Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Rackspace Hosting, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00375
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 12:56 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

v.
No Logo Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardere Wynne Sewell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul V Storm +1 214 999 4701 +1 214 999 3701 pvstorm@gardere.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

No Logo Rackspace Us, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 40 Motion to Enter Final Judgment. The Court hereby enters FINAL JUDGMENT that Plaintiff Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.'s Original Complaint for Patent Infringement against Rackspace and the claims asserted therein, or that could be asserted based upon alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,892,697, are dismissed with prejudice to the refiling of same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
    Unopposed MOTION to Enter Final Judgment by Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying as moot 17 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division filed by Rackspace US, Inc., Rackspace Hosting, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 1/3/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2013. (sms, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2013 re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 USC. Sec. 101 filed by Rackspace US, Inc., Rackspace Hosting, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In sheets) (rlf) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 33 Motion to Confirm New Disclosure Deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/20/12. cc:attys 11-20-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                  Joint MOTION to Confirm New Disclosure Deadlines by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 11/14/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 11/14/2012 01:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/12. cc:attys 11-02-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration - S. Burdick)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 USC. Sec. 101 filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                            ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. DISREGARD.***RESPONSE to Motion re 17 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division Plaintiffs' Surreply to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of S. Burdick)(Hartsell, Steven) Modified on 10/10/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                              ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. DISREGARD.***RESPONSE to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 USC. Sec. 101 Plaintiffs' Surreply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 U.S.C. section 101 filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Bumgardner, Barry) Modified on 10/10/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division filed by Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Capuyan, # 2 Exhibit 26 - excerpts of file history re '697, # 3 Declaration of B. Piatt)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 USC. Sec. 101 filed by Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Vacation Exchange D.N. 27, # 2 Exhibit 2 - OIP v. Amazon D.N. 50, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Phoenix Licensing v. Aetna D.N,. 186)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James Brakefield, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Sean Burdick, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Affidavit Declaration of Matt Kowalec)(Hartsell, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2012: # 15 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 USC. Sec. 101 filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2012: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cynthia D Vreeland on behalf of All Defendants (Vreeland, Cynthia) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                          APPLICATION (APPROVED, receipt # 6-10362) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Monica Grewal for Rackspace Hosting, Inc. and Rackspace US, Inc.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                            APPLICATION (APPROVED, receipt # 6-10362) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam S Gershenson for Rackspace Hosting, Inc. and Rackspace US, Inc.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                              APPLICATION (APPROVED, receipt # 6-10362) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William F Lee for Rackspace Hosting, Inc.,William F Lee for Rackspace US, Inc.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Change Venue to the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division by Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of B. Piatt, # 2 Declaration of C. Capuyan, # 3 Exhibit 1 - 040812 Kens5, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Rackspace.com About Rackspace, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Rackspace 10-K filed, # 6 Exhibit 4 - '697 Patent, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Brakefield Accurint, # 8 Exhibit 6 - '697 Patent Assignment, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Complaint, Uniloc v. Revostock, cv094, # 10 Exhibit 8 - 100410 Orange County Bus. Journal, # 11 Exhibit 9 - Uniloc.com Company, # 12 Exhibit 10 - Davis Accurint, # 13 Exhibit 11 - Etchegoyan Accurint, # 14 Exhibit 12 - Kowalec Accurint, # 15 Exhibit 13 - Boebel Accurint, # 16 Exhibit 14 - Seats Accurint, # 17 Exhibit 15 - '723 Patent, # 18 Exhibit 16 - Karim Accurint, # 19 Exhibit 17 - Olson Accurint, # 20 Exhibit 18 - '943 Patent, # 21 Exhibit 19 - Pang Accurint, # 22 Exhibit 20 - Mobilemedia Ideas v. RIM, # 23 Exhibit 21 - '697 Patent Courtlink, # 24 Exhibit 22 - Pacer Docket 6:12cv375, # 25 Exhibit 23 - Table C-5, # 26 Exhibit 24 - Rackspace.com Weston, Elmendorf, and Condon, # 27 Exhibit 25 - HostSearch.com 1004 Interview, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 USC. Sec. 101 by Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Rackspace Hosting, Inc. on 6/20/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 7/11/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Rackspace US, Inc. on 6/21/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 7/12/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc..( Storm, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc. (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul V Storm on behalf of Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc. (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3630617.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,892,697)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 641 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?