Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.
Page 1 Page 2
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
1543 |
Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None |
Letter |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1539 |
Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None |
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1520 |
Filed: 12/22/2018, Entered: None |
Release from Custody |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1437 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1435 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1431 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1427 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 11/10/2015 re: Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1426 |
Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1425 LETTER MOTION filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara (1), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Jonathan Cohen dated 09-23-15 re: Adjournment. An appearance in the above-referenced set of cases is scheduled for 4:30 p.m. on Thursday, October 1, 2015. We write to respectfully request, on the consent of counsel, adjournment of that appearance until Thursday, November 12, 2015, at 4:00 p.m., which has been provided to us by Deputy Ng as a date and time convenient to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: The requested adjournment is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/24/2015) [*** NOTE: Also for Civil Cases: 09-Cv-9455(LTS)(GWG), 10-Cv-4858(LTS)(JCF). ***] (bw) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1425 |
Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 09-23-15 re: Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1422 |
Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1418 |
Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1417 LETTER MOTION Reschedule Conference as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi...ENDORSEMENT... IT IS ORDERED, that the conference previously scheduled in this matter for September 24, 2015 at 4:30pm is adjourned to October 1, 2015 at 4:30pm. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/20/2015) (jw) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1417 |
Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated August 12, 2015 re: Adjournment of September 24, 2015 Conference . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1401 |
Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 7/17/15 re: Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1399 |
Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Niketh Varadaraj Velamoor appearing for USA. (Velamoor, Niketh) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1381 |
Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg dated 12/18/2013 re: Federal Bureau of Investigation. (jw) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1377 |
Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Andrea Michelle Griswold appearing for USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1371 |
Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1370 |
Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1363 |
Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated June 15, 2015 re: Request to Unseal FBI Interview Report . Document filed by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1361 |
Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1360 |
Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1359 |
Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1355 |
Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno on re: 1350 Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to July 23, 2015, at 4:45 PM. This resolves DE# 105 in 10 CV 4858, DE# 1350 in 10CR228 and DE #26 in 09cv9455. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/3/2015)(ft) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1350 |
Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 28, 2015 re: Adjournment of Forfeiture Conference Document filed by USA. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1320 |
Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated April 20, 2015 re: Adjourn Conference . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1314 |
Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, upon application of counsel for defendant Jerome O'Hara, that Mr. O'Hara's bond issued November 13, 2009, is hereby exonerated and released, including the obligors on the personal recognizance bond ("PRB") as well as the property posted as security, which conditions were imposed to secure Mr. O'Hara's pretrial release. It is further ordered that Pretrial Services or any other agency that has custody of Mr. O'Hara's passport return it to Mr. O'Hara's wife, Bernadette O'Hara, or to his counsel. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/1/2015)(jw) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1300 |
Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10 10 Cr. 228-) Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSAs Paul M. Monteleoni, Jonathan Cohen dated March 2, 2015 re: United States v. Daniel Bon ventre, et al. No. S10 10 Cr. 228 (LTS); United States v. All Right, Title & Interest in the Real Property and Appurtenances Located at 167 Legion Place, et al. No. 09 Civ. 9455(LTS)(GWG); United States v. Joann Crupi, et al. No. 10 Civ. 4857(LTS)(GWG); United States v. All Funds on Deposit in Account Nos. 94660869, 9948199297, 8007487, 9115606297, 9116151903 and 9931127481 in the Names of Annette Bongiorno and/or Rudy Bongiorno, et al. No. 10 Civ. 4858(LTS)(JCF). We write to respectfully request that the March 4, 2015 conference scheduled in the criminal case and the above-referenced civil forfeiture actions be adjourned for 45 days to allow the parties to attempt to consensually resolve or narrow the procedural and substantive issues involved in these cases. Counsel for all of the defendants and claimants except for Daniel Bonventre consent to this request. ENDORSEMENT: The general conference is adjourned to April 23, 2015, at 2:00 pm. A joint status report must be filed by April 20, 2015. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/3/2015) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Cases 09CV9455, doc.#23; 10CV4857, doc.#42; 10CV4858, doc.#101. ***] (bw) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1295 |
Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated March 2, 2015 re: 1282 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, re: Adjournment of Forfeiture Conference . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1293 |
Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1290 LETTER MOTION to make an application on defendant Annette Bongiorno for permission to turn in her ankle bracelet on February 27, so that, on February 28, she can begin her travel to Coleman, Florida, where she will be surrendering to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons on or before March 5 as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5)...ENDORSEMENT...IT IS ORDERED that the defendant Annette Bongiorno return her ankle bracelet to the Pretrial Services Agency on February 27, 2015, and begin her travel to Coleman, Florida on February 28, 2015. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/19/15) (jw) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1290 |
Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/19/2015 re: Permission to turn in ankle bracelet on February 27 . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1280 |
Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated February 13, 2015 re: Scheduling of Forfeiture Conference Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1278 |
Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
Sentencing Letter by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/2015 re: Adjournment of Surrender Date. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1277 |
Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-01) Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Gordon Mehler dated February 2, 2015 re: I write to request permission for Mr. O'Hara and his family to travel to Lake Harmony, PA for a trip with 20 other families from February 15 until February 19. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/2/2015)(bw) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1274 |
Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1272 |
Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 1/28/2015 re: Striking document #1270. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/29/2015)(ft) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1270 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1268 |
Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-) Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSAs Paul M. Monteleoni, Jonathan Cohen dated January 17, 2015 re: We write with the consent of defense counsel to respectfully request that the January 26, 2015 conference scheduled in the above-referenced civil forfeiture actions, see No. 09 Civ. 9455(LTS)(GWG) (ECF No. 15), No. 10 Civ. 4857(LTS)(GWG) (ECF No. 35); No. 10 Civ. 4858(LTS)(JCF) (ECF No. 93), be adjourned for 30 days to allow the parties to attempt to consensually resolve or narrow the procedural and substantive issues involved in these cases. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. the conference is adjourned to February 26, 2015, at 4:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is requeseted to docket this endorsed order in each of the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/20/2015)(bw); [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Cases: 09-cv-9455(LTS)(GWG), doc.#17; 10-cv-4857(LTS)(GWG), doc.#37; 10-cv-4858(LTS)(JCF), doc.#96. ***] Modified on 1/21/2015 (bw). (Entered: 01/20/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1267 |
Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jonathan Ephraim Weis Cohen appearing for USA. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/19/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1266 |
Filed: 1/17/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated January 17, 2015 re: Timing of Conference on Forfeiture Issues Document filed by USA. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 01/17/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1265 |
Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Matthew Abramowicz appearing for USA. (Abramowicz, David) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1261 |
Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 1/14/2015 re: Related Cases Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1250 |
Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to Jerome O'Hara from 1232 Judgment. (nd) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1246 |
Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1244 |
Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jerome O'Hara No transcript ordered. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1242 |
Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
LETTER addressed to Mr. Cahill from Laura Taylor Swain dated 12/23/14 re: I have received your letter concerning the sentences of the former Madoff Securities employees. My reasons for imposing each sentence were laid out specifically and at great length on the record of each public sentencing hearing, each of which was more than two hours long. The transcripts of those hearings will be posted on the public docket in accordance with Judicial Conference policy (jw) Modified on 1/21/2015 (lan). (Entered: 12/30/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1238 |
Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jerome O'Hara from 1217 Order, 1232 Judgment. [NOA filed by CJA appointed counsel on behalf of the defendant]. (nd) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1237 |
Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 12/9/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1236 |
Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1235 |
Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 12/9/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1234 |
Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Sentence held on 12/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1232 |
Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
JUDGMENT as to Jerome O'Hara (1), Count(s) 1, 12sss-13sss, 1s, 1ss, 1sss, 2, 2s, 2sss, 3, 3s, 3ss, 4ss, 6sss-7sss, 9sss-10sss, Dismissed; Count(s) 10ssss, 12ssss, 13ssss, 1ssss, 2ssss, 6ssss, 7ssss, 9ssss, Imprisonment: 30 Months; Supervised Release: 3 Years. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: that the defendant be designated to the FCI Lewisburg Satellite Camp, in Pennsylvania in order to facilitate the maintenance of family ties. The Court recommends to the BOP that the defendant be afforded an opportunity to participate in the BOP's Residential Drug Abuse Treatment Program (RDAP) for his documented alcohol issues. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons:before 2 p.m. on February 23, 2015. The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. The defendant is to pay an assessment fee of $800.00 due immediately. (dnd) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1230 |
Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1228 |
Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS CONSIDERED IN CONNECTION WITH SENTENCINGS OF ABOVE-CAPTIONED DEFENDANTS as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The attached Schedule A Revised lists all of the submissions that were considered in connection with the December 8, 9, 10 and 15, 2014, sentencings of the above-captioned Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/18/2014)(ft) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1222 |
Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 12/16/2014 re: modify bail limits . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1221 |
Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1220 |
Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1217 |
Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY/MONEY JUDGMENT as to Jerome O'Hara. For the reasons as set forth in this Order; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One, Two, Six, Seven, Nineand Ten of the Indictment of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of $19,707,987,337.00 in United States currency (the ""Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant, for which he shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against his co-defendants in this case... The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit One St.Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/9/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1212 |
Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 12/6/14 re: We write pursuant to the Court's order, Docket #1206, concerning the submissions the Court has considered in connection with Mr. O'Hara's upcoming sentencing. A review of Schedule A attached to the Court's order confirms that the Court has considered each of our six post-trial submissions. We did not see any specific mention of the more than 100 letters submitted as a separate bound volume in connection with Mr. O'Hara's sentencing memorandum, but trust that the Court has, in fact, reviewed those letters...ENDORSEMENT: The volume was labeled Exhibit C and is referred to as such in schedule A. It has been reviewed. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/7/14)(jw) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1211 |
Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated December 5, 2014 Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1207 |
Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 12/4/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to request that the defendant's conditions of bond concerning travel and daily curfew be modified to permit him to undergo a second sleep study. I write to request permission for Mr. O'Hara to undergo a sleep study on the night of December 11, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: The modification request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/4/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1206 |
Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS CONSIDERED IN CONNECTION WITH SENTENCINGS OF ABOVE-CAPTIONED DEFENDANTS as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In connection with the sentencings scheduled for December 8, 9, 10 and 15, 2014, the Court has reviewed the Presentence Investigation Reports and the submissions listed on the attached Schedule A. All Defendants' submissions are included here because each of the Defendants has joined some or all of their co-Defendants' arguments. Briefs filed in connection with Defendants' post-trial motions are included because several parties have cross-referenced their earlier submissions. Counsel are requested to inform the Court promptly of any omissions or necessary corrections. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1202 |
Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated December 2, 2014 re: Further update regarding responses to the Court's July 30 Order Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1201 |
Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 26, 2014 re: Update regarding responses to the Court's July 30 Order Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1200 |
Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1197 |
Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/27/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1196 |
Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Conference held on 10/27/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1193 |
Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated November 10, 2014 re 1038 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated June 30, 2014 re: Scheduling of sentencing procedures .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email correspondence)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1192 |
Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated November 10, 2014 re: Resopnse to the November 3, 2014 submission by the government Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Transcript, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of GX 105c-46)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1189 |
Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 4, 2014 re: Memoranda of defendants' proffer statements Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1188 |
Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The Government is hereby directed to provide this Court with copies of all memoranda from the proffer sessions of Defendants Annette Bongiorno and Joann Crupi. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/5/14)(jw) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1185 |
Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER in regards to defendants Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Judge Swain has requested that I remind you that all objections and requests to the Court are to be made by letter motion filed on ECF (with a courtesy copy to chambers), rather than by email. Going forward, please follow this procedure. (jw) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1184 |
Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated November 4, 2014 re: Government's Letter of November 3, 2014 Document filed by Daniel Bonventre. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1183 |
Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated November 4, 2014 re: Government's filing as of November 3, 2014 Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1182 |
Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 3, 2014 re: Response to Questions from the October 27, 2014 Hearing Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibits E-H, # 3 Revised Proposed Orders of Forfeiture)(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1181 |
Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1180 |
Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The continued sentencing hearings in the above-captioned case are adjourned to the following dates: for Daniel Bonventre, on Monday, December 8, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for Annette Bongiorno, on Tuesday, December 9, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for Jerome O'Hara, on Tuesday, December 9, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for George Perez, on Wednesday, December 10, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for Joann Crupi, on Monday, December 15, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/28/2014)(ft) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1178 |
Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 10/20/2014 re: We write, on behalf of all parties, pursuant to the Court's October 2, 2014 Order, which notified the parties that the Court will hear oral argument regarding all forfeiture issues on October 27, 2014. Mindful of the Court's urging that the parties "avoid making repetitive or cumulative arguments,'' the defendants respectfully request oral argument time as follows... ENDORSEMENT: The requested time allotments are approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/20/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1176 |
Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
JOINT LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated October 20, 2014 re: Requests for Oral Argument Time Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1175 |
Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland Riopelle dated 10/15/14 re: Bail Modification Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1174 |
Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 10/14/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to request that the defendant's travel restrictions be modified to permit him to undergo a medical sleep study on the night of October 20th. which was prescribed by his doctor. ENDORSEMENT: The requested modification is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/14/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1173 |
Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
Sentencing Letter by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated October 10, 2014 re: Response to Defendants' Further Submissions on Forfeiture. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1172 |
Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly A. Yuhas dated October 8, 2014 re: Provision of email chain between our firm and Mr. Madoff referred to in our Supplemental Submission Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1170 |
Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Larry H. Krantz by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Second Declaration on Behalf of George Perez and Jerome O'Hara Constituting Second Supplemental Submission on Forfeiture, Foreseeable Loss and Other Sentencing Issues (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1167 |
Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Larry H. Krantz by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Declaration on behalf of George Perez and Jerome O'Hara Constituting Our Supplemental Submission on Forfeiture, Foreseeable Loss and Other Sentencing Issues (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1166 |
Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The Court has received four letters from the parties: a joint letter from all Defendants in response to this Court's September 18 and 22, 2014, Orders (docket entry no. 1156), the Government's reply to the Defendant's joint letter (docket entry no. 1157), a second joint letter from all Defendants in response to the Government's reply (docket entry no. 1160), and a letter from Andrew Frisch, counsel for Daniel Bonventre, expressing his intent not to offer live testimony at any forfeiture hearing (docket entry no. 1162). The Court has carefully considered each of these letters, and orders the following: Any further documentary submissions that Defendants intend to make regarding forfeiture are due by October 6, 2014. Any further documentary submissions that the Government intends to make regarding forfeiture are due by October 10, 2014. The Court will hear oral argument regarding all forfeiture issues on October 27, 2014, at 9:30a.m. By October 20, 2014, the Government and all Defendants must file a joint letter delineating the time each requests to be allotted for oral argument. Defendants are urged to avoid making repetitive or cumulative arguments. Sentencings for the Defendants are rescheduled as follows: The sentencing of Daniel Bonventre will be held on Monday, November 10, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. The sentencing of Annette Bongiorno will be held on Monday, November 10, 2014, at 2:00p.m. The sentencing of Joann Crupi will be held on Wednesday, November 12, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. The sentencing of Jerome O'Hara will be held on Wednesday, November 12, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. The sentencing of George Perez will be held on Thursday, November 13, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/2/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1165 |
Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated October 6, 2014 re: Proposed forfeiture orders and upcoming hearing Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1163 |
Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated October 1, 2014 re: Proposed Forfeiture Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1160 |
Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 9-29-14 re: Scheduling Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1157 |
Filed: 9/28/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
Sentencing Letter by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated September 28, 2014 re: Schedule for Sentencing Proceedings / Response to September 18 & 22 Orders. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1156 |
Filed: 9/28/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 09/28/2014 re: Scheduling For Upcoming Forfeiture and Sentencing Proceedings (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 09/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1154 |
Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi The Government's Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Connection with Sentencing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C (Revised Crupi Preliminary Order of Forfeiture))(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1153 |
Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C (Revised Crupi Preliminary Order of Forfeiture))(Schwartz, Matthew) Modified on 9/25/2014 (ka). (Entered: 09/24/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1152 |
Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). The Court has received three letters from the parties- a joint letter from all Defendants in response to this Court's September 18, 2014, Order (docket entry no. 1149), the Government's reply to the Defendant's joint letter (docket entry no. 1150), and a letter from counsel for Daniel Bonventre, Andrew Frisch, alerting the Court to his upcoming travel plans (via e-mail). The Court has carefully considered each of these letters, and orders the following: The Defendants' request for an opportunity to argue the issue of whether the Government has made a prima facie case for forfeiture is hereby denied. As the Government points out, this issue was addressed and decided by the Court at the July 29, 2014, hearing. (See July 29, 2014, Tr. at 48.) In light of the Defendants' request to consider the Government's reply submissions regarding forfeiture, as well as Mr. Frisch's travel plans, the due date for submission ofthe parties' joint statement regarding witnesses and time required for forfeiture hearings is hereby extended to Monday, September 29, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. No forfeiture hearings will be held that week, in light of Mr. Frisch's unavailability. The Court will set a new hearing date following review of the Defendants' joint statement. The Government's request for an extension of time to file its reply papers regarding forfeiture is denied. The sentencing control dates for Defendants Bonventre, Bongiorno, Crupi, O'Hara and Perez are hereby adjourned pending further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/22/2014)(bw) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1151 |
Filed: 9/21/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R Breslin dated September 21, 2014 re: Hearing and disclosure dates Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1150 |
Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated September 19, 2014 re: Opposition to defendants' letter motion for reconsideration Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1149 |
Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 9-19-14 re: Request for Oral Argument Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1147 |
Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In their responses to the Government's supplemental forfeiture submissions, each of the Defendants has expressed, at least conditionally, a request for a hearing, and two of the Defendants have made supplemental testimonial proffers. The court will hold any necessary hearings, and entertain oral arguments regarding forfeiture, during the week of September 29, 2014, on the days that were provisionally set aside for sentencings. The following time periods are available: Monday, September 29,2014, from 10:00 a.m. to 1:00 p.m. and 2:00p.m. to 4:30 p.m. Tuesday, September 30, 2014, from 2:00p.m. to 4:30p.m..Wednesday, October 1, 2014, from 10:00 a.m. to 12:30 p.m. and 2:00p.m. to4:30p.m. The parties are directed to consult with each other as to which witnesses will be tendered for direct or cross-examination, and the time required for oral argument. A joint letter identifying the witnesses and proposing a schedule must be filed, with a courtesy copy to Chambers, by September 24, 2014 at 3:00p.m. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/18/14)(jw) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1142 |
Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1141 |
Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Jerome O'Hara re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1140 |
Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Eric R. Breslin in Support by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1138 Memorandum of Law in Opposition,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
1138 |
Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bowen Affidavit)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1133 |
Filed: 9/13/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Jerome O'Hara re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Mehler, Gordon) Modified on 9/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 09/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1131 |
Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - DECLARATION of Roland G Riopelle in Opposition by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1033 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture Matters .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Riopelle, Roland) Modified on 9/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 09/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1130 |
Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1079 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated July 17, 2014 re: 1033 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture. (Riopelle, Roland) Modified on 9/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 09/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1128 |
Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Yuhas, Kimberly) Modified on 9/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 09/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1126 |
Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1124 |
Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi Supplemental Memorandum of Law re Sentencing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (part 2), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1123 |
Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 8/19/2014 re: Counsel for the defendant writes to request that the defendant's conditions concerning travel and curfew be modified to permit him to pick his daughter and two of her friends up from Camp Pontiac on Friday, August 22. Mr. O'Hara requires the Court's permission because the camp is just north of the limits of the Southe111 District in Copake, New York. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's request to travel outside of the Southern/Eastern Districts of New York on August 22, 2014 is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/19/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1121 |
Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 7/29/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1120 |
Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Conference held on 7/29/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1115 |
Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus brief regarding sentencing. Document filed by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1114 |
Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-29-14 re: Response to Government's letter dated 7-28-14 Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1113 |
Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Any victim of the Madoff Securities fraud who wishes to speak at the sentencing of Defendant Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, JoAnn Crupi, Jerome O'Hara and/or George Perez, is hereby directed to so notify the United States Attorney's Office Victim Coordinator for the Southern District of New York, by Wednesday, September 17, 2014, either by email to usanys.madoff@usdoj.gov or by regular mail addressed to the United States Attorney's Office Attn: U.S. v. Bonventre, Victim Statements, 1 Saint Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York 10007. A separate sentencing hearing will be held for each of the five Defendants. Up to ten victims will be permitted to speak for a maximum of three minutes at each of the sentencing hearings. The speakers will be selected by the victim coordinator and assigned at random to a sentencing unless they claim to have had personal interactions with one or more of the individual Defendants. Each victim may speak at only one of the sentencings. Each victim who makes a request to speak in response to this order will be notified of the date and time of the sentencing at which he or she will be invited to speak, after the sentencing hearing dates have been finalized. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/30/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1112 |
Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 7/24/14 re: We request permission to redact the photos of Mr. O'Hara's family.ENDORSEMENT: The redaction of the photographs is approved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/29/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1111 |
Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 28, 2014 re: Agenda for Pre-Sentencing Hearing Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1110 |
Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 25, 2014 re: Pursuant to the Court's direction, the parties have conferred about possible new sentencing dates. All parties are available at any time on September 29 and 30, and October 1 and 2, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing hearings are rescheduled as follows: Mr. Bonventre - September 29, 2014, at 10:00 AM. Ms. Bongiorno - September 29, 2014, at 2:00 PM. Ms. Crupi - September 30, 2014, at 2:00 PM. Mr. O'Hara - October 1, 2014, at 10:00 AM. Mr. Perez - October 1, 2014, at 2:00 PM SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/28/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1109 |
Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/17/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1108 |
Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/17/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1107 |
Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/16/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1106 |
Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/16/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1105 |
Filed: 7/26/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Jerome O'Hara. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 07/26/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1102 |
Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 25, 2014 re: Sentencing Dates Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1101 |
Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1100 |
Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
Sentencing Letter by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Swain from Roland Riopelle dated 7/25/14 re: Supplemental Sentencing Submission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's Letter)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1097 |
Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BOP Regs, # 2 Exhibit NYT Article, # 3 Exhibit Defense Power Point Excerpt, # 4 Exhibit Defense Power Point Excerpt, # 5 Exhibit Ponzitracker list)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1096 |
Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated July 25, 2014 re: Common issues for July 29 conference Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1095 |
Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
OPINION AND ORDER: as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). After a more than five month trial, thirty-one counts of the above-captioned Superseding Indictment were submitted to the jury, and Defendants Daniel Bonventre ("Bonventre"), Annette Bongiorno ("Bongiorno"), Jo Ann Crupi ("Crupi"), Jerome O'Hara("O'Hara") and George Perez ("Perez," collectively, "Defendants") were convicted of each of the crimes which with they were charged. The charges included: conspiracy to defraud investment advisory clients and conspiracy to commit securities fraud; conspiracy to engage in accounting fraud and to defraud banks; conspiracy to commit tax fraud; securities fraud; falsifying the records of a broker-dealer; falsifying the records of an investment adviser; causing a false and misleading filing to be made with the Securities and Exchange Commission ("SEC"); bank fraud; making and subscribing to false income tax returns; corruptly obstructing the lawful administration of the internal revenue laws; and tax evasion. Fewer than all of the Defendants were charged in some of the counts. The Defendants move, separately and, as to certain issues, jointly, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29, for a judgment of acquittal and, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33, for a new trial. The Court has considered carefully the parties' voluminous submissions and arguments. For the following reasons, the Defendants' motions are denied in their entirety. Familiarity with the more than 12,000-page trial record and the hundreds of thousands of pages of exhibits received in evidence is presumed....[See this Opinion And Order]... CONCLUSION: For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' motions are denied in their entirety. This Opinion and Order resolves docket entry numbers 719, 722, 767, 970, 974, 975, 979 and 1014. The Clerk of Court is also requested to terminate docket entry numbers 645, 676, and 1007, which were previously resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/24/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1094 |
Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-) Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain and Judge Sidney H. Stein from AUSAs, Matthew L. Schwartz, John T. Zach, Randall W. Jackson, Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 23, 2014 re: We write in response to the letter dated July 16, 2014 to Judge Stein suggesting that the two above-referenced cases-the criminal prosecution of Jerome O'Hara stemming from his role in the fraud perpetrated through Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, and the civil forfeiture of real property nominally in O'Hara's possession should be "consolidated" for unstated purposes. ENDORSEMENT: The relationship between proceedings in the above-captioned cases will be discussed at the conference scheduled for July 29, 2014 at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/23/2014)[*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Case 09Civ.9455(SHS)(GWG), Doc.#13. ***] (bw) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1093 |
Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-) Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. The Government is hereby ordered to provide the Court with copies of the following exhibits by Thursday, July 24, 2014, at 12:00 p.m. GX 105-a127; GX 105-b6; GX 105-b24; GX 105-c57; GX 105-d3; GX 105-d57; GX208-108; GX 208-132; GX 208-210; GX 208-215; GX 208-231; GX 900-53B; GX 2000-35 through 2000-54; GX 2000-93; GX 5000-1 at 142. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/23/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1092 |
Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly Yuhas dated July 23, 2014 re: Transcript of DVD Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1089 |
Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 23, 2014 re: Transfer and Consolidation of Forfeiture Cases Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1088 |
Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SUPPLEMENTAL SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Victim Impact Statements Part 1, # 2 Victim Impact Statements Part 2, # 3 Victim Impact Statements Part 3, # 4 Victim Impact Statements Part 4, # 5 Victim Impact Statements Part 5, # 6 Victim Impact Statements Part 6, # 7 Victim Impact Statements Part 7, # 8 Victim Impact Statements Part 8)(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1087 |
Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1086 |
Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 7/22/2014 re: Victim Impact Statements and Corrected Sentencing Submission Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1085 |
Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER As to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In light of the voluminous submissions received by the Court addressing the many issues that must be carefully considered in regard to sentencing, including forfeiture, sentencing proceedings are hereby adjourned to:Monday, September 15, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for defendant Daniel Bonventre.Monday, September 15,2014, at 2:00p.m. for defendant Annette Bongiorno.Tuesday, September 16, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for defendant JoAnn Crupi. Tuesday, September 16, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for defendant Jerome O'Hara. Wednesday, September 17, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for defendant George Perez. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/22/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1084 |
Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In light of the recently extended deadline for the parties' submission of sentencing and forfeiture briefing materials, the Court hereby adjourns the hearing currently scheduled for Friday, July 25, 2014, to Tuesday, July 29, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. At this hearing, the court will hear the parties' arguments on the following common Issues: 1. Loss amount calculations, principles and evidence for U.S. Sentencing Guidelines purposes. 2. Forfeiture determination principles and evidence. 3. Arguments relating to the applicability of U.S. Sentencing Guidelines § 2B1.1(b)(19)(A), regarding the Defendants' roles as persons associated with registered brokers or dealers or investment advisers. 4. Applicability of an enhancement pursuant to U.S. Sentencing Guidelines § 3C 1.1 for obstructing or impeding the administration of justice. 5. Policy issues related to U.S. Sentencing Guidelines§ 2B1.1, regarding offenses involving fraud or deceit. 6. The relationship between the criminal forfeiture proceedings and the pending civil forfeiture cases. Procedures for the presentation of live victim statements at sentencing will also be discussed. The parties are directed to consult with each other to determine whether any additional common issues should be addressed. The parties are directed to notify the Court of any additional common issues in a joint letter filed by Friday, July 25, 2014, at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/22/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1083 |
Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re Proposed Preliminary Orders of Forfeiture. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1082 |
Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1081 |
Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1079 |
Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated July 17, 2014 re: 1033 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture Matters . re: Denying Government's Application for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rudy Bongiorno Declaration)(Caliendo, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1078 |
Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration re Forfeiture)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1072 |
Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/9/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1071 |
Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1070 |
Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/4/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1069 |
Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/4/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1068 |
Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
Sentencing Letter by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain dated June 16,2014 re: Sentencing Letters on Behalf of George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1068 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1066 |
Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz, John T. Zach, Randall W. Jackson and Paul M. Monteleoni dated 7/11/14 re: Reschedule Briefing.ENDORSEMENT: The proposed modified schedule is approved (Defense Sentencing Replies due by 7/25/2014., Government Sentencing Submission due by 7/18/2014, Status Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 02:15 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) Defense Forfeiture Submissions (including a joint submission on common issues) July 17, 2014, Defense Sentencing Replies set for July 25, 2014, Government Forfeiture Reply set for July 21, 2014. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/11/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1066 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1065 |
Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1064 Sentencing Submission filed by George Perez Amicus submission. (Krantz, Larry) Modified on 7/15/2014 (ka). (Entered: 07/11/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1064 |
Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1064 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1063 |
Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 11, 2014 re: Modifications to Briefing Schedule . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1059 |
Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Jerome O'Hara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Objections To Presentence Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Letter of Jerome O'Hara, # 3 Exhibit C - Sentencing Letters Volume I, # 4 Exhibit C - Sentencing Letters Volume II)(Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1053 |
Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
Sentencing Letter by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-8-14 re: Objections to Final PSR. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1053 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1052 |
Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz, John T. Zach, Randall W. Jackson and Paul M. Monteleoni dated 7/2/2014 re: The Government respectfully requests that the defendants be required to identify those common legal issues and submit a single, joint brief on those issues in connection with their sentencing. If the issues are truly common to all defendants and/or raise questions of law, this should not be difficult, and will both promote efficiency for the Court and will allow the Government to adequately prepare for any such conference..ENDORSEMENT: Defense counsel are expected to address common issues jointly in their opposition to the proposed preliminary forfeiture order. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/2/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1051 |
Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
E-MAIL by USA as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Chambers of Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Matthew L. Schwartz dated 07/02/2014 03:51 PM re: Attached is a brief letter in response to Mr. Krantz's letter of yesterday, which requested a conference on the 25th. It was just filed on ECF. We are also in receipt of the letters filed by Mr. Frisch (yesterday) and Mr. Krantz (today) drawing the Court's attention to Judge's recent decision in United States v. Valle. Unless the Court believes it would be helpful, we do not intend to respond to those letters, as the Valle opinion contains no finding of misconduct, and was decided on the unique facts of that case. Similarly, Judge Glasser's opinion in United States v. Santiago, referenced in Mr. Krantz's letter, turns on the unique facts of that case. For the Court's convenience, we attach copies of the two opinions, which were not included with the copies of the letters served on the Government. (bw) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1049 |
Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated 7/1/14 re: Reschedule Conference. ENDORSEMENT: A conference will be held on July 25, 2014 at 2:15pm in Courtroom 12D ( Status Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 02:15 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/2/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1048 |
Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 2, 2014 re: Defense request for a pre-sentencing conference Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1047 |
Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-2-14 re: Pending Post-Trial Motions Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1046 |
Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-1-14 re: Request for Status Conference Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1045 |
Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 1, 2014 re: Proposed Forfeiture Orders and Supporting Declarations Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order as to Crupi, # 2 Declaration as to Crupi, # 3 Proposed Order as to O'Hara, # 4 Declaration as to O'Hara)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1040 |
Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER terminating 1033 LETTER MOTION as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5); terminating 1038 LETTER MOTION as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5); terminating 1037 LETTER MOTION as to Daniel Bonventre (3). Probation will issue the Presentence Reports for Defendants Bonventre,Bongiorno, Crupi, O'Hara and Perez by July 2, 2014. The deadlines for the submission of Defendants' sentencing memoranda, which are currently due by July 7, 8, or 9, 2014 (depending on the Defendant), are hereby adjourned to July 9, 10, and 11,2014, respectively. The Government's deadlines for its sentencing submissions are also adjourned to July 16, 17 and 18, 2014. The Government must provide its proposed preliminary orders of forfeiture, alongwith a description of the evidentiary bases for its positions and declarations supporting theGovernment's forfeiture theories, as outlined in the Government's June 25, 2014, letter, fourweeks prior to sentencing (i.e.. June 30, July 1, or July 2, depending on the Defendant).The Defendants responses to the Government's proposed preliminary orders offorfeiture, including any opposition declarations. are hereby due on July 14, 15, or 16, 2014 (depending on the Defendant). The Government's replies will be due on July 18, 19 and 20, 2014. This Order resolves docket entry numbers 1033, 1037 and 1038. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/30/14) (jw) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1039 |
Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 6-29-14 re: Forfeiture briefing schedule Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1038 |
Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated June 30, 2014 re: Scheduling of sentencing procedures . Document filed by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1034 |
Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Response to Motion to Mark Case "Related" to Civil Forfeiture Action, and to "Consolidate" the Two Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1033 |
Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture Matters . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1028 |
Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 6/19/2014 re: To request permission for Mr. O'Hara to travel to New Hampshire with his wife and children and stay with his sister-in-law's family from June 26 until July 3rd..ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/23/14)(jw) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1028 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1026 |
Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 979 MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 969 MOTION for Acquittal Under Rule 29. MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 33(a)., 973 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal and Memorandum in Support.FIRST MOTION for New Trial and Memorandum in Support., 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief., 975 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 970 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated April 15, 2014 re: Dismissal of All Counts, and Counts 25-30 pursuant to post trial motion.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit B-1, # 5 Exhibit B-2, # 6 Exhibit B-3, # 7 Exhibit B-4, # 8 Exhibit B-5, # 9 Exhibit B-6, # 10 Exhibit B-7, # 11 Exhibit B-8, # 12 Exhibit B-9, # 13 Exhibit B-10, # 14 Exhibit B-11, # 15 Exhibit B-12, # 16 Exhibit B-13, # 17 Exhibit B-14, # 18 Exhibit B-15, # 19 Exhibit B-16, # 20 Exhibit B-17, # 21 Exhibit B-18, # 22 Exhibit B-19, # 23 Exhibit B-20, # 24 Exhibit B-21, # 25 Exhibit B-22, # 26 Exhibit B-23, # 27 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1025 |
Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Melissa S. Geller dated June 18, 2014 re: Summation Power Point Slides Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Slides Part 1, # 2 Slides Part 2, # 3 Slides Part 3, # 4 Slides Part 4, # 5 Slides Part 5)(Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1023 |
Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 06/18/2014 re: Filing of opening and summation PowerPoint slides (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1022 |
Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly Yuhas dated 6/18/14 re: Filing of PowerPoint slides used in jury address Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1013 |
Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Jerome O'Hara re 979 MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments A and B)(Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1010 |
Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/12/2014 re: Slides Used in the Parties' Jury Addresses Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1009 |
Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly Yuhas dated June 11, 2014 re: We write to respectfully request that the Court order the Government to provide to us a copy of the PowerPoint slides used in its rebuttal summation. Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1006 |
Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief. . (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1005 |
Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 6-5-14 re: Response to Letter from AUSA dated 6-5-14 Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1004 |
Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/5/2014 re: Correction to Opposition Brief Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
999 |
Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 996 LETTER MOTION Extension of Time to File Reply as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). The requested extensions are granted. No further extensions of this briefly schedule will be granted. The sentencings remain scheduled for the week of July 28, 2014 and submissions must be made in accordance with the undersigned's published sentencing submission procedures in advance of the scheduled sentencing dates. Docket entry #996 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/29/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
998 |
Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 5/28/2014 re: 996 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated May 28, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Extension of Time to File Reply .. (Corrected Version) (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
