Marcel v. United States of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-04404-RRM-VVP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 3:40 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Daniel Marcel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniel Marcel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Marcel +1 718 915 6406
v.
No Logo Administration for Children's Services for the City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Mark Cuomo, Defendant
No Logo Cheryl Ashby, Defendant
No Logo Christ Rector, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Delano Connolly, Defendant
No Logo Erica Barbi, Defendant
No Logo Erwin Godette, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Family Court Of The State Of New York, Defendant
No Logo Gilbert Taylor, Defendant
No Logo Gladys Carrion, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Judge Daniel Turbow, Defendant
No Logo Ian Fields, Defendant
No Logo Jaclyn Piepra, Defendant
No Logo Jamie Albert, Defendant
No Logo Jared Mare Berliner, Defendant
No Logo Jeremiah James Quinlan, Defendant
No Logo Jessica Echeandia, Defendant
No Logo Jodi Karsch, Defendant
No Logo John and/or Jane Doe #1-90, Defendant
No Logo John B. Mattingly, Defendant
No Logo Liyan Bao, Defendant
No Logo Madelle Amaro, Defendant
No Logo Marangely Orihuela-Jones, Defendant
No Logo Margaret Becker, Defendant
No Logo Margarita Roldan, Defendant
No Logo Mary Corys, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo New York Foundling Hospital, Defendant
No Logo Nyialah Hikeem, Defendant
No Logo Office of Children and Family Services for the State of New York, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Harvey, Defendant
No Logo Renita Marshall, Defendant
No Logo Sammie Speed, Defendant
No Logo Shakia Brown, Defendant
No Logo Spohngellert Leine, Defendant
No Logo State of New York, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
No Logo Vanetta Williams, Defendant
No Logo William Baccaglini, Defendant
No Logo Zenola Powell, II, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA as to 9 Notice of Appeal, filed by Daniel Marcel. It is Ordered that the appeal is dismissed effective 3/1/13 for failure to either pay the fee in full or move for IFP. Issued as Mandate: 4/03/13. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 10 Motion to Alter Judgment for the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 12/27/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 10 Motion to Alter Judgment for the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 12/27/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2012, Entered: None
        MOTION to Alter Judgment or Amending a Judgment and Relief from a Judgment or Order (Reconsider Application), filed by Daniel Marcel. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/8/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEAL AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME as to 7 Judgment,,, 6 Order Dismissing Case by Daniel Marcel. No fee paid. IFP denied for purposes of appeal. Although timely, Deft files a motion for extension of time. See paragraph 75 and 76 in text of document. Please note: This Notice of Appeal and Motion for Extension of Time are combined with the Motion for Reconsideration - Document #8. Therefore, the same document has been scanned for both entries. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 12/11/2012) (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/8/2012, Entered: None
            MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Judgment,,, 6 Order Dismissing Case,, by Daniel Marcel. Please note: This Motion for Reconsideration is combined with Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal and Motion for Extension of Time. The same document has been scanned for both entries. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              JUDGMENT in favor of Administration for Children's Services for the City of New York, City of New York, Family Court of the State of New York, John and/or Jane Doe #1-90, New York Foundling Hospital, Office of Children and Family Services for t he State of New York, State of New York, United States of America, Andrew Mark Cuomo, Cheryl Ashby, Christ Rector, Daniel Turbow, Delano Connolly, Erica Barbi, Erwin Godette, Jr, Gilbert Taylor, Gladys Carrion, Ian Fields, Jaclyn Piepra, Jamie Albert , Jared Mare Berliner, Jeremiah James Quinlan, Jessica Echeandia, Jodi Karsch, John B. Mattingly, Liyan Bao, Madelle Amaro, Marangely Orihuela-Jones, Margaret Becker, Margarita Roldan, Mary Corys, Michael Bloomberg, Nyialah Hikeem, Patricia Harvey, Renita Marshall, Sammie Speed, Shakia Brown, Spohngellert Leine, Vanetta Williams, William Baccaglini, Zenola Powell, II against Daniel Marcel. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/8/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                JUDGMENT in favor of Administration for Children's Services for the City of New York, City of New York, Family Court of the State of New York, John and/or Jane Doe #1-90, New York Foundling Hospital, Office of Children and Family Services for the State of New York, State of New York, United States of America, Andrew Mark Cuomo, Cheryl Ashby, Christ Rector, Daniel Turbow, Delano Connolly, Erica Barbi, Erwin Godette, Jr, Gilbert Taylor, Gladys Carrion, Ian Fields, Jaclyn Piepra, Jamie Albert, Jared Mare Berliner, Jeremiah James Quinlan, Jessica Echeandia, Jodi Karsch, John B. Mattingly, Liyan Bao, Madelle Amaro, Marangely Orihuela-Jones, Margaret Becker, Margarita Roldan, Mary Corys, Michael Bloomberg, Nyialah Hikeem, Patricia Harvey, Renita Marshall, Sammie Speed, Shakia Brown, Spohngellert Leine, Vanetta Williams, William Baccaglini, Zenola Powell, II against Daniel Marcel. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/8/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER DISMISSING CASE: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Amended Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs state law claims. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order and the accompanying Judgment to the plaintiff, and note the mailing on the docket. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/8/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT (w/ Jury Trial Demanded) against Administration for Children's Services for the City of New York, Jamie Albert, Madelle Amaro, Cheryl Ashby, William Baccaglini, Liyan Bao, Erica Barbi, Margaret Becker, Jared Mare Berliner, Michael Bloomberg, Shakia Brown, Gladys Carrion, City of New York, Delano Connolly, Mary Corys, Andrew Mark Cuomo, Jessica Echeandia, Family Court of the State of New York, Erwin Godette, Jr, Patricia Harvey, Nyialah Hikeem, John and/or Jane Doe #1-90, Jodi Karsch, Spohngellert Leine, John B. Mattingly, New York Foundling Hospital, Office of Children and Family Services for the State of New York, Marangely Orihuela-Jones, Jaclyn Piepra, Zenola Powell, II, Jeremiah James Quinlan, Christ Rector, Margarita Roldan, State of New York, Gilbert Taylor, United States of America, Vanetta Williams, Ian Fields, Renita Marshall, Sammie Speed, filed by Daniel Marcel, Ian Fields, Renita Marshall, Sammie Speed. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, plaintiff's claims purportedly brought on behalf of his children are dismissed without prejudice. To the extent plaintiff seeks declaratory and injunctive relief, the Court must abstain from adjudicating plaintiffs claims challenging the ongoing state court proceedings. However, to the extent plaintiff seeks to allege a claim under 42 U.S.C. §§ 1983, 1985 and/or 1986 seeking damages, in light of this Courts duty to liberally construe pro se complaints, plaintiff is given 30 days leave to file an amended complaint. No summons shall issue at this time and all further proceedings shall be stayed for 30 days. If plaintiff fails to amend his complaint within 30 days as directed by this order, the Court shall dismiss this complaint and judgment will enter. If filed, the amended complaint will be reviewed for compliance with this Order and for sufficiency under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the plaintiff, and note the mailing on the docket. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 9/12/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                        In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Marcel. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, plaintiff's claims purportedly brought on behalf of his children are dismissed without prejudice. To the extent plaintiff seeks declaratory and injunctive re lief, the Court must abstain from adjudicating plaintiffs claims challenging the ongoing state court proceedings. However, to the extent plaintiff seeks to allege a claim under 42 U.S.C. §§ 1983, 1985 and/or 1986 seeking damages, in light of this Courts duty to liberally construe pro se complaints, plaintiff is given 30 days leave to file an amended complaint. No summons shall issue at this time and all further proceedings shall be stayed for 30 days. If plaintiff fails to amend his complaint within 30 days as directed by this order, the Court shall dismiss this complaint and judgment will enter. If filed, the amended complaint will be reviewed for compliance with this Order and for sufficiency under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2 )(B). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the plaintiff, and note the mailing on the docket. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 9/12/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Marcel. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?