USA v. McConico
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-00548-SI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Philip Mazzucco +1 415 436 7289 +1 415 436 7234 tom.mazzucco@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Kevin Demar McConico, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Paul Blank +1 415 436 7700 daniel_blank@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Francisco
Filed 8/14/2008
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
308-mj-70494-MEJ
Count 1-3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a) Bank Robbery
Def Custody Status
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Payment Record Card
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None PRB12
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Set HearingsCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Susan Illston:Trial Setting Hearing as to Kevin Demar McConico held on 8/29/2008 Status Conference set for 10/10/2008 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter Yeomans.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Arraignment as to Kevin Demar McConico (1) Count 1-3 held on 8/15/2008 Plead not guilty. Status Conference set for 8/29/2008 11:00 AM. (Tape #9:49-9:51.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Indictment
          INDICTMENT as to Kevin Demar McConico (1) count(s) 1-3. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Detention HearingCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman:Detention Hearing as to Kevin Demar McConico not held on 8/6/2008 Govt motion for detn granted. Preliminary Examination set for 8/15/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Tape #9:41-9:43.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)[3:08-mj-70494-MEJ]
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Notice of Substitution of Attorney
              NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney as to Kevin Demar McConico Substitution of Counsel (Mazzucco, Thomas) (Filed on 8/1/2008)[3:08-mj-70494-MEJ]
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Initial Appearance as to Kevin Demar McConico held on 8/1/2008, Added attorney Daniel Paul Blank for Kevin Demar McConico. CJA23 Submitted as to Kevin Demar McConico. Defendant remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 8/6/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. (Tape #FTR 11:36-11:40.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)[3:08-mj-70494-MEJ]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT as to Kevin Demar McConico (1). (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2008)[3:08-mj-70494-MEJ]
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                    CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. [3:08-mj-70494-MEJ]
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 91 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?