Sentencing Date Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1268 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-) Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSAs Paul M. Monteleoni, Jonathan Cohen dated January 17, 2015 re: We write with the consent of defense counsel to respectfully request that the January 26, 2015 conference scheduled in the above-referenced civil forfeiture actions, see No. 09 Civ. 9455(LTS)(GWG) (ECF No. 15), No. 10 Civ. 4857(LTS)(GWG) (ECF No. 35); No. 10 Civ. 4858(LTS)(JCF) (ECF No. 93), be adjourned for 30 days to allow the parties to attempt to consensually resolve or narrow the procedural and substantive issues involved in these cases. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. the conference is adjourned to February 26, 2015, at 4:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is requeseted to docket this endorsed order in each of the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/20/2015)(bw); [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Cases: 09-cv-9455(LTS)(GWG), doc.#17; 10-cv-4857(LTS)(GWG), doc.#37; 10-cv-4858(LTS)(JCF), doc.#96. ***] Modified on 1/21/2015 (bw). (Entered: 01/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1267 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jonathan Ephraim Weis Cohen appearing for USA. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1266 Filed: 1/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated January 17, 2015 re: Timing of Conference on Forfeiture Issues Document filed by USA. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 01/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1265 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Matthew Abramowicz appearing for USA. (Abramowicz, David) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1264 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Barry W. Agulnick appearing for Craig Kugel. Appearance Type: Retained. (Agulnick, Barry) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1263 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Craig Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Randall W. Jackson dated 1/13/2015 re: The Government requests that the Court schedule sentencing for the defendant in the above-referenced case. ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing is scheduled for May 28, 2015, at 2:00pm. The PSR will be ordered. (Sentencing set for 5/28/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/14/2015)(ft) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1262 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Eric S. Lipkin on re: 1254 Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing is scheduled for May 20, 2015, at 11:00 AM. The PSR will be ordered. SO ORDERED. (Sentencing set for 5/20/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/14/2015)(ft) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1261 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 1/14/2015 re: Related Cases Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1260 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to David L. Kugel on re: 1255 Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing is scheduled for May 27, 2015, at 2:00 pm. The PSR will be ordered. SO ORDERED. (Sentencing set for 5/27/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/14/2015)(ft) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1259 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz on re: 1256 Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing is scheduled for May 19, 2015, at 2:00pm. The PSR will be ordered. (Sentencing set for 5/19/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/14/2015)(ft) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1258 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Craig Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Barry W. Agulnick dated 1/12/15 re: To request that the Court modify my client's bail conditions to permit him to travel to Detroit, Michigan on February 9-10, 2015 and to San Francisco from March 15-19, 2015. Both trips are for business purposes..ENDORSEMENT: The Government and Pretrial Services having consented, the requested modifications are granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/13/15)(jw) (Main Document 1258 replaced on 1/14/2015) (ft). (Main Document 1258 replaced on 1/14/2015) (ft). (Entered: 01/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1257 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Craig Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 1/13/2015 re: Sentencing Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1256 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 1/13/2015 re: Sentencing Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1255 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to David L. Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 1/13/2015 re: Sentencing Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1254 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Eric S. Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 1/13/2015 re: Sentencing Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1253 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to Joann Crupi from 1243 Judgment. (nd) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1252 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to Annette Bongiorno from 1225 Judgment. (nd) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1251 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to George Perez from 1233 Judgment. (nd) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1250 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to Jerome O'Hara from 1232 Judgment. (nd) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1249 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to Daniel Bonventre from 1223 Judgment. (nd) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1248 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FORM B Filed by Joann Crupi. No transcript ordered. (nd) (nd). (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1247 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Joann Crupi from 1243 Judgment. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401114097. (nd) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1246 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1245 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
THIRD PARTY PETITION IN RESPONSE TO FORFEITURE ORDER by Hudson City Saving Bank as to Daniel Bonventre for a Hearing to Adjudicate Interest in Property Subject to Forfeiture Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Schnapp, Daniel) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1244 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jerome O'Hara No transcript ordered. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1243 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Joann Crupi (5), Found guilty on count(s)1,2,6,7,9,10,12,13,16,17,31,31,32 and 33. Imprisonment for a total term of 60 months of imprisonment as to each of Counts One, Two, Nine, Ten, Twelve, Thirteen, Thirty-One, Thirty-Two and Thirty-Three, to run concurrently. 72 months of imprisonment as to Counts Six (6), Seven (7), Sixteen (16) and Seventeen (17), to run concurrently with the sentences on the other counts of conviction. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: that the defendant be designated to FCI Alderson Satellite Camp, in West Virginia, in order to facilitate the maintenance of family ties and ties with friends in that area who will support family visitation. The Court recommends to the BOP that the defendant serve the final 12 months of her sentence in home confinement. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2pm on February 26, 2015. Supervised release for a term of 3 years as to each of Counts One, Two, Six, Seven, Nine, Ten, Twelve, Thirteen, Thirty-One, Thirty-Two, and Thirty-Three, to run concurrently. 4 years of supervised release as to Counts Sixteen (16) and Seventeen (17), to run concurrently with the other supervised release terms. Special Assessment of $1,300 which is due immediately. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/23/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1242 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Mr. Cahill from Laura Taylor Swain dated 12/23/14 re: I have received your letter concerning the sentences of the former Madoff Securities employees. My reasons for imposing each sentence were laid out specifically and at great length on the record of each public sentencing hearing, each of which was more than two hours long. The transcripts of those hearings will be posted on the public docket in accordance with Judicial Conference policy (jw) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1241 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Annette Bongiorno from 1225 Judgment. [NOA filed by CJA appointed counsel on behalf of the defendant]. (nd) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1240 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FORM B Filed by George Perez for a Sentence proceeding held on 12/10/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain Transcript due by 1/5/2015. (nd) Modified on 12/23/2014 (nd). (Entered: 12/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1239 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by George Perez from 1233 Judgment. [NOA filed by CJA appointed counsel on behalf of the defendant]. (nd) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1238 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jerome O'Hara from 1217 Order, 1232 Judgment. [NOA filed by CJA appointed counsel on behalf of the defendant]. (nd) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1237 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 12/9/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1236 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1235 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 12/9/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1234 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Sentence held on 12/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1233 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to George Perez (2), Count(s) 1, 12sss-13sss, 1s, 1ss, 1sss, 2, 2s, 2sss, 3, 3s, 3ss, 4ss, 6sss-7sss, 9sss-10sss, Underlying Indictment are dismissed on the motion of the US; Count(s) 10ssss, 12ssss, 13ssss, 1ssss, 2ssss, 6ssss, 7ssss, 9ssss, Imprisonment for a total term of 30 months as to each of Counts One, Two, Six, Seven, Nine, Ten, Twelve and Thirteen, to run concurrently, for a total of 30 months of imprisonment. Supervised release for a term of 3 years of supervised release as to each of Counts One, Two, Six and Seven, Nine, Ten, Twelve and Thirteen to run concurrently for a total of 3 years of supervised release. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: that the defendant be designated to the FCI Lewisburg Satellite Camp, in Pennsylvania in order to facilitate the maintenance of family ties. The Court recommends to the BOP that the defendant be afforded an opportunity to participate in the BOP' Residential Drug Abuse Treatment Program (RDAP) for his documented alcohol issues. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2pm on February 23, 2015. Special Assessment of $800 which is due immediately. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/22/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1232 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