997 |
Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 5/28/2014 re: 996 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated May 28, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Extension of Time to File Reply .. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
996 |
Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated May 28, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Extension of Time to File Reply . Document filed by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
995 |
Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, . Document filed by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 5/28/2014 (ka). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
994 |
Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re 975 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief., 979 MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 970 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated April 15, 2014 re: Dismissal of All Counts, and Counts 25-30 pursuant to post trial motion.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
993 |
Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
992 |
Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
991 |
Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcripts of pages 8825-8834 for this case. See order docketed as document #989 by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
990 |
Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcripts of pages 6872-6879 for this case. See order docketed as document #989 by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
989 |
Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Having been informed by the Government that it will not be making any objections and not having received any objections from the Defendants, the Court orders that pages 6872-6879 and 8825-8834 of the transcript from the trial for this case be unsealed and filed on the public docket in accordance with the Court's regular procedures. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/12/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
988 |
Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 5/1/2014 re: Defense counsel submits this letter to request that the travel restrictions for the defendant be modified to permit him to travel to two upcoming family weddings. One is May 9th in Spring Lake, NJ, and the other is June 7th. in Princeton, NJ. Both weddings would be single-day trips, so we would also request that Mr. O'Hara's curfew be extended to 14 hours on those dates to insure his safe return home in case of traffic. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
980 |
Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM in Support by Jerome O'Hara re 979 MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial.. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
979 |
Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Acquittal., FIRST MOTION for New Trial. Document filed by Jerome O'Hara. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
978 |
Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 4/16/2014 re: Rule 29 and 33 proposed briefing schedule Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
977 |
Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM in Support by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief.. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
974 |
Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for New Trial and other relief. Document filed by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Krantz, Larry) Modified on 4/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
972 |
Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi Motion for Judgment of Acquittal on All Counts Pursuant to Rule 29(c). (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
971 |
Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
970 |
Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated April 15, 2014 re: Dismissal of All Counts, and Counts 25-30 pursuant to post trial motion. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of 2/11/2014, # 2 Exhibit Letter of 2/16/14)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
969 |
Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Acquittal Under Rule 29., MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 33(a). Document filed by Jerome O'Hara. (Mehler, Gordon) Modified on 4/16/2014 (ka). Modified on 4/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
968 |
Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
966 |
Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
965 |
Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
962 |
Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 4-10-14 re: Extension of Post-Trial Motion Deadline Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
961 |
Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
960 |
Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
959 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/24/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
958 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/24/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
957 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/21/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
956 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/21/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
956 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
955 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/20/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
954 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/20/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
953 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/19/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
952 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/19/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
951 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/18/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
950 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/18/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
949 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/17/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
948 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/17/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
947 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/14/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
946 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/14/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
945 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/13/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
944 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/13/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
943 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/12/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
942 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/12/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
941 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/11/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
940 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/11/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
939 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/10/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
938 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/10/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
937 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/6/14 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
936 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/6/14 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
935 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/6/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
934 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/6/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
933 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/5/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
932 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/5/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
931 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/4/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
930 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/4/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
929 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/3/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
928 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/3/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
927 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/27/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
926 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/27/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
925 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/25/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
924 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/25/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
923 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/24/14 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
922 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/24/14 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
921 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/20/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
920 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/24/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
919 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/20/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
918 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/20/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
917 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/19/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
916 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/19/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
915 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/18/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
914 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/18/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
913 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/11/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
912 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/11/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
911 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/10/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
910 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/10/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
909 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/6/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
908 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/6/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
907 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/4/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
906 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/4/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
905 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/30/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
904 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/30/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
903 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/29/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
902 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/29/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
901 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/28/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
900 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/28/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
899 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/27/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
898 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/27/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
897 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/23/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
896 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/23/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
895 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/22/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
894 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/22/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
893 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/21/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
892 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/21/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
891 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/16/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
890 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/16/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
889 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/15/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
888 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/15/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
887 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/14/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
886 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/14/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
885 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/13/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
884 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/13/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
881 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/8/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
880 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/8/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
879 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/7/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
878 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/7/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
877 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/19/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
876 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/19/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
875 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/18/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
