Symantec Corporation et al v. Uniloc USA Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:10-cv-01483
District Judge David O. Carter, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Chang +1 213 891 8662 dale.chang@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey +1 714 540 1235 dean.dunlavey@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Flagel +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 mark.flagel@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yury Kapgan +1 213 485 1234 yury.kapgan@lw.com
No Logo Xtreamlok Pty, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited"
No Logo Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited"
No Logo Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Defendant
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Graham Bostock +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 dbostock@mintz.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Hayes +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 phayes@mintz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harvey I. Saferstein +1 310 586 3200 +1 310 586 3202 hsaferstein@mintz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nada I. Shamonki +1 310 586 3200 +1 310 586 3202 nshamonki@mintz.com
Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Xtreamlok Pty, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (rla) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
    RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transferred from California Centralhas been opened in Eastern District of TEXAS as case 6:11-cv-00033, filed 01/18/2011. (yl) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENJOIN UNILOC FROM PROCEEDING WITH DUPLICATIVE ACTION AS AGAINST SYMANTEC, AND TO REQUIRE UNILOC TO DISMISS SYMANTEC AS A DEFENDANT FROM THAT ACTION 18 AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS'/COUNTERCLAIMANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS 19 . Electronic Documents are accessible through Pacer. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal) (rla) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
        JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, Counter Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, Defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Counter Claimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
          DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF POST-BRIEFING EVENTS REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS re MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss 19 , MOTION to Enforce Agreements and Order 18 filed by Defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Counter Claimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Shamonki, Nada) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF POST-BRIEFING EVENTS re MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss 19 , MOTION to Enforce Agreements and Order 18 filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, Counter Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice, # 2 Exhibit B to Notice, # 3 Exhibit C to Notice)(Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION 19 Motion to Transfer Case. Accordingly, the hearing set for December 20, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. is removed from the calendar. Parties will be served with the Court's ruling. (rla) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting 25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul Hayes on behalf of Defendants Uniloc USA, designating Harvey Saferstein as local counsel. (ak) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting 24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dean Bostock on behalf of Uniloc USA Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private, designating Harvey Saferstein as local counsel. (ak) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                    APPLICATION for attorney Paul J. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7933892 paid.) filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Shamonki, Nada) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                      APPLICATION for attorney Dean G. Bostock to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7933744 paid.) filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Shamonki, Nada) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                        REPLY in Support of MOTION to Enforce Agreements and Order 18 filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, Counter Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                          REPLY In Support of MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss 19 filed by Defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Counter Claimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bradley C. Davis In Support Of Defendants/Counterclaimants Motion To Transfer Venue To The U.S. District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 2 Declaration of Dean G. Bostock In Support Of Defendants/Counterclaimants Motion To Transfer Venue To The U.S. District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss)(Shamonki, Nada) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Enforce Agreements and Order 18 filed by Defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Counter Claimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dean G. Bostock in Support of Defendants/Counterclaimants' Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Enjoin Uniloc From Proceeding With Duplicative Action As Against Symantec, And To Require Uniloc To Dismiss Symantec As A Defendant From That Action)(Shamonki, Nada) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss 19 filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, Counter Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Kazanegras, # 2 Declaration of Mark A. Flagel, # 3 Exhibit A to Flagel Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Flagel Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Flagel Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Flagel Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Flagel Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Flagel Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G to Flagel Declaration, # 10 Exhibit H to Flagel Declaration)(Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss filed by Defendants/ Counterclaimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. Motion set for hearing on 12/20/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 2 Declaration if Bradley C. Davis In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 3 Declaration of Dean G. Bostock In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 4 Exhibit 1 through 5 to Declaration of of Dean G. Bostock In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 5 Exhibit 6 through 11 to Dean G. Bostock In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 6 Exhibit 12 through 17 to Dean G. Bostock In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 7 Proposed Order Granting of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss)(Shamonki, Nada) Modified on 12/15/2010 (rla). (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Agreements and Order filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. Motion set for hearing on 12/20/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Mark A. Flagel, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration, # 10 Proposed Order)(Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                    First Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim 15 filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-claim Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty.(Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                      ANSWER to Counterclaim 15 filed by Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty.(Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                        COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty; Jury Demand,, filed by Counterclaimant Uniloc USA Inc, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited.(db) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2011 at 08:30 AM, Courtroom 9-D before Judge David O. Carter. Read Immediately. (see order for details) (nca) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                            ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND ; (Defendants' Counterclaim will be manually filed per ECF requirements on 11/8/10) filed by Defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc.(Shamonki, Nada) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                              FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Uniloc USA Inc answer now due 11/11/2010; Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited answer now due 11/11/2010; Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited answer now due 11/11/2010, filed by Defendants Uniloc USA Inc; Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited; Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited.(Shamonki, Nada) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Uniloc USA, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Summons and Complaint served 10/7/10, answer due 10/28/10 (Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Uniloc Corporation PTY Limited in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Summons and Complaint Served 10/7/10, answer due 10/28/10 (Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Summons and Complaint served 10/7/10, answer due 10/28/10 (Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. correcting Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed, Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed 6 , Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed, Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed 5 , Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed, Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed 7 (Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Uniloc USA Inc acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Bradley Davis, Authorized agent to accept service. (Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Bradley Davis, Authorized agent to accept service. (Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Bradley Davis, Authorized agent to accept service. (Flagel, Mark) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV08-00203 DOC (MLGx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV10-01483 DOC (MLGx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (ade) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, (twdb) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (twdb) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    COMPLAINT against defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman.(Filing fee $ 350 paid) jury demand., filed by plaintiffs Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation.(twdb) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 379 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?