USA v. Zendejas et al
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:08-cr-00524-RMW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 4:08 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chad Michael Mandell +1 408 535 5059 chad.mandell@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Jazmin Marie Rosel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by G BRIAN SPEARS PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Ferrito +1 408 354 6655 +1 408 354 6585 ferritolaw@mindspring.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Jose
Filed 8/6/2008
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
508-mj-70450-HRL
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
18371 - Conspiracy
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a)and (d), and 2 - Armed Bank Robbery, Aiding and Abetting
Def Custody Status Released
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Indictment
INDICTMENT as to Jesus Cortez-Zendejas (1) count(s) 1, 2, Jazmin Marie Rosel (2) count(s) 1, 2. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Case Referred to ECF
    CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing.
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull:Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment NOT held on 8/4/2008; Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment rescheduled for 9/8/2008 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull. (Court Reporter FTR.)(cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008)[5:08-mj-70450-HRL]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
        NO Bail Warrant Returned Executed on 7/23/08 as to Jazmin Marie Rosel. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/31/2008)[5:08-mj-70450-HRL]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Bond HearingCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull: Surety Signing as to Jazmin Marie Rosel held on 7/29/2008 (Court Reporter FTR.)(cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2008)[5:08-mj-70450-HRL]
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
            CJA 20 as to Jazmin Marie Rosel: Appointment of Attorney Thomas J. Ferrito for Jazmin Marie Rosel. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/22/08. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/29/2008)[5:08-mj-70450-HRL]
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jazmin Marie Rosel (2) 100,000 PR BOND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/28/08.(cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2008) Modified on 7/30/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).[5:08-mj-70450-HRL]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull:Detention Hearing as to Jazmin Marie Rosel held on 7/28/2008 Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment set for 8/4/2008 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull. Bond Hearing set for 7/29/2008 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2008)[5:08-mj-70450-HRL]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 ID of Counsel HearingCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:I.D. of Counsel Hearing; attorney Thomas J. Ferrito present for Jazmin Marie Rosel as to Jazmin Marie Rosel held on 7/22/2008. Detention Hearing set for 7/28/2008 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/22/2008)[5:08-mj-70450-HRL]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Initial Appearance NO ATTY present as to Jazmin Marie Rosel held on 7/21/2008, CJA23 Submitted as to Jazmin Marie Rosel. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 7/22/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/21/2008)[5:08-mj-70450-HRL]
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT as to Jesus Cortez Zendejas (1), Jazmin Marie Rosel (2). (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/16/2008)[5:08-mj-70450-HRL]
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                        CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. [5:08-mj-70450-HRL]
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 120 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?