874 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/18/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
873 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/17/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
872 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/17/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
871 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/16/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
870 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/16/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
869 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/13/13 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
868 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/13/13 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
867 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/12/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
866 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/12/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
865 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/11/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
864 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/11/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
863 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/10/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
862 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/10/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
861 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/9/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
860 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/9/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
859 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/5/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
858 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/5/13 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
857 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/4/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
856 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/4/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
855 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/2/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
854 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/2/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
853 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/26/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
852 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/26/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
851 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/25/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
850 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/25/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
849 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/21/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
848 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/21/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
847 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/20/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
846 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/20/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
845 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/19/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
844 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/19/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
843 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/18/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
842 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/18/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
841 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/14/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
840 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/14/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
839 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/13/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
838 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/13/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
837 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/12/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
836 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/12/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
835 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/7/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
834 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/7/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
833 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/6/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
832 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/6/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
831 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/5/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
830 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/5/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
829 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/4/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
826 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/31/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
825 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/30/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
824 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/30/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
823 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/29/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
822 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/29/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
821 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/28/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
820 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/28/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
819 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/24/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
818 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/24/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
817 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/23/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
816 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/23/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
815 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/22/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
814 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/22/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
813 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/21/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
812 |
Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/21/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
811 |
Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated 3/31/14 re: Accordingly, in an abundance of caution, and in light of the 14 day requirement set forth in Rule 33(b )(2), we hereby ask that the deadline for filing all motions for a new trial under Rule 33 be extended to Apri1 14, 2014. Such an extension is permissible by virtue of Rule 45(b)..ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted.. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/2/14)(jw) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
810 |
Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara. Accordingly, the Government is hereby directed to determine what property it will seek to have forfeited and confer promptly with defense counsel to ascertain whether the defense opposes the forfeiture sought. The Government must thereafter provide, no later than two weeks before the scheduled sentencing date, via facsimile to Chambers with a copy served on defense counsel, a proposed preliminary order of forfeiture. If the preliminary order is not on consent, the Government's submission must be accompanied by a description of the evidentiary basis for its forfeiture position and a statement as to whether the parties believe that an evidentiary hearing is warranted pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(1). Defense counsel will have one week following his or her receipt of the Government's letter to respond. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/31/2014)(jw) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
805 |
Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 3-31-14 re: Rule 33 Motions Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
804 |
Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 803 LETTER MOTION To request a 30 day extension of time in which to respond to the Court's order dated March 25, 2014 as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5)...ENDORSEMENT..The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/27/14) (jw) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
803 |
Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated March 27, 2014 re: Extension of Time to Respond to March 25, 2014 Order. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
801 |
Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The Court intends to unseal transcript pages 6872-6879 and 8825-8834 on April 4, 2014. Any objections to such unsealing must be filed by April 2, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/25/14)(jw) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
800 |
Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #64 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Verdict Form (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
799 |
Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #63 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
798 |
Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #62 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
797 |
Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #61 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
796 |
Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #60 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
795 |
Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #59 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
794 |
Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #58 by George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
793 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit Number 57 in USA v. Daniel Bonventre et al., S10 10 Cr. 228 (LTS): as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (bw) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
792 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit Number 56 (Jury Communication To the Court) in USA v. Daniel Bonventre et al., S10 10 Cr. 228 (LTS): as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (bw) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
791 |
Filed: 3/23/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 23, 2014 re: Jury Note (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/23/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
790 |
Filed: 3/23/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated March 23, 2014 re: Proposed Response to Jury Note (CX 56) Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
789 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #55. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
788 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #54. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
787 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #53. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
786 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #52. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
785 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #49. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
784 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #48. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
783 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #47. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
782 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #41. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
781 |
Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #40. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
780 |
Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #15 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
779 |
Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #14 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
778 |
Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #13 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
777 |
Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #12 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
776 |
Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #10 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
775 |
Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #7 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
774 |
Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit #6 Jury Communication to the Court as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
773 |
Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Court Exhibit Number 9 (JURY INSTRUCTIONS) in United States v. Bonventre et al., 10 Cr. 228: as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). (bw) Modified on 3/24/2014 (lan). Modified on 3/24/2014 (lan). (Entered: 03/17/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
771 |
Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 3/13/2014 re: Rebuttal Summation Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
770 |
Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 3-13-14 re: Request for Jury Instruction Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit 1)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
768 |
Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 3/12/2014 re: Motion in Limine regarding Summations of Counsel for Ms. Bongiorno Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
767 |
Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated March 12, 2014 re: Curative Instruction. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3507-3)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
766 |
Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Verdict Form. as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
764 |
Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on March 10,2014, Defendant Daniel Bonventre's motion (docket entry number 762) is granted in part and denied in part. This Order resolves docket entry number 762. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/10/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
763 |
Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 03/07/2014 re: 762 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 7, 2014 re: Redacted Indictment.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
762 |
Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 7, 2014 re: Redacted Indictment. Document filed by Daniel Bonventre as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
761 |
Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 3-7-14 re: Redacted Indictment Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
759 |
Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER sustaining the Government's LETTER MOTION objecting to the admission of two defense exhibits is sustained. 743 LETTER MOTION. The Clerk of Court is also requested to close docket entry number 735, which was previously resolved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/4/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
758 |
Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
757 |
Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
756 |
Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
755 |
Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
754 |
Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
753 |
Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
752 |
Filed: 3/1/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 3/1/2014 re 743 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/26/2014 re: Objections to Certain Defense Exhibits.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
750 |
Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Powerpoint of Final Jury Insruction Before Summation by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
749 |
Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Powerpoint of Final Jury Insructions. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
748 |
Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Final Version of Verdict Form by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
747 |
Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Final Version of Jury Instructions. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
746 |
Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Final Version of Jury Instructions Before Summations. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
745 |
Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
VERDICT FORM by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
744 |
Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
JURY INSTRUCTIONS by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
743 |
Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/26/2014 re: Objections to Certain Defense Exhibits. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
742 |
Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/25/2014 re: Untimely Requests to Further Modify the Court's Charge and Verdict Sheet Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
736 |
Filed: 2/22/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/22/2014 re: Application to Overrule Objection to GX 106-25, an email between Andrew and Mark Madoff Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
735 |
Filed: 2/22/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/22/14 re: Admission of Evidence and to advise of Defendant's Decision to Testify. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Exhibits)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
734 |
Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno and Jo Ann Crupi moved, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29, at the close of the Governments case in the trial on the above-captioned Indictment, seeking judgments of acquittal on Counts Four, Five, and Nineteen through Thirty-Three of the Indictment, which charge Defendants Bonventre,Bongiorno and Crupi with tax violations, Defendants Bonventre and Bongiorno with obstruction of the administration of the tax laws, and Defendant Bonventre with violating the Employment Retirement Income Securities Act (ERISA). Defendants Bonventre, Bongiorno and Crupi request that the Court decide their Rule 29(a) motions with respect to these Counts prior to the submission of the case to the jury. The Court has carefully considered the parties voluminoussubmissions and arguments... For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Bonventres motion, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 29(a), for judgment of acquittal is granted as to Counts Five and Nineteen of Indictment S10 10 Cr. 228, and the pending motions of Defendants Bonventre, Bongiorno and Crupi as to Counts Four and Twenty through Thirty-Three are denied. Decision is reserved with respect to the remaining challenged Counts of the Indictment. This Memorandum Order resolves docket entry numbers 680, 688, 689, 696. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/21/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
733 |
Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record at the conferences on February 18, 2014, and February 19, 2014, the Government's application regarding prior consistent and inconsistent statements (docket entry no. 714) is granted in part and denied in part. This Order resolves docket entry number 714. The Clerk of Court is also requested to terminate docket entry number 709, which was previously resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/21/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
732 |
Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-21-14 re: Verdict Sheet Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
731 |
Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/21/2014 re: Prior Statements (SIAC Report) Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
730 |
Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Verdict Form as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Draft (2)- Reflecting Charge Conference and Consideration of Subsequent Submissions with edits (jw) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
729 |
Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Verdict Form as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
728 |
Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Jury Instructions as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Draft (2) - Reflecting Charge Conference and Consideration of Subsequent Submissions with edits by Govt. (jw) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
727 |
Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
Jury Instructions as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Draft (2)- Reflecting Charge Conference and Consideration of Subsequent Submissions by Gov't (jw) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
726 |
Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/19/2014 re: Requested Limiting Instruction Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
724 |
Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/19/2014 re: 680 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts. LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts., 722 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-17-14 re: Dismissal under Rule 29., 696 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/14/14 re: Supplemental Submission on Rule 29 Attaching Exhibits and Transcript requested by Court.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
722 |
Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-17-14 re: Dismissal under Rule 29. Document filed by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
721 |
Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 17, 2014 re: Government Application to Admit Prior Consistent Statements Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
720 |
Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 17, 2014 re: Government Application to Preclude Prior Inconsistent Statement Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
717 |
Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-16-14 re: Prior inconsistent statements Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
714 |
Filed: 2/16/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/16/2014 re: Prior Consistent and "Inconsistent" Statements. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
713 |
Filed: 2/16/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 680 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts. LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript references, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits referenced)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
712 |
Filed: 2/16/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/16/2014 re: 688 FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated February 13, 2014 re: Rule 29 Judgment of Acquittal on Counts 4-5 & 20-24., 680 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts. LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts., 696 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/14/14 re: Supplemental Submission on Rule 29 Attaching Exhibits and Transcript requested by Court.. Enclosing Cited Transcript Excerpts (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
709 |
Filed: 2/16/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/16/14 re: Requesting permission to instruct defense witnesses not to travel to Court on Tuesday. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
707 |
Filed: 2/15/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/15/2014 re: Testimony of Daniel Bonventre Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
706 |
Filed: 2/15/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/15/2014 re: 688 FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated February 13, 2014 re: Rule 29 Judgment of Acquittal on Counts 4-5 & 20-24., 680 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts. LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts., 696 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/14/14 re: Supplemental Submission on Rule 29 Attaching Exhibits and Transcript requested by Court., 689 MOTION for Acquittal MEMORANDUM of law in support of Motion for Acquittal Made on the Record on February 11, 2014.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
705 |
Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi.re: Evidence of Prior Consistent Statements The Court has reviewed and considered carefully the Governments February 12, 2014, application to elicit evidence of prior consistent statements made by certain cooperating witnesses and the Defendants opposition to the application. Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(1)(B) excludes from the category of inadmissable hearsay and thus permits the substantive proffer of a prior consistent statement offered to rebut an express or implied charge that the declarant recently fabricated trial testimony or acted from a recent improper influence or motive in testifying. To be admissible under Rule 801(d)(1)(B), the proponent of the prior consistent statement must show that the person who made the statement is available for cross examination concerning it, that the statement is consistent with the challenged testimony and that the prior consistent statement was made before the alleged motive to fabricate arose. See, e.g., Tome v. United States, 513 U.S. 150, 158 (1995) (where a witness has been impeached through the suggestion that his trial testimony was recently fabricated or resulted from a recent improper influence or motion, that suggestion is capable of direct and forceful refutation through introduction of out-of-court consistent statements that predate the alleged fabrication, influence or motive); see also United States v. Alviar, 573 F.3d 526, 542 (7th Cir. 2009) ([p]rior consistent statements that are offered to rebut a charge of recent fabrication or improper influence or motive are not hearsay). In United States v. Pierre, 781 F.2d 329, 331 (2d Cir. 1986), the Second Circuit held that prior inconsistent statements may be admitted for the more limited purpose of rehabilitating a witness credibility, but cautioned that the proponent must demonstrate the existence of probative value beyond the mere fact that the witness has repeated on a prior occasion a statement consistent with his trial testimony. Id. The Court finds that none of the witnesses prior consistent statements to the testifying FBI agents is admissible as substantive evidence under Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(1)(B), because the trial record supports Defendants contention that the cooperating witnesses were all motivated or influenced by a desire to impress the Government with their cooperation and the potential value of their information, a motive that predates all of their statements to the Government. Should the Government wish to have the opportunity to offer prior consistent statements for the more limited purpose of rehabilitating cooperating witness credibility, the Government must identify, as to each statement, the probative value of that statement beyond mere repetition. Any alleged prior consistent statements that the Government plans to offer, and the Governments rationale as to probative value for each such statement, must be identified to Defense counsel and the Court before the week of testimony in which the Government expects to introduce them. (For witnesses expected to be called during the week of February 17, 2014, disclosure of the statements and the rationale for admissibility must be made by February 16, 2014.) Any use of prior consistent statements will be limited to statements directly corresponding to the subject matter of the allegedly inconsistent statement. No general repetition of statements consistent with other aspects of trial testimony will be allowed, in order to avoid juror confusion, undue delay or unfair prejudice through the repetition of cooperator allegations by FBI agents. The foregoing procedural requirements and limitations are imposed pursuant to the Courts authority under Federal Rules of Evidence 611(a) and 403. If prior consistent statements are admitted, the Court will upon request provide limiting instructions as to the admission of such prior statements for credibility purposes only and not as substantive evidence. Cross-Examination of Character