JUDGMENT as to Jerome O'Hara (1), Count(s) 1, 12sss-13sss, 1s, 1ss, 1sss, 2, 2s, 2sss, 3, 3s, 3ss, 4ss, 6sss-7sss, 9sss-10sss, Dismissed; Count(s) 10ssss, 12ssss, 13ssss, 1ssss, 2ssss, 6ssss, 7ssss, 9ssss, Imprisonment: 30 Months; Supervised Release: 3 Years. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: that the defendant be designated to the FCI Lewisburg Satellite Camp, in Pennsylvania in order to facilitate the maintenance of family ties. The Court recommends to the BOP that the defendant be afforded an opportunity to participate in the BOP's Residential Drug Abuse Treatment Program (RDAP) for his documented alcohol issues. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons:before 2 p.m. on February 23, 2015. The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. The defendant is to pay an assessment fee of $800.00 due immediately. (dnd) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1231 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Annette Bongiorno for a Sentence proceeding held on 12/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain Transcript due by 1/2/2015. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1230 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1229 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Daniel Bonventre from 1223 Judgment. [NOA filed by CJA appointed counsel on behalf of the defendant]. (nd) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1228 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS CONSIDERED IN CONNECTION WITH SENTENCINGS OF ABOVE-CAPTIONED DEFENDANTS as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The attached Schedule A Revised lists all of the submissions that were considered in connection with the December 8, 9, 10 and 15, 2014, sentencings of the above-captioned Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/18/2014)(ft) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1227 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated 12/5/2014 re: Pursuant to the Court's order earlier today, we write to confirm that the Court's list of submissions by Ms. Crupi is accurate and complete, with one exception. As Ms. Yuhas indicated before, Document # 1115, dated 7/31/2014, was not submitted on behalf of Ms. Crupi, only Messrs. Perez and O'Hara. Additionally, we wish to remind the Court that Ms. Crupi's sentencing submission ( 1076, 7117/2014) was sent to the Court in its un-redacted form by Federal Express on or around July 11,2014. We thank the Court for its courtesies..ENDORSEMENT: The submission was received in unredacted form. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/17/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1226 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER: As to Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 12/16/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to request that the defendants conditions of bond concerning travel be modified to permit her to travel to her brother's home in Monmouth Junction, New Jersey on December 25, 2014 to celebrate the Christmas Holiday. ENDORSEMENT: Request Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/17/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1225 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Annette Bongiorno (4), Count(s) 1, 10-14, 12s, 1s, 2, 25s-29s, 3, 30s, 4, 6s, 9s, Dismissed; Imprisonment: 60 months of imprisonment as to each of Counts One (1), Nine (9), Twelve (12), Twenty-Five (25), Twenty-Six (26),Twenty-Seven (27), Twenty-Eight (28) and Twenty-Nine (29), to run concurrently. 72 months of imprisonment as to Count Six (6), to run concurrently with the sentences on the other counts of conviction. 36 months of imprisonment as to Count Thirty (30), to run concurrently with the sentences on the other counts of conviction. The total custodial sentence is 72 months of imprisonment. Supervised Release: 1 year of supervised release as to each of Counts One (1 ), Six (6), Nine (9), Twelve (12), Twenty-Five (25), Twenty-Six (26), Twenty Seven (27), Twenty-Eight (28), Twenty-Nine (29) and Thirty (30), to run concurrently. The total supervised release term is 1 year. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: that the defendant be designated to the FCI Coleman Women's Satellite Camp, in Florida, in order to facilitate the maintenance of family ties and for health reasons.The Court recommends to the BOP that the defendant serve the final 12 months of her sentence in home confinement. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons: before 2 p.m. on February 19, 2015. The above drug testing condition is suspended, based on the court's determination that the defendant poses a low risk of future substance abuse. The defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. The defendant is to pay an assessment fee of $1000.00 due immediately. The defendantis to pay restitution in the amount of $155,158,703,200.00 as indicated on page7 of this document. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/17/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1224 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY/MONEY JUDGMENT as to Joann Crupi. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One, Two, Six, Seven, Nine and Ten of the Indictment, of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount $33,947,549,335 in US currency shall be entered against the defendant, for which shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against her co-defendants in this case. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts Sixteen and Seventeen of the Indictment, of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of $3,417,804.26 in United States currency (the "Second Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/15/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1223 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Daniel Bonventre (3), Count(s) 1, 12ss-14ss, 15ss, 18ss, 19ss, 1s, 1ss, 2, 20ss-23ss, 24ss, 2s, 2ss, 3, 3s, 3ss, 4, 4s, 4ss, 5, 5s, 5ss, 6-9, 6s-9s, 6ss-8ss, 9ss-11ss are dismissed on the motion of the US. Found guilty to Count(s) 1sss,2sss,3sss,4sss,5sss,6sss,7sss,8sss,9sss,10sss,11sss,12sss,13sss,14sss,15sss, 18sss,20sss,21sss,22sss,23sss,24sss. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: that the defendant be designated to the FCI Schuylkill Camp, in Pennsylvania, in order to facilitate the maintenance of family ties. The Court recommends to the BOP that the defendant serve the final 12 months of his sentence in home confinement. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2pm on February 19, 2015 at 2pm. Assessment of $2,000 which is due immediately. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/15/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1222 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 12/16/2014 re: modify bail limits . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1221 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1220 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1219 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Daniel Bonventre. It has come to the Court's attention that the recommendation portion of the Presentence Report included an erroneous computation of the counts of conviction, and that the correct total is 20, rather than 22. The Court intends, accordingly, to reflect an Assessment obligation of $2,000 in the Judgment, rather than the $2,200 stated on the record. Any objection to this change should be made in a letter filed by 5:00p.m. on December 15, 2014. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/12/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1218 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY/MONEY JUDGMENT as to George Perez. It is hereby ORDERED that: As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One, Two, Six, Seven, Nine and Ten of the Indictment, of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of $19,707,987,337 in US currency (the "Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant, for which he shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against his co-defendants in this case, DANIEL BONVENTRE, ANNETTE BONGIORNO, JOANN CRUPI a/kla "Jodi," JEROME O'HARA, ERIC S. LIPKIN, DAVID L. KUGEL, ENRICA COTELESSA-PITZ, CRAIG KUGEL, IRWIN LIPKIN, PETER MADOFF, and PAUL J. KONIGSBERG, as well as any forfeiture money judgment entered against BERNARD L. MADOFF in United States v.Madoff, 09 Cr. 213 (DC), DAVID G. FRIEHLING in US v. Friehling, 09 cr 700 (AKH), and FRANK DIPASCALI in US v. DiPascali, 09 cr 764 (RJS)(SDNY). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/10/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1217 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY/MONEY JUDGMENT as to Jerome O'Hara. For the reasons as set forth in this Order; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One, Two, Six, Seven, Nineand Ten of the Indictment of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of $19,707,987,337.00 in United States currency (the ""Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant, for which he shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against his co-defendants in this case... The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit One St.Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/9/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1216 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY/MONEY JUDGMENT as to Annette Bongiorno. For the reasons as set forth in this Order; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: As a result of committing the offenses charged in Counts One, Six, and Nine of the Indictment, of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of $155,158,703,200.00 in United States currency shall be entered against the defendant for which she shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against her co-defendants in this case... The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/9/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1215 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY /MONEY JUDGMENT as to Daniel Bonventre. For the reasons as set forth in this Order... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One and Two and Six through Eleven of the Indictment, of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of $155,158,703,200.00 in United States currency shall be entered against the defendant for which he shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against his co-defendants in this case... The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/8/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1214 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to George Perez addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly Yuhas dated 12/5/14 re: We write in response to the Court's order of today, December 5, 2014. regarding submissions considered in connection with the upcoming sentencings of the defendants in the above matter. In response to the Court's order, we are writing to infom1 the Court of one omission and one correction with respect to those submissions filed on behalf of Mr. Perez. Tn particular, omitted from the Court's order is Docket #1068, which is the Sentencing Letters submitted in support of George Perez. We are confident that the Court has reviewed these letters, but mention this in an excess of caution..ENDORSEMENT: The supportive letters have been reviewed in unredacted form; the submission will be added to the final version of Schedule A. The correction will be made in the final version. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/6/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1213 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Daniel Bonventre on re: 1210 Letter filed by Daniel Bonventre. On behalf of Mr. Bonventre, we write in response to the Court's order of today, regarding submissions considered in connection with sentencings of the defendants in the above-referenced matter. In addition, as to Mr. Bonventre's September 13, 2014 Opposition to Government's Supplemental Memo, Docket# 1134/1144 (main documents) and Docket# 1135/1143 (exhibits), Docket# 1137, Declaration of Daniel Bonventre in Opposition to Government's Supplemental Memo with Exhibit A should be added to the "Exhibits" column....ENDORSEMENT...The forgoing documents were reviewed and will be included in the final version of Schedule A. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/6/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1212 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 12/6/14 re: We write pursuant to the Court's order, Docket #1206, concerning the submissions the Court has considered in connection with Mr. O'Hara's upcoming sentencing. A review of Schedule A attached to the Court's order confirms that the Court has considered each of our six post-trial submissions. We did not see any specific mention of the more than 100 letters submitted as a separate bound volume in connection with Mr. O'Hara's sentencing memorandum, but trust that the Court has, in fact, reviewed those letters...ENDORSEMENT: The volume was labeled Exhibit C and is referred to as such in schedule A. It has been reviewed. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/7/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1211 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated December 5, 2014 Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1210 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated December 5, 2014 re: Sentencing Submissions (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1209 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated December 5, 2014 re: Sentencing Submissions (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly A. Yuhas dated December 5, 2014 re: Response to Court's December 5, 2014, Order (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 12/4/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to request that the defendant's conditions of bond concerning travel and daily curfew be modified to permit him to undergo a second sleep study. I write to request permission for Mr. O'Hara to undergo a sleep study on the night of December 11, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: The modification request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/4/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1206 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS CONSIDERED IN CONNECTION WITH SENTENCINGS OF ABOVE-CAPTIONED DEFENDANTS as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In connection with the sentencings scheduled for December 8, 9, 10 and 15, 2014, the Court has reviewed the Presentence Investigation Reports and the submissions listed on the attached Schedule A. All Defendants' submissions are included here because each of the Defendants has joined some or all of their co-Defendants' arguments. Briefs filed in connection with Defendants' post-trial motions are included because several parties have cross-referenced their earlier submissions. Counsel are requested to inform the Court promptly of any omissions or necessary corrections. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1205 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Peter Madoff on re: 1204 Letter filed by USA. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The USMS is authorized to liquidate the Specific Property in a commercially feasible manner and may, in its sole discretion, reject any offer to purchase the Specific Property where it determines that the offer is being made by, or on behalf of, a person involved in the criminal activity alleged as the basis for forfeiture; 2. The net proceeds from the sale will be held by the USMS in its Seized Asset Deposit Fund pending entry of a final order of forfeiture and will serve as a substitute res for the Specific Property (the "Substitute Res") in the above-captioned case, with all claims and defenses applicable to the Specific Property, including any other action that may be brought by the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York for forfeiture of the Specific Property or claims by third parties, to apply instead to the Substitute Res. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/4/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1204 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Peter Madoff addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated December 3, 2014 re: Interlocutory Sale of Property Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1203 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated December 2, 2014 re: Stay of Execution of Forfeiture and Bail Pending Appeal. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1202 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated December 2, 2014 re: Further update regarding responses to the Court's July 30 Order Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1201 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 26, 2014 re: Update regarding responses to the Court's July 30 Order Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1200 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1199 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Richard P. Galler dated 11/12/2014 re: For the reasons discussed in this letter defense counsel writes to respectfully request that the sentencing of the defendant scheduled for December 8, 2014 be adjourned until March 20, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: Sentencing is adjourned until April 10, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/18/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1198 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 18, 2014 re: Opposition to Sentencing Adjournment Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1197 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/27/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1196 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Conference held on 10/27/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1195 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from RICHARD P. GALLER, ESQ. dated Nov. 12, 2014 re: Lipkin, Irwin request for rescheduling of sentencing (Galler, Richard) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1194 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated November 14, 2014 re: Response to Government's November 3, 2014 Letter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Declaration of Gregory L. Florio)(Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1193 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated November 10, 2014 re 1038 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated June 30, 2014 re: Scheduling of sentencing procedures .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email correspondence)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1192 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated November 10, 2014 re: Resopnse to the November 3, 2014 submission by the government Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Transcript, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of GX 105c-46)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1191 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by David L. Kugel. CJA attorney Patrick Joyce appointed. (Signed by Judge Judge Laura Taylor Swain) (dnd) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1190 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20 as to David Kugel: Appointment of Attorney Patrick Joyce for David Kugel. (Appointed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/24/14)(ade) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1189 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 4, 2014 re: Memoranda of defendants' proffer statements Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1188 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The Government is hereby directed to provide this Court with copies of all memoranda from the proffer sessions of Defendants Annette Bongiorno and Joann Crupi. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/5/14)(jw) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1187 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Daniel Bonventre on 1184 Letter, filed by Daniel Bonventre. ENDORSEMENT: The request for permission to file a response by November 14, 2014, is granted. (Responses due by 11/14/2014) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/4/2014)(ft) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1186 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Daniel Bonventre on 1183 Letter, filed by Joann Crupi. ENDORSEMENT: The request for permission to file a brief response is granted. The response must be filed by November 10, 2014. (Responses due by 11/10/2014) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/4/2014)(ft) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1185 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER in regards to defendants Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Judge Swain has requested that I remind you that all objections and requests to the Court are to be made by letter motion filed on ECF (with a courtesy copy to chambers), rather than by email. Going forward, please follow this procedure. (jw) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1184 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated November 4, 2014 re: Government's Letter of November 3, 2014 Document filed by Daniel Bonventre. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1183 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated November 4, 2014 re: Government's filing as of November 3, 2014 Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1182 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 3, 2014 re: Response to Questions from the October 27, 2014 Hearing Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibits E-H, # 3 Revised Proposed Orders of Forfeiture)(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1181 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1180 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The continued sentencing hearings in the above-captioned case are adjourned to the following dates: for Daniel Bonventre, on Monday, December 8, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for Annette Bongiorno, on Tuesday, December 9, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for Jerome O'Hara, on Tuesday, December 9, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for George Perez, on Wednesday, December 10, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for Joann Crupi, on Monday, December 15, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/28/2014)(ft) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1179 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to David L. Kugel. Martin B. Adelman, Daniel L. Zelenko and Michael V. Blumenthal are relieved as retained counsel for the defendant. The defendant in the above-captioned matter is now represented by CJA counsel, Patrick J. Joyce. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/24/14)(jw) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1178 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 10/20/2014 re: We write, on behalf of all parties, pursuant to the Court's October 2, 2014 Order, which notified the parties that the Court will hear oral argument regarding all forfeiture issues on October 27, 2014. Mindful of the Court's urging that the parties "avoid making repetitive or cumulative arguments,'' the defendants respectfully request oral argument time as follows... ENDORSEMENT: The requested time allotments are approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/20/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1177 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (S2-10-Cr-228-04) Annette Bongiorno on re: 1175 LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Roland Riopelle dated 10/15/14 re: Bail Modification. ENDORSEMENT: The defendant, Annette Bongiorno, having made an application to modify the conditions of her bail to permit her to leave her home any time after 7:00 a.m. on October 27, 2014, for the purpose of attending the hearing scheduled in this matter on October 27, 2014 at 9:30a.m., and good cause appearing to grant this application. IT IS ORDERED, that the defendant, Annette Bongiorno, is hereby permitted to leave her home any time after 7:00 a.m. on October 27,2014, for the purpose of attending the hearing scheduled in this matter on October 27, 2014. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/20/2014)(bw) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1176 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JOINT LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated October 20, 2014 re: Requests for Oral Argument Time Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1175 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland Riopelle dated 10/15/14 re: Bail Modification Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1174 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 10/14/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to request that the defendant's travel restrictions be modified to permit him to undergo a medical sleep study on the night of October 20th. which was prescribed by his doctor. ENDORSEMENT: The requested modification is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/14/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1173 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated October 10, 2014 re: Response to Defendants' Further Submissions on Forfeiture. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1172 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly A. Yuhas dated October 8, 2014 re: Provision of email chain between our firm and Mr. Madoff referred to in our Supplemental Submission Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1171 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to David L. Kugel. The change of counsel hearing in this matter originally scheduled for Friday, October 10, 2014, at 12:15 pm is hereby rescheduled to Friday, October 24, 2014, at 9:30a.m. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/8/14)(jw) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1170 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Larry H. Krantz by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Second Declaration on Behalf of George Perez and Jerome O'Hara Constituting Second Supplemental Submission on Forfeiture, Foreseeable Loss and Other Sentencing Issues (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1169 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to David L. Kugel. The Court has received a request from Defendant David Kugel for appointment of new counsel in this case. A conference will be held on Friday, October 10 at 12:15 pm, at which time any application for appointment of counsel will be heard. CJA counsel Steven K. Frankel, Esq., is directed to attend. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 10/10/2014 at 12:15 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/6/2014)(ft) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1168 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated October 6, 2014 re: Further Submission on Forfeiture. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1167 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Larry H. Krantz by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Declaration on behalf of George Perez and Jerome O'Hara Constituting Our Supplemental Submission on Forfeiture, Foreseeable Loss and Other Sentencing Issues (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1166 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The Court has received four letters from the parties: a joint letter from all Defendants in response to this Court's September 18 and 22, 2014, Orders (docket entry no. 1156), the Government's reply to the Defendant's joint letter (docket entry no. 1157), a second joint letter from all Defendants in response to the Government's reply (docket entry no. 1160), and a letter from Andrew Frisch, counsel for Daniel Bonventre, expressing his intent not to offer live testimony at any forfeiture hearing (docket entry no. 1162). The Court has carefully considered each of these letters, and orders the following: Any further documentary submissions that Defendants intend to make regarding forfeiture are due by October 6, 2014. Any further documentary submissions that the Government intends to make regarding forfeiture are due by October 10, 2014. The Court will hear oral argument regarding all forfeiture issues on October 27, 2014, at 9:30a.m. By October 20, 2014, the Government and all Defendants must file a joint letter delineating the time each requests to be allotted for oral argument. Defendants are urged to avoid making repetitive or cumulative arguments. Sentencings for the Defendants are rescheduled as follows: The sentencing of Daniel Bonventre will be held on Monday, November 10, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. The sentencing of Annette Bongiorno will be held on Monday, November 10, 2014, at 2:00p.m. The sentencing of Joann Crupi will be held on Wednesday, November 12, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. The sentencing of Jerome O'Hara will be held on Wednesday, November 12, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. The sentencing of George Perez will be held on Thursday, November 13, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/2/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1165 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated October 6, 2014 re: Proposed forfeiture orders and upcoming hearing Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1164 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER: As to Craig Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Barry W. Agulnick dated 10/2/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to request that the Court modify his client's bail conditions to permit him to travel to New Orleans from November 8, 2014 to November 12, 2014 for business purposes. The government and pre-trial consent to this application. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/3/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1163 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated October 1, 2014 re: Proposed Forfeiture Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1162 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated September 30, 2014 re: Forfeiture Proceedings. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1161 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (10-Cr-228-03) Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Andrew J. Frisch dated September 29, 2014 re: I write to request a short extension of this morning's deadline for a joint submission regarding a forfeiture hearing, or for Mr. Bonventre's input in that submission. We ask for an extension of time until tomorrow to advise the court of whether or not we will have live testimony to offer. ENDORSEMENT: The requested extension is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/29/2014)(bw) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1160 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 9-29-14 re: Scheduling Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1159 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated 9/26/2014 re: Defense counsel submits this letter asking the court to reconsider their application that they be prmitted to read a statement of Dr. Roxane Seemla, a Madoff victim, at Mr. Bonventre's sentencing. ENDORSEMENT: A statement (other than the letter) of up to three minutes in length may be read at the sentencing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/29/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1158 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated September 29, 2014 re: Short Extension of Time to Determine Witness Testimony. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1157 Filed: 9/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated September 28, 2014 re: Schedule for Sentencing Proceedings / Response to September 18 & 22 Orders. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1156 Filed: 9/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 09/28/2014 re: Scheduling For Upcoming Forfeiture and Sentencing Proceedings (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 09/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1155 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated September 26, 2014 re: Reconsideration of Application on Reading of Victim Impact Statement at Sentencing. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1154 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi The Government's Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Connection with Sentencing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C (Revised Crupi Preliminary Order of Forfeiture))(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1153 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C (Revised Crupi Preliminary Order of Forfeiture))(Schwartz, Matthew) Modified on 9/25/2014 (ka). (Entered: 09/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1152 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). The Court has received three letters from the parties- a joint letter from all Defendants in response to this Court's September 18, 2014, Order (docket entry no. 1149), the Government's reply to the Defendant's joint letter (docket entry no. 1150), and a letter from counsel for Daniel Bonventre, Andrew Frisch, alerting the Court to his upcoming travel plans (via e-mail). The Court has carefully considered each of these letters, and orders the following: The Defendants' request for an opportunity to argue the issue of whether the Government has made a prima facie case for forfeiture is hereby denied. As the Government points out, this issue was addressed and decided by the Court at the July 29, 2014, hearing. (See July 29, 2014, Tr. at 48.) In light of the Defendants' request to consider the Government's reply submissions regarding forfeiture, as well as Mr. Frisch's travel plans, the due date for submission ofthe parties' joint statement regarding witnesses and time required for forfeiture hearings is hereby extended to Monday, September 29, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. No forfeiture hearings will be held that week, in light of Mr. Frisch's unavailability. The Court will set a new hearing date following review of the Defendants' joint statement. The Government's request for an extension of time to file its reply papers regarding forfeiture is denied. The sentencing control dates for Defendants Bonventre, Bongiorno, Crupi, O'Hara and Perez are hereby adjourned pending further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/22/2014)(bw) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1151 Filed: 9/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R Breslin dated September 21, 2014 re: Hearing and disclosure dates Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1150 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated September 19, 2014 re: Opposition to defendants' letter motion for reconsideration Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1149 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 9-19-14 re: Request for Oral Argument Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1148 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER: as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated 9/17/2014 re: Pursuant to the Court's order dated July 30, 2104 submits this letter on behalf of Daniel Bonventre as an application that he permitted to read a statement of Madoff victim Roxane Seemta, M.D. at Mr. Bonventre's sentencing. ENDORSEMENT: The request to read the letter at sentencing is denied. The Court will already have reviewed carefully all written submissions including the letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/18/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1147 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In their responses to the Government's supplemental forfeiture submissions, each of the Defendants has expressed, at least conditionally, a request for a hearing, and two of the Defendants have made supplemental testimonial proffers. The court will hold any necessary hearings, and entertain oral arguments regarding forfeiture, during the week of September 29, 2014, on the days that were provisionally set aside for sentencings. The following time periods are available: Monday, September 29,2014, from 10:00 a.m. to 1:00 p.m. and 2:00p.m. to 4:30 p.m. Tuesday, September 30, 2014, from 2:00p.m. to 4:30p.m..Wednesday, October 1, 2014, from 10:00 a.m. to 12:30 p.m. and 2:00p.m. to4:30p.m. The parties are directed to consult with each other as to which witnesses will be tendered for direct or cross-examination, and the time required for oral argument. A joint letter identifying the witnesses and proposing a schedule must be filed, with a courtesy copy to Chambers, by September 24, 2014 at 3:00p.m. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/18/14)(jw) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1146 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated September 17, 2014 re: Victim Impact Statement. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1145 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Paul J. Konigsberg on re: 1139 Order on Letter Motion, The government writes to request that the control date for each of the named defendants be adjourned for approximately 6 months. ENDORSEMENT: The control date for each is adjourned to March 20, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/15/2014)(dnd) Modified on 10/17/2014 (dnd). (Entered: 09/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1144 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Daniel Bonventre . (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1143 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Daniel Bonventre by Daniel Bonventre re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1142 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1141 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Jerome O'Hara re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1140 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Eric R. Breslin in Support by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1138 Memorandum of Law in Opposition,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1139 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1136 LETTER MOTION Reschedule Sentencing as to Eric S. Lipkin (6), David L. Kugel (7), Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz (8), Craig Kugel (9), Paul J. Konigsberg (12)...ENDORSEMENT...The control date for each is adjourned to March 20, 2014 at 2:00pm. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/15/14) (jw) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1138 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bowen Affidavit)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1137 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Daniel Bonventre in Opposition as to Daniel Bonventre (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1136 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated September 15, 2014 re: Adjournment of Sentencing Control Dates . Document filed by USA as to Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1135 Filed: 9/13/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Daniel Bonventre in Opposition as to Daniel Bonventre (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1134 Filed: 9/13/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Daniel Bonventre re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1133 Filed: 9/13/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Jerome O'Hara re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 09/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1132 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated 9/12/2014 re: To request a short extension of time until no later than Monday to make our submission.ENDORSEMENT: The deadline is extended to 12:00pm on Saturday, September 13, 2014. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/12/14)(jw) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
DECLARATION of Roland G Riopelle in Opposition by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1033 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture Matters .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
