Hamer et al v. Planning and Zoning Commission et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-01845-WWE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 1, 2017 at 2:12 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Hamer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Oakview Capital Partners, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Darien Planning & Zoning Commission, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Ryan +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 mtryan@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Zellner +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 jczellner@ryandelucalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP - Stamford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/13/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anupam Ramadhar Pertab +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 arpertab@ryandelucalaw.com
No Logo Frederick B. Conze, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/13/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anupam Ramadhar Pertab +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 arpertab@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Ryan +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 mtryan@ryandelucalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Zellner +1 203 357 9200 +1 203 357 7915 jczellner@ryandelucalaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 3601
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/24/2015.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/22/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
      Parties reached an agreement to settle. Counsel will file a stipulation of dismissal. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 8/4/2015. Counsel shall follow-up with the court by Tuesday, August 11, 2015. Total Time: 4 hours and 30 minutes (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER re: Trial Procedures Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 7/14/2015.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set for 6/9/2015 @ 2:30 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5593. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 190 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/12/2015.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection with trial to follow set for 8/24/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton. The May 13, 2015 pretrial conference is cancelled. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/8/15.(Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Trial Memo
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Trial Memo
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton Jury Selection set for 5/15/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton Jury Trial set for 5/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/7/2015.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton. Jury Selection is continued to 5/15/2015 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2015 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/7/15.(Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            PRETRIAL ORDER:This case is scheduled to begin trial on May 13, 2015. Jury selection will occur on May 11, 2015. By May 7, 2015, each party shall exchange and file with the Court IN DUPLICATE, Trial Memoranda which shall contain the following information: (1) Brief summary of case; (2) Proposed Voir Dire; (3) List of Witnesses; (4) List of Exhibits; (5) Deposition designations and cross-designations; (6) Proposed Jury instructions and interrogatories for Special Verdict forms. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 5/1/15.(Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Calendar Entry
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Settlement Conference held on 4/28/2015. 30 minutes (Watson, M.) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference is set for 4/28/2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Parties must attend the conference unless excused by the Court. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/23/2015.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection, with trial to follow, set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/5/15.(Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection, with trial to follow, set for 3/23/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom Three-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Warren W. Eginton. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/29/14.(Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY to Response to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 34, # 2 Exhibit 35)(Zellner, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Hamer, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit A - C, # 3 Exhibit D - F, # 4 Exhibit G - N)(Williams, John) (Entered: 02/09/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission.Responses due by 2/7/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of MSJ, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Statement of Material Facts Rule 56(A)(1) Statement, # 36 Appendix Appendix of Cases)(Ryan, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery and dispositive motions are due January 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/10/13. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until THE FOLLOWING DEADLINES - DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERTS TO DECEMBER 18,2 013; DEADLINE TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY AND EXPERT AND FACT WITNESS DEPOSITIONS TO JANUARY 17, 2014; DEADLINE TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS TO JANUARY 17, 2014; DEADLINE TO FILE THE JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM TO FEBRUARY 16, 2014; AND THE DEADLINE BY WHICH THE CASE MUST BE TRIAL READY TO MARCH 18, 2014 31 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission. (Zellner, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Longo-McLean on behalf of Christopher Hamer (Longo-McLean, Rose) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Zellner on behalf of Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission (Zellner, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Amended ANSWER to 22 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission.(Ryan, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct 33 Answer to Amended Complaint by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission as whether defendant's alleged acts were legislative remains a disputed question of fact. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 8/21/13. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct 33 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Hamer, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct 33 Answer to Amended Complaint by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission.Responses due by 9/9/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer)(Ryan, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission.(Ryan, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/21/13. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for completing discovery and expert and fact witness depositions and for filing dispositive motions will be three (3) months after a decision on the motion to dismiss; the deadline for filing the Joint Trial Memorandum will be four (4) months after the decision; and the deadline by which the case must be trial ready will be five (5) months after the decision. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 3/18/13. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 3 months For Deadline for Completing Discovery and Depositions of Expert and Fact Witnesses and for Filing Dispositive Motions; 4 Months for filing the Joint Trial Memorandum and Five Months for the Deadline by which the Case Must be Trial Ready 13 Order by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission. (Ryan, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY to Response to 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Dated October 7, 2012 filed by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission. (Ryan, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Dated October 7, 2012 filed by Christopher Hamer, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Memorandum in Support re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Dated October 7, 2012 filed by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeremy Ginsberg)(Ryan, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Dated October 7, 2012 by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission.Responses due by 12/11/2012 (Ryan, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time until November 20, 2012 to respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 10/22/12. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/20/2012 to respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint dated 10/07/2012 23 Amended Complaint by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission. (Ryan, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT (Corrected Version) against Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission, filed by Christopher Hamer, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC.(Williams, John) (Entered: 10/07/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission, filed by Christopher Hamer, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC.(Williams, John) (Entered: 10/07/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Memorandum of Decision granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/21/2012. (Candee, D.) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anupam Ramadhar Pertab terminated. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/12/2012. (Welles, T.) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Anupam R. Pertab to Withdraw as Attorney by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission. (Pertab, Anupam) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 29, 2012 To Respond To Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Christopher Hamer, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/7/12. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until October 29, 2012 To Respond To Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Christopher Hamer, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC. (Williams, John) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 15 Memorandum in Opposition to 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Unpublished Cases)(Pertab, Anupam) Modified on 3/16/2012 to create link. (Torrenti, R.). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christopher Hamer, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unreported Case)(Williams, John) (Entered: 03/03/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission.Responses due by 3/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A--Unpublished Cases)(Pertab, Anupam) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER approving 12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery and dispositive motions are both due March 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/18/12. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 01/14/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 20, 2012 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint 1 . Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/19/11. (Ladd-Smith, I.) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until February 20, 2011 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint 1 Complaint by Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission. (Pertab, Anupam) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Anupam Ramadhar Pertab on behalf of Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission (Pertab, Anupam) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Ryan on behalf of Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission (Ryan, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Hamer, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC. Frederick B. Conze served on 11/30/2011, answer due 12/21/2011; Darien Planning & Zoning Commission served on 11/30/2011, answer due 12/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Darien P&Z - Marshal's Return, # 2 Darien P&Z - Summons, # 3 Conze - Marshal's Return, # 4 Conze - Summons)(Williams, John) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning & Zoning Commission* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC, Christopher Hamer, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Williams on behalf of Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC, Christopher Hamer, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/2011. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 11/29/2011. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 2/29/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2012. Discovery due by 5/30/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2012. Signed by Clerk on 11/29/2011. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Christopher Hamer, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum of Decision granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 9/21/2012. (Candee, D.)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Frederick B. Conze, Darien Planning and Zoning Commission ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2318996.), filed by Christopher Hamer, Oakview Housing Trust I, LLC, Oakview Capital Partners, LLC.(Williams, John) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?