Witnesses: The Court has also reviewed and considered carefully the Governments February 12, 2014, application, pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 404(a)(2)(A), to offer evidence to rebut character witness testimony elicited by Defendants, and the parties correspondence relating to that application. Federal Rules of Evidence 405(a) and 404(a)(2)(A) permit a criminal defendant to offer evidence of pertinent traits of the defendant, by means of reputation or opinion testimony. Federal Rule of Evidence 405(a) permits the court to allow cross-examination as to relevant specific instances of the persons conduct and also permits the Government to offer evidence to rebut evidence of the pertinent trait. Neither of these provisions, however, is a license for the Government to rehearse with any and all character witnesses its collection of allegedly inculpatory facts. Cross-examination using guilt-assuming hypothetical questions is specifically prohibited. See United States v. Oshatz, 912 F.2d 534, 539-540 (2d Cir. 1990). Cross examination regarding knowledge of the allegations in the indictment is also impermissible, unless the defendant on direct has elicited testimony by the witness that the witness is aware of the charges and holds the relevant opinion. See United States v. Russo, 110 F.3d 948, 953 (2d Cir.1997). The following principles will be applied in determining the scope of specific-acts rebuttal cross-examination. Any rebuttal cross-examination concerning specific acts must be relevant to the trait for which the witness is proffered and, unless the Defendant has opened the door to inquiry concerning the witness knowledge of the charges in this case, specific acts cross examination touching on the charges in this case must be confined to questions concerning otherwise legal activity that tests the knowledge or acquaintanceship claims of the witness. See Russo,110 F.3d at 953 (approving cross-examination regarding facially neutral facts relating to business meetings and activities implicated in the case, where a character witness testified as to her opinions of the defendants honesty and trustworthiness and claimed to have formed those opinions based on work in the defendants business and twenty-five years of a business and personal relationship with him). This Order resolves docket entry numbers 684, 687, and 690. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/14/2014)(dnd) Modified on 2/14/2014 (dnd). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
701 |
Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 02/14/2014 re: Support of Crupi Motion To Admit Video Exhibit. Document filed by Jerome O'Hara. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
700 |
Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-14-14 re: Government's application re prior consistent statements Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
699 |
Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from USA dated 2/14/2014 re: Reply re Prior consistent statements and character witnesses Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
696 |
Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/14/14 re: Supplemental Submission on Rule 29 Attaching Exhibits and Transcript requested by Court. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Trial Exhibits Referred to in Rule 29 Motion, # 2 Exhibit Transcript Referred to in Rule 29 Motion)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
695 |
Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-14-14 re: Reply Letter re Jury Charge Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
694 |
Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/13/2014 re: Post Charge Conference Defense Objections to Proposed Jury Instructions Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
693 |
Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/12/2014 re: Defense Objections to Cross Examination and defense's proffered videorecording Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
690 |
Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 02/12/2014 re: Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Jerome O'Hara. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
687 |
Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/13/14 re: Preclusion of testimony concerning prior consistent statements. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
686 |
Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Reconsideration of Jury Charge Ruling. Document filed by Jerome O'Hara. (Mehler, Gordon) Modified on 2/13/2014 (ka). (Entered: 02/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
684 |
Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/12/14 re: Limits to cross-examination of character witnesses. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
683 |
Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-12-14 re: Jury Instructions and Verdict Sheet Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
682 |
Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/10/2014 re: Defense Objections to the Court's Draft Charge Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
681 |
Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/12/2014 re: Jury Charge/Statute of Limitations Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
680 |
Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
679 |
Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S3-10-Cr-228-01) Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Gordon Mehler dated February 5, 2013 re: I write to request permission for Mr. O'Hara and his family to travel to Lake Harmony, PA for a trip with 12 other families from February 15 until February 17. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/11/2014)(bw) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
678 |
Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-10-14 re: Jury Instructions Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Objections to Proposed Charge)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
677 |
Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 9, 2014 re: 666 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/07/2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements.. REFILING AS PER ECF REQUEST (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
676 |
Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 10, 2014 re: Motion permitting Ms. Crupi to admit video evidence in direct case. Document filed by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
675 |
Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/9/14 re 666 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/07/2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements.. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
674 |
Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 7, 2014 re: 666 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/07/2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Response)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
673 |
Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 02/09/2014 re: Jury Charge (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
671 |
Filed: 2/9/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 9, 2014 re: David Kugel's Prior Inconsistent Statements. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ka). (Entered: 02/09/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
670 |
Filed: 2/9/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 9, 2014 re: 666 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/07/2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements. re: Response Letter. Document filed by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Geller, Melissa) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ka). (Entered: 02/09/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
669 |
Filed: 2/8/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/08/2014 re: 668 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 7, 2014 re: Admission of Prior Inconsistent Statements.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
668 |
Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 7, 2014 re: Admission of Prior Inconsistent Statements. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pages from Official Report)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
667 |
Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 7, 2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements Admission Thereof. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ka). (Entered: 02/07/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
666 |
Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/07/2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
664 |
Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 7, 2014 re: Comments to Draft Charge in Advance of Charge Conference Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
663 |
Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
662 |
Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/05/2014 re: Preclusion of Defense Expert Testimony. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
661 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
660 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
659 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
657 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
655 |
Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on February 4, 2014, to the extent that the issues were not previously resolved by the parties, the Government's motion regarding Defense disclosures (docket entry no. 621) is granted and the Government's motion to preclude the Defense from calling Frank DiPascali and asking him about his assertion of his Fifth Amendment privilege in a related civil proceeding is denied (docket entry no. 616). For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on February 4, 2014, the Court denies Defendant Annette Bongiorno's motion to introduce a new summary chart exhibit (docket entry no. 618 ). The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate docket entry numbers 639 and 643 as Defendant Daniel Bonventre's motions were withdrawn. The Clerk of Court is also instructed to terminate docket entry numbers 623, 631 and 632. which were discussed and resolved at this conference. This Order resolves docket entry numbers 616, 618, 621, 623, 631, 632, 639 and 643. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
653 |
Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-4-14 re: Objections to Direct Examination Document filed by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
652 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
651 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
650 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
649 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
647 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
646 |
Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/03/2014 re: 643 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated 02/03/2014 re: Preclusion of Cumulative Testimony.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
645 |
Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 3, 2014 re: Comments on DRAFT Jury Charg. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
644 |
Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated February 3, 2014 re: Defense Objections to Charge and Defense Exhibit AB-2000-1 Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
642 |
Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/03/2014 re: 639 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated 2/3/2014 re: Disclosure of Account Information.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
641 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
640 |
Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-3-14 re: Response to Government's Letter dated February 2, 2014 Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
638 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
636 |
Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
VERDICT FORM by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
634 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
633 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
630 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
629 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
628 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
627 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
626 |
Filed: 2/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 2, 2014 re: Modify/Amend Verdict Form. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/02/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
625 |
Filed: 2/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 2, 2014 re: Amend and correct Draft Jury Charge. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amendments to Charge)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/02/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
623 |
Filed: 2/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 2, 2014 re: Admission of Prior Inconsistent Statements. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit RR Email 2.1.14)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/02/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
622 |
Filed: 2/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated 02/02/2014 re: 616 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from John Zach dated January 31, 2014 Re FDP Deposition Transcript.. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
621 |
Filed: 2/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/02/2014 re: Defense Disclosures. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/02/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
620 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
619 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 1/19/2014 re: Opposition to January 17, 2014 Letter from Larry Krantz, Esq., seeking to preclude certain expert testimony and for additional disclosure Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
618 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated January 31, 2014 re: Offer of AB-2000-1. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AB-2000-1)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
617 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 1/28/2014 re: 610 MOTION to Exclude certain testimony.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
No calendar events were found for this docket.
|