RESPONSE in Opposition by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1079 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated July 17, 2014 re: 1033 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1129 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated September 12, 2014 re: Extension of Time . Document filed by Daniel Bonventre. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1127 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Joann Crupi re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Judith G. Bowen, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Eric R. Breslin, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1126 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1125 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Richard P. Galler dated 8/14/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to request the sentencing of the defendant scheduled for September 12, 2014 be adjourned to later in the year for the reasons set forth below. ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing is adjourned to December 12, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/2/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi Supplemental Memorandum of Law re Sentencing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (part 2), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1123 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 8/19/2014 re: Counsel for the defendant writes to request that the defendant's conditions concerning travel and curfew be modified to permit him to pick his daughter and two of her friends up from Camp Pontiac on Friday, August 22. Mr. O'Hara requires the Court's permission because the camp is just north of the limits of the Southe111 District in Copake, New York. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's request to travel outside of the Southern/Eastern Districts of New York on August 22, 2014 is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/19/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1122 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Richard P. Galler, Esq. dated August 14, 2014 re: Irwin Lipkin (Attachments: # 1 Dr.'s letter)(Galler, Richard) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 7/29/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Conference held on 7/29/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Eric S. Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jame K. Filan dated 8/11/14 re: To respectfully request an amended bail modification that would permit Mr. Lipkin to travel with his wife and children to Seattle, Washington to visit with Mr. Lipkin's mother-and father-in-law, Sue and Phil Kienast, from August 13, 2014 until August 27, 2014, as well as visit Oregon to go camping..ENDORSEMENT: The amended bail modification is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/12/14)(jw) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SALE OF PROPERTY as to Peter Madoff. The Government may proceed with the interlocutory sale of the Interlocutory Sale Property. The defendant and interested parties shall execute promptly any documents which may be required to complete the interlocutory sale of the Interlocutory Sale Property. The parties agree that the United States Marshal Service ("USMS") will market and sell the Interlocutory Sale Property. The United States Marshals Service may, in its sole discretion, reject any offer to purchase the Interlocutory Sale Property where it detennines that the offer is being made by, or on behalf of, a person involved in the criminal activity alleged as the basis for forfeiture. The net proceeds from the sale of the Interlocutory Sale Property will include all money realized from the sale of the Interlocutory Sale Property, except for the following listed herein. The cumulative net proceeds shall be remitted to the custody and control of the United States Marshals Service, and the net proceeds shall be held pending further order of the Court, for application toward the Money Judgment, in partial satisfaction thereof. This Court shall retain jurisdiction in this matter to take additional action and enter further orders as necessary to implement and enforce this order authorizing the interlocutory sale of the Interlocutory Sale Property. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/7/2014)(ft) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1117 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Peter Madoff addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Paul M. Monteleoni dated August 4, 2014 re: Interlocutory Order of Sale of Property Document filed by USA. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Eric S. Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James K. Filan dated 8/1/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to respectfully request a bail modification that would permit Mr. Lipkin to travel with his wife and children to Seattle, Washington to visit with Mr. Lipkin's mother - and father in - law, Sue and Phil Kienast, from August 8, 2014 until August 252014, as well as visit Oregon to go camping. ENDORSEMENT: The request modification is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1115 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus brief regarding sentencing. Document filed by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-29-14 re: Response to Government's letter dated 7-28-14 Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Any victim of the Madoff Securities fraud who wishes to speak at the sentencing of Defendant Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, JoAnn Crupi, Jerome O'Hara and/or George Perez, is hereby directed to so notify the United States Attorney's Office Victim Coordinator for the Southern District of New York, by Wednesday, September 17, 2014, either by email to usanys.madoff@usdoj.gov or by regular mail addressed to the United States Attorney's Office Attn: U.S. v. Bonventre, Victim Statements, 1 Saint Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York 10007. A separate sentencing hearing will be held for each of the five Defendants. Up to ten victims will be permitted to speak for a maximum of three minutes at each of the sentencing hearings. The speakers will be selected by the victim coordinator and assigned at random to a sentencing unless they claim to have had personal interactions with one or more of the individual Defendants. Each victim may speak at only one of the sentencings. Each victim who makes a request to speak in response to this order will be notified of the date and time of the sentencing at which he or she will be invited to speak, after the sentencing hearing dates have been finalized. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/30/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1112 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 7/24/14 re: We request permission to redact the photos of Mr. O'Hara's family.ENDORSEMENT: The redaction of the photographs is approved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/29/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 28, 2014 re: Agenda for Pre-Sentencing Hearing Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 25, 2014 re: Pursuant to the Court's direction, the parties have conferred about possible new sentencing dates. All parties are available at any time on September 29 and 30, and October 1 and 2, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing hearings are rescheduled as follows: Mr. Bonventre - September 29, 2014, at 10:00 AM. Ms. Bongiorno - September 29, 2014, at 2:00 PM. Ms. Crupi - September 30, 2014, at 2:00 PM. Mr. O'Hara - October 1, 2014, at 10:00 AM. Mr. Perez - October 1, 2014, at 2:00 PM SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/28/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/17/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/17/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/16/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/16/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 7/26/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Jerome O'Hara. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 07/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1104 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 1098 LETTER MOTION Request to seal Exhibit to sentencing memorandum as to Joann Crupi (5). Permission to redact Exhibit A of the reply submission is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/25/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1103 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Daniel Bonventre. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1102 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 25, 2014 re: Sentencing Dates Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Swain from Roland Riopelle dated 7/25/14 re: Supplemental Sentencing Submission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's Letter)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1099 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated July 25, 2014 re: Request to seal Exhibit to sentencing memorandum . Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1097 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BOP Regs, # 2 Exhibit NYT Article, # 3 Exhibit Defense Power Point Excerpt, # 4 Exhibit Defense Power Point Excerpt, # 5 Exhibit Ponzitracker list)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated July 25, 2014 re: Common issues for July 29 conference Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1095 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER: as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). After a more than five month trial, thirty-one counts of the above-captioned Superseding Indictment were submitted to the jury, and Defendants Daniel Bonventre ("Bonventre"), Annette Bongiorno ("Bongiorno"), Jo Ann Crupi ("Crupi"), Jerome O'Hara("O'Hara") and George Perez ("Perez," collectively, "Defendants") were convicted of each of the crimes which with they were charged. The charges included: conspiracy to defraud investment advisory clients and conspiracy to commit securities fraud; conspiracy to engage in accounting fraud and to defraud banks; conspiracy to commit tax fraud; securities fraud; falsifying the records of a broker-dealer; falsifying the records of an investment adviser; causing a false and misleading filing to be made with the Securities and Exchange Commission ("SEC"); bank fraud; making and subscribing to false income tax returns; corruptly obstructing the lawful administration of the internal revenue laws; and tax evasion. Fewer than all of the Defendants were charged in some of the counts. The Defendants move, separately and, as to certain issues, jointly, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29, for a judgment of acquittal and, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33, for a new trial. The Court has considered carefully the parties' voluminous submissions and arguments. For the following reasons, the Defendants' motions are denied in their entirety. Familiarity with the more than 12,000-page trial record and the hundreds of thousands of pages of exhibits received in evidence is presumed....[See this Opinion And Order]... CONCLUSION: For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' motions are denied in their entirety. This Opinion and Order resolves docket entry numbers 719, 722, 767, 970, 974, 975, 979 and 1014. The Clerk of Court is also requested to terminate docket entry numbers 645, 676, and 1007, which were previously resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/24/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-) Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain and Judge Sidney H. Stein from AUSAs, Matthew L. Schwartz, John T. Zach, Randall W. Jackson, Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 23, 2014 re: We write in response to the letter dated July 16, 2014 to Judge Stein suggesting that the two above-referenced cases-the criminal prosecution of Jerome O'Hara stemming from his role in the fraud perpetrated through Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, and the civil forfeiture of real property nominally in O'Hara's possession should be "consolidated" for unstated purposes. ENDORSEMENT: The relationship between proceedings in the above-captioned cases will be discussed at the conference scheduled for July 29, 2014 at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/23/2014)[*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Case 09Civ.9455(SHS)(GWG), Doc.#13. ***] (bw) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-) Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. The Government is hereby ordered to provide the Court with copies of the following exhibits by Thursday, July 24, 2014, at 12:00 p.m. GX 105-a127; GX 105-b6; GX 105-b24; GX 105-c57; GX 105-d3; GX 105-d57; GX208-108; GX 208-132; GX 208-210; GX 208-215; GX 208-231; GX 900-53B; GX 2000-35 through 2000-54; GX 2000-93; GX 5000-1 at 142. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/23/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly Yuhas dated July 23, 2014 re: Transcript of DVD Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1091 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Paul J. Konigsberg. