Cafiero v. 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-10266
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nicholas Cafiero, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Joseph Dubanevich +1 212 267 3700 wdubanevich@napolibern.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 7 World Trade Company, L.P., Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F & G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo H.P. Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Group"
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Moretrench American Corp., Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC MGMT Co., L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction Co., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
Verizon New York Inc. Verizon New York Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo WSP Cantor Seinuk, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: (THIS STIPULATED ORDER PERTAINS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DOCKET NUMBERS SET FORTH ON EXHIBIT A) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED Plaintiffs and Settling Defendants have entered into a settlement agreement resolving all claims by Plaintiffs against Settling Defendants in the above-captioned action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims against the Settling Defendants and each of them shall be dismissed, and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/2011) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(ja) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
    AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT against defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero.(mro) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
      COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT Related to the Master Complaint 1 Complaint, against ABM Industries, Inc., et al., with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Nicholas Cafiero.(ab) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CERTAIN ENUMERATED CIVIL ACTIONS AS TO TISHMAN INTERIORS CORPORATION, TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF NEW YORK AND TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF MANHATTAN. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that whereas no party is an infant or an incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the civil actions referenced in Attachment A, be discontinued and dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(ii) as against defendants, TISHMAN INTERIORS CORPORATION, TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF NEW YORK AND TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF MANHATTAN only, without prejudice and without cost to any party. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that should evidence be discovered throughout the course of litigation which determines that TISHMAN INTERIORS CORPORATION, TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF NEW YORK AND TISHMAN CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION OF MANHATTAN are proper parties to this suit, that plaintiffs may reinstitute the action without regard to the applicable Statute of Limitations, assuming said original action was timely commenced, and in such instance defendants shall not assert Statute of Limitation as a defense. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL CASES IN THE WORLD TRADE CENTER DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. Relates to All Cases listed on Attachment A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/26/09) (rjm) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture) served on 1/26/2007, answer due 2/15/2007. Service was accepted by Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture). Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tucci Equipment Rental Corp. served on 1/26/2007, answer due 2/15/2007. Service was accepted by Daneen Gazzola. Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tishman Speyer Properties served on 12/20/2006, answer due 1/9/2007. Service was accepted by Shari Harrison. Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by m.weston. Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Atlantic Heydt Corp. served on 11/14/2006, answer due 12/4/2006. Service was accepted by J. Ocasio. Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/1/2009, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Hallen Welding Service, Inc. served on 11/21/2006, answer due 12/11/2006. Service was accepted by Eugen Massamillo, Esq.. Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. DMT Enterprise, Inc. served on 1/26/2007, answer due 2/15/2007. Service was accepted by DMT Enterprise, Inc.. Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Vollmer Associates L.L.P. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Weeks Marine, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; WSP Cantor Seinuk served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; A Russo Wrecking, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; AMEC Construction Management, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Bechtel Construction, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Bechtel Environmental, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Breeze Carting Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Breeze National, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Brer-Four Transportation Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; C.B. Contracting Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Canron Construction Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Cord Contracting Co., Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Diamond Point Excavating Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Diego Construction, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Diversified Carting, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Eagle One Roofing Contractors, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; EJ Davies, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; En-Tech Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC) served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Ewell W. Finley, P.C. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Executive Medical Services, P.C. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Fleet Trucking, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; FTI Trucking, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Hallen Welding Service, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; H.P. Environmental served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Koch Skanska, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Laquila Construction, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; LaStrada General Contracting Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Lucius Pitkin, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Manafort Brothers Incorporated served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Nicholson Construction Company served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Plaza Construction Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Pro Safety Services, L.L.C. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Rober Silman Associates served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Robert L. Gerosa, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Royal GM, Inc. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Safeway Environmental Corp. served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Silverite Contracting Corporation served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006. Service was accepted by Tara Saybe. Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. served on 11/10/2006, answer due 11/30/2006. Service was accepted by M.Weston. Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006; Tishman Construction Corporation of New York served on 11/13/2006, answer due 12/3/2006. Service was accepted by Andrew Gibbs. Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Silverstein WTC MGMT Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties, L.L.C., Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P., Survivair, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Tishman Speyer Properties, Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., 5 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Turner Construction Company, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Verizon New York, Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Whitney Contracting, Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 7 World Trade Company, L.P., WSP Cantor Seinuk, Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., A Russo Wrecking, Inc., ABM Industries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling, L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors, Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F & G Mechanical, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., 1 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., H.P. Environmental, Koch Skanska, Inc., Laquila Construction, Inc., LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Group, Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Meridian Construction Corp., Moretrench American Corp., MRA Engineering, P.C., Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., 2 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Nicholson Construction Company, Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Pro Safety Services, L.L.C., PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking, Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, L.L.C., 4 WTC Holdings, L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 589528) Document filed by Nicholas Cafiero (Automated User) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?