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Plea proceeding held on 6/24/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Paul J. Konigsberg re: Plea held on 6/24/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1089 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 23, 2014 re: Transfer and Consolidation of Forfeiture Cases Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Victim Impact Statements Part 1, # 2 Victim Impact Statements Part 2, # 3 Victim Impact Statements Part 3, # 4 Victim Impact Statements Part 4, # 5 Victim Impact Statements Part 5, # 6 Victim Impact Statements Part 6, # 7 Victim Impact Statements Part 7, # 8 Victim Impact Statements Part 8)(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1087 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1086 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 7/22/2014 re: Victim Impact Statements and Corrected Sentencing Submission Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER As to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In light of the voluminous submissions received by the Court addressing the many issues that must be carefully considered in regard to sentencing, including forfeiture, sentencing proceedings are hereby adjourned to:Monday, September 15, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for defendant Daniel Bonventre.Monday, September 15,2014, at 2:00p.m. for defendant Annette Bongiorno.Tuesday, September 16, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for defendant JoAnn Crupi. Tuesday, September 16, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for defendant Jerome O'Hara. Wednesday, September 17, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for defendant George Perez. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/22/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In light of the recently extended deadline for the parties' submission of sentencing and forfeiture briefing materials, the Court hereby adjourns the hearing currently scheduled for Friday, July 25, 2014, to Tuesday, July 29, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. At this hearing, the court will hear the parties' arguments on the following common Issues: 1. Loss amount calculations, principles and evidence for U.S. Sentencing Guidelines purposes. 2. Forfeiture determination principles and evidence. 3. Arguments relating to the applicability of U.S. Sentencing Guidelines § 2B1.1(b)(19)(A), regarding the Defendants' roles as persons associated with registered brokers or dealers or investment advisers. 4. Applicability of an enhancement pursuant to U.S. Sentencing Guidelines § 3C 1.1 for obstructing or impeding the administration of justice. 5. Policy issues related to U.S. Sentencing Guidelines§ 2B1.1, regarding offenses involving fraud or deceit. 6. The relationship between the criminal forfeiture proceedings and the pending civil forfeiture cases. Procedures for the presentation of live victim statements at sentencing will also be discussed. The parties are directed to consult with each other to determine whether any additional common issues should be addressed. The parties are directed to notify the Court of any additional common issues in a joint letter filed by Friday, July 25, 2014, at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/22/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re Proposed Preliminary Orders of Forfeiture. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated July 17, 2014 re: government's proposed order of forfeiture (Sporn, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1079 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated July 17, 2014 re: 1033 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture Matters . re: Denying Government's Application for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rudy Bongiorno Declaration)(Caliendo, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration re Forfeiture)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated July 17, 2014 re: Opposition to government's propoed prelimininary order of forfeiture. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E, # 2 Affidavit Judith G. Bowen)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, part 1, # 5 Exhibit D, part 2, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Paul J. Konigsberg. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/17/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1074 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Paul J. Konigsberg re: Conference held on 6/17/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Debra Lyons, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2014. (Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1073 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (10-Cr-228-02) George Perez addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Kimberly A. Yuhas dated July 14, 2014 re: Enclosed please find two courtesy copies of the sentencing submission on behalf of George Perez, including all letters and one video on DVD, which accompanies the letter from one of Mr. Perez's daughters. Please be advised that the hard copies delivered to the Court contain unredacted copies of the letters submitted in support of Mr. Perez. We respectfully request that the Court file these unredacted letters and video under seal. Moreover, we will be filing redacted copies of the letters on ECF today. In addition to the redactions per the Court's Sentencing Submission Procedures and the ECF Privacy Policy, we have redacted the last names of two individuals who have submitted letters in support of Mr. Perez in order to maintain their privacy, at the party's request. ENDORSEMENT: A transcript of the DVD (redacted in a manner consistent with the written submissions) must be filed on ECF by July 23, 2014. SO ORDRED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/14/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/9/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/4/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/4/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1068 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain dated June 16,2014 re: Sentencing Letters on Behalf of George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Daniel Bonventre dated July 14, 2014 re: Objections to PSR (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz, John T. Zach, Randall W. Jackson and Paul M. Monteleoni dated 7/11/14 re: Reschedule Briefing.ENDORSEMENT: The proposed modified schedule is approved (Defense Sentencing Replies due by 7/25/2014., Government Sentencing Submission due by 7/18/2014, Status Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 02:15 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) Defense Forfeiture Submissions (including a joint submission on common issues) July 17, 2014, Defense Sentencing Replies set for July 25, 2014, Government Forfeiture Reply set for July 21, 2014. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/11/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1065 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1064 Sentencing Submission filed by George Perez Amicus submission. (Krantz, Larry) Modified on 7/15/2014 (ka). (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 11, 2014 re: Modifications to Briefing Schedule . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1062 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated 7/10/14 re: Enclosed please find two courtesy copies of the sentencing submission on behalf of Ms. Crupi, including all exhibits. The Court will notice that Exhibit D consists of a DVD. We were only able to provide one copy of the DVD to the Court and one to the government. As per our correspondence with the Court earlier this week, we will file the entire submission on ECF once we have the Court's permission to redact certain personal information from the submission..ENDORSEMENT: The foregoing redaction requests are granted, but a transcript of the video testimonials (with minor's names and personal address references redacted in a manner consistent with the foregoing principles)must be filed on ECF by July 22, 2014. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/11/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated July 11, 2014 re: Extension of Time to File Brief on Forfeiture . Document filed by Daniel Bonventre. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Extension of Time . Document filed by Daniel Bonventre. (Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 7/11/2014 (ka). (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Jerome O'Hara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Objections To Presentence Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Letter of Jerome O'Hara, # 3 Exhibit C - Sentencing Letters Volume I, # 4 Exhibit C - Sentencing Letters Volume II)(Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1058 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jeremy B. Sporn dated July 10, 2014 re: sentencing (Sporn, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1057 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Schedule. ENDORSEMENT: The Proposed schedule is approved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/27/2014)(ft) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1056 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Daniel Bonventre. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit, # 43 Exhibit, # 44 Exhibit, # 45 Exhibit, # 46 Exhibit, # 47 Exhibit, # 48 Exhibit, # 49 Exhibit, # 50 Exhibit, # 51 Exhibit, # 52 Exhibit, # 53 Exhibit, # 54 Exhibit, # 55 Exhibit, # 56 Exhibit, # 57 Exhibit, # 58 Exhibit, # 59 Exhibit, # 60 Exhibit, # 61 Exhibit, # 62 Exhibit, # 63 Exhibit, # 64 Exhibit, # 65 Exhibit, # 66 Exhibit)(Sporn, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 P, # 2 Q, # 3 R, # 4 S, # 5 T, # 6 U, # 7 V, # 8 W, # 9 X, # 10 Y, # 11 Z, # 12 AA, # 13 BB, # 14 CC, # 15 DD)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1054 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 A, # 2 B, # 3 C, # 4 D, # 5 E, # 6 F, # 7 G, # 8 H, # 9 I, # 10 J, # 11 K, # 12 L, # 13 M, # 14 N, # 15 O)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1053 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-8-14 re: Objections to Final PSR. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1052 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz, John T. Zach, Randall W. Jackson and Paul M. Monteleoni dated 7/2/2014 re: The Government respectfully requests that the defendants be required to identify those common legal issues and submit a single, joint brief on those issues in connection with their sentencing. If the issues are truly common to all defendants and/or raise questions of law, this should not be difficult, and will both promote efficiency for the Court and will allow the Government to adequately prepare for any such conference..ENDORSEMENT: Defense counsel are expected to address common issues jointly in their opposition to the proposed preliminary forfeiture order. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/2/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1051 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
E-MAIL by USA as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Chambers of Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Matthew L. Schwartz dated 07/02/2014 03:51 PM re: Attached is a brief letter in response to Mr. Krantz's letter of yesterday, which requested a conference on the 25th. It was just filed on ECF. We are also in receipt of the letters filed by Mr. Frisch (yesterday) and Mr. Krantz (today) drawing the Court's attention to Judge's recent decision in United States v. Valle. Unless the Court believes it would be helpful, we do not intend to respond to those letters, as the Valle opinion contains no finding of misconduct, and was decided on the unique facts of that case. Similarly, Judge Glasser's opinion in United States v. Santiago, referenced in Mr. Krantz's letter, turns on the unique facts of that case. For the Court's convenience, we attach copies of the two opinions, which were not included with the copies of the letters served on the Government. (bw) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1050 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to George Perez addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 2, 2014 re: Proposed Forfeiture Order and Supporting Declaration Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order as to Perez, # 2 Declaration as to Perez)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated 7/1/14 re: Reschedule Conference. ENDORSEMENT: A conference will be held on July 25, 2014 at 2:15pm in Courtroom 12D ( Status Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 02:15 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/2/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 2, 2014 re: Defense request for a pre-sentencing conference Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-2-14 re: Pending Post-Trial Motions Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-1-14 re: Request for Status Conference Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1045 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 1, 2014 re: Proposed Forfeiture Orders and Supporting Declarations Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order as to Crupi, # 2 Declaration as to Crupi, # 3 Proposed Order as to O'Hara, # 4 Declaration as to O'Hara)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1044 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated July 1, 2014 re: Order in SDNY case relevant to post-trial submissions (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1043 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to George Perez addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated 6/30/2014 re: To request permission to excuse Mr. Perez from his curfew for the dates of July 4,5, and 6, 2014. The reason for this request is that MR. Perez would like to take his family away for the July 4th weekend..ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/1/2014)(jw) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1042 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated June 30, 2014 re: Proposed Forfeiture Orders and Supporting Declarations Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order as to Bonventre, # 2 Declaration as to Bonventre, # 3 Proposed Order as to Bongiorno, # 4 Declaration as to Bongiorno)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated June 30, 2014 re: Proposed Forfeiture Orders and Supporting Declarations . Document filed by USA as to Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order as to Bonventre, # 2 Declaration as to Bonventre, # 3 Proposed Order as to Bongiorno, # 4 Declaration as to Bongiorno)(Monteleoni, Paul) Modified on 7/1/2014 (ka). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER terminating 1033 LETTER MOTION as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5); terminating 1038 LETTER MOTION as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5); terminating 1037 LETTER MOTION as to Daniel Bonventre (3). Probation will issue the Presentence Reports for Defendants Bonventre,Bongiorno, Crupi, O'Hara and Perez by July 2, 2014. The deadlines for the submission of Defendants' sentencing memoranda, which are currently due by July 7, 8, or 9, 2014 (depending on the Defendant), are hereby adjourned to July 9, 10, and 11,2014, respectively. The Government's deadlines for its sentencing submissions are also adjourned to July 16, 17 and 18, 2014. The Government must provide its proposed preliminary orders of forfeiture, alongwith a description of the evidentiary bases for its positions and declarations supporting theGovernment's forfeiture theories, as outlined in the Government's June 25, 2014, letter, fourweeks prior to sentencing (i.e.. June 30, July 1, or July 2, depending on the Defendant).The Defendants responses to the Government's proposed preliminary orders offorfeiture, including any opposition declarations. are hereby due on July 14, 15, or 16, 2014 (depending on the Defendant). The Government's replies will be due on July 18, 19 and 20, 2014. This Order resolves docket entry numbers 1033, 1037 and 1038. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/30/14) (jw) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1039 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 6-29-14 re: Forfeiture briefing schedule Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated June 30, 2014 re: Scheduling of sentencing procedures . Document filed by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Daniel Bonventre dated June 30, 2014 re: Adjustment of Schedule for Sentencing . Document filed by Daniel Bonventre. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Andrew J. Frisch dated June 25, 2014 re: pre-motion conference in related in rem action (Sporn, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Andrew J. Frisch dated June 27, 2014 re: consolidating criminal and civil forfeitures (docketed in civil in rem action) (Sporn, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Response to Motion to Mark Case "Related" to Civil Forfeiture Action, and to "Consolidate" the Two Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture Matters . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1032 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Paul J. Konigsberg. (jm) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1031 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
(S12) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Paul J. Konigsberg (12) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s. (jm) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1030 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Paul J. Konigsberg. Accordingly, the Government is hereby directed to determine what property it will seek to have forfeited and confer promptly with defense counsel to ascertain whether the defense opposes the forfeiture sought. The Government must thereafter provide, no later than two weeks before the scheduled sentencing date, via facsimile to Chambers with a copy served on defense counsel, a proposed preliminary order of forfeiture. If the preliminary order is not on consent, the Government's submission must be accompanied by a description of the evidentiary basis for its forfeiture position and a statement as to whether the parties believe that an evidentiary hearing is warranted pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(1). Defense counsel will have one week following his or her receipt of the Government's letter to respond. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/24/14)(jw) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated June 23, 2014 re: forfeiture proceedings (Sporn, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 6/19/2014 re: To request permission for Mr. O'Hara to travel to New Hampshire with his wife and children and stay with his sister-in-law's family from June 26 until July 3rd..ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/23/14)(jw) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 6/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/22/2014 re: Anticipated Guilty Plea Proceeding Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 979 MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 969 MOTION for Acquittal Under Rule 29. MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 33(a)., 973 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal and Memorandum in Support.FIRST MOTION for New Trial and Memorandum in Support., 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief., 975 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 970 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated April 15, 2014 re: Dismissal of All Counts, and Counts 25-30 pursuant to post trial motion.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit B-1, # 5 Exhibit B-2, # 6 Exhibit B-3, # 7 Exhibit B-4, # 8 Exhibit B-5, # 9 Exhibit B-6, # 10 Exhibit B-7, # 11 Exhibit B-8, # 12 Exhibit B-9, # 13 Exhibit B-10, # 14 Exhibit B-11, # 15 Exhibit B-12, # 16 Exhibit B-13, # 17 Exhibit B-14, # 18 Exhibit B-15, # 19 Exhibit B-16, # 20 Exhibit B-17, # 21 Exhibit B-18, # 22 Exhibit B-19, # 23 Exhibit B-20, # 24 Exhibit B-21, # 25 Exhibit B-22, # 26 Exhibit B-23, # 27 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1025 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Melissa S. Geller dated June 18, 2014 re: Summation Power Point Slides Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Slides Part 1, # 2 Slides Part 2, # 3 Slides Part 3, # 4 Slides Part 4, # 5 Slides Part 5)(Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Amanda L. Bassen dated June 18, 2014 re: Summation Slides (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1023 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 06/18/2014 re: Filing of opening and summation PowerPoint slides (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly Yuhas dated 6/18/14 re: Filing of PowerPoint slides used in jury address Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Reed Brodsky dated 6/16/14 re: We respectfully ask the Court to either reject the Government's request for a Laffler/Frye Inquire, which again we are hearing about for the first time this morning, or proceed with tomorrow's conference and schedule another date in the near future to give us a chance to respond to the request for a Laffler/Frye Inquiry. ENDORSEMENT: The June 17, 2014 conference will go forward as scheduled at 2:30pm, in courtroom 12D. The Government will be expected to explain further the nature and timing of its Laffler/Frye request, and the timing of any appropriate briefing can be addressed. Defense counsel will also be expected to explain the request for sealed treatment of this letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/16/14)(jw) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 6/16/14 re: Slides used in jury addresses (closing slides part 3) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Closing Slides Part 3)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 6/16/14 re: Slides used in jury addresses (closing argument part 2) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Closing Slides Part 2)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 6/16/14 re: Attaching slides used in jury addresses (closing argument part 1) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Closing Slides Part 1)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 6/16/14 re: Filing of Power Point Slides as Directed by the Court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Opening Slides in pdf)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Daniel Bonventre on 1010 Letter, filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: Each party shall file its own slides by June 19, 2014. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/16/2014)(ft) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1015 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Daniel Bonventre re: 688 FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated February 13, 2014 re: Rule 29 Judgment of Acquittal on Counts 4-5 & 20-24., 975 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 719 MOTION for Acquittal. . (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated June 13, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Dismissal of All counts Post trial motions reply. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Jerome O'Hara re 979 MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments A and B)(Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Joann Crupi re: 971 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Joann Crupi, 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by USA on motion for new trial pursuant to Rule 33. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Joann Crupi re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by USA, 972 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Joann Crupi on Motion for Judgment of Acquittal pursuant to Rule 29(c). (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/12/2014 re: Slides Used in the Parties' Jury Addresses Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly Yuhas dated June 11, 2014 re: We write to respectfully request that the Court order the Government to provide to us a copy of the PowerPoint slides used in its rebuttal summation. Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/9/2014 re: The government writes to respectfully request on behalf of both parties that the conference scheduled for this afternoon be rescheduled to Tuesday June 17, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. and for time to be excluded from Speedy Trial Act Calculations. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/9/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/9/2014 re: Adjournment of pre-trial conference . Document filed by USA as to Paul J. Konigsberg. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1006 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief. . (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1005 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 6-5-14 re: Response to Letter from AUSA dated 6-5-14 Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/5/2014 re: Correction to Opposition Brief Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (10-Cr-228-12) Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Reed Brodsky dated May 30, 2014 re: In connection with United States v. Konigsberg, No. 10-CR-00228, Paul Konigsberg moves for a postponement of the pretrial conference from Friday, June 5, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. to Monday, June 9, 2014 after 3 p.m. or Friday, June 13, 2014 at any time. Assistant U.S. Attorney Matthew Schwartz consents to postponement and moves to exclude time under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3161. Mr. Konigsberg does not object to that request. In connection with Securities and Exchange Commission v. Konigsberg, No. 13-CV-06859, Mr. Konigsberg moves to extend his time to respond to the U.S. Attorney's Office's motion to intervene and for a stay of proceedings, see Dkt. No. 6, currently due Monday, June 2, 2014. Mr. Konigsberg requests until Friday, June 27, 2014 to file his response as the parties continue to discuss the matter. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. The conference is adjourned to 6/9/14 at 3:30PM in Courtroom 17C. The Court finds pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(H)(7)(A) that the ends of justice served by an exclusion of the time from today's date through 6/9/14 outweigh the best interests of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial for the reasons stated above. The extension request is granted as well. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/30/2014) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Case 13-CV-6859(LTS), see Doc.#22. ***] (bw) Modified on 6/3/2014 (bw). (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Reed Brodsky dated May 30, 2014 re: Rescheduling of Pretrial Conference (Brodsky, Reed) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Craig Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Barry W. Agulnick dated 5/29/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to request the defendant's conditions of bail be modified to permit him to travel to Detroit, Michigan from June 11, 2014 to June 13, 2014 for business purposes. ENDORSEMENT: Request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/30/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER As to Paul J. Konigsberg. The pretrial conference scheduled for June 6, 2014, is hereby rescheduled to June 5, 2014, at 2:30p.m. in Courtroom 17-C. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/30/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 996 LETTER MOTION Extension of Time to File Reply as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). The requested extensions are granted. No further extensions of this briefly schedule will be granted. The sentencings remain scheduled for the week of July 28, 2014 and submissions must be made in accordance with the undersigned's published sentencing submission procedures in advance of the scheduled sentencing dates. Docket entry #996 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/29/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 5/28/2014 re: 996 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated May 28, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Extension of Time to File Reply .. (Corrected Version) (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 5/28/2014 re: 996 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated May 28, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Extension of Time to File Reply .. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated May 28, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Extension of Time to File Reply . Document filed by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, . Document filed by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 5/28/2014 (ka). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re 975 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief., 979 MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 970 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated April 15, 2014 re: Dismissal of All Counts, and Counts 25-30 pursuant to post trial motion.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 993 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 992 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
Transcripts of pages 8825-8834 for this case. See order docketed as document #989 by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
Transcripts of pages 6872-6879 for this case. See order docketed as document #989 by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Having been informed by the Government that it will not be making any objections and not having received any objections from the Defendants, the Court orders that pages 6872-6879 and 8825-8834 of the transcript from the trial for this case be unsealed and filed on the public docket in accordance with the Court's regular procedures. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/12/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 5/1/2014 re: Defense counsel submits this letter to request that the travel restrictions for the defendant be modified to permit him to travel to two upcoming family weddings. One is May 9th in Spring Lake, NJ, and the other is June 7th. in Princeton, NJ. Both weddings would be single-day trips, so we would also request that Mr. O'Hara's curfew be extended to 14 hours on those dates to insure his safe return home in case of traffic. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Irwin Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Richard P. Galler dated 4/29/2014 re: Counsel submits this letter to inform the court that he is substituting for David Richman regarding Irwin Lipkin. He has advised him that he is ill and due to the nature of his illness, can no longer represent Mr. Lipkin. New counsel is requesting a 90 day adjournment of the defendant's sentencing for the reasons stated in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. Sentencing is adjourned to September 12, 2014 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Irwin Lipkin. David M. Richman is relieved as retained counsel for the defendant. The defendant in the above captioned matter is now represented by retained counsel, Richard P. Galler. No conference is required at this time. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 985 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to George Perez addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly A. Yuhas dated 4/29/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to request a modification in Mr. Perez's bail status to permit him to travel with his family to Hershey, Pennsylvania from June 13-15, 2014, for his daughter's soccer tournament. ENDORSEMENT: Request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Craig Kugel addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Barry W. Agulnick dated 4/22/2014 re: Defense counsel writes on behalf of the defendant to request that the Court modify his client's bail conditions to permit him to travel with his family to Hershey, Pennsylvania from May 16 - May 18, 2014.ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/23/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Paul J. Konigsberg. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/28/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Paul J. Konigsberg re: Conference held on 3/28/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2014. (Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Daniel Bonventre addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 4/16/2014 re: The Government writes to respectfully request that the Court approve the following briefing schedule. With the consent of all defense counsel, the Government requests that it be permitted to respond to the defendants' Rule 29 and Rule 33 motions by May 16, 2014, with replies by the defendants to be submitted by May 30, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/16/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support by Jerome O'Hara re 979 MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial.. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Acquittal., FIRST MOTION for New Trial. Document filed by Jerome O'Hara. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 4/16/2014 re: Rule 29 and 33 proposed briefing schedule Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief.. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support by Daniel Bonventre re 975 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 719 MOTION for Acquittal.. (Sporn, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal., FIRST MOTION for New Trial. Document filed by Daniel Bonventre. (Sporn, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for New Trial and other relief. Document filed by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Krantz, Larry) Modified on 4/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal and Memorandum in Support., FIRST MOTION for New Trial and Memorandum in Support. Document filed by Daniel Bonventre. (Sporn, Jeremy) Modified on 4/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi Motion for Judgment of Acquittal on All Counts Pursuant to Rule 29(c). (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated April 15, 2014 re: Dismissal of All Counts, and Counts 25-30 pursuant to post trial motion. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of 2/11/2014, # 2 Exhibit Letter of 2/16/14)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Acquittal Under Rule 29., MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 33(a). Document filed by Jerome O'Hara. (Mehler, Gordon) Modified on 4/16/2014 (ka). Modified on 4/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 968 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Eric S. Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James K. Filan dated 4/11/2014 re: To request a bail modification that would permit Mr. Lipkin to travel with his wife and children by automobile from NJ through Pennsylvania to Niagara Falls from April 15, 2014 until April 19, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/11/2014)(jw) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 966 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 965 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to George Perez addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated 4/10/14 re: We represent defendant George Perez in the above matter, and write on behalf of all defense counsel. All post-trial motions are currently due to be filed on April 14, 2014. Due to some scheduling issues, we write to request a one-day extension of this deadline, to April 15, 2014. This extension is permissible pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(b)(1)(A), as the request has been made "before the originally prescribed or previously extended time expires.ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/10/14)(jw) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated 4/8/2014 re: To request a modification in Ms. Crupi's bail status to permit her to travel with family from August 14, 2014 to August 23, 2014 to Vinalhaven, Maine...ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted, subject to the Court's discretion to remand the defendant prior to the vacation dates. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/10/2014)(jw) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 4-10-14 re: Extension of Post-Trial Motion Deadline Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 961 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 960 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/24/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/24/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/21/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/21/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/20/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/20/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/19/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/19/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/18/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/18/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/17/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/17/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/14/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/14/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/13/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/13/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/12/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/12/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/11/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/11/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/10/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/10/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/6/14 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/6/14 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/6/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/6/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/5/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/5/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/4/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/4/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/3/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/3/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/27/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/27/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/25/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/25/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/24/14 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/24/14 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/20/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/24/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/20/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/20/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/19/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/19/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/18/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/18/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/11/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/11/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 3,157 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?